Washington County, Ohio by its Commissioners et al v. Cardinal Health, Inc. et al
Plaintiff: City Of Marietta, Ohio and Washington County, Ohio by its Commissioners
Defendant: Brandon Worley, McKesson Corporation, Endo Health Solutions, Inc., Purdue Pharma L.P., Allegran Finance, LLC, Purdue Pharma, Inc., Allegran PLC F/K/A Actavis PLC, Teva Pharmaceuticals USA, Inc., Endo Pharmaceuticals, Inc., Kroger Limited Partnership II, CVS Indiana LLC, Ortho-McNeil-Janssen Pharmaceuticals, Inc., n/k/a Janssen Pharmaceuticals, Inc., Cardinal Health, Inc., Actavis Pharma, Inc. F/K/A Watson Pharmaceuticals, Inc., Actavis, LLC, Miami Luken Inc., Purdue Frederick Company, Inc., Watson Laboratories, Inc., Walgreen Co., Walmart Stores East L.P., Rite Aid of Ohio, Inc., Janssen Pharmaceutica Inc. n/k/a Janssen Pharmaceuticals, Inc., Johnson & Johnson, Amerisourcebergen Drug Corporation, Janssen Pharmaceuticals, Inc., Mylan Bertek Pharmaceuticals, Inc. and Cephalon, Inc.,
Case Number: 2:2018cv01706
Filed: December 14, 2018
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of Ohio
Presiding Judge: Elizabeth Preston Deavers
Referring Judge: Kimberly A Jolson
2 Judge: Edmund A Sargus
Nature of Suit: P.I.: Other
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1332
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on April 11, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
April 11, 2019 Case transferred from Ohio Southern has been opened in Northern District of Ohio as case 1:19-op-45230, filed 04/11/2019. (sct)
April 3, 2019 Filing 32 Transfer Order - IT IS THEREFORE ORDERED that the actions listed on Schedule A are transferred to the Northern District of Ohio and, with the consent of that court, assigned to the Honorable Dan A. Polster for inclusion in the coordinated or consolidated pretrial proceedings (pb)
April 3, 2019 Case transferred to District of USDC Northern District of Ohio.Case file and docket sheet sent Electronically. (pb)
April 2, 2019 Filing 31 NOTICE by Defendant McKesson Corporation of Withdrawal of Brian J. Laliberte (Laliberte, Brian)
January 25, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 30 ORDER denying #25 Motion to Remand to State Court; granting #21 Motion to Stay; denying #24 Motion to Remand. Signed by Chief Judge Edmund A. Sargus on 1/25/2019. (cmw)
January 25, 2019 Filing 29 Corporate Disclosure Statement by Defendant Kroger Limited Partnership II. (Kent, Robert)
January 17, 2019 Filing 28 NOTICE of Appearance by Robert James Kent for Defendant Kroger Limited Partnership II (Kent, Robert)
January 17, 2019 Filing 27 RESPONSE in Opposition re #21 MOTION to Stay Proceedings Pending Likely Transfer to Multidistrict Litigation filed by Defendant Mylan Bertek Pharmaceuticals, Inc.. (Murch, Kevin)
January 16, 2019 Filing 26 RESPONSE in Opposition re #21 MOTION to Stay Proceedings Pending Likely Transfer to Multidistrict Litigation filed by Plaintiffs City Of Marietta, Ohio, Washington County, Ohio by its Commissioners. (Vessels, Ethan)
January 14, 2019 Filing 25 MOTION to Remand to State Court by Plaintiffs City Of Marietta, Ohio, Washington County, Ohio by its Commissioners. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit 2, #3 Exhibit 3, #4 Exhibit 4) (Vessels, Ethan)
January 14, 2019 Filing 24 MOTION to Remand by Defendant Mylan Bertek Pharmaceuticals, Inc.. (Murch, Kevin)
January 3, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 23 ORDER granting #22 Motion for Extension of Time to Answer. Signed by Magistrate Judge Elizabeth Preston Deavers on January 3, 2019. (jlk)
January 3, 2019 Filing 22 Consent MOTION for Extension of Time New date requested 6/3/2019. by Defendants Amerisourcebergen Drug Corporation, Cardinal Health, Inc., McKesson Corporation. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order Proposed Order) (Holzhall, Vincent)
December 27, 2018 Filing 21 MOTION to Stay Proceedings Pending Likely Transfer to Multidistrict Litigation by Defendant Walgreen Co.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Text of Proposed Order Granting Motion to Stay Proceedings Pending Likely Transfer to Multidistrict Litigation) (Buckley, Brent)
December 26, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 20 ORDER Granting #18 Defendants CVS Indiana LLC, Kroger Limited Partnership II, Walgreen Co., and Walmart Stores East L.P.'s Motion for Extension of Time to respond to Complaint. Response due within 45 days following the final determination of removal of this action to federal court, or transfer to the multidistrict litigation pending in the Northern District of Ohio. In re National Prescription Opiate Litigation, Case No. 1:17-md-02804, whichever is later. Signed by Magistrate Judge Elizabeth Preston Deavers on 12/26/2018. (sln)
December 21, 2018 Filing 19 Corporate Disclosure Statement by Defendants Walmart Stores East L.P., Walmart Inc. identifying Corporate Parent Walmart Inc. for Walmart Stores East L.P... (McLaughlin, Christopher)
December 21, 2018 Filing 18 Consent MOTION for Extension of Time New date requested 2/4/2019. by Defendants CVS Indiana LLC, Kroger Limited Partnership II, Walgreen Co., Walmart Stores East L.P.. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order) (McLaughlin, Christopher)
December 21, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 17 ORDER Granting #16 the Manufacturer Defendants' Motion for Extension of Time to respond to the Complaint within 60 (sixty) days after the Courts decision on Plaintiffs potential Motion to Remand or the Judicial Panel of Multidistrict Litigations decision on a conditional transfer, whichever is later. Signed by Magistrate Judge Elizabeth Preston Deavers on 12/21/2018. (sln)
December 21, 2018 Filing 16 Consent MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer re #5 Complaint New date requested 2/19/2019. by Defendants Janssen Pharmaceuticals, Inc., Johnson & Johnson. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order) (Rice, Justin)
