Henault, et al v. American Foam Co., et al
Plaintiff: Chad M. Henault, Angela Boggs, Rachel M. Henault, Andrew J. Henault, Estate of Jude B. Henault, Estate of Samuel Miceli, Jr, Madeliene Miceli, Laura Gerfin, Kelly Gerfin, Meagan Gerfin, Nancy Noyes, Caroline Telgarsky, Sarah Jane Ballard, Glenn Johnson, Lisa Johnson, Melanie Holliday, Estate of Melvin A. Gerfin, Jr, Deborah A. Gerfin and Estate of Sarah Jane Telgarsky
Defendant: American Foam Corporation, Barry Warner, Triton Realty Limited Partnership, Jeffrey Derderian, Michael Derderian, Derco, LLC, Manic Music Management, Inc, Jack Russell, Mark Kendall, David Filice, Eric Powers, Daniel Bichele, Paul Woolnough, Knight Records, Inc, McLaughlin & Moran, Inc, Luna Tech Pyrotechnik GmbH, Luna Tech, Inc, Clear Channel Communications, Inc, Town of W. Warwick, Dennis P. Larocque, State of Rhode Island, General Foam Corp, GFC Foam, LLC, Foamex LP, Foamex International, Inc, FMXI, Inc, PMC, Inc, PMC Global, Inc, JBL, Incorporated, L&P Financial Services, Co, Leggett & Platt, Inc, High Tech Special Effects, Inc, Brian Butler, Jack Russell Touring, Inc, Raymond Villanova, Triton Realty, Inc, Anheuser-Busch, Inc, Anheuser-Busch Companies, Inc, Capstar Radio Operating Company, TVL Broadcasting, STC Broadcasting,Inc, Underwriters at Lloyd's London, ABC Bus, Inc, Superstar Services, LLC, Stephen D. Murray, Joseph Lafontaine, Polar Industries, Inc, Home Depot U.S.A., Inc, Celotex Corp, Knight-Celotex Liston Falls LLC, Knight-Celotex LLC, Knight Industries, Inc, Knight Industries, LLC, Knight Industries I, LLC, FFNC, Inc, Framingham-150 FR Realty Limited Partnership, Seekonk-226 Limited Partnership, Frances Villanova, Busch Entertainment Corporation, Busch Media Group, Inc, LIN T.V. Corp, Wm. T. Burnett & Co., Inc, Wm. T. Burnett Operating LLLP, Wm. T. Burnett Management, Inc, Wm. T. Burnett & Co, Sealed Air Corp, Sealed Air Corp., US, Sentinel Products Corp, Luna Tech Euro GmbH, Howard Julian, LIN Television Corporation, TVL Broadcasting of Rhode Island, LLC, TVL Broadcasting, Inc, Anthony Bettencourt, Jo-Anne DerManouelian, Everett Marabian and Paul Plourde
Consol_plaintiff: #Henault Plaintiffs, #Kolasa Plaintiffs, #Long Plaintiff and #Malagrino Plaintiff
Special_master: William A. Poore
Case Number: 1:2003cv00483
Filed: August 14, 2009
Court: U.S. District Court for the District of Rhode Island
Office: Providence Office
Presiding Judge: Ronald R Lagueux
Presiding Judge: David L. Martin
Nature of Suit: P.I.: Other
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1332 Diversity-Personal Injury

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
June 10, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 1192 ORDER granting (1190) Motion to Clarify/Declare that the Provisions of Insurance Bulletin Number 2006-4 issued by the RI Dept. of Business Regulation Have Been Complied With in case 1:03-cv-00483-L-DLM; granting (2057) Motion to Clarify/Declare that the Provisions of Insurance Bulletin Number 2006-4 issued by the RI Dept. of Business Regulation Have Been Complied With in case 1:04-cv-00312-L-DLM. So Ordered by Judge Ronald R Lagueux on June 10, 2010. (Zinni, Concetta)
September 15, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 1172 ORDER granting (1128) Motion for Settlement; Granting (1136) Motion for Settlement; Granting (1138) Motion for Settlement; Granting (1139) Motion for Settlement; Granting (1145) Motion for Settlement; Granting (1149) Motion Approve "Good Faith&q uot; Settlement; Adopting Report and Recommendations re (1163); Adopting Errata Report and Recommendations re (1169) in case 1:03-cv-00483-L-DLM; Granting (1993) Motion for Settlement; Granting (2000) Motion for Settlement; Granting (2001) Motion for Settlement; Granting (2003) Motion for Settlement; Granting (2004) Motion for Settlement; Granting (2009) Motion for Settlement; Granting (2013) Motion Approve "Good Faith" Settlement; Adopting Report and Recommendations re (2028) Report and Recommendations; Adopting Errata Report and Recommendations re (2034) in case 1:04-cv-00312-L-DLM. So Ordered by Judge Ronald R Lagueux on 9/15/09. (Farrell Pletcher, Paula)
September 3, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 1169 ERRATA SHEET RE: REPORT AND RECOMMENDATIONS re: SEVEN DEFENDANTS' MOTIONS TO APPROVE SETTLEMENTS (2000 in 1:04-cv-00312-L-DLM) MOTION for Settlement "Good Faith" filed by Luna Tech, Inc, (1135 in 1:03-cv-00483-L-DLM) MOTION for Settlement "GOOD FAITH" filed by Luna Tech, Inc, (1143 in 1:03-cv-00483-L-DLM) MOTION to Amend/Correct Luna Tech's Motion to Approve "Good Faith" Settlement filed by Luna Tech, Inc. So Ordered by Magistrate Judge David L. Martin on 9/3/09. (Saucier, Martha)
