Ray v. McDonald et al
Plaintiff: Frederick T Ray, III
Defendant: Mr. Kilheeney, Kelly McAndrews, Mary Jo Mather, Major Jason Bohinski, . Kevin Ransom, John/Jane Does, Pamela McDonald, Captain Lukashenski, Captain Brozowski, Deputy Cronauer, Michael Goyne, Deputy Miller and Louise Cicerchia
Case Number: 3:2020cv01697
Filed: September 18, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Middle District of Pennsylvania
Presiding Judge: DB
Referring Judge: Malachy E Mannion
Nature of Suit: Prisoner: Civil Rights
Cause of Action: 42:1983
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on November 16, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
November 16, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 16 ORDER granting #15 pltf's Motion for Extension of Time to File br. in oppos. to re #7 motion to dismiss. Brief in Opposition due by 12/1/2020. Signed by Honorable Malachy E Mannion on 11/16/20 (bs)
November 16, 2020 Filing 15 MOTION for Extension of Time to File Brief in Opposition to #7 MOTION to Dismiss filed by Frederick T Ray, III.(ao)
November 16, 2020 Filing 14 REQUEST dtd 11/12/20 for 5 Subpoenas by Frederick T Ray, III. (ao)
November 2, 2020 Filing 13 NOTICE of Change of Address by Frederick T Ray, III. (dw)
November 2, 2020 Filing 12 Letter dated 10/26/20 from Frederick T. Ray, III regarding status of case. (Copy of docket sent.) (dw)
October 27, 2020 Filing 11 MOTION to Dismiss by Mary Jo Mather. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Robinson, Gerald)
October 16, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 10 ORDER granting #9 pltf's Motion for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply re #7 MOTION to Dismiss. Brief in Opposition due by 11/16/2020.Signed by Honorable Malachy E Mannion on 10/16/20 (bs)
October 9, 2020 Filing 9 MOTION for Extension of Time to File Brief in Opposition to #7 MOTION to Dismiss filed by Frederick T Ray, III.(mw)
September 25, 2020 Filing 8 BRIEF IN SUPPORT re #7 MOTION to Dismiss filed by Major Jason Bohinski, Captain Brozowski, Louise Cicerchia, Deputy Cronauer, Michael Goyne, Mr. Kilheeney, Captain Lukashenski, Kelly McAndrews, Pamela McDonald, Deputy Miller, Kevin Ransom. (Attachments: #1 Unpublished Opinion(s))(Enerson, Caleb)
September 25, 2020 Filing 7 MOTION to Dismiss by Major Jason Bohinski, Captain Brozowski, Louise Cicerchia, Deputy Cronauer, Michael Goyne, Mr. Kilheeney, Captain Lukashenski, Kelly McAndrews, Pamela McDonald, Deputy Miller, Kevin Ransom. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Enerson, Caleb)
September 25, 2020 Filing 6 EXHIBIT A by Major Jason Bohinski, Captain Brozowski, Louise Cicerchia, Deputy Cronauer, Michael Goyne, Mr. Kilheeney, Captain Lukashenski, Kelly McAndrews, Pamela McDonald, Deputy Miller, Kevin Ransom re #1 Notice of Removal. (Enerson, Caleb)
September 25, 2020 Filing 5 NOTICE of Appearance by Caleb C Enerson on behalf of Major Jason Bohinski, Captain Brozowski, Louise Cicerchia, Deputy Cronauer, Michael Goyne, Mr. Kilheeney, Captain Lukashenski, Kelly McAndrews, Pamela McDonald, Deputy Miller, Kevin Ransom (Enerson, Caleb)
September 24, 2020 Filing 4 NOTICE of Appearance by Gerald S Robinson on behalf of Mary Jo Mather (Robinson, Gerald)
September 18, 2020 Filing 3 THIRTY (30) DAY ADMINISTRATIVE ORDER) directing the prisoner to pay the filing fee or file a signed Application to Proceed IFP within 30 days or case will be dismissed.Signed by Honorable Malachy E Mannion on 9/18/20. (Attachments: #1 App for IFP, #2 AO 398, #3 AO 399, #4 LRCP Excerpt)(sm)
September 18, 2020 Filing 2 PRISONER LETTER ISSUED (sm)
September 18, 2020 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL by Frederick T Ray, III filed by Atty General (Attachments: #1 Cover Sheet, #2 Complaint, #3 Notice of Compliance)(sm) Modified on 9/18/2020 (sm). Modified on 10/8/2020 (lp). Filing Fee of $400 paid. See Receipt APAMDC-5259213.

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Pennsylvania Middle District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Ray v. McDonald et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Mr. Kilheeney
Represented By: Caleb C Enerson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Kelly McAndrews
Represented By: Caleb C Enerson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Mary Jo Mather
Represented By: Caleb C Enerson
Represented By: Gerald S Robinson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Major Jason Bohinski
Represented By: Caleb C Enerson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: . Kevin Ransom
Represented By: Caleb C Enerson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: John/Jane Does
Represented By: Caleb C Enerson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Pamela McDonald
Represented By: Caleb C Enerson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Captain Lukashenski
Represented By: Caleb C Enerson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Captain Brozowski
Represented By: Caleb C Enerson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Deputy Cronauer
Represented By: Caleb C Enerson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Michael Goyne
Represented By: Caleb C Enerson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Deputy Miller
Represented By: Caleb C Enerson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Louise Cicerchia
Represented By: Caleb C Enerson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Frederick T Ray, III
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?