Caskey v. Fenton et al
Plaintiff: Terry Scott Caskey
Defendant: The City of Columbus, Nathan Fenton and Charles R Harshbarger
Case Number: 2:2020cv01549
Filed: March 25, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of Ohio
Presiding Judge: Kimberly A Jolson
Referring Judge: Algenon L Marbley
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Other
Cause of Action: 42 U.S.C. ยง 1983
Jury Demanded By: Both
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on June 4, 2024. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
May 22, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 8 ANSWER to #1 Complaint with Jury Demand filed by All Defendants. (Noble, Andria)
May 21, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 7 NOTICE of Hearing: Pretrial Conference set for 6/25/2020 @ 10:30 AM before Magistrate Judge Kimberly A. Jolson. (jr)
May 20, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 6 NOTICE of Appearance by William Anthony Sperlazza for Defendants Nathan Fenton, Charles R Harshbarger, The City of Columbus (Sperlazza, William)
May 20, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 5 NOTICE of Appearance by Andria C. Noble for Defendants Nathan Fenton, Charles R Harshbarger, The City of Columbus (Noble, Andria)
April 1, 2020 Opinion or Order Set/Reset Deadlines: #1 , #2 and #3 Waivers were mailed on 3/25/2020. Answers due as follows: Nathan Fenton answer due 5/24/2020; Charles R Harshbarger answer due 5/24/2020; The City of Columbus answer due 5/24/2020. (jlk)
March 27, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 4 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed. Waiver sent to The City of Columbus on 3/26/2020, answer due 5/26/2020. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Notice of Lawsuit & Request to Waive Service of Summons) (D'Aurora, Jack)
March 27, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 3 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed. Waiver sent to Charles R Harshbarger on 3/26/2020, answer due 5/26/2020. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Notice of Lawsuit & Request to Waive Service of Summons) (D'Aurora, Jack)
March 27, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 2 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed. Waiver sent to Nathan Fenton on 3/26/2020, answer due 5/26/2020. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Notice of Lawsuit & Request to Waive Service of Summons) (D'Aurora, Jack)
March 26, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 1 COMPLAINT with JURY DEMAND against All Defendants, filed by Terry Scott Caskey. (D'Aurora, Jack)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Ohio Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Caskey v. Fenton et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Terry Scott Caskey
Represented By: Jack D'Aurora
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: The City of Columbus
Represented By: Andria C. Noble
Represented By: William Anthony Sperlazza
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Nathan Fenton
Represented By: Andria C. Noble
Represented By: William Anthony Sperlazza
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Charles R Harshbarger
Represented By: Andria C. Noble
Represented By: William Anthony Sperlazza
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?