Isreal v. Holbrook et al

Plaintiff: Michael Isreal
Defendant: Michael Holbrook and Maryellen O'Shaughnessy
Case Number: 2:2017cv00116
Filed: February 7, 2017
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of Ohio
Office: Columbus Office
County: FRANKLIN
Referring Judge: Terence P. Kemp
Presiding Judge: Edmund A. Sargus
Nature of Suit: Freedom of Information Act
Cause of Action: 28:1331
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
January 3, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 17 ORDER granting in part and denying in part Plaintiff's 16 Motion for Extension of Time. Plaintiff is granted an extension of THIRTY (30) DAYS in which to file his notice of appeal. Plaintiff's Notice of Appeal is due by 2/5/2018. Signed by Magistrate Judge Chelsey M. Vascura on 1/3/2018. (kpt)(This document has been sent by regular mail to the party(ies) listed in the NEF that did not receive electronic notification.)
December 4, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 14 ORDER adopting 8 the Magistrate Judge's 05/16/2017 Report and Recommendation. The Plaintiff's Objections 12 13 are overruled. This case is DISMISSED. Signed by Chief Judge Edmund A. Sargus on 12/04/2017. (dh1)(This document has been sent by regular mail to the party(ies) listed in the NEF that did not receive electronic notification.)
May 16, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 8 REPORT AND RECOMMENDATION re 6 MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction filed by Michael Holbrook and Maryellen O'Shaughnessy in that it is RECOMMENDED that Defendants' Motion to Dismiss be GRANTED. Objections to R&R due by 5/30/2017. Signed by Magistrate Judge Terence P. Kemp on 5/16/17. (sem)(This document has been sent by regular mail to the party(ies) listed in the NEF that did not receive electronic notification.)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Ohio Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Isreal v. Holbrook et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Michael Isreal
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Michael Holbrook
Represented By: Benjamin D. Humphrey
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Maryellen O'Shaughnessy
Represented By: Benjamin D. Humphrey
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?