Steward Health Care System LLC et al v. Blue Cross & Blue Shield of Rhode Island
Plaintiff: Steward Health Care System LLC, Blackstone Medical Center, Inc. and Blackstone Rehabilitation Hospital, Inc.
Defendant: Blue Cross & Blue Shield of Rhode Island
Case Number: 1:2013cv00405
Filed: June 4, 2013
Court: US District Court for the District of Rhode Island
Office: Providence Office
County: Providence
Presiding Judge: Lincoln D. Almond
Presiding Judge: William E. Smith
Nature of Suit: Anti-Trust
Cause of Action: 15:2 Antitrust Litigation
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
April 23, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 346 OPINION AND ORDER denying 157 Motion for Summary Judgment. So Ordered by Chief Judge William E. Smith on 4/23/2018. (Jackson, Ryan)
January 10, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 154 ORDER dismissing 128 Appeal of Magistrate Judge Decision to District Court re: 126 Order on Motion to Compel. So Ordered by Chief Judge William E. Smith on 1/10/2017. (Jackson, Ryan)
February 19, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 34 OPINION AND ORDER denying 16 Motion to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim. So Ordered by Chief Judge William E. Smith on 2/19/2014. (Urizandi, Nisshy)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Rhode Island District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Steward Health Care System LLC et al v. Blue Cross & Blue Shield of Rhode Island
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Steward Health Care System LLC
Represented By: Robert Clark Corrente
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Blackstone Medical Center, Inc.
Represented By: Robert Clark Corrente
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Blackstone Rehabilitation Hospital, Inc.
Represented By: Robert Clark Corrente
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Blue Cross & Blue Shield of Rhode Island
Represented By: Patricia K. Rocha
Represented By: John A. Tarantino
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?