Two Rivers Development, LTD. v. Unisys Corporation

Plaintiff: Two Rivers Development, LTD.
Defendant: Unisys Corporation
Case Number: 2:2018cv01210
Filed: October 10, 2018
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of Ohio
Presiding Judge: George C Smith
Referring Judge: Chelsey M Vascura
Nature of Suit: Real Property: Other
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on December 6, 2018. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
December 6, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 8 NOTATION ORDER granting #7 Motion for Extension of Time to Answer. Unisys Corporation answer due 1/18/2019. By Magistrate Judge Chelsey M. Vascura on 12/6/2018. (agm)
December 5, 2018 Filing 7 Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer re #1 Complaint New date requested 1/18/2019. by Defendant Unisys Corporation. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order Proposed Order) (Pasheilich, Gary)
December 5, 2018 Filing 6 MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice (Filing fee of $200 paid, receipt number 0648-6705053) of Michael G. Murphy by Defendant Unisys Corporation. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Certificate of Good Standing) (Pasheilich, Gary)
December 5, 2018 Filing 5 Corporate Disclosure Statement by Defendant Unisys Corporation. (Pasheilich, Gary)
December 5, 2018 Filing 4 NOTICE of Appearance by Gary L Pasheilich for Defendant Unisys Corporation (Pasheilich, Gary)
December 5, 2018 Filing 3 NOTICE of Appearance by Vincent Atriano for Defendant Unisys Corporation (Atriano, Vincent)
October 12, 2018 Filing 2 Corporate Disclosure Statement by Plaintiff Two Rivers Development, LTD.. (DeGulis, Gregory)
October 10, 2018 Filing 1 COMPLAINT with JURY DEMAND against Unisys Corporation ( Filing fee $ 400 paid - receipt number: 0648-6632561), filed by Two Rivers Development, LTD.. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet) (DeGulis, Gregory)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Ohio Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Two Rivers Development, LTD. v. Unisys Corporation
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Unisys Corporation
Represented By: Vincent Atriano
Represented By: Gary L Pasheilich
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Two Rivers Development, LTD.
Represented By: Elizabeth Camille Yancey
Represented By: Gregory John DeGulis
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?