August 14, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 1164 REPORT AND RECOMMENDATIONS re (1161 in 1:03-cv-00483-L-DLM) Assented MOTION to approve "Good Faith" Settlement with Insurance Inspection Defendants in Accordance with RIGL 10-6-7 and 10-6-8 filed by Multi-State Inspections, Inc, V.B. Giffor d & Company, Inc, Gresham & Associates of RI, Inc, Underwriters at Lloyd's London, #Long Plaintiff, #Henault Plaintiffs, Surplex Underwriters Inc, Essex Insurance Company, Anchor Solutions Company, Inc, #Kolasa Plaintiffs, High Caliber Inspectio ns, Inc, #Malagrino Plaintiff, (2026 in 1:04-cv-00312-L-DLM) Assented MOTION to Approve "Good Faith" Settlement with the Insurance Inspection Defendants in Accordance with RIGL 10-6-7 and 10-6-8 filed by Multi-State Inspections, Inc, #Malag rino Plaintiffs, #Gray Plaintiffs, Gresham & Associates of RI, Inc, Underwriters at Lloyd's London, #Paskowski Plaintiffs, Surplex Underwriters Inc, Gresham & Associates of Rhode Island, Inc, Anchor Solutions Company, Inc, Essex Insurance Compan y, #Sweet Plaintiffs, V.B. Gifford & Company, Inc, #Henault Plaintiffs, #Gonsalves Plaintiffs, #Guindon Plaintiffs, #Roderiques Plaintiff, #Napolitano Plaintiffs, #Passa Plaintiffs, #Kolasa Plaintiffs, High Caliber Inspections, Inc, #Kingsley Plainti ffs, #Long Plaintiffs, (2002 in 1:04-cv-00312-L-DLM) MOTION to Approve "Good Faith" Settlement with Defendant Howard Julian in Accordance with R.I.G.L. 10-6-7 and 10-6-8 filed by Linda A. Ormerod, Catherine Cabral, Julie Belson, Gary Stein, Ronald S. Schoepfer, Bruce G. Pollock, Jessica Mallette, Lawrence E. Fick, David Steets, Ray F. Beauchaine, Sr., Gregory Gray, Hollie A. Pomfret, Dorothy Marion, John Mangan, Jr., Anthony Manzo, Sarah Amy Cook, Kevin J. Fisher, Timothy J. Rossano, J oanne L. Mitchell, John J. DeCosta, III, Christopher. J. Nowicki, Kathleen Sullivan, Laurie A. Hussey, Robert W. Rager, John A. Longiaru, Scott C. Moresco, David McGinn, Maria Latulippe, Cheryl Haines, Donna DeBoard, Marc A. Lucier, Katherine Cordier , Joseph P. Barber, Claire H. Bruyere, Catherine C. Sagesta, Stephen Perry, Georgette Giroux-Brown, Judy O'Brien, Patricia Belanger, Melinda Bloomingburgh, Patricia L. Clarke, Susan Sylvia, Brianna Quarry, George Solitro, Paul A. Morin, Robert C ushman, Edward Pezzelli, Jr., Rozilyn Guy, George F. Phelan, Dean DePietro, Ellen-Marie Stowers, John Gibbs, Paula Gould, Robert J. Johnson, Sr., Charlene Prudhomme, John A. Rezendes, Jeannette Garcia, Paul Pezzelli, Kathren M. Prunier, Michael R. Ri cardi, Sharon Colpitts, Grant Hall, Charles A. Oberg, Jordon Clark, Rodney J. Gaumitz, Eugene Goguen, Derrick Silva, Gina Russo, Elizabeth Arruda, Veda Kerr, Joseph Lusardi, Roberta O'Melia, Carla Alves, David Fravala, Cynthia A. Nobles, Paul R. Gordon, Gennaro Companatico, Ashley A. Poland, Shawn Lourenco, Al Prudhomme, Scott J. Vieira, Bruce Cormier, Milton Servis, II, Claude Richard, John D. Wigginton, Anna Gruttadauria, Carolyn Moore, John Kudryk, Matthew Dussault, James C. Gahan, III, Tammy Lapierre, Christopher O'Donnell, Brian Loftus, Melissa A. Stephenson, Jennifer Choquette, Bonnie A. Hoisington, Richard. Cook, Eileen L. DiBonaventura, Jonathan P. Brennan, Victoria L. Potvin, Kevin Blom, Lee A. Karvonen, Judith Carver, Pa ula A. McLaughlin, Paul Bertolo, Richard DelSanto, Kerrie A. Rock, Jane C. Sylvester, Marc Blevins, Mark P. Hyer, Sr., Heidi Peralta Longley, Judith Marie Croteau, Donna L. Micchelli, John Edward Hussey, Jr., John F. Pickett, Michael Magee, Shauna De ll, Korina Arruda, Katherine Shubert, Brenda Cormier, Kathleen M. Cardillo, Lisa C. Hale, Jose Roberto Demos, Donald N. Trudeau, Dorothy E. Bonardi, Robert M. Cripe, John F. Van Deusen, III, John S. Pinkham, Gregory Scott Dufour, Debra Wagner, Suzann e Fox, Maureen Sullivan, Maryanne Shubert, Eileen Dunn, Paul M. Pelletier, Jennifer Vieira, Stephanie Simpson, Deborah Peduzzi, Gerard W. Fontaine, Stephanie Zannella, Ray F. Beauchaine, Jr., Marie G. Morton, Shaun O'Donnell, Donovan Williams, R ichard Dufour, Jr., Edward C. Ervanian, Francis J. Canillas, Joseph A. Jones, David Ciccone, Brandon Fravala, Gina M. Gauvin, Sandra L. Greene, John Minor, Richard Moreau, Robert Harrington, Richard. J. Grace, Jennifer L. Young, Stephen A. Gillett, B arbara Magness, Donna Reis, Sheila Palumbo, Jacqueline Jacavone, Donna Cormier, Timothy J. Fleming, Joseph LoBianco, Erin Pucino, Christina Therriault, David D. Brennan, Roderick Prouty, Melanie Vargas, Michael Iannone, Paula Woodcock, Melanie Fontai ne, Roberta J. Prete, Kimberly Rich, Tawnya Kelly, Erik Sippy, Sarah