Young v. Brown University et al

Plaintiff: Christopher Young
Defendant: Brown University, Christina Paxson, Ruth Simmons, Edward Wing, Marisa Quinn, Paul Shanley and Brown University Police Officers
Case Number: 1:2012cv00937
Filed: December 21, 2012
Court: Rhode Island District Court
Office: Providence Office
County: Providence
Referring Judge: Lincoln D. Almond
Presiding Judge: Mary M. Lisi
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Other
Cause of Action: 28:1441 Notice of Removal - Civil Rights
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
January 8, 2016 105 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER DENYING 94 Bill of Costs. No costs are awarded to Defendants. So Ordered by Senior Judge Mary M. Lisi on 1/8/2016. A copy of this Order was forwarded to Plaintiff via first-class mail.(Feeley, Susan)
September 15, 2015 91 Opinion or Order of the Court MEMORANDUM AND ORDER denying 89 Motion for Reconsideration re 63 Memorandum of Decision on Motion for Judgment on Partial Findings. So Ordered by Judge Mary M. Lisi on 9/15/2015. (Duhamel, John)
October 22, 2014 63 Opinion or Order of the Court MEMORANDUM OF DECISION granting in part and denying in part Defendants' Oral Motion for Judgment on Partial Findings: The motion is GRANTED with respect to Counts I, II, and XII. With respect to Count X, the motion is denied, pending additional fact finding by this Court at trial. So Ordered by Judge Mary M. Lisi on 10/22/2014. (Duhamel, John)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Rhode Island District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Young v. Brown University et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Christopher Young
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Brown University
Represented By: James M. Green
Represented By: Beverly E. Ledbetter
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Christina Paxson
Represented By: James M. Green
Represented By: Beverly E. Ledbetter
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Ruth Simmons
Represented By: James M. Green
Represented By: Beverly E. Ledbetter
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Edward Wing
Represented By: James M. Green
Represented By: Beverly E. Ledbetter
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Marisa Quinn
Represented By: James M. Green
Represented By: Beverly E. Ledbetter
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Paul Shanley
Represented By: James M. Green
Represented By: Beverly E. Ledbetter
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Brown University Police Officers
Represented By: James M. Green
Represented By: Beverly E. Ledbetter
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?