Barnhart v. Horn
Plaintiff: Terri Barnhart
Defendant: Michael L. Horn
Petitioner: U.S. Postal Service and United States Postal Service
Case Number: 2:2019cv04275
Filed: September 25, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of Ohio
Presiding Judge: Elizabeth Preston Deavers
Referring Judge: Michael H Watson
Nature of Suit: Other Statutes: Administrative Procedures Act/Review or Appeal of Agency Decision
Cause of Action: 28:1442
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on May 4, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
November 19, 2019 Filing 10 REPLY to Response to Motion re #2 MOTION to Quash or Memorandum in Opposition to Petitioner's Motion to Compel filed by Movant United States Postal Service. (Yates, Christopher)
November 17, 2019 Filing 9 RESPONSE in Opposition re #2 MOTION to Quash filed by Petitioner Terri Barnhart. (Miller, Donna)
November 5, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 8 NOTATION ORDER granting #5 Motion for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice of Donna M. Miller. By Magistrate Judge Elizabeth Preston Deavers on 11/5/2019. (ew)
November 5, 2019 Filing 7 NOTICE by Petitioner Terri Barnhart re #5 First MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice (FILING FEE DUE) of Donna M. Miller Affirmation of Applicant's Intention to Seek Permanent Admission to the United States District Court, Southern District of Ohio, Eastern Division (Hillyer, Brad)
October 28, 2019 Filing Fee Received re #5 Motion for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice of Donna M. Miller. $200. Receipt Number: 200COL059249. (ew)
October 25, 2019 Set Deadlines: Deficiency Deadline by 11/8/2019. (ew)
October 25, 2019 Filing 6 NOTICE of Deficiency re #5 Motion for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice of Donna M. Miller. (ew)
October 24, 2019 Filing 5 First MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice (FILING FEE DUE) of Donna M. Miller by Petitioner Terri Barnhart. (Hillyer, Brad)
September 30, 2019 Filing 4 Motion to Compel Compliance With Subpoena originally filed in Harrison County Court of Common Pleas on 9/4/2019 by Petitioner Terri Barnhart. (Yates, Christopher) Modified text and event on 10/1/2019 (ew).
September 26, 2019 Filing 3 Notice by Clerk of Southern District of Ohio of Pro Hac Vice Rules as to Attorneys Donna M. Miller and Steven Stickles. (ew)(This document has been sent by regular mail to the party(ies) listed in the NEF that did not receive electronic notification.)
September 25, 2019 Filing 2 MOTION to Quash Subpoena or Memorandum in Opposition to Petitioner's Motion to Compel originally filed in Harrison County Court of Common Pleas on 9/11/2019 by Movant United States Postal Service. (ew)
September 25, 2019 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL from Harrison County Court of Common Pleas, case number CVH20190012, filed by U.S. Postal Service. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Exhibit A - USPS Motion to Quash Subpoena, #2 Civil Cover Sheet Civil Cover Sheet, #3 Supplemental Civil Cover Sheet Supplemental Civil Cover Sheet) (Yates, Christopher)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Ohio Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Barnhart v. Horn
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: U.S. Postal Service
Represented By: Christopher R Yates
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: United States Postal Service
Represented By: Christopher R Yates
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Terri Barnhart
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Michael L. Horn
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?