Rocha v. Peter Pan Bus Line Inc.
Plaintiff: Joseph R. Rocha
Defendant: Peter Pan Bus Line Inc.
Case Number: 1:2009cv00586
Filed: December 4, 2009
Court: US District Court for the District of Rhode Island
Office: Providence Office
County: Providence
Presiding Judge: Lincoln D. Almond
Presiding Judge: William E Smith
Nature of Suit: Plaintiff
Cause of Action: 28:1331 Fed. Question: Fair Labor Standards
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
July 15, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 23 DECISION AND ORDER granting (21) Motion for Summary Judgment in case 1:09-cv-00586-M -LDA; granting (20) Motion for Summary Judgment in case 1:10-cv-00006-M -LDA- So Ordered by Judge John J McConnell, Jr on 7/15/11. Associated Cases: 1:09-cv-00586-M -LDA, 1:10-cv-00006-M -LDA(Barletta, Barbara)
January 25, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 7 ORDER adopting 4 Report and Recommendations; denying 2 Motion for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis and directing plaintiff to pay the filing fee of $350 on or before 2/28/10. So Ordered by Judge William E. Smith on 1/21/10. (Jackson, Ryan)
January 6, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 4 REPORT AND RECOMMENDATIONS recommending that Plaintiff's Application to Proceed without Prepayment of Fees (Document No. 2) be DENIED and that the District Court dismiss Plaintiff's Complaint (Document No. 1) without prejudice if he fails t o pay the required $350.00 filing fee by February 28, 2010. 2 MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis filed by Joseph R. Rocha Objections to R&R due by 1/20/2010. So Ordered by Magistrate Judge Lincoln D. Almond on 1/6/2010. (Noel, Jeannine)
December 8, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 3 MEMORANDUM AND ORDER - Plaintiff is ordered to supplement his Affidavit by providing full and complete answers to each question contained in the revised Application. This Court cannot determine whether Rocha qualifies to have his Application granted in this case until the additional information requested is received. Rocha must file the proper information by December 31, 2009 or risk having his Application denied and this matter dismissed. So Ordered by Magistrate Judge Lincoln D. Almond on 12/8/09. (Noel, Jeannine)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Rhode Island District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Rocha v. Peter Pan Bus Line Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Joseph R. Rocha
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Peter Pan Bus Line Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?