Jarrell v. National Personnel Records Center et al

Plaintiff: Stephen Paul Jarrell
Defendant: National Personnel Records Center, United States Attorney and United States Attorney General
Case Number: 3:2011cv00434
Filed: December 9, 2011
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of Ohio
Office: Dayton Office
County: CLARK
Presiding Judge: Timothy S. Black
Presiding Judge: Sharon L Ovington
Nature of Suit: Freedom of Information Act
Cause of Action: 05:552
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
October 24, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 30 CLERK'S JUDGMENT with Attached Notice of Disposal. Signed on 10/24/2013. (pb1)
September 23, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 27 REPORT AND RECOMMENDATIONS recommending that 18 Plaintiff Stephen Jarrell's Motion for Summary Judgmentbe DENIED; 22 Defendant National Personnel Records Center's Motion for Summary Judgment be GRANTED; and, this case be terminated on the docket of this Court. Objections to R&R due by 10/10/2013. Signed by Magistrate Judge Sharon L Ovington on 9/23/13. (mm1)
April 8, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 23 PRO SE NOTICE OF MOTION FOR SUMMARY JUDGMENT. Signed by Chief Magistrate Judge Sharon L Ovington on 4/8/13. (kje1)
March 6, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 6 PRELIMINARY PRETRIAL CONFERENCE ORDER: In accordance with mandates of Fed. R. Civ. P.26(f), the parties must meet and confer in order to file the 26(f) Report of parties by May 7, 2012. Signed by Magistrate Judge Sharon L Ovington on 3/6/12. (cib1)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Ohio Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Jarrell v. National Personnel Records Center et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: National Personnel Records Center
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: United States Attorney
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: United States Attorney General
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Stephen Paul Jarrell
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?