Shepard et al v. Air & Liquid Systems Corporation

Plaintiff: Roy Edward Shepard and Shirley Shepard
Defendant: Air & Liquid Systems Corporation, Alfa Laval, Inc., Anvil International, Inc., A.O. Smith Corporation, Armstrong International, Inc., Aurora Pump Company, A.Y. McDonald, Baldor Electric Co., Bird, Inc., Blackmer Pump Company, BW/IP, Inc., Cameron International Corporation, Carrier Corporation, CBS Corporation, Certainteed Corporation, Cleaver-Brooks, Inc., Clyde Union, Inc., Crane Company, Crane Pumps & Systems, Inc., Crown, Cork & Seal Company, Inc., Dezurik, Inc., The Dow Chemical Company, Eaton Corporation, Eckel Industries, Elliott Turbomachinery Co., The Falk Corporation, Flowserve Corporation, Flowserve US, Inc., FMC Corporation, Foster Wheeler LLC, Gardner Denver, Inc., General Electric Company, General Insulation Company, Georgia Pacific LLC, The Goodyear Tire & Rubber Company, The Gorman-Rupp Company, Goulds Pumps Inc., Grinnell LLC, The Griscom-Russell Company, Honeywell International, Inc., Howden Buffalo, Inc, IMO Industries, Inc., Ingersoll-Rand Company, ITT Corporation, John Bean Technologies Corporation, John Crane, Inc., Johnson Controls, Inc., The Joy Manufacturing Company, Metropolitan Life Insurance Co., The Nash Engineering Compnay, Neles-Jamesbury, Inc., New England Insulation Co., Packings & Insulation Co., Parker Hannifin Corporation, Patterson Pump Co., Pecora Corporation, Peerless Industries, Inc., Peerless Pump Company, Philadelphia Gear Corporation, P.I.C. Contractors, Inc., Quaker Chemical Corporation, Rapid American Corporation, Riley Power, Inc., Rockwell International Corporation, SB Decking, Inc., Schneider Electric, USA, Inc., Spiraz-Sarco, Inc., SPX Corp., Sterling Fluid Systems (USA) LLC, Taco, Inc., Trane US Inc., Tuthill Corporation, Tyco International (U.S.), Inc., Tyco Valves and Controls LP, Union Carbide Corporation, Union Pump Company, Velan Valve Corp., Viking Pump Co., Inc., Warren Pumps, Inc., Weil Pump Company, Inc., The William Powell Company, Yarway Corporation, York Industries, Inc., York International Corp., York Process System-Frick, Zurn Industries, Inc., Viad Corp., The Frick Company, Joy Global, Inc., Joy Technologies, Inc. and Sterling Fluid Systems (USA), LLC, improperly sued as Peerless Pump Company
Cross_claimant: Viad Corp., The William Powell Company, Grinnell LLC, BW/IP, Inc., Flowserve Corporation, Blackmer Pump Company, Gardner Denver, Inc., The Frick Company, IMO Industries, Inc., Johnson Controls, Inc., Joy Global, Inc., Union Pump Company, Viking Pump Co., Inc., Warren Pumps, Inc., York Industries, Inc., Zurn Industries, Inc., Tuthill Corporation, Air & Liquid Systems Corporation, Crane Company, Eckel Industries, Baldor Electric Co., Alfa Laval, Inc., Schneider Electric, USA, Inc., Joy Technologies, Inc., Sterling Fluid Systems (USA) LLC, Sterling Fluid Systems (USA), LLC, improperly sued as Peerless Pump Company and John Bean Technologies Corporation
Cross_defendant: A.O. Smith Corporation, A.Y. McDonald, Air & Liquid Systems Corporation, Alfa Laval, Inc., Anvil International, Inc., Armstrong International, Inc., Aurora Pump Company, BW/IP, Inc., Baldor Electric Co., Bird, Inc., Blackmer Pump Company, CBS Corporation, Cameron International Corporation, Carrier Corporation, Certainteed Corporation, Cleaver-Brooks, Inc., Clyde Union, Inc., Crane Company, Crane Pumps & Systems, Inc., Crown, Cork & Seal Company, Inc., Dezurik, Inc., Eaton Corporation, Eckel Industries, Elliott Turbomachinery Co., FMC Corporation, Flowserve Corporation, Flowserve US, Inc., Foster Wheeler LLC, Gardner Denver, Inc., General Electric Company, General Insulation Company, Georgia Pacific LLC, Goulds Pumps Inc., Grinnell LLC, Honeywell International, Inc., Howden Buffalo, Inc, IMO Industries, Inc., ITT Corporation, Ingersoll-Rand Company, John Bean Technologies Corporation, John Crane, Inc., Johnson Controls, Inc., Metropolitan Life Insurance Co., Neles-Jamesbury, Inc., New England Insulation Co., P.I.C. Contractors, Inc., Packings & Insulation Co., Parker Hannifin Corporation, Patterson Pump Co., Pecora Corporation, Peerless Industries, Inc., Peerless Pump Company, Philadelphia Gear Corporation, Quaker Chemical Corporation, Rapid American Corporation, Riley Power, Inc., Rockwell International Corporation, SB Decking, Inc., SPX Corp., Schneider Electric, USA, Inc., Spiraz-Sarco, Inc., Sterling Fluid Systems (USA) LLC, Taco, Inc., The Dow Chemical Company, The Falk Corporation, The Goodyear Tire & Rubber Company, The Gorman-Rupp Company, The Griscom-Russell Company, The Joy Manufacturing Company, The Nash Engineering Compnay, The William Powell Company, Trane US Inc., Tuthill Corporation, Tyco International (U.S.), Inc., Tyco Valves and Controls LP, Union Carbide Corporation, Union Pump Company, Velan Valve Corp., Viking Pump Co., Inc., Warren Pumps, Inc., Weil Pump Company, Inc., Yarway Corporation, York Industries, Inc., York International Corp., York Process System-Frick, Zurn Industries, Inc., Viad Corp., The Frick Company, Joy Global, Inc., Joy Technologies, Inc. and Sterling Fluid Systems (USA), LLC, improperly sued as Peerless Pump Company
Case Number: 1:2012cv00143
Filed: February 29, 2012
Court: Rhode Island District Court
Office: Providence Office
County: Providence
Referring Judge: Lincoln D. Almond
Presiding Judge: Ronald R Lagueux
Nature of Suit: Asbestos Personal Injury Product Liability
Cause of Action: 28:1441
Jury Demanded By: Defendant

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
September 29, 2015 605 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER ADOPTING REPORT AND RECOMMENDATIONS for 427 Motion for Summary Judgment, 593 Report and Recommendations, Defendant Crane Company's motion for summary judgment is denied. So Ordered by Senior Judge Ronald R. Lagueux on 9/29/2015. (Cavaco, Janice)
July 16, 2015 603 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER ADOPTING REPORT AND RECOMMENDATIONS for 459 Motion for Partial Summary Judgment filed by Shirley Shepard, Roy Edward Shepard, 458 Motion for Partial Summary Judgment filed by Shirley Shepard, Roy Edward Shepard, 460 Motion for Par tial Summary Judgment, filed by Shirley Shepard, Roy Edward Shepard, 592 Report and Recommendations. Plaintiff's Partial Motions for Summary judgment 458 , 459 , and 460 are denied. So Ordered by Senior Judge Ronald R. Lagueux on 7/16/2015. (Cavaco, Janice)
December 20, 2012 269 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER ADOPTING 240 REPORT AND RECOMMENDATIONS of Magistrate Judge Almond granting 183 motion for summary judgment and dismissing defendant DeZurik. So Ordered by Senior Judge Ronald R. Lagueux on 12/18/12. (Cavaco, Janice)
November 20, 2012 256 Opinion or Order of the Court MEMORANDUM AND ORDER denying 137 Motion to Remand to State Court; denying 194 Motion to Remand to State Court. So Ordered by Magistrate Judge Lincoln D. Almond on 11/20/2012. (Noel, Jeannine)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Rhode Island District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Shepard et al v. Air & Liquid Systems Corporation
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Roy Edward Shepard
Represented By: John E. Deaton
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Shirley Shepard
Represented By: John E. Deaton
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Air & Liquid Systems Corporation
Represented By: David A. Goldman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Alfa Laval, Inc.
Represented By: Kenneth R. Neal
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Anvil International, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: A.O. Smith Corporation
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Armstrong International, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Aurora Pump Company
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: A.Y. McDonald
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Baldor Electric Co.
Represented By: Steven T. Armato
Represented By: Lawrence G. Cetrulo
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Bird, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Blackmer Pump Company
Represented By: Beth A. Oldmixon
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: BW/IP, Inc.
Represented By: Brian D. Gross
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Cameron International Corporation
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Carrier Corporation
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: CBS Corporation
Represented By: Thomas W. Lyons, III
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Certainteed Corporation
Represented By: Steven T. Armato
Represented By: Lawrence G. Cetrulo
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Cleaver-Brooks, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Clyde Union, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Crane Company
Represented By: David A. Goldman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Crane Pumps & Systems, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Crown, Cork & Seal Company, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Dezurik, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: The Dow Chemical Company
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Eaton Corporation
Represented By: Peter R. Donatelli
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Eckel Industries
Represented By: David A. Goldman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Elliott Turbomachinery Co.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: The Falk Corporation
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Flowserve Corporation
Represented By: Brian D. Gross
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Flowserve US, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: FMC Corporation
Represented By: Andrew J. Murray
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Foster Wheeler LLC
Represented By: James R. Oswald
Represented By: Kristen W. Sherman
Represented By: R. Bart Totten
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Gardner Denver, Inc.
