BROOKING v. D.O.C. AND EMPLOYEES AT SCI CAMP HILL et al
Plaintiff: |
MARCUS DION BROOKING |
Defendant: |
D.O.C. AND EMPLOYEES AT SCI CAMP HILL, Zobitne, Harrison, T. Williams and Cleaver |
Case Number: |
3:2015cv02134 |
Filed: |
November 6, 2015 |
Court: |
US District Court for the Middle District of Pennsylvania |
Office: |
Scranton Office |
County: |
Outside State |
Presiding Judge: |
A. Richard Caputo |
Presiding Judge: |
Joseph F. Saporito |
Nature of Suit: |
Prison Condition |
Cause of Action: |
42 U.S.C. § 1983 |
Jury Demanded By: |
None |
Available Case Documents
The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:
Date Filed |
Document Text |
July 20, 2023 |
Filing
64
ORDER ADOPTING REPORT AND RECOMMENDATIONS - IT IS HEREBY ORDERED that Magistrate Judge Joseph F. Saporito, Jr.s Report and Recommendation (Doc. 55 ) is ADOPTED; The Court finds that Brooking failed to exhaust his administrativeremedies, and the Cler k of Court is therefore DIRECTED to enter judgment in favor of Defendant; Brookings motion for summary judgment (Doc. 59 ) is DENIED as moot; The Clerk of Court is directed to CLOSE this case. Signed by Chief Judge Matthew W. Brann on 7/20/2023. (nr)
|
October 28, 2020 |
Filing
45
ORDER ADOPTING REPORT AND RECOMMENDATION - IT IS HEREBY ORDERED that 44 Magistrate Judge Saporito's Report and Recommendation is adopted; 33 Motion for Summary Judgment is denied; case is remanded to Magistrate Judge Saporito for further proceedings. Signed by Honorable Matthew W. Brann on 10/28/2020. (lg)
|
June 9, 2020 |
Filing
43
ORDER (memorandum filed previously as separate docket entry), ORDER REFERRING CASE to Magistrate Judge Joseph F. Saporito, Jr. - IT IS HEREBY ORDERED that 37 Report and Recommendation of Magistrate Judge Joseph F. Saporito, Jr. is REJECTED. 38 Plaintiff Marcus Brooking's opposition to Defendant's motion for summary judgment, Exhibits C and D, are deemed to have been timely filed. This case is remanded back to Magistrate Judge Saporito for further proceedings. Signed by Honorable Matthew W. Brann on 6/9/2020. (lg)
|
June 12, 2019 |
Filing
25
ORDER ADOPTING REPORT AND RECOMMENDATIONS ; adopting 24 Report and Recommendations. Signed by Honorable A. Richard Caputo on 6/12/19. (dw)
|
January 29, 2019 |
Filing
16
ORDER (memorandum filed previously as separate docket entry). (1) The Report and Recommendation 13 is ADOPTED in part and REJECTED in part. (2) All claims except Plaintiff Marcus Brookings Eighth Amendment deliberate indifference claim are DISMISSED with prejudice. (3) This matter is RECOMMITTED to Magistrate Judge Saporito for further proceedings.Signed by Honorable A. Richard Caputo on 1/29/19. (dw)
|
April 4, 2016 |
Filing
11
ORDER (memorandum filed previously as separate docket entry) DENYING Doc. 9 motion for appointment of counsel. Signed by Magistrate Judge Joseph F. Saporito, Jr on 4/4/16. (ms)
|
Access additional case information on PACER
Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system.
A subscription to PACER is required.
Access this case on the Pennsylvania Middle District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System
Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.
Why Is My Information Online?