Loestrin 24 FE Antitrust Litigation
Plaintiff: Fraternal Order of Police Fort Lauderdale Lodge 31, HEB Grocery Company L.P., Rite-Aid Corporation, Electrical Workers 242 & 294 Health & Welfare Fund, Painters District Council No. 30 Health & Welfare Fund, City of Providence, Walgreen Co., Allied Services Division Welfare Fund, Direct Purchaser Class Plaintiffs, Rite-Aid Hdqtrs. Corp., Melissa Chrestman, Ahold USA, Inc., End Payor Plaintiffs, Melisa Chrestman, Denise Loy, Safeway, Inc., Laborers International Union of North America, Rochester Drug Co-Operative, Inc., Albertson's, LLC, The Kroger Co., New York Hotel Trades Council & Hotel Association of New York City, Inc. Health Benefits Fund, American Sales Company, LLC, United Food and Commercial Workers Local 1776, Teamsters Local 237 Welfare Benefits Fund, CVS Pharmacy, Inc. and Mary Alexander
Defendant: Warner Chilcott Holdings Company III, Ltd., Warner Chilcott Sales (US), LLC, Warner Chilcott Company, LLC, Allergan PLC, Warner Chilcott U.S., LLC, Lupin Ltd., Warner Chilcott Corporation, Watson Laboratories, Inc., Warner Chilcott Public Limited Company, Warner Chilcott Company, Inc., Watson Pharmaceuticals, Inc., Warner Chilcott Laboratories Ireland Limited, Lupin Pharmaceuticals, Inc. and Actavis, Inc.
Interested Party: Health Care Service Corporation, Caremark, LLC, CVS Health Corporation, Bayer Healthcare Pharmaceuticals, Inc. and Plaintiffs
Case Number: 1:2013md02472
Filed: October 3, 2013
Court: US District Court for the District of Rhode Island
Office: Providence Office
County: Providence
Presiding Judge: William E Smith (2)
Referring Judge: Patricia A Sullivan
Nature of Suit: Anti-Trust
Cause of Action: 28:1331
Jury Demanded By: Both
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on March 31, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
March 31, 2021 Filing 1465 NOTICE by Direct Purchaser Class Plaintiffs Regarding Claims Administration (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B)(Sorensen, David)
September 4, 2020 Filing 1464 TRANSCRIPT of Motion held on 08/27/2020 before Judge Smith. Court Reporter/Transcriber Lisa Schwam, Telephone number 401-752-7128. Transcript may be viewed at the court public terminal or purchased through the Court Reporter/Transcriber before the deadline for Release of Transcript Restriction. After that date it may be obtained through PACER. NOTICE TO COUNSEL: Redaction Requests must be filed for personal identifiers only. All other redactions must be requested by motion. For local policy and sample redaction request visit our website at www.rid.uscourts.gov and select Transcripts under the Case Information menu option. Redaction Request due 9/25/2020. Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 10/5/2020. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 12/3/2020. (Schwam, Lisa)
September 3, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 1463 ORDER RECOMMENDING TERMINATION OF MULTIDISTRICT LITIGATION. So Ordered by District Judge William E. Smith on 9/2/2020. (Jackson, Ryan)
September 1, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 1462 ORDER adopting #1443 Report and Recommendations and granting #1428 Motion for Attorney Fees; and, granting #1447 DIRECT PURCHASER CLASS PLAINTIFFS' UNOPPOSED MOTION FOR FINAL APPROVAL OF SETTLEMENT, APPROVAL OF PROPOSED PLAN OF ALLOCATION, ADOPTION OF REPORT AND RECOMMENDATION OF MAGISTRATE JUDGE, AND ORDER OF DISMISSAL WITH PREJUDICE. So Ordered by District Judge William E. Smith on 9/1/2020. (Jackson, Ryan)
September 1, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 1461 ORDER adopting #1444 Report and Recommendations and granting #1437 Motion for Attorney Fees; and, granting #1452 THIRD-PARTY PAYOR PLAINTIFFS MOTION FOR FINAL APPROVAL OF CLASS ACTION SETTLEMENT AND FINAL JUDGMENT ANDORDER OF DISMISSAL OF ALL THIRD-PARTY PAYOR CLASS CLAIMS WITHPREJUDICE AS TO THE WARNER CHILCOTT DEFENDANTS. So Ordered by District Judge William E. Smith on 9/1/2020. (Jackson, Ryan)
September 1, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 1460 ORDER GRANTING END-PAYOR PLAINTIFFS' MOTION FOR FINAL APPROVALOF CLASS ACTION SETTLEMENT AND FINAL JUDGMENT AND ORDER OFDISMISSAL OF ALL END-PAYOR CLASS CLAIMS WITH PREJUDICE AS TODEFENDANTS LUPIN LIMITED AND LUPIN PHARMACEUTICALS, INC. So Ordered by District Judge William E. Smith on 9/1/2020. (Jackson, Ryan)
August 28, 2020 Filing 1459 TRANSCRIPT ORDER ACKNOWLEDGMENT Entered re: #1458 Transcript Order. Court Reporter/Transcriber: Lisa Schwam. (Dias, Jennifer)
August 27, 2020 Filing 1458 TRANSCRIPT ORDER for proceedings held on 8/27/2020 before Judge Smith. Ordinary Transcript delivery selected. Transcript to be delivered in 30 days.. (Robertson, Sharon)
August 27, 2020 Filing 1457 TRANSCRIPT ORDER ACKNOWLEDGMENT Entered re: #1456 Transcript Order. Court Reporter/Transcriber: Lisa Schwam. (Dias, Jennifer)
August 27, 2020 Filing 1456 TRANSCRIPT ORDER for proceedings held on 8/27/2020 before Judge Smith. Ordinary Transcript delivery selected. Transcript to be delivered in 30 days.. (Johnson, Kristen)
August 27, 2020 Minute Entry for proceedings held before District Judge William E. Smith (2): Fairness Hearing held on 8/27/2020 re #1420 , #1409 : T. Sobol. N. Benjamin J. Pace, M. Buchman, B. McConnell, D. Cavello, D. Sorensen, E. Noteware, J. Meltzer, K. Johnson, M. Gidley, M. Miller, P. Kohn, S. Robertson and S. Shadowen. Arguments heard. Court address the parties. For reasons stated on the record, the Court approves the settlement and adopts the Report and Recommendation with regards to Attorneys Fees. Orders to enter. Recess. (Court Reporter L. Schwam via Video Hearing at 10:03 a.m..) (Potter, Carrie)
August 24, 2020 Opinion or Order TEXT ORDER granting #1455 Motion to Amend/Correct. However, End-Payor and Third-Party Payor Plaintiffs are directed to file revised proposed orders that include language adopting and approving the findings and recommendations of Magistrate Judge Patricia A. Sullivan. So Ordered by District Judge William E. Smith on 8/24/2020. (Jackson, Ryan)
August 24, 2020 Opinion or Order TEXT ORDER construing #1432 NOTICE by Health Care Service Corporation of Withdrawal of its Opposition to the Third-Party Payor Class' Motion to Reject Opt Out Requests, as a motion for leave to rejoin the Third-Party Payor Class and granting same. So Ordered by District Judge William E. Smith on 8/24/2020. (Jackson, Ryan)
August 21, 2020 Filing 1455 MOTION to Amend/Correct #1452 MOTION for Settlement End-Payor and Third-Party Payor Plaintiffs Motion for Final Approval of Class Action Settlements filed by End Payor Plaintiffs. Responses due by 9/4/2020. (Attachments: #1 Corrected Proposed Order (Lupin Settlement), #2 Corrected Proposed Order (Warner Chilcott Settlement))(Buchman, Michael)
August 13, 2020 Filing 1454 DECLARATION re #1452 MOTION for Settlement End-Payor and Third-Party Payor Plaintiffs Motion for Final Approval of Class Action Settlements by End Payor Plaintiffs. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A)(Buchman, Michael)
August 13, 2020 Filing 1453 MEMORANDUM IN SUPPORT by End Payor Plaintiffs in support of #1452 MOTION for Settlement End-Payor and Third-Party Payor Plaintiffs Motion for Final Approval of Class Action Settlements . (Buchman, Michael)
August 13, 2020 Filing 1452 MOTION for Settlement End-Payor and Third-Party Payor Plaintiffs Motion for Final Approval of Class Action Settlements filed by End Payor Plaintiffs. Responses due by 8/27/2020. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order (Lupin Settlement), #2 Proposed Order (Warner Chilcott Settlement))(Buchman, Michael)
August 13, 2020 Filing 1451 EXHIBIT IN SUPPORT by Direct Purchaser Class Plaintiffs in support of #1450 Declaration, Exhibit A to Declaration of Tina Chiango Regarding Notice of Settlement to the Direct Purchaser Class. (Johnson, Kristen)
August 13, 2020 Filing 1450 DECLARATION re #1447 Assented MOTION for Settlement Unopposed Motion for Final Approval of Settlement, Approval of Proposed Plan of Allocation, Adoption of Report and Recommendation of Magistrate Judge, and Order of Dismissal with Prejudice Declaration of Tina Chiango Regarding Notice of Settlement to the Direct Purchaser Class by Direct Purchaser Class Plaintiffs. (Johnson, Kristen)
August 13, 2020 Filing 1449 DECLARATION re #1447 Assented MOTION for Settlement Unopposed Motion for Final Approval of Settlement, Approval of Proposed Plan of Allocation, Adoption of Report and Recommendation of Magistrate Judge, and Order of Dismissal with Prejudice Declaration of Kristen A. Johnson by Direct Purchaser Class Plaintiffs. (Johnson, Kristen)
August 13, 2020 Filing 1448 MEMORANDUM IN SUPPORT by Direct Purchaser Class Plaintiffs in support of #1447 Assented MOTION for Settlement Unopposed Motion for Final Approval of Settlement, Approval of Proposed Plan of Allocation, Adoption of Report and Recommendation of Magistrate Judge, and Order of Dismissal with Prejudice . (Johnson, Kristen)
August 13, 2020 Filing 1447 Assented MOTION for Settlement Unopposed Motion for Final Approval of Settlement, Approval of Proposed Plan of Allocation, Adoption of Report and Recommendation of Magistrate Judge, and Order of Dismissal with Prejudice filed by Direct Purchaser Class Plaintiffs. Responses due by 8/27/2020. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Johnson, Kristen)
August 4, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 1446 ADVISORY WITH RESPECT TO REPORT AND RECOMMENDATION REGARDING DIRECT PURCHASER CLASS MOTION FOR APPROVAL OF ATTORNEYS FEES, EXPENSES AND A SERVICE AWARD. So Ordered by Magistrate Judge Patricia A. Sullivan on 8/4/2020. (Saucier, Martha)
July 31, 2020 Minute Entry for proceedings held before Magistrate Judge Patricia A. Sullivan: Ex Parte Confidential Sealed Telephone Conference held on 7/31/2020 with Attorneys Thomas Sobol and Jessica MacAuley. ( Telephone Conference at 1:00.) (Saucier, Martha)
July 30, 2020 NOTICE of Hearing: Ex Parte Confidential Sealed Conference for Direct Purchaser Plaintiffs with Court regarding time and expense reports. Telephone Conference set for 7/31/2020 at 01:00 PM before Magistrate Judge Patricia A. Sullivan. (Saucier, Martha)
July 17, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 1444 REPORT AND RECOMMENDATIONS re #1437 MOTION for Attorney Fees REIMBURSEMENT OF LITIGATION EXPENSES, AND SERVICE AWARDS TO THE CLASS REPRESENTATIVES filed by End Payor Plaintiffs. I recommend that the Court grant the EPP Classes Motion for an Award of Attorneys Fees, Reimbursement of Litigation Expenses, and Service Award to the Class Representatives (ECF No. 1437). Objections to R&R due by 7/31/2020.. So Ordered by Magistrate Judge Patricia A. Sullivan on 7/17/2020. (Saucier, Martha)
July 17, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 1443 REPORT AND RECOMMENDATIONS re #1428 Assented MOTION for Attorney Fees Unopposed Motion for an Award of Attorneys' Fees, Reimbursement of Expenses, and Service Award for the Class Representative filed by Direct Purchaser Class Plaintiffs. I recommend that the Court grant the DPP Classs Unopposed Motion for an Award of Attorneys Fees, Reimbursement of Expenses, and Service Award for the Class Representative (ECF No. 1428). Objections to R&R due by 7/31/2020.. So Ordered by Magistrate Judge Patricia A. Sullivan on 7/17/2020. (Saucier, Martha)
July 16, 2020 Filing 1442 NOTICE of Change of Address by Moira Kim Penza (Penza, Moira)
July 16, 2020 Filing 1441 NOTICE by End Payor Plaintiffs to Withdraw Appearance of Deborah Gross with Certificate of Service (Gross, Deborah)
July 13, 2020 Filing 1440 NOTICE by End Payor Plaintiffs Letter to Magistrate Judge Sullivan Regarding the Allocation of Expenses and Service Awards Between the Lupin and Warner Chilcott Settlements (Robertson, Sharon)
July 13, 2020 Minute Entry for proceedings held before Magistrate Judge Patricia A. Sullivan: Telephone Conference held on 7/13/2020. ( Telephone Conference at 9:17.) (Saucier, Martha)
July 10, 2020 NOTICE of Hearing: Telephone Conference set for 7/13/2020 at 09:15 AM in Remote Hearing before Magistrate Judge Patricia A. Sullivan. Notice of phone conference regarding Magistrate Judge Sullivans questions for clarification in connection with End-Payor Class Plaintiffs Motion for an award of attorneys fees, reimbursement of litigation expenses and service awards. Dial in instructions are : 877-336-1839/ Access Code 7779192/ Password 19745.(Saucier, Martha)
July 3, 2020 Filing 1439 NOTICE by Direct Purchaser Class Plaintiffs Notice of Filing Motion for Withdrawal of Appearance (Attachments: #1 Motion for Withdrawal of Appearance of Edward Notargiacomo)(Sobol, Thomas)
June 16, 2020 MOTIONS REFERRED: #1437 MOTION for Attorney Fees REIMBURSEMENT OF LITIGATION EXPENSES, AND SERVICE AWARDS TO THE CLASS REPRESENTATIVES, #1428 Assented MOTION for Attorney Fees Unopposed Motion for an Award of Attorneys' Fees, Reimbursement of Expenses, and Service Award for the Class Representative referred for determination to Magistrate Judge Patricia A. Sullivan. (Jackson, Ryan)
June 11, 2020 Filing 1438 NOTICE by End Payor Plaintiffs non-opposition to the motion of Health Care Services Corp. to rescind its opt-out notice (Shadowen, Steve)
June 8, 2020 Filing 1437 MOTION for Attorney Fees REIMBURSEMENT OF LITIGATION EXPENSES, AND SERVICE AWARDS TO THE CLASS REPRESENTATIVES filed by End Payor Plaintiffs. Responses due by 6/22/2020. (Attachments: #1 Joint Declaration of Steve D. Shadowen, Sharon K. Robertson, Michael M. Buchman, and Marvin A. Miller, #2 Exhibit A, #3 Exhibit B, #4 Exhibit C, #5 Exhibit D, #6 Exhibit E, #7 Exhibit F, #8 Exhibit G, #9 Exhibit H, #10 Exhibit I, #11 Exhibit J, #12 Exhibit K, #13 Exhibit L)(Robertson, Sharon)
June 4, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 1436 ORDER granting #1435 Motion for Extension of Time. So Ordered by District Judge William E. Smith on 6/4/2020. (Jackson, Ryan)
June 3, 2020 Filing 1435 MOTION for an Extension of Time one-week extension for TPP Class Plaintiffs to respond to the motion of Health Care Services Corp. to rescind its opt-out notice filed by Allied Services Division Welfare Fund, City of Providence, Electrical Workers 242 & 294 Health & Welfare Fund, Fraternal Order of Police Fort Lauderdale Lodge 31, Laborers International Union of North America, New York Hotel Trades Council & Hotel Association of New York City, Inc. Health Benefits Fund, Painters District Council No. 30 Health & Welfare Fund, Teamsters Local 237 Welfare Benefits Fund, United Food and Commercial Workers Local 1776. Responses due by 6/17/2020. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Shadowen, Steve)
May 26, 2020 HEARING CANCELLED re: Notice of Hearing on #1402 Third-Party Payor Plaintiffs' MOTION for an Order regarding Certain Opt-Out Requests: Motion Hearing previously scheduled for THURSDAY 8/6/2020 at 10:00 AM in Courtroom 3 before District Judge William E. Smith is hereby CANCELLED (Jackson, Ryan)
May 22, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 1434 ORDER granting #1402 THIRD-PARTY PAYOR CLASS PLAINTIFFS MOTION FOR AN ORDER REGARDING CERTAIN OPT-OUT REQUESTS. So Ordered by District Judge William E. Smith on 5/22/2020. (Perry, Frank)
May 21, 2020 Filing 1433 NOTICE by End Payor Plaintiffs re #1432 Notice (Other) by Health Care Service Corporation of Withdrawal of its Opposition to the Third-Party Payor Class' Motion to Reject Opt Out Requests (Shadowen, Steve)
May 21, 2020 Filing 1432 NOTICE by Health Care Service Corporation of Withdrawal of its Opposition to the Third-Party Payor Class' Motion to Reject Opt Out Requests (Rabinovitz, Uriel)
April 20, 2020 Filing 1431 DECLARATION re #1428 Assented MOTION for Attorney Fees Unopposed Motion for an Award of Attorneys' Fees, Reimbursement of Expenses, and Service Award for the Class Representative Declaration of Brian T. Fitzpatrick by Direct Purchaser Class Plaintiffs. (Sobol, Thomas)
April 20, 2020 Filing 1430 DECLARATION re #1428 Assented MOTION for Attorney Fees Unopposed Motion for an Award of Attorneys' Fees, Reimbursement of Expenses, and Service Award for the Class Representative Declaration of Co-Lead Counsel Peter R. Kohn by Direct Purchaser Class Plaintiffs. (Sobol, Thomas)
April 20, 2020 Filing 1429 MEMORANDUM IN SUPPORT by Direct Purchaser Class Plaintiffs in support of #1428 Assented MOTION for Attorney Fees Unopposed Motion for an Award of Attorneys' Fees, Reimbursement of Expenses, and Service Award for the Class Representative . (Sobol, Thomas)
April 20, 2020 Filing 1428 Assented MOTION for Attorney Fees Unopposed Motion for an Award of Attorneys' Fees, Reimbursement of Expenses, and Service Award for the Class Representative filed by Direct Purchaser Class Plaintiffs. Responses due by 5/4/2020. (Sobol, Thomas)
March 23, 2020 Opinion or Order TEXT ORDER denying as moot #1394 Motion for Settlement; denying as moot #1397 Motion for Settlement; denying as moot #1399 Motion for Settlement. So Ordered by District Judge William E. Smith on 3/23/2020. (Jackson, Ryan)
March 23, 2020 Opinion or Order TEXT ORDER granting #1419 Motion for Leave to File A Sur-Reply filed by Health Care Service Corporation. So Ordered by District Judge William E. Smith on 3/23/2020. (Jackson, Ryan)
March 23, 2020 CORRECTED NOTICE of Hearing on #1402 Third-Party Payor Plaintiffs' MOTION for an Order regarding Certain Opt-Out Requests: Motion Hearing scheduled for THURSDAY 8/6/2020 at 10:00 AM in Courtroom 3 before District Judge William E. Smith. (Jackson, Ryan) Modified on 3/23/2020: corrected day of hearing (Jackson, Ryan).
March 23, 2020 Opinion or Order TEXT ORDER re: #1402 Third-Party Payor Plaintiffs' Motion for an Order regarding Certain Opt-Out Requests: Within 60 days of this order, the parties, along with Health Care Service Corporation, are directed to provide the Court with a sample of ASO Plans and any relevant contracts (between 15 and 20). Within 14 days of that submission, TPPs and Health Care Service Corporation shall file briefing of no more than 10 pages addressing the relevance of these contracts. The remaining parties may also respond. So Ordered by District Judge William E. Smith on 3/23/2020. (Jackson, Ryan)
March 23, 2020 NOTICE of Hearing:Final Fairness Hearing re: #1409 Motion for Approval and #1420 Motion for Approval scheduled for Thursday 8/27/2020 at 10:00 AM in Courtroom 3 before District Judge William E. Smith. (Jackson, Ryan)
March 23, 2020 Opinion or Order TEXT ORDER granting #1422 End-Payor Plaintiffs' Unopposed Amended Motion for Modification of the Form and Manner of Notice to the Lupin Settlement Class and Schedule For a Fairness Hearing. So Ordered by District Judge William E. Smith on 3/23/2020. (Jackson, Ryan)
March 23, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 1427 ORDER granting #1420 Third-Party Payor Plaintiffs Unopposed Amended Motion for Preliminary Approval of Proposed Settlement, Approval of the Form And Manner of Notice to the Class, and Schedule for a Fairness Hearing. So Ordered by District Judge William E. Smith on 3/23/2020. (Jackson, Ryan)
March 23, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 1426 ORDER granting #1409 Motion for Preliminary Approval of Settlement, Approval of the Form and Manner of Notice to the Class, Appointment of Claims Administrator and Escrow Agent, and Setting the Final Settlement Schedule. So Ordered by District Judge William E. Smith on 3/23/2020. (Jackson, Ryan)
March 6, 2020 Filing 1425 NOTICE by End Payor Plaintiffs re #1397 MOTION for Settlement Third-Party Payor Plaintiffs Unopposed Motion for Preliminary Approval of Proposed Settlement, Approval of the Form And Manner of Notice to the Class, and Schedule for a Fairness Hearing, #1399 MOTION for Settlement End-Payor Plaintiffs' Unopposed Motion for Modification of the Form and Manner of Notice to the Lupin Settlement Class and Schedule For a Fairness Hearing, #1400 Memorandum in Support, #1398 Memorandum in Support, #1401 Declaration,, (Buchman, Michael)
March 6, 2020 Filing 1424 DECLARATION re #1420 Amended MOTION for Settlement Third-Party Payor Plaintiffs Unopposed Amended Motion for Preliminary Approval of Proposed Settlement, Approval of the Form And Manner of Notice to the Class, and Schedule for a Fairness Hearing, #1422 Amended MOTION for Settlement End-Payor Plaintiffs' Unopposed Amended Motion for Modification of the Form and Manner of Notice to the Lupin Settlement Class and Schedule For a Fairness Hearing by End Payor Plaintiffs. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit 2, #3 Exhibit 3, #4 Exhibit 4, #5 Exhibit 5)(Buchman, Michael)
March 6, 2020 Filing 1423 MEMORANDUM IN SUPPORT by End Payor Plaintiffs in support of #1422 Amended MOTION for Settlement End-Payor Plaintiffs' Unopposed Amended Motion for Modification of the Form and Manner of Notice to the Lupin Settlement Class and Schedule For a Fairness Hearing . (Buchman, Michael)
March 6, 2020 Filing 1422 Amended MOTION for Settlement End-Payor Plaintiffs' Unopposed Amended Motion for Modification of the Form and Manner of Notice to the Lupin Settlement Class and Schedule For a Fairness Hearing filed by End Payor Plaintiffs. Responses due by 3/20/2020. (Buchman, Michael)
March 6, 2020 Filing 1421 MEMORANDUM IN SUPPORT by End Payor Plaintiffs in support of #1420 Amended MOTION for Settlement Third-Party Payor Plaintiffs Unopposed Amended Motion for Preliminary Approval of Proposed Settlement, Approval of the Form And Manner of Notice to the Class, and Schedule for a Fairness Hearing . (Buchman, Michael)
March 6, 2020 Filing 1420 Amended MOTION for Settlement Third-Party Payor Plaintiffs Unopposed Amended Motion for Preliminary Approval of Proposed Settlement, Approval of the Form And Manner of Notice to the Class, and Schedule for a Fairness Hearing filed by End Payor Plaintiffs. Responses due by 3/20/2020. (Buchman, Michael)
March 6, 2020 Filing 1419 MOTION for Leave to File Document A Sur-Reply filed by Health Care Service Corporation. Responses due by 3/20/2020. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A)(Mancini, John)
February 28, 2020 Filing 1418 REPLY MEMORANDUM re #1404 Response in Opposition (Defendants' Response to Health Care Service Corporation's Opposition to Motion for an Order Regarding Certain Opt Out Requests). (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1)(Benjamin, Nicole)
February 28, 2020 Filing 1417 REPLY MEMORANDUM re #1402 MOTION . (Attachments: #1 Exhibit)(Shadowen, Steve)
February 28, 2020 Filing 1416 Redacted Transcript of #1415 Transcript. (Veitch, Denise)
February 28, 2020 Filing 1415 TRANSCRIPT of Jury Empanelment, Volume 2, held on December 18, 2019, before District Judge William E. Smith. Court Reporter Denise P. Veitch, Telephone number 401-752-7031. Transcript may be viewed at the court public terminal or purchased through the Court Reporter before the deadline for Release of Transcript Restriction. After that date it may be obtained through the Court Reporter or PACER. NOTICE TO COUNSEL: Redaction Requests must be filed for personal identifiers only. All other redactions must be requested by motion. For local policy and sample redaction request visit our website at www.rid.uscourts.gov and select Transcripts under the Case Information menu option. Redaction Request due 3/20/2020. Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 3/30/2020. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 5/28/2020. (Veitch, Denise)
February 27, 2020 Filing 1414 Redacted Transcript of #1413 Transcript,,,. (Veitch, Denise)
February 27, 2020 Filing 1413 TRANSCRIPT of Jury Empanelment, held on December 16, 2019, before District Judge William E. Smith. Court Reporters Lisa Schwam and Denise P. Veitch, Telephone number 401-752-7031. Transcript may be viewed at the court public terminal or purchased through the Court Reporters before the deadline for Release of Transcript Restriction. After that date it may be obtained through the Court Reporters or PACER. NOTICE TO COUNSEL: Redaction Requests must be filed for personal identifiers only. All other redactions must be requested by motion. For local policy and sample redaction request visit our website at www.rid.uscourts.gov and select Transcripts under the Case Information menu option. Redaction Request due 3/19/2020. Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 3/30/2020. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 5/27/2020. (Veitch, Denise)
February 25, 2020 Opinion or Order TEXT ORDER granting #1408 Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice of Uriel Rabinovitz. So Ordered by District Judge William E. Smith (2) on 2/25/2020. (Hicks, Alyson)
February 25, 2020 Opinion or Order TEXT ORDER granting #1407 Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice of Peter D. St. Phillip, Jr.. So Ordered by District Judge William E. Smith (2) on 2/25/2020. (Hicks, Alyson)
February 24, 2020 Filing 1412 NOTICE by Direct Purchaser Class Plaintiffs re #1394 MOTION for Settlement Motion for Preliminary Approval of Settlement, Approval of the Form and Manner of Notice to the Class, Appointment of Claims Administrator and Escrow Agent, and Setting the Final Settlement Schedule and Date for a Fairness Hea, #1395 Memorandum in Support, #1396 Declaration,, NOTICE OF WITHDRAWAL (Sobol, Thomas)
February 24, 2020 Filing 1411 DECLARATION re #1409 Amended MOTION for Settlement Amended Motion for Preliminary Approval of Settlement, Approval of the Form and Manner of Notice to the Class, Appointment of Claims Administrator and Escrow Agent, and Setting the Final Settlement Schedule and Date for by Direct Purchaser Class Plaintiffs. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit 2, #3 Exhibit 3, #4 Exhibit 4, #5 Exhibit 5, #6 Exhibit 6, #7 Exhibit 7, #8 Exhibit 8, #9 Exhibit 9, #10 Exhibit 10)(Sobol, Thomas)
February 24, 2020 Filing 1410 MEMORANDUM IN SUPPORT by Direct Purchaser Class Plaintiffs in support of #1409 Amended MOTION for Settlement Amended Motion for Preliminary Approval of Settlement, Approval of the Form and Manner of Notice to the Class, Appointment of Claims Administrator and Escrow Agent, and Setting the Final Settlement Schedule and Date for . (Sobol, Thomas)
February 24, 2020 Filing 1409 Amended MOTION for Settlement Amended Motion for Preliminary Approval of Settlement, Approval of the Form and Manner of Notice to the Class, Appointment of Claims Administrator and Escrow Agent, and Setting the Final Settlement Schedule and Date for a Fairness Hearing filed by Direct Purchaser Class Plaintiffs. Responses due by 3/9/2020. (Sobol, Thomas)
February 24, 2020 Filing 1408 MOTION for Uriel Rabinovitz to Appear Pro Hac Vice ( filing fee paid $ 100.00, receipt number 0103-1478223 ) filed by Health Care Service Corporation. (Mineau, Michael)
February 24, 2020 Filing 1407 MOTION for Peter D. St. Phillip, Jr. to Appear Pro Hac Vice ( filing fee paid $ 100.00, receipt number 0103-1478216 ) filed by Health Care Service Corporation. (Mineau, Michael)
February 24, 2020 Filing 1406 NOTICE of Appearance by Michael L. Mineau on behalf of Health Care Service Corporation (Mineau, Michael)
February 21, 2020 Filing 1405 DECLARATION re #1404 Response in Opposition by Health Care Service Corporation. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B)(Mancini, John)
February 21, 2020 Filing 1404 RESPONSE IN OPPOSITION by Health Care Service Corporation re #1402 MOTION to Reject Opt Out Requests. (Mancini, John)
February 21, 2020 Filing 1403 NOTICE of Appearance by John O. Mancini on behalf of Health Care Service Corporation (Mancini, John)
February 7, 2020 Filing 1402 MOTION filed by Allied Services Division Welfare Fund, City of Providence, Electrical Workers 242 & 294 Health & Welfare Fund, Fraternal Order of Police Fort Lauderdale Lodge 31, Laborers International Union of North America, New York Hotel Trades Council & Hotel Association of New York City, Inc. Health Benefits Fund, Painters District Council No. 30 Health & Welfare Fund, Teamsters Local 237 Welfare Benefits Fund, United Food and Commercial Workers Local 1776. Responses due by 2/21/2020. (Attachments: #1 Supporting Memorandum, #2 Declaration, #3 Exhibit A, #4 Exhibit B, #5 Exhibit C, #6 Exhibit D, #7 Exhibit E, #8 Exhibit F, #9 Exhibit G, #10 Exhibit H, #11 Exhibit I, #12 Exhibit J, #13 Exhibit K, #14 Proposed Order)(Shadowen, Steve)
February 6, 2020 Filing 1401 DECLARATION re #1399 MOTION for Settlement End-Payor Plaintiffs' Unopposed Motion for Modification of the Form and Manner of Notice to the Lupin Settlement Class and Schedule For a Fairness Hearing, #1397 MOTION for Settlement Third-Party Payor Plaintiffs Unopposed Motion for Preliminary Approval of Proposed Settlement, Approval of the Form And Manner of Notice to the Class, and Schedule for a Fairness Hearing by End Payor Plaintiffs. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1: Settlement Agreement, #2 Exhibit 2: Plan of Allocation, #3 Exhibit 3: Young Declaration, #4 Exhibit 4: Proposed Claim Form, #5 Exhibit 5: Proposed Order)(Buchman, Michael)
February 6, 2020 Filing 1400 MEMORANDUM IN SUPPORT by End Payor Plaintiffs in support of #1399 MOTION for Settlement End-Payor Plaintiffs' Unopposed Motion for Modification of the Form and Manner of Notice to the Lupin Settlement Class and Schedule For a Fairness Hearing . (Buchman, Michael)
February 6, 2020 Filing 1399 MOTION for Settlement End-Payor Plaintiffs' Unopposed Motion for Modification of the Form and Manner of Notice to the Lupin Settlement Class and Schedule For a Fairness Hearing filed by End Payor Plaintiffs. Responses due by 2/20/2020. (Buchman, Michael)
February 6, 2020 Filing 1398 MEMORANDUM IN SUPPORT by End Payor Plaintiffs in support of #1397 MOTION for Settlement Third-Party Payor Plaintiffs Unopposed Motion for Preliminary Approval of Proposed Settlement, Approval of the Form And Manner of Notice to the Class, and Schedule for a Fairness Hearing . (Buchman, Michael)
February 6, 2020 Filing 1397 MOTION for Settlement Third-Party Payor Plaintiffs Unopposed Motion for Preliminary Approval of Proposed Settlement, Approval of the Form And Manner of Notice to the Class, and Schedule for a Fairness Hearing filed by End Payor Plaintiffs. Responses due by 2/20/2020. (Buchman, Michael)
January 23, 2020 Opinion or Order TEXT ORDER Entering #1393 Stipulation of Dismissal of Retailer Plaintiffs' Claims Against the Warner Chilcott Defendants filed by Albertson's, LLC, CVS Pharmacy, Inc., HEB Grocery Company L.P., Rite-Aid Corporation, Rite-Aid Hdqtrs. Corp., Safeway, Inc., The Kroger Co., Walgreen Co. So Ordered by District Judge William E. Smith on 1/23/2020. (Jackson, Ryan)
January 22, 2020 Filing 1396 DECLARATION re #1394 MOTION for Settlement Motion for Preliminary Approval of Settlement, Approval of the Form and Manner of Notice to the Class, Appointment of Claims Administrator and Escrow Agent, and Setting the Final Settlement Schedule and Date for a Fairness Hea by Direct Purchaser Class Plaintiffs. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit 2, #3 Exhibit 3, #4 Exhibit 4, #5 Exhibit 5, #6 Exhibit 6, #7 Exhibit 7, #8 Exhibit 8, #9 Exhibit 9, #10 Exhibit 10)(Sobol, Thomas)
January 22, 2020 Filing 1395 MEMORANDUM IN SUPPORT by Direct Purchaser Class Plaintiffs in support of #1394 MOTION for Settlement Motion for Preliminary Approval of Settlement, Approval of the Form and Manner of Notice to the Class, Appointment of Claims Administrator and Escrow Agent, and Setting the Final Settlement Schedule and Date for a Fairness Hea . (Sobol, Thomas)
January 22, 2020 Filing 1394 MOTION for Settlement Motion for Preliminary Approval of Settlement, Approval of the Form and Manner of Notice to the Class, Appointment of Claims Administrator and Escrow Agent, and Setting the Final Settlement Schedule and Date for a Fairness Hearing filed by Direct Purchaser Class Plaintiffs. Responses due by 2/5/2020. (Sobol, Thomas)
January 21, 2020 Filing 1393 STIPULATION of Dismissal of Retailer Plaintiffs' Claims Against the Warner Chilcott Defendants filed by Albertson's, LLC, CVS Pharmacy, Inc., HEB Grocery Company L.P., Rite-Aid Corporation, Rite-Aid Hdqtrs. Corp., Safeway, Inc., The Kroger Co., Walgreen Co.. (Perwin, Scott)
January 13, 2020 Opinion or Order TEXT ORDER Entering #1389 Notice of Acceptance with Offer of Judgment by End Payor Plaintiffs Denise Loy and Mary Alexander. So Ordered by District Judge William E. Smith on 1/13/2020. (Jackson, Ryan)
January 3, 2020 Minute Entry for proceedings held before District Judge William E. Smith: In Chambers Conference held on 1/3/2020; counsel present: C. Curran; N. Benjamin; L. Pappenhausen; B. Gant; S. Shadowen; S. Robertson; M. Weiner; R. Braun; D. Evans; S. Khan; J. Reynolds; R. McConnell; M. Buchman; M. Hamburger; M. Penza; J. Pace. (Jackson, Ryan)
January 3, 2020 Opinion or Order TEXT ORDER granting #1391 Motion to Clarify: Third-Party Payor Plaintiffs' Motion for Clarification Regarding Use of the Molloy Reference, ECF No. 1391, is GRANTED such that Plaintiffs may use the Molloy Reference as detailed in the motion. So Ordered by District Judge William E. Smith on 1/3/2020. (Jackson, Ryan)
January 3, 2020 Filing 1392 NOTICE by Warner Chilcott Company, Inc., Warner Chilcott Company, LLC, Warner Chilcott Corporation, Warner Chilcott Holdings Company III, Ltd., Warner Chilcott Laboratories Ireland Limited, Warner Chilcott Public Limited Company, Warner Chilcott Sales (US), LLC, Warner Chilcott U.S., LLC, Watson Laboratories, Inc., Watson Pharmaceuticals, Inc. (Notice of Filing of Defendants' Amended Witness and Exhibit Lists) (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B)(Benjamin, Nicole)
January 2, 2020 Filing 1391 MOTION to Clarify filed by Allied Services Division Welfare Fund, City of Providence, Electrical Workers 242 & 294 Health & Welfare Fund, Fraternal Order of Police Fort Lauderdale Lodge 31, Laborers International Union of North America, New York Hotel Trades Council & Hotel Association of New York City, Inc. Health Benefits Fund, Painters District Council No. 30 Health & Welfare Fund, Teamsters Local 237 Welfare Benefits Fund, United Food and Commercial Workers Local 1776. Responses due by 1/16/2020. (Shadowen, Steve)
December 30, 2019 Opinion or Order TEXT ORDER granting #1390 Motion for Frazar Wright Thomas to Appear Pro Hac Vice filed by City of Providence. So Ordered by District Judge William E. Smith (2) on 12/30/2019. (Simoncelli, Michael)
December 30, 2019 Filing 1390 MOTION for Frazar Wright Thomas to Appear Pro Hac Vice ( filing fee paid $ 100.00, receipt number 0103-1460258 ) filed by City of Providence. (McConnell, Robert)
December 30, 2019 Filing 1389 NOTICE of Acceptance with Offer of Judgment by End Payor Plaintiffs Denise Loy and Mary Alexander (Buchman, Michael)
December 23, 2019 NOTICE of Hearing: In Chambers Conference set for 1/3/2020 at 10:00 AM in the Judicial Conference Room before District Judge William E. Smith (2). (Potter, Carrie)
December 23, 2019 Minute Entry for proceedings held before District Judge William E. Smith: In Chambers Conference held on 12/23/2019: S. Shadowen, R. Arnold, N. Benjamin, C. Curran, M. Gidley, P. Carney, M. Buchman, L. Paperhausen, M. Penza, M. Hamburger, M. Gallagher, B. Refsin, J. Pace, E. Bloom, M. Miller, M. Van Tine, B. Gant, R. Milne. (Potter, Carrie)
December 23, 2019 Filing 1388 NOTICE by Albertson's, LLC, CVS Pharmacy, Inc., End Payor Plaintiffs, HEB Grocery Company L.P., Rite-Aid Corporation, Rite-Aid Hdqtrs. Corp., Safeway, Inc., The Kroger Co., Walgreen Co. Retailer and Third-Party Payor Plaintiffs' Notice of Intent to Limit Their Legal Theories at Trial (Refsin, Barry)
December 20, 2019 Filing 1387 NOTICE by End Payor Plaintiffs Notice Regarding The Participation of the Consumer End-Payor Plaintiffs at Trial (Fanning, Lori)
December 20, 2019 Opinion or Order TEXT ORDER re #1376 Memorandum in Support of Testimony of Dr. McGuire: The Court will allow Plaintiffs to call Dr. McGuire twice during their case in chief, permitting Dr. McGuire to initially provide "tutorial" testimony to the jury. Exercising its wide discretion in matters concerning the presentation of evidence, the Court concludes that, in light of the complexity of this case, Dr. McGuire's tutorial testimony will assist the jury in determining the truth. See Fed. R. Evid. 611(a). The Court intends to take necessary measures to ensure that the jury does not consider Dr. McGuire in any way "elevated" above other witnesses; the Court will instruct the jury as necessary. Further, once Dr. McGuire is placed under oath, he will be instructed not to consult with Plaintiffs' counsel after his initial testimony so as to avoid an opportunity for Plaintiffs' counsel to "rehabilitate" Dr. McGuire after Defendants' cross-examination. If Defendants are inclined to offer a witness for this same purpose, the Court will extend this ruling to them - So Ordered by District Judge William E. Smith on 12/20/2019. (Urizandi, Nisshy)
December 19, 2019 Filing 1386 MEMORANDUM IN OPPOSITION by Warner Chilcott Company, Inc., Warner Chilcott Company, LLC, Warner Chilcott Corporation, Warner Chilcott Holdings Company III, Ltd., Warner Chilcott Laboratories Ireland Limited, Warner Chilcott Public Limited Company, Warner Chilcott Sales (US), LLC, Warner Chilcott U.S., LLC, Watson Laboratories, Inc., Watson Pharmaceuticals, Inc. in opposition to #1376 Memorandum in Support, (Defendants' Opposition to Allowing Plaintiffs to Call Thomas McGuire Twice During Their Case in Chief). (Benjamin, Nicole)
December 19, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 1385 ORDER Entering #1382 Stipulation and Order Regarding End-Payor Plaintiffs' Washington and Wyoming Unjust Enrichment Claims under State Law. So Ordered by District Judge William E. Smith on 12/19/2019. (Jackson, Ryan)
December 19, 2019 Opinion or Order TEXT ORDER granting #1359 Motion to Unseal Document: in the absence of any response or objection, the Motion to Unseal is hereby GRANTED. So Ordered by District Judge William E. Smith on 12/19/2019. (Jackson, Ryan)
December 19, 2019 Opinion or Order TEXT ORDER granting in part and denying in part #876 MOTION To Exclude The Merits Testimony And Opinions Of James W. Hughes, Ph.D.: This order pertains only to Phase 1 of the upcoming trial. The End-Payor Plaintiffs' Motion to Exclude the Merits Testimony and Opinions of James W. Hughes, Ph.D., ECF No. 876, is GRANTED IN PART AND DENIED IN PART. Dr. Hughes may not opine that a purchaser injured on a single transaction is not injured, but he may opine to the extent his opinion is supported by sound and reliable methodology that some purchasers never sustained any injury. With respect to free samples, Dr. Hughes's opinion is excluded to the extent it is inconsistent with the Court's decision in its Memorandum of Decision on Class Certification and Order Regarding Motions to Exclude Certain Expert Opinions and Defendants' Renewed Motion to Dismiss, see In re Loestrin 24 FE Antitrust Litig., No. 1:13-md-2472-WES-PAS, 2019 WL 5406077, at *23 (D.R.I. Oct. 17, 2019). While opinion testimony relating to free samples is admissible, for example, insofar as it goes to the cost/expense incurred by Warner Chilcott in marketing and distribution, it is not admissible to offset injury or damages to the class. The Court defers, until Phase 2 or 3 of the trial, ruling on whether Dr. Hughes may opine that Warner Chilcott would have substantially raised the price of branded Loestrin in the but-for world. So Ordered by District Judge William E. Smith on 12/19/2019. (Jackson, Ryan)
December 18, 2019 Filing 1384 TRANSCRIPT ORDER ACKNOWLEDGMENT Entered re: #1378 Transcript Order, #1379 Transcript Order, #1381 Transcript Order,. Daily Transcript Ordered. Court Reporter/Transcriber: Lisa Schwam. (Dias, Jennifer)
December 18, 2019 Filing 1383 TRANSCRIPT ORDER ACKNOWLEDGMENT Entered re: #1378 Transcript Order, #1379 Transcript Order, #1381 Transcript Order,. Daily Transcript Ordered. Court Reporter/Transcriber: Denise Veitch. (Dias, Jennifer)
December 18, 2019 Filing 1382 STIPULATION and Proposed Order Regarding End-Payor Plaintiffs' Washington and Wyoming Unjust Enrichment Claims under State Law filed by Warner Chilcott Company, Inc., Warner Chilcott Company, LLC, Warner Chilcott Corporation, Warner Chilcott Holdings Company III, Ltd., Warner Chilcott Laboratories Ireland Limited, Warner Chilcott Public Limited Company, Warner Chilcott Sales (US), LLC, Warner Chilcott U.S., LLC, Watson Laboratories, Inc., Watson Pharmaceuticals, Inc.. (Benjamin, Nicole)
December 18, 2019 Filing 1381 TRANSCRIPT ORDER for proceedings held on 1/6/2020-2/28/2020 before Judge Smith, J.. Daily Transcript selected. Transcript to be delivered following adjournment and prior to the normal opening hour of court on the following morning.. (Robertson, Sharon)
December 18, 2019 Minute Entry for proceedings held before District Judge William E. Smith: Conference held on 12/18/2019: R. Arnold, S. Robertson, R. Ganzales, C. Curran, H, Letourneau, N. Benjamin, M. Penza, A. Cox, L. Papenhausen, J.M. Gidley, P. Carney, S. Khan, D. Evans, E. Bloom, L. Raukind, A. Egervary, C. Seth, A. Getachen, M. Buckman, P. Reynolds, S. Shadowen. Conference regarding any additional trial issues scheduled for Monday, December 23, 2020 at 3:00 p.m. (Potter, Carrie)
December 18, 2019 Minute Entry for proceedings held before District Judge William E. Smith: Jury Selection held on 12/18/2019: R. Arnold, S. Robertson, R. Ganzales, C. Curran, H, Letourneau, N. Benjamin, M. Penza, A. Cox, L. Papenhausen, J.M. Gidley, P. Carney, S. Khan, D. Evans, E. Bloom, L. Raukind, A. Egervary, C. Seth, A. Getachen, M. Buckman, P. Reynolds, S. Shadowen. 10 jurors chosen. Court questions parties; Plaintiffs find the jury acceptable; Defendants find the jury acceptable. Start of trial scheduled for Monday, January 6, 2020 at 9:00 a.m. (Court Reporter D. Veitch in Courtroom 4 at 9:23 a.m..) (Potter, Carrie)
December 18, 2019 NOTICE of Hearing: In Chambers Conference (and Teleconference) scheduled for Monday 12/23/2019 at 3:00 PM in Chambers before District Judge William E. Smith. Teleconference dial-in instructions will be sent to all counsel via email prior to the day of the conference.(Jackson, Ryan)
December 17, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 1380 OPINION AND ORDER ON SUMMARY JUDGMENT AND ORDER REGARDING MOTIONS TO EXCLUDE CERTAIN EXPERT OPINIONS: denying #496 Motion for Summary Judgment Due to Lack of Market Power; terminating #540 Motion for Summary Judgment; denying #569 Motion for Summary Judgment on Market Power; denying #610 Motion to Strike Plaintiffs' Improper Responses to Defendants' Statement of Undisputed Facts; terminating 611 Motion to Strike; granting in part and denying in part #640 MOTION to Exclude Certain Opinions and Testimony of Michael Thomas, M.D.; denying #646 MOTION to Exclude Certain Opinions and Testimony of Plaintiffs' Expert Dr. Christopher F. Baum and Certain Opinions of Dr. Meredith Rosenthal; denying #711 MOTION to Exclude the Expert Testimony of Dr. Sumanth Addanki; granting in part and denying in part #781 MOTION to Exclude Certain Opinions and Testimony of Dr. Richard J. Derman; denying #842 Motion for Summary Judgment; granting in part and denying in part #874 MOTION to Exclude Opinions and Testimony of Drs. Christine S. Meyer and Mark S. Robbins Regarding Procompetitive Justifications of Reverse Payments; granting in part and denying in part #875 MOTION to Exclude Opinions and Testimony of Drs. Christine S. Meyer, Mark S. Robbins, and Melissa A. Schilling Regarding Lack of Anticompetitive Effect from Product Hop; granting in part and denying in part #882 MOTION to Exclude the Opinions and Testimony of Plaintiffs' Expert Dr. Thomas McGuire; granting in part and denying in #886 MOTION to Exclude Certain Opinions and Testimony of Michael Thomas, M.D. on Chewability and Patent Issues; granting in part and denying in part #890 MOTION to Exclude Certain Opinions and Testimony of Edward Lentz, John Doll, and Nicholas Jewell; denying #892 MOTION to Exclude Certain Opinions and Testimony of John R. Tupman; denying #901 MOTION to Exclude In Part the Expert Opinions of Christine Meyer, Ph.D. and Philip Green that Authorized Generics Were Facing Legal Uncertainty; granting in part and denying in part #902 MOTION to Exclude the Expert Testimony of Dr. Louis Berneman, Philip Green, and Dr. Christine Meyer Regarding "Fair Value"; and, granting 906 MOTION to Exclude Portions of Testimony of Defendants' Expert Dr. Pierre-Yves Cremieux. The parties are hereby directed to submit a joint letter with proposed redactions, by email to Case Manager Ryan Jackson, within three days of the entry of the Opinion and Order on Summary Judgment and Order Regarding Motions to Exclude Certain Expert Opinions, ECF No. 1380, or it will be unsealed and filed on the public docket as is. So Ordered by District Judge William E. Smith on 12/17/2019. (Jackson, Ryan) This document has been filed under seal pursuant to LR Gen 102 and access is restricted. Please login to CM/ECF to view document(s). Modified on 12/23/2019: Pursuant to the Text Order entered by this Court on 12/17/19, and in the absence of any objection by the parties, this Opinion and Order has been unsealed.) (Perry, Frank).
