Joseph Mercurio Produce LLC v. Mt Perry Foods, Inc.
Plaintiff: Joseph Mercurio Produce LLC
Defendant: Thomas Martin, Reg Martin, Mt Perry Foods, Inc. and John R Largent
Case Number: 2:2020cv04556
Filed: September 2, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of Ohio
Presiding Judge: Elizabeth Preston Deavers
Referring Judge: James L Graham
Nature of Suit: Agriculture Acts
Cause of Action: 07:499
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on October 29, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
October 29, 2020 ***Civil Case Terminated. (ds)
October 28, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 17 ORDER RELEASING FUNDS AND DISMISSING CASE. Signed by Judge James L. Graham on 10/28/2020. (ds)
October 28, 2020 NOTICE: The PPTC set for 10/29/2020 at 10:00 AM is VACATED. (sln)
October 15, 2020 Filing 16 STIPULATION (Joint) by Plaintiff Joseph Mercurio Produce LLC. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order Release Funds and Dismiss Case) (Price, William)
October 15, 2020 Filing 15 SUMMONS Returned Executed as to Defendant Mt Perry Foods, Inc.. Mt Perry Foods, Inc. served on 9/9/2020, answer due 10/13/2020. (Price, William)
October 1, 2020 Filing 14 NOTICE of Hearing: Preliminary Pretrial Conference set for 10/29/2020 10:00 AM in Teleconference before Magistrate Judge Elizabeth Preston Deavers. (sln)
October 1, 2020 Set/Reset Deadlines per #13 STIPULATION TO MOVE OR PLEAD UNTIL OCTOBER 13, 2020 by Defendants John R Largent, Reg Martin, Thomas Martin, Mt Perry Foods, Inc. : John R Largent answer due 10/13/2020; Reg Martin answer due 10/13/2020; Thomas Martin answer due 10/13/2020; Mt Perry Foods, Inc. answer due 10/13/2020. (mdr)
September 30, 2020 Filing 13 STIPULATION TO MOVE OR PLEAD UNTIL OCTOBER 13, 2020 by Defendants John R Largent, Reg Martin, Thomas Martin, Mt Perry Foods, Inc.. (Barrett, David)
September 14, 2020 Funds deposited to the Court's Registry by Defendant Mt Perry Foods, Inc. pursuant to #8 : $32,642.23. Receipt Number: 200COL063109 (ew)
September 9, 2020 Filing 12 Summons Issued as to Mt Perry Foods, Inc., Thomas Martin, Reg Martin, and John R Largent (kk2)
September 9, 2020 Filing 11 REQUEST for Issuance of Summons. Corrected Summons Attached (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Exhibits A to G, #2 Summons Form Defendant Mt Perry, #3 Summons Form Defendant T Martin, #4 Summons Form Defendant R Martin, #5 Summons Form Defendant Largent) (Price, William)
September 8, 2020 Filing 10 NOTICE of Filing Corrected Summons re #9 Notice of Non-Issuance of Summons by Plaintiff Joseph Mercurio Produce LLC (Price, William) Modified text on 9/9/2020 (kk2)
September 3, 2020 Filing 9 NOTICE OF NON-ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS by Clerk of Southern District of Ohio (Attachments: #1 Summons Form Mt Perry Foods, #2 Summons Form Thomas Martin, #3 Summons Form Reg Martin, #4 Summons Form John Largent) (kk2)
September 2, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 8 TEMPORARY RESTRAINING ORDER. Signed by Judge James L. Graham on 9/2/2020. (ds) Modified on 9/3/2020 to correct signature date (kk2)
September 2, 2020 Filing 7 NOTICE of Corrected Exhibit C re #5 MOTION for Preliminary Injunction , #4 MOTION for Temporary Restraining Order by Plaintiff Joseph Mercurio Produce LLC (Price, William) Modified text on 9/3/2020 (kk2)
September 2, 2020 Filing 6 MOTION for Temporary Restraining Order Attorney Rule 65 Certification by Plaintiff Joseph Mercurio Produce LLC. (Price, William)
September 2, 2020 Filing 5 MOTION for Preliminary Injunction by Plaintiff Joseph Mercurio Produce LLC. (Attachments: #1 Supplement, #2 Affidavit, #3 Exhibit, #4 Exhibit, #5 Exhibit) (Price, William)
September 2, 2020 Filing 4 MOTION for Temporary Restraining Order by Plaintiff Joseph Mercurio Produce LLC. (Attachments: #1 Supplement Memo in Support, #2 Affidavit, #3 Exhibit, #4 Exhibit, #5 Exhibit, #6 Text of Proposed Order) (Price, William)
September 2, 2020 Filing 3 Corporate Disclosure Statement by Plaintiff Joseph Mercurio Produce LLC. (Price, William) Modified text on 9/3/2020 (kk2)
September 2, 2020 Filing 2 COMPLAINT against All Defendants, filed by Joseph Mercurio Produce LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibits A to G, #2 Civil Cover Sheet, #3 Summons Form Mt Perry, #4 Summons Form Thomas Martin, #5 Summons Form Reg Martin, #6 Summons Form John Largent) (Price, William) Modified on 9/3/2020 (kk2)
September 2, 2020 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against All Defendants ( Filing fee $ 400 paid - receipt number: 0648-7637516), filed by Joseph Mercurio Produce LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibits A to G) (Price, William) Modified on 9/3/2020 (kk2)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Ohio Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Joseph Mercurio Produce LLC v. Mt Perry Foods, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Thomas Martin
Represented By: David Carroll Barrett, Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Reg Martin
Represented By: David Carroll Barrett, Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Mt Perry Foods, Inc.
Represented By: David Carroll Barrett, Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: John R Largent
Represented By: David Carroll Barrett, Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Joseph Mercurio Produce LLC
Represented By: William Evan Price, II
Represented By: Anthony J Sugar
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?