SLOAN v. PA DEPT. OF CORRECTIONS et al
Plaintiff: JOHN SLOAN
Defendant: PA DEPT. OF CORRECTIONS, SCI - MERCER, THOMPSON, SULLENBERGER, BOGGS, BROMLEY, DELLORSO, BOAL, WOODS, ENGSTROM, CORRECT CARE SOLUTIONS (CCS), RICHARD ELLERS, SCOTT MORGAN and KAREN FEATHER
Case Number: 2:2016cv01182
Filed: August 5, 2016
Court: US District Court for the Western District of Pennsylvania
Office: Pittsburgh Office
County: Mercer
Presiding Judge: Cynthia Reed Eddy
Nature of Suit: Prison Condition
Cause of Action: 42:1983
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
December 17, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 115 ORDER indicating that, for the reasons set forth in the accompanying Memorandum Opinion 114 , it is hereby ordered as follows: (1) The Report and Recommendation 109 filed on 10/25/18, by Magistrate Judge Cynthia Reed Eddy is adopted as the opinion of the Court; that the Motion for Summary Judgment filed by the DOC Defendants 93 is granted in its entirety based on Plaintiff's failure to exhaust his administrative remedies; (2) The Report and Recommendation 110 filed on 10/25/18, by Ma gistrate Judge Cynthia Reed Eddy is adopted as the opinion of the Court; that the Motion for Summary Judgment filed by the Medical Defendants 97 is granted as to Plaintiff's constitutional claims; (3) that Plaintiff's state law claims b rought against the Medical Defendants are dismissed without prejudice for want of jurisdiction; that the Clerk of Court mark this case closed; that pursuant to Rule 4(a)(1) of the Federal Rules of Appellate Procedure, Plaintiff has thirty (30) days to file a notice of appeal as provided by Rule 3 of the Appellate Rules of Appellate Procedure. Signed by Judge Nora Barry Fischer on 12/17/18. (jg)
March 27, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 90 ORDER denying 82 Plaintiff's Motion to waive the requirement or necessity for a certificate of merit; and denying without prejudice 85 the Medical Defendants' Motion to Strike. See Memorandum Order for further details. Signed by Magistrate Judge Cynthia Reed Eddy on 3/27/2018. (bsc)
September 7, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 55 MEMORANDUM ORDER indicating that the Report and Recommendation 54 of Magistrate Judge Cynthia Reed Eddy is hereby adopted as the opinion of the district court; that the DOC Defendants' motion to dismiss 39 is granted, in part, and denied, in part. The DOC Defendants' motion 39 is granted to the extent that: 1. All claims against SCI-Mercer and the Department of Corrections are dismissed with prejudice; 2. The Eighth Amendment claims against Defendants Thompson, Woods, and Sulle nberger are dismissed with prejudice; The DOC Defendants' motion 39 is denied to the extent that:1. Plaintiff's Eighth Amendment claims against Bromley, Boggs, and Dellorso shall proceed to discovery; 2. Plaintiff's retaliation cla ims against Engstrom, Thompson, Bromley, Boggs, and Dellorso shall proceed to discovery; that the Medical Defendants' motion to dismiss 42 is granted, in part, and denied, in part. The Medical Defendants' motion 42 is granted to the extent that: 1. Plaintiff's Fourteenth Amendment claims are dismissed, with prejudice, and leave to amend such claims is denied; 2. Plaintiff's Monell claim against Correct Care Solutions is dismissed, without prejudice, and he is granted leave to amend his Monell claim but only to the extent that he can allege sufficient facts to allow the Court to conclude that his treatment, or lack thereof, was part of a pervasive corporate policy or custom, including a failure to train, which di rectly caused the constitutional violations about which he complains; The Medical Defendants' motion 42 is denied to the extent that: 1. Defendants' claims of res judicata are denied, without prejudice; 2.Plaintiff's Eighth Amend ment deliberate indifference claims against Defendants Morgan, Feathers and Ellers shall proceed to discovery; that this matter is hereby remanded to Magistrate Judge Eddy to conduct further proceedings and issue appropriate Orders. Signed by Judge Nora Barry Fischer on 9/7/17. (jg)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Pennsylvania Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: SLOAN v. PA DEPT. OF CORRECTIONS et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: JOHN SLOAN
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: PA DEPT. OF CORRECTIONS
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: SCI - MERCER
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: THOMPSON
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: SULLENBERGER
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: BOGGS
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: BROMLEY
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: DELLORSO
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: BOAL
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: WOODS
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: ENGSTROM
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: CORRECT CARE SOLUTIONS (CCS)
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: RICHARD ELLERS
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: SCOTT MORGAN
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: KAREN FEATHER
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?