Represented By: Beth A. Oldmixon
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: General Electric Company
Represented By: Jeffrey M. Thomen
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: General Insulation Company
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Georgia Pacific LLC
Represented By: Brian D. Gross
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: The Goodyear Tire & Rubber Company
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: The Gorman-Rupp Company
Represented By: Michael J. Marcello
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Goulds Pumps Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Grinnell LLC
Represented By: Todd S. Holbrook
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: The Griscom-Russell Company
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Honeywell International, Inc.
Represented By: Steven T. Armato
Represented By: Lawrence G. Cetrulo
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Howden Buffalo, Inc
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: IMO Industries, Inc.
Represented By: Beth A. Oldmixon
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Ingersoll-Rand Company
Represented By: Timothy M Zabbo
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: ITT Corporation
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: John Bean Technologies Corporation
Represented By: Andrew J. Murray
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: John Crane, Inc.
Represented By: Kenneth R. Costa
Represented By: Jonathan F. Tabasky
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Johnson Controls, Inc.
Represented By: Beth A. Oldmixon
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: The Joy Manufacturing Company
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Metropolitan Life Insurance Co.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: The Nash Engineering Compnay
Represented By: Timothy M Zabbo
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Neles-Jamesbury, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: New England Insulation Co.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Packings & Insulation Co.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Parker Hannifin Corporation
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Patterson Pump Co.
Represented By: Michael J. Marcello
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Pecora Corporation
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Peerless Industries, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Peerless Pump Company
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Philadelphia Gear Corporation
Represented By: Nicole C. Mastan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: P.I.C. Contractors, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Quaker Chemical Corporation
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Rapid American Corporation
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Riley Power, Inc.
Represented By: Steven T. Armato
Represented By: Lawrence G. Cetrulo
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Rockwell International Corporation
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: SB Decking, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Schneider Electric, USA, Inc.
Represented By: Kenneth R. Neal
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Spiraz-Sarco, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: SPX Corp.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Sterling Fluid Systems (USA) LLC
Represented By: Andrew J. Murray
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Taco, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Trane US Inc.
Represented By: Timothy M Zabbo
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Tuthill Corporation
Represented By: Peter R. Donatelli
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Tyco International (U.S.), Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Tyco Valves and Controls LP
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Union Carbide Corporation
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Union Pump Company
Represented By: Beth A. Oldmixon
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Velan Valve Corp.
Represented By: Andrew J. Murray
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Viking Pump Co., Inc.
Represented By: Beth A. Oldmixon
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Warren Pumps, Inc.
Represented By: Beth A. Oldmixon
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Weil Pump Company, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: The William Powell Company
Represented By: Richard M. Dighello, Jr.
Represented By: Sharon A. Neiberg
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Yarway Corporation
Represented By: Todd S. Holbrook
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: York Industries, Inc.
Represented By: Beth A. Oldmixon
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: York International Corp.
Represented By: Beth A. Oldmixon
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: York Process System-Frick
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Zurn Industries, Inc.
Represented By: Beth A. Oldmixon
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Viad Corp.
Represented By: Stephen Adams
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: The Frick Company
Represented By: Beth A. Oldmixon
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Joy Global, Inc.
Represented By: Beth A. Oldmixon
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Joy Technologies, Inc.
Represented By: Beth A. Oldmixon
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Sterling Fluid Systems (USA), LLC, improperly sued as Peerless Pump Company
Represented By: Andrew J. Murray
Represented By: Andrew J. Murray
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Cross_claimant: Viad Corp.
Represented By: Stephen Adams
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Cross_claimant: The William Powell Company
Represented By: Sharon A. Neiberg
Represented By: Sharon A. Neiberg
Represented By: Sharon A. Neiberg
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Cross_claimant: Grinnell LLC
Represented By: Todd S. Holbrook
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Cross_claimant: BW/IP, Inc.
Represented By: Brian D. Gross
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Cross_claimant: Flowserve Corporation
Represented By: Brian D. Gross
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Cross_claimant: Blackmer Pump Company
Represented By: Beth A. Oldmixon
Represented By: Beth A. Oldmixon
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Cross_claimant: Gardner Denver, Inc.
Represented By: Beth A. Oldmixon
Represented By: Beth A. Oldmixon
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Cross_claimant: The Frick Company
Represented By: Beth A. Oldmixon
Represented By: Beth A. Oldmixon
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Cross_claimant: IMO Industries, Inc.
Represented By: Beth A. Oldmixon
Represented By: Beth A. Oldmixon
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Cross_claimant: Johnson Controls, Inc.
Represented By: Beth A. Oldmixon
Represented By: Beth A. Oldmixon
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Cross_claimant: Joy Global, Inc.
Represented By: Beth A. Oldmixon
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Cross_claimant: Union Pump Company
Represented By: Beth A. Oldmixon
Represented By: Beth A. Oldmixon
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Cross_claimant: Viking Pump Co., Inc.
Represented By: Beth A. Oldmixon
Represented By: Beth A. Oldmixon
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Cross_claimant: Warren Pumps, Inc.
Represented By: Beth A. Oldmixon
Represented By: Beth A. Oldmixon
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Cross_claimant: York Industries, Inc.
Represented By: Beth A. Oldmixon
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Cross_claimant: Zurn Industries, Inc.
Represented By: Beth A. Oldmixon
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Cross_claimant: Tuthill Corporation
Represented By: Peter R. Donatelli
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Cross_claimant: Air & Liquid Systems Corporation
Represented By: David A. Goldman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Cross_claimant: Crane Company
Represented By: David A. Goldman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Cross_claimant: Eckel Industries
Represented By: David A. Goldman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Cross_claimant: Baldor Electric Co.
Represented By: Steven T. Armato
Represented By: Lawrence G. Cetrulo
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Cross_claimant: Alfa Laval, Inc.
Represented By: Kenneth R. Neal
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Cross_claimant: Schneider Electric, USA, Inc.
Represented By: Kenneth R. Neal
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Cross_claimant: Joy Technologies, Inc.
Represented By: Beth A. Oldmixon
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Cross_claimant: Sterling Fluid Systems (USA) LLC
Represented By: Andrew J. Murray
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Cross_claimant: Sterling Fluid Systems (USA), LLC, improperly sued as Peerless Pump Company
Represented By: Andrew J. Murray
Represented By: Andrew J. Murray
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Cross_claimant: John Bean Technologies Corporation
Represented By: Andrew J. Murray
Represented By: Andrew J. Murray
Represented By: Andrew J. Murray
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Cross_defendant: A.O. Smith Corporation
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Cross_defendant: A.Y. McDonald
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Cross_defendant: Air & Liquid Systems Corporation
Represented By: David A. Goldman
Represented By: David A. Goldman
Represented By: David A. Goldman
Represented By: David A. Goldman
Represented By: David A. Goldman
Represented By: David A. Goldman
Represented By: David A. Goldman
Represented By: David A. Goldman
Represented By: David A. Goldman
Represented By: David A. Goldman
Represented By: David A. Goldman
Represented By: David A. Goldman
Represented By: David A. Goldman
Represented By: David A. Goldman
Represented By: David A. Goldman
Represented By: David A. Goldman
Represented By: David A. Goldman
Represented By: David A. Goldman
Represented By: David A. Goldman
Represented By: David A. Goldman
Represented By: David A. Goldman
Represented By: David A. Goldman
Represented By: David A. Goldman
Represented By: David A. Goldman
Represented By: David A. Goldman
Represented By: David A. Goldman
Represented By: David A. Goldman
Represented By: David A. Goldman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Cross_defendant: Alfa Laval, Inc.
Represented By: Kenneth R. Neal
Represented By: Kenneth R. Neal
Represented By: Kenneth R. Neal
Represented By: Kenneth R. Neal
Represented By: Kenneth R. Neal
Represented By: Kenneth R. Neal
Represented By: Kenneth R. Neal
Represented By: Kenneth R. Neal
Represented By: Kenneth R. Neal
Represented By: Kenneth R. Neal
Represented By: Kenneth R. Neal
Represented By: Kenneth R. Neal
Represented By: Kenneth R. Neal
Represented By: Kenneth R. Neal
Represented By: Kenneth R. Neal
Represented By: Kenneth R. Neal
Represented By: Kenneth R. Neal
Represented By: Kenneth R. Neal
Represented By: Kenneth R. Neal
Represented By: Kenneth R. Neal
Represented By: Kenneth R. Neal
Represented By: Kenneth R. Neal
Represented By: Kenneth R. Neal
Represented By: Kenneth R. Neal
Represented By: Kenneth R. Neal
Represented By: Kenneth R. Neal
Represented By: Kenneth R. Neal
Represented By: Kenneth R. Neal
Represented By: Kenneth R. Neal
Represented By: Kenneth R. Neal
Represented By: Kenneth R. Neal
Represented By: Kenneth R. Neal
Represented By: Kenneth R. Neal
Represented By: Kenneth R. Neal
Represented By: Kenneth R. Neal
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Cross_defendant: Anvil International, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Cross_defendant: Armstrong International, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Cross_defendant: Aurora Pump Company
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Cross_defendant: BW/IP, Inc.
Represented By: Brian D. Gross
Represented By: Brian D. Gross
Represented By: Brian D. Gross
Represented By: Brian D. Gross
Represented By: Brian D. Gross
Represented By: Brian D. Gross
Represented By: Brian D. Gross
Represented By: Brian D. Gross
Represented By: Brian D. Gross
Represented By: Brian D. Gross
Represented By: Brian D. Gross
Represented By: Brian D. Gross
Represented By: Brian D. Gross
Represented By: Brian D. Gross
Represented By: Brian D. Gross
Represented By: Brian D. Gross
Represented By: Brian D. Gross
Represented By: Brian D. Gross
Represented By: Brian D. Gross
Represented By: Brian D. Gross
Represented By: Brian D. Gross
Represented By: Brian D. Gross
Represented By: Brian D. Gross
Represented By: Brian D. Gross
Represented By: Brian D. Gross
Represented By: Brian D. Gross
Represented By: Brian D. Gross
Represented By: Brian D. Gross
Represented By: Brian D. Gross
Represented By: Brian D. Gross
Represented By: Brian D. Gross
Represented By: Brian D. Gross
Represented By: Brian D. Gross
Represented By: Brian D. Gross
Represented By: Brian D. Gross
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Cross_defendant: Baldor Electric Co.