December 17, 2019 Filing 1379 TRANSCRIPT ORDER for proceedings held on 1/06/2020 through 2/28/2020 before Judge J. Smith. Daily Transcript selected. Transcript to be delivered following adjournment and prior to the normal opening hour of court on the following morning.. (Perwin, Scott)
December 17, 2019 Filing 1378 TRANSCRIPT ORDER for proceedings held on 1/6/2020-2/28/2020 before Judge Smith. Daily Transcript selected. Transcript to be delivered following adjournment and prior to the normal opening hour of court on the following morning.. (Benjamin, Nicole)
December 17, 2019 Filing 1377 REPLY to Response re 1024 Response to Motion, Reply to Plaintiffs Response (1375) to Defendants' Appendix A (891-2) filed by Warner Chilcott Company, Inc., Warner Chilcott Company, LLC, Warner Chilcott Corporation, Warner Chilcott Holdings Company III, Ltd., Warner Chilcott Laboratories Ireland Limited, Warner Chilcott Public Limited Company, Warner Chilcott Sales (US), LLC, Warner Chilcott U.S., LLC, Watson Laboratories, Inc., Watson Pharmaceuticals, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Appendix A)(Benjamin, Nicole)
December 16, 2019 Minute Entry for proceedings held before District Judge William E. Smith: Jury Selection held on 12/16/2019. In attendance B. Refsin, R. Arnold, S. Robertson, R. Ganzales, C. Curran, H. Letourneau, N. Benjamin, M. Penza, A. Cox, S. Perwin, L. Raukind, L. Papenhausen, J. Gidley, P. Carney, T. Sobol, K. Johnson, M Van Tine, S. Shadowen, N. Clark, M. Buchman, R. McConnell, A. Egervary, E. Bloom, A. Getachew, H. Brewster, C. Sethi, R. Braun, D. Evans, S. Khen. 20 potential jurors chosen. Strikes to take place on Wednesday, December 18, 2019 at 9:00 a.m. (Court Reporter L. Schwam/D. Veitch in Courtroom 4 at 9:00 a.m..) (Potter, Carrie)
December 16, 2019 Minute Entry for proceedings held before District Judge William E. Smith: Conference held on 12/16/2019: In attendance: B. Refsin, R. Arnold, S. Robertson, R. Ganzales, C. Curran, H. Letourneau, N.Benjamin, M. Penza, A. Cox, S. Perwin, L. Raukind, L. Papenhausen, J. Gidley, P. Carney, T. Sobol, K. Johnson, M Van Tine, Shadowen, N. Clark, M. uchman, R. McConnell, A. Egervary, E. Bloom, A. Getachew, H. Brewster, C. Sethi, R. Braun, D. Evans, S. Khen. (Courtroom 4 at 8:53.) (Potter, Carrie)
December 16, 2019 Opinion or Order TEXT ORDER re #1283 MOTION in Limine to Preclude Argument, Evidence or Adverse Inferences Based Upon Defendant's Invocation of Privilege or a Non-Party's Privilege Log (MIL No. 5) filed by Watson Pharmaceuticals, Inc., Warner Chilcott Sales (US), LLC, Warner Chilcott Holdings Company III, Ltd., Warner Chilcott Company, LLC, Warner Chilcott Public Limited Company, Watson Laboratories, Inc., Warner Chilcott Laboratories Ireland Limited, Warner Chilcott Company, Inc., Warner Chilcott Corporation, Warner Chilcott U.S., LLC. Defendants MIL No. 5 (ECF No. 1283) is granted to the extent that it seeks to preclude Plaintiffs from relying on documents reflecting or argument based on the oral and written legal arguments and supporting materials (such as attorney declarations) presented by counsel for any party in connection with Warner Chilcotts failed disqualification argument made in 2008 in Warner Chilcott Co. v. Watson Pharm., Inc., Civ. No. 06-3491-HAA-ES (D.N.J.). In that case, the validity of the 394 Patent was in issue and Warner Chilcott moved to disqualify Watsons attorney because the law firm (Kenyon & Kenyon, LLP) had represented Galen PLC in connection with its acquisition of the 394 Patent. The court rejected Warner Chilcotts argument, finding that the prior engagement of the law firm did not bear on the validity, enforceability, or scope of said patent. Civ. No. 06-03491-HAA-ES (ECF No. 93 at 6). Accordingly, legal arguments as reflected in the briefs, transcripts, declarations and similar documents presented to the New Jersey court are of minimal or no probative value, but pose significant potential for unfair prejudice and confusion; therefore, they are excluded. Notwithstanding the foregoing, Plaintiffs are not precluded from the use in this case of a document that was used in connection with the motion to disqualify as long as the document has probative value in this case apart from the legal arguments presented in the New Jersey case. Defendants MIL No. 5 is denied to the extent that it requests that the Court enter a sweeping order barring any question that might draw a privilege invocation, similar to that issued King Drug Co. v. Cephalon, Inc., No. 2:06-cv-1797, 2016 U.S. Dist. LEXIS 7477, at *28 (E.D. Pa. Jan. 22, 2016). With the EVMS log excluded and Plaintiffs barred from relying on any suggestion or argument that the jury may draw an adverse inference from the assertion of the attorney client privilege, the relief sought is unnecessary. If Plaintiffs appear to be asking questions for the sole purpose of drawing an assertion of the attorney client privilege, the denial of this part of Defendants motion may be revisited during trial.. So Ordered by Magistrate Judge Patricia A. Sullivan on 12/16/2019. (Saucier, Martha)
December 16, 2019 Opinion or Order TEXT ORDER granting in part and denying in part #1283 Motion in Limine; granting #1284 Motion in Limine. [This Text Order addresses ECF No. 1283 (Defendants MIL No. 5) in part; the balance of MIL No. 5 is addressed in a separate Text Order. This Text Order also addresses ECF No. 1284 (Defendants MIL No. 6)]. In presenting argument and evidence, Plaintiffs may not rely on an adverse inference or speculation regarding the content of the handful of communications reflected on the EVMS log. These communications are protected by an unchallenged assertion of the attorney-client privilege and it is improper to base an adverse inference on the assertion of the attorney-client privilege. Astra Pharm. Prod., Inc. v. Beckman Instruments, Inc., No. CA-79-1445, 1983 WL 51933, at *4 (D. Mass. Mar. 24, 1983), affd, 718 F.2d 1201 (1st Cir. 1983) (The court cannot draw adverse inference from the proper assertion of an attorney-client privilege.). Further, having failed to establish any of the elements foundational to a finding of spoliation, Plaintiffs may not rely on an adverse inference regarding the possible content of any of the ten documents listed on the EVMS log that are now missing. Accordingly, Defendants MIL No. 5 is granted in part and Defendants MIL No. 6 is granted as follows. The motions are granted to the extent that Plaintiffs are barred from directly or indirectly making such arguments to the jury. Plaintiffs may not suggest (as they repeatedly argued to this Court) that the assertion of the attorney-client privilege or privilege log entries permit the inference that one or more Warner Chilcott employee(s) actively participated in the prosecution of the 394 Patent or that some of the documents containing these privileged communications are suspiciously missing. Because, apart from these impermissible adverse inferences, the probative value of the EVMS log is extremely limited and the danger of unfair prejudice and confusion great (in that speculation regarding the content of the communications is the principal probative fact to be established), the motions are also granted to the extent that Plaintiffs may not offer the EVMS log in evidence. Fed. R. Evid. 403; see Beraha v. Baxter Healthcare Corp., No. 88 C 9898, 1994 WL 494654, at *3 (N.D. Ill. Sept. 6, 1994) (evidence that a privileged communication occurred is not privileged but may not be admitted if it is only offered to enable the jury to draw adverse inferences from it). However, circumstances during trial may afford a foundation for use of or reliance on the EVMS log. For example, if a witness testifies to a lack of recollection regarding the fact of communications in the 1994-95 period that are reflected on the EVMS log, it may be used to refresh recollection pursuant to Fed. R. Evid. 612, but not admitted or commented on to the jury.. So Ordered by Magistrate Judge Patricia A. Sullivan on 12/16/2019. (Saucier, Martha)
December 16, 2019 Opinion or Order TEXT ORDER denying #1300 Motion in Limine. Purchasers motion in limine (ECF No. 1300) to preclude argument or evidence that Warner Chilcott Executives were not involved in the 394 Patent prosecution or assignment seeks a sweeping preclusion order barring various defenses to their Walker Process claims based on a handful of unchallenged assertions of the attorney-client privilege with respect to certain communications conveying legal advice between January 1994 and February 1996. While the motion argues that such an extraordinary preclusion order is necessary because Defendants are relying on the content of the withheld communications as a sword, while asserting the privilege as a shield, it presents no foundation for such an argument. Therefore, the motion in limine is denied. However, if any witness testifies to a subjective belief (such as that the 394 Patent application was not fraudulent), which belief was informed based on his/her participation in these privileged communications, such testimony is excluded unless the document containing the communication in which that witness participated is produced far enough in advance of the testimony to permit preparation for cross examination. In re Lidoderm Antitrust Litig., Case No. 14-md-02521-WHO, 2016 WL 4191612, at *2 (N.D. Cal. Aug. 9, 2016) (insofar as defendants relied on attorney advice, they are precluded from offering subjective beliefs unless they waive the privilege). So Ordered by Magistrate Judge Patricia A. Sullivan on 12/16/2019. (Saucier, Martha)
December 16, 2019 Filing 1376 MEMORANDUM IN SUPPORT by Albertson's, LLC, CVS Pharmacy, Inc., End Payor Plaintiffs, HEB Grocery Company L.P., Rite-Aid Corporation, Rite-Aid Hdqtrs. Corp., Safeway, Inc., The Kroger Co., Walgreen Co. in support of #1374 Transcript,,, Re: Testimony of Dr. McGuire. (Shadowen, Steve)
December 13, 2019 Filing 1375 NOTICE by Plaintiffs re #890 MOTION in Limine to Exclude Certain Opinions of Lentz, Doll, and Jewell ----- Notice of Purchasers' Response to Defendants' Appendix A (Attachments: #1 Exhibit)(Johnson, Kristen)
December 13, 2019 Filing 1374 TRANSCRIPT of Motions held on 12/9/2019 before Judge Smith. Court Reporter/Transcriber Lisa Schwam, Telephone number 401-752-7128. Transcript may be viewed at the court public terminal or purchased through the Court Reporter/Transcriber before the deadline for Release of Transcript Restriction. After that date it may be obtained through PACER. NOTICE TO COUNSEL: Redaction Requests must be filed for personal identifiers only. All other redactions must be requested by motion. For local policy and sample redaction request visit our website at www.rid.uscourts.gov and select Transcripts under the Case Information menu option. Redaction Request due 1/3/2020. Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 1/13/2020. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 3/12/2020. (Schwam, Lisa)
December 13, 2019 Opinion or Order TEXT ORDER granting #1373 Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice of Aurelia Chaudhury. So Ordered by District Judge William E. Smith (2) on 12/13/2019. (Farrell Pletcher, Paula)
December 13, 2019 Opinion or Order TEXT ORDER re: #1301 PURCHASERS' OMNIBUS MOTION IN LIMINE: Plaintiffs' Motion in Limine No. 39 is GRANTED for the reasons stated in the forthcoming summary judgment ruling. So Ordered by District Judge William E. Smith on 12/13/2019. (Jackson, Ryan)
December 13, 2019 Opinion or Order TEXT ORDER re: #1301 PURCHASERS' OMNIBUS MOTION IN LIMINE: Plaintiffs' Motion in Limine No. 36 is GRANTED insofar as it relates to Phase 1 of the trial and deferred as it relates to Phases 2 and/or 3 of the trial. So Ordered by District Judge William E. Smith on 12/13/2019. (Jackson, Ryan)
December 13, 2019 Filing 1373 MOTION for Aurelia Chaudhury to Appear Pro Hac Vice ( filing fee paid $ 100.00, receipt number 0103-1456150 ) filed by Ahold USA, Inc.. (Sobol, Thomas)
December 13, 2019 Opinion or Order TEXT ORDER granting #1372 Motion for Leave to File Additional pro hac vice Applications. So Ordered by District Judge William E. Smith on 12/13/2019. (Jackson, Ryan)
December 13, 2019 Opinion or Order TEXT ORDER re: #1301 PURCHASERS' OMNIBUS MOTION IN LIMINE: Plaintiffs' Motion in Limine No. 40 is GRANTED IN PART AND DENIED IN PART. The Court has already ruled on the admissibility of the settlement agreements with respect to Plaintiffs' Motion in Limine No. 38. As to material referenced in this motion: First, the purpose for which Defendants intend to use the pleadings (e.g., to show that some generic manufacturers did not assert inequitable conduct counterclaims) is not hearsay. A proper foundation would be necessary prior to introduction of this evidence. The evidence is relevant to the claims of Walker Process fraud, sham litigation, and reverse payment. However, in accordance with Rule 403 of the Federal Rules of Evidence, no decision of any court or materials filed in other lawsuits may be presented to the jury. For example, Defendants may only explain Judge Pisanos decision (without admitting it into evidence). Defendants also may not relay to the jury that Warner Chilcott "won" or "prevailed" with regard to the Mylan Markman decision. Further, as this court has said in other orders, Judge Pisano's decision is not binding evidence in this litigation. (See forthcoming summary judgment ruling). Plaintiffs' remaining objections, including those related to the weight to be afforded to litigation strategies, do not require exclusion of the evidence and instead can be addressed on cross-examination. The Court will instruct the jury as necessary. So Ordered by District Judge William E. Smith on 12/13/2019. (Jackson, Ryan)
December 13, 2019 Opinion or Order TEXT ORDER re: #1301 PURCHASERS' OMNIBUS MOTION IN LIMINE: Plaintiffs' Motion in Limine No. 7 is GRANTED IN PART AND DENIED IN PART. To the extent this motion asks the Court to prohibit Defendants from inquiring as to why patients purchased Loestrin 24 and Minastrin 24 or present evidence as to the same, this motion is DENIED with respect to both market power and Plaintiffs' product hop claim. However, to the extent this motion asks the Court to prohibit Defendants from inquiring as to why patients switched from Loestrin 24 to any other drug, except Minastrin 24, this motion is GRANTED with respect to Plaintiffs' product hop claim in light of the Court's order on December 11, 2019 ruling on Plaintiffs' Motion in Limine No. 27. Further, the Court directs the parties to file a short statement regarding the status of these two named plaintiffs in this case and which claims they are pursuing. So Ordered by District Judge William E. Smith on 12/13/2019. (Jackson, Ryan)
December 12, 2019 Filing 1372 MOTION for Leave to File Document Motion for Leave to File Additional Application for Admission Pro Hac Vice filed by Ahold USA, Inc.. Responses due by 12/26/2019. (Sobol, Thomas)
December 12, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 1371 STIPULATION AND ORDER Entering #1370 Stipulation on Finalizing Deposition Designations for Use at Trial. So Ordered by District Judge William E. Smith on 12/12/2019. (Jackson, Ryan)
December 12, 2019 Opinion or Order TEXT ORDER granting #1175 Motion to Unseal Document ; granting #1176 Motion to Unseal Document ; granting #1179 Motion to Unseal Document ; granting #1180 Motion to Unseal Document. So Ordered by District Judge William E. Smith on 12/12/2019. (Jackson, Ryan)
December 11, 2019 Filing 1370 STIPULATION and Proposed Order on Finalizing Deposition Designations for Use at Trial filed by Warner Chilcott Company, Inc., Warner Chilcott Company, LLC, Warner Chilcott Corporation, Warner Chilcott Holdings Company III, Ltd., Warner Chilcott Laboratories Ireland Limited, Warner Chilcott Public Limited Company, Warner Chilcott Sales (US), LLC, Warner Chilcott U.S., LLC, Watson Laboratories, Inc., Watson Pharmaceuticals, Inc.. (Benjamin, Nicole)
December 11, 2019 Opinion or Order TEXT ORDER granting #1369 Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice of Laura Hayes. So Ordered by District Judge William E. Smith (2) on 12/11/2019. (Hicks, Alyson)
December 11, 2019 Opinion or Order TEXT ORDER granting #1368 Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice of David Calvello. So Ordered by District Judge William E. Smith (2) on 12/11/2019. (Hicks, Alyson)
December 11, 2019 Opinion or Order TEXT ORDER re: #1301 PURCHASERS' OMNIBUS MOTION IN LIMINE: Plaintiffs' Motion in Limine No. 28 is GRANTED IN PART AND DENIED IN PART. In rebutting Plaintiffs' evidence of coercion, neither Dr. Meyer nor any other expert may opine that the fact that Loestrin 24 was limitedly available means Defendants' conduct could not and did not coerce consumers. While the amount of legacy product available may be relevant to the more nuanced question of whether a "hard switch" occurred, which is a question the jury will decide based on all the evidence presented, Dr. Meyer may not opine contrary to law that no hard switch occurred because some product remained on the market. See New York ex rel. Schneiderman v. Actavis PLC, 787 F.3d 638, 648, 654 (2d Cir. 2015) (recognizing that a hard switch may occur in effect where the branded product remains on the market in some limited fashion). (See forthcoming summary judgment ruling). So Ordered by District Judge William E. Smith on 12/11/2019. (Jackson, Ryan)
December 11, 2019 Opinion or Order TEXT ORDER re: #1301 PURCHASERS' OMNIBUS MOTION IN LIMINE: Plaintiffs' Motion in Limine No. 27 is GRANTED. Dr. Meyer may not opine that the existence of other oral contraceptives in the market disproves coercion resulting from the switch from Loestrin 24 to Minastrin 24; such evidence is not relevant because the relevant question is whether consumers were coerced to switch. The fact that individual consumers may have had other choices does not speak to this issue. So Ordered by District Judge William E. Smith on 12/11/2019. (Jackson, Ryan)
December 11, 2019 Filing 1369 MOTION for Laura G. Hayes to Appear Pro Hac Vice ( filing fee paid $ 100.00, receipt number 0103-1455253 ) filed by Direct Purchaser Class Plaintiffs. (Sobol, Thomas)
December 11, 2019 Opinion or Order TEXT ORDER re: #1301 PURCHASERS' OMNIBUS MOTION IN LIMINE: Plaintiffs' Motion in Limine No. 22 is DENIED. Defendants state they do not intend to argue they have been singled out in this litigation. The Court has ruled in reference to Plaintiffs' Motion in Limine No. 38 that the patent litigation settlements with other companies regarding the '394 patent are only admissible in very limited circumstances. The settlement with Lupin in this litigation (which does not appear to be the subject of this motion) would not be admissible. So Ordered by District Judge William E. Smith on 12/11/2019. (Jackson, Ryan)
December 11, 2019 Opinion or Order TEXT ORDER re: #1301 PURCHASERS' OMNIBUS MOTION IN LIMINE: Plaintiffs' Motion in Limine No. 38 is GRANTED IN PART AND DENIED IN PART. In accordance with Rule 408 of the Federal Rules of Evidence, these agreements may not be used prove or disprove the validity of the disputed claims. It is proper for the parties' experts to rely on these agreements in forming their opinions, including their opinions as to likelihood of success in the underlying litigation; the jury may similarly consider the agreements to the extent they instruct on Warner Chilcott's state of mind (and not the validity of the claims) provided a proper foundation is laid for any such testimony. So Ordered by District Judge William E. Smith on 12/11/2019. (Jackson, Ryan)
December 11, 2019 Filing 1368 MOTION for David Calvello to Appear Pro Hac Vice ( filing fee paid $ 100.00, receipt number 0103-1455241 ) filed by Direct Purchaser Class Plaintiffs. (Sobol, Thomas)
December 10, 2019 Filing 1367 NOTICE by Plaintiffs of PURCHASER PLAINTIFFS SUBMISSION OF NEXIUM AND SOLODYN PRELIMINARY JURY INSTRUCTIONS (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B)(Sobol, Thomas)
December 10, 2019 Opinion or Order TEXT ORDER: Plaintiffs' Motion in Limine No. 1, see #1301 MOTION in Limine PURCHASERS' OMNIBUS MOTION IN LIMINE, is GRANTED. This order applies to Phase 1 of the trial. First, consistent with the Court's earlier pronouncements, Defendants may not present evidence or argument suggesting that lost profits is a more appropriate measure of damages than overcharges. See, e.g., In re Loestrin 24 Fe Antitrust Litig., No. 1:13-2472-WES-PAS, 2019 WL 3214257, at *5 n.10 (D.R.I. July 2, 2019) ("The Supreme Court has 'long recognized [overcharges] as the principal measure of damages for plaintiffs injured as customers.'" (quoting In re Nexium (Esomeprazole) Antitrust Litig., 296 F.R.D. 47, 55 (D. Mass. 2013))). Second, Defendants may not present evidence or argument during the first phase of trial that the DPPs' or Retailers' damages or injury may be offset or diminished by evidence of passing on overcharges. See Illinois Brick Co. v. Illinois, 431 U.S. 720, 724-25 (1977) ("[T]he antitrust defendant is not permitted to introduce evidence that indirect purchasers were in fact injured by the illegal overcharge.") (citing Hanover Shoe, Inc. v. United Shoe Mach. Corp., 392 U.S. 481, 494 (1968)); see also id. at 736 (noting that a pre-existing cost-plus contract with a fixed-quantity requirement is the only exception cited in Hanover Shoe "to its rule barring pass-on defenses"); In re Namenda Direct Purchaser Antitrust Litig., No. 15 Civ. 7488 (CM) (JCF), 2017 WL 2693713, at *7-8 (S.D.N.Y. June 21, 2017) (holding that cost-plus exception is not applicable where a customer is not obligated to purchase fixed quantity of specific drug). Third, Defendants may not present evidence or argument that Plaintiffs' damages should be reduced to account for so-called generic bypass. See, e.g., In re Loestrin 24 Fe Antitrust Litig., 2019 WL 3214257, at *5-6 n.10 (citing cases). The Court reserves ruling on Plaintiffs Motions in Limine Nos. 4 and 5 until Phases 2 and 3 of trial. So Ordered by District Judge William E. Smith on 12/10/2019. (Jackson, Ryan)
December 9, 2019 Minute Entry for proceedings held before District Judge William E. Smith (2): In Chambers Conference held on 12/9/2019: N. Benjamin, P. Carney, J. Pace, R. Milne, B. Gant, M. Gidley, C. Curran, M. Penza, L. Pupenhouse, T. Sobol. K. Johnson, S. Shadowen, B. Refsin, T. Ziegler, J. Meltzar, S. Robertson, D. Evans, R. Brown, H. Brewster, A. Getacheu, R. Arnold, A. Neill, E. Bloom, R. Gonzales, E. Noteware, D. Walker, A. Chaudhury, D. Grossbaum, M. Vantine, A. Cox, R. McConnell, M. Buchman, P. Kohn, J. Gray. (Court Reporter L. Schwam.) (Potter, Carrie)
December 9, 2019 Minute Entry for proceedings held before District Judge William E. Smith (2): Motion Hearing held on 12/9/2019 re MOTIONs in Limine: T. Sobol, S. Shadowen, B. Refsin, K. Johnson, R. Milne, J, Pace, A. Cox, B. Gant, N. Benjamin. Parties argue Motions in Limine. Court takes under advisement. (Court Reporter L. Schwam in Courtroom 4 at 9:48 p.m..) (Potter, Carrie)
December 8, 2019 Filing 1366 NOTICE by Direct Purchaser Class Plaintiffs Notice of Filing Purchaser Plaintiffs' Witness List and Exhibit List (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Purchasers' Witness List, #2 Exhibit B - Purchasers' Exhibit List, #3 Exhibit C - Tabbed Excerpts of Plaintiffs' Exhibit List)(Sobol, Thomas)
December 8, 2019 Filing 1365 NOTICE by Warner Chilcott Company, Inc., Warner Chilcott Company, LLC, Warner Chilcott Corporation, Warner Chilcott Holdings Company III, Ltd., Warner Chilcott Laboratories Ireland Limited, Warner Chilcott Public Limited Company, Warner Chilcott Sales (US), LLC, Warner Chilcott U.S., LLC, Watson Laboratories, Inc., Watson Pharmaceuticals, Inc. (Proposed Jury Charges Prior to Addressing Key Trial Topics and Party Objections) Submitted on behalf of all Parties (Benjamin, Nicole)
December 8, 2019 Filing 1364 PRETRIAL MEMORANDUM by Plaintiffs. (Robertson, Sharon)
December 6, 2019 Filing 1363 NOTICE by Warner Chilcott Company, Inc., Warner Chilcott Company, LLC, Warner Chilcott Corporation, Warner Chilcott Holdings Company III, Ltd., Warner Chilcott Laboratories Ireland Limited, Warner Chilcott Public Limited Company, Warner Chilcott Sales (US), LLC, Warner Chilcott U.S., LLC, Watson Laboratories, Inc., Watson Pharmaceuticals, Inc. (Notice of Filing of Defendants' Witness and Exhibit Lists) (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A (Exhibit List), #2 Exhibit B (Witness List))(Benjamin, Nicole)
December 6, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 1362 ORDER ON PENDING MOTIONS IN LIMINE: granting in part and denying in part #1301 Motion in Limine; granting #1279 Motion in Limine; denying as moot #1280 Motion in Limine; denying as moot #1281 Motion in Limine; denying #1282 Motion in Limine; granting in part and denying in part #1285 Motion in Limine; granting in part and denying in part #1286 Motion in Limine; and, denying #1287 Motion in Limine. So Ordered by District Judge William E. Smith on 12/6/2019. (Jackson, Ryan)
December 6, 2019 Opinion or Order TEXT ORDER granting #1360 Motion for Leave to File Two Additional Applications for Admission Pro Hac Vice. So Ordered by District Judge William E. Smith on 12/6/2019. (Jackson, Ryan)
December 6, 2019 Opinion or Order TEXT ORDER denying #884 MOTION to Exclude the Opinions and Testimony of End-Payor Plaintiffs' Expert Dr. Gary L. French: For the reasons set forth in In re Loestrin 24 FE Antitrust Litig., No. 1:13-MD-2472-WES-PAS, 2019 WL 5406077, at *19-24 (D.R.I. Oct. 17, 2019), Defendants' Motion to Exclude the Opinions and Testimony of EPPs' Expert Dr. Gary L. French, ECF No. 884, is DENIED. So Ordered by District Judge William E. Smith on 12/6/2019. (Jackson, Ryan)
December 6, 2019 Opinion or Order TEXT ORDER granting in part and denying in part #895 MOTION to Exclude the Opinions and Testimony of Judge T. John Ward: Mr. Ward may not provide a detailed description of the patent-trial process and recitation of the law; he may only discuss his experience generally to explain his conclusion regarding chance of success. He will be referred to only as "Mr. Ward", and, as necessary, the Court will instruct the jury that Mr. Ward is just like any other witness. With respect to his opinion about Watson's chance of success in the underlying litigation, Mr. Ward may not opine from the perspective of a judge presiding over that particular case; he may only opine about the likelihood of success based on his experience as a patent lawyer and judge who has handled patent cases. He may rely on the Mylan claim construction decision and Defendants' other experts. So Ordered by District Judge William E. Smith on 12/6/2019. (Jackson, Ryan)
December 6, 2019 Opinion or Order TEXT ORDER denying #897 MOTION to Partially Exclude the Opinions and Testimony of Ronald Thisted: The opinions are proper rebuttal to Mr. Lentz and Dr. Jewell. If Mr. Lentz does not refer to the Phase III trial, then Dr. Thisted may not address it; but if Mr. Lentz intends to use it to support his opinion regarding the materiality of the 30-Woman Study, then Dr. Thisted may address it. The "corrected" charts may be used; if Plaintiffs disagree with Dr. Thisted's corrections, they may address this on cross-examination. So Ordered by District Judge William E. Smith on 12/6/2019. (Jackson, Ryan)
December 6, 2019 Opinion or Order TEXT ORDER granting in part and denying in part 905 MOTION to Exclude the Expert Opinions of Karen Ryle: Ms. Ryle may testify based on her experience and research in the industry about the process and practice of generic substitution; counseling of patients regarding switching to other oral contraceptives; and consultation with prescribers regarding same. Moreover, subject to proper foundation, she may testify about specifics regarding Loestrin 24 and substitutes and switching in her own experience and in the industry. If there is no foundation, she cannot express conclusions or opinions. The Court will reserve further ruling until it hears her testimony. So Ordered by District Judge William E. Smith on 12/6/2019. (Jackson, Ryan)
December 6, 2019 Opinion or Order TEXT ORDER denying #867 MOTION to Exclude In Part Expert Opinions of Christine S. Meyer: The opinion regarding the commercial success of Loestrin 24 is admissible. The timeframe should be restricted to the relevant period. The issues raised by Plaintiffs in the motion are proper cross-examination material. So Ordered by District Judge William E. Smith on 12/6/2019. (Jackson, Ryan)
December 6, 2019 Opinion or Order TEXT ORDER granting in part and denying in part #899 MOTION to Partially Exclude the Opinions and Testimony of Stephen G. Kunin: Mr. Kunin may not restate the law (except as necessary background), opine on state of mind, parrot other experts' opinions without adding any further analysis, or opine as to the proper scope and legal boundaries of other experts. So Ordered by District Judge William E. Smith on 12/6/2019. (Jackson, Ryan)
December 6, 2019 Opinion or Order TEXT ORDER granting in part and denying in part #865 MOTION to Exclude In Part Expert Opinions of Dr. Philip D. Darney: Mr. Darney may not offer legal conclusions or opinions contrary to law, but may opine from his perspective as a person of ordinary skill in the art. Plaintiffs' remaining objections to his testimony may be dealt with on cross-examination. So Ordered by District Judge William E. Smith on 12/6/2019. (Jackson, Ryan)
December 6, 2019 Opinion or Order TEXT ORDER denying #903 MOTION to Exclude in Part the Expert Testimony of Philip Green: All of the issues raised in the motion may be covered in cross-examination of the witness. So Ordered by District Judge William E. Smith on 12/6/2019. (Jackson, Ryan)
December 6, 2019 Opinion or Order TEXT ORDER granting in part and denying in part #881 MOTION to Partially Exclude the Opinions and Testimony of Robert A. Dormer: Mr. Dormer may offer opinions only as to the Hatch-Waxman process; filing of an NDA; exclusivity period of three years; filing of an ANDA; and process of listing patents that may reasonably be asserted. He may not opine about what the generic manufacturers' failure or decision to not file counterclaims to delist the patent means regarding what Warner Chilcott must have believed (including with respect to the patent's validity), or otherwise opine contrary to law. So Ordered by District Judge William E. Smith on 12/6/2019. (Jackson, Ryan)
December 6, 2019 Opinion or Order TEXT ORDER granting #1361 Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice of Moira Kim Penza. So Ordered by District Judge William E. Smith (2) on 12/6/2019. (Hicks, Alyson)
December 6, 2019 Opinion or Order TEXT ORDER: The Court intends to issue text order rulings on up to 37 motions in limine and numerous Daubert motions by the end of the day today (Friday, December 6, 2019). Counsel will need to incorporate many of these rulings into the pre-trial "roadmap" or "checklist", also due to be filed today. Therefore, counsel may have until 12 noon Sunday, December 8, 2019, to file this document. So Ordered by District Judge William E. Smith on 12/6/2019. (Jackson, Ryan)
December 5, 2019 Filing 1361 MOTION for Moira Kim Penza to Appear Pro Hac Vice ( filing fee paid $ 100.00, receipt number 0103-1453629 ) filed by Warner Chilcott Company, Inc., Warner Chilcott Company, LLC, Warner Chilcott Corporation, Warner Chilcott Holdings Company III, Ltd., Warner Chilcott Laboratories Ireland Limited, Warner Chilcott Public Limited Company, Warner Chilcott Sales (US), LLC, Warner Chilcott U.S., LLC, Watson Laboratories, Inc., Watson Pharmaceuticals, Inc.. (Benjamin, Nicole)
December 5, 2019 Opinion or Order TEXT ORDER denying #1346 Purchasers' MOTION to Preclude Defendants from Calling Katie MacFarlane as a Witness at Trial. So Ordered by District Judge William E. Smith on 12/5/2019. (Jackson, Ryan)
December 5, 2019 Filing 1360 MOTION for Leave to File Document Motion for Leave to File Two Additional Applications for Admission Pro Hac Vice filed by Ahold USA, Inc.. Responses due by 12/19/2019. (Sobol, Thomas)
December 5, 2019 Opinion or Order TEXT ORDER granting #1358 Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice of Rudy Gonzales, Jr.. So Ordered by District Judge William E. Smith (2) on 12/5/2019. (Hicks, Alyson)
December 4, 2019 Filing 1359 MOTION to Unseal Document #1347 MOTION to Seal Filed. filed by Painters District Council No. 30 Health & Welfare Fund, Laborers International Union of North America, Direct Purchaser Class Plaintiffs, Rite-Aid Hdqtrs. Corp., End Payor Plaintiffs, HEB Grocery Company L.P., Melissa Chrestman, Albertson's, LLC, Allied Services Division Welfare Fund, Walgreen Co., The Kroger Co., Electrical Workers 242 & 294 Health & Welfare Fund, Mary Alexander, CVS Pharmacy, Inc., American Sales Company, LLC, Rochester Drug Co-Operative, Inc., City of Providence, United Food and Commercial Workers Local 1776, New York Hotel Trades Council & Hotel Association of New York City, Inc. Health Benefits Fund, Ahold USA, Inc., Melisa Chrestman, Fraternal Order of Police Fort Lauderdale Lodge 31, Denise Loy, Rite-Aid Corporation, Safeway, Inc., Teamsters Local 237 Welfare Benefits Fund filed by All Plaintiffs. Responses due by 12/18/2019. (Walker, Daniel)
December 4, 2019 Filing 1358 MOTION for Rudy F. Gonzales, Jr. to Appear Pro Hac Vice ( filing fee paid $ 100.00, receipt number 0103-1453101 ) filed by City of Providence, United Food and Commercial Workers Local 1776. (McConnell, Robert)
December 4, 2019 MOTIONS REFERRED: #1283 MOTION in Limine to Preclude Argument, Evidence or Adverse Inferences Based Upon Defendant's Invocation of Privilege or a Non-Party's Privilege Log (MIL No. 5); #1284 MOTION in Limine to Preclude Argument About Privileged Documents of Non-Parties that Defendants and Non-Parties Were Unable to Locate During Discovery (MIL No. 6); and, #1300 MOTION in Limine for an Order Precluding Argument or Evidence that Warner Chilcott Executives were Not Involved in the 394 Patent Prosecution or Assignment referred for determination to Magistrate Judge Patricia A. Sullivan. (Jackson, Ryan)
December 3, 2019 Filing 1357 NOTICE by Plaintiffs Reply in Support of Purchasers' Motion in Limine For an Order Precluding Argument or Evidence That Warner Chilcott Executives Were Not Involved in The '394 Patent Prosecution or Assignment (Public Version of ECF 1325) (Robertson, Sharon)
December 2, 2019 Filing 1356 REPLY to Response re #1354 Response to Motion,, to Preclude Defendants from Calling Katie MacFarlane as a Witness at Trial filed by All Plaintiffs. (Walker, Daniel)
November 30, 2019 Filing 1355 DECLARATION re #1354 Response to Motion,, Declaration of Katherine Dyson in Support of Defendants' Opposition to Plaintiffs' Motion to Preclude Defendants from Calling Katie MacFarlane as a Witness at Trial by Warner Chilcott Company, Inc., Warner Chilcott Company, LLC, Warner Chilcott Corporation, Warner Chilcott Holdings Company III, Ltd., Warner Chilcott Laboratories Ireland Limited, Warner Chilcott Public Limited Company, Warner Chilcott Sales (US), LLC, Warner Chilcott U.S., LLC, Watson Laboratories, Inc., Watson Pharmaceuticals, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit 2, #3 Exhibit 3, #4 Exhibit 4)(Benjamin, Nicole)
November 30, 2019 Filing 1354 RESPONSE In Opposition to #1346 MOTION Preclusion of Katie MacFarlane as a Witness at Trial filed by Warner Chilcott Company, Inc., Warner Chilcott Company, LLC, Warner Chilcott Corporation, Warner Chilcott Holdings Company III, Ltd., Warner Chilcott Laboratories Ireland Limited, Warner Chilcott Public Limited Company, Warner Chilcott Sales (US), LLC, Warner Chilcott U.S., LLC, Watson Laboratories, Inc., Watson Pharmaceuticals, Inc.. Replies due by 12/9/2019. (Benjamin, Nicole)
November 26, 2019 Filing 1353 NOTICE by Plaintiffs re #1301 MOTION in Limine PURCHASERS' OMNIBUS MOTION IN LIMINE REPLY MEMORANDUM OF LAW IN SUPPORT OF PURCHASERS OMNIBUS MOTION IN LIMINE (Public Version ECF No. 1336) (Attachments: #1 Supplemental Declaration of Sharon K. Robertson, #2 Exhibits 1-7)(Robertson, Sharon)
November 26, 2019 Opinion or Order TEXT ORDER granting #1347 Motion to Seal. So Ordered by Chief Judge William E. Smith on 11/26/2019. (Jackson, Ryan)
November 25, 2019 Filing 1351 Proposed Jury Instructions by Plaintiffs.(Sobol, Thomas)
November 25, 2019 Filing 1350 NOTICE by Plaintiffs Plaintiffs' Proposed Jury Verdict (Sobol, Thomas)
November 25, 2019 Filing 1349 NOTICE by Warner Chilcott Company, Inc., Warner Chilcott Company, LLC, Warner Chilcott Corporation, Warner Chilcott Holdings Company III, Ltd., Warner Chilcott Laboratories Ireland Limited, Warner Chilcott Public Limited Company, Warner Chilcott Sales (US), LLC, Warner Chilcott U.S., LLC, Watson Laboratories, Inc., Watson Pharmaceuticals, Inc. of Defendants' Proposed Verdict Form (Benjamin, Nicole)
November 25, 2019 Filing 1348 Proposed Jury Instructions by Warner Chilcott Company, Inc., Warner Chilcott Company, LLC, Warner Chilcott Corporation, Warner Chilcott Holdings Company III, Ltd., Warner Chilcott Laboratories Ireland Limited, Warner Chilcott Public Limited Company, Warner Chilcott Sales (US), LLC, Warner Chilcott U.S., LLC, Watson Laboratories, Inc., Watson Pharmaceuticals, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C, #4 Exhibit D, #5 Exhibit E, #6 Exhibit F, #7 Exhibit G, #8 Exhibit H, #9 Exhibit I, #10 Exhibit J, #11 Exhibit K)(Benjamin, Nicole)
November 25, 2019 Opinion or Order TEXT ORDER denying #1315 MOTION for Live Trial Testimony Via Contemporaneous Video Transmission. So Ordered by Chief Judge William E. Smith on 11/25/2019. (Jackson, Ryan)
November 22, 2019 Filing 1347 MOTION to Seal Filed. Notice Sent To: All Plaintiffs. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 2, #2 Exhibit 3, #3 Exhibit 4, #4 Exhibit 5)(Walker, Daniel) This entry/document has been filed under seal pursuant to statute, rule or court order and access is restricted. Please login to CM/ECF to view document(s).
November 22, 2019 Filing 1346 MOTION Preclusion of Katie MacFarlane as a Witness at Trial filed by All Plaintiffs. Responses due by 12/6/2019. (Attachments: #1 Supporting Memorandum, #2 Affidavit, #3 Exhibit 1)(Walker, Daniel)
November 22, 2019 Filing 1345 TRANSCRIPT of Juror Questionnaires Conference (Redacted) held on 11/19/2019 before Judge Smith. Court Reporter/Transcriber Lisa Schwam, Telephone number 401-752-7128. Transcript may be viewed at the court public terminal or purchased through the Court Reporter/Transcriber before the deadline for Release of Transcript Restriction. After that date it may be obtained through PACER. NOTICE TO COUNSEL: Redaction Requests must be filed for personal identifiers only. All other redactions must be requested by motion. For local policy and sample redaction request visit our website at www.rid.uscourts.gov and select Transcripts under the Case Information menu option. Redaction Request due 12/13/2019. Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 12/23/2019. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 2/20/2020. (Schwam, Lisa)
November 22, 2019 Opinion or Order TEXT ORDER: Pursuant to Case Management Orders 2 and #85 and #90 , the Court has held quarterly ex parte confidential phone conferences with the direct purchaser and end payor classes throughout the duration of the case. In light of the upcoming trial scheduled to commence in January 2020, the Court hereby suspends the quarterly ex parte confidential phone conferences until trial concludes and there are further orders from the Court. So Ordered by Magistrate Judge Patricia A. Sullivan on 11/22/2019. (Saucier, Martha)
November 20, 2019 Filing 1342 RESPONSE In Opposition to #1315 MOTION for Live Trial Testimony Via Contemporaneous Video Transmission filed by Warner Chilcott Company, Inc., Warner Chilcott Company, LLC, Warner Chilcott Corporation, Warner Chilcott Holdings Company III, Ltd., Warner Chilcott Laboratories Ireland Limited, Warner Chilcott Public Limited Company, Warner Chilcott Sales (US), LLC, Warner Chilcott U.S., LLC, Watson Laboratories, Inc., Watson Pharmaceuticals, Inc.. Replies due by 11/27/2019. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit 2, #3 Exhibit 3, #4 Exhibit 4, #5 Exhibit 5, #6 Exhibit 6, #7 Exhibit 7, #8 Exhibit 8, #9 Exhibit 9, #10 Exhibit 10, #11 Exhibit 11, #12 Exhibit 12, #13 Exhibit 13, #14 Exhibit 14, #15 Exhibit 15)(Benjamin, Nicole)
November 20, 2019 NOTICE of Hearing: Final Pretrial Conference scheduled for Monday 12/9/2019 to begin at 9:30 AM in the Judicial Conference Room, Second Floor, U.S. Courthouse before Judge William E. Smith; this conference will be immediately followed by a Motion Hearing re: pending Motions in limine in Courtroom 3 before Judge William E. Smith. (Jackson, Ryan)
November 20, 2019 Opinion or Order TEXT ORDER granting #1322 Motion to Seal Document Previously Filed With the Court ; granting #1325 Motion to Seal; granting #1336 Motion to Seal. So Ordered by Chief Judge William E. Smith on 11/20/2019. (Jackson, Ryan)
November 20, 2019 Filing 1339 NOTICE by Plaintiffs re #1285 MOTION in Limine TO LIMIT THE RISK OF JURY NULLIFICATION BY EXCLUDING UNNECESSARY PUBLIC POLICY ARGUMENTS REGARDING THE PHARMACEUTICAL INDUSTRY (MIL NO. 7) Opposition to Defendants' Motion in Limine No. 7 to Limit the Risk of Jury Nullification by Excluding Unnecessary Public Policy Arguments Regarding the Pharmaceutical Industry (Public Version - ECF No. 1311-1) (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C)(Robertson, Sharon)
November 20, 2019 Filing 1338 NOTICE by Plaintiffs re #1284 MOTION in Limine to Preclude Argument About Privileged Documents of Non-Parties that Defendants and Non-Parties Were Unable to Locate During Discovery (MIL No. 6) Purchasers' Opposition to Defendants' Motion in Limine No. 6 to Preclude Argument About Privileged Documents of Non-Parties That Defendants and Non-Parties Were Unable to Locate During Discovery (Public Version) (Robertson, Sharon)
November 20, 2019 Filing 1337 NOTICE by Plaintiffs re #1283 MOTION in Limine to Preclude Argument, Evidence or Adverse Inferences Based Upon Defendant's Invocation of Privilege or a Non-Party's Privilege Log (MIL No. 5) Purchasers' Opposition to Defendants' Motion in Limine (MIL No. 5) to Preclude Argument, Evidence, or Adverse Inferences Based Upon Defendants' Invocation of Privilege or a Non-Party's Privilege Log (Public Version - ECF No. 1308-1) (Robertson, Sharon)
November 19, 2019 Minute Entry for proceedings held before Chief Judge William E. Smith: In Chambers Conference re: Jury Selection/Questionnaires held on 11/19/2019; Counsel present: P. Carney; A. Yutes; J. Pace; M. Gidley; L. Pappenhausen; H. Leterran; M. Buchman; P. Kahn. R. Arnold; B. Retsin; A. Lambert; K. Johnson; T. Sobol; J. Meltzer; S. Robertson; D. Walker. (Jackson, Ryan)
November 19, 2019 Filing 1336 MOTION to Seal REPLY MEMORANDUM OF LAW IN SUPPORT OF PURCHASERS OMNIBUS MOTION IN LIMINE Filed. Notice Sent To: Painters District Council No. 30 Health & Welfare Fund, United Food and Commercial Workers Local 1776, The Kroger Co., American Sales Company, LLC, Laborers International Union of North America, New York Hotel Trades Council & Hotel Association of New York City, Inc. Health Benefits Fund, Fraternal Order of Police Fort Lauderdale Lodge 31, Walgreen Co., Rite-Aid Hdqtrs. Corp., Denise Loy, Rochester Drug Co-Operative, Inc., City of Providence, Ahold USA, Inc., Allied Services Division Welfare Fund, CVS Pharmacy, Inc., Safeway, Inc., Rite-Aid Corporation, Albertson's, LLC, HEB Grocery Company L.P., Mary Alexander, Electrical Workers 242 & 294 Health & Welfare Fund, Melisa Chrestman, Teamsters Local 237 Welfare Benefits Fund, Direct Purchaser Class Plaintiffs, End Payor Plaintiffs, Actavis, Inc., Allergan PLC, Lupin Ltd., Lupin Pharmaceuticals, Inc., Warner Chilcott Company, Inc., Warner Chilcott Company, LLC, Warner Chilcott Corporation, Warner Chilcott Holdings Company III, Ltd., Warner Chilcott Laboratories Ireland Limited, Warner Chilcott Public Limited Company, Warner Chilcott Sales (US), LLC, Warner Chilcott U.S., LLC, Watson Laboratories, Inc., Watson Pharmaceuticals, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Sealed Document REPLY MEMORANDUM OF LAW IN SUPPORT OF PURCHASERS OMNIBUS MOTION IN LIMINE, #2 Proposed Sealed Document SUPPLEMENTAL DECLARATION OF SHARON K. ROBERTSON, #3 Proposed Sealed Document EXHIBITS 1-7 OF SUPPLEMENTAL DECLARATION OF SHARON K. ROBERTSON)(Robertson, Sharon) This entry/document has been filed under seal pursuant to statute, rule or court order and access is restricted. Please login to CM/ECF to view document(s).
November 19, 2019 Filing 1335 REPLY to Response re #1310 Response to Motion, in Limine to Preclude Plaintiffs from Relying on What Other Companies Might Do To Prove What Warner Chilcott Would Have Done in 2009 (MIL No. 4) filed by Warner Chilcott Company, Inc., Warner Chilcott Company, LLC, Warner Chilcott Corporation, Warner Chilcott Holdings Company III, Ltd., Warner Chilcott Laboratories Ireland Limited, Warner Chilcott Public Limited Company, Warner Chilcott Sales (US), LLC, Warner Chilcott U.S., LLC, Watson Laboratories, Inc., Watson Pharmaceuticals, Inc.. (Benjamin, Nicole)
November 19, 2019 Filing 1334 REPLY to Response re #1306 Response to Motion,,,, in Limine to Preclude Argument About Privileged Documents of Non-Parties that Defendants and Non-Parties Were Unable to Locate During Discovery (MIL No. 6) filed by Warner Chilcott Company, Inc., Warner Chilcott Company, LLC, Warner Chilcott Corporation, Warner Chilcott Holdings Company III, Ltd., Warner Chilcott Laboratories Ireland Limited, Warner Chilcott Public Limited Company, Warner Chilcott Sales (US), LLC, Warner Chilcott U.S., LLC, Watson Laboratories, Inc., Watson Pharmaceuticals, Inc.. (Benjamin, Nicole)
November 19, 2019 Filing 1333 NOTICE by Plaintiffs re #1286 MOTION in Limine TO EXCLUDE EVIDENCE AND ARGUMENT CONCERNING UNRELATED, ALLEGED ANTICOMPETITIVE ACTS (MIL NO. 8) Plaintiffs Memorandum in Opposition to Defendants Motion in Limine to Exclude Evidence and Argument Concerning Unrelated, Alleged Anticompetitive Acts (MIL No. 8) (Public Version) (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Steve D. Shadowen, #2 Exhibit A, #3 Exhibit B, #4 Exhibit C, #5 Exhibit D, #6 Exhibit E)(Shadowen, Steve)
November 19, 2019 Filing 1332 REPLY to Response re 1317 Response to Motion, in limine to preclude argument, evidence, or adverse inferences based upon Defendants' invocation of privilege or a non-party privilege log (MIL No. 5) filed by Warner Chilcott Company, Inc., Warner Chilcott Company, LLC, Warner Chilcott Corporation, Warner Chilcott Holdings Company III, Ltd., Warner Chilcott Laboratories Ireland Limited, Warner Chilcott Public Limited Company, Warner Chilcott Sales (US), LLC, Warner Chilcott U.S., LLC, Watson Laboratories, Inc., Watson Pharmaceuticals, Inc.. (Benjamin, Nicole)
November 19, 2019 Filing 1331 REPLY to Response re #1304 Response to Motion, in Limine to Exclude Evidence of Unrelated Criminal Case, Guilty Plea, and Non-Antitrust Qui Tam Proceeding and Settlement (MIL No. 3) filed by Warner Chilcott Company, Inc., Warner Chilcott Company, LLC, Warner Chilcott Corporation, Warner Chilcott Holdings Company III, Ltd., Warner Chilcott Laboratories Ireland Limited, Warner Chilcott Public Limited Company, Warner Chilcott Sales (US), LLC, Warner Chilcott U.S., LLC, Watson Laboratories, Inc., Watson Pharmaceuticals, Inc.. (Benjamin, Nicole)
November 19, 2019 Filing 1330 REPLY to Response re #1303 Response to Motion, in Limine TO PRECLUDE PLAINTIFFS FROM INTRODUCING EVIDENCE ABOUT BREAKTHROUGH BLEEDING CONTRARY TO THE SETTLED CLAIM CONSTRUCTION ORDER OF THE PATENT COURT (MIL NO. 9) filed by Warner Chilcott Company, Inc., Warner Chilcott Company, LLC, Warner Chilcott Corporation, Warner Chilcott Holdings Company III, Ltd., Warner Chilcott Laboratories Ireland Limited, Warner Chilcott Public Limited Company, Warner Chilcott Sales (US), LLC, Warner Chilcott U.S., LLC, Watson Laboratories, Inc., Watson Pharmaceuticals, Inc.. (Benjamin, Nicole)
November 19, 2019 Filing 1329 REPLY to Response re 1318 Response to Motion,, in limine to exclude evidence and argument concerning unrelated, alleged anticompetitive acts (MIL No. 8) filed by Warner Chilcott Company, Inc., Warner Chilcott Company, LLC, Warner Chilcott Corporation, Warner Chilcott Holdings Company III, Ltd., Warner Chilcott Laboratories Ireland Limited, Warner Chilcott Public Limited Company, Warner Chilcott Sales (US), LLC, Warner Chilcott U.S., LLC, Watson Laboratories, Inc., Watson Pharmaceuticals, Inc.. (Benjamin, Nicole)
November 19, 2019 Filing 1328 REPLY to Response re 1319 Response to Motion,, in Limine TO LIMIT THE RISK OF JURY NULLIFICATION BY EXCLUDING UNNECESSARY PUBLIC POLICY ARGUMENTS REGARDING THE PHARMACEUTICAL INDUSTRY (MIL NO. 7) filed by Warner Chilcott Company, Inc., Warner Chilcott Company, LLC, Warner Chilcott Corporation, Warner Chilcott Holdings Company III, Ltd., Warner Chilcott Laboratories Ireland Limited, Warner Chilcott Public Limited Company, Warner Chilcott Sales (US), LLC, Warner Chilcott U.S., LLC, Watson Laboratories, Inc., Watson Pharmaceuticals, Inc.. (Benjamin, Nicole)
November 19, 2019 Filing 1327 REPLY to Response re #1305 Response to Motion, in limine to bar reference to any agreement not at issue in this case as an illegal reverse payment (MIL No. 2) filed by Warner Chilcott Company, Inc., Warner Chilcott Company, LLC, Warner Chilcott Corporation, Warner Chilcott Holdings Company III, Ltd., Warner Chilcott Laboratories Ireland Limited, Warner Chilcott Public Limited Company, Warner Chilcott Sales (US), LLC, Warner Chilcott U.S., LLC, Watson Laboratories, Inc., Watson Pharmaceuticals, Inc.. (Benjamin, Nicole)
November 19, 2019 Filing 1326 REPLY to Response re #1307 Response to Motion,,,, in limine to bar Plaintffs from using inflammatory and inaccurate terminology such as "bribes" or "kickbacks" (MIL No. 1) filed by Warner Chilcott Company, Inc., Warner Chilcott Company, LLC, Warner Chilcott Corporation, Warner Chilcott Holdings Company III, Ltd., Warner Chilcott Laboratories Ireland Limited, Warner Chilcott Public Limited Company, Warner Chilcott Sales (US), LLC, Warner Chilcott U.S., LLC, Watson Laboratories, Inc., Watson Pharmaceuticals, Inc.. (Benjamin, Nicole)
November 19, 2019 Filing 1325 MOTION to Seal REPLY IN SUPPORT OF PURCHASERS MOTION IN LIMINE FOR AN ORDER PRECLUDING ARGUMENT OR EVIDENCE THAT WARNER CHILCOTT EXECUTIVES WERE NOT INVOLVED IN THE 394 PATENT PROSECUTION OR ASSIGNMENT Filed. Notice Sent To: Painters District Council No. 30 Health & Welfare Fund, United Food and Commercial Workers Local 1776, The Kroger Co., American Sales Company, LLC, Laborers International Union of North America, New York Hotel Trades Council & Hotel Association of New York City, Inc. Health Benefits Fund, Fraternal Order of Police Fort Lauderdale Lodge 31, Walgreen Co., Rite-Aid Hdqtrs. Corp., Denise Loy, Rochester Drug Co-Operative, Inc., City of Providence, Ahold USA, Inc., Allied Services Division Welfare Fund, CVS Pharmacy, Inc., Safeway, Inc., Rite-Aid Corporation, Albertson's, LLC, HEB Grocery Company L.P., Mary Alexander, Electrical Workers 242 & 294 Health & Welfare Fund, Melisa Chrestman, Teamsters Local 237 Welfare Benefits Fund, Direct Purchaser Class Plaintiffs, End Payor Plaintiffs, Actavis, Inc., Allergan PLC, Melissa Chrestman, Warner Chilcott Company, Inc., Warner Chilcott Company, LLC, Warner Chilcott Corporation, Warner Chilcott Holdings Company III, Ltd., Warner Chilcott Laboratories Ireland Limited, Warner Chilcott Public Limited Company, Warner Chilcott Sales (US), LLC, Warner Chilcott U.S., LLC, Watson Laboratories, Inc., Watson Pharmaceuticals, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 REPLY IN SUPPORT OF PURCHASERS MOTION IN LIMINE FOR AN ORDER PRECLUDING ARGUMENT OR EVIDENCE THAT WARNER CHILCOTT EXECUTIVES WERE NOT INVOLVED IN THE 394 PATENT PROSECUTION OR ASSIGNMENT)(Robertson, Sharon) This entry/document has been filed under seal pursuant to statute, rule or court order and access is restricted. Please login to CM/ECF to view document(s).
