Blocker et al v. ConocoPhillips Company

Plaintiff: James Blocker, Jamie Blocker, Corey B Bolding, Amanda E Bolding, Hai Bui, Stephanie Bui, Larry K Coshow, Julie K Coshow, Solon B Davis, Linda Davis, Jason A Davis, Amber L Davis, Brett Dawkins, Dianne Dawkins, Glenn and Kathy Edgin Trust, Keith A Goggans, Jason Gooch, Tiffany Gooch, James H Goodin, Rachelle D Goodin, Alven Jones, Gail K Jones, Joe M Jones, Doli K Jones, Tim Jones, Patti Jones, Kermati Family Trust, Fernando Lopez, Stephanie Lopez, Hue T Luong, Ching H Luong, Huynh Cong Mai, Kelly P Mai, Curt McMurphy, Megan McMurphy, Jonathan Meier, Megan Meier, Greg Menifee, Michelle Menifee, Stephanie L Naifeh, Khanh V Pham, Thuy T Ngo, Steve Plumbtree, Brenda Plumbtree, Karen Ross and David Wilson Trust, Ryan P Scarlett, Courtney D Scarlett, Stacy E Scheffler, Sharon S Smeltzer, Sunil Thomas, Jogi Thomas, Michael Williams and Leberta Williams
Defendant: ConocoPhillips Company
Case Number: 5:2017cv00248
Filed: March 7, 2017
Court: US District Court for the Western District of Oklahoma
Office: Oklahoma City Office
County: Oklahoma
Presiding Judge: Timothy D. DeGiusti
Nature of Suit: Torts to Land
Cause of Action: 28:1441
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
May 14, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 282 ORDER denying 160 Motion to Strike and 169 Motion to Strike. Signed by Honorable Charles Goodwin on 05/14/2019. (jb)
May 6, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 249 OPINION AND ORDER granting in part and denying in part 131 Motion for Partial Summary Judgment. The Court grants summary judgment in favor of Defendant on Plaintiffs' private nuisance claims and Plaintiffs' negligence claims predicated on the duty to warn. The Motion is denied in all other respects. Signed by Honorable Charles Goodwin on 05/06/2019. (jb)
May 22, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 72 ORDER denying 54 Defendant's Motion to Reconsider Prior Order 48 Order and Reopen Limited Fact Discovery and Brief in Support; striking as moot 58 Motion for Leave to File Supplement to Motion to Reconsider. Signed by Honorable Timothy D. DeGiusti on 5/22/2018. (mb)
May 9, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 71 ORDER granting 69 Motion to Consolidate Cases. The above-styled cases are consolidated for all purposes, including trial. The deadlines in the Courts Order dated April 23, 2018 will remain in effect as more fully set out. Plaintiffs actions shall p roceed as a single case under Case No. CIV-17-248-D and all future filings shall occur only in Case No. CIV-17-248-D, unless otherwise ordered. The Clerk shall administratively close Case No. CIV-18-316-D without prejudice to a future reopening. Signed by Honorable Timothy D. DeGiusti on 5/9/2018. (ml)
February 8, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 48 ORDER granting 39 Plaintiffs' Motion to Preclude Service of Subpoenas to Produce Records on Non-Parties. Signed by Honorable Timothy D. DeGiusti on 2/8/2018. (mb)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Oklahoma Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Blocker et al v. ConocoPhillips Company
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: ConocoPhillips Company
Represented By: Ellen A Adams
Represented By: John M Krattiger
Represented By: Terry D Ragsdale
Represented By: Scott R Rowland
Represented By: Amy M Stipe
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: James Blocker
Represented By: Mark D Coldiron
Represented By: Stephen C Gelnar
Represented By: Stephen L Jantzen
Represented By: Corey A Neller
Represented By: Patrick R Pearce, Jr
Represented By: Phillip Whaley
Represented By: Phillip G Whaley
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Jamie Blocker
Represented By: Mark D Coldiron
Represented By: Stephen C Gelnar
Represented By: Stephen L Jantzen