Represented By: Steven T. Armato
Represented By: Lawrence G. Cetrulo
Represented By: Steven T. Armato
Represented By: Lawrence G. Cetrulo
Represented By: Steven T. Armato
Represented By: Lawrence G. Cetrulo
Represented By: Steven T. Armato
Represented By: Lawrence G. Cetrulo
Represented By: Steven T. Armato
Represented By: Lawrence G. Cetrulo
Represented By: Steven T. Armato
Represented By: Lawrence G. Cetrulo
Represented By: Steven T. Armato
Represented By: Lawrence G. Cetrulo
Represented By: Steven T. Armato
Represented By: Lawrence G. Cetrulo
Represented By: Steven T. Armato
Represented By: Lawrence G. Cetrulo
Represented By: Steven T. Armato
Represented By: Lawrence G. Cetrulo
Represented By: Steven T. Armato
Represented By: Lawrence G. Cetrulo
Represented By: Steven T. Armato
Represented By: Lawrence G. Cetrulo
Represented By: Steven T. Armato
Represented By: Lawrence G. Cetrulo
Represented By: Steven T. Armato
Represented By: Lawrence G. Cetrulo
Represented By: Steven T. Armato
Represented By: Lawrence G. Cetrulo
Represented By: Steven T. Armato
Represented By: Lawrence G. Cetrulo
Represented By: Steven T. Armato
Represented By: Lawrence G. Cetrulo
Represented By: Steven T. Armato
Represented By: Lawrence G. Cetrulo
Represented By: Steven T. Armato
Represented By: Lawrence G. Cetrulo
Represented By: Steven T. Armato
Represented By: Lawrence G. Cetrulo
Represented By: Steven T. Armato
Represented By: Lawrence G. Cetrulo
Represented By: Steven T. Armato
Represented By: Lawrence G. Cetrulo
Represented By: Steven T. Armato
Represented By: Lawrence G. Cetrulo
Represented By: Steven T. Armato
Represented By: Lawrence G. Cetrulo
Represented By: Steven T. Armato
Represented By: Lawrence G. Cetrulo
Represented By: Steven T. Armato
Represented By: Lawrence G. Cetrulo
Represented By: Steven T. Armato
Represented By: Lawrence G. Cetrulo
Represented By: Steven T. Armato
Represented By: Lawrence G. Cetrulo
Represented By: Steven T. Armato
Represented By: Lawrence G. Cetrulo
Represented By: Steven T. Armato
Represented By: Lawrence G. Cetrulo
Represented By: Steven T. Armato
Represented By: Lawrence G. Cetrulo
Represented By: Steven T. Armato
Represented By: Lawrence G. Cetrulo
Represented By: Steven T. Armato
Represented By: Lawrence G. Cetrulo
Represented By: Steven T. Armato
Represented By: Lawrence G. Cetrulo
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Cross_defendant: Bird, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Cross_defendant: Blackmer Pump Company
Represented By: Beth A. Oldmixon
Represented By: Beth A. Oldmixon
Represented By: Beth A. Oldmixon
Represented By: Beth A. Oldmixon
Represented By: Beth A. Oldmixon
Represented By: Beth A. Oldmixon
Represented By: Beth A. Oldmixon
Represented By: Beth A. Oldmixon
Represented By: Beth A. Oldmixon
Represented By: Beth A. Oldmixon
Represented By: Beth A. Oldmixon
Represented By: Beth A. Oldmixon
Represented By: Beth A. Oldmixon
Represented By: Beth A. Oldmixon
Represented By: Beth A. Oldmixon
Represented By: Beth A. Oldmixon
Represented By: Beth A. Oldmixon
Represented By: Beth A. Oldmixon
Represented By: Beth A. Oldmixon
Represented By: Beth A. Oldmixon
Represented By: Beth A. Oldmixon
Represented By: Beth A. Oldmixon
Represented By: Beth A. Oldmixon
Represented By: Beth A. Oldmixon
Represented By: Beth A. Oldmixon
Represented By: Beth A. Oldmixon
Represented By: Beth A. Oldmixon
Represented By: Beth A. Oldmixon
Represented By: Beth A. Oldmixon
Represented By: Beth A. Oldmixon
Represented By: Beth A. Oldmixon
Represented By: Beth A. Oldmixon
Represented By: Beth A. Oldmixon
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Cross_defendant: CBS Corporation
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Cross_defendant: Cameron International Corporation
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Cross_defendant: Carrier Corporation
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Cross_defendant: Certainteed Corporation
Represented By: Steven T. Armato
Represented By: Lawrence G. Cetrulo
Represented By: Steven T. Armato
Represented By: Lawrence G. Cetrulo
Represented By: Steven T. Armato
Represented By: Lawrence G. Cetrulo
Represented By: Steven T. Armato
Represented By: Lawrence G. Cetrulo
Represented By: Steven T. Armato
Represented By: Lawrence G. Cetrulo
Represented By: Steven T. Armato
Represented By: Lawrence G. Cetrulo
Represented By: Steven T. Armato
Represented By: Lawrence G. Cetrulo
Represented By: Steven T. Armato
Represented By: Lawrence G. Cetrulo
Represented By: Steven T. Armato
Represented By: Lawrence G. Cetrulo
Represented By: Steven T. Armato
Represented By: Lawrence G. Cetrulo
Represented By: Steven T. Armato
Represented By: Lawrence G. Cetrulo
Represented By: Steven T. Armato
Represented By: Lawrence G. Cetrulo
Represented By: Steven T. Armato
Represented By: Lawrence G. Cetrulo
Represented By: Steven T. Armato
Represented By: Lawrence G. Cetrulo
Represented By: Steven T. Armato
Represented By: Lawrence G. Cetrulo
Represented By: Steven T. Armato
Represented By: Lawrence G. Cetrulo
Represented By: Steven T. Armato
Represented By: Lawrence G. Cetrulo
Represented By: Steven T. Armato
Represented By: Lawrence G. Cetrulo
Represented By: Steven T. Armato
Represented By: Lawrence G. Cetrulo
Represented By: Steven T. Armato
Represented By: Lawrence G. Cetrulo
Represented By: Steven T. Armato
Represented By: Lawrence G. Cetrulo
Represented By: Steven T. Armato
Represented By: Lawrence G. Cetrulo
Represented By: Steven T. Armato
Represented By: Lawrence G. Cetrulo
Represented By: Steven T. Armato
Represented By: Lawrence G. Cetrulo
Represented By: Steven T. Armato
Represented By: Lawrence G. Cetrulo
Represented By: Steven T. Armato
Represented By: Lawrence G. Cetrulo
Represented By: Steven T. Armato
Represented By: Lawrence G. Cetrulo
Represented By: Steven T. Armato
Represented By: Lawrence G. Cetrulo
Represented By: Steven T. Armato
Represented By: Lawrence G. Cetrulo
Represented By: Steven T. Armato
Represented By: Lawrence G. Cetrulo
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Cross_defendant: Cleaver-Brooks, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Cross_defendant: Clyde Union, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Cross_defendant: Crane Company
Represented By: David A. Goldman
Represented By: David A. Goldman
Represented By: David A. Goldman
Represented By: David A. Goldman
Represented By: David A. Goldman
Represented By: David A. Goldman
Represented By: David A. Goldman
Represented By: David A. Goldman
Represented By: David A. Goldman
Represented By: David A. Goldman
Represented By: David A. Goldman
Represented By: David A. Goldman
Represented By: David A. Goldman
Represented By: David A. Goldman
Represented By: David A. Goldman
Represented By: David A. Goldman
Represented By: David A. Goldman
Represented By: David A. Goldman
Represented By: David A. Goldman
Represented By: David A. Goldman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Cross_defendant: Crane Pumps & Systems, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Cross_defendant: Crown, Cork & Seal Company, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Cross_defendant: Dezurik, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Cross_defendant: Eaton Corporation
Represented By: Peter R. Donatelli
Represented By: Peter R. Donatelli
Represented By: Peter R. Donatelli
Represented By: Peter R. Donatelli
Represented By: Peter R. Donatelli
Represented By: Peter R. Donatelli
Represented By: Peter R. Donatelli
Represented By: Peter R. Donatelli
Represented By: Peter R. Donatelli
Represented By: Peter R. Donatelli
Represented By: Peter R. Donatelli
Represented By: Peter R. Donatelli
Represented By: Peter R. Donatelli
Represented By: Peter R. Donatelli
Represented By: Peter R. Donatelli
Represented By: Peter R. Donatelli
Represented By: Peter R. Donatelli
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Cross_defendant: Eckel Industries
Represented By: David A. Goldman
Represented By: David A. Goldman
Represented By: David A. Goldman
Represented By: David A. Goldman
Represented By: David A. Goldman
Represented By: David A. Goldman
Represented By: David A. Goldman
Represented By: David A. Goldman
Represented By: David A. Goldman
Represented By: David A. Goldman
Represented By: David A. Goldman
Represented By: David A. Goldman
Represented By: David A. Goldman
Represented By: David A. Goldman
Represented By: David A. Goldman
Represented By: David A. Goldman
Represented By: David A. Goldman
Represented By: David A. Goldman
Represented By: David A. Goldman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Cross_defendant: Elliott Turbomachinery Co.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Cross_defendant: FMC Corporation
Represented By: Andrew J. Murray
Represented By: Andrew J. Murray
Represented By: Andrew J. Murray
Represented By: Andrew J. Murray
Represented By: Andrew J. Murray
Represented By: Andrew J. Murray
Represented By: Andrew J. Murray
Represented By: Andrew J. Murray
Represented By: Andrew J. Murray
Represented By: Andrew J. Murray
Represented By: Andrew J. Murray
Represented By: Andrew J. Murray
Represented By: Andrew J. Murray
Represented By: Andrew J. Murray
Represented By: Andrew J. Murray
Represented By: Andrew J. Murray
Represented By: Andrew J. Murray
Represented By: Andrew J. Murray
Represented By: Andrew J. Murray
Represented By: Andrew J. Murray
Represented By: Andrew J. Murray
Represented By: Andrew J. Murray
Represented By: Andrew J. Murray
Represented By: Andrew J. Murray
Represented By: Andrew J. Murray
Represented By: Andrew J. Murray
Represented By: Andrew J. Murray
Represented By: Andrew J. Murray
Represented By: Andrew J. Murray
Represented By: Andrew J. Murray
Represented By: Andrew J. Murray
Represented By: Andrew J. Murray
Represented By: Andrew J. Murray
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Cross_defendant: Flowserve Corporation
Represented By: Brian D. Gross
Represented By: Brian D. Gross
Represented By: Brian D. Gross
Represented By: Brian D. Gross
Represented By: Brian D. Gross
Represented By: Brian D. Gross
Represented By: Brian D. Gross
Represented By: Brian D. Gross
Represented By: Brian D. Gross
Represented By: Brian D. Gross
Represented By: Brian D. Gross
Represented By: Brian D. Gross
Represented By: Brian D. Gross
Represented By: Brian D. Gross
Represented By: Brian D. Gross
Represented By: Brian D. Gross
Represented By: Brian D. Gross
Represented By: Brian D. Gross
Represented By: Brian D. Gross
Represented By: Brian D. Gross
Represented By: Brian D. Gross
Represented By: Brian D. Gross
Represented By: Brian D. Gross
Represented By: Brian D. Gross
Represented By: Brian D. Gross
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Cross_defendant: Flowserve US, Inc.
