Plain Local School District Board of Education v. DeWine et al
Plaintiff: Plain Local School District Board of Education, C.H., B.H., J.L. and C.L.
Defendant: reginald wilkinson, Meryl Johnson, Jenny Kilgore, Antoinette Miranda, Kirsten Hill, Samuel Ferruccio, Laura Kohler, Charlotte McGuire, Nick Owens, William Cline, Stephanie Dodd, Lisa Woods, Dimitrios Pousoulides, Village of Hills And Dales, Paolo Demaria, steve dackin, mike toal, Eric Poklar, Sarah Fowler, Linda Haycock, Mike DeWine, martha manchester, Frank Braden, Mark Lamoncha, Cindy Collins, John Hagan, Samuel J Ferruccio, Jr, William S Cline and Frank C Braden
Case Number: 2:2019cv05086
Filed: November 20, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of Ohio
Presiding Judge: Kimberly A Jolson
Referring Judge: Sarah D Morrison
2 Judge: Chelsey M Vascura
3 Judge: Michael H Watson
Nature of Suit: Constitutional - State Statute
Cause of Action: 28:1331
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on July 28, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
January 16, 2020 Filing 27 NOTICE of Appearance by Joseph J. Pasquarella for Defendant Village of Hills And Dales (Pasquarella, Joseph)
January 15, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 26 ORDER re #10 Motion for Preliminary Injunction: The Court invites the parties to present a joint proposed briefing schedule on Plaintiff's motion within SEVEN DAYS. Signed by Judge Michael H. Watson on 1/15/2020. (er)
January 10, 2020 Filing 25 NOTICE OF WITHDRAWAL OF DOCUMENT by Defendants Frank C Braden, William S Cline, Samuel J Ferruccio, Jr, Dimitrios Pousoulides re #20 MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction and brief regarding standing and ripeness (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - State ex rel. Dunn v. Plain Local School Dist. Bd. of Edn., Slip Opinion No. 2020-Ohio-40) (Babik, Stephan)
January 6, 2020 Filing 24 RESPONSE in Opposition re #20 MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction and brief regarding standing and ripeness filed by Plaintiff Plain Local School District Board of Education. (Martinsek, Amanda)
December 20, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 23 ORDER staying any further briefing on Plaintiff's motion for a preliminary injunction until it resolves the pending motion to dismiss for lack of jurisdiction. Signed by Judge Michael H. Watson on 12/20/2019. (jk)
December 16, 2019 Filing 22 Respondent's BRIEF by Mike DeWine , et al.,. (Reed, Frank)
December 16, 2019 Filing 21 Response re #19 Brief Regarding the Issues of Ripeness and Standing by Defendant Village of Hills And Dales. (Zurakowski, Scott)
December 16, 2019 Filing 20 WITHDRAWN per #25 . MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction and brief regarding standing and ripeness by Defendants Frank C Braden, William S Cline, Samuel J Ferruccio, Jr, Dimitrios Pousoulides. (Babik, Stephan) Modified on 1/13/2020 (ew).
December 9, 2019 Filing 19 BRIEF by Plaintiff Plain Local School District Board of Education. (Martinsek, Amanda)
December 9, 2019 Filing 18 AMENDED COMPLAINT for Declaratory and Injunctive Relief (Verified) against All Defendants, filed by Plain Local School District Board of Education, C.L., J.L., B.H., and C.H.. (Attachments: #1 Declaration, #2 Exhibit 1 - Statute for Plaintiff) (Martinsek, Amanda) Modified text on 12/9/2019 (daf). Modified filers on 12/10/2019 (ew).
