Coles v. National Labor Relations Board et al
Plaintiff: Anthony Coles
Defendant: National Labor Relations Board, Mancor Industries and I Force
Case Number: 3:2013cv00353
Filed: October 15, 2013
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of Ohio
Office: Dayton Office
County: MONTGOMERY
Presiding Judge: Timothy S. Black
Presiding Judge: Michael J Newman
Nature of Suit: Review or Appeal of Agency Decision
Cause of Action: 29:151
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
March 26, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 34 CLERK'S JUDGMENT AFFIRMING DECISION AND ORDER 33 . (mr1)
February 14, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 30 REPORT AND RECOMMENDATIONS - The Court RECOMMENDS that: 1. Defendants motions to dismiss (docs. 16 , 26 ) be GRANTED; and 2. This case be DISMISSED. Objections to R&R due by 3/3/2014. Signed by Magistrate Judge Michael J Newman on 02/14/14. (pb1)
December 31, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 22 ORDER DENYING PLAINTIFF'S REQUEST FOR AN ENTRY OF DEFAULT AGAINST DEFENDANT MANCOR INDUSTRIES (Doc. 19 ). Signed by Judge Timothy S. Black on 12/31/2013. (mr1)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Ohio Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Coles v. National Labor Relations Board et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Anthony Coles
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: National Labor Relations Board
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Mancor Industries
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: I Force
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?