Represented By: Mark J. Claflin
Represented By: Jeffrey S. McAllister
Represented By: Mark J. Claflin
Represented By: Jeffrey S. McAllister
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Cross_defendant: Foster Wheeler LLC
Represented By: James R. Oswald
Represented By: Kristen W. Sherman
Represented By: R. Bart Totten
Represented By: James R. Oswald
Represented By: Kristen W. Sherman
Represented By: R. Bart Totten
Represented By: James R. Oswald
Represented By: Kristen W. Sherman
Represented By: R. Bart Totten
Represented By: James R. Oswald
Represented By: Kristen W. Sherman
Represented By: R. Bart Totten
Represented By: James R. Oswald
Represented By: Kristen W. Sherman
Represented By: R. Bart Totten
Represented By: James R. Oswald
Represented By: Kristen W. Sherman
Represented By: R. Bart Totten
Represented By: James R. Oswald
Represented By: Kristen W. Sherman
Represented By: R. Bart Totten
Represented By: James R. Oswald
Represented By: Kristen W. Sherman
Represented By: R. Bart Totten
Represented By: James R. Oswald
Represented By: Kristen W. Sherman
Represented By: R. Bart Totten
Represented By: James R. Oswald
Represented By: Kristen W. Sherman
Represented By: R. Bart Totten
Represented By: James R. Oswald
Represented By: Kristen W. Sherman
Represented By: R. Bart Totten
Represented By: James R. Oswald
Represented By: Kristen W. Sherman
Represented By: R. Bart Totten
Represented By: James R. Oswald
Represented By: Kristen W. Sherman
Represented By: R. Bart Totten
Represented By: James R. Oswald
Represented By: Kristen W. Sherman
Represented By: R. Bart Totten
Represented By: James R. Oswald
Represented By: Kristen W. Sherman
Represented By: R. Bart Totten
Represented By: James R. Oswald
Represented By: Kristen W. Sherman
Represented By: R. Bart Totten
Represented By: James R. Oswald
Represented By: Kristen W. Sherman
Represented By: R. Bart Totten
Represented By: James R. Oswald
Represented By: Kristen W. Sherman
Represented By: R. Bart Totten
Represented By: James R. Oswald
Represented By: Kristen W. Sherman
Represented By: R. Bart Totten
Represented By: James R. Oswald
Represented By: Kristen W. Sherman
Represented By: R. Bart Totten
Represented By: James R. Oswald
Represented By: Kristen W. Sherman
Represented By: R. Bart Totten
Represented By: James R. Oswald
Represented By: Kristen W. Sherman
Represented By: R. Bart Totten
Represented By: James R. Oswald
Represented By: Kristen W. Sherman
Represented By: R. Bart Totten
Represented By: James R. Oswald
Represented By: Kristen W. Sherman
Represented By: R. Bart Totten
Represented By: James R. Oswald
Represented By: Kristen W. Sherman
Represented By: R. Bart Totten
Represented By: James R. Oswald
Represented By: Kristen W. Sherman
Represented By: R. Bart Totten
Represented By: James R. Oswald
Represented By: Kristen W. Sherman
Represented By: R. Bart Totten
Represented By: James R. Oswald
Represented By: Kristen W. Sherman
Represented By: R. Bart Totten
Represented By: James R. Oswald
Represented By: Kristen W. Sherman
Represented By: R. Bart Totten
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Cross_defendant: Gardner Denver, Inc.
Represented By: Beth A. Oldmixon
Represented By: Beth A. Oldmixon
Represented By: Beth A. Oldmixon
Represented By: Beth A. Oldmixon
Represented By: Beth A. Oldmixon
Represented By: Beth A. Oldmixon
Represented By: Beth A. Oldmixon
Represented By: Beth A. Oldmixon
Represented By: Beth A. Oldmixon
Represented By: Beth A. Oldmixon
Represented By: Beth A. Oldmixon
Represented By: Beth A. Oldmixon
Represented By: Beth A. Oldmixon
Represented By: Beth A. Oldmixon
Represented By: Beth A. Oldmixon
Represented By: Beth A. Oldmixon
Represented By: Beth A. Oldmixon
Represented By: Beth A. Oldmixon
Represented By: Beth A. Oldmixon
Represented By: Beth A. Oldmixon
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Cross_defendant: General Electric Company
Represented By: Jeffrey M. Thomen
Represented By: Jeffrey M. Thomen
Represented By: Jeffrey M. Thomen
Represented By: Jeffrey M. Thomen
Represented By: Jeffrey M. Thomen
Represented By: Jeffrey M. Thomen
Represented By: Jeffrey M. Thomen
Represented By: Jeffrey M. Thomen
Represented By: Jeffrey M. Thomen
Represented By: Jeffrey M. Thomen
Represented By: Jeffrey M. Thomen
Represented By: Jeffrey M. Thomen
Represented By: Jeffrey M. Thomen
Represented By: Jeffrey M. Thomen
Represented By: Jeffrey M. Thomen
Represented By: Jeffrey M. Thomen
Represented By: Jeffrey M. Thomen
Represented By: Jeffrey M. Thomen
Represented By: Jeffrey M. Thomen
Represented By: Jeffrey M. Thomen
Represented By: Jeffrey M. Thomen
Represented By: Jeffrey M. Thomen
Represented By: Jeffrey M. Thomen
Represented By: Jeffrey M. Thomen
Represented By: Jeffrey M. Thomen
Represented By: Jeffrey M. Thomen
Represented By: Jeffrey M. Thomen
Represented By: Jeffrey M. Thomen
Represented By: Jeffrey M. Thomen
Represented By: Jeffrey M. Thomen
Represented By: Jeffrey M. Thomen
Represented By: Jeffrey M. Thomen
Represented By: Jeffrey M. Thomen
Represented By: Jeffrey M. Thomen
Represented By: Jeffrey M. Thomen
Represented By: Jeffrey M. Thomen
Represented By: Jeffrey M. Thomen
Represented By: Jeffrey M. Thomen
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Cross_defendant: General Insulation Company
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Cross_defendant: Georgia Pacific LLC
Represented By: Brian D. Gross
Represented By: Brian D. Gross
Represented By: Brian D. Gross
Represented By: Brian D. Gross
Represented By: Brian D. Gross
Represented By: Brian D. Gross
Represented By: Brian D. Gross
Represented By: Brian D. Gross
Represented By: Brian D. Gross
Represented By: Brian D. Gross
Represented By: Brian D. Gross
Represented By: Brian D. Gross
Represented By: Brian D. Gross
Represented By: Brian D. Gross
Represented By: Brian D. Gross
Represented By: Brian D. Gross
Represented By: Brian D. Gross
Represented By: Brian D. Gross
Represented By: Brian D. Gross
Represented By: Brian D. Gross
Represented By: Brian D. Gross
Represented By: Brian D. Gross
Represented By: Brian D. Gross
Represented By: Brian D. Gross
Represented By: Brian D. Gross
Represented By: Brian D. Gross
Represented By: Brian D. Gross
Represented By: Brian D. Gross
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Cross_defendant: Goulds Pumps Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Cross_defendant: Grinnell LLC
Represented By: Todd S. Holbrook
Represented By: Todd S. Holbrook
Represented By: Todd S. Holbrook
Represented By: Todd S. Holbrook
Represented By: Todd S. Holbrook
Represented By: Todd S. Holbrook
Represented By: Todd S. Holbrook
Represented By: Todd S. Holbrook
Represented By: Todd S. Holbrook
Represented By: Todd S. Holbrook
Represented By: Todd S. Holbrook
Represented By: Todd S. Holbrook
Represented By: Todd S. Holbrook
Represented By: Todd S. Holbrook
Represented By: Todd S. Holbrook
Represented By: Todd S. Holbrook
Represented By: Todd S. Holbrook
Represented By: Todd S. Holbrook
Represented By: Todd S. Holbrook
Represented By: Todd S. Holbrook
Represented By: Todd S. Holbrook
Represented By: Todd S. Holbrook
Represented By: Todd S. Holbrook
Represented By: Todd S. Holbrook
Represented By: Todd S. Holbrook
Represented By: Todd S. Holbrook
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Cross_defendant: Honeywell International, Inc.