December 5, 2019 Filing 17 Transcript of Telephonic Status Conference Proceedings held on 12/2/2019, before Judge Michael H. Watson. Court Reporter/Transcriber Lahana DuFour, Telephone number 614-719-3286. Transcript may be viewed at the court public terminal or purchased through the Court Reporter/Transcriber before the deadline for Release of Transcript Restriction. After that date it may be obtained through PACER. NOTICE RE: REDACTION OF TRANSCRIPTS: Within 5 business days of this filing, each party shall inform the Court, by filing a Notice of Redaction, of the party's intent to redact personal data identifiers from the electronic transcript of the court proceeding. The policy is located on our website at www.ohsd.uscourts.gov (Forms - Electronic Availability of Transcripts). Please read this policy carefully. For a complete copy of a transcript, please contact the Court Reporter or the Clerk's Office. Redaction Request due 12/26/2019. Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 1/6/2020. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 3/4/2020. (DuFour, Lahana)
December 4, 2019 Filing 16 NOTICE of Substitution of Counsel - Frank J Reed, Jr substituting for Julie M. Pfeiffer as to Defendant Mike DeWine. (Reed, Frank)
December 4, 2019 Filing 15 NOTICE of Appearance by Stephen Eric Chappelear for Defendants Paolo Demaria, Laura Kohler, Charlotte McGuire, Linda Haycock, Kirsten Hill, Jenny Kilgore, Lisa Woods, Antoinette Miranda, Sarah Fowler, John Hagan, Stephanie Dodd, Nick Owens. Meryl Johnson, Eric Poklar, Cindy Collins, Mark Lamoncha, Martha Manchester, Mike Toal, Steve Dackin, and Reginald Wilkinson.(Chappelear, Stephen) Modified filers on 12/5/2019 (ew).
December 4, 2019 Filing 14 NOTICE of Appearance by Frank J Reed, Jr for Defendants Paolo Demaria, Laura Kohler, Charlotte McGuire, Linda Haycock, Kirsten Hill, Jenny Kilgore, Lisa Woods, Antoinette Miranda, Sarah Fowler, John Hagan, Stephanie Dodd, Nick Owens, Meryl Johnson, Eric Poklar, Cindy Collins, Mark Lamoncha, Martha Manchester, Mike Toal, Steve Dackm, and Reginald Wilkinson. (Reed, Frank) Modified filers on 12/5/2019 (ew).
December 3, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 13 ORDER regarding briefing signed by Judge Michael H. Watson on 12/3/2019. (jk)
December 3, 2019 Filing 12 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed. Waiver sent to Village of Hills And Dales on 11/27/2019, answer due 1/27/2020. (Martinsek, Amanda)
December 2, 2019 Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge Michael H. Watson: Telephone Conference held on 12/2/2019. (Court Reporter: Lahana DuFour) (jk)
December 2, 2019 Filing 11 NOTICE by Plaintiff Plain Local School District Board of Education re #10 MOTION for Preliminary Injunction Certificate of Service (Martinsek, Amanda)
December 2, 2019 Filing 10 MOTION for Preliminary Injunction by Plaintiff Plain Local School District Board of Education. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Proposed Order) (Martinsek, Amanda)
December 2, 2019 NOTICE of Hearing - Telephone Status Conference set for 12/2/2019 at 3:00 p.m. before Judge Michael H. Watson. (jk)
November 29, 2019 Filing 9 NOTICE of Appearance by Julie M Pfeiffer for Defendant Mike DeWine (Pfeiffer, Julie)
November 27, 2019 Filing 8 Corporate Disclosure Statement by Defendant Village of Hills And Dales. (Zurakowski, Scott)
November 27, 2019 Filing 7 NOTICE of Appearance by Scott M. Zurakowski and Owen J. Rarric for Defendant Village of Hills And Dales (Zurakowski, Scott) Modified text on 12/2/2019 (ew).
November 22, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 6 RELATED CASE MEMORANDUM ORDER: The Judges agree that this case and case number 2:19-cv-4246 ARE related. Case reassigned to Judge Michael H. Watson and Magistrate Judge Chelsey M. Vascura for all further proceedings. Signed by Judge Sarah D. Morrison & Judge Michael H. Watson on 11/22/2019. (kk2)
November 22, 2019 Filing 5 NOTICE of Appearance by Stephan P. Babik for Defendants Frank C Braden, William S Cline, Samuel J Ferruccio, Jr, Dimitrios Pousoulides (Babik, Stephan)
November 22, 2019 Filing 3 NOTICE of Amended Civil Cover Sheet re #1 Complaint by Plaintiff Plain Local School District Board of Education (Edwards, William) Modified text on 11/22/2019 (kk2)
November 21, 2019 Filing 2 Notice by Clerk of Southern District of Ohio of Pro Hac Vice Rules as to Attorney Trevor J Hardy (kk2)
November 20, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against All Defendants ( Filing fee $ 400 paid - receipt number: 0648-7209737), filed by Plain Local School District Board of Education. [ELECTION ISSUE(S) CITED] (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Verification of Brent May, #2 Exhibit Ohio Revised Code 3311.242, #3 Civil Cover Sheet) (Martinsek, Amanda) Modified text on 11/21/2019 (kk2)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Ohio Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Plain Local School District Board of Education v. DeWine et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: reginald wilkinson
Represented By: Frank J Reed, Jr.