Represented By: Corey A Neller
Represented By: Patrick R Pearce, Jr
Represented By: Phillip Whaley
Represented By: Phillip G Whaley
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Corey B Bolding
Represented By: Mark D Coldiron
Represented By: Stephen C Gelnar
Represented By: Stephen L Jantzen
Represented By: Corey A Neller
Represented By: Patrick R Pearce, Jr
Represented By: Phillip Whaley
Represented By: Phillip G Whaley
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Amanda E Bolding
Represented By: Mark D Coldiron
Represented By: Stephen C Gelnar
Represented By: Stephen L Jantzen
Represented By: Corey A Neller
Represented By: Patrick R Pearce, Jr
Represented By: Phillip Whaley
Represented By: Phillip G Whaley
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Hai Bui
Represented By: Mark D Coldiron
Represented By: Stephen C Gelnar
Represented By: Stephen L Jantzen
Represented By: Corey A Neller
Represented By: Patrick R Pearce, Jr
Represented By: Phillip Whaley
Represented By: Phillip G Whaley
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Stephanie Bui
Represented By: Mark D Coldiron
Represented By: Stephen C Gelnar
Represented By: Stephen L Jantzen
Represented By: Corey A Neller
Represented By: Patrick R Pearce, Jr
Represented By: Phillip Whaley
Represented By: Phillip G Whaley
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Larry K Coshow
Represented By: Mark D Coldiron
Represented By: Stephen C Gelnar
Represented By: Stephen L Jantzen
Represented By: Corey A Neller
Represented By: Patrick R Pearce, Jr
Represented By: Phillip Whaley
Represented By: Phillip G Whaley
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Julie K Coshow
Represented By: Mark D Coldiron
Represented By: Stephen C Gelnar
Represented By: Stephen L Jantzen
Represented By: Corey A Neller
Represented By: Patrick R Pearce, Jr
Represented By: Phillip Whaley
Represented By: Phillip G Whaley
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Solon B Davis
Represented By: Mark D Coldiron
Represented By: Stephen C Gelnar
Represented By: Stephen L Jantzen
Represented By: Corey A Neller
Represented By: Patrick R Pearce, Jr
Represented By: Phillip Whaley
Represented By: Phillip G Whaley
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Linda Davis
Represented By: Mark D Coldiron
Represented By: Stephen C Gelnar
Represented By: Stephen L Jantzen
Represented By: Corey A Neller
Represented By: Patrick R Pearce, Jr
Represented By: Phillip Whaley
Represented By: Phillip G Whaley
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Jason A Davis
Represented By: Mark D Coldiron
Represented By: Stephen C Gelnar
Represented By: Stephen L Jantzen
Represented By: Corey A Neller
Represented By: Patrick R Pearce, Jr
Represented By: Phillip Whaley
Represented By: Phillip G Whaley
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Amber L Davis
Represented By: Mark D Coldiron
Represented By: Stephen C Gelnar
Represented By: Stephen L Jantzen
Represented By: Corey A Neller
Represented By: Patrick R Pearce, Jr
Represented By: Phillip Whaley
Represented By: Phillip G Whaley
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Brett Dawkins
Represented By: Mark D Coldiron
Represented By: Stephen C Gelnar
Represented By: Stephen L Jantzen
Represented By: Corey A Neller
Represented By: Patrick R Pearce, Jr
Represented By: Phillip Whaley
Represented By: Phillip G Whaley
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Dianne Dawkins
Represented By: Mark D Coldiron
Represented By: Stephen C Gelnar
Represented By: Stephen L Jantzen
Represented By: Corey A Neller
Represented By: Patrick R Pearce, Jr
Represented By: Phillip Whaley
Represented By: Phillip G Whaley
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Glenn and Kathy Edgin Trust
Represented By: Mark D Coldiron
Represented By: Stephen C Gelnar