November 19, 2019 Filing 1324 NOTICE by Warner Chilcott Company, Inc., Warner Chilcott Company, LLC, Warner Chilcott Corporation, Warner Chilcott Holdings Company III, Ltd., Warner Chilcott Laboratories Ireland Limited, Warner Chilcott Public Limited Company, Warner Chilcott Sales (US), LLC, Warner Chilcott U.S., LLC, Watson Laboratories, Inc., Watson Pharmaceuticals, Inc. Defendants Opposition to Motion in Limine for an Order Precluding Argument or Evidence that Warner Chilcott Executives Were Not Involved in the 394 Patent Prosecution or Assignment (Public Version of 1313) (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit 2, #3 Exhibit 3, #4 Exhibit 4, #5 Exhibit 5)(Benjamin, Nicole)
November 19, 2019 Filing 1323 NOTICE by Warner Chilcott Company, Inc., Warner Chilcott Company, LLC, Warner Chilcott Corporation, Warner Chilcott Holdings Company III, Ltd., Warner Chilcott Laboratories Ireland Limited, Warner Chilcott Public Limited Company, Warner Chilcott Sales (US), LLC, Warner Chilcott U.S., LLC, Watson Laboratories, Inc., Watson Pharmaceuticals, Inc. Defendants' Opposition to Plaintiffs' Omnibus Motion in Limine (Public Version) (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 5, #2 Exhibit 6, #3 Exhibit 7, #4 Exhibit 8, #5 Exhibit 9, #6 Exhibit 10, #7 Exhibit 11, #8 Exhibit 12, #9 Exhibit 13)(Benjamin, Nicole)
November 19, 2019 Filing 1322 MOTION to Seal Document Previously Filed With the Court filed by Ahold USA, Inc., Albertson's, LLC, Mary Alexander, Allied Services Division Welfare Fund, American Sales Company, LLC, CVS Pharmacy, Inc., Melisa Chrestman, Melissa Chrestman, City of Providence, Direct Purchaser Class Plaintiffs, Electrical Workers 242 & 294 Health & Welfare Fund, End Payor Plaintiffs, Fraternal Order of Police Fort Lauderdale Lodge 31, HEB Grocery Company L.P., Laborers International Union of North America, Denise Loy, New York Hotel Trades Council & Hotel Association of New York City, Inc. Health Benefits Fund, Painters District Council No. 30 Health & Welfare Fund, Rite-Aid Corporation, Rite-Aid Hdqtrs. Corp., Rochester Drug Co-Operative, Inc., Safeway, Inc., Teamsters Local 237 Welfare Benefits Fund, The Kroger Co., United Food and Commercial Workers Local 1776, Walgreen Co.. Responses due by 12/3/2019. (Attachments: #1 Redacted DE 1303)(Neill, Anna)
November 15, 2019 Opinion or Order TEXT ORDER: Defendants are directed to respond, if they wish, to #1315 Purchasers' Motion for Live Trial Testimony via Contemporaneous Video Transmission, by Wednesday, November 20, 2019. Defendants should understand that the Court has a very strong preference for live testimony, particularly from important witnesses. If these witnesses were to appear live in court, the Court would be more than willing to be accommodating with respect to structuring their testimony so as to reduce any inconvenience. Traveling to Rhode Island might be more enjoyable than to Newark, and the restaurants are almost certainly better. In addition, Defendants are on notice that any and all delays associated with presentation of these witnesses by video, if this becomes necessary, will be assessed against their 60-hour evidence allotment, regardless of cause. This includes any equipment malfunction or other technical delays - So Ordered by Chief Judge William E. Smith on 11/15/2019. (Urizandi, Nisshy)
November 14, 2019 Opinion or Order TEXT ORDER: Upon reviewing the parties' filings in connection with 1296 Defendants' Objection to Partial-Assignment Retailers' Requests to Opt Out and Split their Claims from the Direct Purchaser Class, and the cases cited therein, the Court OVERRULES 1296 Defendants' objection and will allow Retailers' requests for exclusion from the Direct Purchaser Class, for the reasons set forth in #1295 Retailer Plaintiffs' Opposition to Defendants' Objection/Motion for Reconsideration re: Retailer Plaintiffs' Exclusion from the DPP Class. The Court is satisfied that Defendants' rights are adequately protected where the DPPs' and the Retailers' claims will be joined for all phases of trial. In addition, the Court will provide instructions to the jury as appropriate to explain the roles and relationships of the DPPs and the Retailers as Plaintiffs in the case, both to protect Defendants' rights and to avoid jury confusion. The parties should propose both preliminary and final instructions for this purpose at the appointed times in the Case Management Orders. So Ordered by Chief Judge William E. Smith on 11/14/2019. (Jackson, Ryan)
November 14, 2019 HEARING CANCELLED: Notice of Fairness Hearing re: Preliminary Approval of the End-Payor Plaintiffs' Settlement with Lupin Pharmaceuticals Inc. and Lupin Limited previously scheduled for Wednesday 1/29/2020 at 3:00 PM in Courtroom 3 before Judge William E. Smith; this hearing is hereby CANCELLED pursuant to the Text Order entered on 11/14/19 and will be re-scheduled at a date to be determined. (Jackson, Ryan)
November 14, 2019 Opinion or Order TEXT ORDER granting #1299 End Payors' Motion to Approve Modified Long Form Notice, to Defer Notice to the Class and Extend the Fairness Hearing Regarding Lupin Ltd. and Lupin Pharmaceuticals Inc. Settlement re: #1278 Order on Motion for Settlement. The Court approves the notices attached at ECF No. 1299-1, defers notice to the class, and extends the date of the Fairness Hearing of the Lupin Settlement from January 29, 2020, until after the conclusion of the case with all other Defendants. So Ordered by Chief Judge William E. Smith on 11/14/2019. (Jackson, Ryan)
November 13, 2019 Filing 1316 MEMORANDUM IN SUPPORT by Plaintiffs in support of #1315 MOTION for Live Trial Testimony Via Contemporaneous Video Transmission . (Sobol, Thomas)
November 13, 2019 Filing 1315 MOTION for Live Trial Testimony Via Contemporaneous Video Transmission filed by Plaintiffs. Responses due by 11/27/2019. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order - Anthony Bruno, #2 Proposed Order - James Chirip, #3 Proposed Order - Carl Reichel, #4 Proposed Protocol and Transmission Procedure)(Sobol, Thomas)
November 13, 2019 Filing 1314 REPLY to Response re #1302 Reply to Response, Direct Purchaser Class Plaintiffs' Response to Retailer Plaintiffs' Reply to Their Response to Defendants' Objection to Retailer Plaintiffs' Request for Exclusion from the Direct Purchaser Class filed by Direct Purchaser Class Plaintiffs. (Sobol, Thomas)
November 13, 2019 Opinion or Order TEXT ORDER granting #1308 Motion to Seal; granting #1309 Motion to Seal; granting #1311 Motion to Seal; granting #1312 Motion to Seal; granting #1313 Motion to Seal. So Ordered by Chief Judge William E. Smith on 11/13/2019. (Jackson, Ryan)
November 12, 2019 Filing 1313 MOTION to Seal Defendants Opposition to Motion in Limine for an Order Precluding Argument or Evidence that Warner Chilcott Executives Were Not Involved in the 394 Patent Prosecution or Assignment and Supporting Exhibits Filed. Notice Sent To: Warner Chilcott Holdings Company III, Ltd., Warner Chilcott Corporation, Warner Chilcott Public Limited Company, Watson Laboratories, Inc., Warner Chilcott Company, LLC, Warner Chilcott Sales (US), LLC, Watson Pharmaceuticals, Inc., Warner Chilcott Laboratories Ireland Limited, Warner Chilcott U.S., LLC, Warner Chilcott Company, Inc., Actavis, Inc., Ahold USA, Inc., Albertson's, LLC, Mary Alexander, Allergan PLC, Allied Services Division Welfare Fund, American Sales Company, LLC, CVS Pharmacy, Inc., Melisa Chrestman, Melissa Chrestman, City of Providence, Direct Purchaser Class Plaintiffs, Electrical Workers 242 & 294 Health & Welfare Fund, End Payor Plaintiffs, Fraternal Order of Police Fort Lauderdale Lodge 31, HEB Grocery Company L.P., Laborers International Union of North America, Denise Loy, Lupin Ltd., Lupin Pharmaceuticals, Inc., New York Hotel Trades Council & Hotel Association of New York City, Inc. Health Benefits Fund, Painters District Council No. 30 Health & Welfare Fund, Rite-Aid Corporation, Rite-Aid Hdqtrs. Corp., Rochester Drug Co-Operative, Inc., Safeway, Inc., Teamsters Local 237 Welfare Benefits Fund, The Kroger Co., United Food and Commercial Workers Local 1776, Walgreen Co.. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Sealed Document Defendants Opposition to Motion in Limine for an Order Precluding Argument or Evidence that Warner Chilcott Executives Were Not Involved in the 394 Patent Prosecution or Assignment, #2 Proposed Sealed Document Exhibit 1, #3 Proposed Sealed Document Exhibit 2, #4 Proposed Sealed Document Exhibit 3, #5 Proposed Sealed Document Exhibit 4, #6 Proposed Sealed Document Exhibit 5, #7 Proposed Sealed Document Exhibit 6)(Benjamin, Nicole) This entry/document has been filed under seal pursuant to statute, rule or court order and access is restricted. Please login to CM/ECF to view document(s).
November 12, 2019 Filing 1312 MOTION to Seal Defendants Opposition to Plaintiffs Omnibus Motion in Limine and Supporting Exhibits Filed. Notice Sent To: Warner Chilcott Holdings Company III, Ltd., Warner Chilcott Corporation, Warner Chilcott Public Limited Company, Watson Laboratories, Inc., Warner Chilcott Company, LLC, Warner Chilcott Sales (US), LLC, Watson Pharmaceuticals, Inc., Warner Chilcott Laboratories Ireland Limited, Warner Chilcott U.S., LLC, Warner Chilcott Company, Inc., Actavis, Inc., Ahold USA, Inc., Albertson's, LLC, Mary Alexander, Allergan PLC, Allied Services Division Welfare Fund, American Sales Company, LLC, CVS Pharmacy, Inc., Melisa Chrestman, Melissa Chrestman, City of Providence, Direct Purchaser Class Plaintiffs, Electrical Workers 242 & 294 Health & Welfare Fund, End Payor Plaintiffs, Fraternal Order of Police Fort Lauderdale Lodge 31, HEB Grocery Company L.P., Laborers International Union of North America, Denise Loy, Lupin Ltd., Lupin Pharmaceuticals, Inc., New York Hotel Trades Council & Hotel Association of New York City, Inc. Health Benefits Fund, Painters District Council No. 30 Health & Welfare Fund, Rite-Aid Corporation, Rite-Aid Hdqtrs. Corp., Rochester Drug Co-Operative, Inc., Safeway, Inc., Teamsters Local 237 Welfare Benefits Fund, The Kroger Co., United Food and Commercial Workers Local 1776, Walgreen Co.. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Sealed Document Defendants Opposition to Plaintiffs Omnibus Motion in Limine, #2 Proposed Sealed Document Exhibit 1, #3 Proposed Sealed Document Exhibit 2, #4 Proposed Sealed Document Exhibit 3, #5 Proposed Sealed Document Exhibit 4, #6 Proposed Sealed Document Exhibit 5, #7 Proposed Sealed Document Exhibit 6, #8 Proposed Sealed Document Exhibit 7, #9 Proposed Sealed Document Exhibit 8, #10 Proposed Sealed Document Exhibit 9, #11 Proposed Sealed Document Exhibit 10, #12 Proposed Sealed Document Exhibit 11, #13 Proposed Sealed Document Exhibit 12, #14 Proposed Sealed Document Exhibit 13)(Benjamin, Nicole) This entry/document has been filed under seal pursuant to statute, rule or court order and access is restricted. Please login to CM/ECF to view document(s).
November 12, 2019 Filing 1311 MOTION to Seal PURCHASERS' OPPOSITION TO DEFENDANTS MOTION IN LIMINE NO. 7 TO LIMIT THE RISK OF JURY NULLIFICATION BY EXCLUDING UNNECESSARY PUBLIC POLICY ARGUMENTS REGARDING THE PHARMACEUTICAL INDUSTRY Filed. Notice Sent To: Painters District Council No. 30 Health & Welfare Fund, United Food and Commercial Workers Local 1776, The Kroger Co., American Sales Company, LLC, Laborers International Union of North America, New York Hotel Trades Council & Hotel Association of New York City, Inc. Health Benefits Fund, Fraternal Order of Police Fort Lauderdale Lodge 31, Walgreen Co., Rite-Aid Hdqtrs. Corp., Denise Loy, Rochester Drug Co-Operative, Inc., City of Providence, Ahold USA, Inc., Allied Services Division Welfare Fund, CVS Pharmacy, Inc., Safeway, Inc., Rite-Aid Corporation, Albertson's, LLC, HEB Grocery Company L.P., Mary Alexander, Electrical Workers 242 & 294 Health & Welfare Fund, Melisa Chrestman, Teamsters Local 237 Welfare Benefits Fund, Direct Purchaser Class Plaintiffs, End Payor Plaintiffs, Actavis, Inc., Allergan PLC, Melissa Chrestman, Warner Chilcott Company, Inc., Warner Chilcott Company, LLC, Warner Chilcott Corporation, Warner Chilcott Holdings Company III, Ltd., Warner Chilcott Laboratories Ireland Limited, Warner Chilcott Public Limited Company, Warner Chilcott Sales (US), LLC, Warner Chilcott U.S., LLC, Watson Laboratories, Inc., Watson Pharmaceuticals, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Sealed Document OPPOSITION TO DEFENDANTS MOTION IN LIMINE NO. 7 TO LIMIT THE RISK OF JURY NULLIFICATION BY EXCLUDING UNNECESSARY PUBLIC POLICY ARGUMENTS REGARDING THE PHARMACEUTICAL INDUSTRY, #2 Exhibit A, #3 Exhibit B, #4 Exhibit C)(Robertson, Sharon) This entry/document has been filed under seal pursuant to statute, rule or court order and access is restricted. Please login to CM/ECF to view document(s).
November 12, 2019 Filing 1310 RESPONSE In Opposition to #1282 MOTION in Limine to Preclude Plaintiffs from Relying on What Other Companies Might Do To Prove What Warner Chilcott Would Have Done in 2009 (MIL No. 4) filed by All Plaintiffs. Replies due by 11/19/2019. (Meltzer, Joseph)
November 12, 2019 Filing 1309 MOTION to Seal Plaintiffs Memorandum in Opposition to Defendants Motion in Limine to Exclude Evidence and Argument Concerning Unrelated, Alleged Anticompetitive Acts (MIL No. 8) and Supporting Exhibits Filed. Notice Sent To: All Plaintiffs. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Sealed Document Plaintiffs Memorandum in Opposition to Defendants Motion in Limine to Exclude Evidence and Argument Concerning Unrelated, Alleged Anticompetitive Acts (MIL No. 8), #2 Proposed Sealed Document Declaration of Steve D. Shadowen, #3 Proposed Sealed Document Exhibit A, #4 Proposed Sealed Document Exhibit B, #5 Proposed Sealed Document Exhibit C, #6 Proposed Sealed Document Exhibit D, #7 Proposed Sealed Document Exhibit E)(Shadowen, Steve) This entry/document has been filed under seal pursuant to statute, rule or court order and access is restricted. Please login to CM/ECF to view document(s).
November 12, 2019 Filing 1308 MOTION to Seal PURCHASERS OPPOSITION TO DEFENDANTS MOTION IN LIMINE (MIL NO. 5) TO PRECLUDE ARGUMENT, EVIDENCE, OR ADVERSE INFERENCES BASED UPON DEFENDANTS INVOCATION OF PRIVILEGE OR A NON-PARTYS PRIVILEGE LOG Filed. Notice Sent To: Painters District Council No. 30 Health & Welfare Fund, United Food and Commercial Workers Local 1776, The Kroger Co., American Sales Company, LLC, Laborers International Union of North America, New York Hotel Trades Council & Hotel Association of New York City, Inc. Health Benefits Fund, Fraternal Order of Police Fort Lauderdale Lodge 31, Walgreen Co., Rite-Aid Hdqtrs. Corp., Denise Loy, Rochester Drug Co-Operative, Inc., City of Providence, Ahold USA, Inc., Allied Services Division Welfare Fund, CVS Pharmacy, Inc., Safeway, Inc., Rite-Aid Corporation, Albertson's, LLC, HEB Grocery Company L.P., Mary Alexander, Electrical Workers 242 & 294 Health & Welfare Fund, Melisa Chrestman, Teamsters Local 237 Welfare Benefits Fund, Direct Purchaser Class Plaintiffs, End Payor Plaintiffs, Actavis, Inc., Allergan PLC, CVS Health Corporation, Warner Chilcott Company, Inc., Warner Chilcott Company, LLC, Warner Chilcott Corporation, Warner Chilcott Holdings Company III, Ltd., Warner Chilcott Laboratories Ireland Limited, Warner Chilcott Public Limited Company, Warner Chilcott Sales (US), LLC, Warner Chilcott U.S., LLC, Watson Laboratories, Inc., Watson Pharmaceuticals, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Sealed Document PURCHASERS OPPOSITION TO DEFENDANTS MOTION IN LIMINE (MIL NO. 5) TO PRECLUDE ARGUMENT, EVIDENCE, OR ADVERSE INFERENCES BASED UPON DEFENDANTS INVOCATION OF PRIVILEGE OR A NON-PARTYS PRIVILEGE LOG)(Robertson, Sharon) This entry/document has been filed under seal pursuant to statute, rule or court order and access is restricted. Please login to CM/ECF to view document(s).
November 12, 2019 Filing 1307 RESPONSE In Opposition to #1279 MOTION in Limine to Bar Plaintiffs from Using Inflammatory and Inaccuracy Terminology Such as "Bribes" or "Kickbacks" (MIL No. 1) filed by Ahold USA, Inc., Albertson's, LLC, Mary Alexander, Allied Services Division Welfare Fund, American Sales Company, LLC, Bayer Healthcare Pharmaceuticals, Inc., CVS Pharmacy, Inc., Melisa Chrestman, City of Providence, Direct Purchaser Class Plaintiffs, Electrical Workers 242 & 294 Health & Welfare Fund, End Payor Plaintiffs, Fraternal Order of Police Fort Lauderdale Lodge 31, HEB Grocery Company L.P., Laborers International Union of North America, Denise Loy, New York Hotel Trades Council & Hotel Association of New York City, Inc. Health Benefits Fund, Painters District Council No. 30 Health & Welfare Fund, Rite-Aid Corporation, Rite-Aid Hdqtrs. Corp., Rochester Drug Co-Operative, Inc., Safeway, Inc., Teamsters Local 237 Welfare Benefits Fund, The Kroger Co., United Food and Commercial Workers Local 1776, Walgreen Co.. Replies due by 11/19/2019. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Sharon K. Robertson, #2 Exhibit A, #3 Exhibit B)(Robertson, Sharon)
November 12, 2019 Filing 1306 RESPONSE In Opposition to #1284 MOTION in Limine to Preclude Argument About Privileged Documents of Non-Parties that Defendants and Non-Parties Were Unable to Locate During Discovery (MIL No. 6) filed by Ahold USA, Inc., Albertson's, LLC, Mary Alexander, Allied Services Division Welfare Fund, American Sales Company, LLC, CVS Pharmacy, Inc., Melisa Chrestman, City of Providence, Direct Purchaser Class Plaintiffs, Electrical Workers 242 & 294 Health & Welfare Fund, End Payor Plaintiffs, Fraternal Order of Police Fort Lauderdale Lodge 31, HEB Grocery Company L.P., Laborers International Union of North America, Denise Loy, New York Hotel Trades Council & Hotel Association of New York City, Inc. Health Benefits Fund, Painters District Council No. 30 Health & Welfare Fund, Rite-Aid Corporation, Rite-Aid Hdqtrs. Corp., Rochester Drug Co-Operative, Inc., Safeway, Inc., Teamsters Local 237 Welfare Benefits Fund, The Kroger Co., United Food and Commercial Workers Local 1776, Walgreen Co.. Replies due by 11/19/2019. (Robertson, Sharon)
November 12, 2019 Filing 1305 RESPONSE In Opposition to #1280 MOTION in Limine to Bar Reference to Any Agreement Not at Issue in this Case as an Illegal Reverse Payment (MIL No. 2) filed by All Plaintiffs. Replies due by 11/19/2019. (Kohn, Peter)
November 12, 2019 Filing 1304 RESPONSE In Opposition to #1281 MOTION in Limine to Exclude Evidence of Unrelated Criminal Case, Guilty Plea, and Non-Antitrust Qui Tam Proceeding and Settlement (MIL No. 3) filed by All Plaintiffs. Replies due by 11/19/2019. (Refsin, Barry)
November 12, 2019 Filing 1303 RESPONSE In Opposition to #1287 MOTION in Limine TO PRECLUDE PLAINTIFFS FROM INTRODUCING EVIDENCE ABOUT BREAKTHROUGH BLEEDING CONTRARY TO THE SETTLED CLAIM CONSTRUCTION ORDER OF THE PATENT COURT (MIL NO. 9) filed by All Plaintiffs. Replies due by 11/19/2019. (Neill, Anna) (Additional attachment(s) added on 11/20/2019: #1 Redacted Copy) (Farrell Pletcher, Paula).
November 11, 2019 Filing 1302 REPLY to Response re #1298 Response to Motion,, Retailer Plaintiffs' Reply to DPPs' Response to Defendants' Objection to Retailer Plaintiffs' Request for Exclusion from the DPP Class filed by Albertson's, LLC, CVS Pharmacy, Inc., HEB Grocery Company L.P., Rite-Aid Corporation, Rite-Aid Hdqtrs. Corp., Safeway, Inc., The Kroger Co., Walgreen Co.. (Refsin, Barry)
November 8, 2019 Filing 1301 MOTION in Limine PURCHASERS' OMNIBUS MOTION IN LIMINE filed by Ahold USA, Inc., Albertson's, LLC, Mary Alexander, Allied Services Division Welfare Fund, American Sales Company, LLC, CVS Pharmacy, Inc., Melisa Chrestman, City of Providence, Direct Purchaser Class Plaintiffs, Electrical Workers 242 & 294 Health & Welfare Fund, End Payor Plaintiffs, Fraternal Order of Police Fort Lauderdale Lodge 31, HEB Grocery Company L.P., Laborers International Union of North America, Denise Loy, New York Hotel Trades Council & Hotel Association of New York City, Inc. Health Benefits Fund, Painters District Council No. 30 Health & Welfare Fund, Rite-Aid Corporation, Rite-Aid Hdqtrs. Corp., Rochester Drug Co-Operative, Inc., Safeway, Inc., Teamsters Local 237 Welfare Benefits Fund, The Kroger Co., United Food and Commercial Workers Local 1776, Walgreen Co.. Responses due by 11/15/2019. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Sharon K. Robertson, #2 Exhibits A-O)(Robertson, Sharon)
November 8, 2019 Filing 1300 MOTION in Limine FOR AN ORDER PRECLUDING ARGUMENT OR EVIDENCE THAT WARNER CHILCOTT EXECUTIVES WERE NOT INVOLVED IN THE 394 PATENT PROSECUTION OR ASSIGNMENT filed by Ahold USA, Inc., Albertson's, LLC, Mary Alexander, Allied Services Division Welfare Fund, American Sales Company, LLC, CVS Pharmacy, Inc., Melisa Chrestman, City of Providence, Direct Purchaser Class Plaintiffs, Electrical Workers 242 & 294 Health & Welfare Fund, End Payor Plaintiffs, Fraternal Order of Police Fort Lauderdale Lodge 31, HEB Grocery Company L.P., Laborers International Union of North America, Denise Loy, New York Hotel Trades Council & Hotel Association of New York City, Inc. Health Benefits Fund, Painters District Council No. 30 Health & Welfare Fund, Rite-Aid Corporation, Rite-Aid Hdqtrs. Corp., Rochester Drug Co-Operative, Inc., Safeway, Inc., Teamsters Local 237 Welfare Benefits Fund, The Kroger Co., United Food and Commercial Workers Local 1776, Walgreen Co.. Responses due by 11/15/2019. (Attachments: #1 Supporting Memorandum, #2 Proposed Order, #3 Declaration of April D. Lambert, #4 Exhibit A-J)(Robertson, Sharon)
November 8, 2019 Filing 1299 MOTION End Payors' Motion to Approve Modified Long Form Notice, to Defer Notice to the Class and Extend the Fairness Hearing Regarding Lupin Ltd. and Lupin Pharmaceuticals Inc. Settlement re: #1278 Order on Motion for Settlement,, Set Deadlines/Hearings, filed by End Payor Plaintiffs. Responses due by 11/22/2019. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A)(Miller, Marvin)
November 8, 2019 NOTICE of Hearing: In Chambers Conference re: Jury Selection scheduled for Tuesday 11/19/2019 at 10:00 AM in the Judicial Conference Room, 2nd Floor U.S. Courthouse before Chief Judge William E. Smith. (Jackson, Ryan)
November 8, 2019 Filing 1298 RESPONSE In Opposition to #1291 MOTION to Seal Defendants' Objection to Partial-Assignment Retailers' Requests to Opt Out and Split their Claims from the Direct Purchaser Class and Supporting Exhibits Filed. Response to Defendants' Objection to Partial Assignment Retailers' Request to Opt Out and Split their Claims from the Direct Purchaser Class filed by Direct Purchaser Class Plaintiffs. Replies due by 11/15/2019. (Sobol, Thomas)
November 8, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 1297 ORDER entering #1294 Stipulation ON REDACTED COPIES OF FILINGS RELATED TO MOTION IN LIMINE BRIEFING filed by Painters District Council No. 30 Health & Welfare Fund, Laborers International Union of North America, Direct Purchaser Class Plaintiffs, Rite-Aid Hdqtrs. Corp., End Payor Plaintiffs, HEB Grocery Company L.P., Albertson's, LLC, Allied Services Division Welfare Fund, Walgreen Co., The Kroger Co., Electrical Workers 242 & 294 Health & Welfare Fund, Mary Alexander, CVS Pharmacy, Inc., City of Providence, Rochester Drug Co-Operative, Inc., United Food and Commercial Workers Local 1776, New York Hotel Trades Council & Hotel Association of New York City, Inc. Health Benefits Fund, Ahold USA, Inc., Fraternal Order of Police Fort Lauderdale Lodge 31, Denise Loy, Rite-Aid Corporation, CVS Health Corporation, Safeway, Inc., Teamsters Local 237 Welfare Benefits Fund. So Ordered by Chief Judge William E. Smith on 11/8/2019. (Jackson, Ryan)
November 7, 2019 Minute Entry for proceedings held before Chief Judge William E. Smith: Telephone Conference re: Pretrial Deadlines held on 11/7/2019; counsel participating on call: S. Perwin; L. Pappenhausen; T. Sobol; N. Benjamin. (Jackson, Ryan)
November 7, 2019 Filing 1295 RESPONSE In Opposition to #1291 MOTION to Seal Defendants' Objection to Partial-Assignment Retailers' Requests to Opt Out and Split their Claims from the Direct Purchaser Class and Supporting Exhibits Filed. Retailer Plaintiffs Opposition to Defendants Objection/Motion for Reconsideration Re: Retailer Plaintiffs Exclusion from the DPP Class filed by Albertson's, LLC, CVS Pharmacy, Inc., HEB Grocery Company L.P., Rite-Aid Corporation, Rite-Aid Hdqtrs. Corp., Safeway, Inc., The Kroger Co., Walgreen Co.. Replies due by 11/14/2019. (Perwin, Scott)
November 7, 2019 NOTICE of Hearing: Telephone Conference re: Pretrial Deadlines scheduled for Thursday 11/7/2019 at 3:45 PM before Judge William E. Smith; call-in instructions will be distributed to all counsel via email from Case Manager Ryan Jackson following this notice. (Jackson, Ryan)
November 6, 2019 Filing 1294 STIPULATION AND PROPOSED ORDER ON REDACTED COPIES OF FILINGS RELATED TO MOTION IN LIMINE BRIEFING filed by Ahold USA, Inc., Albertson's, LLC, Mary Alexander, Allied Services Division Welfare Fund, CVS Health Corporation, CVS Pharmacy, Inc., City of Providence, Direct Purchaser Class Plaintiffs, Electrical Workers 242 & 294 Health & Welfare Fund, End Payor Plaintiffs, Fraternal Order of Police Fort Lauderdale Lodge 31, HEB Grocery Company L.P., Laborers International Union of North America, Denise Loy, New York Hotel Trades Council & Hotel Association of New York City, Inc. Health Benefits Fund, Painters District Council No. 30 Health & Welfare Fund, Rite-Aid Corporation, Rite-Aid Hdqtrs. Corp., Rochester Drug Co-Operative, Inc., Safeway, Inc., Teamsters Local 237 Welfare Benefits Fund, The Kroger Co., United Food and Commercial Workers Local 1776, Walgreen Co.. (Robertson, Sharon)
November 4, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 1292 SUPPLEMENTAL PRETRIAL ORDER (modifying #1277 Case Management Order No. 16). So Ordered by Chief Judge William E. Smith on 11/4/2019. (Jackson, Ryan)
November 4, 2019 Opinion or Order TEXT ORDER: Any response to Defendants' Objection to Partial-Assignment Retailers' Requests to Opt Out and Split their Claims from the Direct Purchaser Class and Supporting Exhibits (currently docketed as a Motion to Seal, ECF No. 1291 and to be uploaded as it's own entry by the Clerk's Office) shall be filed by Friday, November 8, 2019 at noon. So Ordered by Chief Judge William E. Smith on 11/4/2019. (Jackson, Ryan)
November 1, 2019 Opinion or Order TEXT ORDER granting #1291 Motion to Seal. So Ordered by Chief Judge William E. Smith on 11/1/2019. (Jackson, Ryan)
October 31, 2019 Filing 1291 MOTION to Seal Defendants' Objection to Partial-Assignment Retailers' Requests to Opt Out and Split their Claims from the Direct Purchaser Class and Supporting Exhibits Filed. Notice Sent To: Warner Chilcott Holdings Company III, Ltd., Warner Chilcott Corporation, Warner Chilcott Public Limited Company, Watson Laboratories, Inc., Warner Chilcott Company, LLC, Warner Chilcott Sales (US), LLC, Watson Pharmaceuticals, Inc., Warner Chilcott Laboratories Ireland Limited, Warner Chilcott U.S., LLC, Warner Chilcott Company, Inc., Actavis, Inc., Ahold USA, Inc., Albertson's, LLC, Mary Alexander, Allergan PLC, Allied Services Division Welfare Fund, American Sales Company, LLC, CVS Pharmacy, Inc., Melisa Chrestman, Melissa Chrestman, City of Providence, Direct Purchaser Class Plaintiffs, Electrical Workers 242 & 294 Health & Welfare Fund, End Payor Plaintiffs, Fraternal Order of Police Fort Lauderdale Lodge 31, HEB Grocery Company L.P., Laborers International Union of North America, Denise Loy, Lupin Ltd., Lupin Pharmaceuticals, Inc., New York Hotel Trades Council & Hotel Association of New York City, Inc. Health Benefits Fund, Painters District Council No. 30 Health & Welfare Fund, Rite-Aid Corporation, Rite-Aid Hdqtrs. Corp., Rochester Drug Co-Operative, Inc., Safeway, Inc., Teamsters Local 237 Welfare Benefits Fund, The Kroger Co., United Food and Commercial Workers Local 1776, Walgreen Co.. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Sealed Document Defendants' Objection to Partial-Assignment Retailers' Requests to Opt Out and Split their Claims from the Direct Purchaser Class, #2 Proposed Sealed Document Exhibit 1, #3 Proposed Sealed Document Exhibit 2, #4 Proposed Sealed Document Exhibit 3, #5 Proposed Sealed Document Exhibit 4, #6 Proposed Sealed Document Exhibit 5, #7 Proposed Sealed Document Exhibit 6, #8 Proposed Sealed Document Exhibit 7, #9 Proposed Sealed Document Exhibit 8, #10 Proposed Sealed Document Exhibit 9, #11 Proposed Sealed Document Exhibit 10, #12 Proposed Sealed Document Exhibit 11, #13 Proposed Sealed Document Exhibit 12, #14 Proposed Sealed Document Exhibit 13, #15 Proposed Sealed Document Exhibit 14, #16 Proposed Sealed Document Exhibit 15, #17 Proposed Sealed Document Exhibit 16, #18 Proposed Sealed Document Exhibit 17, #19 Proposed Sealed Document Exhibit 18, #20 Proposed Sealed Document Exhibit 19, #21 Proposed Sealed Document Exhibit 20, #22 Proposed Sealed Document Exhibit 21, #23 Proposed Sealed Document Exhibit 22, #24 Proposed Sealed Document Exhibit 23, #25 Proposed Sealed Document Exhibit 24, #26 Proposed Sealed Document Exhibit 25, #27 Proposed Sealed Document Exhibit 26, #28 Proposed Sealed Document Exhibit 27, #29 Proposed Sealed Document Exhibit 28, #30 Proposed Sealed Document Exhibit 29)(Benjamin, Nicole) This entry/document has been filed under seal pursuant to statute, rule or court order and access is restricted. Please login to CM/ECF to view document(s).
October 25, 2019 Opinion or Order TEXT ORDER granting #1288 Motion to Seal; granting #1289 Motion to Seal. So Ordered by Chief Judge William E. Smith on 10/25/2019. (Jackson, Ryan)
October 24, 2019 Filing 1289 MOTION to Seal PURCHASERS OMNIBUS MOTION IN LIMINE, THE DECLARATION OF SHARON K. ROBERTSON AND ACCOMPANYING EXHIBITS Filed. Notice Sent To: Painters District Council No. 30 Health & Welfare Fund, United Food and Commercial Workers Local 1776, The Kroger Co., American Sales Company, LLC, Laborers International Union of North America, New York Hotel Trades Council & Hotel Association of New York City, Inc. Health Benefits Fund, Fraternal Order of Police Fort Lauderdale Lodge 31, Walgreen Co., Rite-Aid Hdqtrs. Corp., Rochester Drug Co-Operative, Inc., City of Providence, Ahold USA, Inc., Allied Services Division Welfare Fund, CVS Pharmacy, Inc., Safeway, Inc., Rite-Aid Corporation, Albertson's, LLC, HEB Grocery Company L.P., Electrical Workers 242 & 294 Health & Welfare Fund, Teamsters Local 237 Welfare Benefits Fund, Direct Purchaser Class Plaintiffs, End Payor Plaintiffs, Actavis, Inc., Allergan PLC, Lupin Ltd., Lupin Pharmaceuticals, Inc., Warner Chilcott Company, Inc., Warner Chilcott Company, LLC, Warner Chilcott Corporation, Warner Chilcott Holdings Company III, Ltd., Warner Chilcott Laboratories Ireland Limited, Warner Chilcott Public Limited Company, Warner Chilcott Sales (US), LLC, Warner Chilcott U.S., LLC, Watson Laboratories, Inc., Watson Pharmaceuticals, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Sealed Document MEMORANDUM IN SUPPORT OF PURCHASERS OMNIBUS MOTION IN LIMINE, #2 Proposed Sealed Document DECLARATION OF SHARON K. ROBERTSON, #3 Proposed Sealed Document EXHIBITS A-O TO DECLARATION OF SHARON K. ROBERTSON)(Robertson, Sharon) This entry/document has been filed under seal pursuant to statute, rule or court order and access is restricted. Please login to CM/ECF to view document(s).
October 24, 2019 Filing 1288 MOTION to Seal PURCHASERS MOTION IN LIMINE FOR AN ORDER PRECLUDING ARGUMENT OR EVIDENCE THAT WARNER CHILCOTT EXECUTIVES WERE NOT INVOLVED IN THE 394 PATENT PROSECUTION OR ASSIGNMENT Filed. Notice Sent To: Painters District Council No. 30 Health & Welfare Fund, United Food and Commercial Workers Local 1776, The Kroger Co., American Sales Company, LLC, Laborers International Union of North America, New York Hotel Trades Council & Hotel Association of New York City, Inc. Health Benefits Fund, Fraternal Order of Police Fort Lauderdale Lodge 31, Walgreen Co., Rite-Aid Hdqtrs. Corp., Rochester Drug Co-Operative, Inc., Ahold USA, Inc., Allied Services Division Welfare Fund, CVS Pharmacy, Inc., Safeway, Inc., Rite-Aid Corporation, Albertson's, LLC, HEB Grocery Company L.P., Electrical Workers 242 & 294 Health & Welfare Fund, Teamsters Local 237 Welfare Benefits Fund, Direct Purchaser Class Plaintiffs, End Payor Plaintiffs, Actavis, Inc., Allergan PLC, City of Providence, Lupin Ltd., Lupin Pharmaceuticals, Inc., Warner Chilcott Company, Inc., Warner Chilcott Company, LLC, Warner Chilcott Corporation, Warner Chilcott Holdings Company III, Ltd., Warner Chilcott Laboratories Ireland Limited, Warner Chilcott Public Limited Company, Warner Chilcott Sales (US), LLC, Warner Chilcott U.S., LLC, Watson Laboratories, Inc., Watson Pharmaceuticals, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Sealed Document MOTION FOR LEAVE TO FILE UNDER SEAL PURCHASERS MEMORANDUM OF LAW IN SUPPORT OF THEIR MOTION IN LIMINE FOR AN ORDER PRECLUDING ARGUMENT OR EVIDENCE THAT WARNER CHILCOTT EXECUTIVES WERE NOT INVOLVED IN THE 394 PATENT PROSECUTION OR ASSIGNMENT, THE DECLARATION OF APRIL D. LAMBERT, AND ACCOMPANYING EXHIBITS, #2 Proposed Sealed Document PURCHASERS MEMORANDUM IN SUPPORT OF MOTION IN LIMINE FOR AN ORDER PRECLUDING ARGUMENT OR EVIDENCE THAT WARNER CHILCOTT EXECUTIVES WERE NOT INVOLVED IN THE 394 PATENT PROSECUTION OR ASSIGNMENT, #3 Proposed Sealed Document [PROPOSED] ORDER, #4 Proposed Sealed Document DECLARATION OF APRIL D. LAMBERT, #5 Proposed Sealed Document EXHIBITS A-J TO DECLARATION OF APRIL D. LAMBERT)(Robertson, Sharon) This entry/document has been filed under seal pursuant to statute, rule or court order and access is restricted. Please login to CM/ECF to view document(s).
October 24, 2019 Filing 1287 MOTION in Limine TO PRECLUDE PLAINTIFFS FROM INTRODUCING EVIDENCE ABOUT BREAKTHROUGH BLEEDING CONTRARY TO THE SETTLED CLAIM CONSTRUCTION ORDER OF THE PATENT COURT (MIL NO. 9) filed by Warner Chilcott Company, Inc., Warner Chilcott Company, LLC, Warner Chilcott Corporation, Warner Chilcott Holdings Company III, Ltd., Warner Chilcott Laboratories Ireland Limited, Warner Chilcott Public Limited Company, Warner Chilcott Sales (US), LLC, Warner Chilcott U.S., LLC, Watson Laboratories, Inc., Watson Pharmaceuticals, Inc.. Responses due by 10/31/2019. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A)(Wray, William)
October 24, 2019 Filing 1286 MOTION in Limine TO EXCLUDE EVIDENCE AND ARGUMENT CONCERNING UNRELATED, ALLEGED ANTICOMPETITIVE ACTS (MIL NO. 8) filed by Warner Chilcott Company, Inc., Warner Chilcott Company, LLC, Warner Chilcott Corporation, Warner Chilcott Holdings Company III, Ltd., Warner Chilcott Laboratories Ireland Limited, Warner Chilcott Public Limited Company, Warner Chilcott Sales (US), LLC, Warner Chilcott U.S., LLC, Watson Laboratories, Inc., Watson Pharmaceuticals, Inc.. Responses due by 10/31/2019. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B)(Wray, William)
October 24, 2019 Filing 1285 MOTION in Limine TO LIMIT THE RISK OF JURY NULLIFICATION BY EXCLUDING UNNECESSARY PUBLIC POLICY ARGUMENTS REGARDING THE PHARMACEUTICAL INDUSTRY (MIL NO. 7) filed by Warner Chilcott Company, Inc., Warner Chilcott Company, LLC, Warner Chilcott Corporation, Warner Chilcott Holdings Company III, Ltd., Warner Chilcott Laboratories Ireland Limited, Warner Chilcott Public Limited Company, Warner Chilcott Sales (US), LLC, Warner Chilcott U.S., LLC, Watson Laboratories, Inc., Watson Pharmaceuticals, Inc.. Responses due by 10/31/2019. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C, #4 Exhibit D, #5 Exhibit E, #6 Exhibit F, #7 Exhibit G, #8 Exhibit H)(Wray, William)
October 24, 2019 Filing 1284 MOTION in Limine to Preclude Argument About Privileged Documents of Non-Parties that Defendants and Non-Parties Were Unable to Locate During Discovery (MIL No. 6) filed by Warner Chilcott Company, Inc., Warner Chilcott Company, LLC, Warner Chilcott Corporation, Warner Chilcott Holdings Company III, Ltd., Warner Chilcott Laboratories Ireland Limited, Warner Chilcott Public Limited Company, Warner Chilcott Sales (US), LLC, Warner Chilcott U.S., LLC, Watson Laboratories, Inc., Watson Pharmaceuticals, Inc.. Responses due by 10/31/2019. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B)(Benjamin, Nicole)
October 24, 2019 Filing 1283 MOTION in Limine to Preclude Argument, Evidence or Adverse Inferences Based Upon Defendant's Invocation of Privilege or a Non-Party's Privilege Log (MIL No. 5) filed by Warner Chilcott Company, Inc., Warner Chilcott Company, LLC, Warner Chilcott Corporation, Warner Chilcott Holdings Company III, Ltd., Warner Chilcott Laboratories Ireland Limited, Warner Chilcott Public Limited Company, Warner Chilcott Sales (US), LLC, Warner Chilcott U.S., LLC, Watson Laboratories, Inc., Watson Pharmaceuticals, Inc.. Responses due by 10/31/2019. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A)(Benjamin, Nicole)
October 24, 2019 Filing 1282 MOTION in Limine to Preclude Plaintiffs from Relying on What Other Companies Might Do To Prove What Warner Chilcott Would Have Done in 2009 (MIL No. 4) filed by Warner Chilcott Company, Inc., Warner Chilcott Company, LLC, Warner Chilcott Corporation, Warner Chilcott Holdings Company III, Ltd., Warner Chilcott Laboratories Ireland Limited, Warner Chilcott Public Limited Company, Warner Chilcott Sales (US), LLC, Warner Chilcott U.S., LLC, Watson Laboratories, Inc., Watson Pharmaceuticals, Inc.. Responses due by 10/31/2019. (Benjamin, Nicole)
October 24, 2019 Filing 1281 MOTION in Limine to Exclude Evidence of Unrelated Criminal Case, Guilty Plea, and Non-Antitrust Qui Tam Proceeding and Settlement (MIL No. 3) filed by Warner Chilcott Company, Inc., Warner Chilcott Company, LLC, Warner Chilcott Corporation, Warner Chilcott Holdings Company III, Ltd., Warner Chilcott Laboratories Ireland Limited, Warner Chilcott Public Limited Company, Warner Chilcott Sales (US), LLC, Warner Chilcott U.S., LLC, Watson Laboratories, Inc., Watson Pharmaceuticals, Inc.. Responses due by 10/31/2019. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C, #4 Exhibit D, #5 Exhibit E)(Benjamin, Nicole)
October 24, 2019 Filing 1280 MOTION in Limine to Bar Reference to Any Agreement Not at Issue in this Case as an Illegal Reverse Payment (MIL No. 2) filed by Warner Chilcott Company, Inc., Warner Chilcott Company, LLC, Warner Chilcott Corporation, Warner Chilcott Holdings Company III, Ltd., Warner Chilcott Laboratories Ireland Limited, Warner Chilcott Public Limited Company, Warner Chilcott Sales (US), LLC, Warner Chilcott U.S., LLC, Watson Laboratories, Inc., Watson Pharmaceuticals, Inc.. Responses due by 10/31/2019. (Benjamin, Nicole)
October 24, 2019 Filing 1279 MOTION in Limine to Bar Plaintiffs from Using Inflammatory and Inaccuracy Terminology Such as "Bribes" or "Kickbacks" (MIL No. 1) filed by Warner Chilcott Company, Inc., Warner Chilcott Company, LLC, Warner Chilcott Corporation, Warner Chilcott Holdings Company III, Ltd., Warner Chilcott Laboratories Ireland Limited, Warner Chilcott Public Limited Company, Warner Chilcott Sales (US), LLC, Warner Chilcott U.S., LLC, Watson Laboratories, Inc., Watson Pharmaceuticals, Inc.. Responses due by 10/31/2019. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A)(Benjamin, Nicole)
October 23, 2019 NOTICE of Hearing: Fairness Hearing re: Preliminary Approval of the End-Payor Plaintiffs' Settlement with Lupin Pharmaceuticals Inc. and Lupin Limited scheduled for Wednesday 1/29/2020 at 3:00 PM in Courtroom 3 before Judge William E. Smith. (Jackson, Ryan)
October 23, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 1278 ORDER PRELIMINARILY APPROVING END-PAYOR PLAINTIFFS' SETTLEMENT WITH LUPIN PHARMACEUTICALS INC. AND LUPIN LIMITED: granting #1122 Motion for Preliminary Approval of Class Action Settlement with Lupin Ltd. and Lupin Pharmaceuticals, Inc; Fairness Hearing to be noticed. So Ordered by Chief Judge William E. Smith on 10/23/2019. (Jackson, Ryan)
October 23, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 1277 CASE MANAGEMENT ORDER No. 16. So Ordered by Chief Judge William E. Smith on 10/23/2019. (Jackson, Ryan)
October 22, 2019 Opinion or Order TEXT ORDER granting #1276 Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice filed byAllergan PLC, Warner Chilcott Company, Inc., Warner Chilcott Company, LLC, Warner Chilcott Corporation, Warner Chilcott Holdings Company III, Ltd., Warner Chilcott Laboratories Ireland Limited, Warner Chilcott Public Limited Company, Warner Chilcott Sales (US), LLC, Warner Chilcott U.S., LLC, Watson Laboratories, Inc., Watson Pharmaceuticals, Inc.. So Ordered by Judge William E. Smith (2) on 10/22/2019. (Farrell Pletcher, Paula)
October 22, 2019 Filing 1276 MOTION for Christopher M. Curran to Appear Pro Hac Vice ( filing fee paid $ 100.00, receipt number 0103-1429769 ) filed by Warner Chilcott Company, Inc., Warner Chilcott Company, LLC, Warner Chilcott Corporation, Warner Chilcott Holdings Company III, Ltd., Warner Chilcott Laboratories Ireland Limited, Warner Chilcott Public Limited Company, Warner Chilcott Sales (US), LLC, Warner Chilcott U.S., LLC, Watson Laboratories, Inc., Watson Pharmaceuticals, Inc.. (Benjamin, Nicole)
October 22, 2019 Opinion or Order TEXT ORDER granting #1260 Motion for Leave to File Additional Application for Admission Pro Hac Vice. So Ordered by Chief Judge William E. Smith on 10/22/2019. (Jackson, Ryan)
October 20, 2019 Filing 1275 REPLY MEMORANDUM re #1265 Response in Opposition,,,, (Defendants' Reply Regarding Jury Instructions Related to Fair Value Under Actavis). (Benjamin, Nicole)
October 17, 2019 Opinion or Order TEXT ORDER: The parties are hereby directed to submit a joint letter with proposed redactions, by email to Case Manager Ryan Jackson, within seven days of the entry of the Sealed Memorandum of Decision on Class Certification and Order Regarding Motions to Exclude Certain Expert Opinions and Defendants' Renewed Motion to Dismiss (ECF No. 1274), or it will be unsealed and filed on the public docket as is. So Ordered by Chief Judge William E. Smith on 10/17/2019. (Jackson, Ryan)
October 17, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 1274 MEMORANDUM OF DECISION ON CLASS CERTIFICATION AND ORDER REGARDING MOTIONS TO EXCLUDE CERTAIN EXPERT OPINIONS AND DEFENDANTS' RENEWED MOTION TO DISMISS: in re: #526 MOTION for Class Certification; denying #575 MOTION to Exclude; granting in part and denying in part #576 MOTION to Dismiss; granting in part and denying in part 634 MOTION to Exclude; granting in part and denying in part #698 MOTION to Exclude; and, denying #733 MOTION to Exclude. So Ordered by Chief Judge William E. Smith on 10/17/2019. (Jackson, Ryan) Modified on 10/22/2019: Pursuant to the Text Order entered by this Court on 10/17/19, and in light of the parties reporting that they have no redactions, this Memorandum of Decision has been unsealed. (Jackson, Ryan).
