Jarrell v. Army Review Boards Agency et al
Plaintiff: Richard Maurice Jarrell
Defendant: Army Review Boards Agency, United States Attorney, National Personnel Records Center and United States Attorney General
Case Number: 3:2019cv00349
Filed: November 6, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of Ohio
Presiding Judge: Sharon L Ovington
Referring Judge: Thomas M Rose
Nature of Suit: Freedom of Information Act
Cause of Action: 05:552
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on March 6, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
December 3, 2019 Filing 5 Summons Issued as to Army Review Boards Agency, National Personnel Records Center, United States Attorney, United States Attorney General, U.S. Attorney and U.S. Attorney General (pb)
December 3, 2019 Filing 4 REDACTED COMPLAINT against Army Review Boards Agency, National Personnel Records Center, United States Attorney, United States Attorney General, filed by Richard Maurice Jarrell. (pb)
December 3, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 3 ORDER - 1. Plaintiffs Motion to File Complaint under Seal (Doc. #2 ) is GRANTED in part; 2. The Clerk of Court is directed to redact Plaintiffs and his brothers identifiers from Plaintiffs Complaint and attached Exhibits; 3. The Clerk of Court is directed to separately docket Plaintiffs Complaint and its attached pages with the identifiers redacted; and 4. Plaintiffs Motion to File Complaint under Seal (Doc. #2 ) is otherwise DENIED. Signed by Magistrate Judge Sharon L. Ovington on 12/3/19. (pb)(This document has been sent by regular mail to the party(ies) listed in the NEF that did not receive electronic notification.)
November 27, 2019 Opinion or Order NOTATION ORDER - Upon initial review of Plaintiff's pro se Complaint under 28 U.S.C. 1915(e),it is not presently subject to dismissal. Accordingly, the Court DIRECTS the United States Marshal to serve a copy of the Complaint, summons, and this Order upon the named defendants as directed by Plaintiff. All costs of service shall be advanced by the United States. Plaintiff must serve the named defendants - or their attorney in the event an attorney's appearance is entered in the record - with a copy of every document submitted for consideration by the Court. Plaintiff shall include with the original paper to be filed with the Clerk of Court a certificate stating the date and verifying that Plaintiff mailed a true and correct copy of any document to defendants or their attorney(s). Any paper received by a District Judge or Magistrate Judge that has not been filed with the Clerk of Court or that fails to include a certificate of service will be disregarded by the Court. Plaintiff must inform the Clerk of Court promptly of any changes of address which he has during the pendency of this lawsuit. Failure to do so may result in dismissal of his case for failure to prosecute. Signed by Magistrate Judge Sharon L. Ovington on 11-27-19. (slo1)(This document has been sent by regular mail to the party(ies) listed in the NEF that did not receive electronic notification.)
November 7, 2019 Opinion or Order NOTATION ORDER granting #1 Plaintiff's Motion for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis. The Clerk of Court is directed to hold Service of Summons pending initial review of the Complaint. Signed by Magistrate Judge Sharon L. Ovington on 11-7-19. (mcm)(This document has been sent by regular mail to the party(ies) listed in the NEF that did not receive electronic notification.)
November 6, 2019 Filing 2 MOTION to File Complaint Under Seal by Plaintiff Richard Maurice Jarrell. (kma)
November 6, 2019 Filing 1 MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis (The Office of the Clerk is in possession of all necessary service documents) by Plaintiff Richard Maurice Jarrell. (Attachments: #1 Complaint, #2 Civil Cover Sheet, #3 Summons Forms, #4 US Marshal Forms) (kma)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Ohio Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Jarrell v. Army Review Boards Agency et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Army Review Boards Agency
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: United States Attorney
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: National Personnel Records Center
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: United States Attorney General
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Richard Maurice Jarrell
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?