Represented By: Stephen Eric Chappelear
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Meryl Johnson
Represented By: Frank J Reed, Jr.
Represented By: Stephen Eric Chappelear
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Jenny Kilgore
Represented By: Stephen Eric Chappelear
Represented By: Frank J Reed, Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Antoinette Miranda
Represented By: Stephen Eric Chappelear
Represented By: Frank J Reed, Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Kirsten Hill
Represented By: Stephen Eric Chappelear
Represented By: Frank J Reed, Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Samuel Ferruccio
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Laura Kohler
Represented By: Stephen Eric Chappelear
Represented By: Frank J Reed, Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Charlotte McGuire
Represented By: Stephen Eric Chappelear
Represented By: Frank J Reed, Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Nick Owens
Represented By: Frank J Reed, Jr.
Represented By: Stephen Eric Chappelear
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: William Cline
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Stephanie Dodd
Represented By: Frank J Reed, Jr.
Represented By: Stephen Eric Chappelear
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Lisa Woods
Represented By: Stephen Eric Chappelear
Represented By: Frank J Reed, Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Dimitrios Pousoulides
Represented By: Stephan P. Babik
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Village of Hills And Dales
Represented By: Joseph J. Pasquarella
Represented By: Owen J Rarric
Represented By: Scott M Zurakowski
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Paolo Demaria
Represented By: Stephen Eric Chappelear
Represented By: Frank J Reed, Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: steve dackin
Represented By: Frank J Reed, Jr.
Represented By: Stephen Eric Chappelear
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: mike toal
Represented By: Frank J Reed, Jr.
Represented By: Stephen Eric Chappelear
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Eric Poklar
Represented By: Frank J Reed, Jr.
Represented By: Stephen Eric Chappelear
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Sarah Fowler
Represented By: Frank J Reed, Jr.
Represented By: Stephen Eric Chappelear
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Linda Haycock
Represented By: Stephen Eric Chappelear
Represented By: Frank J Reed, Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Mike DeWine
Represented By: Stephen Eric Chappelear
Represented By: Frank J Reed, Jr.
Represented By: Julie M Pfeiffer
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: martha manchester
Represented By: Frank J Reed, Jr.
Represented By: Stephen Eric Chappelear
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Frank Braden
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Mark Lamoncha
Represented By: Frank J Reed, Jr.
Represented By: Stephen Eric Chappelear
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Cindy Collins
Represented By: Frank J Reed, Jr.
Represented By: Stephen Eric Chappelear
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: John Hagan
Represented By: Frank J Reed, Jr.
Represented By: Stephen Eric Chappelear
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Samuel J Ferruccio, Jr
Represented By: Stephan P. Babik
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: William S Cline
Represented By: Stephan P. Babik
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Frank C Braden
Represented By: Stephan P. Babik
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Plain Local School District Board of Education
Represented By: Amanda Martinsek
Represented By: Timothy J Downing
Represented By: Rachael Leigh Rodman
Represented By: William D Edwards
Represented By: Rex A Littrell
Represented By: Trevor J. Hardy
Represented By: Daniela Paez
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: C.H.
Represented By: Timothy J Downing
Represented By: Rachael Leigh Rodman
Represented By: William D Edwards
Represented By: Rex A Littrell
Represented By: Trevor J. Hardy
Represented By: Amanda Martinsek
Represented By: Daniela Paez
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: B.H.
Represented By: Timothy J Downing
Represented By: Rachael Leigh Rodman
Represented By: William D Edwards
Represented By: Rex A Littrell
Represented By: Trevor J. Hardy
Represented By: Amanda Martinsek
Represented By: Daniela Paez
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: J.L.
Represented By: Timothy J Downing
Represented By: Rachael Leigh Rodman
Represented By: William D Edwards
Represented By: Rex A Littrell
Represented By: Trevor J. Hardy
Represented By: Amanda Martinsek
Represented By: Daniela Paez
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: C.L.
Represented By: Timothy J Downing
Represented By: Rachael Leigh Rodman
Represented By: William D Edwards
Represented By: Rex A Littrell
Represented By: Trevor J. Hardy
Represented By: Amanda Martinsek
Represented By: Daniela Paez
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?