Represented By: Steven T. Armato
Represented By: Lawrence G. Cetrulo
Represented By: Steven T. Armato
Represented By: Lawrence G. Cetrulo
Represented By: Steven T. Armato
Represented By: Lawrence G. Cetrulo
Represented By: Steven T. Armato
Represented By: Lawrence G. Cetrulo
Represented By: Steven T. Armato
Represented By: Lawrence G. Cetrulo
Represented By: Steven T. Armato
Represented By: Lawrence G. Cetrulo
Represented By: Steven T. Armato
Represented By: Lawrence G. Cetrulo
Represented By: Steven T. Armato
Represented By: Lawrence G. Cetrulo
Represented By: Steven T. Armato
Represented By: Lawrence G. Cetrulo
Represented By: Steven T. Armato
Represented By: Lawrence G. Cetrulo
Represented By: Steven T. Armato
Represented By: Lawrence G. Cetrulo
Represented By: Steven T. Armato
Represented By: Lawrence G. Cetrulo
Represented By: Steven T. Armato
Represented By: Lawrence G. Cetrulo
Represented By: Steven T. Armato
Represented By: Lawrence G. Cetrulo
Represented By: Steven T. Armato
Represented By: Lawrence G. Cetrulo
Represented By: Steven T. Armato
Represented By: Lawrence G. Cetrulo
Represented By: Steven T. Armato
Represented By: Lawrence G. Cetrulo
Represented By: Steven T. Armato
Represented By: Lawrence G. Cetrulo
Represented By: Steven T. Armato
Represented By: Lawrence G. Cetrulo
Represented By: Steven T. Armato
Represented By: Lawrence G. Cetrulo
Represented By: Steven T. Armato
Represented By: Lawrence G. Cetrulo
Represented By: Steven T. Armato
Represented By: Lawrence G. Cetrulo
Represented By: Steven T. Armato
Represented By: Lawrence G. Cetrulo
Represented By: Steven T. Armato
Represented By: Lawrence G. Cetrulo
Represented By: Steven T. Armato
Represented By: Lawrence G. Cetrulo
Represented By: Steven T. Armato
Represented By: Lawrence G. Cetrulo
Represented By: Steven T. Armato
Represented By: Lawrence G. Cetrulo
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Cross_defendant: Howden Buffalo, Inc
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Cross_defendant: IMO Industries, Inc.
Represented By: Beth A. Oldmixon
Represented By: Beth A. Oldmixon
Represented By: Beth A. Oldmixon
Represented By: Beth A. Oldmixon
Represented By: Beth A. Oldmixon
Represented By: Beth A. Oldmixon
Represented By: Beth A. Oldmixon
Represented By: Beth A. Oldmixon
Represented By: Beth A. Oldmixon
Represented By: Beth A. Oldmixon
Represented By: Beth A. Oldmixon
Represented By: Beth A. Oldmixon
Represented By: Beth A. Oldmixon
Represented By: Beth A. Oldmixon
Represented By: Beth A. Oldmixon
Represented By: Beth A. Oldmixon
Represented By: Beth A. Oldmixon
Represented By: Beth A. Oldmixon
Represented By: Beth A. Oldmixon
Represented By: Beth A. Oldmixon
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Cross_defendant: ITT Corporation
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Cross_defendant: Ingersoll-Rand Company
Represented By: Timothy M Zabbo
Represented By: Timothy M Zabbo
Represented By: Timothy M Zabbo
Represented By: Timothy M Zabbo
Represented By: Timothy M Zabbo
Represented By: Timothy M Zabbo
Represented By: Timothy M Zabbo
Represented By: Timothy M Zabbo
Represented By: Timothy M Zabbo
Represented By: Timothy M Zabbo
Represented By: Timothy M Zabbo
Represented By: Timothy M Zabbo
Represented By: Timothy M Zabbo
Represented By: Timothy M Zabbo
Represented By: Timothy M Zabbo
Represented By: Timothy M Zabbo
Represented By: Timothy M Zabbo
Represented By: Timothy M Zabbo
Represented By: Timothy M Zabbo
Represented By: Timothy M Zabbo
Represented By: Timothy M Zabbo
Represented By: Timothy M Zabbo
Represented By: Timothy M Zabbo
Represented By: Timothy M Zabbo
Represented By: Timothy M Zabbo
Represented By: Timothy M Zabbo
Represented By: Timothy M Zabbo
Represented By: Timothy M Zabbo
Represented By: Timothy M Zabbo
Represented By: Timothy M Zabbo
Represented By: Timothy M Zabbo
Represented By: Timothy M Zabbo
Represented By: Timothy M Zabbo
Represented By: Timothy M Zabbo
Represented By: Timothy M Zabbo
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Cross_defendant: John Bean Technologies Corporation
Represented By: Andrew J. Murray
Represented By: Andrew J. Murray
Represented By: Andrew J. Murray
Represented By: Andrew J. Murray
Represented By: Andrew J. Murray
Represented By: Andrew J. Murray
Represented By: Andrew J. Murray
Represented By: Andrew J. Murray
Represented By: Andrew J. Murray
Represented By: Andrew J. Murray
Represented By: Andrew J. Murray
Represented By: Andrew J. Murray
Represented By: Andrew J. Murray
Represented By: Andrew J. Murray
Represented By: Andrew J. Murray
Represented By: Andrew J. Murray
Represented By: Andrew J. Murray
Represented By: Andrew J. Murray
Represented By: Andrew J. Murray
Represented By: Andrew J. Murray
Represented By: Andrew J. Murray
Represented By: Andrew J. Murray
Represented By: Andrew J. Murray
Represented By: Andrew J. Murray
Represented By: Andrew J. Murray
Represented By: Andrew J. Murray
Represented By: Andrew J. Murray
Represented By: Andrew J. Murray
Represented By: Andrew J. Murray
Represented By: Andrew J. Murray
Represented By: Andrew J. Murray
Represented By: Andrew J. Murray
Represented By: Andrew J. Murray
Represented By: Andrew J. Murray
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Cross_defendant: John Crane, Inc.
Represented By: Kenneth R. Costa
Represented By: Jonathan F. Tabasky
Represented By: Kenneth R. Costa
Represented By: Jonathan F. Tabasky
Represented By: Kenneth R. Costa
Represented By: Jonathan F. Tabasky
Represented By: Kenneth R. Costa
Represented By: Jonathan F. Tabasky
Represented By: Kenneth R. Costa
Represented By: Jonathan F. Tabasky
Represented By: Kenneth R. Costa
Represented By: Jonathan F. Tabasky
Represented By: Kenneth R. Costa
Represented By: Jonathan F. Tabasky
Represented By: Kenneth R. Costa
Represented By: Jonathan F. Tabasky
Represented By: Kenneth R. Costa
Represented By: Jonathan F. Tabasky
Represented By: Kenneth R. Costa
Represented By: Jonathan F. Tabasky
Represented By: Kenneth R. Costa
Represented By: Jonathan F. Tabasky
Represented By: Kenneth R. Costa
Represented By: Jonathan F. Tabasky
Represented By: Kenneth R. Costa
Represented By: Jonathan F. Tabasky
Represented By: Kenneth R. Costa
Represented By: Jonathan F. Tabasky
Represented By: Kenneth R. Costa
Represented By: Jonathan F. Tabasky
Represented By: Kenneth R. Costa
Represented By: Jonathan F. Tabasky
Represented By: Kenneth R. Costa
Represented By: Jonathan F. Tabasky
Represented By: Kenneth R. Costa
Represented By: Jonathan F. Tabasky
Represented By: Kenneth R. Costa
Represented By: Jonathan F. Tabasky
Represented By: Kenneth R. Costa
Represented By: Jonathan F. Tabasky
Represented By: Kenneth R. Costa
Represented By: Jonathan F. Tabasky
Represented By: Kenneth R. Costa
Represented By: Jonathan F. Tabasky
Represented By: Kenneth R. Costa
Represented By: Jonathan F. Tabasky
Represented By: Kenneth R. Costa
Represented By: Jonathan F. Tabasky
Represented By: Kenneth R. Costa
Represented By: Jonathan F. Tabasky
Represented By: Kenneth R. Costa
Represented By: Jonathan F. Tabasky
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Cross_defendant: Johnson Controls, Inc.
Represented By: Beth A. Oldmixon
Represented By: Beth A. Oldmixon
Represented By: Beth A. Oldmixon
Represented By: Beth A. Oldmixon
Represented By: Beth A. Oldmixon
Represented By: Beth A. Oldmixon
Represented By: Beth A. Oldmixon
Represented By: Beth A. Oldmixon
Represented By: Beth A. Oldmixon
Represented By: Beth A. Oldmixon
Represented By: Beth A. Oldmixon
Represented By: Beth A. Oldmixon
Represented By: Beth A. Oldmixon
Represented By: Beth A. Oldmixon
Represented By: Beth A. Oldmixon
Represented By: Beth A. Oldmixon
Represented By: Beth A. Oldmixon
Represented By: Beth A. Oldmixon
Represented By: Beth A. Oldmixon
Represented By: Beth A. Oldmixon
Represented By: Beth A. Oldmixon
Represented By: Beth A. Oldmixon
Represented By: Beth A. Oldmixon
Represented By: Beth A. Oldmixon
Represented By: Beth A. Oldmixon
Represented By: Beth A. Oldmixon
Represented By: Beth A. Oldmixon
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Cross_defendant: Metropolitan Life Insurance Co.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Cross_defendant: Neles-Jamesbury, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Cross_defendant: New England Insulation Co.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Cross_defendant: P.I.C. Contractors, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Cross_defendant: Packings & Insulation Co.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Cross_defendant: Parker Hannifin Corporation
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Cross_defendant: Patterson Pump Co.