December 21, 2018 Filing 15 NOTICE of Appearance by Justin Edward Rice for Defendants Janssen Pharmaceutica Inc. n/k/a Janssen Pharmaceuticals, Inc., Janssen Pharmaceuticals, Inc., Johnson & Johnson, Ortho-McNeil-Janssen Pharmaceuticals, Inc., n/k/a Janssen Pharmaceuticals, Inc. (Rice, Justin)
December 19, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 14 ORDER granting #12 Motion for Extension of Time. It is ORDERED that the deadline for Defendant Mylan Bertek Pharmaceuticals Inc. to answer or otherwise respond to the Complaint is extended until 60 days after the Court rules on Plaintiffs motion to remand (should one be filed) or the Joint Panel on Multidistrict Litigation issues a determination regarding transfer of this matter, whichever date is later. Signed by Magistrate Judge Elizabeth Preston Deavers on December 19, 2018. (jlk)
December 19, 2018 Filing 13 Corporate Disclosure Statement by Defendant Mylan Bertek Pharmaceuticals, Inc.. (Murch, Kevin)
December 18, 2018 Filing 12 Consent MOTION for Extension of Time New date requested 2/19/2019. by Defendant Mylan Bertek Pharmaceuticals, Inc.. (Murch, Kevin)
December 18, 2018 Filing 11 NOTICE of Appearance by Brian J Laliberte for Defendant McKesson Corporation (Laliberte, Brian)
December 18, 2018 Filing 10 Corporate Disclosure Statement by Defendants Amerisourcebergen Drug Corporation, AmerisourceBergen Corporation, AmerisourceBergen Services Corporation identifying Corporate Parent AmerisourceBergen Services Corporation, Corporate Parent AmerisourceBergen Corporation for Amerisourcebergen Drug Corporation.. (Rhinehart, Erin)
December 18, 2018 Filing 9 Corporate Disclosure Statement by Defendant McKesson Corporation. (Holzhall, Vincent)
December 18, 2018 Filing 8 NOTICE of Appearance by Vincent I Holzhall for Defendant McKesson Corporation (Holzhall, Vincent)
December 18, 2018 Filing 7 NOTICE of Appearance by Christopher Clayton Hollon for Defendant Amerisourcebergen Drug Corporation (Hollon, Christopher)
December 18, 2018 Filing 6 NOTICE of Appearance by Erin Rhinehart for Defendant Amerisourcebergen Drug Corporation (Rhinehart, Erin)
December 17, 2018 Filing 5 COMPLAINT with JURY DEMAND against All Defendants, filed by City Of Marietta, Ohio and Washington County, Ohio by its Commissioners. (Attachments: #1 Part 2 of the Complaint) (daf)
December 14, 2018 Filing 4 Corporate Disclosure Statement by Defendants Walgreen Co., Walgreens Boots Alliance, Inc. identifying Corporate Parent Walgreens Boots Alliance, Inc. for Walgreen Co... (Buckley, Brent)
December 14, 2018 Filing 3 NOTICE by Defendant Walgreen Co. re #1 Notice of Removal Notice to Plaintiffs of Removal to Federal Court (Buckley, Brent)
December 14, 2018 Filing 2 NOTICE by Defendant Walgreen Co. re #1 Notice of Removal Civil Cover Sheet (Buckley, Brent)
December 14, 2018 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL ( Filing fee $ 400 paid - receipt number: 0648-6719019), filed by Walgreen Co.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1 - Transfer Order, #2 Exhibit 2 - Process, Pleadings and Orders) (Buckley, Brent)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Ohio Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Washington County, Ohio by its Commissioners et al v. Cardinal Health, Inc. et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Brandon Worley
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: McKesson Corporation
Represented By: Vincent I Holzhall
Represented By: Brian J Laliberte
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Endo Health Solutions, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Purdue Pharma L.P.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Allegran Finance, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Purdue Pharma, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Allegran PLC F/K/A Actavis PLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Teva Pharmaceuticals USA, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Endo Pharmaceuticals, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Kroger Limited Partnership II
Represented By: Robert James Kent
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: CVS Indiana LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Ortho-McNeil-Janssen Pharmaceuticals, Inc., n/k/a Janssen Pharmaceuticals, Inc.
Represented By: Justin Edward Rice
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Cardinal Health, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Actavis Pharma, Inc. F/K/A Watson Pharmaceuticals, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Actavis, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Miami Luken Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Purdue Frederick Company, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Watson Laboratories, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Walgreen Co.
Represented By: Brent Michael Buckley
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Walmart Stores East L.P.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Rite Aid of Ohio, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Janssen Pharmaceutica Inc. n/k/a Janssen Pharmaceuticals, Inc.
Represented By: Justin Edward Rice
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Johnson & Johnson
Represented By: Justin Edward Rice
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Amerisourcebergen Drug Corporation
Represented By: Erin Rhinehart
Represented By: Christopher Clayton Hollon
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Janssen Pharmaceuticals, Inc.
Represented By: Justin Edward Rice
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Mylan Bertek Pharmaceuticals, Inc.
Represented By: Kevin L Murch
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Cephalon, Inc.,
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: City Of Marietta, Ohio
Represented By: Ethan T Vessels
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Washington County, Ohio by its Commissioners
Represented By: Ethan T Vessels
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?