Sillah et al v. C.R. Bard, Inc. et al

Plaintiff: Fatmata Sillah and Momodu Sillah
Defendant: Davol, Inc. and C. R. Bard, Inc.
Case Number: 2:2018cv01284
Filed: October 23, 2018
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of Ohio
Presiding Judge: Kimberly A Jolson
Referring Judge: Edmund A Sargus
Nature of Suit: Tort Product Liability
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on December 4, 2018. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
December 4, 2018 Filing 13 MOTION to Withdraw as Attorney ( Responses due by 12/28/2018) by Plaintiff Dianna R. McClain. Associated Cases: 2:18-md-02846-EAS-KAJ et al. (Morgan, Crystal)
October 23, 2018 Chief Judge Edmund A. Sargus and Magistrate Judge Kimberly A. Jolson added. Motions referred to Kimberly A. Jolson. (daf)
October 23, 2018 Filing 12 Case transferred in from District of North Carolina Western; Case Number 3:18-cv-00399. Original file electronic copy of transfer order and docket sheet received.
October 19, 2018 Filing 11 Transfer Order of Judicial Panel MDL transferring case to Southern District of Ohio, MDL# 2846. Matter transferred for coordinated or consolidated pretrial proceedings. (tmg) [Transferred from North Carolina Western on 10/23/2018.]
October 5, 2018 Filing 10 SUMMONS Returned Executed as to Davol, Inc. served on 9/26/2018, answer due 10/17/2018. (ams) [Transferred from North Carolina Western on 10/23/2018.]
September 18, 2018 Filing 9 Summons Issued Electronically to US Marshal for service as to C.R. Bard, Inc., Davol, Inc. (Attachments: #1 USM 285-Davol Inc., #2 USM 285-CR Bard Inc.)(ams) [Transferred from North Carolina Western on 10/23/2018.]
September 18, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 8 ORDER granting #2 Motion for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis; granting #3 Motion for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis. The United States Marshal shall serve process upon the defendants, in accordance with Fed. R. Civ. P. 4(i)(1) and (2), and/or as directed by Plaintiffs through Plaintiffs counsel. Signed by Chief Judge Frank D. Whitney on 9/18/2018. (ams) [Transferred from North Carolina Western on 10/23/2018.]
September 5, 2018 SECOND Notice to Tiega-Noel Varlack: Pursuant to Local Rule 83.1 you are required to Register for ECF at #www.ncwd.uscourts.gov. Deadline by 9/12/2018. (tmg) [Transferred from North Carolina Western on 10/23/2018.]
August 27, 2018 Notice to Tiega-Noel Varlack: Pursuant to Local Rule 83.1 you are required to Register for ECF at #www.ncwd.uscourts.gov. Deadline by 9/4/2018. (brl) [Transferred from North Carolina Western on 10/23/2018.]
August 27, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 7 ORDER granting #6 Motion for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice added Tiega-Noel Varlack for Fatmata Sillah and Momodu Sillah. Signed by Magistrate Judge David Keesler on 08/27/2018. (brl) [Transferred from North Carolina Western on 10/23/2018.]
August 27, 2018 Filing 6 MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice as to Tiega-Noel Varlack Filing fee $ 281, receipt number 0419-3790709. by Fatmata Sillah, Momodu Sillah. (Shyllon, Mohammed). Motions referred to David Keesler. [Transferred from North Carolina Western on 10/23/2018.]
August 21, 2018 SECOND Notice to Muhammad Alieu Iscandari: Pursuant to Local Rule 83.1 you are required to Register for ECF at #www.ncwd.uscourts.gov. Deadline by 8/28/2018. (tmg) [Transferred from North Carolina Western on 10/23/2018.]
August 13, 2018 Notice to Muhammad Alieu Iscandari: Pursuant to Local Rule 83.1 you are required to Register for ECF at #www.ncwd.uscourts.gov. Deadline by 8/20/2018. (mga) [Transferred from North Carolina Western on 10/23/2018.]
August 13, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 5 ORDER granting #4 Motion for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice. Mr. Muhammad Alieu Iscandari is hereby admitted pro hac to represent Plaitiffs Fatmata Sillah and Momodu Sillah. Signed by Magistrate Judge David C. Keesler on 8/13/2018.(mga) Modified on 8/16/2018 to add judge(rth). [Transferred from North Carolina Western on 10/23/2018.]
August 10, 2018 Filing 4 MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice as to M. Alieu Iscandari Filing fee $ 281, receipt number 0419-3774868. by Fatmata Sillah, Momodu Sillah. (Shyllon, Mohammed). Motions referred to David Keesler. [Transferred from North Carolina Western on 10/23/2018.]
July 20, 2018 Clerk's Entry and Service of #Initial Scheduling Order and #Certificate of Initial Attorney FRCP 26(f) Conference Form pursuant to the Standing Order Governing Civil Case Management before the Honorable Frank D. Whitney (3:07-mc-47 (Doc. No. 2)). The parties are directed to click on the link above to retrieve the Order. (ams) [Transferred from North Carolina Western on 10/23/2018.]
July 20, 2018 Case assigned to Chief Judge Frank D. Whitney and Magistrate Judge David Keesler. Notice: You must click this link to retrieve the #Case Assignment Packet. This is your only notice - you will not receive a separate document.(ams) [Transferred from North Carolina Western on 10/23/2018.]
July 20, 2018 Filing 3 MOTION (Sealed - Participants) to Proceed in forma pauperis M.Sillah by Momodu Sillah. (Shyllon, Mohammed) [Transferred from North Carolina Western on 10/23/2018.]
July 20, 2018 Filing 2 MOTION (Sealed - Participants) to Proceed in forma pauperis F. Sillah by Fatmata Sillah, Momodu Sillah. (Shyllon, Mohammed) [Transferred from North Carolina Western on 10/23/2018.]
July 20, 2018 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against C.R. Bard, Inc., Davol, Inc. with Jury Demand, filed by Momodu Sillah, Fatmata Sillah.(Shyllon, Mohammed) [Transferred from North Carolina Western on 10/23/2018.]

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Ohio Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Sillah et al v. C.R. Bard, Inc. et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Fatmata Sillah
Represented By: Tiega Noel Varlack
Represented By: M. Alieu Iscandari
Represented By: Mohammed M. Shyllon
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Momodu Sillah
Represented By: Tiega Noel Varlack
Represented By: M. Alieu Iscandari
Represented By: Mohammed M. Shyllon
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Davol, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: C. R. Bard, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?