Represented By: Michael J. Marcello
Represented By: Michael J. Marcello
Represented By: Michael J. Marcello
Represented By: Michael J. Marcello
Represented By: Michael J. Marcello
Represented By: Michael J. Marcello
Represented By: Michael J. Marcello
Represented By: Michael J. Marcello
Represented By: Michael J. Marcello
Represented By: Michael J. Marcello
Represented By: Michael J. Marcello
Represented By: Michael J. Marcello
Represented By: Michael J. Marcello
Represented By: Michael J. Marcello
Represented By: Michael J. Marcello
Represented By: Michael J. Marcello
Represented By: Michael J. Marcello
Represented By: Michael J. Marcello
Represented By: Michael J. Marcello
Represented By: Michael J. Marcello
Represented By: Michael J. Marcello
Represented By: Michael J. Marcello
Represented By: Michael J. Marcello
Represented By: Michael J. Marcello
Represented By: Michael J. Marcello
Represented By: Michael J. Marcello
Represented By: Michael J. Marcello
Represented By: Michael J. Marcello
Represented By: Michael J. Marcello
Represented By: Michael J. Marcello
Represented By: Michael J. Marcello
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Cross_defendant: Pecora Corporation
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Cross_defendant: Peerless Industries, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Cross_defendant: Peerless Pump Company
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Cross_defendant: Philadelphia Gear Corporation
Represented By: Nicole C. Mastan
Represented By: Nicole C. Mastan
Represented By: Nicole C. Mastan
Represented By: Nicole C. Mastan
Represented By: Nicole C. Mastan
Represented By: Nicole C. Mastan
Represented By: Nicole C. Mastan
Represented By: Nicole C. Mastan
Represented By: Nicole C. Mastan
Represented By: Nicole C. Mastan
Represented By: Nicole C. Mastan
Represented By: Nicole C. Mastan
Represented By: Nicole C. Mastan
Represented By: Nicole C. Mastan
Represented By: Nicole C. Mastan
Represented By: Nicole C. Mastan
Represented By: Nicole C. Mastan
Represented By: Nicole C. Mastan
Represented By: Nicole C. Mastan
Represented By: Nicole C. Mastan
Represented By: Nicole C. Mastan
Represented By: Nicole C. Mastan
Represented By: Nicole C. Mastan
Represented By: Nicole C. Mastan
Represented By: Nicole C. Mastan
Represented By: Nicole C. Mastan
Represented By: Nicole C. Mastan
Represented By: Nicole C. Mastan
Represented By: Nicole C. Mastan
Represented By: Nicole C. Mastan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Cross_defendant: Quaker Chemical Corporation
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Cross_defendant: Rapid American Corporation
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Cross_defendant: Riley Power, Inc.
Represented By: Steven T. Armato
Represented By: Lawrence G. Cetrulo
Represented By: Steven T. Armato
Represented By: Lawrence G. Cetrulo
Represented By: Steven T. Armato
Represented By: Lawrence G. Cetrulo
Represented By: Steven T. Armato
Represented By: Lawrence G. Cetrulo
Represented By: Steven T. Armato
Represented By: Lawrence G. Cetrulo
Represented By: Steven T. Armato
Represented By: Lawrence G. Cetrulo
Represented By: Steven T. Armato
Represented By: Lawrence G. Cetrulo
Represented By: Steven T. Armato
Represented By: Lawrence G. Cetrulo
Represented By: Steven T. Armato
Represented By: Lawrence G. Cetrulo
Represented By: Steven T. Armato
Represented By: Lawrence G. Cetrulo
Represented By: Steven T. Armato
Represented By: Lawrence G. Cetrulo
Represented By: Steven T. Armato
Represented By: Lawrence G. Cetrulo
Represented By: Steven T. Armato
Represented By: Lawrence G. Cetrulo
Represented By: Steven T. Armato
Represented By: Lawrence G. Cetrulo
Represented By: Steven T. Armato
Represented By: Lawrence G. Cetrulo
Represented By: Steven T. Armato
Represented By: Lawrence G. Cetrulo
Represented By: Steven T. Armato
Represented By: Lawrence G. Cetrulo
Represented By: Steven T. Armato
Represented By: Lawrence G. Cetrulo
Represented By: Steven T. Armato
Represented By: Lawrence G. Cetrulo
Represented By: Steven T. Armato
Represented By: Lawrence G. Cetrulo
Represented By: Steven T. Armato
Represented By: Lawrence G. Cetrulo
Represented By: Steven T. Armato
Represented By: Lawrence G. Cetrulo
Represented By: Steven T. Armato
Represented By: Lawrence G. Cetrulo
Represented By: Steven T. Armato
Represented By: Lawrence G. Cetrulo
Represented By: Steven T. Armato
Represented By: Lawrence G. Cetrulo
Represented By: Steven T. Armato
Represented By: Lawrence G. Cetrulo
Represented By: Steven T. Armato
Represented By: Lawrence G. Cetrulo
Represented By: Steven T. Armato
Represented By: Lawrence G. Cetrulo
Represented By: Steven T. Armato
Represented By: Lawrence G. Cetrulo
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Cross_defendant: Rockwell International Corporation
Represented By: Mark J. Claflin
Represented By: Jeffrey S. McAllister
Represented By: Jeffrey S. McAllister
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Cross_defendant: SB Decking, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Cross_defendant: SPX Corp.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Cross_defendant: Schneider Electric, USA, Inc.
Represented By: Kenneth R. Neal
Represented By: Kenneth R. Neal
Represented By: Kenneth R. Neal
Represented By: Kenneth R. Neal
Represented By: Kenneth R. Neal
Represented By: Kenneth R. Neal
Represented By: Kenneth R. Neal
Represented By: Kenneth R. Neal
Represented By: Kenneth R. Neal
Represented By: Kenneth R. Neal
Represented By: Kenneth R. Neal
Represented By: Kenneth R. Neal
Represented By: Kenneth R. Neal
Represented By: Kenneth R. Neal
Represented By: Kenneth R. Neal
Represented By: Kenneth R. Neal
Represented By: Kenneth R. Neal
Represented By: Kenneth R. Neal
Represented By: Kenneth R. Neal
Represented By: Kenneth R. Neal
Represented By: Kenneth R. Neal
Represented By: Kenneth R. Neal
Represented By: Kenneth R. Neal
Represented By: Kenneth R. Neal
Represented By: Kenneth R. Neal
Represented By: Kenneth R. Neal
Represented By: Kenneth R. Neal
Represented By: Kenneth R. Neal
Represented By: Kenneth R. Neal
Represented By: Kenneth R. Neal
Represented By: Kenneth R. Neal
Represented By: Kenneth R. Neal
Represented By: Kenneth R. Neal
Represented By: Kenneth R. Neal
Represented By: Kenneth R. Neal
Represented By: Kenneth R. Neal
Represented By: Kenneth R. Neal
Represented By: Kenneth R. Neal
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Cross_defendant: Spiraz-Sarco, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Cross_defendant: Sterling Fluid Systems (USA) LLC
Represented By: Andrew J. Murray
Represented By: Andrew J. Murray
Represented By: Andrew J. Murray
Represented By: Andrew J. Murray
Represented By: Andrew J. Murray
Represented By: Andrew J. Murray
Represented By: Andrew J. Murray
Represented By: Andrew J. Murray
Represented By: Andrew J. Murray
Represented By: Andrew J. Murray
Represented By: Andrew J. Murray
Represented By: Andrew J. Murray
Represented By: Andrew J. Murray
Represented By: Andrew J. Murray
Represented By: Andrew J. Murray
Represented By: Andrew J. Murray
Represented By: Andrew J. Murray
Represented By: Andrew J. Murray
Represented By: Andrew J. Murray
Represented By: Andrew J. Murray
Represented By: Andrew J. Murray
Represented By: Andrew J. Murray
Represented By: Andrew J. Murray
Represented By: Andrew J. Murray
Represented By: Andrew J. Murray
Represented By: Andrew J. Murray
Represented By: Andrew J. Murray
Represented By: Andrew J. Murray
Represented By: Andrew J. Murray
Represented By: Andrew J. Murray
Represented By: Andrew J. Murray
Represented By: Andrew J. Murray
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Cross_defendant: Taco, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Cross_defendant: The Dow Chemical Company
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Cross_defendant: The Falk Corporation
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Cross_defendant: The Goodyear Tire & Rubber Company
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Cross_defendant: The Gorman-Rupp Company
Represented By: Michael J. Marcello
Represented By: Michael J. Marcello
Represented By: Michael J. Marcello
Represented By: Michael J. Marcello
Represented By: Michael J. Marcello
Represented By: Michael J. Marcello
Represented By: Michael J. Marcello
Represented By: Michael J. Marcello
Represented By: Michael J. Marcello
Represented By: Michael J. Marcello
Represented By: Michael J. Marcello
Represented By: Michael J. Marcello
Represented By: Michael J. Marcello
Represented By: Michael J. Marcello
Represented By: Michael J. Marcello
Represented By: Michael J. Marcello
Represented By: Michael J. Marcello
Represented By: Michael J. Marcello
Represented By: Michael J. Marcello
Represented By: Michael J. Marcello
Represented By: Michael J. Marcello
Represented By: Michael J. Marcello
Represented By: Michael J. Marcello
Represented By: Michael J. Marcello
Represented By: Michael J. Marcello
Represented By: Michael J. Marcello
Represented By: Michael J. Marcello
Represented By: Michael J. Marcello
Represented By: Michael J. Marcello
Represented By: Michael J. Marcello
Represented By: Michael J. Marcello
Represented By: Michael J. Marcello
Represented By: Michael J. Marcello
Represented By: Michael J. Marcello
Represented By: Michael J. Marcello
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Cross_defendant: The Griscom-Russell Company
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Cross_defendant: The Joy Manufacturing Company
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Cross_defendant: The Nash Engineering Compnay
Represented By: Timothy M Zabbo
Represented By: Timothy M Zabbo
Represented By: Timothy M Zabbo
Represented By: Timothy M Zabbo
Represented By: Timothy M Zabbo
Represented By: Timothy M Zabbo
Represented By: Timothy M Zabbo
Represented By: Timothy M Zabbo
Represented By: Timothy M Zabbo
Represented By: Timothy M Zabbo
Represented By: Timothy M Zabbo
Represented By: Timothy M Zabbo
Represented By: Timothy M Zabbo
Represented By: Timothy M Zabbo
Represented By: Timothy M Zabbo
Represented By: Timothy M Zabbo
Represented By: Timothy M Zabbo
Represented By: Timothy M Zabbo
Represented By: Timothy M Zabbo
Represented By: Timothy M Zabbo
Represented By: Timothy M Zabbo
Represented By: Timothy M Zabbo
Represented By: Timothy M Zabbo
Represented By: Timothy M Zabbo
Represented By: Timothy M Zabbo
Represented By: Timothy M Zabbo
Represented By: Timothy M Zabbo
Represented By: Timothy M Zabbo
Represented By: Timothy M Zabbo
Represented By: Timothy M Zabbo
Represented By: Timothy M Zabbo
Represented By: Timothy M Zabbo
Represented By: Timothy M Zabbo
Represented By: Timothy M Zabbo
Represented By: Timothy M Zabbo
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Cross_defendant: The William Powell Company
Represented By: Sharon A. Neiberg
Represented By: Sharon A. Neiberg
Represented By: Sharon A. Neiberg
Represented By: Richard M. Dighello, Jr.
