Czmus v. United States of America et al
Plaintiff: |
Akim F. Czmus |
Defendant: |
United States of America and Department of Homeland Security |
Case Number: |
1:2009cv00373 |
Filed: |
August 17, 2009 |
Court: |
US District Court for the District of Rhode Island |
Office: |
Providence Office |
County: |
Providence |
Presiding Judge: |
Lincoln D. Almond |
Presiding Judge: |
William E Smith |
Nature of Suit: |
None |
Cause of Action: |
28 U.S.C. § 1331 Fed. Question |
Jury Demanded By: |
None |
Available Case Documents
The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:
Date Filed |
Document Text |
February 4, 2010 |
Filing
12
ORDER denying 8 Motion for Default Judgment; granting 9 Motion to Dismiss; denying 10 Motion for an Order; adopting 11 Report and Recommendations. So Ordered by Judge William E. Smith on 2/3/10. (Jackson, Ryan)
|
January 11, 2010 |
Filing
11
REPORT AND RECOMMENDATIONS recommending that Plaintiff's Complaint be DISMISSED with prejudice pursuant to 28 U.S.C. Section 1915(e)(2)(B)(i) and that the United States of America's Motion to Dismiss be GRANTED - 8 MOTION for Default Judg ment as to Defendants' Failure to Answer Plaintiff's Complaint filed by Akim F. Czmus, 10 MOTION for Order Granting Plaintiff's Motion for Default Judgment and Response to Defendant's Motion to Dismiss re 8 MOTION for D efault Judgment as to Defendants' Failure to Answer Plaintiff's Complaint, 9 MOTION to Dism MOTION for Order Granting Plaintiff's Motion for Default Judgment and Response to Defendant's Motion to Dismiss re 8 MOTION for Default Judgment as to Defendants' Failure to Answer Plaintiff's Complaint, 9 MOTION to Dism filed by Akim F. Czmus, 9 MOTION to Dismiss Case as Frivolous filed by Department of Homeland Security, United States of America Objections to R&R due by 1/25/2010. So Ordered by Magistrate Judge Lincoln D. Almond on 1/11/2010. (Noel, Jeannine)
|
August 21, 2009 |
Filing
4
MEMORANDUM AND ORDER - Czmus must file the proper information by September 18, 2009 or risk having his Application denied and this matter dismissed. So Ordered by Magistrate Judge Lincoln D. Almond on 8/21/09. (Noel, Jeannine)
|
Access additional case information on PACER
Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system.
A subscription to PACER is required.
Access this case on the Rhode Island District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System
Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.
Why Is My Information Online?