Represented By: Stephen L Jantzen
Represented By: Corey A Neller
Represented By: Patrick R Pearce, Jr
Represented By: Phillip Whaley
Represented By: Phillip G Whaley
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Keith A Goggans
Represented By: Mark D Coldiron
Represented By: Stephen C Gelnar
Represented By: Stephen L Jantzen
Represented By: Corey A Neller
Represented By: Patrick R Pearce, Jr
Represented By: Phillip Whaley
Represented By: Phillip G Whaley
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Jason Gooch
Represented By: Mark D Coldiron
Represented By: Stephen C Gelnar
Represented By: Stephen L Jantzen
Represented By: Corey A Neller
Represented By: Patrick R Pearce, Jr
Represented By: Phillip Whaley
Represented By: Phillip G Whaley
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Tiffany Gooch
Represented By: Mark D Coldiron
Represented By: Stephen C Gelnar
Represented By: Stephen L Jantzen
Represented By: Corey A Neller
Represented By: Patrick R Pearce, Jr
Represented By: Phillip Whaley
Represented By: Phillip G Whaley
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: James H Goodin
Represented By: Mark D Coldiron
Represented By: Stephen C Gelnar
Represented By: Stephen L Jantzen
Represented By: Corey A Neller
Represented By: Patrick R Pearce, Jr
Represented By: Phillip Whaley
Represented By: Phillip G Whaley
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Rachelle D Goodin
Represented By: Mark D Coldiron
Represented By: Stephen C Gelnar
Represented By: Stephen L Jantzen
Represented By: Corey A Neller
Represented By: Patrick R Pearce, Jr
Represented By: Phillip Whaley
Represented By: Phillip G Whaley
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Alven Jones
Represented By: Mark D Coldiron
Represented By: Stephen C Gelnar
Represented By: Stephen L Jantzen
Represented By: Corey A Neller
Represented By: Patrick R Pearce, Jr
Represented By: Phillip Whaley
Represented By: Phillip G Whaley
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Gail K Jones
Represented By: Mark D Coldiron
Represented By: Stephen C Gelnar
Represented By: Stephen L Jantzen
Represented By: Corey A Neller
Represented By: Patrick R Pearce, Jr
Represented By: Phillip Whaley
Represented By: Phillip G Whaley
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Joe M Jones
Represented By: Mark D Coldiron
Represented By: Stephen C Gelnar
Represented By: Stephen L Jantzen
Represented By: Corey A Neller
Represented By: Patrick R Pearce, Jr
Represented By: Phillip Whaley
Represented By: Phillip G Whaley
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Doli K Jones
Represented By: Mark D Coldiron
Represented By: Stephen C Gelnar
Represented By: Stephen L Jantzen
Represented By: Corey A Neller
Represented By: Patrick R Pearce, Jr
Represented By: Phillip Whaley
Represented By: Phillip G Whaley
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Tim Jones
Represented By: Mark D Coldiron
Represented By: Stephen C Gelnar
Represented By: Stephen L Jantzen
Represented By: Corey A Neller
Represented By: Patrick R Pearce, Jr
Represented By: Phillip Whaley
Represented By: Phillip G Whaley
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Patti Jones
Represented By: Mark D Coldiron
Represented By: Stephen C Gelnar
Represented By: Stephen L Jantzen
Represented By: Corey A Neller
Represented By: Patrick R Pearce, Jr
Represented By: Phillip Whaley
Represented By: Phillip G Whaley
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Kermati Family Trust
Represented By: Mark D Coldiron
Represented By: Stephen C Gelnar
Represented By: Stephen L Jantzen
Represented By: Corey A Neller
Represented By: Patrick R Pearce, Jr
Represented By: Phillip Whaley
Represented By: Phillip G Whaley
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Fernando Lopez
Represented By: Mark D Coldiron
Represented By: Stephen C Gelnar