October 17, 2019 Filing 1273 NOTICE by Ahold USA, Inc., Albertson's, LLC, Mary Alexander, Allied Services Division Welfare Fund, CVS Pharmacy, Inc., City of Providence, Direct Purchaser Class Plaintiffs, Electrical Workers 242 & 294 Health & Welfare Fund, End Payor Plaintiffs, Fraternal Order of Police Fort Lauderdale Lodge 31, HEB Grocery Company L.P., Laborers International Union of North America, Denise Loy, New York Hotel Trades Council & Hotel Association of New York City, Inc. Health Benefits Fund, Painters District Council No. 30 Health & Welfare Fund, Rite-Aid Corporation, Rite-Aid Hdqtrs. Corp., Rochester Drug Co-Operative, Inc., Safeway, Inc., Teamsters Local 237 Welfare Benefits Fund, The Kroger Co., United Food and Commercial Workers Local 1776, Walgreen Co. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit, #2 Exhibit, #3 Exhibit, #4 Exhibit, #5 Exhibit, #6 Exhibit, #7 Exhibit)(Walker, Daniel)
October 15, 2019 Opinion or Order TEXT ORDER granting #1264 Motion to Seal. So Ordered by Chief Judge William E. Smith on 10/15/2019. (Jackson, Ryan)
October 15, 2019 Filing 1271 NOTICE by Ahold USA, Inc., Albertson's, LLC, Mary Alexander, Allied Services Division Welfare Fund, Bayer Healthcare Pharmaceuticals, Inc., CVS Health Corporation, CVS Pharmacy, Inc., Caremark, LLC, City of Providence, Direct Purchaser Class Plaintiffs, Electrical Workers 242 & 294 Health & Welfare Fund, End Payor Plaintiffs, Fraternal Order of Police Fort Lauderdale Lodge 31, HEB Grocery Company L.P., Laborers International Union of North America, Denise Loy, New York Hotel Trades Council & Hotel Association of New York City, Inc. Health Benefits Fund, Painters District Council No. 30 Health & Welfare Fund, Plaintiffs, Rite-Aid Corporation, Rite-Aid Hdqtrs. Corp., Rochester Drug Co-Operative, Inc., Safeway, Inc., Teamsters Local 237 Welfare Benefits Fund, The Kroger Co., United Food and Commercial Workers Local 1776, Walgreen Co. Letter from Thomas M. Sobol to Chief Judge Smith Seeking Court's Guidance on Parties' Dispute Regarding Appearance of Witnesses Live in Purchasers' Case-in-Chief (Sobol, Thomas)
October 15, 2019 Filing 1270 NOTICE by Ahold USA, Inc., Albertson's, LLC, Mary Alexander, Allied Services Division Welfare Fund, Bayer Healthcare Pharmaceuticals, Inc., CVS Health Corporation, CVS Pharmacy, Inc., Caremark, LLC, City of Providence, Direct Purchaser Class Plaintiffs, Electrical Workers 242 & 294 Health & Welfare Fund, End Payor Plaintiffs, Fraternal Order of Police Fort Lauderdale Lodge 31, HEB Grocery Company L.P., Laborers International Union of North America, Denise Loy, New York Hotel Trades Council & Hotel Association of New York City, Inc. Health Benefits Fund, Painters District Council No. 30 Health & Welfare Fund, Plaintiffs, Rite-Aid Corporation, Rite-Aid Hdqtrs. Corp., Rochester Drug Co-Operative, Inc., Safeway, Inc., Teamsters Local 237 Welfare Benefits Fund, The Kroger Co., United Food and Commercial Workers Local 1776, Walgreen Co. Notice of Filing Declaration of Notice Administrator Concerning Completion of Notice to Members of the Direct Purchaser Class and Receipt of Requests for Exclusion (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1 - Declaration of Tina Chiango Regarding Notice to the Direct Purchaser Class)(Sobol, Thomas)
October 15, 2019 Filing 1269 TRANSCRIPT ORDER ACKNOWLEDGMENT Entered re: #1267 Transcript Order. Court Reporter/Transcriber: Denise Veitch. (Dias, Jennifer)
October 15, 2019 Filing 1268 TRANSCRIPT ORDER ACKNOWLEDGMENT Entered re: #1267 Transcript Order. Court Reporter/Transcriber: Lisa Schwam. (Dias, Jennifer)
October 15, 2019 Filing 1267 TRANSCRIPT ORDER for proceedings held on 9/11/19, 9/12/19, 10/3/19 before Judge Chief Judge William E. Smith. Expedited Transcript selected. Transcript to be delivered within 7 calendar days.. (Smith, Rana) (Main Document 1267 replaced on 10/15/2019) (Smith, Rana).
October 14, 2019 Filing 1266 NOTICE by Ahold USA, Inc., Albertson's, LLC, Mary Alexander, Allied Services Division Welfare Fund, CVS Pharmacy, Inc., City of Providence, Direct Purchaser Class Plaintiffs, Electrical Workers 242 & 294 Health & Welfare Fund, End Payor Plaintiffs, Fraternal Order of Police Fort Lauderdale Lodge 31, HEB Grocery Company L.P., Laborers International Union of North America, Denise Loy, New York Hotel Trades Council & Hotel Association of New York City, Inc. Health Benefits Fund, Painters District Council No. 30 Health & Welfare Fund, Rite-Aid Corporation, Rite-Aid Hdqtrs. Corp., Rochester Drug Co-Operative, Inc., Safeway, Inc., Teamsters Local 237 Welfare Benefits Fund, The Kroger Co., United Food and Commercial Workers Local 1776, Walgreen Co. Notice of Filing Jointly Proposed Case Management Order No. 16 (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Johnson, Kristen)
October 14, 2019 Filing 1265 RESPONSE IN OPPOSITION by Ahold USA, Inc., Albertson's, LLC, Mary Alexander, Allied Services Division Welfare Fund, American Sales Company, LLC, CVS Pharmacy, Inc., Melisa Chrestman, Melissa Chrestman, City of Providence, Direct Purchaser Class Plaintiffs, Electrical Workers 242 & 294 Health & Welfare Fund, End Payor Plaintiffs, Fraternal Order of Police Fort Lauderdale Lodge 31, HEB Grocery Company L.P., Laborers International Union of North America, Denise Loy, New York Hotel Trades Council & Hotel Association of New York City, Inc. Health Benefits Fund, Painters District Council No. 30 Health & Welfare Fund, Rite-Aid Corporation, Rite-Aid Hdqtrs. Corp., Rochester Drug Co-Operative, Inc., Safeway, Inc., Teamsters Local 237 Welfare Benefits Fund, The Kroger Co., United Food and Commercial Workers Local 1776, Walgreen Co. re #1255 Notice (Other),, Plaintiffs' Response to Defendants' Submission Regarding Jury Instructions Related to Fair Value Under Actavis. (Sobol, Thomas)
October 10, 2019 Filing 1264 MOTION to Seal Filed. Notice Sent To: Plaintiffs, Actavis, Inc., Ahold USA, Inc., Albertson's, LLC, Mary Alexander, Allergan PLC, Allied Services Division Welfare Fund, American Sales Company, LLC, CVS Pharmacy, Inc., Melisa Chrestman, Melissa Chrestman, City of Providence, Direct Purchaser Class Plaintiffs, Electrical Workers 242 & 294 Health & Welfare Fund, End Payor Plaintiffs, Fraternal Order of Police Fort Lauderdale Lodge 31, HEB Grocery Company L.P., Laborers International Union of North America, Denise Loy, Lupin Ltd., Lupin Pharmaceuticals, Inc., New York Hotel Trades Council & Hotel Association of New York City, Inc. Health Benefits Fund, Painters District Council No. 30 Health & Welfare Fund, Rite-Aid Corporation, Rite-Aid Hdqtrs. Corp., Rochester Drug Co-Operative, Inc., Safeway, Inc., Teamsters Local 237 Welfare Benefits Fund, The Kroger Co., United Food and Commercial Workers Local 1776, Walgreen Co., Warner Chilcott Company, Inc., Warner Chilcott Company, LLC, Warner Chilcott Corporation, Warner Chilcott Holdings Company III, Ltd., Warner Chilcott Laboratories Ireland Limited, Warner Chilcott Public Limited Company, Warner Chilcott Sales (US), LLC, Warner Chilcott U.S., LLC, Watson Laboratories, Inc., Watson Pharmaceuticals, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit, #2 Exhibit, #3 Exhibit, #4 Exhibit, #5 Exhibit, #6 Exhibit, #7 Exhibit)(Walker, Daniel) This entry/document has been filed under seal pursuant to statute, rule or court order and access is restricted. Please login to CM/ECF to view document(s).
October 10, 2019 Minute Entry for proceedings held before Magistrate Judge Patricia A. Sullivan: Telephone Conference held on 10/10/2019. Attorney Marvin Miller and CPA Linda Opichka by phone and Attorney Robert McConnell in person. (Court Reporter Lisa Schwam in Chambers at 4:00.) (Saucier, Martha)
October 10, 2019 Minute Entry for proceedings held before Magistrate Judge Patricia A. Sullivan: Telephone Conference held on 10/10/2019 with Attorney Kristen Johnson and CPAs Robert Zagrodny and Chet Capodilupo. (Court Reporter Lisa Schwam in Chambers at 3:20.) (Saucier, Martha)
October 10, 2019 Filing 1263 TRANSCRIPT of Motions held on 10/3/2019 before Judge Smith. Court Reporter/Transcriber Lisa Schwam, Telephone number 401-752-7128. Transcript may be viewed at the court public terminal or purchased through the Court Reporter/Transcriber before the deadline for Release of Transcript Restriction. After that date it may be obtained through PACER. NOTICE TO COUNSEL: Redaction Requests must be filed for personal identifiers only. All other redactions must be requested by motion. For local policy and sample redaction request visit our website at www.rid.uscourts.gov and select Transcripts under the Case Information menu option. Redaction Request due 10/31/2019. Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 11/12/2019. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 1/8/2020. (Schwam, Lisa)
October 10, 2019 Opinion or Order TEXT ORDER: The court has considered the parties respective suggestions regarding allocation of time for presentation of evidence (the so-called "chess clock"). Each side will be allotted 70 hours for the presentation of evidence. This does not include time for opening statements, closing arguments, jury charges and the like. This should be more than sufficient to allow both sides to present their cases fully. So Ordered by Chief Judge William E. Smith on 10/10/2019. (Jackson, Ryan)
October 8, 2019 Filing 1261 NOTICE of Change of Address by Natalie Finkelman Bennett (Bennett, Natalie)
October 8, 2019 Filing 1260 MOTION for Leave to File Document (Motion for Leave to File Additional Application for Admission Pro Hac Vice) filed by Warner Chilcott Company, Inc., Warner Chilcott Company, LLC, Warner Chilcott Corporation, Warner Chilcott Holdings Company III, Ltd., Warner Chilcott Laboratories Ireland Limited, Warner Chilcott Public Limited Company, Warner Chilcott Sales (US), LLC, Warner Chilcott U.S., LLC, Watson Laboratories, Inc., Watson Pharmaceuticals, Inc.. Responses due by 10/22/2019. (Benjamin, Nicole)
October 8, 2019 Opinion or Order TEXT ORDER granting #1258 Motion to Seal. So Ordered by Chief Judge William E. Smith on 10/8/2019. (Jackson, Ryan)
October 8, 2019 Filing 1259 NOTICE by Warner Chilcott Company, Inc., Warner Chilcott Company, LLC, Warner Chilcott Corporation, Warner Chilcott Holdings Company III, Ltd., Warner Chilcott Laboratories Ireland Limited, Warner Chilcott Public Limited Company, Warner Chilcott Sales (US), LLC, Warner Chilcott U.S., LLC, Watson Laboratories, Inc., Watson Pharmaceuticals, Inc. of Submission of Defendants' PowerPoint Presentation from the Hearing on the Court's Questions for Further Market Power Briefing (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Defendants' Responses to Court's Questions Regarding Monopoly Power (Public Version))(Benjamin, Nicole)
October 8, 2019 Filing 1258 MOTION to Seal Defendants' PowerPoint Presentation from the Hearing on the Court's Questions for Further Market Power Briefing Filed. Notice Sent To: Warner Chilcott Holdings Company III, Ltd., Warner Chilcott Corporation, Warner Chilcott Public Limited Company, Watson Laboratories, Inc., Warner Chilcott Company, LLC, Warner Chilcott Sales (US), LLC, Watson Pharmaceuticals, Inc., Warner Chilcott Laboratories Ireland Limited, Warner Chilcott U.S., LLC, Warner Chilcott Company, Inc., Actavis, Inc., Ahold USA, Inc., Albertson's, LLC, Mary Alexander, Allergan PLC, Allied Services Division Welfare Fund, American Sales Company, LLC, CVS Pharmacy, Inc., Melisa Chrestman, Melissa Chrestman, City of Providence, Direct Purchaser Class Plaintiffs, Electrical Workers 242 & 294 Health & Welfare Fund, End Payor Plaintiffs, Fraternal Order of Police Fort Lauderdale Lodge 31, HEB Grocery Company L.P., Laborers International Union of North America, Denise Loy, Lupin Ltd., Lupin Pharmaceuticals, Inc., New York Hotel Trades Council & Hotel Association of New York City, Inc. Health Benefits Fund, Painters District Council No. 30 Health & Welfare Fund, Rite-Aid Corporation, Rite-Aid Hdqtrs. Corp., Rochester Drug Co-Operative, Inc., Safeway, Inc., Teamsters Local 237 Welfare Benefits Fund, The Kroger Co., United Food and Commercial Workers Local 1776, Walgreen Co.. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Sealed Document Defendants' Responses to Court's Questions Regarding Monopoly Power)(Benjamin, Nicole) This entry/document has been filed under seal pursuant to statute, rule or court order and access is restricted. Please login to CM/ECF to view document(s).
October 8, 2019 Filing 1257 TRANSCRIPT of Motion for Summary Judgment, held on September 11, 2019, before Chief Judge William E. Smith. Court Reporter Denise P. Veitch, Telephone number 401-752-7031. Transcript may be viewed at the court public terminal or purchased through the Court Reporter before the deadline for Release of Transcript Restriction. After that date it may be obtained through the Court Reporter or PACER. NOTICE TO COUNSEL: Redaction Requests must be filed for personal identifiers only. All other redactions must be requested by motion. For local policy and sample redaction request visit our website at www.rid.uscourts.gov and select Transcripts under the Case Information menu option. Redaction Request due 10/29/2019. Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 11/8/2019. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 1/6/2020. (Veitch, Denise)
October 7, 2019 Opinion or Order TEXT ORDER granting #1256 Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice of Richard Alan Arnold. So Ordered by Judge William E. Smith (2) on 10/7/2019. (Potter, Carrie)
October 7, 2019 Filing 1256 MOTION for Richard Alan Arnold to Appear Pro Hac Vice ( filing fee paid $ 100.00, receipt number 0103-1423822 ) filed by Albertson's, LLC, HEB Grocery Company L.P., Safeway, Inc., The Kroger Co., Walgreen Co.. (Oliverio, Matthew)
October 4, 2019 Filing 1255 NOTICE by Warner Chilcott Company, Inc., Warner Chilcott Company, LLC, Warner Chilcott Corporation, Warner Chilcott Holdings Company III, Ltd., Warner Chilcott Laboratories Ireland Limited, Warner Chilcott Public Limited Company, Warner Chilcott Sales (US), LLC, Warner Chilcott U.S., LLC, Watson Laboratories, Inc., Watson Pharmaceuticals, Inc. of Response to the Court's Request Regarding Jury Instructions Related to Fair Value Under Actavis (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C, #4 Exhibit D, #5 Exhibit E)(Benjamin, Nicole)
October 4, 2019 Opinion or Order TEXT ORDER granting #1194 Motion to Bifurcate; granting in part #1195 Motion to Bifurcate; granting in part #1196 Motion to Bifurcate; denying #1197 Motion to Bifurcate: For the reasons set forth during the hearing on October 3, 2019, the Court GRANTS #1194 Retailers' Motion to Bifurcate; GRANTS #1195 #1196 DPPs' and EPPs' Motions to Bifurcate in part insofar as those motions mirror the proposal set forth by the Retailers; and DENIES #1197 Defendants' Motion for Phased Trial. So Ordered by Chief Judge William E. Smith on 10/4/2019. (Jackson, Ryan)
October 3, 2019 Minute Entry for proceedings held before Chief Judge William E. Smith: In Chambers Conference (post-hearing) held in Judicial Conference Room on 10/3/2019; counsel present: T. Sobol; K. Johnson; J. Meltzer; R. Arnold; B. Retsin; S. Shadowen; M. Weiner; M. Van Tine; M. Buchman; R. McConnell; N. Benjamin; M. Gidley; R. Milne; C. Curran; D. Grossbaum; J. Pace (Jackson, Ryan)
October 3, 2019 Minute Entry for proceedings held before Chief Judge William E. Smith: Motion Hearing held on 10/3/2019: S. Shadowen, T. Sobol, B. Refsin, M. Gidley and R. Milne. Arguments heard; Court questions; each side responds. Court takes matter under advisement and will issue a ruling at a later date. Recess re #1194 MOTION to Bifurcate of Retailer Plaintiffs, #1197 MOTION to Bifurcate (Defendants' Motion for a Phased Trial, #1196 MOTION to Bifurcate Direct Purchaser Class and End-Payor Plaintiffs' Motion to Bifurcate the Trial filed by Direct Purchaser Class Plaintiffs, #540 MOTION for Summary Judgment (Redacted Memorandum of Law in Support of Defendants' Motion for Summary Judgment Due to Lack of Market Power), #496 MOTION for Summary Judgment Due to Lack of Market Power (Court Reporter L. Schwam in Courtroom 3 at 10:04.) (Potter, Carrie)
October 2, 2019 Filing 1254 NOTICE - Courtesy Copy of "Petition Pursuant to Rule 23(f) of the Federal Rules of Civil Procedure for Permission to Appeal from Order Granting Class Certification" received from Defendants. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit, #2 Envelope)(Potter, Carrie)
October 1, 2019 Filing 1253 TRANSCRIPT of Motion held on 9/12/2019 before Judge Smith. Court Reporter/Transcriber Lisa Schwam, Telephone number 401-752-7128. Transcript may be viewed at the court public terminal or purchased through the Court Reporter/Transcriber before the deadline for Release of Transcript Restriction. After that date it may be obtained through PACER. NOTICE TO COUNSEL: Redaction Requests must be filed for personal identifiers only. All other redactions must be requested by motion. For local policy and sample redaction request visit our website at www.rid.uscourts.gov and select Transcripts under the Case Information menu option. Redaction Request due 10/22/2019. Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 11/1/2019. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 12/30/2019. (Schwam, Lisa)
September 30, 2019 Filing 1250 NOTICE by Warner Chilcott Company, Inc., Warner Chilcott Company, LLC, Warner Chilcott Corporation, Warner Chilcott Holdings Company III, Ltd., Warner Chilcott Laboratories Ireland Limited, Warner Chilcott Public Limited Company, Warner Chilcott Sales (US), LLC, Warner Chilcott U.S., LLC, Watson Laboratories, Inc., Watson Pharmaceuticals, Inc. of Defendants' Responses to the Court's Questions for Further Market Power Briefing (Public Version) (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 4 (Public Version))(Benjamin, Nicole)
September 30, 2019 Opinion or Order TEXT ORDER granting #1247 Motion to Seal. So Ordered by Chief Judge William E. Smith on 9/30/2019. (Jackson, Ryan)
September 30, 2019 Filing 1247 MOTION to Seal Plaintiffs' Answers to the Court's Questions for Further Market Power Briefing Filed. Notice Sent To: All Plaintiffs. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Sealed Document)(Sobol, Thomas) This entry/document has been filed under seal pursuant to statute, rule or court order and access is restricted. Please login to CM/ECF to view document(s).
September 30, 2019 Opinion or Order TEXT ORDER granting #1240 Motion to Seal; granting #1241 Motion to Seal; granting #1246 Motion to Seal. So Ordered by Chief Judge William E. Smith on 9/30/2019. (Jackson, Ryan)
September 30, 2019 Filing 1246 MOTION to Seal Defendants' Responses to the Court's Questions for Further Market Power Briefing Filed. Notice Sent To: Warner Chilcott Holdings Company III, Ltd., Warner Chilcott Corporation, Warner Chilcott Public Limited Company, Watson Laboratories, Inc., Warner Chilcott Company, LLC, Warner Chilcott Sales (US), LLC, Watson Pharmaceuticals, Inc., Warner Chilcott Laboratories Ireland Limited, Warner Chilcott U.S., LLC, Warner Chilcott Company, Inc., Actavis, Inc., Ahold USA, Inc., Albertson's, LLC, Mary Alexander, Allergan PLC, Allied Services Division Welfare Fund, American Sales Company, LLC, CVS Pharmacy, Inc., Melisa Chrestman, Melissa Chrestman, City of Providence, Direct Purchaser Class Plaintiffs, Electrical Workers 242 & 294 Health & Welfare Fund, End Payor Plaintiffs, Fraternal Order of Police Fort Lauderdale Lodge 31, HEB Grocery Company L.P., Laborers International Union of North America, Denise Loy, Lupin Ltd., Lupin Pharmaceuticals, Inc., New York Hotel Trades Council & Hotel Association of New York City, Inc. Health Benefits Fund, Painters District Council No. 30 Health & Welfare Fund, Rite-Aid Corporation, Rite-Aid Hdqtrs. Corp., Rochester Drug Co-Operative, Inc., Safeway, Inc., Teamsters Local 237 Welfare Benefits Fund, The Kroger Co., United Food and Commercial Workers Local 1776, Walgreen Co.. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Sealed Document Defendants' Responses to the Court's Questions for Further Market Power Briefing, #2 Proposed Sealed Document Exhibit 1, #3 Proposed Sealed Document Exhibit 2, #4 Proposed Sealed Document Exhibit 3, #5 Proposed Sealed Document Exhibit 4)(Benjamin, Nicole) This entry/document has been filed under seal pursuant to statute, rule or court order and access is restricted. Please login to CM/ECF to view document(s).
September 27, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 1245 ORDER granting in part #1233 MOTION EPPs' Motion For Entry Of An Order To Allow For The Amendment of the Class Defniition to Include A Finite End Date, Approve the Form and Manner Of Notice, Appoint Notice Administrator, and Shorten The Time to Respond to This Motion - So Ordered by Chief Judge William E. Smith on 9/27/2019. (Urizandi, Nisshy)
September 27, 2019 Filing 1244 NOTICE by End Payor Plaintiffs re #1239 Order, End Payor Plaintiffs Submission of Amended Notices Pursuant to Order ECF No. 1239 (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Amended Short Form Notice, #2 Exhibit Amended Long Form Notice)(Miller, Marvin)
September 26, 2019 Filing 1243 NOTICE by Warner Chilcott Company, Inc., Warner Chilcott Company, LLC, Warner Chilcott Corporation, Warner Chilcott Holdings Company III, Ltd., Warner Chilcott Laboratories Ireland Limited, Warner Chilcott Public Limited Company, Warner Chilcott Sales (US), LLC, Warner Chilcott U.S., LLC, Watson Laboratories, Inc., Watson Pharmaceuticals, Inc. of Submission of Defendants' PowerPoint Presentations from the February 11, 13 & 14, 2019 IPP Class Certification Hearing (Attachments: #1 Exhibit DDX400-417 (Redacted), #2 Exhibit DDX500 (Redacted), #3 Exhibit DDX600 - Defendants' Closing: Six of Nine Plan IPPs are Unable to Produce Full Claims Data, #4 Exhibit DDX601 (Redacted), #5 Exhibit DDX602 - Asacol Provides Road Map for this Case, #6 Exhibit DDX701 (Redacted), #7 Exhibit DDX800 (Redacted), #8 Exhibit DDX900 (Redacted))(Benjamin, Nicole)
September 26, 2019 Filing 1242 NOTICE by Warner Chilcott Company, Inc., Warner Chilcott Company, LLC, Warner Chilcott Corporation, Warner Chilcott Holdings Company III, Ltd., Warner Chilcott Laboratories Ireland Limited, Warner Chilcott Public Limited Company, Warner Chilcott Sales (US), LLC, Warner Chilcott U.S., LLC, Watson Laboratories, Inc., Watson Pharmaceuticals, Inc. of Submission of Defendants' PowerPoint Presentations from the February 11, 13 & 14, 2019 DPP Class Certification Hearing (Attachments: #1 Exhibit DDX100 (Redacted), #2 Exhibit DDX101 (Redacted), #3 Exhibit DDX204, #4 Exhibit DDX205, #5 Exhibit DDX210)(Benjamin, Nicole)
September 26, 2019 Filing 1241 MOTION to Seal Defendants' PowerPoint Presentations from the February 11, 13 & 14, 2019 IPP Class Certification Hearing Filed. Notice Sent To: Warner Chilcott Holdings Company III, Ltd., Warner Chilcott Corporation, Warner Chilcott Public Limited Company, Watson Laboratories, Inc., Warner Chilcott Company, LLC, Warner Chilcott Sales (US), LLC, Watson Pharmaceuticals, Inc., Warner Chilcott Laboratories Ireland Limited, Warner Chilcott U.S., LLC, Warner Chilcott Company, Inc., Actavis, Inc., Ahold USA, Inc., Albertson's, LLC, Mary Alexander, Allergan PLC, Allied Services Division Welfare Fund, American Sales Company, LLC, CVS Pharmacy, Inc., Melisa Chrestman, Melissa Chrestman, City of Providence, Direct Purchaser Class Plaintiffs, Electrical Workers 242 & 294 Health & Welfare Fund, End Payor Plaintiffs, Fraternal Order of Police Fort Lauderdale Lodge 31, HEB Grocery Company L.P., Laborers International Union of North America, Denise Loy, Lupin Ltd., Lupin Pharmaceuticals, Inc., New York Hotel Trades Council & Hotel Association of New York City, Inc. Health Benefits Fund, Painters District Council No. 30 Health & Welfare Fund, Rite-Aid Corporation, Rite-Aid Hdqtrs. Corp., Rochester Drug Co-Operative, Inc., Safeway, Inc., Teamsters Local 237 Welfare Benefits Fund, The Kroger Co., United Food and Commercial Workers Local 1776, Walgreen Co.. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Sealed Document DDX400-417, #2 Proposed Sealed Document DDX500 - Cross Examination of Laura Craft, #3 Proposed Sealed Document DDX601 - Defendants' Opposition to IPP Class Certification, #4 Proposed Sealed Document DDX701 - Dr. James W. Hughes, Ph.D., #5 Proposed Sealed Document DDX800 - Dr. Bruce A. Strombom, Ph.D., #6 Proposed Sealed Document DDX900 - Defendants' Opposition to IPP Class Certification)(Benjamin, Nicole) This entry/document has been filed under seal pursuant to statute, rule or court order and access is restricted. Please login to CM/ECF to view document(s).
September 26, 2019 Filing 1240 MOTION to Seal Defendants' PowerPoint Presentations from the February 11, 13 & 14, 2019 DPP Class Certification Hearing Filed. Notice Sent To: Warner Chilcott Holdings Company III, Ltd., Warner Chilcott Corporation, Warner Chilcott Public Limited Company, Watson Laboratories, Inc., Warner Chilcott Company, LLC, Warner Chilcott Sales (US), LLC, Watson Pharmaceuticals, Inc., Warner Chilcott Laboratories Ireland Limited, Warner Chilcott U.S., LLC, Warner Chilcott Company, Inc., Actavis, Inc., Ahold USA, Inc., Albertson's, LLC, Mary Alexander, Allergan PLC, Allied Services Division Welfare Fund, American Sales Company, LLC, CVS Pharmacy, Inc., Melisa Chrestman, Melissa Chrestman, City of Providence, Direct Purchaser Class Plaintiffs, Electrical Workers 242 & 294 Health & Welfare Fund, End Payor Plaintiffs, Fraternal Order of Police Fort Lauderdale Lodge 31, HEB Grocery Company L.P., Laborers International Union of North America, Denise Loy, Lupin Ltd., Lupin Pharmaceuticals, Inc., New York Hotel Trades Council & Hotel Association of New York City, Inc. Health Benefits Fund, Painters District Council No. 30 Health & Welfare Fund, Rite-Aid Corporation, Rite-Aid Hdqtrs. Corp., Rochester Drug Co-Operative, Inc., Safeway, Inc., Teamsters Local 237 Welfare Benefits Fund, The Kroger Co., United Food and Commercial Workers Local 1776, Walgreen Co.. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Sealed Document DDX100 - Defendants' Material for DPP Class Certification Tutorial, #2 Proposed Sealed Document DDX101 - Pierre-Yves Cremieux Examination Materials, #3 Proposed Sealed Document DDX215, #4 Proposed Sealed Document DDX217)(Benjamin, Nicole) This entry/document has been filed under seal pursuant to statute, rule or court order and access is restricted. Please login to CM/ECF to view document(s).
September 26, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 1239 ORDER re: #1233 MOTION EPPs' Motion for Entry of an Order to Allow for the Amendment of the Class Definition to Include a Finite End Date, Approve the Form and Manner Of Notice, Appoint Notice Administrator, and Shorten the Time to Respond to This Motion filed by End Payor Plaintiffs. The Court directs counsel for the TPP Class to file an amended notice for the Court's approval. So Ordered by Chief Judge William E. Smith on 9/26/2019. (Williams Torrey, Alexis)
September 26, 2019 Opinion or Order TEXT ORDER re: #1232 Questions for Further Market Power Briefing, setting the deadline to respond for 2 p.m. EST on Monday, September 30, 2019. No extensions shall be granted. So Ordered by Chief Judge William E. Smith on 9/26/2019. (Williams Torrey, Alexis)
September 26, 2019 Filing 1238 REPLY to Response re #1237 Response to Motion,,, End Payor Plaintiffs' Reply to Defendants' Objection to the Proposed Class Notice filed by End Payor Plaintiffs. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C)(Miller, Marvin)
September 25, 2019 Opinion or Order TEXT ORDER directing the End-Payor Plaintiffs (EPPs) to file a short reply brief responding to Defendants arguments set forth in Sections III, IV, and V of #1237 Defendants Response in Opposition. The Reply is due tomorrow, September 26, 2019 at 5p.m. EST - So Ordered by Chief Judge William E. Smith on 9/25/2019. (Urizandi, Nisshy)
September 25, 2019 Filing 1237 RESPONSE In Opposition to #1233 MOTION EPPs' Motion For Entry Of An Order To Allow For The Amendment of the Class Defniition to Include A Finite End Date, Approve the Form and Manner Of Notice, Appoint Notice Administrator, and Shorten The Time to Respond to This Motion filed by Warner Chilcott Company, Inc., Warner Chilcott Company, LLC, Warner Chilcott Corporation, Warner Chilcott Holdings Company III, Ltd., Warner Chilcott Laboratories Ireland Limited, Warner Chilcott Public Limited Company, Warner Chilcott Sales (US), LLC, Warner Chilcott U.S., LLC, Watson Laboratories, Inc., Watson Pharmaceuticals, Inc.. Replies due by 10/2/2019. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit 2)(Benjamin, Nicole)
September 23, 2019 Opinion or Order TEXT ORDER granting #1229 Motion to Seal. So Ordered by Chief Judge William E. Smith on 9/23/2019. (Jackson, Ryan)
September 22, 2019 Opinion or Order TEXT ORDER setting the deadline to respond to #1233 EPPs' Motion For Entry Of An Order, for 4 p.m. EST on Wednesday, September 25, 2019. No extensions shall be granted. So Ordered by Chief Judge William E. Smith on 9/22/2019. (Jackson, Ryan)
September 21, 2019 Filing 1235 DECLARATION re #1233 MOTION EPPs' Motion For Entry Of An Order To Allow For The Amendment of the Class Defniition to Include A Finite End Date, Approve the Form and Manner Of Notice, Appoint Notice Administrator, and Shorten The Time to Respond to This Motion by End Payor Plaintiffs. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit 2, #3 Exhibit 3, #4 Exhibit 4, #5 Exhibit 5)(Miller, Marvin)
September 21, 2019 Filing 1234 MEMORANDUM IN SUPPORT by End Payor Plaintiffs in support of #1233 MOTION EPPs' Motion For Entry Of An Order To Allow For The Amendment of the Class Defniition to Include A Finite End Date, Approve the Form and Manner Of Notice, Appoint Notice Administrator, and Shorten The Time to Respond to This Motion . (Miller, Marvin)
September 21, 2019 Filing 1233 MOTION EPPs' Motion For Entry Of An Order To Allow For The Amendment of the Class Defniition to Include A Finite End Date, Approve the Form and Manner Of Notice, Appoint Notice Administrator, and Shorten The Time to Respond to This Motion filed by End Payor Plaintiffs. Responses due by 10/7/2019. (Miller, Marvin)
September 20, 2019 Filing 1232 NOTICE OF THE COURT: QUESTIONS FOR FURTHER MARKET POWER BRIEFING to be answered on or before 9/30/19; responses should be filed via CM/ECF (entered 9/20/19) (Jackson, Ryan)
September 20, 2019 Filing 1231 NOTICE by End Payor Plaintiffs Notice of Submission in Response to September 17, 2019 Order (Attachments: #1 Appendix State Claims Chart)(McConnell, Robert)
September 19, 2019 Filing 1230 NOTICE by Warner Chilcott Company, Inc., Warner Chilcott Company, LLC, Warner Chilcott Corporation, Warner Chilcott Holdings Company III, Ltd., Warner Chilcott Laboratories Ireland Limited, Warner Chilcott Public Limited Company, Warner Chilcott Sales (US), LLC, Warner Chilcott U.S., LLC, Watson Laboratories, Inc., Watson Pharmaceuticals, Inc. of Submissiion of Defendants' PowerPoint Presentations from the September 11 and 12, 2019 Summary Judgment and Daubert Hearings (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1 - Defendants' Slides Regarding Plaintiffs' Motion to Partially Exclude the Expert Opinions of Dr. Philip D. Darney, #2 Exhibit 2 - Defendants' Slides Regarding Motion to Exclude Certain Opinions and Testimony on Dr. Michael Thomas on Chewability and Patent Issues, #3 Exhibit 3 - Defendants' Slides Regarding Plaintiffs' Motion to Partially Exclude the Opinions and Testimony of Stephen G. Kunin, #4 Exhibit 4 - Defendants' Slides Regarding Motion to Exclude Certain Opinions and Testimony of Edward Lentz, John Doll and Nicholas Jewell, #5 Exhibit 5 - Defendants' Slides Regarding Motion to Exclude the Opinions and Testimony of John R. Tupman, #6 Exhibit 6 - Defendants' Slides Regarding Issues with IPP Class Certification and Trial Timing, #7 Exhibit 7 - Defendants' Slides Regarding Plaintiffs' Motion to Exclude the Opinions and Testimony of Mr. T. John Ward, #8 Exhibit 8 - Defendants' Slides Regarding Opposition to Plaintiffs' Motion to Exclude the Expert Testimony of Dr. Louis Berneman, Philip Green, and Dr. Christine Meyer Regarding "Fair Value", #9 Exhibit 9 - Defendants' Slides Regarding Loestrin 1/20 Supplemental Argument on Plaintiffs' Claim that Hodgen was "Hiding Loestrin 1/20", #10 Exhibit 10 - Defendants' Slides Regarding Opposition to Plaintiffs' Motion to Exclude Opinions and Testimony of Drs. Christine Meyer & Mark S. Robbins re: Procompetitive Justifications of Reverse Payments, #11 Exhibit 11 - Defendants' Slides Regarding Walker Process Fraud and Sham Patent Litigation - REDACTED VERSION, #12 Exhibit 12 - Defendants' Slides Regarding Summary Judgment - Product Hopping - REDACTED VERSION, #13 Exhibit 13 - Defendants' Slides Regarding Daubert Motion as to Plaintiffs' Economist Dr. McGuire, #14 Exhibit 14 - Defendants' Slides Regarding Motion for Summary Judgment Dismissing Reverse Payment Claims)(Benjamin, Nicole)
September 19, 2019 Filing 1229 MOTION to Seal Certain of Defendants' PowerPoint Presentations from the September 11 and 12, 2019 Summary Judgment and Daubert Hearings Filed. Notice Sent To: Warner Chilcott Holdings Company III, Ltd., Warner Chilcott Corporation, Warner Chilcott Public Limited Company, Watson Laboratories, Inc., Warner Chilcott Company, LLC, Warner Chilcott Sales (US), LLC, Watson Pharmaceuticals, Inc., Warner Chilcott Laboratories Ireland Limited, Warner Chilcott U.S., LLC, Warner Chilcott Company, Inc., Actavis, Inc., Ahold USA, Inc., Albertson's, LLC, Mary Alexander, Allergan PLC, Allied Services Division Welfare Fund, American Sales Company, LLC, CVS Pharmacy, Inc., Melisa Chrestman, Melissa Chrestman, City of Providence, Direct Purchaser Class Plaintiffs, Electrical Workers 242 & 294 Health & Welfare Fund, End Payor Plaintiffs, Fraternal Order of Police Fort Lauderdale Lodge 31, HEB Grocery Company L.P., Laborers International Union of North America, Denise Loy, Lupin Ltd., Lupin Pharmaceuticals, Inc., New York Hotel Trades Council & Hotel Association of New York City, Inc. Health Benefits Fund, Painters District Council No. 30 Health & Welfare Fund, Rite-Aid Corporation, Rite-Aid Hdqtrs. Corp., Rochester Drug Co-Operative, Inc., Safeway, Inc., Teamsters Local 237 Welfare Benefits Fund, The Kroger Co., United Food and Commercial Workers Local 1776, Walgreen Co.. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Sealed Document Defendants' Walker Process Fraud & Sham Patent Litigation Slides, #2 Proposed Sealed Document Defendants' Summary Judgment - Product Hopping Slides)(Benjamin, Nicole) This entry/document has been filed under seal pursuant to statute, rule or court order and access is restricted. Please login to CM/ECF to view document(s).
September 19, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 1228 ORDER granting #1227 Motion for Extension of Time re: CMO No. 15 Concerning Rule 16(a)(3) Disclosures. So Ordered by Chief Judge William E. Smith on 9/19/2019. (Jackson, Ryan)
September 19, 2019 NOTICE of Hearing: [End Payors]: Ex Parte Confidential Sealed Conference for End Payor Class Plaintiffs with Court to review time and expense reports for Quarter 2, ending June 30, 2019, RESCHEDULED for 10/10/2019 at 04:00 PM in Magistrate Judge Sullivan Chambers - Room P-285 before Magistrate Judge Patricia A. Sullivan. Call in instructions remain the same as previously sent to counsel. (Saucier, Martha)
September 19, 2019 NOTICE of Hearing: [Direct Payors]: Ex Parte Confidential Sealed Conference for Direct Payor Class Plaintiffs with Court to review time and expense reports for Quarter 2, ending June 30, 2019, RESCHEDULED for 10/10/2019 at 03:00 PM in Magistrate Judge Sullivan Chambers - Room P-285 before Magistrate Judge Patricia A. Sullivan. Call in instructions remain the same as previously given to counsel. (Saucier, Martha)
September 18, 2019 Filing 1227 Assented MOTION for an Extension of Time to Extend Deadlines in Interim Case Management Order No. 15 Concerning Rule 26(a)(3) Disclosures filed by All Plaintiffs. Responses due by 10/2/2019. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Johnson, Kristen)
September 18, 2019 NOTICE of Hearing on #496 MOTION for Summary Judgment Due to Lack of Market Power, #540 MOTION for Summary Judgment, #1196 MOTION to Bifurcate, #1195 MOTION to Bifurcate, #1194 MOTION to Bifurcate, and #1197 MOTION to Bifurcate: Motion Hearing scheduled for Thursday 10/3/2019 to begin at 10:00 AM in Courtroom 3 before Judge William E. Smith; this hearing will be immediately followed by a conference with all counsel re: Jury Questionnaires and the upcoming Jury Trial, to be held in the Judicial Conference Room adjacent to Courtroom 3 (Jackson, Ryan)
September 17, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 1226 ORDER granting in part and denying in part #526 End-Payor Plaintiffs' Motion for Class Certification and Appointment of Class Counsel. So Ordered by Chief Judge William E. Smith on 9/17/2019. (Jackson, Ryan)
September 17, 2019 Filing 1225 TRANSCRIPT ORDER ACKNOWLEDGMENT Entered re: #1224 Transcript Order. Court Reporter/Transcriber: Denise Veitch/Lisa Schwam. (Simoncelli, Michael)
September 16, 2019 Filing 1224 TRANSCRIPT ORDER for proceedings held on September 11-12, 2019 before Judge Chief Judge Smith. 3-Day Transcript Selected. Transcript to be delivered within 3 calendar days.. (Johnson, Kristen)
September 16, 2019 Filing 1223 TRANSCRIPT ORDER ACKNOWLEDGMENT Entered re: #1221 Transcript Order, #1222 Transcript Order. Court Reporter/Transcriber: Denise Veitch/Lisa Schwam. (Simoncelli, Michael)
September 16, 2019 Filing 1222 TRANSCRIPT ORDER for proceedings held on 9/11/2019-9/12/2019 before Judge Smith, CJ. 3-Day Transcript Selected. Transcript to be delivered within 3 calendar days.. (Kohn, Peter)
September 14, 2019 Filing 1221 TRANSCRIPT ORDER for proceedings held on 9/11/2019-9/12/2019 before Judge Smith, CJ. 3-Day Transcript Selected. Transcript to be delivered within 3 calendar days.. (Benjamin, Nicole)
September 13, 2019 Filing 1220 Exhibit/Witness List. (Attachments: #1 Exhibits)(Potter, Carrie)
September 13, 2019 Opinion or Order TEXT ORDER granting #1217 Motion to Amend/Correct Plaintiffs' Motion to File Two Corrected Exhibits to the Johnson Declaration in Support of Plaintiffs' Opposition to Defendants' Motion for Summary Judgment filed by All Plaintiffs. So Ordered by Chief Judge William E. Smith on 9/13/2019. (Jackson, Ryan)
September 12, 2019 Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge William E. Smith (2): Motion Hearing held on 9/12/2019 re #874 MOTION to Exclude Opinions and Testimony of Drs. Christine S. Meyer and Mark S. Robbins Regarding Procompetitive Justifications of Reverse Payments filed Plaintiffs #886 MOTION to Exclude Certain Opinions and Testimony of Michael Thomas, M.D., on Chewability and Patent Issues filed by Watson Pharmaceuticals, Inc., Warner Chilcott Sales (US), LLC, #882 MOTION to Exclude the Opinions and Testimony of Plaintiffs' Expert Dr. Thomas McGuire filed by Watson Pharmaceuticals, Inc., Warner Chilcott Sales (US), LLC #902 MOTION Motion to Exclude the Expert Testimony of Dr. Louis Berneman, Philip Green, and Dr. Christine Meyer Regarding "Fair Value" filed by Plaintiffs #895 MOTION to Exclude the Opinions and Testimony of Judge John T. Ward filed by Plaintiffs #890 MOTION in Limine to Exclude Certain Opinions of Lentz, Doll, and Jewell filed by Watson Pharmaceuticals, Inc., Warner Chilcott Sales (US), LLC, #865 MOTION to Exclude In Part Expert Opinions of Dr. Philip D. Darney filed by Plaintiffs, #892 MOTION in Limine to Exclude Opinions and Testimony of John R. Tupman filed by Watson Pharmaceuticals, Inc., Warner Chilcott Sales (US), LLC, #899 MOTION to Partially Exclude the Opinions and Testimony of Stephen G. Kunin filed by Plaintiffs. T. Sobal, B. Refsin, K. Johnson, A. Neil for the Plaintiffs. A. Hanstead, R. Milne, B. Gant, M. Gallagher, P. Carney for the Defendants. Court hears arguments regarding Motions. Court takes Motions under advisement. Parties are to file short preliminary jury instructions. Court to issue questions regarding Market Power. Answers, no more than 5 to 7 pages, to the Market Power Questions are due September 30, 2019. Hearing on Motions regarding Bifurcation and Market Power set for October 3, 2019. Conference regarding Jury Questionnaires and the upcoming trial to immediately follow. 4 Plaintiffs Exhibtis entered. (Court Reporter Lisa Schwam in Courtroom 3 at 10:04.) (Potter, Carrie) Modified on 9/13/2019 (Potter, Carrie). Modified on 10/2/2019 (Potter, Carrie).
September 12, 2019 NOTICE of Hearing on Motion #698 MOTION Exclude the Opinions and Testimony of Indirect Purchaser Plaintiffs' Experts Eric Miller, Laura Craft and Myron Winkleman (Supporting Memorandum of Law filed separately at Doc. 696) re: #696 MOTION to Seal Defendants, #895 MOTION to Exclude the Opinions and Testimony of Judge John T. Ward, #875 MOTION to Exclude Opinions and Testimony of Drs. Christine S. Meyer, Mark S. Robbins, and Melissa A. Schilling Regarding Lack of Anticompetitive Effect from Product Hop , #874 MOTION to Exclude Opinions and Testimony of Drs. Christine S. Meyer and Mark S. Robbins Regarding Procompetitive Justifications of Reverse Payments , #892 MOTION in Limine to Exclude Opinions and Testimony of John R. Tupman, 634 MOTION to Exclude the Testimony and Opinions of James W. Hughes, PH.D , #903 MOTION to Exclude in Part the Expert Testimony of Philip Green , 905 MOTION to Exclude the Expert Opinions of Karen Ryle , #711 MOTION to Exclude the Expert Testimony of Dr. Sumanth Addanki , #882 MOTION to Exclude the Opinions and Testimony of Plaintiffs' Expert Dr. Thomas McGuire , #886 MOTION to Exclude Certain Opinions and Testimony of Michael Thomas, M.D., on Chewability and Patent Issues , #899 MOTION to Partially Exclude the Opinions and Testimony of Stephen G. Kunin, #890 MOTION in Limine to Exclude Certain Opinions of Lentz, Doll, and Jewell, #901 MOTION Motion to Exclude in Part the Expert Opinions of Christine Meyer, Ph.D. and Philip Green that Authorized Generics Were Facing Legal Uncertainty , #876 MOTION To Exclude The Merits Testimony And Opinions Of James W. Hughes, Ph.D., #867 MOTION to Exclude In Part Expert Opinions of Christine S. Meyer , #902 MOTION Motion to Exclude the Expert Testimony of Dr. Louis Berneman, Philip Green, and Dr. Christine Meyer Regarding "Fair Value" , 906 MOTION to Exclude Portions of Testimony of Defendants' Expert Dr. Pierre-Yves Cremieux , #884 MOTION to Exclude the Opinions and Testimony of End-Payor Plaintiffs' Expert Dr. Gary L. French , #881 MOTION to Partially Exclude the Opinions and Testimony of Robert A. Dormer, #865 MOTION to Exclude In Part Expert Opinions of Dr. Philip D. Darney , #897 MOTION to Partially Exclude the Opinions and Testimony of Ronald Thisted, #733 MOTION to Exclude THE OPINIONS AND TESTIMONY OF MR. TIMOTHY E. KOSTY AND DR. BRUCE A. STROMBOM : Motion Hearing set for 9/12/2019 at 10:00 AM in Courtroom 3 before Judge William E. Smith (2). (Potter, Carrie)
September 11, 2019 Minute Entry for proceedings held before Chief Judge William E. Smith: Motion Hearing held on 9/12/2019 re #842 MOTION for Summary Judgment filed by Watson Pharmaceuticals, Inc., Warner Chilcott Sales (US),et al: T. Sobal,S. Shadowen, B. Refsin, K. Johnson for the Plaintiffs. R. Milne M. Gidley, M. Hamburger, N. Benjamin, J, Pace, P. Carney for the Defendants. Attorneys responds to Courts inquiry on bifurcation. Court will address bifurcation at a later date. Parties argue Motion for Summary Judgment. Court requests further briefing on Market Power. Court takes Defendants Motion for Summary Judgment under advisement. (Court Reporter Denise Vietch in Courtroom 3 at 10:04.) (Potter, Carrie) Modified on 9/12/2019 (Potter, Carrie).
