Rodriguez v. Amsberry et al
Plaintiff: Jonathan Jason Rodriguez
Defendant: Brady, D. Pedro, Heather Nevil, J. Cuna, N. Sobotta, E. Anderson, Brigitte Amsberry, Jason Duchek, Turner, T. Hart and S. Brown
Case Number: 2:2020cv01914
Filed: November 6, 2020
Court: US District Court for the District of Oregon
Presiding Judge: John V Acosta
Nature of Suit: Prisoner: Civil Rights
Cause of Action: 42:1983
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on January 4, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
January 4, 2021 Filing 9 Notice of Lawsuit and Request for Waiver of Service of Summons. Waiver of Service is due by 2/3/2021.**4 PAGE(S), PRINT ALL**(Jonathan Rodriguez, Prisoner ID: 17349747) (Emailed notice and complaint to ODOJ.) (dsg)
December 22, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 8 ORDER: IT IS ORDERED that defendants Duchek, Pedro, Amsberry, and Nevil are DISMISSED from this action, and the Clerk of the Court is DIRECTED to terminate them as parties. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that plaintiff's due process claims against defendants Hart and Brown are DISMISSED. This action shall proceed solely upon plaintiff's excessive force claims against defendants Hart, Turner, Brady, Cuna, Brown, and Anderson, and plaintiff's claim of denial of his First Amendment right to petition the government for redress against defendant Sobotta. Signed on 12/22/2020 by Judge Karin J. Immergut. **2 PAGE(S), PRINT ALL**(Jonathan Rodriguez, Prisoner ID: 17349747) (dsg)
December 15, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 7 Order of USCA for the 9th Circuit, USCA # 20-36027, re Notice of Appeal #6 . A review of the record demonstrates that this court lacks jurisdiction over this appeal because the order challenged in the appeal is not final or appealable. See WMX Techs., Inc. v. Miller, 104 F.3d 1133, 1136 (9th Cir. 1997) (dismissal of complaint with leave to amend is not appealable); see also In re San Vicente Med. Partners Ltd., 865 F.2d 1128, 1131 (9th Cir. 1989) (order) (magistrate judge order not final or appealable). Consequently, this appeal is dismissed for lack of jurisdiction. DISMISSED. **1 PAGE(S), PRINT ALL**(Jonathan Rodriguez, Prisoner ID: 17349747) (jtj)
November 30, 2020 USCA Case Number and Notice confirming Docketing Record on Appeal re Notice of Appeal #6 . Case Appealed to 9th Circuit Court of Appeals Case Number 20-36027 assigned. **PRINT NEF ONLY**(Jonathan Rodriguez, Prisoner ID: 17349747) (jtj)
November 25, 2020 Filing 6 Notice of Appeal to the 9th Circuit. Related Documents: Order to Dismiss in Part #5 . (IFP Granted - Order #4 ). Filed by Jonathan Jason Rodriguez. **PRINT NEF ONLY**(Jonathan Rodriguez, Prisoner ID: 17349747) (joha)
November 10, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 5 ORDER TO DISMISS IN PART. Based on the foregoing, the Court DISMISSES IN PART plaintiff's Amended Complaint. Plaintiff may file a Second Amended Complaint, curing the deficiencies noted above, within 30 days of the date of this order. If plaintiff does not file a Second Amended Complaint within the time provided, this action shall proceed solely upon plaintiff's excessive force claims against defendants Hart, Turner, Brady, Cuna, Brown, and Anderson, and plaintiff's claim of denial of his First Amendment right to petition the government for redress against defendant Sobotta. IT IS SO ORDERED. Signed on 11/10/2020 by Judge Karin J. Immergut. **8 PAGES, PRINT ALL** (Jonathan Rodriguez, Prisoner ID: 17349747) (gw)
November 9, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 4 ORDER TO PROCEED IN FORMA PAUPERIS AND TO COLLECT INMATE FILING FEE: Plaintiff's application to proceed in forma pauperis #1 is GRANTED. IT IS ORDERED that the Oregon Department of Corrections shall collect payments from Plaintiff's prison trust account and shall forward those payments to the Clerk of the Court. Signed on 11/9/2020 by Judge Karin J. Immergut. **2 PAGE(S), PRINT ALL**(Jonathan Rodriguez, Prisoner ID: 17349747) (dsg)
November 6, 2020 Filing 3 Notice of Case Assignment: This case is assigned to Magistrate Judge John V. Acosta. **3 PAGE(S), PRINT ALL**(Jonathan Rodriguez, Prisoner ID: 17349747) (joha)
November 6, 2020 Filing 2 Complaint. Jury Trial Requested: Yes. Filed by Jonathan Jason Rodriguez against Brigitte Amsberry, E. Anderson, Brady, S. Brown, J. Cuna, Jason Duchek, T. Hart, Heather Nevil, D. Pedro, N. Sobotta, Turner.**PRINT NEF ONLY**(Jonathan Rodriguez, Prisoner ID: 17349747) (joha)
November 6, 2020 Filing 1 Application for Leave to Proceed IFP. Filed by Jonathan Jason Rodriguez.**PRINT NEF ONLY**(Jonathan Rodriguez, Prisoner ID: 17349747) (joha)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Oregon District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Rodriguez v. Amsberry et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Brady
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: D. Pedro
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Heather Nevil
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: J. Cuna
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: N. Sobotta
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: E. Anderson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Brigitte Amsberry
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Jason Duchek
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Turner
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: T. Hart
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: S. Brown
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Jonathan Jason Rodriguez
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?