Represented By: Stephen L Jantzen
Represented By: Corey A Neller
Represented By: Patrick R Pearce, Jr
Represented By: Phillip Whaley
Represented By: Phillip G Whaley
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Stephanie Lopez
Represented By: Mark D Coldiron
Represented By: Stephen C Gelnar
Represented By: Stephen L Jantzen
Represented By: Corey A Neller
Represented By: Patrick R Pearce, Jr
Represented By: Phillip Whaley
Represented By: Phillip G Whaley
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Hue T Luong
Represented By: Mark D Coldiron
Represented By: Stephen C Gelnar
Represented By: Stephen L Jantzen
Represented By: Corey A Neller
Represented By: Patrick R Pearce, Jr
Represented By: Phillip Whaley
Represented By: Phillip G Whaley
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Ching H Luong
Represented By: Mark D Coldiron
Represented By: Stephen C Gelnar
Represented By: Stephen L Jantzen
Represented By: Corey A Neller
Represented By: Patrick R Pearce, Jr
Represented By: Phillip Whaley
Represented By: Phillip G Whaley
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Huynh Cong Mai
Represented By: Mark D Coldiron
Represented By: Stephen C Gelnar
Represented By: Stephen L Jantzen
Represented By: Corey A Neller
Represented By: Patrick R Pearce, Jr
Represented By: Phillip Whaley
Represented By: Phillip G Whaley
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Kelly P Mai
Represented By: Mark D Coldiron
Represented By: Stephen C Gelnar
Represented By: Stephen L Jantzen
Represented By: Corey A Neller
Represented By: Patrick R Pearce, Jr
Represented By: Phillip Whaley
Represented By: Phillip G Whaley
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Curt McMurphy
Represented By: Mark D Coldiron
Represented By: Stephen C Gelnar
Represented By: Stephen L Jantzen
Represented By: Corey A Neller
Represented By: Patrick R Pearce, Jr
Represented By: Phillip Whaley
Represented By: Phillip G Whaley
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Megan McMurphy
Represented By: Mark D Coldiron
Represented By: Stephen C Gelnar
Represented By: Stephen L Jantzen
Represented By: Corey A Neller
Represented By: Patrick R Pearce, Jr
Represented By: Phillip Whaley
Represented By: Phillip G Whaley
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Jonathan Meier
Represented By: Mark D Coldiron
Represented By: Stephen C Gelnar
Represented By: Stephen L Jantzen
Represented By: Corey A Neller
Represented By: Patrick R Pearce, Jr
Represented By: Phillip Whaley
Represented By: Phillip G Whaley
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Megan Meier
Represented By: Mark D Coldiron
Represented By: Stephen C Gelnar
Represented By: Stephen L Jantzen
Represented By: Corey A Neller
Represented By: Patrick R Pearce, Jr
Represented By: Phillip Whaley
Represented By: Phillip G Whaley
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Greg Menifee
Represented By: Mark D Coldiron
Represented By: Stephen C Gelnar
Represented By: Stephen L Jantzen
Represented By: Corey A Neller
Represented By: Patrick R Pearce, Jr
Represented By: Phillip Whaley
Represented By: Phillip G Whaley
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Michelle Menifee
Represented By: Mark D Coldiron
Represented By: Stephen C Gelnar
Represented By: Stephen L Jantzen
Represented By: Corey A Neller
Represented By: Patrick R Pearce, Jr
Represented By: Phillip Whaley
Represented By: Phillip G Whaley
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Stephanie L Naifeh
Represented By: Mark D Coldiron
Represented By: Stephen C Gelnar
Represented By: Stephen L Jantzen
Represented By: Corey A Neller
Represented By: Patrick R Pearce, Jr
Represented By: Phillip Whaley
Represented By: Phillip G Whaley
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Khanh V Pham
Represented By: Mark D Coldiron