September 11, 2019 Opinion or Order TEXT ORDER granting #1218 Motion to Seal. So Ordered by Chief Judge William E. Smith on 9/11/2019. (Jackson, Ryan)
September 10, 2019 Filing 1218 MOTION to Seal Proposed Corrected Exhibits PX219 and PX240 to the Declaration of Kristen A. Johnson in Support of Plaintiffs' Opposition to Defendants' Motion for Summary Judgment Filed. Notice Sent To: All Plaintiffs. (Attachments: #1 PX219, #2 PX240)(Johnson, Kristen) This entry/document has been filed under seal pursuant to statute, rule or court order and access is restricted. Please login to CM/ECF to view document(s).
September 10, 2019 Filing 1217 MOTION to Amend/Correct Plaintiffs' Motion to File Two Corrected Exhibits to the Johnson Declaration in Support of Plaintiffs' Opposition to Defendants' Motion for Summary Judgment filed by All Plaintiffs. Responses due by 9/24/2019. (Johnson, Kristen)
September 10, 2019 Opinion or Order TEXT ORDER granting #1216 Motion for Bryan D. Gant to Appear Pro Hac Vice filed by Warner Chilcott Company, Inc., Warner Chilcott Company, LLC, Warner Chilcott Corporation, Warner Chilcott Holdings Company III, Ltd., Warner Chilcott Laboratories Ireland Limited, Warner Chilcott Public Limited Company, Warner Chilcott Sales (US), LLC, Warner Chilcott U.S., LLC, Watson Laboratories, Inc., Watson Pharmaceuticals, Inc. So Ordered by Chief Judge William E. Smith on 9/10/2019. (Simoncelli, Michael)
September 10, 2019 Filing 1216 MOTION for Bryan D. Gant to Appear Pro Hac Vice ( filing fee paid $ 100.00, receipt number 0103-1414020 ) filed by Warner Chilcott Company, Inc., Warner Chilcott Company, LLC, Warner Chilcott Corporation, Warner Chilcott Holdings Company III, Ltd., Warner Chilcott Laboratories Ireland Limited, Warner Chilcott Public Limited Company, Warner Chilcott Sales (US), LLC, Warner Chilcott U.S., LLC, Watson Laboratories, Inc., Watson Pharmaceuticals, Inc.. (Benjamin, Nicole)
September 10, 2019 Opinion or Order TEXT ORDER granting #1212 Motion for Leave to File/to File for Additional Admission pro hac vice. So Ordered by Chief Judge William E. Smith on 9/10/2019. (Jackson, Ryan)
September 10, 2019 Filing 1215 NOTICE by End Payor Plaintiffs re #1207 Notice (Other),, Reply to Defendants' Response to End-Payor Plaintiffs' Response to Warner Chilcott's Notice of Supplemental Authorities (Attachments: #1 Exhibit, #2 Exhibit)(Shadowen, Steve)
September 10, 2019 Opinion or Order TEXT ORDER granting #1214 Motion for Extension of Time: Continuing Deadline in CMO 15 re: Parties exchange Rule 26(a)(3) disclosures from 9/13/19 to 9/20/19. So Ordered by Chief Judge William E. Smith on 9/10/2019. (Jackson, Ryan)
September 10, 2019 Opinion or Order TEXT ORDER denying as moot #871 MOTION to Strike Defendants' Exhibit 70 (Declaration of Pramod Dahibhate) and to Preclude Defendants from Relying thereon in Support of Their Motion for Summary Judgment, Any Other Motion, at a Hearing or at Trial; denying as moot #872 MOTION to Exclude Certain Purported Expert Opinions and Testimony of Christopher Smith, Robert Dormer, and Mark Robbins; denying as moot #879 MOTION to Exclude the Opinions and Testimony of Deborah Jaskot Concerning Lupin's Inability to Obtain FDA Approval for its Generic Until 2015. So Ordered by Chief Judge William E. Smith on 9/10/2019. (Jackson, Ryan)
September 9, 2019 Filing 1214 Joint MOTION for an Extension of Time Extend Deadline in Case Management Order 15 filed by Warner Chilcott Company, Inc., Warner Chilcott Company, LLC, Warner Chilcott Corporation, Warner Chilcott Holdings Company III, Ltd., Warner Chilcott Laboratories Ireland Limited, Warner Chilcott Public Limited Company, Warner Chilcott Sales (US), LLC, Warner Chilcott U.S., LLC, Watson Laboratories, Inc., Watson Pharmaceuticals, Inc.. Responses due by 9/23/2019. (Benjamin, Nicole)
September 6, 2019 Filing 1213 REPLY to Response re #1204 Response to Motion,, (Reply Memorandum of Law in Support of Defendants' Motion for a Phased Trial) filed by Warner Chilcott Company, Inc., Warner Chilcott Company, LLC, Warner Chilcott Corporation, Warner Chilcott Holdings Company III, Ltd., Warner Chilcott Laboratories Ireland Limited, Warner Chilcott Public Limited Company, Warner Chilcott Sales (US), LLC, Warner Chilcott U.S., LLC, Watson Laboratories, Inc., Watson Pharmaceuticals, Inc.. (Benjamin, Nicole)
September 6, 2019 Filing 1212 MOTION for Leave to File Document (Motion for Leave to File Additional Application for Admission Pro Hac Vice) filed by Warner Chilcott Company, Inc., Warner Chilcott Company, LLC, Warner Chilcott Corporation, Warner Chilcott Holdings Company III, Ltd., Warner Chilcott Laboratories Ireland Limited, Warner Chilcott Public Limited Company, Warner Chilcott Sales (US), LLC, Warner Chilcott U.S., LLC, Watson Laboratories, Inc., Watson Pharmaceuticals, Inc.. Responses due by 9/20/2019. (Benjamin, Nicole)
September 6, 2019 Filing 1211 REPLY to Response re #1204 Response to Motion,, filed by Direct Purchaser Class Plaintiffs, End Payor Plaintiffs. (Meltzer, Joseph)
September 6, 2019 Filing 1210 REPLY to Response re #1204 Response to Motion,, in Support of Retailer Plaintiffs' Motion for Bifurcation filed by Albertson's, LLC, CVS Health Corporation, CVS Pharmacy, Inc., Caremark, LLC, HEB Grocery Company L.P., Rite-Aid Corporation, Rite-Aid Hdqtrs. Corp., Safeway, Inc., The Kroger Co., Walgreen Co.. (Refsin, Barry)
September 5, 2019 Filing 1209 NOTICE by Plaintiffs, Warner Chilcott Company, Inc., Warner Chilcott Company, LLC, Warner Chilcott Corporation, Warner Chilcott Holdings Company III, Ltd., Warner Chilcott Laboratories Ireland Limited, Warner Chilcott Public Limited Company, Warner Chilcott Sales (US), LLC, Warner Chilcott U.S., LLC, Watson Laboratories, Inc., Watson Pharmaceuticals, Inc. of Joint Roadmap Regarding Hearing on Daubert Motions (Benjamin, Nicole)
September 5, 2019 Filing 1208 NOTICE by Plaintiffs Of Intent Not To Pursue Any Arguments That Defendants' Conduct Delayed Lupin's Introduction of Generic Loestrin 24 (Meltzer, Joseph)
September 4, 2019 Filing 1207 NOTICE by Warner Chilcott Company, Inc., Warner Chilcott Company, LLC, Warner Chilcott Corporation, Warner Chilcott Holdings Company III, Ltd., Warner Chilcott Laboratories Ireland Limited, Warner Chilcott Public Limited Company, Warner Chilcott Sales (US), LLC, Warner Chilcott U.S., LLC, Watson Laboratories, Inc., Watson Pharmaceuticals, Inc. re #1206 Notice (Other) (Defendants' Response to End-Payor Plaintiffs' Response to Warner Chilcott's Notice of Supplemental Authorities) (Benjamin, Nicole)
August 30, 2019 Filing 1206 NOTICE by End Payor Plaintiffs re #1205 Notice (Other),,, (Shadowen, Steve)
August 26, 2019 Filing 1205 NOTICE by Warner Chilcott Company, Inc., Warner Chilcott Company, LLC, Warner Chilcott Corporation, Warner Chilcott Holdings Company III, Ltd., Warner Chilcott Laboratories Ireland Limited, Warner Chilcott Public Limited Company, Warner Chilcott Sales (US), LLC, Warner Chilcott U.S., LLC, Watson Laboratories, Inc., Watson Pharmaceuticals, Inc. re #576 MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM (Defendants' Renewed Motion to Dismiss and Motion for Judgment on the Pleadings as to Claims in End-Payor Class Plaintiffs' Second Amended Consolidated Class Action Complaint), #876 MOTION To Exclude The Merits Testimony And Opinions Of James W. Hughes, Ph.D., #526 MOTION to Certify Class End-Payor Plaintiffs Motion for Class Certification and Appointment of Class Counsel (Notice of Supplemental Authorities) (Benjamin, Nicole)
August 23, 2019 Filing 1204 RESPONSE In Opposition to #1194 MOTION to Bifurcate of Retailer Plaintiffs, #1196 MOTION to Bifurcate Direct Purchaser Class and End-Payor Plaintiffs' Motion to Bifurcate the Trial, #1195 MOTION to Bifurcate the Trial filed by Warner Chilcott Company, Inc., Warner Chilcott Company, LLC, Warner Chilcott Corporation, Warner Chilcott Holdings Company III, Ltd., Warner Chilcott Laboratories Ireland Limited, Warner Chilcott Public Limited Company, Warner Chilcott Sales (US), LLC, Warner Chilcott U.S., LLC, Watson Laboratories, Inc., Watson Pharmaceuticals, Inc.. Replies due by 8/30/2019. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit 2)(Benjamin, Nicole)
August 23, 2019 Filing 1203 RESPONSE In Opposition to #1194 MOTION to Bifurcate of Retailer Plaintiffs, #1197 MOTION to Bifurcate (Defendants' Motion for a Phased Trial) filed by Direct Purchaser Class Plaintiffs, End Payor Plaintiffs. Replies due by 8/30/2019. (Johnson, Kristen)
August 23, 2019 Filing 1202 RESPONSE In Opposition to #1198 MOTION to Seal Memorandum of Law in Support of Defendants' Motion for Phased Trial Filed., #1195 MOTION to Bifurcate the Trial filed by Albertson's, LLC, CVS Pharmacy, Inc., HEB Grocery Company L.P., Rite-Aid Corporation, Rite-Aid Hdqtrs. Corp., Safeway, Inc., The Kroger Co., Walgreen Co.. Replies due by 8/30/2019. (Refsin, Barry)
August 19, 2019 Opinion or Order TEXT ORDER granting #1198 Motion to Seal. So Ordered by Chief Judge William E. Smith on 8/19/2019. (Jackson, Ryan)
August 16, 2019 Opinion or Order TEXT ORDER: [End Payors]: Ex Parte Confidential Sealed Conference for End Payor Class Plaintiffs with Court to review time and expense reports for Quarter 2, ending June 30, 2019, set for 09/26/2019 at 4:00 pm in Magistrate Judge Sullivan Chambers - Room P-285 before Magistrate Judge Patricia A. Sullivan. At least one interim co-lead counsel and the CPA are ordered to participate, but may, at their option, do so either in-person or by telephone. Liaison counsel shall advise the Deputy Clerk on or before 5:00 pm on 09/23/2019, whether participants will be in-person or by telephone, and, if any participants will join by telephone, the Clerk will provide liaison counsel with the dial-in information. Liaison counsel are directed to supply the dial-in information to the CPA and any counsel wishing to participate telephonically. The Clerk will email to liaison counsel the dial-in instructions.. So Ordered by Magistrate Judge Patricia A. Sullivan on 8/16/2019. (Saucier, Martha)
August 16, 2019 Opinion or Order TEXT ORDER: [Direct Payors]: Ex Parte Confidential Sealed Conference for Direct Payor Class Plaintiffs with Court to review time and expense reports for Quarter 2, ending June 30, 2019, set for 09/26/2019 at 3:00 pm in Magistrate Judge Sullivan Chambers - Room P-285 before Magistrate Judge Patricia A. Sullivan. At least one interim co-lead counsel and the CPA are ordered to participate, but may, at their option, do so either in-person or by telephone. Liaison counsel shall advise the Deputy Clerk on or before 5:00 pm on 09/23/2019 whether participants will be in-person or by telephone, and, if any participants will join by telephone, the Clerk will provide liaison counsel with the dial-in information. Liaison counsel are directed to supply the dial-in information to the CPA and any counsel wishing to participate telephonically. The Clerk will email to liaison counsel the dial-in instructions.. So Ordered by Magistrate Judge Patricia A. Sullivan on 8/16/2019. (Saucier, Martha)
August 14, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 1200 ORDER Approving The Form and Manner of Notice and Appointing Notice Administrator - So Ordered by Chief Judge William E. Smith on 8/14/2019. (Urizandi, Nisshy)
August 14, 2019 Opinion or Order TEXT ORDER granting Direct Purchaser Plaintiffs' Motion for Entry of an Order Approving the Form and Manner of Notice and Appointing Notice Administrator (ECF No. #1056 ) and approving the Proposed Form of Notice located at Exhibit A to the DPPs' Notice of Filing Revised Proposed Notice to Class Members (ECF No. 1178-1). After careful consideration of Defendants' and the Retailer Plaintiffs' briefing on this issue, the Court is satisfied that the Revised Proposed Notice, as approved and docketed, is consistent with the Federal Rules of Civil Procedure and relevant case law. The Court will address any issues implicating Defendants' Due Process rights if and when they arise - So Ordered by Chief Judge William E. Smith on 8/14/2019. (Urizandi, Nisshy)
August 9, 2019 Filing 1199 REDACTION to #1198 MOTION to Seal Memorandum of Law in Support of Defendants' Motion for Phased Trial Filed., #1197 MOTION to Bifurcate (Defendants' Motion for a Phased Trial) (Public Version) by Warner Chilcott Company, Inc., Warner Chilcott Company, LLC, Warner Chilcott Corporation, Warner Chilcott Holdings Company III, Ltd., Warner Chilcott Laboratories Ireland Limited, Warner Chilcott Public Limited Company, Warner Chilcott Sales (US), LLC, Warner Chilcott U.S., LLC, Watson Laboratories, Inc., Watson Pharmaceuticals, Inc.. (Benjamin, Nicole)
August 9, 2019 Filing 1198 MOTION to Seal Memorandum of Law in Support of Defendants' Motion for Phased Trial Filed. Notice Sent To: Warner Chilcott Holdings Company III, Ltd., Warner Chilcott Corporation, Warner Chilcott Public Limited Company, Watson Laboratories, Inc., Warner Chilcott Company, LLC, Warner Chilcott Sales (US), LLC, Watson Pharmaceuticals, Inc., Warner Chilcott Laboratories Ireland Limited, Warner Chilcott U.S., LLC, Warner Chilcott Company, Inc., Actavis, Inc., Ahold USA, Inc., Albertson's, LLC, Mary Alexander, Allergan PLC, Allied Services Division Welfare Fund, American Sales Company, LLC, CVS Pharmacy, Inc., Melisa Chrestman, Melissa Chrestman, City of Providence, Direct Purchaser Class Plaintiffs, Electrical Workers 242 & 294 Health & Welfare Fund, End Payor Plaintiffs, Fraternal Order of Police Fort Lauderdale Lodge 31, HEB Grocery Company L.P., Laborers International Union of North America, Denise Loy, Lupin Ltd., Lupin Pharmaceuticals, Inc., New York Hotel Trades Council & Hotel Association of New York City, Inc. Health Benefits Fund, Painters District Council No. 30 Health & Welfare Fund, Rite-Aid Corporation, Rite-Aid Hdqtrs. Corp., Rochester Drug Co-Operative, Inc., Safeway, Inc., Teamsters Local 237 Welfare Benefits Fund, The Kroger Co., United Food and Commercial Workers Local 1776, Walgreen Co.. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Sealed Document Defendants' Memorandum of Law in Support of their Motion for a Phased Trial)(Benjamin, Nicole) This entry/document has been filed under seal pursuant to statute, rule or court order and access is restricted. Please login to CM/ECF to view document(s).
August 9, 2019 Filing 1197 MOTION to Bifurcate (Defendants' Motion for a Phased Trial) filed by Warner Chilcott Company, Inc., Warner Chilcott Company, LLC, Warner Chilcott Corporation, Warner Chilcott Holdings Company III, Ltd., Warner Chilcott Laboratories Ireland Limited, Warner Chilcott Public Limited Company, Warner Chilcott Sales (US), LLC, Warner Chilcott U.S., LLC, Watson Laboratories, Inc., Watson Pharmaceuticals, Inc.. Responses due by 8/23/2019. (Benjamin, Nicole)
August 9, 2019 Filing 1196 MOTION to Bifurcate Direct Purchaser Class and End-Payor Plaintiffs' Motion to Bifurcate the Trial filed by Direct Purchaser Class Plaintiffs. Responses due by 8/23/2019. (Attachments: #1 Attachment A)(Sobol, Thomas)
August 9, 2019 Filing 1195 MOTION to Bifurcate the Trial filed by Direct Purchaser Class Plaintiffs, End Payor Plaintiffs. Responses due by 8/23/2019. (Attachments: #1 Attachment A)(Sobol, Thomas)
August 9, 2019 Filing 1194 MOTION to Bifurcate of Retailer Plaintiffs filed by Albertson's, LLC, CVS Pharmacy, Inc., HEB Grocery Company L.P., Rite-Aid Corporation, Rite-Aid Hdqtrs. Corp., Safeway, Inc., The Kroger Co., Walgreen Co.. Responses due by 8/23/2019. (Perwin, Scott)
August 9, 2019 Filing 1193 NOTICE by United Food and Commercial Workers Local 1776 Withdrawal of Appearance of D. Sean Nation (Nation, Donald)
August 8, 2019 Filing 1192 NOTICE of Change of Address by Michael M. Buchman (Buchman, Michael)
August 1, 2019 Filing 1191 RESPONSE In Support to #1056 MOTION for Entry of an Order Approving the Form and Manner of Notice and Appointing Notice Administrator Retailer Plaintiffs' Reply to Defendants' Response to Withdrawn Objection to Proposed Class Notice filed by Albertson's, LLC, CVS Pharmacy, Inc., HEB Grocery Company L.P., Rite-Aid Corporation, Rite-Aid Hdqtrs. Corp., Safeway, Inc., The Kroger Co., Walgreen Co.. Replies due by 8/8/2019. (Perwin, Scott)
July 30, 2019 Filing 1190 RESPONSE IN OPPOSITION by Warner Chilcott Company, Inc., Warner Chilcott Company, LLC, Warner Chilcott Corporation, Warner Chilcott Holdings Company III, Ltd., Warner Chilcott Laboratories Ireland Limited, Warner Chilcott Public Limited Company, Warner Chilcott Sales (US), LLC, Warner Chilcott U.S., LLC, Watson Laboratories, Inc., Watson Pharmaceuticals, Inc. re #1108 Notice (Other), Defendants' Response to Retailer Plaintiffs' Objection to DPP's Proposed Class Notice (ECF No. 1108) and DPP's Notice of Filing Revised Proposed Notice (ECF No. 1178). (Benjamin, Nicole)
July 27, 2019 Filing 1189 NOTICE by Albertson's, LLC, CVS Pharmacy, Inc., HEB Grocery Company L.P., Rite-Aid Corporation, Rite-Aid Hdqtrs. Corp., Safeway, Inc., The Kroger Co., Walgreen Co. re #1108 Notice (Other), Notice of Withdrawal of Objection (Neill, Anna)
July 26, 2019 Filing 1188 REDACTION (Doc. 1019: Expert Report of Risa Kagan, M.D.) by Warner Chilcott Company, Inc., Warner Chilcott Company, LLC, Warner Chilcott Corporation, Warner Chilcott Holdings Company III, Ltd., Warner Chilcott Laboratories Ireland Limited, Warner Chilcott Public Limited Company, Warner Chilcott Sales (US), LLC, Warner Chilcott U.S., LLC, Watson Laboratories, Inc., Watson Pharmaceuticals, Inc.. (Benjamin, Nicole)
July 26, 2019 Filing 1187 REDACTION to 860 Statement of Undisputed Facts,,,, (860-15: Expert Report of Melissa A. Schilling Ph.D.) by Warner Chilcott Company, Inc., Warner Chilcott Company, LLC, Warner Chilcott Corporation, Warner Chilcott Holdings Company III, Ltd., Warner Chilcott Laboratories Ireland Limited, Warner Chilcott Public Limited Company, Warner Chilcott Sales (US), LLC, Warner Chilcott U.S., LLC, Watson Laboratories, Inc., Watson Pharmaceuticals, Inc.. (Benjamin, Nicole)
July 26, 2019 Filing 1186 REPLY to Response re 1033 Response to Motion, filed by Warner Chilcott Company, Inc., Warner Chilcott Company, LLC, Warner Chilcott Corporation, Warner Chilcott Holdings Company III, Ltd., Warner Chilcott Laboratories Ireland Limited, Warner Chilcott Public Limited Company, Warner Chilcott Sales (US), LLC, Warner Chilcott U.S., LLC, Watson Laboratories, Inc., Watson Pharmaceuticals, Inc.. (Benjamin, Nicole)
July 26, 2019 Filing 1185 REPLY to Response re 1029 Response to Motion, filed by Warner Chilcott Company, Inc., Warner Chilcott Company, LLC, Warner Chilcott Corporation, Warner Chilcott Holdings Company III, Ltd., Warner Chilcott Laboratories Ireland Limited, Warner Chilcott Public Limited Company, Warner Chilcott Sales (US), LLC, Warner Chilcott U.S., LLC, Watson Laboratories, Inc., Watson Pharmaceuticals, Inc.. (Benjamin, Nicole)
July 26, 2019 Filing 1184 REPLY to Response re 1026 Response to Motion, (Public Version) filed by Warner Chilcott Company, Inc., Warner Chilcott Company, LLC, Warner Chilcott Corporation, Warner Chilcott Holdings Company III, Ltd., Warner Chilcott Laboratories Ireland Limited, Warner Chilcott Public Limited Company, Warner Chilcott Sales (US), LLC, Warner Chilcott U.S., LLC, Watson Laboratories, Inc., Watson Pharmaceuticals, Inc.. (Benjamin, Nicole)
July 26, 2019 Filing 1183 REPLY to Response re 1030 Response to Motion, filed by Warner Chilcott Company, Inc., Warner Chilcott Company, LLC, Warner Chilcott Corporation, Warner Chilcott Holdings Company III, Ltd., Warner Chilcott Laboratories Ireland Limited, Warner Chilcott Public Limited Company, Warner Chilcott Sales (US), LLC, Warner Chilcott U.S., LLC, Watson Laboratories, Inc., Watson Pharmaceuticals, Inc.. (Benjamin, Nicole)
July 26, 2019 Filing 1182 REPLY to Response re 1024 Response to Motion, (Public Version) filed by Warner Chilcott Company, Inc., Warner Chilcott Company, LLC, Warner Chilcott Corporation, Warner Chilcott Holdings Company III, Ltd., Warner Chilcott Laboratories Ireland Limited, Warner Chilcott Public Limited Company, Warner Chilcott Sales (US), LLC, Warner Chilcott U.S., LLC, Watson Laboratories, Inc., Watson Pharmaceuticals, Inc.. (Benjamin, Nicole)
July 26, 2019 Filing 1181 REPLY to Response re 1025 Response to Motion, (Public Version) filed by Warner Chilcott Company, Inc., Warner Chilcott Company, LLC, Warner Chilcott Corporation, Warner Chilcott Holdings Company III, Ltd., Warner Chilcott Laboratories Ireland Limited, Warner Chilcott Public Limited Company, Warner Chilcott Sales (US), LLC, Warner Chilcott U.S., LLC, Watson Laboratories, Inc., Watson Pharmaceuticals, Inc.. (Benjamin, Nicole)
July 26, 2019 Filing 1180 MOTION to Unseal Document 1115 Reply to Response, filed by Painters District Council No. 30 Health & Welfare Fund, Laborers International Union of North America, Direct Purchaser Class Plaintiffs, Rite-Aid Hdqtrs. Corp., End Payor Plaintiffs, HEB Grocery Company L.P., Melissa Chrestman, Albertson's, LLC, Allied Services Division Welfare Fund, Walgreen Co., The Kroger Co., Electrical Workers 242 & 294 Health & Welfare Fund, Mary Alexander, CVS Pharmacy, Inc., American Sales Company, LLC, Rochester Drug Co-Operative, Inc., City of Providence, United Food and Commercial Workers Local 1776, New York Hotel Trades Council & Hotel Association of New York City, Inc. Health Benefits Fund, Ahold USA, Inc., Melisa Chrestman, Fraternal Order of Police Fort Lauderdale Lodge 31, Denise Loy, Rite-Aid Corporation, Safeway, Inc., Teamsters Local 237 Welfare Benefits Fund filed by End Payor Plaintiffs. Responses due by 8/9/2019. (Miller, Marvin)
July 26, 2019 Filing 1179 MOTION to Unseal Document Plaintiffs' Replies in Support of Certain Daubert Motions filed by All Plaintiffs. Responses due by 8/9/2019. (Shadowen, Steve)
July 26, 2019 Filing 1178 NOTICE by Direct Purchaser Class Plaintiffs re #1108 Notice (Other), Notice of Filing Revised Proposed Notice to Class Members (Attachments: #1 Revised Proposed Notice)(Sobol, Thomas)
July 26, 2019 Filing 1177 REDACTION to 1097-3 Reply in Support of Plaintiffs' Motion to Exclude in Part the Expert Testimony of Philip Green by All Plaintiffs. (Kohn, Peter)
July 26, 2019 Filing 1176 MOTION to Unseal Document Plaintiffs' Replies in Support of Daubert Motions Regarding Dr. Berneman, Mr. Green, and Dr. Meyer filed by All Plaintiffs. Responses due by 8/9/2019. (Kohn, Peter)
July 26, 2019 Filing 1175 MOTION to Unseal Document Unopposed Motion to Unseal Certain Daubert Replies filed by All Plaintiffs. Responses due by 8/9/2019. (Meltzer, Joseph)
July 25, 2019 Filing 1174 NOTICE by Lupin Ltd., Lupin Pharmaceuticals, Inc. of Compliance with 28 U.S.C. Section 1715 (Blad, Leiv)
July 22, 2019 Filing 1173 REDACTION to 1087 Statement of Disputed Facts,, and Exhibits 280-281, 289 and 292-293 (Public Version) by Warner Chilcott Company, Inc., Warner Chilcott Company, LLC, Warner Chilcott Corporation, Warner Chilcott Holdings Company III, Ltd., Warner Chilcott Laboratories Ireland Limited, Warner Chilcott Public Limited Company, Warner Chilcott Sales (US), LLC, Warner Chilcott U.S., LLC, Watson Laboratories, Inc., Watson Pharmaceuticals, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 280, #2 Exhibit 281, #3 Exhibit 289, #4 Exhibit 292, #5 Exhibit 293)(Benjamin, Nicole)
July 22, 2019 Filing 1172 REDACTION to 859 Memorandum in Support,, (Public Version) by Warner Chilcott Company, Inc., Warner Chilcott Company, LLC, Warner Chilcott Corporation, Warner Chilcott Holdings Company III, Ltd., Warner Chilcott Laboratories Ireland Limited, Warner Chilcott Public Limited Company, Warner Chilcott Sales (US), LLC, Warner Chilcott U.S., LLC, Watson Laboratories, Inc., Watson Pharmaceuticals, Inc.. (Benjamin, Nicole)
July 22, 2019 Filing 1171 NOTICE by Direct Purchaser Class Plaintiffs re #1108 Notice (Other), Notice of Treatment of Retailer Plaintiffs' Objection to Direct Purchasers' Proposed Class Notice for Purposes of Direct Purchaser Class Plaintiffs' Response Thereto (Johnson, Kristen)
July 18, 2019 Filing 1170 NOTICE by CVS Pharmacy, Inc., Rite-Aid Corporation, Rite-Aid Hdqtrs. Corp. Withdrawal of Appearance of Maureen S. Lawrence (Refsin, Barry)
July 17, 2019 Filing 1156 NOTICE by Ahold USA, Inc., Albertson's, LLC, Mary Alexander, Allied Services Division Welfare Fund, CVS Pharmacy, Inc., City of Providence, Direct Purchaser Class Plaintiffs, Electrical Workers 242 & 294 Health & Welfare Fund, End Payor Plaintiffs, Fraternal Order of Police Fort Lauderdale Lodge 31, HEB Grocery Company L.P., Laborers International Union of North America, Denise Loy, New York Hotel Trades Council & Hotel Association of New York City, Inc. Health Benefits Fund, Painters District Council No. 30 Health & Welfare Fund, Rite-Aid Corporation, Rite-Aid Hdqtrs. Corp., Rochester Drug Co-Operative, Inc., Safeway, Inc., Teamsters Local 237 Welfare Benefits Fund, The Kroger Co., United Food and Commercial Workers Local 1776, Walgreen Co. (Kendrick, Bonnie)
July 16, 2019 Opinion or Order TEXT ORDER granting #1117 Motion to Seal; granting #1118 Motion to Seal; granting #1119 Motion to Seal; granting #1120 Motion to Seal; granting #1121 Motion to Seal. So Ordered by Chief Judge William E. Smith on 7/16/2019. (Jackson, Ryan)
July 16, 2019 NOTICE of Hearing on #842 MOTION for Summary Judgment and on motions re: Daubert challenges: The motion hearing, which has been scheduled pursuant to #1088 Interim Case Management Order No. 15, will begin on Wednesday 9/11/2019 at 10:00 AM and continue on Thursday 9/12/19 at 10:00 AM in Courtroom 2 before Judge William E. Smith. (Jackson, Ryan)
July 16, 2019 DOCKET NOTE: Regarding: 1132 Response to Motion. FILED IN ERROR. PLEASE DISREGARD. (Potter, Carrie)
July 15, 2019 Filing 1124 DECLARATION re #1122 MOTION for Settlement EPPs' Motion for Preliminary Approval of Class Action Settlement with Lupin Ltd. and Lupin Pharmaceuticals, Inc. Declaration of Michael M. Buchman by End Payor Plaintiffs. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit 2, #3 Exhibit 3, #4 Exhibit 4, #5 Exhibit 5, #6 Exhibit 6, #7 Exhibit 7, #8 Exhibit 8)(Buchman, Michael)
July 15, 2019 Filing 1123 MEMORANDUM IN SUPPORT by End Payor Plaintiffs in support of #1122 MOTION for Settlement EPPs' Motion for Preliminary Approval of Class Action Settlement with Lupin Ltd. and Lupin Pharmaceuticals, Inc. . (Buchman, Michael)
July 15, 2019 Filing 1122 MOTION for Settlement EPPs' Motion for Preliminary Approval of Class Action Settlement with Lupin Ltd. and Lupin Pharmaceuticals, Inc. filed by End Payor Plaintiffs. Responses due by 7/29/2019. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Buchman, Michael)
July 15, 2019 Filing 1121 MOTION to Seal FULL DEPOSITION TRANSCRIPTS PURSUANT TO THE COURTS JUNE 6, 2019 ORDER Filed. Notice Sent To: All Plaintiffs. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Sealed Document, #2 Proposed Sealed Document, #3 Proposed Sealed Document, #4 Proposed Sealed Document, #5 Proposed Sealed Document, #6 Proposed Sealed Document)(Walker, Daniel) This entry/document has been filed under seal pursuant to statute, rule or court order and access is restricted. Please login to CM/ECF to view document(s).
July 15, 2019 Filing 1120 MOTION to Seal FULL DEPOSITION TRANSCRIPTS PURSUANT TO THE COURTS JUNE 6, 2019 ORDER Filed. Notice Sent To: All Plaintiffs. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Sealed Document, #2 Proposed Sealed Document, #3 Proposed Sealed Document, #4 Proposed Sealed Document, #5 Proposed Sealed Document, #6 Proposed Sealed Document, #7 Proposed Sealed Document)(Walker, Daniel) This entry/document has been filed under seal pursuant to statute, rule or court order and access is restricted. Please login to CM/ECF to view document(s).
July 15, 2019 Filing 1119 MOTION to Seal FULL DEPOSITION TRANSCRIPTS PURSUANT TO THE COURTS JUNE 6, 2019 ORDER Filed. Notice Sent To: All Plaintiffs. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Sealed Document, #2 Proposed Sealed Document, #3 Proposed Sealed Document, #4 Proposed Sealed Document, #5 Proposed Sealed Document, #6 Proposed Sealed Document)(Walker, Daniel) This entry/document has been filed under seal pursuant to statute, rule or court order and access is restricted. Please login to CM/ECF to view document(s).
July 15, 2019 Filing 1118 MOTION to Seal FULL DEPOSITION TRANSCRIPTS PURSUANT TO THE COURTS JUNE 6, 2019 ORDER Filed. Notice Sent To: All Plaintiffs. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Sealed Document, #2 Proposed Sealed Document, #3 Proposed Sealed Document, #4 Proposed Sealed Document, #5 Proposed Sealed Document, #6 Proposed Sealed Document)(Walker, Daniel) This entry/document has been filed under seal pursuant to statute, rule or court order and access is restricted. Please login to CM/ECF to view document(s).
July 15, 2019 Filing 1117 MOTION to Seal FULL DEPOSITION TRANSCRIPTS PURSUANT TO THE COURTS JUNE 6, 2019 ORDER Filed. Notice Sent To: All Plaintiffs. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Sealed Document, #2 Proposed Sealed Document, #3 Proposed Sealed Document, #4 Proposed Sealed Document, #5 Proposed Sealed Document, #6 Proposed Sealed Document)(Walker, Daniel) This entry/document has been filed under seal pursuant to statute, rule or court order and access is restricted. Please login to CM/ECF to view document(s).
July 15, 2019 Opinion or Order TEXT ORDER granting #1116 Motion to Seal. So Ordered by Chief Judge William E. Smith on 7/15/2019. (Jackson, Ryan)
July 15, 2019 Filing 1116 MOTION to Seal Joint Chart of Disputed and Undisputed Facts Filed. Notice Sent To: All Plaintiffs. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Sealed Document)(Walker, Daniel) This entry/document has been filed under seal pursuant to statute, rule or court order and access is restricted. Please login to CM/ECF to view document(s).
July 15, 2019 Opinion or Order TEXT ORDER granting #1089 Motion to Seal; granting #1091 Motion to Seal; granting #1092 Motion to Seal; granting #1093 Motion to Seal; granting #1094 Motion to Seal; granting #1095 Motion to Seal; granting #1096 Motion to Seal; granting #1097 Motion to Seal; granting #1098 Motion to Seal; granting #1099 Motion to Seal; granting #1100 Motion to Seal; granting #1101 Motion to Seal; granting #1102 Motion to Seal; granting #1103 Motion to Seal; granting #1104 Motion to Seal; granting #1105 Motion to Seal; granting #1106 Motion to Seal; granting #1107 Motion to Seal. So Ordered by Chief Judge William E. Smith on 7/15/2019. (Jackson, Ryan)
July 15, 2019 Filing 1108 NOTICE by Albertson's, LLC, CVS Pharmacy, Inc., HEB Grocery Company L.P., Rite-Aid Corporation, Rite-Aid Hdqtrs. Corp., Safeway, Inc., The Kroger Co., Walgreen Co. re #1056 MOTION for Entry of an Order Approving the Form and Manner of Notice and Appointing Notice Administrator Retailer Plaintiffs' Objection to Direct Purchasers' Proposed Class Notice (Perwin, Scott)
July 12, 2019 Filing 1107 MOTION to Seal Defendants' Reply Memorandum in Support of Motion to Exclude the Opinions and Testimony of Plaintiffs' Expert Dr. Thomas McGuire (ECF 882) Filed. Notice Sent To: Warner Chilcott Holdings Company III, Ltd., Warner Chilcott Corporation, Warner Chilcott Public Limited Company, Watson Laboratories, Inc., Warner Chilcott Company, LLC, Warner Chilcott Sales (US), LLC, Watson Pharmaceuticals, Inc., Warner Chilcott Laboratories Ireland Limited, Warner Chilcott U.S., LLC, Warner Chilcott Company, Inc., Actavis, Inc., Ahold USA, Inc., Albertson's, LLC, Mary Alexander, Allergan PLC, Allied Services Division Welfare Fund, American Sales Company, LLC, CVS Pharmacy, Inc., Melisa Chrestman, Melissa Chrestman, City of Providence, Direct Purchaser Class Plaintiffs, Electrical Workers 242 & 294 Health & Welfare Fund, End Payor Plaintiffs, Fraternal Order of Police Fort Lauderdale Lodge 31, HEB Grocery Company L.P., Laborers International Union of North America, Denise Loy, Lupin Ltd., Lupin Pharmaceuticals, Inc., New York Hotel Trades Council & Hotel Association of New York City, Inc. Health Benefits Fund, Painters District Council No. 30 Health & Welfare Fund, Rite-Aid Corporation, Rite-Aid Hdqtrs. Corp., Rochester Drug Co-Operative, Inc., Safeway, Inc., Teamsters Local 237 Welfare Benefits Fund, The Kroger Co., United Food and Commercial Workers Local 1776, Walgreen Co.. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Sealed Document Defendants' Reply Memorandum in Support of Motion to Exclude the Opinions and Testimony of Plaintiffs Expert Dr. Thomas McGuire (ECF 882))(Benjamin, Nicole) This entry/document has been filed under seal pursuant to statute, rule or court order and access is restricted. Please login to CM/ECF to view document(s).
July 12, 2019 Filing 1106 MOTION to Seal Defendants' Reply Memorandum in Support of Motion to Exclude the Opinions and Testimony of John R. Tupman Filed. Notice Sent To: Warner Chilcott Holdings Company III, Ltd., Warner Chilcott Corporation, Warner Chilcott Public Limited Company, Watson Laboratories, Inc., Warner Chilcott Company, LLC, Warner Chilcott Sales (US), LLC, Watson Pharmaceuticals, Inc., Warner Chilcott Laboratories Ireland Limited, Warner Chilcott U.S., LLC, Warner Chilcott Company, Inc., Actavis, Inc., Ahold USA, Inc., Albertson's, LLC, Mary Alexander, Allergan PLC, Allied Services Division Welfare Fund, American Sales Company, LLC, CVS Pharmacy, Inc., Melisa Chrestman, Melissa Chrestman, City of Providence, Direct Purchaser Class Plaintiffs, Electrical Workers 242 & 294 Health & Welfare Fund, End Payor Plaintiffs, Fraternal Order of Police Fort Lauderdale Lodge 31, HEB Grocery Company L.P., Laborers International Union of North America, Denise Loy, Lupin Ltd., Lupin Pharmaceuticals, Inc., New York Hotel Trades Council & Hotel Association of New York City, Inc. Health Benefits Fund, Painters District Council No. 30 Health & Welfare Fund, Rite-Aid Corporation, Rite-Aid Hdqtrs. Corp., Rochester Drug Co-Operative, Inc., Safeway, Inc., Teamsters Local 237 Welfare Benefits Fund, The Kroger Co., United Food and Commercial Workers Local 1776, Walgreen Co.. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Sealed Document Defendants' Reply Memorandum in Support of Motion to Exclude the Opinions and Testimony of John R. Tupman)(Benjamin, Nicole) This entry/document has been filed under seal pursuant to statute, rule or court order and access is restricted. Please login to CM/ECF to view document(s).
July 12, 2019 Filing 1105 MOTION to Seal Defendants' Reply Memorandum in Support of Motion to Exclude the Opinions and Testimony of End-Payor Plaintiffs Expert Dr. Gary L. French (ECF No. 884) Filed. Notice Sent To: Warner Chilcott Holdings Company III, Ltd., Warner Chilcott Corporation, Warner Chilcott Public Limited Company, Watson Laboratories, Inc., Warner Chilcott Company, LLC, Warner Chilcott Sales (US), LLC, Watson Pharmaceuticals, Inc., Warner Chilcott Laboratories Ireland Limited, Warner Chilcott U.S., LLC, Warner Chilcott Company, Inc., Actavis, Inc., Ahold USA, Inc., Albertson's, LLC, Mary Alexander, Allergan PLC, Allied Services Division Welfare Fund, American Sales Company, LLC, CVS Pharmacy, Inc., Melisa Chrestman, Melissa Chrestman, City of Providence, Direct Purchaser Class Plaintiffs, Electrical Workers 242 & 294 Health & Welfare Fund, End Payor Plaintiffs, Fraternal Order of Police Fort Lauderdale Lodge 31, HEB Grocery Company L.P., Laborers International Union of North America, Denise Loy, Lupin Ltd., Lupin Pharmaceuticals, Inc., New York Hotel Trades Council & Hotel Association of New York City, Inc. Health Benefits Fund, Painters District Council No. 30 Health & Welfare Fund, Rite-Aid Corporation, Rite-Aid Hdqtrs. Corp., Rochester Drug Co-Operative, Inc., Safeway, Inc., Teamsters Local 237 Welfare Benefits Fund, The Kroger Co., United Food and Commercial Workers Local 1776, Walgreen Co.. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Sealed Document Defendants Reply Memorandum in Support of Motion to Exclude the Opinions and Testimony of End-Payor Plaintiffs Expert Dr. Gary L. French (ECF No. 884))(Benjamin, Nicole) This entry/document has been filed under seal pursuant to statute, rule or court order and access is restricted. Please login to CM/ECF to view document(s).
July 12, 2019 Filing 1104 MOTION to Seal Defendants Reply Memorandum in Support of Motion to Exclude Certain Opinions and Testimony of Michael A. Thomas, M.D. on Chewability and Patent Issues (ECF 886) Filed. Notice Sent To: Warner Chilcott Holdings Company III, Ltd., Warner Chilcott Corporation, Warner Chilcott Public Limited Company, Watson Laboratories, Inc., Warner Chilcott Company, LLC, Warner Chilcott Sales (US), LLC, Watson Pharmaceuticals, Inc., Warner Chilcott Laboratories Ireland Limited, Warner Chilcott U.S., LLC, Warner Chilcott Company, Inc., Actavis, Inc., Ahold USA, Inc., Albertson's, LLC, Mary Alexander, Allergan PLC, Allied Services Division Welfare Fund, American Sales Company, LLC, CVS Pharmacy, Inc., Melisa Chrestman, Melissa Chrestman, City of Providence, Direct Purchaser Class Plaintiffs, Electrical Workers 242 & 294 Health & Welfare Fund, End Payor Plaintiffs, Fraternal Order of Police Fort Lauderdale Lodge 31, HEB Grocery Company L.P., Laborers International Union of North America, Denise Loy, Lupin Ltd., Lupin Pharmaceuticals, Inc., New York Hotel Trades Council & Hotel Association of New York City, Inc. Health Benefits Fund, Painters District Council No. 30 Health & Welfare Fund, Rite-Aid Corporation, Rite-Aid Hdqtrs. Corp., Rochester Drug Co-Operative, Inc., Safeway, Inc., Teamsters Local 237 Welfare Benefits Fund, The Kroger Co., United Food and Commercial Workers Local 1776, Walgreen Co.. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Sealed Document Defendants Reply Memorandum in Support of Motion to Exclude Certain Opinions and Testimony of Michael A. Thomas, M.D. on Chewability and Patent Issues (ECF 886))(Benjamin, Nicole) This entry/document has been filed under seal pursuant to statute, rule or court order and access is restricted. Please login to CM/ECF to view document(s).
July 12, 2019 Filing 1103 MOTION to Seal Defendants Reply Memorandum in Support of Motion to Exclude Certain Opinions and Testimony of Edward Lentz, John Doll, and Nicholas Jewell (ECF 890) Filed. Notice Sent To: Warner Chilcott Holdings Company III, Ltd., Warner Chilcott Corporation, Warner Chilcott Public Limited Company, Watson Laboratories, Inc., Warner Chilcott Company, LLC, Warner Chilcott Sales (US), LLC, Watson Pharmaceuticals, Inc., Warner Chilcott Laboratories Ireland Limited, Warner Chilcott U.S., LLC, Warner Chilcott Company, Inc., Actavis, Inc., Ahold USA, Inc., Albertson's, LLC, Mary Alexander, Allergan PLC, Allied Services Division Welfare Fund, American Sales Company, LLC, CVS Pharmacy, Inc., Melisa Chrestman, Melissa Chrestman, City of Providence, Direct Purchaser Class Plaintiffs, Electrical Workers 242 & 294 Health & Welfare Fund, End Payor Plaintiffs, Fraternal Order of Police Fort Lauderdale Lodge 31, HEB Grocery Company L.P., Laborers International Union of North America, Denise Loy, Lupin Ltd., Lupin Pharmaceuticals, Inc., New York Hotel Trades Council & Hotel Association of New York City, Inc. Health Benefits Fund, Painters District Council No. 30 Health & Welfare Fund, Rite-Aid Corporation, Rite-Aid Hdqtrs. Corp., Rochester Drug Co-Operative, Inc., Safeway, Inc., Teamsters Local 237 Welfare Benefits Fund, The Kroger Co., United Food and Commercial Workers Local 1776, Walgreen Co.. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Sealed Document Defendants Reply Memorandum in Support of Motion to Exclude Certain Opinions and Testimony of Edward Lentz, John Doll, and Nicholas Jewell (ECF 890))(Benjamin, Nicole) This entry/document has been filed under seal pursuant to statute, rule or court order and access is restricted. Please login to CM/ECF to view document(s).
July 12, 2019 Filing 1102 MOTION to Seal Defendants' Reply in Further Support of their Motion (ECF No. 879) to Exclude the Opinions and Testimony of Deborah Jaskot Concerning Lupins Inability to Obtain FDA Approval for its Generic Until 2015 Filed. Notice Sent To: Warner Chilcott Holdings Company III, Ltd., Warner Chilcott Corporation, Warner Chilcott Public Limited Company, Watson Laboratories, Inc., Warner Chilcott Company, LLC, Warner Chilcott Sales (US), LLC, Watson Pharmaceuticals, Inc., Warner Chilcott Laboratories Ireland Limited, Warner Chilcott U.S., LLC, Warner Chilcott Company, Inc., Actavis, Inc., Ahold USA, Inc., Albertson's, LLC, Mary Alexander, Allergan PLC, Allied Services Division Welfare Fund, American Sales Company, LLC, CVS Pharmacy, Inc., Melisa Chrestman, Melissa Chrestman, City of Providence, Direct Purchaser Class Plaintiffs, Electrical Workers 242 & 294 Health & Welfare Fund, End Payor Plaintiffs, Fraternal Order of Police Fort Lauderdale Lodge 31, HEB Grocery Company L.P., Laborers International Union of North America, Denise Loy, Lupin Ltd., Lupin Pharmaceuticals, Inc., New York Hotel Trades Council & Hotel Association of New York City, Inc. Health Benefits Fund, Painters District Council No. 30 Health & Welfare Fund, Rite-Aid Corporation, Rite-Aid Hdqtrs. Corp., Rochester Drug Co-Operative, Inc., Safeway, Inc., Teamsters Local 237 Welfare Benefits Fund, The Kroger Co., United Food and Commercial Workers Local 1776, Walgreen Co.. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Sealed Document Defendants' Reply in Further Support of their Motion (ECF No. 879) to Exclude the Opinions and Testimony of Deborah Jaskot Concerning Lupins Inability to Obtain FDA Approval for its Generic Until 2015)(Benjamin, Nicole) This entry/document has been filed under seal pursuant to statute, rule or court order and access is restricted. Please login to CM/ECF to view document(s).
July 12, 2019 Filing 1101 MOTION to Seal Replies in Support of Motions to Exclude Filed. Notice Sent To: All Plaintiffs. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Reply Memorandum of Law in Support of Plaintiffs Motion to Exclude Opinions and Testimony of Drs. Christine S. Meyer and Mark S. Robbins Regarding Procompetitive Justifications of Reverse Payments, #2 Exhibit Reply Memorandum of Law in Support of Plaintiffs Motion to Exclude Opinions and Testimony of Drs. Christine S. Meyer, Mark S. Robbins, and Melissa A. Schilling Regarding Lack of Anticompetitive Effect from Product Hop)(Shadowen, Steve) This entry/document has been filed under seal pursuant to statute, rule or court order and access is restricted. Please login to CM/ECF to view document(s).
July 12, 2019 Filing 1100 MOTION to Seal Plaintiffs' Reply in Support of Motion to Partially Exclude Opinions and Testimony of Robert Dormer Filed. Notice Sent To: All Plaintiffs. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Sealed Document Plaintiffs' Reply in Support of Motion to Partially Exclude Opinions and Testimony of Robert Dormer)(Johnson, Kristen) This entry/document has been filed under seal pursuant to statute, rule or court order and access is restricted. Please login to CM/ECF to view document(s).