R. Mancini, Annmarie Swidwa, Carlton L. Howorth, Jr., Sally Blom, Albert L. Gray, Honorina Washburn, Gary M. Tremblay, Steven M. Tavares, Christopher A. Peters, Carol Magee, William H. Cartwright, Jr., Robert A. Barlow, John R. Arpin, Raul Vargas, Robin Petrarca, Leonard Angers, Susan H. Chamberlin, Joseph Cristina, Christopher J. Travis, Mark D'Andrea, Elizabeth O'Connor, James Dufresne, Laura Shubert, Tammy M. St. H ilaire, Eric Williams, Frances P. McMurray, Jordan Blasbalg, Joanne O'Neill, Susan Brennan, Nicole Conant, Kenneth Frederickson, Stephanie Conant, Milisa Bump, David B. MacDonald, Leslie Preuit, Kerrie-Lynn Beers, Denise M. McGregor, Linda M. Fi sher, Joseph M. Flynn, Catherine Randall, Chris C. Trautz, Robert Peduzzi, Edward D. Nobles, John J. Libera, Sharon Eaton, Jesse Botelho, Joseph A. Dibona, Jr., Scott Preuit, Warren L. Baker, III, Christopher Costa, Sharon A. Wilson, Kristen A. Brown , Justina Martin, Theresia M. LaBree, William Rancourt, John M. Hoban, Michael Reno, Justin Pomfret, Michael Perreault, Andrea F. Fairbairn, Peter M. DiRienzo, Angel O. Amitrano, Melissa J. Minor, Stephen M. Isherwood, Scott Dunbar, Matthew Mallette, Adrian Krasinskas, Irina M. Gershelis, Peter M. DiRienzo, Jr., Richard Wiggs, Robert J. Luxton, Lisa Geremia, Andrew S. Richardson, Nancene Cohen, Melinda J. Darby, Leo Smith, Paul du Fosse, Karen E. Howorth, Raymond Mattera, Glenn Therriault, Brend a Goguen, John J. Shaw, Kevin J. Beese, Sr., Richard H. Rakoski, Patricia Avilez, Nathan D. White, Mary Lourenco, Dorothy Pimentel, Erin Whalen, Robin Precourt, Karen M. Gordon, Dawn Perry, Jason Piscopio, Barbara A. Kulz, Charles J. Maraglia, Antho ny J. Durante, Steven Beardsworth, Fredrick P. Vallante, Jr., John F. Fairbairn, John Dimeo, Michael Stefani, Jonathan Petrin, Arthur J. Conway, III, Craig Ballard, Yvette Fresolo, Mario B. Cardillo, Kerrie A. Amato, Nancy S. Trautz, Loriann Gooden, Kevin Bowe, Roberta Trudeau, Jon. R. Schmidt, Joseph K. Kinan, Zachary S. Suffoletto, Evelyn L. King, Robert P. Feeney, Neil E. Cronin, (1137 in 1:03-cv-00483-L-DLM) MOTION to Approve "Good Faith" Settlement with Defendant Howard Julian in accordance with R.I.G.L. 10-6-7 and 10-6-8 filed by Sarah Jane Ballard, Nancy Noyes, Rachel M. Henault, Estate of Jude B. Henault, Andrew J. Henault, Caroline Telgarsky, Melanie Holliday, Laura Gerfin, Kelly Gerfin, Estate of Sarah Jane Telgarsky, Gl enn Johnson, Lisa Johnson, Madeliene Miceli, Estate of Samuel Miceli, Jr, Deborah A. Gerfin, Chad M. Henault, Estate of Melvin A. Gerfin, Jr, Angela Boggs, Meagan Gerfin. Recommending the Motions be GRANTED. ( Objections to R&R due by 8/28/2009). So Ordered by Magistrate Judge David L. Martin on 8/14/09. (Saucier, Martha) Termination Date Modified on 9/15/2009 (Farrell Pletcher, Paula).
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the U.S. Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Rhode Island District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Henault, et al v. American Foam Co., et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Chad M. Henault
Represented By: John P. Barylick
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Angela Boggs
Represented By: John P. Barylick
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Rachel M. Henault
Represented By: John P. Barylick
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Andrew J. Henault
Represented By: John P. Barylick
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Estate of Jude B. Henault
Represented By: John P. Barylick
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Estate of Samuel Miceli, Jr
Represented By: John P. Barylick
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Madeliene Miceli
Represented By: John P. Barylick
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Laura Gerfin
Represented By: John P. Barylick
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Kelly Gerfin
Represented By: John P. Barylick
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Meagan Gerfin
Represented By: John P. Barylick
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Nancy Noyes
Represented By: John P. Barylick
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Caroline Telgarsky
Represented By: John P. Barylick
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Sarah Jane Ballard
Represented By: John P. Barylick
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Glenn Johnson
Represented By: John P. Barylick
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Lisa Johnson
Represented By: John P. Barylick
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Melanie Holliday
Represented By: John P. Barylick