Represented By: Stephen C Gelnar
Represented By: Stephen L Jantzen
Represented By: Corey A Neller
Represented By: Patrick R Pearce, Jr
Represented By: Phillip Whaley
Represented By: Phillip G Whaley
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Thuy T Ngo
Represented By: Mark D Coldiron
Represented By: Stephen C Gelnar
Represented By: Stephen L Jantzen
Represented By: Corey A Neller
Represented By: Patrick R Pearce, Jr
Represented By: Phillip Whaley
Represented By: Phillip G Whaley
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Steve Plumbtree
Represented By: Mark D Coldiron
Represented By: Stephen C Gelnar
Represented By: Stephen L Jantzen
Represented By: Corey A Neller
Represented By: Patrick R Pearce, Jr
Represented By: Phillip Whaley
Represented By: Phillip G Whaley
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Brenda Plumbtree
Represented By: Mark D Coldiron
Represented By: Stephen C Gelnar
Represented By: Stephen L Jantzen
Represented By: Corey A Neller
Represented By: Patrick R Pearce, Jr
Represented By: Phillip Whaley
Represented By: Phillip G Whaley
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Karen Ross and David Wilson Trust
Represented By: Mark D Coldiron
Represented By: Stephen C Gelnar
Represented By: Stephen L Jantzen
Represented By: Corey A Neller
Represented By: Patrick R Pearce, Jr
Represented By: Phillip Whaley
Represented By: Phillip G Whaley
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Ryan P Scarlett
Represented By: Mark D Coldiron
Represented By: Stephen C Gelnar
Represented By: Stephen L Jantzen
Represented By: Corey A Neller
Represented By: Patrick R Pearce, Jr
Represented By: Phillip Whaley
Represented By: Phillip G Whaley
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Courtney D Scarlett
Represented By: Mark D Coldiron
Represented By: Stephen C Gelnar
Represented By: Stephen L Jantzen
Represented By: Corey A Neller
Represented By: Patrick R Pearce, Jr
Represented By: Phillip Whaley
Represented By: Phillip G Whaley
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Stacy E Scheffler
Represented By: Mark D Coldiron
Represented By: Stephen C Gelnar
Represented By: Stephen L Jantzen
Represented By: Corey A Neller
Represented By: Patrick R Pearce, Jr
Represented By: Phillip Whaley
Represented By: Phillip G Whaley
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Sharon S Smeltzer
Represented By: Mark D Coldiron
Represented By: Stephen C Gelnar
Represented By: Stephen L Jantzen
Represented By: Corey A Neller
Represented By: Patrick R Pearce, Jr
Represented By: Phillip Whaley
Represented By: Phillip G Whaley
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Sunil Thomas
Represented By: Mark D Coldiron
Represented By: Stephen C Gelnar
Represented By: Stephen L Jantzen
Represented By: Corey A Neller
Represented By: Patrick R Pearce, Jr
Represented By: Phillip Whaley
Represented By: Phillip G Whaley
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Jogi Thomas
Represented By: Mark D Coldiron
Represented By: Stephen C Gelnar
Represented By: Stephen L Jantzen
Represented By: Corey A Neller
Represented By: Patrick R Pearce, Jr
Represented By: Phillip Whaley
Represented By: Phillip G Whaley
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Michael Williams
Represented By: Mark D Coldiron
Represented By: Stephen C Gelnar
Represented By: Stephen L Jantzen
Represented By: Corey A Neller
Represented By: Patrick R Pearce, Jr
Represented By: Phillip Whaley
Represented By: Phillip G Whaley
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Leberta Williams
Represented By: Mark D Coldiron
Represented By: Stephen C Gelnar
Represented By: Stephen L Jantzen
Represented By: Corey A Neller
Represented By: Patrick R Pearce, Jr
Represented By: Phillip Whaley
Represented By: Phillip G Whaley
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?