July 12, 2019 Filing 1099 MOTION to Seal Plaintiffs' Reply Memorandum in Support of Motion to Partially Exclude Opinions and Testimony of Stephen G. Kunin Filed. Notice Sent To: All Plaintiffs. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Sealed Document Plaintiffs' Reply Memorandum in Support of Motion to Partially Exclude Stephen G. Kunin)(Johnson, Kristen) This entry/document has been filed under seal pursuant to statute, rule or court order and access is restricted. Please login to CM/ECF to view document(s).
July 12, 2019 Filing 1098 MOTION to Seal Plaintiffs' Reply Memorandum in Support of Motion to Exclude the Opinions and Testimony of Judge T. John Ward Filed. Notice Sent To: All Plaintiffs. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Sealed Document Plaintiffs' Reply Memorandum in Support of Motion to Exclude the Opinions and Testimony of Judge T. John Ward)(Johnson, Kristen) This entry/document has been filed under seal pursuant to statute, rule or court order and access is restricted. Please login to CM/ECF to view document(s).
July 12, 2019 Filing 1097 MOTION to Seal Replies in Support of Daubert Motions Regarding Dr. Berneman, Mr. Green, and Dr. Meyer Filed. Notice Sent To: All Plaintiffs. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Sealed Document Reply in support of Plaintiffs' Motion to Exclude in Part the Expert Opinions of Christine Meyer, Ph.D. and Philip Green that Authorized Generics were Facing Legal Uncertainty, #2 Proposed Sealed Document Reply in support of Plaintiffs' Motion to Exclude the Expert Testimony of Dr. Louis Berneman, Philip Green, and Dr. Christine Meyer Regarding "Fair Value", #3 Proposed Sealed Document Reply in support of Plaintiffs' Motion to Exclude in Part the Expert Testimony of Philip Green)(Kohn, Peter) This entry/document has been filed under seal pursuant to statute, rule or court order and access is restricted. Please login to CM/ECF to view document(s).
July 12, 2019 Filing 1096 MOTION to Seal End-Payor Plaintiffs Reply Memorandum In Support Of Their Motion To Exclude The Merits Testimony And Opinions Of James W. Hughes, Ph.D. Filed. Notice Sent To: End Payor Plaintiffs, Actavis, Inc., Ahold USA, Inc., Albertson's, LLC, Mary Alexander, Allergan PLC, Allied Services Division Welfare Fund, American Sales Company, LLC, CVS Pharmacy, Inc., City of Providence, Direct Purchaser Class Plaintiffs, Electrical Workers 242 & 294 Health & Welfare Fund, Fraternal Order of Police Fort Lauderdale Lodge 31, HEB Grocery Company L.P., Laborers International Union of North America, Denise Loy, Lupin Ltd., Lupin Pharmaceuticals, Inc., New York Hotel Trades Council & Hotel Association of New York City, Inc. Health Benefits Fund, Painters District Council No. 30 Health & Welfare Fund, Rite-Aid Corporation, Rite-Aid Hdqtrs. Corp., Rochester Drug Co-Operative, Inc., Safeway, Inc., Teamsters Local 237 Welfare Benefits Fund, The Kroger Co., United Food and Commercial Workers Local 1776, Walgreen Co., Warner Chilcott Company, Inc., Warner Chilcott Company, LLC, Warner Chilcott Corporation, Warner Chilcott Holdings Company III, Ltd., Warner Chilcott Laboratories Ireland Limited, Warner Chilcott Public Limited Company, Warner Chilcott Sales (US), LLC, Warner Chilcott U.S., LLC, Watson Laboratories, Inc., Watson Pharmaceuticals, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Sealed Document)(Miller, Marvin) This entry/document has been filed under seal pursuant to statute, rule or court order and access is restricted. Please login to CM/ECF to view document(s).
July 12, 2019 Filing 1095 MOTION to Seal Plaintiffs' Reply in Support of Motion to Strike Defendants' Exhibit 70 (Declaration of Pramod Dahibhate) and to Preclude Defendants from Relying Thereon in Support of Their Motion for Summary Judgment, Any Other Motion, at a Hearing or at Trial Filed. Notice Sent To: All Plaintiffs. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Sealed Document Reply, #2 Proposed Sealed Document Declaration of Terence S. Ziegler, #3 Proposed Sealed Document Exhibit 1)(Meltzer, Joseph) This entry/document has been filed under seal pursuant to statute, rule or court order and access is restricted. Please login to CM/ECF to view document(s).
July 12, 2019 Filing 1094 MOTION to Seal Plaintiffs' Reply in Support of Motion to Exclude Certain Purported Expert Opinions and Testimony of Christopher Smith, Robert Dormer, and Mark Robbins Filed. Notice Sent To: All Plaintiffs. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Sealed Document Reply)(Meltzer, Joseph) This entry/document has been filed under seal pursuant to statute, rule or court order and access is restricted. Please login to CM/ECF to view document(s).
July 12, 2019 Filing 1093 MOTION to Seal Reply Memorandum in Support of Plaintiffs' Motion to Exclude in Part the Expert Opinions of Christine S. Meyer (ECF 867) Filed. Notice Sent To: All Plaintiffs. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Sealed Document Reply Memorandum in Support of Plaintiffs' Motion to Exclude in Part the Expert Opinions of Christine S. Meyer (ECF 867), #2 Proposed Sealed Document Exhibit 1 to Reply Memorandum in Support of Plaintiffs' Motion to Exclude in Part the Expert Opinions of Christine S. Meyer (ECF 867))(Neill, Anna) This entry/document has been filed under seal pursuant to statute, rule or court order and access is restricted. Please login to CM/ECF to view document(s).
July 12, 2019 Filing 1092 MOTION to Seal Reply Memorandum in Support of Plaintiffs' Motion to Exclude in Part the Expert Opinions of Dr. Philip Darney (ECF 865) Filed. Notice Sent To: All Plaintiffs. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Sealed Document Reply Memorandum in Support of Plaintiffs' Motion to Exclude in Part the Expert Opinions of Dr. Philip Darney (ECF 865))(Neill, Anna) This entry/document has been filed under seal pursuant to statute, rule or court order and access is restricted. Please login to CM/ECF to view document(s).
July 12, 2019 Filing 1091 MOTION to Seal REPLY MEMORANDUM IN SUPPORT OF PLAINTIFFS MOTION TO EXCLUDE PORTIONS OF TESTIMONY OF DEFENDANTS EXPERT DR. PIERRE-YVES CREMIEUX Filed. Notice Sent To: All Plaintiffs. (Attachments: #1 Supporting Memorandum)(Walker, Daniel) This entry/document has been filed under seal pursuant to statute, rule or court order and access is restricted. Please login to CM/ECF to view document(s).
July 12, 2019 Filing 1090 REPLY to Response re 1037 Response to Motion, PLAINTIFFS REPLY MEMORANDUM OF LAW IN SUPPORT OF MOTION TO EXCLUDE OPINIONS AND TESTIMONY OF PHARMACIST KAREN RYLE filed by All Plaintiffs. (Walker, Daniel)
July 12, 2019 Filing 1089 MOTION to Seal Plaintiffs' Reply In Support of Motion to Exclude Opinions and Testimony of Ronald Thisted Filed. Notice Sent To: Direct Purchaser Class Plaintiffs, Actavis, Inc., Ahold USA, Inc., Albertson's, LLC, Mary Alexander, Allergan PLC, Allied Services Division Welfare Fund, American Sales Company, LLC, CVS Pharmacy, Inc., Melisa Chrestman, Melissa Chrestman, City of Providence, Electrical Workers 242 & 294 Health & Welfare Fund, End Payor Plaintiffs, Fraternal Order of Police Fort Lauderdale Lodge 31, HEB Grocery Company L.P., Laborers International Union of North America, Denise Loy, Lupin Ltd., Lupin Pharmaceuticals, Inc., New York Hotel Trades Council & Hotel Association of New York City, Inc. Health Benefits Fund, Painters District Council No. 30 Health & Welfare Fund, Rite-Aid Corporation, Rite-Aid Hdqtrs. Corp., Rochester Drug Co-Operative, Inc., Safeway, Inc., Teamsters Local 237 Welfare Benefits Fund, The Kroger Co., United Food and Commercial Workers Local 1776, Walgreen Co., Warner Chilcott Company, Inc., Warner Chilcott Company, LLC, Warner Chilcott Corporation, Warner Chilcott Holdings Company III, Ltd., Warner Chilcott Laboratories Ireland Limited, Warner Chilcott Public Limited Company, Warner Chilcott Sales (US), LLC, Warner Chilcott U.S., LLC, Watson Laboratories, Inc., Watson Pharmaceuticals, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Sealed Document Reply In Support of Motion to Exclude Opinions and Testimony of Ronald Thisted)(Johnson, Kristen) This entry/document has been filed under seal pursuant to statute, rule or court order and access is restricted. Please login to CM/ECF to view document(s).
July 12, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 1088 INTERIM CASE MANAGEMENT ORDER 15. So Ordered by Chief Judge William E. Smith on 7/12/2019. (Jackson, Ryan)
July 11, 2019 Opinion or Order TEXT ORDER granting #1064 Motion to Unseal Document Certain Daubert Oppositions. So Ordered by Chief Judge William E. Smith on 7/11/2019. (Jackson, Ryan)
July 10, 2019 Filing 1085 REDACTION to #1066 Response to Motion,, Redacted Appendix C to Defendants' Opposition to Plaintiffs' Motion to Exclude Certain Opinions and Testimony of Experts Christopher Smith, Robert Dormer and Dr. Mark Robbins by Warner Chilcott Company, Inc., Warner Chilcott Company, LLC, Warner Chilcott Corporation, Warner Chilcott Holdings Company III, Ltd., Warner Chilcott Laboratories Ireland Limited, Warner Chilcott Public Limited Company, Warner Chilcott Sales (US), LLC, Warner Chilcott U.S., LLC, Watson Laboratories, Inc., Watson Pharmaceuticals, Inc.. (Benjamin, Nicole)
July 10, 2019 Filing 1084 REDACTION to #1066 Response to Motion,, Redacted Appendix B to Defendants' Opposition to Plaintiffs' Motion to Exclude Certain Opinions and Testimony of Experts Christopher Smith, Robert Dormer and Dr. Mark Robbins by Warner Chilcott Company, Inc., Warner Chilcott Company, LLC, Warner Chilcott Corporation, Warner Chilcott Holdings Company III, Ltd., Warner Chilcott Laboratories Ireland Limited, Warner Chilcott Public Limited Company, Warner Chilcott Sales (US), LLC, Warner Chilcott U.S., LLC, Watson Laboratories, Inc., Watson Pharmaceuticals, Inc.. (Benjamin, Nicole)
July 10, 2019 Filing 1083 REDACTION to #1066 Response to Motion,, Redacted Appendix A to Defendants' Opposition to Plaintiffs' Motion to Exclude Certain Opinions and Testimony of Experts Christopher Smith, Robert Dormer and Dr. Mark Robbins by Warner Chilcott Company, Inc., Warner Chilcott Company, LLC, Warner Chilcott Corporation, Warner Chilcott Holdings Company III, Ltd., Warner Chilcott Laboratories Ireland Limited, Warner Chilcott Public Limited Company, Warner Chilcott Sales (US), LLC, Warner Chilcott U.S., LLC, Watson Laboratories, Inc., Watson Pharmaceuticals, Inc.. (Benjamin, Nicole)
July 10, 2019 Filing 1082 EXHIBIT IN SUPPORT by Warner Chilcott Company, Inc., Warner Chilcott Company, LLC, Warner Chilcott Corporation, Warner Chilcott Holdings Company III, Ltd., Warner Chilcott Laboratories Ireland Limited, Warner Chilcott Public Limited Company, Warner Chilcott Sales (US), LLC, Warner Chilcott U.S., LLC, Watson Laboratories, Inc., Watson Pharmaceuticals, Inc. in support of #1017 Declaration, (Public Version). (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 16, #2 Exhibit 17, #3 Exhibit 18, #4 Exhibit 20, #5 Exhibit 30, #6 Exhibit 31, #7 Exhibit 35, #8 Exhibit 36, #9 Exhibit 39, #10 Exhibit 40, #11 Exhibit 49, #12 Exhibit 52, #13 Exhibit 54, #14 Exhibit 61, #15 Exhibit 63)(Benjamin, Nicole)
July 10, 2019 Filing 1081 RESPONSE In Opposition to #881 MOTION to Partially Exclude the Opinions and Testimony of Robert A. Dormer (Public Version) filed by Warner Chilcott Company, Inc., Warner Chilcott Company, LLC, Warner Chilcott Corporation, Warner Chilcott Holdings Company III, Ltd., Warner Chilcott Laboratories Ireland Limited, Warner Chilcott Public Limited Company, Warner Chilcott Sales (US), LLC, Warner Chilcott U.S., LLC, Watson Laboratories, Inc., Watson Pharmaceuticals, Inc.. Replies due by 7/17/2019. (Benjamin, Nicole)
July 10, 2019 Filing 1080 RESPONSE In Opposition to 906 MOTION to Exclude Portions of Testimony of Defendants' Expert Dr. Pierre-Yves Cremieux (Public Version) filed by Warner Chilcott Company, Inc., Warner Chilcott Company, LLC, Warner Chilcott Corporation, Warner Chilcott Holdings Company III, Ltd., Warner Chilcott Laboratories Ireland Limited, Warner Chilcott Public Limited Company, Warner Chilcott Sales (US), LLC, Warner Chilcott U.S., LLC, Watson Laboratories, Inc., Watson Pharmaceuticals, Inc.. Replies due by 7/17/2019. (Benjamin, Nicole)
July 10, 2019 Filing 1079 RESPONSE In Opposition to #876 MOTION To Exclude The Merits Testimony And Opinions Of James W. Hughes, Ph.D. (Public Version) filed by Warner Chilcott Company, Inc., Warner Chilcott Company, LLC, Warner Chilcott Corporation, Warner Chilcott Holdings Company III, Ltd., Warner Chilcott Laboratories Ireland Limited, Warner Chilcott Public Limited Company, Warner Chilcott Sales (US), LLC, Warner Chilcott U.S., LLC, Watson Laboratories, Inc., Watson Pharmaceuticals, Inc.. Replies due by 7/17/2019. (Benjamin, Nicole)
July 10, 2019 Filing 1078 RESPONSE In Opposition to #903 MOTION to Exclude in Part the Expert Testimony of Philip Green (Public Version) filed by Warner Chilcott Company, Inc., Warner Chilcott Company, LLC, Warner Chilcott Corporation, Warner Chilcott Holdings Company III, Ltd., Warner Chilcott Laboratories Ireland Limited, Warner Chilcott Public Limited Company, Warner Chilcott Sales (US), LLC, Warner Chilcott U.S., LLC, Watson Laboratories, Inc., Watson Pharmaceuticals, Inc.. Replies due by 7/17/2019. (Benjamin, Nicole)
July 10, 2019 Filing 1077 RESPONSE In Opposition to #902 MOTION Motion to Exclude the Expert Testimony of Dr. Louis Berneman, Philip Green, and Dr. Christine Meyer Regarding "Fair Value" (Public Version) filed by Warner Chilcott Company, Inc., Warner Chilcott Company, LLC, Warner Chilcott Corporation, Warner Chilcott Holdings Company III, Ltd., Warner Chilcott Laboratories Ireland Limited, Warner Chilcott Public Limited Company, Warner Chilcott Sales (US), LLC, Warner Chilcott U.S., LLC, Watson Laboratories, Inc., Watson Pharmaceuticals, Inc.. Replies due by 7/17/2019. (Benjamin, Nicole)
July 10, 2019 Filing 1076 RESPONSE In Opposition to #867 MOTION to Exclude In Part Expert Opinions of Christine S. Meyer (Public Version) filed by Warner Chilcott Company, Inc., Warner Chilcott Company, LLC, Warner Chilcott Corporation, Warner Chilcott Holdings Company III, Ltd., Warner Chilcott Laboratories Ireland Limited, Warner Chilcott Public Limited Company, Warner Chilcott Sales (US), LLC, Warner Chilcott U.S., LLC, Watson Laboratories, Inc., Watson Pharmaceuticals, Inc.. Replies due by 7/17/2019. (Benjamin, Nicole)
July 10, 2019 Filing 1075 RESPONSE In Opposition to #865 MOTION to Exclude In Part Expert Opinions of Dr. Philip D. Darney (Public Version) filed by Warner Chilcott Company, Inc., Warner Chilcott Company, LLC, Warner Chilcott Corporation, Warner Chilcott Holdings Company III, Ltd., Warner Chilcott Laboratories Ireland Limited, Warner Chilcott Public Limited Company, Warner Chilcott Sales (US), LLC, Warner Chilcott U.S., LLC, Watson Laboratories, Inc., Watson Pharmaceuticals, Inc.. Replies due by 7/17/2019. (Benjamin, Nicole)
July 10, 2019 Filing 1074 RESPONSE In Opposition to #895 MOTION to Exclude the Opinions and Testimony of Judge John T. Ward (Public Version) filed by Warner Chilcott Company, Inc., Warner Chilcott Company, LLC, Warner Chilcott Corporation, Warner Chilcott Holdings Company III, Ltd., Warner Chilcott Laboratories Ireland Limited, Warner Chilcott Public Limited Company, Warner Chilcott Sales (US), LLC, Warner Chilcott U.S., LLC, Watson Laboratories, Inc., Watson Pharmaceuticals, Inc.. Replies due by 7/17/2019. (Benjamin, Nicole)
July 10, 2019 Filing 1073 RESPONSE In Opposition to #872 MOTION Exclude Certain Purported Expert Opinions and Testimony of Christopher Smith, Robert Dormer, and Mark Robbins (Public Version) filed by Warner Chilcott Company, Inc., Warner Chilcott Company, LLC, Warner Chilcott Corporation, Warner Chilcott Holdings Company III, Ltd., Warner Chilcott Laboratories Ireland Limited, Warner Chilcott Public Limited Company, Warner Chilcott Sales (US), LLC, Warner Chilcott U.S., LLC, Watson Laboratories, Inc., Watson Pharmaceuticals, Inc.. Replies due by 7/17/2019. (Benjamin, Nicole)
July 10, 2019 Filing 1072 RESPONSE In Opposition to #871 MOTION to Strike Plaintiffs' Motion to Strike Defendants Exhibit 70 (Declaration of Pramod Dahibhate) and to Preclude Defendants from Relying Thereon in Support of Their Motion for Summary Judgment, Any Other Motion, at a Hearing, or at Tria (Public Version) filed by Warner Chilcott Company, Inc., Warner Chilcott Company, LLC, Warner Chilcott Corporation, Warner Chilcott Holdings Company III, Ltd., Warner Chilcott Laboratories Ireland Limited, Warner Chilcott Public Limited Company, Warner Chilcott Sales (US), LLC, Warner Chilcott U.S., LLC, Watson Laboratories, Inc., Watson Pharmaceuticals, Inc.. Replies due by 7/17/2019. (Benjamin, Nicole)
July 10, 2019 Filing 1071 RESPONSE In Opposition to #899 MOTION to Partially Exclude the Opinions and Testimony of Stephen G. Kunin (Public Version) filed by Warner Chilcott Company, Inc., Warner Chilcott Company, LLC, Warner Chilcott Corporation, Warner Chilcott Holdings Company III, Ltd., Warner Chilcott Laboratories Ireland Limited, Warner Chilcott Public Limited Company, Warner Chilcott Sales (US), LLC, Warner Chilcott U.S., LLC, Watson Laboratories, Inc., Watson Pharmaceuticals, Inc.. Replies due by 7/17/2019. (Benjamin, Nicole)
July 10, 2019 Filing 1070 RESPONSE In Opposition to #897 MOTION to Partially Exclude the Opinions and Testimony of Ronald Thisted (Public Version) filed by Warner Chilcott Company, Inc., Warner Chilcott Company, LLC, Warner Chilcott Corporation, Warner Chilcott Holdings Company III, Ltd., Warner Chilcott Laboratories Ireland Limited, Warner Chilcott Public Limited Company, Warner Chilcott Sales (US), LLC, Warner Chilcott U.S., LLC, Watson Laboratories, Inc., Watson Pharmaceuticals, Inc.. Replies due by 7/17/2019. (Benjamin, Nicole)
July 10, 2019 Filing 1069 RESPONSE In Opposition to #901 MOTION Motion to Exclude in Part the Expert Opinions of Christine Meyer, Ph.D. and Philip Green that Authorized Generics Were Facing Legal Uncertainty (Public Version) filed by Warner Chilcott Company, Inc., Warner Chilcott Company, LLC, Warner Chilcott Corporation, Warner Chilcott Holdings Company III, Ltd., Warner Chilcott Laboratories Ireland Limited, Warner Chilcott Public Limited Company, Warner Chilcott Sales (US), LLC, Warner Chilcott U.S., LLC, Watson Laboratories, Inc., Watson Pharmaceuticals, Inc.. Replies due by 7/17/2019. (Benjamin, Nicole)
July 10, 2019 Filing 1068 RESPONSE In Opposition to 905 MOTION to Exclude the Expert Opinions of Karen Ryle (Public Version) filed by Warner Chilcott Company, Inc., Warner Chilcott Company, LLC, Warner Chilcott Corporation, Warner Chilcott Holdings Company III, Ltd., Warner Chilcott Laboratories Ireland Limited, Warner Chilcott Public Limited Company, Warner Chilcott Sales (US), LLC, Warner Chilcott U.S., LLC, Watson Laboratories, Inc., Watson Pharmaceuticals, Inc.. Replies due by 7/17/2019. (Benjamin, Nicole)
July 10, 2019 Filing 1067 RESPONSE In Opposition to #875 MOTION to Exclude Opinions and Testimony of Drs. Christine S. Meyer, Mark S. Robbins, and Melissa A. Schilling Regarding Lack of Anticompetitive Effect from Product Hop (Public Version) filed by Warner Chilcott Company, Inc., Warner Chilcott Company, LLC, Warner Chilcott Corporation, Warner Chilcott Holdings Company III, Ltd., Warner Chilcott Laboratories Ireland Limited, Warner Chilcott Public Limited Company, Warner Chilcott Sales (US), LLC, Warner Chilcott U.S., LLC, Watson Laboratories, Inc., Watson Pharmaceuticals, Inc.. Replies due by 7/17/2019. (Benjamin, Nicole)
July 10, 2019 Filing 1066 RESPONSE In Opposition to #874 MOTION to Exclude Opinions and Testimony of Drs. Christine S. Meyer and Mark S. Robbins Regarding Procompetitive Justifications of Reverse Payments (Public Version) filed by Warner Chilcott Company, Inc., Warner Chilcott Company, LLC, Warner Chilcott Corporation, Warner Chilcott Holdings Company III, Ltd., Warner Chilcott Laboratories Ireland Limited, Warner Chilcott Public Limited Company, Warner Chilcott Sales (US), LLC, Warner Chilcott U.S., LLC, Watson Laboratories, Inc., Watson Pharmaceuticals, Inc.. Replies due by 7/17/2019. (Benjamin, Nicole)
July 10, 2019 Filing 1065 NOTICE by Warner Chilcott Company, Inc., Warner Chilcott Company, LLC, Warner Chilcott Corporation, Warner Chilcott Holdings Company III, Ltd., Warner Chilcott Laboratories Ireland Limited, Warner Chilcott Public Limited Company, Warner Chilcott Sales (US), LLC, Warner Chilcott U.S., LLC, Watson Laboratories, Inc., Watson Pharmaceuticals, Inc. Regarding Finality of First Circuit's In re Asacol Antitrust Litigation Decision (Benjamin, Nicole)
July 10, 2019 Filing 1064 MOTION to Unseal Document Unopposed Motion to Unseal Certain Daubert Oppositions filed by All Plaintiffs. Responses due by 7/24/2019. (Meltzer, Joseph)
July 10, 2019 Filing 1063 REDACTION to 1033 Response to Motion, Plaintiffs' Opposition to Defendants' Motion to Exclude the Opinions and Testimony of Plaintiffs' Expert Dr. Thomas McGuire by All Plaintiffs. (Meltzer, Joseph)
July 10, 2019 Filing 1062 REDACTION to 980 Statement of Undisputed Facts, by All Plaintiffs. (Meltzer, Joseph)
July 10, 2019 Filing 1061 REDACTION to 979 Response in Opposition, Plaintiffs' Response to Defendants' Statement of Undisputed Facts by All Plaintiffs. (Meltzer, Joseph)
July 10, 2019 Filing 1060 REDACTION to 978 Response to Motion, Plaintiffs' Opposition to Defendants' Motion for Summary Judgment by All Plaintiffs. (Meltzer, Joseph)
July 10, 2019 Opinion or Order TEXT ORDER granting #1052 Motion to Seal; granting #1053 Motion to Seal; granting #1054 Motion to Seal; granting #1055 Motion to Seal. So Ordered by Chief Judge William E. Smith on 7/10/2019. (Jackson, Ryan)
July 9, 2019 Filing 1059 DECLARATION re #1056 MOTION for Entry of an Order Approving the Form and Manner of Notice and Appointing Notice Administrator Declaration of Kristen A. Johnson by Direct Purchaser Class Plaintiffs. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit 2, #3 Exhibit 3, #4 Exhibit 4, #5 Exhibit 5, #6 Exhibit 6, #7 Exhibit 7, #8 Exhibit 8, #9 Exhibit 9)(Johnson, Kristen)
July 9, 2019 Filing 1058 DECLARATION re #1056 MOTION for Entry of an Order Approving the Form and Manner of Notice and Appointing Notice Administrator Declaration of William W. Wickersham by Direct Purchaser Class Plaintiffs. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A)(Johnson, Kristen)
July 9, 2019 Filing 1057 MEMORANDUM IN SUPPORT by Direct Purchaser Class Plaintiffs in support of #1056 MOTION for Entry of an Order Approving the Form and Manner of Notice and Appointing Notice Administrator . (Johnson, Kristen)
July 9, 2019 Filing 1056 MOTION for Entry of an Order Approving the Form and Manner of Notice and Appointing Notice Administrator filed by Direct Purchaser Class Plaintiffs. Responses due by 7/23/2019. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Johnson, Kristen)
July 8, 2019 Filing 1055 MOTION to Seal Defendants' Reply Memorandum in Support of Summary Judgment Filed. Notice Sent To: Warner Chilcott Holdings Company III, Ltd., Warner Chilcott Corporation, Warner Chilcott Public Limited Company, Watson Laboratories, Inc., Warner Chilcott Company, LLC, Warner Chilcott Sales (US), LLC, Watson Pharmaceuticals, Inc., Warner Chilcott Laboratories Ireland Limited, Warner Chilcott U.S., LLC, Warner Chilcott Company, Inc., Actavis, Inc., Ahold USA, Inc., Albertson's, LLC, Mary Alexander, Allergan PLC, Allied Services Division Welfare Fund, American Sales Company, LLC, CVS Pharmacy, Inc., Melisa Chrestman, Melissa Chrestman, City of Providence, Direct Purchaser Class Plaintiffs, Electrical Workers 242 & 294 Health & Welfare Fund, End Payor Plaintiffs, Fraternal Order of Police Fort Lauderdale Lodge 31, HEB Grocery Company L.P., Laborers International Union of North America, Denise Loy, Lupin Ltd., Lupin Pharmaceuticals, Inc., New York Hotel Trades Council & Hotel Association of New York City, Inc. Health Benefits Fund, Painters District Council No. 30 Health & Welfare Fund, Rite-Aid Corporation, Rite-Aid Hdqtrs. Corp., Rochester Drug Co-Operative, Inc., Safeway, Inc., Teamsters Local 237 Welfare Benefits Fund, The Kroger Co., United Food and Commercial Workers Local 1776, Walgreen Co.. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Sealed Document Defendants' Reply Memorandum in Support of Summary Judgment)(Benjamin, Nicole) This entry/document has been filed under seal pursuant to statute, rule or court order and access is restricted. Please login to CM/ECF to view document(s).
July 8, 2019 Filing 1054 MOTION to Seal Defendants' Statement of Disputed Facts in Response to Plaintiffs' Additional Statement of Material Undisputed Facts Filed. Notice Sent To: Warner Chilcott Holdings Company III, Ltd., Warner Chilcott Corporation, Warner Chilcott Public Limited Company, Watson Laboratories, Inc., Warner Chilcott Company, LLC, Warner Chilcott Sales (US), LLC, Watson Pharmaceuticals, Inc., Warner Chilcott Laboratories Ireland Limited, Warner Chilcott U.S., LLC, Warner Chilcott Company, Inc., Actavis, Inc., Ahold USA, Inc., Albertson's, LLC, Mary Alexander, Allergan PLC, Allied Services Division Welfare Fund, American Sales Company, LLC, CVS Pharmacy, Inc., Melisa Chrestman, Melissa Chrestman, City of Providence, Direct Purchaser Class Plaintiffs, Electrical Workers 242 & 294 Health & Welfare Fund, End Payor Plaintiffs, Fraternal Order of Police Fort Lauderdale Lodge 31, HEB Grocery Company L.P., Laborers International Union of North America, Denise Loy, Lupin Ltd., Lupin Pharmaceuticals, Inc., New York Hotel Trades Council & Hotel Association of New York City, Inc. Health Benefits Fund, Painters District Council No. 30 Health & Welfare Fund, Rite-Aid Corporation, Rite-Aid Hdqtrs. Corp., Rochester Drug Co-Operative, Inc., Safeway, Inc., Teamsters Local 237 Welfare Benefits Fund, The Kroger Co., United Food and Commercial Workers Local 1776, Walgreen Co.. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Sealed Document Defendants' Statement of Disputed Facts in Response to Plaintiffs' Additional Statement of Material Undisputed Facts)(Benjamin, Nicole) This entry/document has been filed under seal pursuant to statute, rule or court order and access is restricted. Please login to CM/ECF to view document(s).
July 8, 2019 Filing 1053 MOTION to Seal Exhibits 288-293 in Support of Defendants' Statement of Disputed Facts in Response to Plaintiffs' Additional Statement of Material Undisputed Facts Filed. Notice Sent To: Warner Chilcott Holdings Company III, Ltd., Warner Chilcott Corporation, Warner Chilcott Public Limited Company, Watson Laboratories, Inc., Warner Chilcott Company, LLC, Warner Chilcott Sales (US), LLC, Watson Pharmaceuticals, Inc., Warner Chilcott Laboratories Ireland Limited, Warner Chilcott U.S., LLC, Warner Chilcott Company, Inc., Actavis, Inc., Ahold USA, Inc., Albertson's, LLC, Mary Alexander, Allergan PLC, Allied Services Division Welfare Fund, American Sales Company, LLC, CVS Pharmacy, Inc., Melisa Chrestman, Melissa Chrestman, City of Providence, Direct Purchaser Class Plaintiffs, Electrical Workers 242 & 294 Health & Welfare Fund, End Payor Plaintiffs, Fraternal Order of Police Fort Lauderdale Lodge 31, HEB Grocery Company L.P., Laborers International Union of North America, Denise Loy, Lupin Ltd., Lupin Pharmaceuticals, Inc., New York Hotel Trades Council & Hotel Association of New York City, Inc. Health Benefits Fund, Painters District Council No. 30 Health & Welfare Fund, Rite-Aid Corporation, Rite-Aid Hdqtrs. Corp., Rochester Drug Co-Operative, Inc., Safeway, Inc., Teamsters Local 237 Welfare Benefits Fund, The Kroger Co., United Food and Commercial Workers Local 1776, Walgreen Co.. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Sealed Document Exhibit 288, #2 Proposed Sealed Document Exhibit 289, #3 Proposed Sealed Document Exhibit 290, #4 Proposed Sealed Document Exhibit 291, #5 Proposed Sealed Document Exhibit 292, #6 Proposed Sealed Document Exhibit 293)(Benjamin, Nicole) This entry/document has been filed under seal pursuant to statute, rule or court order and access is restricted. Please login to CM/ECF to view document(s).
July 8, 2019 Filing 1052 MOTION to Seal Exhibits 280-287 in Support of Defendants' Statement of Disputed Facts in Response to Plaintiffs' Additional Statement of Material Undisputed Facts Filed. Notice Sent To: Warner Chilcott Holdings Company III, Ltd., Warner Chilcott Corporation, Warner Chilcott Public Limited Company, Watson Laboratories, Inc., Warner Chilcott Company, LLC, Warner Chilcott Sales (US), LLC, Watson Pharmaceuticals, Inc., Warner Chilcott Laboratories Ireland Limited, Warner Chilcott U.S., LLC, Warner Chilcott Company, Inc., Actavis, Inc., Ahold USA, Inc., Albertson's, LLC, Mary Alexander, Allergan PLC, Allied Services Division Welfare Fund, American Sales Company, LLC, CVS Pharmacy, Inc., Melisa Chrestman, Melissa Chrestman, City of Providence, Direct Purchaser Class Plaintiffs, Electrical Workers 242 & 294 Health & Welfare Fund, End Payor Plaintiffs, Fraternal Order of Police Fort Lauderdale Lodge 31, HEB Grocery Company L.P., Laborers International Union of North America, Denise Loy, Lupin Ltd., Lupin Pharmaceuticals, Inc., New York Hotel Trades Council & Hotel Association of New York City, Inc. Health Benefits Fund, Painters District Council No. 30 Health & Welfare Fund, Rite-Aid Corporation, Rite-Aid Hdqtrs. Corp., Rochester Drug Co-Operative, Inc., Safeway, Inc., Teamsters Local 237 Welfare Benefits Fund, The Kroger Co., United Food and Commercial Workers Local 1776, Walgreen Co.. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Sealed Document Exhibit 280, #2 Proposed Sealed Document Exhibit 281, #3 Proposed Sealed Document Exhibit 282, #4 Proposed Sealed Document Exhibit 283, #5 Proposed Sealed Document Exhibit 284, #6 Proposed Sealed Document Exhibit 285, #7 Proposed Sealed Document Exhibit 286, #8 Proposed Sealed Document Exhibit 287)(Benjamin, Nicole) This entry/document has been filed under seal pursuant to statute, rule or court order and access is restricted. Please login to CM/ECF to view document(s).
July 8, 2019 Filing 1051 DECLARATION of Katherine Dyson in Support of Defendants' Motion for Summary Judgment by Warner Chilcott Company, Inc., Warner Chilcott Company, LLC, Warner Chilcott Corporation, Warner Chilcott Holdings Company III, Ltd., Warner Chilcott Laboratories Ireland Limited, Warner Chilcott Public Limited Company, Warner Chilcott Sales (US), LLC, Warner Chilcott U.S., LLC, Watson Laboratories, Inc., Watson Pharmaceuticals, Inc.. (Benjamin, Nicole)
July 2, 2019 Opinion or Order TEXT ORDER granting #989 MOTION to File Corrected Exhibits and Declaration in Support of Defendants' Statement of Undisputed Facts. So Ordered by Chief Judge William E. Smith on 7/2/2019. (Jackson, Ryan)
July 2, 2019 Opinion or Order TEXT ORDER: The parties are hereby directed to submit a joint letter with proposed redactions, by email to Case Manager Ryan Jackson, within two weeks of the entry of this Sealed Opinion and Order (ECF No. 1050) or the Opinion and Order will be unsealed and filed on the public docket as is. So Ordered by Chief Judge William E. Smith on 7/2/2019. (Jackson, Ryan)
July 2, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 1050 OPINION AND ORDER granting #513 Motion to Certify Class; denying #570 MOTION Exclude the Opinions and Testimony of Direct Purchaser Plaintiffs' Expert Jeffrey J. Leitzinger. So Ordered by Chief Judge William E. Smith on 7/2/2019. (Jackson, Ryan) Modified on 7/16/2019: Pursuant to the Text Order entered by this Court on 7/2/19, and in the absence of any objection by the parties, this Opinion and Order has been unsealed. (Jackson, Ryan)
June 28, 2019 Filing 1049 STATUS REPORT (Joint Status Report Regarding Case Schedule) by Warner Chilcott Company, Inc., Warner Chilcott Company, LLC, Warner Chilcott Corporation, Warner Chilcott Holdings Company III, Ltd., Warner Chilcott Laboratories Ireland Limited, Warner Chilcott Public Limited Company, Warner Chilcott Sales (US), LLC, Warner Chilcott U.S., LLC, Watson Laboratories, Inc., Watson Pharmaceuticals, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B)(Benjamin, Nicole)
June 28, 2019 Filing 1048 STATUS REPORT (Joint Status Report Regarding Daubert Motions) by Warner Chilcott Company, Inc., Warner Chilcott Company, LLC, Warner Chilcott Corporation, Warner Chilcott Holdings Company III, Ltd., Warner Chilcott Laboratories Ireland Limited, Warner Chilcott Public Limited Company, Warner Chilcott Sales (US), LLC, Warner Chilcott U.S., LLC, Watson Laboratories, Inc., Watson Pharmaceuticals, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A)(Benjamin, Nicole)
June 25, 2019 Opinion or Order TEXT ORDER granting #928 Motion to Unseal Document ; finding as moot #930 Motion to Unseal Document ; granting #959 Motion to Unseal Document ; finding as moot #961 Motion to Unseal Document ; granting #963 Motion to Unseal Document ; granting #964 Motion to Unseal Document ; granting #965 Motion to Unseal Document ; granting #966 Motion to Unseal Document ; granting #967 Motion to Unseal Document ; granting #985 Motion to Unseal Document ; granting #986 Motion to Unseal Document. So Ordered by Chief Judge William E. Smith on 6/25/2019. (Jackson, Ryan)
June 21, 2019 Filing 1023 REDACTION to #988 Notice (Other) by Direct Purchaser Class Plaintiffs of Filing Materials from February 11, 2019 Hearing on Motion for Class Certification and March 15,2019 Hearing on Motion for Summary Judgment by Direct Purchaser Class Plaintiffs. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit 2, #3 Exhibit 3, #4 Exhibit 4, #5 Exhibit 5)(Walker, Daniel)
June 20, 2019 Opinion or Order TEXT ORDER granting #995 Motion to Seal; granting #996 Motion to Seal; granting #997 Motion to Seal; granting #998 Motion to Seal; granting #999 Motion to Seal; granting #1000 Motion to Seal; granting #1001 Motion to Seal; granting #1002 Motion to Seal; granting #1003 Motion to Seal; granting #1004 Motion to Seal; granting #1005 Motion to Seal; granting #1006 Motion to Seal; granting #1007 Motion to Seal; granting #1008 Motion to Seal; granting #1009 Motion to Seal; granting #1010 Motion to Seal; granting #1011 Motion to Seal; granting #1012 Motion to Seal; granting #1013 Motion to Seal; granting #1014 Motion to Seal; granting #1015 Motion to Seal; granting #1016 Motion to Seal; granting #1018 Motion to Seal; granting #1019 Motion to Seal; granting #1020 Motion to Seal; granting #1021 Motion to Seal; granting #1022 Motion to Seal. So Ordered by Chief Judge William E. Smith on 6/20/2019. (Jackson, Ryan)
June 19, 2019 Filing 1022 MOTION to Seal Defendants' Opposition to Plaintiffs' Motion to Exclude Certain Opinions and Testimony of Experts Christopher Smith, Robert Dormer and Dr. Mark Robbins (ECF No. 872) Filed. Notice Sent To: Warner Chilcott Holdings Company III, Ltd., Warner Chilcott Corporation, Warner Chilcott Public Limited Company, Watson Laboratories, Inc., Warner Chilcott Company, LLC, Warner Chilcott Sales (US), LLC, Watson Pharmaceuticals, Inc., Warner Chilcott Laboratories Ireland Limited, Warner Chilcott U.S., LLC, Warner Chilcott Company, Inc., Actavis, Inc., Ahold USA, Inc., Albertson's, LLC, Mary Alexander, Allergan PLC, Allied Services Division Welfare Fund, American Sales Company, LLC, CVS Pharmacy, Inc., Melisa Chrestman, Melissa Chrestman, City of Providence, Direct Purchaser Class Plaintiffs, Electrical Workers 242 & 294 Health & Welfare Fund, End Payor Plaintiffs, Fraternal Order of Police Fort Lauderdale Lodge 31, HEB Grocery Company L.P., Laborers International Union of North America, Denise Loy, Lupin Ltd., Lupin Pharmaceuticals, Inc., New York Hotel Trades Council & Hotel Association of New York City, Inc. Health Benefits Fund, Painters District Council No. 30 Health & Welfare Fund, Rite-Aid Corporation, Rite-Aid Hdqtrs. Corp., Rochester Drug Co-Operative, Inc., Safeway, Inc., Teamsters Local 237 Welfare Benefits Fund, The Kroger Co., United Food and Commercial Workers Local 1776, Walgreen Co.. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Sealed Document Defendants' Opposition to Plaintiffs' Motion to Exclude Certain Opinions and Testimony of Experts Christopher Smith, Robert Dormer and Dr. Mark Robbins (ECF No. 872), #2 Proposed Sealed Document Appendix A, #3 Proposed Sealed Document Appendix B, #4 Proposed Sealed Document Appendix C)(Benjamin, Nicole) This entry/document has been filed under seal pursuant to statute, rule or court order and access is restricted. Please login to CM/ECF to view document(s).
June 19, 2019 Filing 1021 MOTION to Seal Exhibits 46-63 to the Declaration of Lauren M. Papenhausen in Support of Defendants' Opposition to Plaintiffs' May 17, 2019 Motions Filed. Notice Sent To: Warner Chilcott Holdings Company III, Ltd., Warner Chilcott Corporation, Warner Chilcott Public Limited Company, Watson Laboratories, Inc., Warner Chilcott Company, LLC, Warner Chilcott Sales (US), LLC, Watson Pharmaceuticals, Inc., Warner Chilcott Laboratories Ireland Limited, Warner Chilcott U.S., LLC, Warner Chilcott Company, Inc., Actavis, Inc., Ahold USA, Inc., Albertson's, LLC, Mary Alexander, Allergan PLC, Allied Services Division Welfare Fund, American Sales Company, LLC, CVS Pharmacy, Inc., Melisa Chrestman, Melissa Chrestman, City of Providence, Direct Purchaser Class Plaintiffs, Electrical Workers 242 & 294 Health & Welfare Fund, End Payor Plaintiffs, Fraternal Order of Police Fort Lauderdale Lodge 31, HEB Grocery Company L.P., Laborers International Union of North America, Denise Loy, Lupin Ltd., Lupin Pharmaceuticals, Inc., New York Hotel Trades Council & Hotel Association of New York City, Inc. Health Benefits Fund, Painters District Council No. 30 Health & Welfare Fund, Rite-Aid Corporation, Rite-Aid Hdqtrs. Corp., Rochester Drug Co-Operative, Inc., Safeway, Inc., Teamsters Local 237 Welfare Benefits Fund, The Kroger Co., United Food and Commercial Workers Local 1776, Walgreen Co.. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Sealed Document Exhibit 46, #2 Proposed Sealed Document Exhibit 47, #3 Proposed Sealed Document Exhibit 48, #4 Proposed Sealed Document Exhibit 49, #5 Proposed Sealed Document Exhibit 50, #6 Proposed Sealed Document Exhibit 51, #7 Proposed Sealed Document Exhibit 52, #8 Proposed Sealed Document Exhibit 53, #9 Proposed Sealed Document Exhibit 54, #10 Proposed Sealed Document Exhibit 55, #11 Proposed Sealed Document Exhibit 56, #12 Proposed Sealed Document Exhibit 57, #13 Proposed Sealed Document Exhibit 58, #14 Proposed Sealed Document Exhibit 59, #15 Proposed Sealed Document Exhibit 60, #16 Proposed Sealed Document Exhibit 61, #17 Proposed Sealed Document Exhibit 62, #18 Proposed Sealed Document Exhibit 63)(Benjamin, Nicole) This entry/document has been filed under seal pursuant to statute, rule or court order and access is restricted. Please login to CM/ECF to view document(s).
June 19, 2019 Filing 1020 MOTION to Seal Exhibits 33-45 to the Declaration of Lauren M. Papenhausen in Support of Defendants' Opposition to Plaintiffs' May 17, 2019 Motions Filed. Notice Sent To: Warner Chilcott Holdings Company III, Ltd., Warner Chilcott Corporation, Warner Chilcott Public Limited Company, Watson Laboratories, Inc., Warner Chilcott Company, LLC, Warner Chilcott Sales (US), LLC, Watson Pharmaceuticals, Inc., Warner Chilcott Laboratories Ireland Limited, Warner Chilcott U.S., LLC, Warner Chilcott Company, Inc., Actavis, Inc., Ahold USA, Inc., Albertson's, LLC, Mary Alexander, Allergan PLC, Allied Services Division Welfare Fund, American Sales Company, LLC, CVS Pharmacy, Inc., Melisa Chrestman, Melissa Chrestman, City of Providence, Direct Purchaser Class Plaintiffs, Electrical Workers 242 & 294 Health & Welfare Fund, End Payor Plaintiffs, Fraternal Order of Police Fort Lauderdale Lodge 31, HEB Grocery Company L.P., Laborers International Union of North America, Denise Loy, Lupin Ltd., Lupin Pharmaceuticals, Inc., New York Hotel Trades Council & Hotel Association of New York City, Inc. Health Benefits Fund, Painters District Council No. 30 Health & Welfare Fund, Rite-Aid Corporation, Rite-Aid Hdqtrs. Corp., Rochester Drug Co-Operative, Inc., Safeway, Inc., Teamsters Local 237 Welfare Benefits Fund, The Kroger Co., United Food and Commercial Workers Local 1776, Walgreen Co.. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Sealed Document Exhibit 33, #2 Proposed Sealed Document Exhibit 34, #3 Proposed Sealed Document Exhibit 35, #4 Proposed Sealed Document Exhibit 36, #5 Proposed Sealed Document Exhibit 37, #6 Proposed Sealed Document Exhibit 38, #7 Proposed Sealed Document Exhibit 39, #8 Proposed Sealed Document Exhibit 40, #9 Proposed Sealed Document Exhibit 41, #10 Proposed Sealed Document Exhibit 42, #11 Proposed Sealed Document Exhibit 43, #12 Proposed Sealed Document Exhibit 44, #13 Proposed Sealed Document Exhibit 45)(Benjamin, Nicole) This entry/document has been filed under seal pursuant to statute, rule or court order and access is restricted. Please login to CM/ECF to view document(s).
June 19, 2019 Filing 1019 MOTION to Seal Exhibits 19-32 to the Declaration of Lauren M. Papenhausen in Support of Defendants' Opposition to Plaintiffs' May 17, 2019 Motions Filed. Notice Sent To: Warner Chilcott Holdings Company III, Ltd., Warner Chilcott Corporation, Warner Chilcott Public Limited Company, Watson Laboratories, Inc., Warner Chilcott Company, LLC, Warner Chilcott Sales (US), LLC, Watson Pharmaceuticals, Inc., Warner Chilcott Laboratories Ireland Limited, Warner Chilcott U.S., LLC, Warner Chilcott Company, Inc., Actavis, Inc., Ahold USA, Inc., Albertson's, LLC, Mary Alexander, Allergan PLC, Allied Services Division Welfare Fund, American Sales Company, LLC, CVS Pharmacy, Inc., Melisa Chrestman, Melissa Chrestman, City of Providence, Direct Purchaser Class Plaintiffs, Electrical Workers 242 & 294 Health & Welfare Fund, End Payor Plaintiffs, Fraternal Order of Police Fort Lauderdale Lodge 31, HEB Grocery Company L.P., Laborers International Union of North America, Denise Loy, Lupin Ltd., Lupin Pharmaceuticals, Inc., New York Hotel Trades Council & Hotel Association of New York City, Inc. Health Benefits Fund, Painters District Council No. 30 Health & Welfare Fund, Rite-Aid Corporation, Rite-Aid Hdqtrs. Corp., Rochester Drug Co-Operative, Inc., Safeway, Inc., Teamsters Local 237 Welfare Benefits Fund, The Kroger Co., United Food and Commercial Workers Local 1776, Walgreen Co.. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Sealed Document Exhibit 19, #2 Proposed Sealed Document Exhibit 20, #3 Proposed Sealed Document Exhibit 21, #4 Proposed Sealed Document Exhibit 22, #5 Proposed Sealed Document Exhibit 23, #6 Proposed Sealed Document Exhibit 24, #7 Proposed Sealed Document Exhibit 25, #8 Proposed Sealed Document Exhibit 26, #9 Proposed Sealed Document Exhibit 27, #10 Proposed Sealed Document Exhibit 28, #11 Proposed Sealed Document Exhibit 29, #12 Proposed Sealed Document Exhibit 30, #13 Proposed Sealed Document Exhibit 31, #14 Proposed Sealed Document Exhibit 32)(Benjamin, Nicole) This entry/document has been filed under seal pursuant to statute, rule or court order and access is restricted. Please login to CM/ECF to view document(s).