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Estate of Melvin A. Gerfin, Jr
Represented By: John P. Barylick
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Deborah A. Gerfin
Represented By: John P. Barylick
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Estate of Sarah Jane Telgarsky
Represented By: John P. Barylick
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: American Foam Corporation
Represented By: Thomas C. Angelone
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Barry Warner
Represented By: Ronald P. Langlois
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Triton Realty Limited Partnership
Represented By: Thomas R. Bender
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Jeffrey Derderian
Represented By: Anthony F. DeMarco
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Michael Derderian
Represented By: Anthony F. DeMarco
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Derco, LLC
Represented By: Joseph J. Bellew
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Manic Music Management, Inc
Represented By: Kim M. Clarke
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Jack Russell
Represented By: Kim M. Clarke
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Mark Kendall
Represented By: Fred A. Kelly, Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: David Filice
Represented By: Fred A. Kelly, Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Eric Powers
Represented By: Fred A. Kelly, Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Daniel Bichele
Represented By: Thomas G. Briody
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Paul Woolnough
Represented By: Kim M. Clarke
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Knight Records, Inc
Represented By: Kim M. Clarke
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: McLaughlin & Moran, Inc
Represented By: Howard A. Merten
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Luna Tech Pyrotechnik GmbH
Represented By: Curtis R. Diedrich
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Luna Tech, Inc
Represented By: Curtis R. Diedrich
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Clear Channel Communications, Inc
Represented By: Stephen J. MacGillivray
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Town of W. Warwick
Represented By: Karen K. Corcoran
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Dennis P. Larocque
Represented By: Karen K. Corcoran
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: State of Rhode Island
Represented By: James R. Lee
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: General Foam Corp
Represented By: John R. Crockett
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: GFC Foam, LLC
Represented By: John R. Crockett
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Foamex LP
Represented By: Gerald C. DeMaria
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Foamex International, Inc
Represented By: Gerald C. DeMaria
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: FMXI, Inc
Represented By: Gerald C. DeMaria
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: PMC, Inc
Represented By: Gerald C. DeMaria
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: PMC Global, Inc
Represented By: John R. Crockett
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: JBL, Incorporated
Represented By: C. Russell Bengtson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: L&P Financial Services, Co
Represented By: Thomas W. Lyons, III
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Leggett & Platt, Inc
Represented By: Thomas W. Lyons, III
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: High Tech Special Effects, Inc
Represented By: Andrew A. Beerworth
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Brian Butler
Represented By: Charles L. Babcock
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Jack Russell Touring, Inc
Represented By: Kim M. Clarke
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Raymond Villanova
Represented By: Thomas R. Bender
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Triton Realty, Inc
Represented By: Thomas R. Bender
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Anheuser-Busch, Inc
Represented By: Joseph V. Cavanagh, Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Anheuser-Busch Companies, Inc
Represented By: Joseph V. Cavanagh, Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Capstar Radio Operating Company
Represented By: Stephen J. MacGillivray
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: TVL Broadcasting
Represented By: Charles L. Babcock
