Patel et al v. United States of America et al
Plaintiff: LILABEN MAHESHKUMAR PATEL and JAGDISH PATEL
Defendant: Chad F Wolf, Kenneth T Cuccinelli, STACY L BESECKER, ANNA CHAU, United States Of America, Kenneth T. Cuccinelli, Chad F. Wolf and Stacy L. Besecker
Case Number: 2:2020cv04143
Filed: August 13, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of Ohio
Presiding Judge: Elizabeth Preston Deavers
Referring Judge: Michael H Watson
Nature of Suit: Other Immigration Actions
Cause of Action: 05:702
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on October 8, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
October 8, 2020 ***Civil Case Terminated. (ew)
October 8, 2020 Filing 12 NOTICE of Voluntary Dismissal by Plaintiffs Jagdish Patel, Lilaben Maheshkumar Patel (Yazdani, Payam)
September 30, 2020 Filing 11 SUMMONS Returned Executed as to Defendant Stacy L. Besecker. Stacy L. Besecker served on 8/21/2020, answer due 10/20/2020. (Attachments: #1 Certified Mail Receipt, Stacey Besecker, USCIS Columbus Field Office Director, #2 Certified Mail Receipt Return, William P. Barr, Attorney General of the United States, #3 Certified Mail Receipt Return, David DeVillers, United States Attorney) (Yazdani, Payam)
September 30, 2020 Filing 10 SUMMONS Returned Executed as to Defendant Anna Chau. Anna Chau served on 8/21/2020, answer due 10/20/2020. (Attachments: #1 Certified Mail Receipt, Anna Chau, USCIS District Director, #2 Certified Mail Receipt Return, William P. Barr, Attorney General of the United States, #3 Certified Mail Receipt Return, David DeVillers, United States Attorney) (Yazdani, Payam)
September 30, 2020 Filing 9 SUMMONS Returned Executed as to Defendant Kenneth T. Cuccinelli. Kenneth T. Cuccinelli served on 8/21/2020, answer due 10/20/2020. (Attachments: #1 Certified Mail Receipt, Kenneth Cuccinelli, Acting Director of USCIS, #2 Certified Mail Receipt Return, William P. Barr, Attorney General of the United States, #3 Certified Mail Receipt Return, David DeVillers, United States Attorney) (Yazdani, Payam)
September 30, 2020 Filing 8 SUMMONS Returned Executed as to Defendant Chad F. Wolf. Chad F. Wolf served on 8/21/2020, answer due 10/20/2020. (Attachments: #1 Certified Mail Receipt, Chad F. Wolf, Acting Secretary of Homeland Security, #2 Certified Mail Receipt Return, William P. Barr, Attorney General of the United States, #3 Certified Mail Receipt Return, David DeVillers, United States Attorney) (Yazdani, Payam)
September 30, 2020 Filing 7 SUMMONS Returned Executed as to Defendant United States of America. United States of America served on 8/21/2020, answer due 10/20/2020. (Attachments: #1 Certified Mail Receipt Return, William P. Barr, Attorney General of the United States, #2 Certified Mail Receipt Return, David DeVillers, United States Attorney) (Yazdani, Payam)
September 28, 2020 Filing 6 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Plaintiffs Jagdish Patel, Lilaben Maheshkumar Patel (Yazdani, Payam)
August 17, 2020 Filing 5 Summons Issued as to Chad F. Wolf. (ew)
August 14, 2020 Filing 4 REQUEST for Issuance of Summons. Chad F. Wolf (Yazdani, Payam)
August 14, 2020 Filing 3 NOTICE of Non-Issuance of Summons. (Attachments: #1 Summons Form - L. Francis Cissna) (ew)
August 14, 2020 Filing 2 Summons Issued as to Kenneth T. Cuccinelli, Stacy L. Besecker, Anna Chau, and and U.S. Attorney General. (ew)
August 13, 2020 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against All Defendants ( Filing fee $ 400 paid - receipt number: 0648-7606566), filed by JAGDISH PATEL, LILABEN MAHESHKUMAR PATEL. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit, #2 Civil Cover Sheet, #3 Summons Form Barr, #4 Summons Form Besecker, #5 Summons Form Cuccinelli, #6 Summons Form Wolf, #7 Summons Form Chau) (Yazdani, Payam) (Attachments 2-7 replaced to correct combined PDF error on 8/14/2020) (ew).

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Ohio Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Patel et al v. United States of America et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Chad F Wolf
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Kenneth T Cuccinelli
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: STACY L BESECKER
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: ANNA CHAU
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: United States Of America
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Kenneth T. Cuccinelli
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Chad F. Wolf
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Stacy L. Besecker
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: LILABEN MAHESHKUMAR PATEL
Represented By: Payam Yazdani
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: JAGDISH PATEL
Represented By: Payam Yazdani
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?