June 19, 2019 Filing 1018 MOTION to Seal Exhibits 1-18 to the Declaration of Lauren M. Papenhausen in Support of Defendants' Opposition to Plaintiffs' May 17, 2019 Motions Filed. Notice Sent To: Warner Chilcott Holdings Company III, Ltd., Warner Chilcott Corporation, Warner Chilcott Public Limited Company, Watson Laboratories, Inc., Warner Chilcott Company, LLC, Warner Chilcott Sales (US), LLC, Watson Pharmaceuticals, Inc., Warner Chilcott Laboratories Ireland Limited, Warner Chilcott U.S., LLC, Warner Chilcott Company, Inc., Actavis, Inc., Ahold USA, Inc., Albertson's, LLC, Mary Alexander, Allergan PLC, Allied Services Division Welfare Fund, American Sales Company, LLC, CVS Pharmacy, Inc., Melisa Chrestman, Melissa Chrestman, City of Providence, Direct Purchaser Class Plaintiffs, Electrical Workers 242 & 294 Health & Welfare Fund, End Payor Plaintiffs, Fraternal Order of Police Fort Lauderdale Lodge 31, HEB Grocery Company L.P., Laborers International Union of North America, Denise Loy, Lupin Ltd., Lupin Pharmaceuticals, Inc., New York Hotel Trades Council & Hotel Association of New York City, Inc. Health Benefits Fund, Painters District Council No. 30 Health & Welfare Fund, Rite-Aid Corporation, Rite-Aid Hdqtrs. Corp., Rochester Drug Co-Operative, Inc., Safeway, Inc., Teamsters Local 237 Welfare Benefits Fund, The Kroger Co., United Food and Commercial Workers Local 1776, Walgreen Co.. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Sealed Document Exhibit 1, #2 Proposed Sealed Document Exhibit 2, #3 Proposed Sealed Document Exhibit 3, #4 Proposed Sealed Document Exhibit 4, #5 Proposed Sealed Document Exhibit 5, #6 Proposed Sealed Document Exhibit 6, #7 Proposed Sealed Document Exhibit 7, #8 Proposed Sealed Document Exhibit 8, #9 Proposed Sealed Document Exhibit 9, #10 Proposed Sealed Document Exhibit 10, #11 Proposed Sealed Document Exhibit 11, #12 Proposed Sealed Document Exhibit 12, #13 Proposed Sealed Document Exhibit 13, #14 Proposed Sealed Document Exhibit 14, #15 Proposed Sealed Document Exhibit 15, #16 Proposed Sealed Document Exhibit 16, #17 Proposed Sealed Document Exhibit 17, #18 Proposed Sealed Document Exhibit 18)(Benjamin, Nicole) This entry/document has been filed under seal pursuant to statute, rule or court order and access is restricted. Please login to CM/ECF to view document(s).
June 19, 2019 Filing 1017 DECLARATION DECLARATION OF LAUREN M. PAPENHAUSEN IN SUPPORT OF DEFENDANTS OPPOSITIONS TO PLAINTIFFS MAY 17, 2019 MOTIONS by Warner Chilcott Company, Inc., Warner Chilcott Company, LLC, Warner Chilcott Corporation, Warner Chilcott Holdings Company III, Ltd., Warner Chilcott Laboratories Ireland Limited, Warner Chilcott Public Limited Company, Warner Chilcott Sales (US), LLC, Warner Chilcott U.S., LLC, Watson Laboratories, Inc., Watson Pharmaceuticals, Inc.. (Benjamin, Nicole)
June 19, 2019 Filing 1016 MOTION to Seal Defendants' Opposition to Plaintiffs' Motion to Strike Defendants Exhibit 70 (Lupin Declaration) (ECF No. 871) Filed. Notice Sent To: Warner Chilcott Holdings Company III, Ltd., Warner Chilcott Corporation, Warner Chilcott Public Limited Company, Watson Laboratories, Inc., Warner Chilcott Company, LLC, Warner Chilcott Sales (US), LLC, Watson Pharmaceuticals, Inc., Warner Chilcott Laboratories Ireland Limited, Warner Chilcott U.S., LLC, Warner Chilcott Company, Inc., Actavis, Inc., Ahold USA, Inc., Albertson's, LLC, Mary Alexander, Allergan PLC, Allied Services Division Welfare Fund, American Sales Company, LLC, CVS Pharmacy, Inc., Melisa Chrestman, Melissa Chrestman, City of Providence, Direct Purchaser Class Plaintiffs, Electrical Workers 242 & 294 Health & Welfare Fund, End Payor Plaintiffs, Fraternal Order of Police Fort Lauderdale Lodge 31, HEB Grocery Company L.P., Laborers International Union of North America, Denise Loy, Lupin Ltd., Lupin Pharmaceuticals, Inc., New York Hotel Trades Council & Hotel Association of New York City, Inc. Health Benefits Fund, Painters District Council No. 30 Health & Welfare Fund, Rite-Aid Corporation, Rite-Aid Hdqtrs. Corp., Rochester Drug Co-Operative, Inc., Safeway, Inc., Teamsters Local 237 Welfare Benefits Fund, The Kroger Co., United Food and Commercial Workers Local 1776, Walgreen Co.. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Sealed Document Defendants' Opposition to Plaintiffs' Motion to Strike Defendants Exhibit 70 (Lupin Declaration) (ECF No. 871))(Benjamin, Nicole) This entry/document has been filed under seal pursuant to statute, rule or court order and access is restricted. Please login to CM/ECF to view document(s).
June 19, 2019 Filing 1015 MOTION to Seal Defendants' Opposition to Plaintiffs' Motion to Partially Exclude the Opinions and Testimony of Stephen G. Kunin (ECF 899) Filed. Notice Sent To: Warner Chilcott Holdings Company III, Ltd., Warner Chilcott Corporation, Warner Chilcott Public Limited Company, Watson Laboratories, Inc., Warner Chilcott Company, LLC, Warner Chilcott Sales (US), LLC, Watson Pharmaceuticals, Inc., Warner Chilcott Laboratories Ireland Limited, Warner Chilcott U.S., LLC, Warner Chilcott Company, Inc., Actavis, Inc., Ahold USA, Inc., Albertson's, LLC, Mary Alexander, Allergan PLC, Allied Services Division Welfare Fund, American Sales Company, LLC, CVS Pharmacy, Inc., Melisa Chrestman, Melissa Chrestman, City of Providence, Direct Purchaser Class Plaintiffs, Electrical Workers 242 & 294 Health & Welfare Fund, End Payor Plaintiffs, Fraternal Order of Police Fort Lauderdale Lodge 31, HEB Grocery Company L.P., Laborers International Union of North America, Denise Loy, Lupin Ltd., Lupin Pharmaceuticals, Inc., New York Hotel Trades Council & Hotel Association of New York City, Inc. Health Benefits Fund, Painters District Council No. 30 Health & Welfare Fund, Rite-Aid Corporation, Rite-Aid Hdqtrs. Corp., Rochester Drug Co-Operative, Inc., Safeway, Inc., Teamsters Local 237 Welfare Benefits Fund, The Kroger Co., United Food and Commercial Workers Local 1776, Walgreen Co.. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Sealed Document Defendants' Opposition to Plaintiffs' Motion to Partially Exclude the Opinions and Testimony of Stephen G. Kunin (ECF 899))(Benjamin, Nicole) This entry/document has been filed under seal pursuant to statute, rule or court order and access is restricted. Please login to CM/ECF to view document(s).
June 19, 2019 Filing 1014 MOTION to Seal Defendants' Opposition to Plaintiffs' Motion to Partially Exclude Opinions and Testimony of Ronald Thisted (ECF 897) Filed. Notice Sent To: Warner Chilcott Holdings Company III, Ltd., Warner Chilcott Corporation, Warner Chilcott Public Limited Company, Watson Laboratories, Inc., Warner Chilcott Company, LLC, Warner Chilcott Sales (US), LLC, Watson Pharmaceuticals, Inc., Warner Chilcott Laboratories Ireland Limited, Warner Chilcott U.S., LLC, Warner Chilcott Company, Inc., Actavis, Inc., Ahold USA, Inc., Albertson's, LLC, Mary Alexander, Allergan PLC, Allied Services Division Welfare Fund, American Sales Company, LLC, CVS Pharmacy, Inc., Melisa Chrestman, Melissa Chrestman, City of Providence, Direct Purchaser Class Plaintiffs, Electrical Workers 242 & 294 Health & Welfare Fund, End Payor Plaintiffs, Fraternal Order of Police Fort Lauderdale Lodge 31, HEB Grocery Company L.P., Laborers International Union of North America, Denise Loy, Lupin Ltd., Lupin Pharmaceuticals, Inc., New York Hotel Trades Council & Hotel Association of New York City, Inc. Health Benefits Fund, Painters District Council No. 30 Health & Welfare Fund, Rite-Aid Corporation, Rite-Aid Hdqtrs. Corp., Rochester Drug Co-Operative, Inc., Safeway, Inc., Teamsters Local 237 Welfare Benefits Fund, The Kroger Co., United Food and Commercial Workers Local 1776, Walgreen Co.. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Sealed Document Defendants' Opposition to Plaintiffs' Motion to Partially Exclude Opinions and Testimony of Ronald Thisted (ECF 897))(Benjamin, Nicole) This entry/document has been filed under seal pursuant to statute, rule or court order and access is restricted. Please login to CM/ECF to view document(s).
June 19, 2019 Filing 1013 MOTION to Seal Defendants' Opposition to Plaintiffs' Motion to Exclude in part the Expert Opinions of Dr. Christine Meyer and Mr. Philip Green that Authorized Generics were Facing Legal Uncertainty (ECF 901) Filed. Notice Sent To: Warner Chilcott Holdings Company III, Ltd., Warner Chilcott Corporation, Warner Chilcott Public Limited Company, Watson Laboratories, Inc., Warner Chilcott Company, LLC, Warner Chilcott Sales (US), LLC, Watson Pharmaceuticals, Inc., Warner Chilcott Laboratories Ireland Limited, Warner Chilcott U.S., LLC, Warner Chilcott Company, Inc., Actavis, Inc., Ahold USA, Inc., Albertson's, LLC, Mary Alexander, Allergan PLC, Allied Services Division Welfare Fund, American Sales Company, LLC, CVS Pharmacy, Inc., Melisa Chrestman, Melissa Chrestman, City of Providence, Direct Purchaser Class Plaintiffs, Electrical Workers 242 & 294 Health & Welfare Fund, End Payor Plaintiffs, Fraternal Order of Police Fort Lauderdale Lodge 31, HEB Grocery Company L.P., Laborers International Union of North America, Denise Loy, Lupin Ltd., Lupin Pharmaceuticals, Inc., New York Hotel Trades Council & Hotel Association of New York City, Inc. Health Benefits Fund, Painters District Council No. 30 Health & Welfare Fund, Rite-Aid Corporation, Rite-Aid Hdqtrs. Corp., Rochester Drug Co-Operative, Inc., Safeway, Inc., Teamsters Local 237 Welfare Benefits Fund, The Kroger Co., United Food and Commercial Workers Local 1776, Walgreen Co.. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Sealed Document Defendants' Opposition to Plaintiffs' Motion to Exclude in part the Expert Opinions of Dr. Christine Meyer and Mr. Philip Green that Authorized Generics were Facing Legal Uncertainty (ECF 901))(Benjamin, Nicole) This entry/document has been filed under seal pursuant to statute, rule or court order and access is restricted. Please login to CM/ECF to view document(s).
June 19, 2019 Filing 1012 MOTION to Seal Defendants' Opposition to Plaintiffs' Motion to Exclude the Opinions and Testimony of T. John Ward (ECF 895) Filed. Notice Sent To: Warner Chilcott Holdings Company III, Ltd., Warner Chilcott Corporation, Warner Chilcott Public Limited Company, Watson Laboratories, Inc., Warner Chilcott Company, LLC, Warner Chilcott Sales (US), LLC, Watson Pharmaceuticals, Inc., Warner Chilcott Laboratories Ireland Limited, Warner Chilcott U.S., LLC, Warner Chilcott Company, Inc., Actavis, Inc., Ahold USA, Inc., Albertson's, LLC, Mary Alexander, Allergan PLC, Allied Services Division Welfare Fund, American Sales Company, LLC, CVS Pharmacy, Inc., Melisa Chrestman, Melissa Chrestman, City of Providence, Direct Purchaser Class Plaintiffs, Electrical Workers 242 & 294 Health & Welfare Fund, End Payor Plaintiffs, Fraternal Order of Police Fort Lauderdale Lodge 31, HEB Grocery Company L.P., Laborers International Union of North America, Denise Loy, Lupin Ltd., Lupin Pharmaceuticals, Inc., New York Hotel Trades Council & Hotel Association of New York City, Inc. Health Benefits Fund, Painters District Council No. 30 Health & Welfare Fund, Rite-Aid Corporation, Rite-Aid Hdqtrs. Corp., Rochester Drug Co-Operative, Inc., Safeway, Inc., Teamsters Local 237 Welfare Benefits Fund, The Kroger Co., United Food and Commercial Workers Local 1776, Walgreen Co.. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Sealed Document Defendants' Opposition to Plaintiffs Motion to Exclude the Opinions and Testimony of T. John Ward (ECF 895))(Benjamin, Nicole) This entry/document has been filed under seal pursuant to statute, rule or court order and access is restricted. Please login to CM/ECF to view document(s).
June 19, 2019 Filing 1011 MOTION to Seal Defendants' Opposition to Direct Purchaser Plaintiffs Motion to Exclude the Merits Testimony and Opinions of Pierre-Yves Cremieux, PH.D. (ECF 906) Filed. Notice Sent To: Warner Chilcott Holdings Company III, Ltd., Warner Chilcott Corporation, Warner Chilcott Public Limited Company, Watson Laboratories, Inc., Warner Chilcott Company, LLC, Warner Chilcott Sales (US), LLC, Watson Pharmaceuticals, Inc., Warner Chilcott Laboratories Ireland Limited, Warner Chilcott U.S., LLC, Warner Chilcott Company, Inc., Actavis, Inc., Ahold USA, Inc., Albertson's, LLC, Mary Alexander, Allergan PLC, Allied Services Division Welfare Fund, American Sales Company, LLC, CVS Pharmacy, Inc., Melisa Chrestman, Melissa Chrestman, City of Providence, Direct Purchaser Class Plaintiffs, Electrical Workers 242 & 294 Health & Welfare Fund, End Payor Plaintiffs, Fraternal Order of Police Fort Lauderdale Lodge 31, HEB Grocery Company L.P., Laborers International Union of North America, Denise Loy, Lupin Ltd., Lupin Pharmaceuticals, Inc., New York Hotel Trades Council & Hotel Association of New York City, Inc. Health Benefits Fund, Painters District Council No. 30 Health & Welfare Fund, Rite-Aid Corporation, Rite-Aid Hdqtrs. Corp., Rochester Drug Co-Operative, Inc., Safeway, Inc., Teamsters Local 237 Welfare Benefits Fund, The Kroger Co., United Food and Commercial Workers Local 1776, Walgreen Co.. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Sealed Document Defendants Opposition to Direct Purchaser Plaintiffs Motion to Exclude the Merits Testimony and Opinions of Pierre-Yves Cremieux, PH.D. (ECF 906))(Benjamin, Nicole) This entry/document has been filed under seal pursuant to statute, rule or court order and access is restricted. Please login to CM/ECF to view document(s).
June 19, 2019 Filing 1010 MOTION to Seal Defendants' Opposition to Plaintiffs Motion to Exclude in part the Expert Opinions of Dr. Philip D. Darney (ECF 865) Filed. Notice Sent To: Warner Chilcott Holdings Company III, Ltd., Warner Chilcott Corporation, Warner Chilcott Public Limited Company, Watson Laboratories, Inc., Warner Chilcott Company, LLC, Warner Chilcott Sales (US), LLC, Watson Pharmaceuticals, Inc., Warner Chilcott Laboratories Ireland Limited, Warner Chilcott U.S., LLC, Warner Chilcott Company, Inc., Actavis, Inc., Ahold USA, Inc., Albertson's, LLC, Mary Alexander, Allergan PLC, Allied Services Division Welfare Fund, American Sales Company, LLC, CVS Pharmacy, Inc., Melisa Chrestman, Melissa Chrestman, City of Providence, Direct Purchaser Class Plaintiffs, Electrical Workers 242 & 294 Health & Welfare Fund, End Payor Plaintiffs, Fraternal Order of Police Fort Lauderdale Lodge 31, HEB Grocery Company L.P., Laborers International Union of North America, Denise Loy, Lupin Ltd., Lupin Pharmaceuticals, Inc., New York Hotel Trades Council & Hotel Association of New York City, Inc. Health Benefits Fund, Painters District Council No. 30 Health & Welfare Fund, Rite-Aid Corporation, Rite-Aid Hdqtrs. Corp., Rochester Drug Co-Operative, Inc., Safeway, Inc., Teamsters Local 237 Welfare Benefits Fund, The Kroger Co., United Food and Commercial Workers Local 1776, Walgreen Co.. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Sealed Document Defendants Opposition to Plaintiffs Motion to Exclude in part the Expert Opinions of Dr. Philip D. Darney (865))(Benjamin, Nicole) This entry/document has been filed under seal pursuant to statute, rule or court order and access is restricted. Please login to CM/ECF to view document(s).
June 19, 2019 Filing 1009 MOTION to Seal Defendants' Opposition to Plaintiffs Motion to Exclude the Expert Opinions of Karen Ryle (ECF 905) Filed. Notice Sent To: Warner Chilcott Holdings Company III, Ltd., Warner Chilcott Corporation, Warner Chilcott Public Limited Company, Watson Laboratories, Inc., Warner Chilcott Company, LLC, Warner Chilcott Sales (US), LLC, Watson Pharmaceuticals, Inc., Warner Chilcott Laboratories Ireland Limited, Warner Chilcott U.S., LLC, Warner Chilcott Company, Inc., Actavis, Inc., Ahold USA, Inc., Albertson's, LLC, Mary Alexander, Allergan PLC, Allied Services Division Welfare Fund, American Sales Company, LLC, CVS Pharmacy, Inc., Melisa Chrestman, Melissa Chrestman, City of Providence, Direct Purchaser Class Plaintiffs, Electrical Workers 242 & 294 Health & Welfare Fund, End Payor Plaintiffs, Fraternal Order of Police Fort Lauderdale Lodge 31, HEB Grocery Company L.P., Laborers International Union of North America, Denise Loy, Lupin Ltd., Lupin Pharmaceuticals, Inc., New York Hotel Trades Council & Hotel Association of New York City, Inc. Health Benefits Fund, Painters District Council No. 30 Health & Welfare Fund, Rite-Aid Corporation, Rite-Aid Hdqtrs. Corp., Rochester Drug Co-Operative, Inc., Safeway, Inc., Teamsters Local 237 Welfare Benefits Fund, The Kroger Co., United Food and Commercial Workers Local 1776, Walgreen Co.. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Sealed Document Defendants Opposition to Plaintiffs Motion to Exclude the Expert Opinions of Karen Ryle (ECF 905))(Benjamin, Nicole) This entry/document has been filed under seal pursuant to statute, rule or court order and access is restricted. Please login to CM/ECF to view document(s).
June 19, 2019 Filing 1008 MOTION to Seal Defendants Opposition to End-Payor Plaintiffs Motion to Exclude the Merits Testimony and Opinions of James W. Hughes, PH.D. (ECF 876) Filed. Notice Sent To: Warner Chilcott Holdings Company III, Ltd., Warner Chilcott Corporation, Warner Chilcott Public Limited Company, Watson Laboratories, Inc., Warner Chilcott Company, LLC, Warner Chilcott Sales (US), LLC, Watson Pharmaceuticals, Inc., Warner Chilcott Laboratories Ireland Limited, Warner Chilcott U.S., LLC, Warner Chilcott Company, Inc., Actavis, Inc., Ahold USA, Inc., Albertson's, LLC, Mary Alexander, Allergan PLC, Allied Services Division Welfare Fund, American Sales Company, LLC, CVS Pharmacy, Inc., Melisa Chrestman, Melissa Chrestman, City of Providence, Direct Purchaser Class Plaintiffs, Electrical Workers 242 & 294 Health & Welfare Fund, End Payor Plaintiffs, Fraternal Order of Police Fort Lauderdale Lodge 31, HEB Grocery Company L.P., Laborers International Union of North America, Denise Loy, Lupin Ltd., Lupin Pharmaceuticals, Inc., New York Hotel Trades Council & Hotel Association of New York City, Inc. Health Benefits Fund, Painters District Council No. 30 Health & Welfare Fund, Rite-Aid Corporation, Rite-Aid Hdqtrs. Corp., Rochester Drug Co-Operative, Inc., Safeway, Inc., Teamsters Local 237 Welfare Benefits Fund, The Kroger Co., United Food and Commercial Workers Local 1776, Walgreen Co.. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Sealed Document Defendants Opposition to End-Payor Plaintiffs Motion to Exclude the Merits Testimony and Opinions of James W. Hughes, PH.D. (ECF 876))(Benjamin, Nicole) This entry/document has been filed under seal pursuant to statute, rule or court order and access is restricted. Please login to CM/ECF to view document(s).
June 19, 2019 Filing 1007 MOTION to Seal Defendants' Opposition to Plaintiffs' Motion (ECF 951) to Partially Exclude the Opinions and Testimony of Robert A. Dormer Filed. Notice Sent To: Warner Chilcott Holdings Company III, Ltd., Warner Chilcott Corporation, Warner Chilcott Public Limited Company, Watson Laboratories, Inc., Warner Chilcott Company, LLC, Warner Chilcott Sales (US), LLC, Watson Pharmaceuticals, Inc., Warner Chilcott Laboratories Ireland Limited, Warner Chilcott U.S., LLC, Warner Chilcott Company, Inc., Actavis, Inc., Ahold USA, Inc., Albertson's, LLC, Mary Alexander, Allergan PLC, Allied Services Division Welfare Fund, American Sales Company, LLC, CVS Pharmacy, Inc., Melisa Chrestman, Melissa Chrestman, City of Providence, Direct Purchaser Class Plaintiffs, Electrical Workers 242 & 294 Health & Welfare Fund, End Payor Plaintiffs, Fraternal Order of Police Fort Lauderdale Lodge 31, HEB Grocery Company L.P., Laborers International Union of North America, Denise Loy, Lupin Ltd., Lupin Pharmaceuticals, Inc., New York Hotel Trades Council & Hotel Association of New York City, Inc. Health Benefits Fund, Painters District Council No. 30 Health & Welfare Fund, Rite-Aid Corporation, Rite-Aid Hdqtrs. Corp., Rochester Drug Co-Operative, Inc., Safeway, Inc., Teamsters Local 237 Welfare Benefits Fund, The Kroger Co., United Food and Commercial Workers Local 1776, Walgreen Co.. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Sealed Document Defendants' Opposition to Plaintiffs' Motion (ECF 951) to Partially Exclude the Opinions and Testimony of Robert A. Dormer)(Benjamin, Nicole) This entry/document has been filed under seal pursuant to statute, rule or court order and access is restricted. Please login to CM/ECF to view document(s).
June 19, 2019 Filing 1006 MOTION to Seal Defendants Opposition to Motion to Exclude Opinions and Testimony of Drs. Christine S. Meyer, Mark Robbins, and Melissa Schilling Regarding Lack of Anticompetitive Effect from Product Hop (ECF 940) Filed. Notice Sent To: Warner Chilcott Holdings Company III, Ltd., Warner Chilcott Corporation, Warner Chilcott Public Limited Company, Watson Laboratories, Inc., Warner Chilcott Company, LLC, Warner Chilcott Sales (US), LLC, Watson Pharmaceuticals, Inc., Warner Chilcott Laboratories Ireland Limited, Warner Chilcott U.S., LLC, Warner Chilcott Company, Inc., Actavis, Inc., Ahold USA, Inc., Albertson's, LLC, Mary Alexander, Allergan PLC, Allied Services Division Welfare Fund, American Sales Company, LLC, CVS Pharmacy, Inc., Melisa Chrestman, Melissa Chrestman, City of Providence, Direct Purchaser Class Plaintiffs, Electrical Workers 242 & 294 Health & Welfare Fund, End Payor Plaintiffs, Fraternal Order of Police Fort Lauderdale Lodge 31, HEB Grocery Company L.P., Laborers International Union of North America, Denise Loy, Lupin Ltd., Lupin Pharmaceuticals, Inc., New York Hotel Trades Council & Hotel Association of New York City, Inc. Health Benefits Fund, Painters District Council No. 30 Health & Welfare Fund, Rite-Aid Corporation, Rite-Aid Hdqtrs. Corp., Rochester Drug Co-Operative, Inc., Safeway, Inc., Teamsters Local 237 Welfare Benefits Fund, The Kroger Co., United Food and Commercial Workers Local 1776, Walgreen Co.. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Sealed Document Defendants Opposition to Motion to Exclude Opinions and Testimony of Drs. Christine S. Meyer, Mark Robbins, and Melissa Schilling Regarding Lack of Anticompetitive Effect from Product Hop (ECF 940))(Benjamin, Nicole) This entry/document has been filed under seal pursuant to statute, rule or court order and access is restricted. Please login to CM/ECF to view document(s).
June 19, 2019 Filing 1005 MOTION to Seal Plaintiffs' Opposition to Defendants' Motion to Exclude the Opinions and Testimony of Plaintiffs' Expert Dr. Thomas McGuire Filed. Notice Sent To: All Plaintiffs. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Sealed Document Plaintiffs' Opposition to Defendants' Motion to Exclude the Opinions and Testimony of Plaintiffs' Expert Dr. Thomas McGuire)(Kohn, Peter) This entry/document has been filed under seal pursuant to statute, rule or court order and access is restricted. Please login to CM/ECF to view document(s).
June 19, 2019 Filing 1004 MOTION to Seal Defendants' Opposition to Plaintiffs' Motion to Exclude in part the Expert Testimony of Philip Green (ECF 903) Filed. Notice Sent To: Warner Chilcott Holdings Company III, Ltd., Warner Chilcott Corporation, Warner Chilcott Public Limited Company, Watson Laboratories, Inc., Warner Chilcott Company, LLC, Warner Chilcott Sales (US), LLC, Watson Pharmaceuticals, Inc., Warner Chilcott Laboratories Ireland Limited, Warner Chilcott U.S., LLC, Warner Chilcott Company, Inc., Actavis, Inc., Ahold USA, Inc., Albertson's, LLC, Mary Alexander, Allergan PLC, Allied Services Division Welfare Fund, American Sales Company, LLC, CVS Pharmacy, Inc., Melisa Chrestman, Melissa Chrestman, City of Providence, Direct Purchaser Class Plaintiffs, Electrical Workers 242 & 294 Health & Welfare Fund, End Payor Plaintiffs, Fraternal Order of Police Fort Lauderdale Lodge 31, HEB Grocery Company L.P., Laborers International Union of North America, Denise Loy, Lupin Ltd., Lupin Pharmaceuticals, Inc., New York Hotel Trades Council & Hotel Association of New York City, Inc. Health Benefits Fund, Painters District Council No. 30 Health & Welfare Fund, Rite-Aid Corporation, Rite-Aid Hdqtrs. Corp., Rochester Drug Co-Operative, Inc., Safeway, Inc., Teamsters Local 237 Welfare Benefits Fund, The Kroger Co., United Food and Commercial Workers Local 1776, Walgreen Co.. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Sealed Document Defendants Opposition to Plaintiffs Motion to Exclude in part the Expert Testimony of Philip Green (ECF 903))(Benjamin, Nicole) This entry/document has been filed under seal pursuant to statute, rule or court order and access is restricted. Please login to CM/ECF to view document(s).
June 19, 2019 Filing 1003 MOTION to Seal Defendants' Opposition to Plaintiffs Motion to Exclude the Expert Testimony of Dr. Louis Berneman, Philip Green, and Dr. Christine Meyer regarding Fair Value (ECF 956) Filed. Notice Sent To: Warner Chilcott Holdings Company III, Ltd., Warner Chilcott Corporation, Warner Chilcott Public Limited Company, Watson Laboratories, Inc., Warner Chilcott Company, LLC, Warner Chilcott Sales (US), LLC, Watson Pharmaceuticals, Inc., Warner Chilcott Laboratories Ireland Limited, Warner Chilcott U.S., LLC, Warner Chilcott Company, Inc., Actavis, Inc., Ahold USA, Inc., Albertson's, LLC, Mary Alexander, Allergan PLC, Allied Services Division Welfare Fund, American Sales Company, LLC, CVS Pharmacy, Inc., Melisa Chrestman, Melissa Chrestman, City of Providence, Direct Purchaser Class Plaintiffs, Electrical Workers 242 & 294 Health & Welfare Fund, End Payor Plaintiffs, Fraternal Order of Police Fort Lauderdale Lodge 31, HEB Grocery Company L.P., Laborers International Union of North America, Denise Loy, Lupin Ltd., Lupin Pharmaceuticals, Inc., New York Hotel Trades Council & Hotel Association of New York City, Inc. Health Benefits Fund, Painters District Council No. 30 Health & Welfare Fund, Rite-Aid Corporation, Rite-Aid Hdqtrs. Corp., Rochester Drug Co-Operative, Inc., Safeway, Inc., Teamsters Local 237 Welfare Benefits Fund, The Kroger Co., United Food and Commercial Workers Local 1776, Walgreen Co.. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Sealed Document Defendants Opposition to Plaintiffs Motion to Exclude the Expert Testimony of Dr. Louis Berneman, Philip Green, and Dr. Christine Meyer regarding Fair Value (ECF 956))(Benjamin, Nicole) This entry/document has been filed under seal pursuant to statute, rule or court order and access is restricted. Please login to CM/ECF to view document(s).
June 19, 2019 Filing 1002 MOTION to Seal Defendants' PowerPoint Presentation in Support of Defendants' Motion for Summary Judgment on Absence of Monopoly Power Filed. Notice Sent To: Warner Chilcott Holdings Company III, Ltd., Warner Chilcott Corporation, Warner Chilcott Public Limited Company, Watson Laboratories, Inc., Warner Chilcott Company, LLC, Warner Chilcott Sales (US), LLC, Watson Pharmaceuticals, Inc., Warner Chilcott Laboratories Ireland Limited, Warner Chilcott U.S., LLC, Warner Chilcott Company, Inc., Actavis, Inc., Ahold USA, Inc., Albertson's, LLC, Mary Alexander, Allergan PLC, Allied Services Division Welfare Fund, American Sales Company, LLC, CVS Pharmacy, Inc., Melisa Chrestman, Melissa Chrestman, City of Providence, Direct Purchaser Class Plaintiffs, Electrical Workers 242 & 294 Health & Welfare Fund, End Payor Plaintiffs, Fraternal Order of Police Fort Lauderdale Lodge 31, HEB Grocery Company L.P., Laborers International Union of North America, Denise Loy, Lupin Ltd., Lupin Pharmaceuticals, Inc., New York Hotel Trades Council & Hotel Association of New York City, Inc. Health Benefits Fund, Painters District Council No. 30 Health & Welfare Fund, Rite-Aid Corporation, Rite-Aid Hdqtrs. Corp., Rochester Drug Co-Operative, Inc., Safeway, Inc., Teamsters Local 237 Welfare Benefits Fund, The Kroger Co., United Food and Commercial Workers Local 1776, Walgreen Co.. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Sealed Document Defendants' PowerPoint Presentation in Support of Defendants' Motion for Summary Judgment on Absence of Monopoly Power)(Benjamin, Nicole) This entry/document has been filed under seal pursuant to statute, rule or court order and access is restricted. Please login to CM/ECF to view document(s).
June 19, 2019 Filing 1001 MOTION to Seal Plaintiffs' Opposition to Defendants' Motion to Exclude Certain Opinions and Testimony of Michael A. Thomas, M.D., on Chewability and Patent Issues Filed. Notice Sent To: All Plaintiffs. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Sealed Document Plaintiffs' Opposition, #2 Proposed Sealed Document B. Refsin Declaration)(Refsin, Barry) This entry/document has been filed under seal pursuant to statute, rule or court order and access is restricted. Please login to CM/ECF to view document(s).
June 19, 2019 Filing 1000 MOTION to Seal Plaintiffs' Opposition to Defendants' Motion to Exclude the Opinions and Testimony of John R. Tupman, Jr. Filed. Notice Sent To: All Plaintiffs. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Sealed Document Plaintiffs' Opposition)(Refsin, Barry) This entry/document has been filed under seal pursuant to statute, rule or court order and access is restricted. Please login to CM/ECF to view document(s).
June 19, 2019 Filing 999 MOTION to Seal Defendants Opposition to Plaintiffs Motion to Exclude Opinions and Testimony of Drs. Christine S. Meyer and Mark S. Robbins regarding Procompetitive Justifications of Reverse Payments (ECF 874) Filed. Notice Sent To: Warner Chilcott Holdings Company III, Ltd., Warner Chilcott Corporation, Warner Chilcott Public Limited Company, Watson Laboratories, Inc., Warner Chilcott Company, LLC, Warner Chilcott Sales (US), LLC, Watson Pharmaceuticals, Inc., Warner Chilcott Laboratories Ireland Limited, Warner Chilcott U.S., LLC, Warner Chilcott Company, Inc., Actavis, Inc., Ahold USA, Inc., Albertson's, LLC, Mary Alexander, Allergan PLC, Allied Services Division Welfare Fund, American Sales Company, LLC, CVS Pharmacy, Inc., Melisa Chrestman, Melissa Chrestman, City of Providence, Direct Purchaser Class Plaintiffs, Electrical Workers 242 & 294 Health & Welfare Fund, End Payor Plaintiffs, Fraternal Order of Police Fort Lauderdale Lodge 31, HEB Grocery Company L.P., Laborers International Union of North America, Denise Loy, Lupin Ltd., Lupin Pharmaceuticals, Inc., New York Hotel Trades Council & Hotel Association of New York City, Inc. Health Benefits Fund, Painters District Council No. 30 Health & Welfare Fund, Rite-Aid Corporation, Rite-Aid Hdqtrs. Corp., Rochester Drug Co-Operative, Inc., Safeway, Inc., Teamsters Local 237 Welfare Benefits Fund, The Kroger Co., United Food and Commercial Workers Local 1776, Walgreen Co.. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Sealed Document Defendants Opposition to Plaintiffs Motion to Exclude Opinions and Testimony of Drs. Christine S. Meyer and Mark S. Robbins regarding Procompetitive Justifications of Reverse Payments (ECF 874))(Benjamin, Nicole) This entry/document has been filed under seal pursuant to statute, rule or court order and access is restricted. Please login to CM/ECF to view document(s).
June 19, 2019 Filing 998 MOTION to Seal Defendants Opposition to Motion to Exclude in part the Expert Opinions of Christine S. Meyer (Commercial Success) (ECF 867) Filed. Notice Sent To: Warner Chilcott Holdings Company III, Ltd., Warner Chilcott Corporation, Warner Chilcott Public Limited Company, Watson Laboratories, Inc., Warner Chilcott Company, LLC, Warner Chilcott Sales (US), LLC, Watson Pharmaceuticals, Inc., Warner Chilcott Laboratories Ireland Limited, Warner Chilcott U.S., LLC, Warner Chilcott Company, Inc., Actavis, Inc., Ahold USA, Inc., Albertson's, LLC, Mary Alexander, Allergan PLC, Allied Services Division Welfare Fund, American Sales Company, LLC, CVS Pharmacy, Inc., Melisa Chrestman, Melissa Chrestman, City of Providence, Direct Purchaser Class Plaintiffs, Electrical Workers 242 & 294 Health & Welfare Fund, End Payor Plaintiffs, Fraternal Order of Police Fort Lauderdale Lodge 31, HEB Grocery Company L.P., Laborers International Union of North America, Denise Loy, Lupin Ltd., Lupin Pharmaceuticals, Inc., New York Hotel Trades Council & Hotel Association of New York City, Inc. Health Benefits Fund, Painters District Council No. 30 Health & Welfare Fund, Rite-Aid Corporation, Rite-Aid Hdqtrs. Corp., Rochester Drug Co-Operative, Inc., Safeway, Inc., Teamsters Local 237 Welfare Benefits Fund, The Kroger Co., United Food and Commercial Workers Local 1776, Walgreen Co.. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Sealed Document Defendants Opposition to Motion to Exclude in part the Expert Opinions of Christine S. Meyer (Commercial Success) (ECF 867))(Benjamin, Nicole) This entry/document has been filed under seal pursuant to statute, rule or court order and access is restricted. Please login to CM/ECF to view document(s).
June 19, 2019 Filing 997 MOTION to Seal End-Payor Plaintiffs Motion For Leave To File Under Seal End-Payor Plaintiffs Memorandum In Opposition To Defendants Motion To Exclude The Opinions And Testimony Of End-Payor Plaintiffs Expert Dr. Gary L. French (ECF No. 884) Filed. Notice Sent To: End Payor Plaintiffs, Actavis, Inc., Ahold USA, Inc., Albertson's, LLC, Mary Alexander, Allergan PLC, Allied Services Division Welfare Fund, American Sales Company, LLC, CVS Pharmacy, Inc., Melisa Chrestman, Melissa Chrestman, City of Providence, Direct Purchaser Class Plaintiffs, Electrical Workers 242 & 294 Health & Welfare Fund, Fraternal Order of Police Fort Lauderdale Lodge 31, HEB Grocery Company L.P., Laborers International Union of North America, Denise Loy, Lupin Ltd., Lupin Pharmaceuticals, Inc., New York Hotel Trades Council & Hotel Association of New York City, Inc. Health Benefits Fund, Painters District Council No. 30 Health & Welfare Fund, Rite-Aid Corporation, Rite-Aid Hdqtrs. Corp., Rochester Drug Co-Operative, Inc., Safeway, Inc., Teamsters Local 237 Welfare Benefits Fund, The Kroger Co., United Food and Commercial Workers Local 1776, Walgreen Co., Warner Chilcott Company, Inc., Warner Chilcott Company, LLC, Warner Chilcott Corporation, Warner Chilcott Holdings Company III, Ltd., Warner Chilcott Laboratories Ireland Limited, Warner Chilcott Public Limited Company, Warner Chilcott Sales (US), LLC, Warner Chilcott U.S., LLC, Watson Laboratories, Inc., Watson Pharmaceuticals, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Sealed Document)(Miller, Marvin) This entry/document has been filed under seal pursuant to statute, rule or court order and access is restricted. Please login to CM/ECF to view document(s).
June 19, 2019 Filing 996 MOTION to Seal Memorandum Of Law In Support Of Plaintiffs Opposition To Defendants Motion To Exclude The Opinions And Testimony Of Deborah Jaskot Concerning Lupins Inability To Obtain FDA Approval For Its Generic Until 2015 Filed. Notice Sent To: All Plaintiffs. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Sealed Document)(Meltzer, Joseph) This entry/document has been filed under seal pursuant to statute, rule or court order and access is restricted. Please login to CM/ECF to view document(s).
June 19, 2019 Minute Entry for proceedings held before Magistrate Judge Patricia A. Sullivan: Telephone Conference held on 6/19/2019 with Attorneys Joseph Meltzer, Matthew Van Tine, Scott Perwin, Monica Kiley, Nicole Benjamin, Alyson Cox and Kate Dyson. (Chambers at 4:00.) (Saucier, Martha)
June 19, 2019 Filing 995 MOTION to Seal Plaintiffs' Opposition to Defendants' Motion to Exclude Certain Opinions and Testimony of Edward Lentz, John Doll, and Nicholas Jewell Filed. Notice Sent To: All Plaintiffs. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Sealed Document)(Johnson, Kristen) This entry/document has been filed under seal pursuant to statute, rule or court order and access is restricted. Please login to CM/ECF to view document(s).
June 19, 2019 Opinion or Order TEXT ORDER granting #987 Motion to Seal; granting #991 Motion to Seal. So Ordered by Chief Judge William E. Smith on 6/19/2019. (Jackson, Ryan)
June 17, 2019 Filing 991 MOTION to Seal Corrected Exhibits in Support of Defendants' Statement of Undisputed Facts Filed. Notice Sent To: Warner Chilcott Holdings Company III, Ltd., Warner Chilcott Corporation, Warner Chilcott Public Limited Company, Watson Laboratories, Inc., Warner Chilcott Company, LLC, Warner Chilcott Sales (US), LLC, Watson Pharmaceuticals, Inc., Warner Chilcott Laboratories Ireland Limited, Warner Chilcott U.S., LLC, Warner Chilcott Company, Inc., Actavis, Inc., Ahold USA, Inc., Albertson's, LLC, Mary Alexander, Allergan PLC, Allied Services Division Welfare Fund, American Sales Company, LLC, CVS Pharmacy, Inc., Melisa Chrestman, Melissa Chrestman, City of Providence, Direct Purchaser Class Plaintiffs, Electrical Workers 242 & 294 Health & Welfare Fund, End Payor Plaintiffs, Fraternal Order of Police Fort Lauderdale Lodge 31, HEB Grocery Company L.P., Laborers International Union of North America, Denise Loy, Lupin Ltd., Lupin Pharmaceuticals, Inc., New York Hotel Trades Council & Hotel Association of New York City, Inc. Health Benefits Fund, Painters District Council No. 30 Health & Welfare Fund, Rite-Aid Corporation, Rite-Aid Hdqtrs. Corp., Rochester Drug Co-Operative, Inc., Safeway, Inc., Teamsters Local 237 Welfare Benefits Fund, The Kroger Co., United Food and Commercial Workers Local 1776, Walgreen Co.. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Sealed Document Exhibit 1, #2 Proposed Sealed Document Exhibit 69, #3 Proposed Sealed Document Exhibit 114, #4 Proposed Sealed Document Exhibit 123, #5 Proposed Sealed Document Exhibit 201, #6 Proposed Sealed Document Exhibit 204, #7 Proposed Sealed Document Exhibit 205, #8 Proposed Sealed Document Exhibit 213)(Benjamin, Nicole) This entry/document has been filed under seal pursuant to statute, rule or court order and access is restricted. Please login to CM/ECF to view document(s).
June 17, 2019 Filing 990 DECLARATION re #843 Declaration, (Corrected Declaration of Katherine Dyson in Support of Defendants' Motion for Summary Judgment) by Warner Chilcott Company, Inc., Warner Chilcott Company, LLC, Warner Chilcott Corporation, Warner Chilcott Holdings Company III, Ltd., Warner Chilcott Laboratories Ireland Limited, Warner Chilcott Public Limited Company, Warner Chilcott Sales (US), LLC, Warner Chilcott U.S., LLC, Watson Laboratories, Inc., Watson Pharmaceuticals, Inc.. (Benjamin, Nicole)
June 17, 2019 Filing 989 MOTION to File Corrected Exhibits and Declaration in Support of Defendants' Statement of Undisputed Facts filed by Warner Chilcott Company, Inc., Warner Chilcott Company, LLC, Warner Chilcott Corporation, Warner Chilcott Holdings Company III, Ltd., Warner Chilcott Laboratories Ireland Limited, Warner Chilcott Public Limited Company, Warner Chilcott Sales (US), LLC, Warner Chilcott U.S., LLC, Watson Laboratories, Inc., Watson Pharmaceuticals, Inc.. Responses due by 7/1/2019. (Benjamin, Nicole)
June 14, 2019 Filing 988 NOTICE by Direct Purchaser Class Plaintiffs of Filing Materials from February 11, 2019 Hearing on Motion for Class Certification and March 15,2019 Hearing on Motion for Summary Judgment. (Farrell Pletcher, Paula)
June 14, 2019 Filing 987 MOTION to Seal Filed. Notice Sent To: All Parties. (Attachments: #1 Slideshow for Class Cert. Hearing, #2 Class Members List - Color Coded, #3 Slideshow of Examination of Dr. Leitzinger, #4 Final Slideshow for 3-14 Hearing on Market Power Motion for Summary Judgment - Johnson, #5 Slideshow for 3-14 Hearing on Market Power Motion for Summary Judgment-Shadowen)(Farrell Pletcher, Paula) This entry/document has been filed under seal pursuant to statute, rule or court order and access is restricted. Please login to CM/ECF to view document(s). Filed Date Modified on 6/17/2019 (Farrell Pletcher, Paula).
June 14, 2019 Filing 986 MOTION to Unseal Document the Declaration of Terence S. Ziegler in Support of Plaintiffs' Motion to Strike the Declaration of Pramod Dahibhate and to Preclude Defendants From Relying Thereon in Support of Their Motion for Summary Judgment and Exhibit A Attached Tereto filed by All Plaintiffs. Responses due by 6/28/2019. (Meltzer, Joseph)
June 14, 2019 Filing 985 MOTION to Unseal Document Unopposed Motion to Unseal the Declaration of Terence S. Ziegler in Support of Plaintiffs' Motion to Exclude Certain Puported Expert Opinions and Testimony of Christopher Smith, Robert Dormer, and mark Robbins filed by All Plaintiffs. Responses due by 6/28/2019. (Meltzer, Joseph)
June 14, 2019 NOTICE of Hearing: Telephone Conference set for 6/19/2019 at 04:00 PM in Magistrate Judge Sullivan Chambers before Magistrate Judge Patricia A. Sullivan regarding the treatment of confidential information and public access. Court to provide call- in instructions via email.(Saucier, Martha)
June 13, 2019 Minute Entry for proceedings held before Magistrate Judge Patricia A. Sullivan: Telephone Conference held on 6/13/2019. (Court Reporter Lisa Schwam in Chambers at 4:00.) (Saucier, Martha)
June 13, 2019 Minute Entry for proceedings held before Magistrate Judge Patricia A. Sullivan: Telephone Conference held on 6/13/2019. (Court Reporter Lisa Schwam in Courtroom Chambers at 3:00.) (Saucier, Martha)
June 13, 2019 Filing 982 NOTICE by Warner Chilcott Company, Inc., Warner Chilcott Company, LLC, Warner Chilcott Corporation, Warner Chilcott Holdings Company III, Ltd., Warner Chilcott Laboratories Ireland Limited, Warner Chilcott Public Limited Company, Warner Chilcott Sales (US), LLC, Warner Chilcott U.S., LLC, Watson Laboratories, Inc., Watson Pharmaceuticals, Inc. re #970 Notice (Other),,,, (Letter in response to Plaintiffs' June 10, 2019 submission (ECF 970) regarding treatment of confidential information) (Benjamin, Nicole)
June 13, 2019 Filing 981 DECLARATION of Kristen Johnson re 978 Response to Motion by Plaintiffs. (Potter, Carrie)
June 13, 2019 Filing 977 Addendum re #959 MOTION to Unseal Document Select Documents from Motion for Leave to File Under Seal Daubert Motions Regarding Dr. Berneman, Mr. Green, and Dr. Meyer by Plaintiffs. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1)(Kohn, Peter)
June 13, 2019 Opinion or Order TEXT ORDER granting #972 Motion to Seal; granting #973 Motion to Seal; granting #974 Motion to Seal; granting #975 Motion to Seal; granting #976 Motion to Seal. So Ordered by Chief Judge William E. Smith on 6/13/2019. (Jackson, Ryan)
June 12, 2019 Minute Entry for proceedings held before Chief Judge William E. Smith: In Chambers Conference re: Scheduling held on 6/12/2019; counsel present: T. Sobol; K. Johnson; S. Shadowen; J. Meltzer; M. Van Tine; D. Solensen; P. Kohn; B. Retsin; P. Currey; J. Gidley; R. McConnell; M. Buchman; R. Milne; N. Benjamin; K. Glynn; S. Perwin (Jackson, Ryan)
June 12, 2019 Filing 976 MOTION to Seal Exhibits PX154 to PX265 to the Declaration of Kristen A. Johnson in Support of Plaintiffs' Opposition to Defendants' Motion for Summary Judgment Filed. Notice Sent To: All Plaintiffs. (Attachments: #1 PX154, #2 PX155, #3 PX156, #4 PX157, #5 PX158, #6 PX159, #7 PX160, #8 PX161, #9 PX162, #10 PX163, #11 PX164, #12 PX165, #13 PX166, #14 PX167, #15 PX168, #16 PX169, #17 PX170, #18 PX171, #19 PX172, #20 PX173, #21 PX174, #22 PX175, #23 PX176, #24 PX177, #25 PX178, #26 PX179, #27 PX180, #28 PX181, #29 PX182, #30 PX183, #31 PX184, #32 PX185, #33 PX186, #34 PX187, #35 PX188, #36 PX189, #37 PX190, #38 PX191, #39 PX192, #40 PX193, #41 PX194, #42 PX195, #43 PX196, #44 PX197, #45 PX198, #46 PX199, #47 PX200, #48 PX201, #49 PX202, #50 PX203, #51 PX204, #52 PX205, #53 PX206, #54 PX207, #55 PX208, #56 PX209, #57 PX210, #58 PX211, #59 PX212, #60 PX213, #61 PX214, #62 PX215, #63 PX216, #64 PX217, #65 PX218, #66 PX219, #67 PX220, #68 PX221, #69 PX222, #70 PX223, #71 PX224, #72 PX225, #73 PX226, #74 PX227, #75 PX228, #76 PX229, #77 PX230, #78 PX231, #79 PX232, #80 PX233, #81 PX234, #82 PX235, #83 PX236, #84 PX237, #85 PX238, #86 PX239, #87 PX240, #88 PX241, #89 PX242, #90 PX243, #91 PX244, #92 PX245, #93 PX246, #94 PX247, #95 PX248, #96 PX249, #97 PX250, #98 PX251, #99 PX252, #100 PX253, #101 PX254, #102 PX255, #103 PX256, #104 PX257, #105 PX258, #106 PX259, #107 PX260, #108 PX261, #109 PX262, #110 PX263, #111 PX264, #112 PX265)(Johnson, Kristen) This entry/document has been filed under seal pursuant to statute, rule or court order and access is restricted. Please login to CM/ECF to view document(s).
June 12, 2019 Filing 975 MOTION to Seal Exhibits PX073 to PX153 to the Declaration of Kristen A. Johnson in Support of Plaintiffs' Opposition to Defendants' Motion for Summary Judgment Filed. Notice Sent To: All Plaintiffs. (Attachments: #1 PX073, #2 PX074, #3 PX075, #4 PX076, #5 PX077, #6 PX078, #7 PX079, #8 PX080, #9 PX081, #10 PX082, #11 PX083, #12 PX084, #13 PX085, #14 PX086, #15 PX087, #16 PX088, #17 PX089, #18 PX090, #19 PX091, #20 PX092, #21 PX093, #22 PX094, #23 PX095, #24 PX096, #25 PX097, #26 PX098, #27 PX099, #28 PX100, #29 PX101, #30 PX102, #31 PX103, #32 PX104, #33 PX105, #34 PX106, #35 PX107, #36 PX108, #37 PX109, #38 PX110, #39 PX111, #40 PX112, #41 PX113, #42 PX114, #43 PX115, #44 PX116, #45 PX117, #46 PX118, #47 PX119, #48 PX120, #49 PX121, #50 PX122, #51 PX123, #52 PX124, #53 PX125, #54 PX126, #55 PX127, #56 PX128, #57 PX129, #58 PX130, #59 PX131, #60 PX132, #61 PX133, #62 PX134, #63 PX135, #64 PX136, #65 PX137, #66 PX138, #67 PX139, #68 PX140, #69 PX141, #70 PX142, #71 PX143, #72 PX144, #73 PX145, #74 PX146, #75 PX147, #76 PX148, #77 PX149, #78 PX150, #79 PX151, #80 PX152, #81 PX153)(Johnson, Kristen) This entry/document has been filed under seal pursuant to statute, rule or court order and access is restricted. Please login to CM/ECF to view document(s).