Represented By: Sharon A. Neiberg
Represented By: Richard M. Dighello, Jr.
Represented By: Sharon A. Neiberg
Represented By: Richard M. Dighello, Jr.
Represented By: Sharon A. Neiberg
Represented By: Richard M. Dighello, Jr.
Represented By: Sharon A. Neiberg
Represented By: Richard M. Dighello, Jr.
Represented By: Sharon A. Neiberg
Represented By: Richard M. Dighello, Jr.
Represented By: Sharon A. Neiberg
Represented By: Richard M. Dighello, Jr.
Represented By: Sharon A. Neiberg
Represented By: Richard M. Dighello, Jr.
Represented By: Sharon A. Neiberg
Represented By: Richard M. Dighello, Jr.
Represented By: Sharon A. Neiberg
Represented By: Richard M. Dighello, Jr.
Represented By: Sharon A. Neiberg
Represented By: Richard M. Dighello, Jr.
Represented By: Sharon A. Neiberg
Represented By: Richard M. Dighello, Jr.
Represented By: Sharon A. Neiberg
Represented By: Richard M. Dighello, Jr.
Represented By: Sharon A. Neiberg
Represented By: Richard M. Dighello, Jr.
Represented By: Sharon A. Neiberg
Represented By: Richard M. Dighello, Jr.
Represented By: Sharon A. Neiberg
Represented By: Richard M. Dighello, Jr.
Represented By: Sharon A. Neiberg
Represented By: Richard M. Dighello, Jr.
Represented By: Sharon A. Neiberg
Represented By: Richard M. Dighello, Jr.
Represented By: Sharon A. Neiberg
Represented By: Richard M. Dighello, Jr.
Represented By: Sharon A. Neiberg
Represented By: Richard M. Dighello, Jr.
Represented By: Sharon A. Neiberg
Represented By: Richard M. Dighello, Jr.
Represented By: Sharon A. Neiberg
Represented By: Richard M. Dighello, Jr.
Represented By: Sharon A. Neiberg
Represented By: Richard M. Dighello, Jr.
Represented By: Sharon A. Neiberg
Represented By: Richard M. Dighello, Jr.
Represented By: Sharon A. Neiberg
Represented By: Richard M. Dighello, Jr.
Represented By: Sharon A. Neiberg
Represented By: Richard M. Dighello, Jr.
Represented By: Sharon A. Neiberg
Represented By: Richard M. Dighello, Jr.
Represented By: Sharon A. Neiberg
Represented By: Richard M. Dighello, Jr.
Represented By: Sharon A. Neiberg
Represented By: Richard M. Dighello, Jr.
Represented By: Sharon A. Neiberg
Represented By: Richard M. Dighello, Jr.
Represented By: Sharon A. Neiberg
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Cross_defendant: Trane US Inc.
Represented By: Timothy M Zabbo
Represented By: Timothy M Zabbo
Represented By: Timothy M Zabbo
Represented By: Timothy M Zabbo
Represented By: Timothy M Zabbo
Represented By: Timothy M Zabbo
Represented By: Timothy M Zabbo
Represented By: Timothy M Zabbo
Represented By: Timothy M Zabbo
Represented By: Timothy M Zabbo
Represented By: Timothy M Zabbo
Represented By: Timothy M Zabbo
Represented By: Timothy M Zabbo
Represented By: Timothy M Zabbo
Represented By: Timothy M Zabbo
Represented By: Timothy M Zabbo
Represented By: Timothy M Zabbo
Represented By: Timothy M Zabbo
Represented By: Timothy M Zabbo
Represented By: Timothy M Zabbo
Represented By: Timothy M Zabbo
Represented By: Timothy M Zabbo
Represented By: Timothy M Zabbo
Represented By: Timothy M Zabbo
Represented By: Timothy M Zabbo
Represented By: Timothy M Zabbo
Represented By: Timothy M Zabbo
Represented By: Timothy M Zabbo
Represented By: Timothy M Zabbo
Represented By: Timothy M Zabbo
Represented By: Timothy M Zabbo
Represented By: Timothy M Zabbo
Represented By: Timothy M Zabbo
Represented By: Timothy M Zabbo
Represented By: Timothy M Zabbo
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Cross_defendant: Tuthill Corporation
Represented By: Peter R. Donatelli
Represented By: Peter R. Donatelli
Represented By: Peter R. Donatelli
Represented By: Peter R. Donatelli
Represented By: Peter R. Donatelli
Represented By: Peter R. Donatelli
Represented By: Peter R. Donatelli
Represented By: Peter R. Donatelli
Represented By: Peter R. Donatelli
Represented By: Peter R. Donatelli
Represented By: Peter R. Donatelli
Represented By: Peter R. Donatelli
Represented By: Peter R. Donatelli
Represented By: Peter R. Donatelli
Represented By: Peter R. Donatelli
Represented By: Peter R. Donatelli
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Cross_defendant: Tyco International (U.S.), Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Cross_defendant: Tyco Valves and Controls LP
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Cross_defendant: Union Carbide Corporation
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Cross_defendant: Union Pump Company
Represented By: Beth A. Oldmixon
Represented By: Beth A. Oldmixon
Represented By: Beth A. Oldmixon
Represented By: Beth A. Oldmixon
Represented By: Beth A. Oldmixon
Represented By: Beth A. Oldmixon
Represented By: Beth A. Oldmixon
Represented By: Beth A. Oldmixon
Represented By: Beth A. Oldmixon
Represented By: Beth A. Oldmixon
Represented By: Beth A. Oldmixon
Represented By: Beth A. Oldmixon
Represented By: Beth A. Oldmixon
Represented By: Beth A. Oldmixon
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Cross_defendant: Velan Valve Corp.
Represented By: Andrew J. Murray
Represented By: Andrew J. Murray
Represented By: Andrew J. Murray
Represented By: Andrew J. Murray
Represented By: Andrew J. Murray
Represented By: Andrew J. Murray
Represented By: Andrew J. Murray
Represented By: Andrew J. Murray
Represented By: Andrew J. Murray
Represented By: Andrew J. Murray
Represented By: Andrew J. Murray
Represented By: Andrew J. Murray
Represented By: Andrew J. Murray
Represented By: Andrew J. Murray
Represented By: Andrew J. Murray
Represented By: Andrew J. Murray
Represented By: Andrew J. Murray
Represented By: Andrew J. Murray
Represented By: Andrew J. Murray
Represented By: Andrew J. Murray
Represented By: Andrew J. Murray
Represented By: Andrew J. Murray
Represented By: Andrew J. Murray
Represented By: Andrew J. Murray
Represented By: Andrew J. Murray
Represented By: Andrew J. Murray
Represented By: Andrew J. Murray
Represented By: Andrew J. Murray
Represented By: Andrew J. Murray
Represented By: Andrew J. Murray
Represented By: Andrew J. Murray
Represented By: Andrew J. Murray
Represented By: Andrew J. Murray
Represented By: Andrew J. Murray
Represented By: Andrew J. Murray
Represented By: Andrew J. Murray
Represented By: Andrew J. Murray
Represented By: Andrew J. Murray
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Cross_defendant: Viking Pump Co., Inc.
