Brewer et al v. Norfolk Southern Railway Company et al

Plaintiff: Penny Brewer and Dominic Brewer
Defendant: David Patterson, Norfolk Southern Railway Company, Professional Transportation, Inc. and James McCoy
Case Number: 2:2019cv01766
Filed: May 3, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of Ohio
Presiding Judge: Elizabeth Preston Deavers
Referring Judge: George C Smith
Nature of Suit: Federal Employer's Liability
Cause of Action: 45:51
Jury Demanded By: Both

Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on June 17, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
June 17, 2019 Filing 12 NOTICE of Hearing: Preliminary Pretrial Conference set for 7/16/2019 10:00 AM in Chambers before Magistrate Judge Elizabeth Preston Deavers. (sln)
June 11, 2019 Filing 11 James A. McCoy's ANSWER to Complaint with Jury Demand & CROSSCLAIM against Norfolk Southern Railway Company, David Patterson, Professional Transportation, Inc. filed by James McCoy. (Ahlstrom, David)
June 3, 2019 Filing 10 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed. Waiver sent to Professional Transportation, Inc. on 5/10/2019, answer due 7/9/2019. (Thompson, Robert)
May 30, 2019 Filing 9 SUMMONS Returned Executed as to Defendant James McCoy. James McCoy served on 5/17/2019, answer due 6/7/2019. (Thompson, Robert)
May 30, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 8 ORDER Granting #7 Motion for Extension of Time to Answer. Professional Transportation, Inc. and David Patterson answers due by 7/9/2019. Signed by Magistrate Judge Elizabeth Preston Deavers on 5/30/2019. (sln)
May 29, 2019 Filing 7 Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer by Defendants David Patterson & Professional Transportation, Inc. New date requested 7/9/2019. (Evans, R) Modified on 5/30/2019 to clarify text (kk)
May 21, 2019 Filing 6 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed. Waiver sent to Norfolk Southern Railway Company on 5/10/2019, answer due 7/9/2019. (Thompson, Robert)
May 17, 2019 Filing 5 SUMMONS Returned Executed as to Defendant David Patterson. David Patterson served on 5/13/2019, answer due 6/3/2019. (Thompson, Robert)
May 7, 2019 Filing 4 Summons Issued as to James McCoy and David Patterson. (Attachments: #1 Summons Form) (sem)
May 6, 2019 Filing 3 REQUEST for Issuance of Summons. (Thompson, Robert)
May 6, 2019 Filing 2 REQUEST for Issuance of Summons. (Thompson, Robert)
May 3, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT with JURY DEMAND against James McCoy, Norfolk Southern Railway Company, David Patterson, Professional Transportation, Inc. ( Filing fee $ 400 paid - receipt number: 0648-6910310), filed by Dominic Brewer, Penny Brewer. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet) (Thompson, Robert)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Ohio Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Brewer et al v. Norfolk Southern Railway Company et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: David Patterson
Represented By: R Leland Evans
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Norfolk Southern Railway Company
Represented By: R Leland Evans
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Professional Transportation, Inc.
Represented By: R Leland Evans
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: James McCoy
Represented By: David C Ahlstrom
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Penny Brewer
Represented By: Robert Bruce Thompson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Dominic Brewer
Represented By: Robert Bruce Thompson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?