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: STC Broadcasting,Inc
Represented By: Charles L. Babcock
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Underwriters at Lloyd's London
Represented By: James S. D'Ambra
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: ABC Bus, Inc
Represented By: Joseph J. McGair
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Superstar Services, LLC
Represented By: Theodorus D. Urbanski
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Stephen D. Murray
Represented By: Karen K. Corcoran
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Joseph Lafontaine
Represented By: David A. Wollin
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Polar Industries, Inc
Represented By: John J. Flanagan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Home Depot U.S.A., Inc
Represented By: William E. O'Gara
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Celotex Corp
Represented By: Steven T. Armato
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Knight-Celotex Liston Falls LLC
Represented By: David E. Maglio
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Knight-Celotex LLC
Represented By: David E. Maglio
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Knight Industries, Inc
Represented By: David E. Maglio
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Knight Industries, LLC
Represented By: David E. Maglio
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Knight Industries I, LLC
Represented By: David E. Maglio
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: FFNC, Inc
Represented By: Michael R. DeLuca
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Framingham-150 FR Realty Limited Partnership
Represented By: Thomas R. Bender
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Seekonk-226 Limited Partnership
Represented By: Thomas R. Bender
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Frances Villanova
Represented By: Thomas R. Bender
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Busch Entertainment Corporation
Represented By: Joseph V. Cavanagh, Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Busch Media Group, Inc
Represented By: Joseph V. Cavanagh, Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: LIN T.V. Corp
Represented By: Charles L. Babcock
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Wm. T. Burnett & Co., Inc
Represented By: James K. Archibald
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Wm. T. Burnett Operating LLLP
Represented By: James K. Archibald
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Wm. T. Burnett Management, Inc
Represented By: James K. Archibald
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Wm. T. Burnett & Co
Represented By: James K. Archibald
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Sealed Air Corp
Represented By: Scott M. Carroll
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Sealed Air Corp., US
Represented By: Scott M. Carroll
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Sentinel Products Corp
Represented By: Robert P. Corrigan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Luna Tech Euro GmbH
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Howard Julian
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: LIN Television Corporation
Represented By: Charles L. Babcock
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: TVL Broadcasting of Rhode Island, LLC
Represented By: Charles L. Babcock
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: TVL Broadcasting, Inc
Represented By: Charles L. Babcock
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Anthony Bettencourt
Represented By: Karen K. Corcoran
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Jo-Anne DerManouelian
Represented By: Thomas C. Angelone
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Everett Marabian
Represented By: Thomas C. Angelone
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Paul Plourde
Represented By: Thomas C. Angelone
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Consol_plaintiff: #Henault Plaintiffs
Represented By: Joseph M Barnes
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Consol_plaintiff: #Kolasa Plaintiffs
Represented By: Lawrence Joseph Cappuccio
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Consol_plaintiff: #Long Plaintiff
Represented By: Lawrence Joseph Cappuccio
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Consol_plaintiff: #Malagrino Plaintiff
Represented By: Lawrence Joseph Cappuccio
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Special_master: William A. Poore
Represented By: William A. Poore
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?