Represented By: Beth A. Oldmixon
Represented By: Beth A. Oldmixon
Represented By: Beth A. Oldmixon
Represented By: Beth A. Oldmixon
Represented By: Beth A. Oldmixon
Represented By: Beth A. Oldmixon
Represented By: Beth A. Oldmixon
Represented By: Beth A. Oldmixon
Represented By: Beth A. Oldmixon
Represented By: Beth A. Oldmixon
Represented By: Beth A. Oldmixon
Represented By: Beth A. Oldmixon
Represented By: Beth A. Oldmixon
Represented By: Beth A. Oldmixon
Represented By: Beth A. Oldmixon
Represented By: Beth A. Oldmixon
Represented By: Beth A. Oldmixon
Represented By: Beth A. Oldmixon
Represented By: Beth A. Oldmixon
Represented By: Beth A. Oldmixon
Represented By: Beth A. Oldmixon
Represented By: Beth A. Oldmixon
Represented By: Beth A. Oldmixon
Represented By: Beth A. Oldmixon
Represented By: Beth A. Oldmixon
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Cross_defendant: Warren Pumps, Inc.
Represented By: Beth A. Oldmixon
Represented By: Beth A. Oldmixon
Represented By: Beth A. Oldmixon
Represented By: Beth A. Oldmixon
Represented By: Beth A. Oldmixon
Represented By: Beth A. Oldmixon
Represented By: Beth A. Oldmixon
Represented By: Beth A. Oldmixon
Represented By: Beth A. Oldmixon
Represented By: Beth A. Oldmixon
Represented By: Beth A. Oldmixon
Represented By: Beth A. Oldmixon
Represented By: Beth A. Oldmixon
Represented By: Beth A. Oldmixon
Represented By: Beth A. Oldmixon
Represented By: Beth A. Oldmixon
Represented By: Beth A. Oldmixon
Represented By: Beth A. Oldmixon
Represented By: Beth A. Oldmixon
Represented By: Beth A. Oldmixon
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Cross_defendant: Weil Pump Company, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Cross_defendant: Yarway Corporation
Represented By: Todd S. Holbrook
Represented By: Todd S. Holbrook
Represented By: Todd S. Holbrook
Represented By: Todd S. Holbrook
Represented By: Todd S. Holbrook
Represented By: Todd S. Holbrook
Represented By: Todd S. Holbrook
Represented By: Todd S. Holbrook
Represented By: Todd S. Holbrook
Represented By: Todd S. Holbrook
Represented By: Todd S. Holbrook
Represented By: Todd S. Holbrook
Represented By: Todd S. Holbrook
Represented By: Todd S. Holbrook
Represented By: Todd S. Holbrook
Represented By: Todd S. Holbrook
Represented By: Todd S. Holbrook
Represented By: Todd S. Holbrook
Represented By: Todd S. Holbrook
Represented By: Todd S. Holbrook
Represented By: Todd S. Holbrook
Represented By: Todd S. Holbrook
Represented By: Todd S. Holbrook
Represented By: Todd S. Holbrook
Represented By: Todd S. Holbrook
Represented By: Todd S. Holbrook
Represented By: Todd S. Holbrook
Represented By: Todd S. Holbrook
Represented By: Todd S. Holbrook
Represented By: Todd S. Holbrook
Represented By: Todd S. Holbrook
Represented By: Todd S. Holbrook
Represented By: Todd S. Holbrook
Represented By: Todd S. Holbrook
Represented By: Todd S. Holbrook
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Cross_defendant: York Industries, Inc.
Represented By: Beth A. Oldmixon
Represented By: Beth A. Oldmixon
Represented By: Beth A. Oldmixon
Represented By: Beth A. Oldmixon
Represented By: Beth A. Oldmixon
Represented By: Beth A. Oldmixon
Represented By: Beth A. Oldmixon
Represented By: Beth A. Oldmixon
Represented By: Beth A. Oldmixon
Represented By: Beth A. Oldmixon
Represented By: Beth A. Oldmixon
Represented By: Beth A. Oldmixon
Represented By: Beth A. Oldmixon
Represented By: Beth A. Oldmixon
Represented By: Beth A. Oldmixon
Represented By: Beth A. Oldmixon
Represented By: Beth A. Oldmixon
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Cross_defendant: York International Corp.
Represented By: Beth A. Oldmixon
Represented By: Beth A. Oldmixon
Represented By: Beth A. Oldmixon
Represented By: Beth A. Oldmixon
Represented By: Beth A. Oldmixon
Represented By: Beth A. Oldmixon
Represented By: Beth A. Oldmixon
Represented By: Beth A. Oldmixon
Represented By: Beth A. Oldmixon
Represented By: Beth A. Oldmixon
Represented By: Beth A. Oldmixon
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Cross_defendant: York Process System-Frick
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Cross_defendant: Zurn Industries, Inc.
Represented By: Beth A. Oldmixon
Represented By: Beth A. Oldmixon
Represented By: Beth A. Oldmixon
Represented By: Beth A. Oldmixon
Represented By: Beth A. Oldmixon
Represented By: Beth A. Oldmixon
Represented By: Beth A. Oldmixon
Represented By: Beth A. Oldmixon
Represented By: Beth A. Oldmixon
Represented By: Beth A. Oldmixon
Represented By: Beth A. Oldmixon
Represented By: Beth A. Oldmixon
Represented By: Beth A. Oldmixon
Represented By: Beth A. Oldmixon
Represented By: Beth A. Oldmixon
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Cross_defendant: Viad Corp.
Represented By: Stephen Adams
Represented By: Stephen Adams
Represented By: Stephen Adams
Represented By: Stephen Adams
Represented By: Stephen Adams
Represented By: Stephen Adams
Represented By: Stephen Adams
Represented By: Stephen Adams
Represented By: Stephen Adams
Represented By: Stephen Adams
Represented By: Stephen Adams
Represented By: Stephen Adams
Represented By: Stephen Adams
Represented By: Stephen Adams
Represented By: Stephen Adams
Represented By: Stephen Adams
Represented By: Stephen Adams
Represented By: Stephen Adams
Represented By: Stephen Adams
Represented By: Stephen Adams
Represented By: Stephen Adams
Represented By: Stephen Adams
Represented By: Stephen Adams
Represented By: Stephen Adams
Represented By: Stephen Adams
Represented By: Stephen Adams
Represented By: Stephen Adams
Represented By: Stephen Adams
Represented By: Stephen Adams
Represented By: Stephen Adams
Represented By: Stephen Adams
Represented By: Stephen Adams
Represented By: Stephen Adams
Represented By: Stephen Adams
Represented By: Stephen Adams
Represented By: Stephen Adams
Represented By: Stephen Adams
Represented By: Stephen Adams
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Cross_defendant: The Frick Company
Represented By: Beth A. Oldmixon
Represented By: Beth A. Oldmixon
Represented By: Beth A. Oldmixon
Represented By: Beth A. Oldmixon
Represented By: Beth A. Oldmixon
Represented By: Beth A. Oldmixon
Represented By: Beth A. Oldmixon
Represented By: Beth A. Oldmixon
Represented By: Beth A. Oldmixon
Represented By: Beth A. Oldmixon
Represented By: Beth A. Oldmixon
Represented By: Beth A. Oldmixon
Represented By: Beth A. Oldmixon
Represented By: Beth A. Oldmixon
Represented By: Beth A. Oldmixon
Represented By: Beth A. Oldmixon
Represented By: Beth A. Oldmixon
Represented By: Beth A. Oldmixon
Represented By: Beth A. Oldmixon
Represented By: Beth A. Oldmixon
Represented By: Beth A. Oldmixon
Represented By: Beth A. Oldmixon
Represented By: Beth A. Oldmixon
Represented By: Beth A. Oldmixon
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Cross_defendant: Joy Global, Inc.
Represented By: Beth A. Oldmixon
Represented By: Beth A. Oldmixon
Represented By: Beth A. Oldmixon
Represented By: Beth A. Oldmixon
Represented By: Beth A. Oldmixon
Represented By: Beth A. Oldmixon
Represented By: Beth A. Oldmixon
Represented By: Beth A. Oldmixon
Represented By: Beth A. Oldmixon
Represented By: Beth A. Oldmixon
Represented By: Beth A. Oldmixon
Represented By: Beth A. Oldmixon
Represented By: Beth A. Oldmixon
Represented By: Beth A. Oldmixon
Represented By: Beth A. Oldmixon
Represented By: Beth A. Oldmixon
Represented By: Beth A. Oldmixon
Represented By: Beth A. Oldmixon
Represented By: Beth A. Oldmixon
Represented By: Beth A. Oldmixon
Represented By: Beth A. Oldmixon
Represented By: Beth A. Oldmixon
Represented By: Beth A. Oldmixon
Represented By: Beth A. Oldmixon
Represented By: Beth A. Oldmixon
Represented By: Beth A. Oldmixon
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Cross_defendant: Joy Technologies, Inc.
Represented By: Beth A. Oldmixon
Represented By: Beth A. Oldmixon
Represented By: Beth A. Oldmixon
Represented By: Beth A. Oldmixon
Represented By: Beth A. Oldmixon
Represented By: Beth A. Oldmixon
Represented By: Beth A. Oldmixon
Represented By: Beth A. Oldmixon
Represented By: Beth A. Oldmixon
Represented By: Beth A. Oldmixon
Represented By: Beth A. Oldmixon
Represented By: Beth A. Oldmixon
Represented By: Beth A. Oldmixon
Represented By: Beth A. Oldmixon
Represented By: Beth A. Oldmixon
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Cross_defendant: Sterling Fluid Systems (USA), LLC, improperly sued as Peerless Pump Company
Represented By: Andrew J. Murray
Represented By: Andrew J. Murray
Represented By: Andrew J. Murray
Represented By: Andrew J. Murray
Represented By: Andrew J. Murray
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?