June 12, 2019 Filing 974 MOTION to Seal Exhibits PX001 to PX072 to the Declaration of Kristen A. Johnson in Support of Plaintiffs' Opposition to Defendants' Motion for Summary Judgment Filed. Notice Sent To: All Plaintiffs. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Kristen Johnson, #2 PX001, #3 PX002, #4 PX003, #5 PX004, #6 PX005, #7 PX006, #8 PX007, #9 PX008, #10 PX009, #11 PX010, #12 PX011, #13 PX012, #14 PX013, #15 PX014, #16 PX015, #17 PX016, #18 PX017, #19 PX018, #20 PX019, #21 PX020, #22 PX021, #23 PX022, #24 PX023, #25 PX024, #26 PX025, #27 PX026, #28 PX027, #29 PX028, #30 PX029, #31 PX030, #32 PX031, #33 PX032, #34 PX033, #35 PX034, #36 PX035, #37 PX036, #38 PX037, #39 PX038, #40 PX039, #41 PX040, #42 PX041, #43 PX042, #44 PX043, #45 PX044, #46 PX045, #47 PX046, #48 PX047, #49 PX048, #50 PX049, #51 PX050, #52 PX051, #53 PX052, #54 PX053, #55 PX054, #56 PX055, #57 PX056, #58 PX057, #59 PX058, #60 PX059, #61 PX060, #62 PX061, #63 PX062, #64 PX063, #65 PX064, #66 PX065, #67 PX066, #68 PX067, #69 PX068, #70 PX069, #71 PX070, #72 PX071, #73 PX072)(Johnson, Kristen) This entry/document has been filed under seal pursuant to statute, rule or court order and access is restricted. Please login to CM/ECF to view document(s).
June 12, 2019 Filing 973 MOTION to Seal Plaintiffs' Statements of Facts in Opposition to Defendants' Motion for Summary Judgment Filed. Notice Sent To: All Plaintiffs. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Sealed Document Plaintiffs' Response to Defendants' Statement of Undisputed Facts, #2 Proposed Sealed Document Plaintiffs' Additional Statement of Material Undisputed Facts)(Johnson, Kristen) This entry/document has been filed under seal pursuant to statute, rule or court order and access is restricted. Please login to CM/ECF to view document(s).
June 12, 2019 Filing 972 MOTION to Seal Plaintiffs' Memorandum in Opposition to Defendants' Motion for Summary Judgment Filed. Notice Sent To: All Plaintiffs. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Sealed Document)(Johnson, Kristen) This entry/document has been filed under seal pursuant to statute, rule or court order and access is restricted. Please login to CM/ECF to view document(s).
June 12, 2019 Opinion or Order TEXT ORDER denying as moot #888 MOTION to Exclude Certain Opinions and Testimony of Michael Johnson. So Ordered by Chief Judge William E. Smith on 6/12/2019. (Jackson, Ryan)
June 12, 2019 Filing 971 NOTICE by CVS Pharmacy, Inc., Rite-Aid Corporation, Rite-Aid Hdqtrs. Corp. Retailer and End-Payor Class Plaintiffs Notice of Intent Not to Pursue the Lupin Reverse Payment Claim Against Defendant Warner Chilcott, Withdrawal of Michael Johnson as an Expert, and Mootness of Certain of Defendants Pending Motions (Refsin, Barry)
June 10, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 970 NOTICE by Ahold USA, Inc., Albertson's, LLC, Mary Alexander, Allied Services Division Welfare Fund, Bayer Healthcare Pharmaceuticals, Inc., CVS Health Corporation, CVS Pharmacy, Inc., Caremark, LLC, City of Providence, Direct Purchaser Class Plaintiffs, Electrical Workers 242 & 294 Health & Welfare Fund, End Payor Plaintiffs, Fraternal Order of Police Fort Lauderdale Lodge 31, HEB Grocery Company L.P., Laborers International Union of North America, Denise Loy, New York Hotel Trades Council & Hotel Association of New York City, Inc. Health Benefits Fund, Painters District Council No. 30 Health & Welfare Fund, Plaintiffs, Rite-Aid Corporation, Rite-Aid Hdqtrs. Corp., Rochester Drug Co-Operative, Inc., Safeway, Inc., Teamsters Local 237 Welfare Benefits Fund, The Kroger Co., United Food and Commercial Workers Local 1776, Walgreen Co. Letter from Kristen A. Johnson to Magistrate Judge Sullivan Regarding Dispute Between the Parties About Proper Sealing/Redaction of Summary Judgment and Daubert Filings (as Requested by Magistrate Judge Sullivan at 6/3 Telephonic Hearing) (Johnson, Kristen)
June 7, 2019 Filing 969 STATUS REPORT (Joint Status Report Regarding Case Schedule) by Lupin Ltd., Lupin Pharmaceuticals, Inc., Plaintiffs, Warner Chilcott Company, Inc., Warner Chilcott Company, LLC, Warner Chilcott Corporation, Warner Chilcott Holdings Company III, Ltd., Warner Chilcott Laboratories Ireland Limited, Warner Chilcott Public Limited Company, Warner Chilcott Sales (US), LLC, Warner Chilcott U.S., LLC, Watson Laboratories, Inc., Watson Pharmaceuticals, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C)(Benjamin, Nicole)
June 6, 2019 Opinion or Order TEXT ORDER granting #788 Motion for Leave to File Full Deposition Transcripts. So Ordered by Chief Judge William E. Smith on 6/6/2019. (Jackson, Ryan)
June 5, 2019 Filing 968 MEMORANDUM IN SUPPORT by All Plaintiffs in support of #871 MOTION to Strike Plaintiffs' Motion to Strike Defendants Exhibit 70 (Declaration of Pramod Dahibhate) and to Preclude Defendants from Relying Thereon in Support of Their Motion for Summary Judgment, Any Other Motion, at a Hearing, or at Tria. (Attachments: #1 Dec of Ziegler, #2 Exhibit A, #3 Exhibit B, #4 Exhibit C, #5 Exhibit D)(Potter, Carrie) This document has been filed under seal pursuant to LR Gen 102 and access is restricted. Please login to CM/ECF to view document(s).
June 5, 2019 Opinion or Order TEXT ORDER granting #962 Motion to Seal. So Ordered by Chief Judge William E. Smith on 6/5/2019. (Jackson, Ryan)
June 3, 2019 Filing 967 Assented MOTION to Unseal Document #954 Memorandum in Support, filed by Painters District Council No. 30 Health & Welfare Fund, Laborers International Union of North America, Direct Purchaser Class Plaintiffs, Rite-Aid Hdqtrs. Corp., End Payor Plaintiffs, HEB Grocery Company L.P., Melissa Chrestman, Albertson's, LLC, Allied Services Division Welfare Fund, Walgreen Co., The Kroger Co., Electrical Workers 242 & 294 Health & Welfare Fund, Mary Alexander, CVS Pharmacy, Inc., American Sales Company, LLC, Rochester Drug Co-Operative, Inc., City of Providence, United Food and Commercial Workers Local 1776, New York Hotel Trades Council & Hotel Association of New York City, Inc. Health Benefits Fund, Ahold USA, Inc., Melisa Chrestman, Fraternal Order of Police Fort Lauderdale Lodge 31, Denise Loy, Rite-Aid Corporation, Safeway, Inc., Teamsters Local 237 Welfare Benefits Fund Plaintiffs' Unopposed Motion to Unseal Memorandum of Law in Support of Motion to Partially Exclude Opinions and Testimony of Stephen G. Kunin and Accompanying Declaration (ECF Nos. 954 & 954-1 Only) filed by All Plaintiffs. Responses due by 6/17/2019. (Johnson, Kristen)
June 3, 2019 Filing 966 Assented MOTION to Unseal Document Plaintiffs' Unopposed Motion to Unseal Memorandum of Law in Support of Motion to Exclude Opinions and Testimony of Judge T. John Ward and Accompanying Declaration (ECF Nos. 952 & 952-1 Only) filed by All Plaintiffs. Responses due by 6/17/2019. (Johnson, Kristen)
June 3, 2019 Filing 965 Assented MOTION to Unseal Document #951 Memorandum in Support, filed by Painters District Council No. 30 Health & Welfare Fund, Laborers International Union of North America, Direct Purchaser Class Plaintiffs, Rite-Aid Hdqtrs. Corp., End Payor Plaintiffs, HEB Grocery Company L.P., Melissa Chrestman, Albertson's, LLC, Allied Services Division Welfare Fund, Walgreen Co., The Kroger Co., Electrical Workers 242 & 294 Health & Welfare Fund, Mary Alexander, CVS Pharmacy, Inc., American Sales Company, LLC, Rochester Drug Co-Operative, Inc., City of Providence, United Food and Commercial Workers Local 1776, New York Hotel Trades Council & Hotel Association of New York City, Inc. Health Benefits Fund, Ahold USA, Inc., Melisa Chrestman, Fraternal Order of Police Fort Lauderdale Lodge 31, Denise Loy, Rite-Aid Corporation, Safeway, Inc., Teamsters Local 237 Welfare Benefits Fund Plaintiffs' Unopposed Motion to Unseal Memorandum of Law in Support of Motion to Partially Exclude Opinions and Testimony of Robert A. Dormer and Accompanying Declaration (ECF Nos. 951 & 951-1 Only) filed by All Plaintiffs. Responses due by 6/17/2019. (Johnson, Kristen)
June 3, 2019 Filing 964 MOTION to Unseal Document #942 Memorandum in Support,, filed by Laborers International Union of North America, Direct Purchaser Class Plaintiffs, Warner Chilcott Holdings Company III, Ltd., Warner Chilcott Public Limited Company, Albertson's, LLC, The Kroger Co., Warner Chilcott Laboratories Ireland Limited, Mary Alexander, Warner Chilcott Corporation, City of Providence, Warner Chilcott Company, LLC, Actavis, Inc., Rite-Aid Corporation, Safeway, Inc., Teamsters Local 237 Welfare Benefits Fund, Painters District Council No. 30 Health & Welfare Fund, Warner Chilcott Sales (US), LLC, Watson Pharmaceuticals, Inc., Rite-Aid Hdqtrs. Corp., End Payor Plaintiffs, HEB Grocery Company L.P., Watson Laboratories, Inc., Allied Services Division Welfare Fund, Walgreen Co., Electrical Workers 242 & 294 Health & Welfare Fund, Allergan PLC, Warner Chilcott Company, Inc., Warner Chilcott U.S., LLC, CVS Pharmacy, Inc., Rochester Drug Co-Operative, Inc., United Food and Commercial Workers Local 1776, New York Hotel Trades Council & Hotel Association of New York City, Inc. Health Benefits Fund, Ahold USA, Inc., Lupin Pharmaceuticals, Inc., Fraternal Order of Police Fort Lauderdale Lodge 31, Denise Loy, Lupin Ltd. Unopposed Motion To Unseal Certain Portions Of End-Payor Plaintiffs Motion To Exclude The Merits Testimony Of Defendants Expert James W. Hughes, Ph.D. filed by End Payor Plaintiffs. Responses due by 6/17/2019. (Miller, Marvin)
June 3, 2019 Filing 963 MOTION to Unseal Document THE DECLARATION OF TERENCE S. ZIEGLER IN SUPPORT OF PLAINTIFFS MOTION TO EXCLUDE CERTAIN PURPORTED EXPERT OPINIONS AND TESTIMONY OF CHRISTOPHER SMITH, ROBERT DORMER, AND MARK ROBBINS filed by All Plaintiffs. Responses due by 6/17/2019. (Meltzer, Joseph)
June 3, 2019 Filing 962 MOTION to Seal Plaintiffs' Memorandum of Law in Support of Motion to Strike Defendants Exhibit 70 (Declaration of Pramod Dahibhate) and to Preclude Defendants from Relying Thereon in Support of Their Motion for Summary Judgment, Any Other Motion, at a Hearing, or at Trial Filed. Notice Sent To: All Plaintiffs. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Sealed Document Memorandum, #2 Proposed Sealed Document Declaration of Terence S. Ziegler, #3 Proposed Sealed Document Exhibit A, #4 Proposed Sealed Document Exhibit B, #5 Proposed Sealed Document Exhibit C, #6 Exhibit Exhibit D)(Meltzer, Joseph) This entry/document has been filed under seal pursuant to statute, rule or court order and access is restricted. Please login to CM/ECF to view document(s).
June 3, 2019 Filing 961 MOTION to Unseal Document Certain Portions of Plaintiffs (1) Motion to Exclude Opinions and Testimony of Drs. Christine S. Meyer and Mark S. Robbins Regarding Procompetitive Justifications of Reverse Payments and (2) Motion to Exclude Opinions and Testimony of Drs. Christine S. Meyer, Mark S. Robbins, and Melissa A. Schilling Regarding Lack of Anticompetitive Effect from Product Hop filed by All Plaintiffs. Responses due by 6/17/2019. (Shadowen, Steve)
June 3, 2019 Filing 960 REDACTION to 904-13 Additional Expert Report of Keith B. Leffler by All Plaintiffs. (Kohn, Peter)
June 3, 2019 Filing 959 MOTION to Unseal Document Select Documents from Motion for Leave to File Under Seal Daubert Motions Regarding Dr. Berneman, Mr. Green, and Dr. Meyer filed by All Plaintiffs. Responses due by 6/17/2019. (Kohn, Peter)
June 3, 2019 Filing 954 MEMORANDUM IN SUPPORT by All Plaintiffs in support of #899 MOTION to Partially Exclude the Opinions and Testimony of Stephen G. Kunin. (Attachments: #1 Dec of Kristen Johnson, #2 Exhibit 1, #3 Exhibit 2, #4 Exhibit 3)(Potter, Carrie) This document has been filed under seal pursuant to LR Gen 102 and access is restricted. Please login to CM/ECF to view document(s).
June 3, 2019 Minute Entry for proceedings held before Magistrate Judge Patricia A. Sullivan: Telephone Conference held on 6/3/2019. Direct Purchasers: Edward Notargiacomo and Joseph Meltzer; End Payors: Matthew Van Tine; Walgreens: Scott Perwin; CVS and Rite Aid: Monica Kiley; Defendants: Nicole Benjamin, Kate Dyson and Lauren Papenhausen (Chambers at 12:00.) (Saucier, Martha)
June 3, 2019 Filing 952 MEMORANDUM IN SUPPORT by All Plaintiffs in support of #895 MOTION to Exclude the Opinions and Testimony of Judge John T. Ward. (Attachments: #1 Dec of Kristen Johnson, #2 Exhibit 1, #3 Exhibit 2, #4 Exhibit 3, #5 Exhibit 4)(Potter, Carrie) This document has been filed under seal pursuant to LR Gen 102 and access is restricted. Please login to CM/ECF to view document(s).
June 3, 2019 Filing 951 MEMORANDUM IN SUPPORT by All Plaintiffs in support of #881 MOTION to Partially Exclude the Opinions and Testimony of Robert A. Dormer. (Attachments: #1 Dec of Kristen Johnson, #2 Exhibit 1)(Potter, Carrie) This document has been filed under seal pursuant to LR Gen 102 and access is restricted. Please login to CM/ECF to view document(s).
June 3, 2019 Filing 942 MEMORANDUM IN SUPPORT by Plaintiffs in support of #876 MOTION To Exclude The Merits Testimony And Opinions Of James W. Hughes, Ph.D.. (Attachments: #1 Dec of Marvin Miller, #2 Exhibit 1, #3 Exhibit 2, #4 Exhibit 3, #5 Exhibit 4, #6 Exhibit 5, #7 Exhibit 6, #8 Exhibit 7, #9 Exhibit 8, #10 Exhibit 9, #11 Exhibit 10, #12 Exhibit 11, #13 Exhibit 12, #14 Exhibit 13, #15 Exhibit 14)(Potter, Carrie) This document has been filed under seal pursuant to LR Gen 102 and access is restricted. Please login to CM/ECF to view document(s).
June 3, 2019 Filing 941 DECLARATION re #875 MOTION to Exclude Opinions and Testimony of Drs. Christine S. Meyer, Mark S. Robbins, and Melissa A. Schilling Regarding Lack of Anticompetitive Effect from Product Hop , #874 MOTION to Exclude Opinions and Testimony of Drs. Christine S. Meyer and Mark S. Robbins Regarding Procompetitive Justifications of Reverse Payments by All Plaintiffs. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C, #4 Exhibit D, #5 Exhibit E, #6 Exhibit F, #7 Exhibit G, #8 Exhibit H, #9 Exhibit I, #10 Exhibit J)(Potter, Carrie) This document has been filed under seal pursuant to LR Gen 102 and access is restricted. Please login to CM/ECF to view document(s).
June 3, 2019 Filing 940 MEMORANDUM IN SUPPORT by All Plaintiffs in support of #875 MOTION to Exclude Opinions and Testimony of Drs. Christine S. Meyer, Mark S. Robbins, and Melissa A. Schilling Regarding Lack of Anticompetitive Effect from Product Hop . (Potter, Carrie) This document has been filed under seal pursuant to LR Gen 102 and access is restricted. Please login to CM/ECF to view document(s).
June 3, 2019 Filing 939 MEMORANDUM IN SUPPORT by All Plaintiffs in support of #874 MOTION to Exclude Opinions and Testimony of Drs. Christine S. Meyer and Mark S. Robbins Regarding Procompetitive Justifications of Reverse Payments . (Potter, Carrie) This document has been filed under seal pursuant to LR Gen 102 and access is restricted. Please login to CM/ECF to view document(s).
May 31, 2019 Filing 945 REDACTION to 906 Expert Merits Report of Pierre-Yves Cremieux by All Plaintiffs. (Simoncelli, Michael)
May 31, 2019 Filing 938 MEMORANDUM IN SUPPORT by Warner Chilcott Company, Inc., Warner Chilcott Company, LLC, Warner Chilcott Corporation, Warner Chilcott Holdings Company III, Ltd., Warner Chilcott Laboratories Ireland Limited, Warner Chilcott Public Limited Company, Warner Chilcott Sales (US), LLC, Warner Chilcott U.S., LLC, Watson Laboratories, Inc., Watson Pharmaceuticals, Inc. in support of #888 MOTION to Exclude Certain Opinions and Testimony of Michael Johnson (Public Version). (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 7, #2 Exhibit 8, #3 Exhibit 9, #4 Exhibit 10, #5 Exhibit 14)(Benjamin, Nicole)
May 31, 2019 Filing 937 MEMORANDUM IN SUPPORT by Warner Chilcott Company, Inc., Warner Chilcott Company, LLC, Warner Chilcott Corporation, Warner Chilcott Holdings Company III, Ltd., Warner Chilcott Laboratories Ireland Limited, Warner Chilcott Public Limited Company, Warner Chilcott Sales (US), LLC, Warner Chilcott U.S., LLC, Watson Laboratories, Inc., Watson Pharmaceuticals, Inc. in support of #886 MOTION to Exclude Certain Opinions and Testimony of Michael Thomas, M.D., on Chewability and Patent Issues (Public Version). (Benjamin, Nicole)
May 31, 2019 Filing 936 MEMORANDUM IN SUPPORT by Warner Chilcott Company, Inc., Warner Chilcott Company, LLC, Warner Chilcott Corporation, Warner Chilcott Holdings Company III, Ltd., Warner Chilcott Laboratories Ireland Limited, Warner Chilcott Public Limited Company, Warner Chilcott Sales (US), LLC, Warner Chilcott U.S., LLC, Watson Laboratories, Inc., Watson Pharmaceuticals, Inc. in support of #879 MOTION to Exclude the Opinions and Testimony of Deborah Jaskot Concerning Lupin's Inability to Obtain FDA Approval for its Generic Until 2015 (Public Version). (Benjamin, Nicole)
May 31, 2019 Filing 935 MEMORANDUM IN SUPPORT by Warner Chilcott Company, Inc., Warner Chilcott Company, LLC, Warner Chilcott Corporation, Warner Chilcott Holdings Company III, Ltd., Warner Chilcott Laboratories Ireland Limited, Warner Chilcott Public Limited Company, Warner Chilcott Sales (US), LLC, Warner Chilcott U.S., LLC, Watson Laboratories, Inc., Watson Pharmaceuticals, Inc. in support of #885 MOTION to Seal Memorandum of Law in Support of Defendants' Motion to Exclude the Opinions and Testimony of End-Payor Plaintiffs' Expert Dr. Gary L. French and Exhibits Thereto Filed. (Public Version). (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 6, #2 Exhibit 10)(Benjamin, Nicole)
May 31, 2019 Filing 934 MEMORANDUM IN SUPPORT by Warner Chilcott Company, Inc., Warner Chilcott Company, LLC, Warner Chilcott Corporation, Warner Chilcott Holdings Company III, Ltd., Warner Chilcott Laboratories Ireland Limited, Warner Chilcott Public Limited Company, Warner Chilcott Sales (US), LLC, Warner Chilcott U.S., LLC, Watson Laboratories, Inc., Watson Pharmaceuticals, Inc. in support of #890 MOTION in Limine to Exclude Certain Opinions of Lentz, Doll, and Jewell (Public Version). (Attachments: #1 Appendix A)(Benjamin, Nicole)
May 31, 2019 Filing 933 MEMORANDUM IN SUPPORT by Warner Chilcott Company, Inc., Warner Chilcott Company, LLC, Warner Chilcott Corporation, Warner Chilcott Holdings Company III, Ltd., Warner Chilcott Laboratories Ireland Limited, Warner Chilcott Public Limited Company, Warner Chilcott Sales (US), LLC, Warner Chilcott U.S., LLC, Watson Laboratories, Inc., Watson Pharmaceuticals, Inc. in support of #892 MOTION in Limine to Exclude Opinions and Testimony of John R. Tupman (Public Version). (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 3, #2 Exhibit 4, #3 Exhibit 5 (Part 1 of 2), #4 Exhibit 5 (Part 2 of 2))(Benjamin, Nicole)
May 31, 2019 Filing 932 MEMORANDUM IN SUPPORT by Warner Chilcott Company, Inc., Warner Chilcott Company, LLC, Warner Chilcott Corporation, Warner Chilcott Holdings Company III, Ltd., Warner Chilcott Laboratories Ireland Limited, Warner Chilcott Public Limited Company, Warner Chilcott Sales (US), LLC, Warner Chilcott U.S., LLC, Watson Laboratories, Inc., Watson Pharmaceuticals, Inc. in support of #882 MOTION to Exclude the Opinions and Testimony of Plaintiffs' Expert Dr. Thomas McGuire (Public Version). (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit 2)(Benjamin, Nicole)
May 31, 2019 Filing 931 REPLY MEMORANDUM re #567 MOTION to Amend/Correct --- Direct Purchaser Plaintiff's Motion to Amend Complaint And Appoint FWK Holdings, LLC Class Representative (Public version without redactions - previously filed under seal as Doc. 615-1). (Kohn, Peter)
May 31, 2019 Filing 930 MOTION to Unseal Document Select Documents From Motion to Exclude Karen Ryle filed by Ahold USA, Inc., Albertson's, LLC, Mary Alexander, Allied Services Division Welfare Fund, American Sales Company, LLC, CVS Pharmacy, Inc., Melisa Chrestman, Melissa Chrestman, City of Providence, Direct Purchaser Class Plaintiffs, Electrical Workers 242 & 294 Health & Welfare Fund, End Payor Plaintiffs, Fraternal Order of Police Fort Lauderdale Lodge 31, HEB Grocery Company L.P., Laborers International Union of North America, Denise Loy, New York Hotel Trades Council & Hotel Association of New York City, Inc. Health Benefits Fund, Painters District Council No. 30 Health & Welfare Fund, Rite-Aid Corporation, Rite-Aid Hdqtrs. Corp., Rochester Drug Co-Operative, Inc., Safeway, Inc., Teamsters Local 237 Welfare Benefits Fund, The Kroger Co., United Food and Commercial Workers Local 1776, Walgreen Co.. Responses due by 6/14/2019. (Walker, Daniel)
May 31, 2019 Filing 929 NOTICE by Warner Chilcott Company, Inc., Warner Chilcott Company, LLC, Warner Chilcott Corporation, Warner Chilcott Holdings Company III, Ltd., Warner Chilcott Laboratories Ireland Limited, Warner Chilcott Public Limited Company, Warner Chilcott Sales (US), LLC, Warner Chilcott U.S., LLC, Watson Laboratories, Inc., Watson Pharmaceuticals, Inc. re #921 Notice (Other), (Response to Plaintiffs' May 29, 2019 submission (ECF No. 921) regarding the treatment of confidential information) (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B)(Benjamin, Nicole)
May 31, 2019 Filing 928 MOTION to Unseal Document Select Documents from Motion to Exclude Portions of Testimony of Dr. Pierre-Yves Cremieux filed by All Plaintiffs. Responses due by 6/14/2019. (Walker, Daniel)
May 31, 2019 Filing 927 REDACTION Memorandum of Law in Support of Plaintiffs' Motion to Partially Exclude the Opinions and Testimony of Ronald Thisted (Public Version) by All Plaintiffs. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Kristen A. Johnson, #2 Exhibit 1, #3 Exhibit 2, #4 Exhibit 3, #5 Exhibit 4, #6 Exhibit 5, #7 Exhibit 6)(Johnson, Kristen)
May 31, 2019 Filing 926 REDACTION to #871 MOTION to Strike Plaintiffs' Motion to Strike Defendants Exhibit 70 (Declaration of Pramod Dahibhate) and to Preclude Defendants from Relying Thereon in Support of Their Motion for Summary Judgment, Any Other Motion, at a Hearing, or at Tria by All Plaintiffs. (Meltzer, Joseph)
May 31, 2019 Filing 925 REDACTION to #872 MOTION Exclude Certain Purported Expert Opinions and Testimony of Christopher Smith, Robert Dormer, and Mark Robbins by All Plaintiffs. (Meltzer, Joseph)
May 31, 2019 Filing 924 REDACTION Plaintiffs' Memorandum of Law in support of Plaintiffs' Motion to Exclude in Part the Expert Testimony of Philip Green Filed by All Plaintiffs. (Kohn, Peter)
May 31, 2019 Opinion or Order TEXT ORDER granting #894 Motion to Seal; granting #896 Motion to Seal; granting #898 Motion to Seal; granting #900 Motion to Seal; granting #904 Motion to Seal. So Ordered by Chief Judge William E. Smith on 5/31/2019. (Jackson, Ryan)
May 31, 2019 Filing 923 REDACTED Memorandum in Support of #867 Motion to Exclude in Part the Opinions of Christine S. Meyer by All Plaintiffs. (Ravkind, Lauren) Docket Text Modified on 5/31/2019 (Farrell Pletcher, Paula).
May 31, 2019 Filing 922 REDACTED MEMORANDUM IN SUPPORT of #865 MOTION to Exclude In Part Expert Opinions of Dr. Philip D. Darney by All Plaintiffs. (Ravkind, Lauren) Docket Text Modified on 5/31/2019 (Farrell Pletcher, Paula).
May 31, 2019 NOTICE of Hearing: Telephone Conference set for 6/3/2019 at 12:00 PM in Magistrate Judge Sullivan Chambers before Magistrate Judge Patricia A. Sullivan. Call in instructions to be sent via email.(Saucier, Martha)
May 29, 2019 Filing 921 NOTICE by Plaintiffs Letter from Kristen Johnson to Chief Judge Smith and Magistrate Judge Sullivan Regarding Dispute Between the Parties Over Sealing/Redaction of Summary Judgment and Daubert Filings (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A)(Johnson, Kristen)
May 29, 2019 NOTICE of Hearing: In Chambers Conference re: Scheduling will be held on Wednesday 6/12/2019 at 3:30 PM in the Judicial Conference Room, 2nd Floor before Judge William E. Smith. (Jackson, Ryan)
May 28, 2019 Filing 920 SUR-REPLY to Reply to Motion Response re #604 Response to Motion,, (Public version without redactions - previously filed under seal as Doc. 625-1) filed by Warner Chilcott Company, Inc., Warner Chilcott Company, LLC, Warner Chilcott Corporation, Warner Chilcott Holdings Company III, Ltd., Warner Chilcott Laboratories Ireland Limited, Warner Chilcott Public Limited Company, Warner Chilcott Sales (US), LLC, Warner Chilcott U.S., LLC, Watson Laboratories, Inc., Watson Pharmaceuticals, Inc.. (Benjamin, Nicole)
May 24, 2019 Filing 919 EXHIBIT IN SUPPORT by Warner Chilcott Company, Inc., Warner Chilcott Company, LLC, Warner Chilcott Corporation, Warner Chilcott Holdings Company III, Ltd., Warner Chilcott Laboratories Ireland Limited, Warner Chilcott Public Limited Company, Warner Chilcott Sales (US), LLC, Warner Chilcott U.S., LLC, Watson Laboratories, Inc., Watson Pharmaceuticals, Inc. in support of #913 MOTION for Summary Judgment (Public Version) (Public Exhibits). (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 252, #2 Exhibit 253, #3 Exhibit 254, #4 Exhibit 255, #5 Exhibit 256, #6 Exhibit 257, #7 Exhibit 258, #8 Exhibit 259, #9 Exhibit 260, #10 Exhibit 262, #11 Exhibit 263, #12 Exhibit 264, #13 Exhibit 266, #14 Exhibit 267, #15 Exhibit 268, #16 Exhibit 269, #17 Exhibit 270, #18 Exhibit 271, #19 Exhibit 272, #20 Exhibit 277, #21 Exhibit 278)(Benjamin, Nicole)
May 24, 2019 Filing 918 EXHIBIT IN SUPPORT by Warner Chilcott Company, Inc., Warner Chilcott Company, LLC, Warner Chilcott Corporation, Warner Chilcott Holdings Company III, Ltd., Warner Chilcott Laboratories Ireland Limited, Warner Chilcott Public Limited Company, Warner Chilcott Sales (US), LLC, Warner Chilcott U.S., LLC, Watson Laboratories, Inc., Watson Pharmaceuticals, Inc. in support of #913 MOTION for Summary Judgment (Public Version) (Public Exhibits). (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 227, #2 Exhibit 228, #3 Exhibit 229, #4 Exhibit 230, #5 Exhibit 231, #6 Exhibit 232, #7 Exhibit 233, #8 Exhibit 234, #9 Exhibit 235, #10 Exhibit 236, #11 Exhibit 237, #12 Exhibit 238, #13 Exhibit 239, #14 Exhibit 240, #15 Exhibit 241, #16 Exhibit 242, #17 Exhibit 243, #18 Exhibit 244, #19 Exhibit 245, #20 Exhibit 246, #21 Exhibit 247, #22 Exhibit 248, #23 Exhibit 249, #24 Exhibit 250)(Benjamin, Nicole)
May 24, 2019 Filing 917 EXHIBIT IN SUPPORT by Warner Chilcott Company, Inc., Warner Chilcott Company, LLC, Warner Chilcott Corporation, Warner Chilcott Holdings Company III, Ltd., Warner Chilcott Laboratories Ireland Limited, Warner Chilcott Public Limited Company, Warner Chilcott Sales (US), LLC, Warner Chilcott U.S., LLC, Watson Laboratories, Inc., Watson Pharmaceuticals, Inc. in support of #913 MOTION for Summary Judgment (Public Version) (Public Exhibit). (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 150)(Benjamin, Nicole)
May 24, 2019 Filing 916 EXHIBIT IN SUPPORT by Warner Chilcott Company, Inc., Warner Chilcott Company, LLC, Warner Chilcott Corporation, Warner Chilcott Holdings Company III, Ltd., Warner Chilcott Laboratories Ireland Limited, Warner Chilcott Public Limited Company, Warner Chilcott Sales (US), LLC, Warner Chilcott U.S., LLC, Watson Laboratories, Inc., Watson Pharmaceuticals, Inc. in support of #913 MOTION for Summary Judgment (Public Version) . (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 130, #2 Exhibit 133, #3 Exhibit 134, #4 Exhibit 135, #5 Exhibit 136, #6 Exhibit 149)(Benjamin, Nicole)
May 24, 2019 Filing 915 EXHIBIT IN SUPPORT by Warner Chilcott Company, Inc., Warner Chilcott Company, LLC, Warner Chilcott Corporation, Warner Chilcott Holdings Company III, Ltd., Warner Chilcott Laboratories Ireland Limited, Warner Chilcott Public Limited Company, Warner Chilcott Sales (US), LLC, Warner Chilcott U.S., LLC, Watson Laboratories, Inc., Watson Pharmaceuticals, Inc. in support of #913 MOTION for Summary Judgment (Public Version) (Public Exhibits). (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 69, #2 Exhibit 74, #3 Exhibit 77, #4 Exhibit 90, #5 Exhibit 105, #6 Exhibit 106, #7 Exhibit 118, #8 Exhibit 126, #9 Exhibit 127, #10 Exhibit 128)(Benjamin, Nicole)
May 24, 2019 Filing 914 STATEMENT OF UNDISPUTED FACTS (Public Version) by Warner Chilcott Company, Inc., Warner Chilcott Company, LLC, Warner Chilcott Corporation, Warner Chilcott Holdings Company III, Ltd., Warner Chilcott Laboratories Ireland Limited, Warner Chilcott Public Limited Company, Warner Chilcott Sales (US), LLC, Warner Chilcott U.S., LLC, Watson Laboratories, Inc., Watson Pharmaceuticals, Inc. re #913 MOTION for Summary Judgment (Public Version). (Benjamin, Nicole)
May 24, 2019 Filing 913 Memo in Support of #842 Motion for Summary Judgment (Public Version) filed by Warner Chilcott Company, Inc., Warner Chilcott Company, LLC, Warner Chilcott Corporation, Warner Chilcott Holdings Company III, Ltd., Warner Chilcott Laboratories Ireland Limited, Warner Chilcott Public Limited Company, Warner Chilcott Sales (US), LLC, Warner Chilcott U.S., LLC, Watson Laboratories, Inc., Watson Pharmaceuticals, Inc.. Responses due by 6/7/2019. (Benjamin, Nicole) Modified on 9/11/2019 (Potter, Carrie). Modified on 9/11/2019 (Potter, Carrie).
May 23, 2019 Opinion or Order TEXT ORDER granting in part and denying in part #907 Motion for Leave to File Excess Pages: Plaintiffs may have up to 125 pages for their Opposition to Defendants' Motion for Summary Judgment, inclusive of any statements of disputed and undisputed facts. This shall not include any restatement of Defendants' facts. Defendants may have 60 pages, inclusive of any additional statements of disputed and undisputed facts, but excluding any restatement of Plaintiffs' factual assertions. In addition to these filings, the Court directs the parties to submit, one week after Defendants' Reply is submitted, a single document containing all statements of disputed and undisputed facts in chart format. This filing shall contain no new or additional facts, but shall be used as a master document compiling all facts. It shall have no page limit. The Court is disinclined to take up page limits for this Motion again. So Ordered by Chief Judge William E. Smith on 5/23/2019. (Jackson, Ryan)
May 23, 2019 Filing 912 MEMORANDUM IN SUPPORT by Plaintiffs in support of #872 MOTION Exclude Certain Purported Expert Opinions and Testimony of Christopher Smith, Robert Dormer, and Mark Robbins . (Attachments: #1 Dec of Terence S. Ziegler, #2 Exhibit A, #3 Exhibit B, #4 Exhibit C, #5 Exhibit D, #6 Exhibit E)(Potter, Carrie) This document has been filed under seal pursuant to LR Gen 102 and access is restricted. Please login to CM/ECF to view document(s).
May 22, 2019 Filing 911 NOTICE by Warner Chilcott Company, Inc., Warner Chilcott Company, LLC, Warner Chilcott Corporation, Warner Chilcott Holdings Company III, Ltd., Warner Chilcott Laboratories Ireland Limited, Warner Chilcott Public Limited Company, Warner Chilcott Sales (US), LLC, Warner Chilcott U.S., LLC, Watson Laboratories, Inc., Watson Pharmaceuticals, Inc. Withdrawal of Appearance for Stacey P. Nakasian (Nakasian, Stacey)
May 21, 2019 Filing 908 RESPONSE In Opposition to #907 MOTION for Leave to File Excess Pages (Motion to Enlarge Page Limit for Plaintiffs' Rule 56 Opposition) filed by Warner Chilcott Company, Inc., Warner Chilcott Company, LLC, Warner Chilcott Corporation, Warner Chilcott Holdings Company III, Ltd., Warner Chilcott Laboratories Ireland Limited, Warner Chilcott Public Limited Company, Warner Chilcott Sales (US), LLC, Warner Chilcott U.S., LLC, Watson Laboratories, Inc., Watson Pharmaceuticals, Inc.. Replies due by 5/28/2019. (Benjamin, Nicole)
May 21, 2019 Filing 907 MOTION for Leave to File Excess Pages (Motion to Enlarge Page Limit for Plaintiffs' Rule 56 Opposition) filed by All Plaintiffs. (Kohn, Peter)
May 20, 2019 Filing 904 MOTION to Seal Daubert Motions Regarding Dr. Berneman, Mr. Green, and Dr. Meyer Filed. Notice Sent To: All Plaintiffs. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Sealed Document Memorandum of Law in support of Plaintiffs' Motion to Exclude in Part the Expert Opinions of Christine Meyer, Ph.D. and Philip Green that Authorized Generics were Facing Legal Uncertainty, #2 Proposed Sealed Document Memorandum of Law in support of Plaintiffs' Motion to Exclude the Expert Testimony of Dr. Louis Berneman, Philip Green, and Dr. Christine Meyer Regarding "Fair Value", #3 Proposed Sealed Document Memorandum of Law in support of Plaintiffs' Motion to Exclude in Part the Expert Testimony of Philip Green, #4 Proposed Sealed Document Declaration of Peter Kohn in support of Daubert Motions Regarding Dr. Berneman, Mr. Green, and Dr. Meyer, #5 Proposed Sealed Document Exhibit 1, #6 Proposed Sealed Document Exhibit 2, #7 Proposed Sealed Document Exhibit 3, #8 Proposed Sealed Document Exhibit 4, #9 Proposed Sealed Document Exhibit 5, #10 Proposed Sealed Document Exhibit 6, #11 Proposed Sealed Document Exhibit 7, #12 Proposed Sealed Document Exhibit 8, #13 Proposed Sealed Document Exhibit 9, #14 Proposed Sealed Document Exhibit 10, #15 Proposed Sealed Document Exhibit 11, #16 Proposed Sealed Document Exhibit 12, #17 Proposed Sealed Document Exhibit 13, #18 Proposed Sealed Document Exhibit 14, #19 Proposed Sealed Document Exhibit 15, #20 Proposed Sealed Document Exhibit 16)(Kohn, Peter) This entry/document has been filed under seal pursuant to statute, rule or court order and access is restricted. Please login to CM/ECF to view document(s).
May 20, 2019 Filing 903 MOTION to Exclude in Part the Expert Testimony of Philip Green filed by All Plaintiffs. Responses due by 6/3/2019. (Kohn, Peter)
May 20, 2019 Filing 902 MOTION Motion to Exclude the Expert Testimony of Dr. Louis Berneman, Philip Green, and Dr. Christine Meyer Regarding "Fair Value" filed by All Plaintiffs. Responses due by 6/3/2019. (Kohn, Peter)
May 20, 2019 Filing 901 MOTION Motion to Exclude in Part the Expert Opinions of Christine Meyer, Ph.D. and Philip Green that Authorized Generics Were Facing Legal Uncertainty filed by All Plaintiffs. Responses due by 6/3/2019. (Kohn, Peter)
May 20, 2019 Filing 900 MOTION to Seal Memorandum of Law in Support of Motion to Partially Exclude the Opinions and Testimony of Stephen G. Kunin and Exhibits to Accompanying Declaration Filed. Notice Sent To: All Plaintiffs. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Sealed Document Memorandum of Law in Support of Plaintiffs Motion to Partially Exclude the Opinions and Testimony of Stephen G. Kunin, #2 Proposed Sealed Document Declaration of Kristen A. Johnson Plaintiffs Motion to Partially Exclude the Opinions and Testimony of Stephen G. Kunin, #3 Proposed Sealed Document Exhibit 1 to Johnson Declaration, #4 Proposed Sealed Document Exhibit 2 to Johnson Declaration, #5 Proposed Sealed Document Exhibit 3 to Johnson Declaration)(Johnson, Kristen) This entry/document has been filed under seal pursuant to statute, rule or court order and access is restricted. Please login to CM/ECF to view document(s).
May 20, 2019 Filing 899 MOTION to Partially Exclude the Opinions and Testimony of Stephen G. Kunin filed by All Plaintiffs. Responses due by 6/3/2019. (Johnson, Kristen)
May 20, 2019 Filing 898 MOTION to Seal Memorandum of Law in Support of Motion to Partially Exclude the Opinions and Testimony of Ronald Thisted and Exhibits to Accompanying Declaration Filed. Notice Sent To: All Plaintiffs. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Sealed Document Memorandum of Law in Support of Plaintiffs Motion to Partially Exclude the Opinions and Testimony of Ronald Thisted, #2 Proposed Sealed Document Declaration of Kristen A. Johnson Plaintiffs Motion to Partially Exclude the Opinions and Testimony of Ronald Thisted, #3 Proposed Sealed Document Exhibit 1 to Johnson Declaration, #4 Proposed Sealed Document Exhibit 2 to Johnson Declaration, #5 Proposed Sealed Document Exhibit 3 to Johnson Declaration, #6 Proposed Sealed Document Exhibit 4 to Johnson Declaration, #7 Proposed Sealed Document Exhibit 5 to Johnson Declaration, #8 Proposed Sealed Document Exhibit 6 to Johnson Declaration)(Johnson, Kristen) This entry/document has been filed under seal pursuant to statute, rule or court order and access is restricted. Please login to CM/ECF to view document(s).
May 20, 2019 Filing 897 MOTION to Partially Exclude the Opinions and Testimony of Ronald Thisted filed by All Plaintiffs. Responses due by 6/3/2019. (Johnson, Kristen)
May 20, 2019 Filing 896 MOTION to Seal Materials Related to Plaintiffs' Motion to Exclude the Opinions and Testimony of Judge T. John Ward Filed. Notice Sent To: All Plaintiffs. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Sealed Document Memorandum in Support of Plaintiffs Motion to Exclude the Opinions and Testimony of Judge T. John Ward, #2 Proposed Sealed Document Declaration of Kristen A. Johnson in Support of Plaintiffs Motion to Exclude the Opinions and Testimony of Judge T. John Ward, #3 Proposed Sealed Document Exhibit 1 to Johnson Declaration, #4 Proposed Sealed Document Exhibit 2 to Johnson Declaration, #5 Proposed Sealed Document Exhibit 3 to Johnson Declaration, #6 Proposed Sealed Document Exhibit 4 to Johnson Declaration)(Johnson, Kristen) This entry/document has been filed under seal pursuant to statute, rule or court order and access is restricted. Please login to CM/ECF to view document(s).
May 20, 2019 Filing 895 MOTION to Exclude the Opinions and Testimony of Judge John T. Ward filed by All Plaintiffs. Responses due by 6/3/2019. (Johnson, Kristen)
May 20, 2019 Filing 894 MOTION to Seal Materials Related to Motion to Partially Exclude the Opinions and Testimony of Robert A. Dormer Filed. Notice Sent To: All Plaintiffs. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Sealed Document Memorandum in Support, #2 Proposed Sealed Document Declaration of Kristen Johnson, #3 Proposed Sealed Document Ex. 1 to Johnson Declaration)(Simoncelli, Michael) This entry/document has been filed under seal pursuant to statute, rule or court order and access is restricted. Please login to CM/ECF to view document(s).
May 20, 2019 Opinion or Order TEXT ORDER granting #866 Motion to Seal; granting #868 Motion to Seal; granting #869 Motion to Seal; granting #870 Motion to Seal; granting #873 Motion to Seal; granting #877 Motion to Seal; granting #878 Motion to Seal; granting #880 Motion to Seal; granting #883 Motion to Seal; granting #885 Motion to Seal; granting #887 Motion to Seal; granting #889 Motion to Seal; granting #891 Motion to Seal; granting #893 Motion to Seal. So Ordered by Chief Judge William E. Smith on 5/20/2019. (Jackson, Ryan)
May 17, 2019 Filing 893 MOTION to Seal Memorandum of Law and Exhibits to Motion to Exclude Opinions of John R. Tupman Filed. Notice Sent To: Warner Chilcott Holdings Company III, Ltd., Warner Chilcott Corporation, Warner Chilcott Public Limited Company, Watson Laboratories, Inc., Warner Chilcott Company, LLC, Warner Chilcott Sales (US), LLC, Watson Pharmaceuticals, Inc., Warner Chilcott Laboratories Ireland Limited, Warner Chilcott U.S., LLC, Warner Chilcott Company, Inc., Actavis, Inc., Ahold USA, Inc., Albertson's, LLC, Mary Alexander, Allergan PLC, Allied Services Division Welfare Fund, American Sales Company, LLC, CVS Pharmacy, Inc., Melisa Chrestman, Melissa Chrestman, City of Providence, Direct Purchaser Class Plaintiffs, Electrical Workers 242 & 294 Health & Welfare Fund, End Payor Plaintiffs, Fraternal Order of Police Fort Lauderdale Lodge 31, HEB Grocery Company L.P., Laborers International Union of North America, Denise Loy, Lupin Ltd., Lupin Pharmaceuticals, Inc., New York Hotel Trades Council & Hotel Association of New York City, Inc. Health Benefits Fund, Painters District Council No. 30 Health & Welfare Fund, Plaintiffs, Rite-Aid Corporation, Rite-Aid Hdqtrs. Corp., Rochester Drug Co-Operative, Inc., Safeway, Inc., Teamsters Local 237 Welfare Benefits Fund, The Kroger Co., United Food and Commercial Workers Local 1776, Walgreen Co.. (Attachments: #1 Supporting Memorandum Memorandum of Law iso Motion to Exclude Opinions of John R. Tupman, #2 Exhibit 1, #3 Exhibit 2, #4 Exhibit 3, #5 Exhibit 4, #6 Exhibit 5)(Benjamin, Nicole) This entry/document has been filed under seal pursuant to statute, rule or court order and access is restricted. Please login to CM/ECF to view document(s).
May 17, 2019 Filing 892 MOTION in Limine to Exclude Opinions and Testimony of John R. Tupman filed by Warner Chilcott Company, Inc., Warner Chilcott Company, LLC, Warner Chilcott Corporation, Warner Chilcott Holdings Company III, Ltd., Warner Chilcott Laboratories Ireland Limited, Warner Chilcott Public Limited Company, Warner Chilcott Sales (US), LLC, Warner Chilcott U.S., LLC, Watson Laboratories, Inc., Watson Pharmaceuticals, Inc.. Responses due by 5/24/2019. (Benjamin, Nicole)
May 17, 2019 Filing 891 MOTION to Seal Memorandum of Law and Exhibits to Motion to Exclude Certain Opinions of Doll, Lentz, and Jewell Filed. Notice Sent To: Warner Chilcott Holdings Company III, Ltd., Warner Chilcott Corporation, Warner Chilcott Public Limited Company, Watson Laboratories, Inc., Warner Chilcott Company, LLC, Warner Chilcott Sales (US), LLC, Watson Pharmaceuticals, Inc., Warner Chilcott Laboratories Ireland Limited, Warner Chilcott U.S., LLC, Warner Chilcott Company, Inc., Actavis, Inc., Ahold USA, Inc., Albertson's, LLC, Mary Alexander, Allergan PLC, Allied Services Division Welfare Fund, American Sales Company, LLC, CVS Pharmacy, Inc., Melisa Chrestman, Melissa Chrestman, City of Providence, Direct Purchaser Class Plaintiffs, Electrical Workers 242 & 294 Health & Welfare Fund, End Payor Plaintiffs, Fraternal Order of Police Fort Lauderdale Lodge 31, HEB Grocery Company L.P., Laborers International Union of North America, Denise Loy, Lupin Ltd., Lupin Pharmaceuticals, Inc., New York Hotel Trades Council & Hotel Association of New York City, Inc. Health Benefits Fund, Painters District Council No. 30 Health & Welfare Fund, Plaintiffs, Rite-Aid Corporation, Rite-Aid Hdqtrs. Corp., Rochester Drug Co-Operative, Inc., Safeway, Inc., Teamsters Local 237 Welfare Benefits Fund, The Kroger Co., United Food and Commercial Workers Local 1776, Walgreen Co.. (Attachments: #1 Supporting Memorandum Memorandum of Law iso Motion to Exclude Certain Opinions of Lentz, Doll and Jewell, #2 Appendix Appendix to Memorandum, #3 Exhibit 1, #4 Exhibit 2, #5 Exhibit 3, #6 Exhibit 4, #7 Exhibit 5, #8 Exhibit 6, #9 Exhibit 7, #10 Exhibit 8, #11 Exhibit 9, #12 Exhibit 10)(Benjamin, Nicole) This entry/document has been filed under seal pursuant to statute, rule or court order and access is restricted. Please login to CM/ECF to view document(s).
May 17, 2019 Filing 890 MOTION in Limine to Exclude Certain Opinions of Lentz, Doll, and Jewell filed by Warner Chilcott Company, Inc., Warner Chilcott Company, LLC, Warner Chilcott Corporation, Warner Chilcott Holdings Company III, Ltd., Warner Chilcott Laboratories Ireland Limited, Warner Chilcott Public Limited Company, Warner Chilcott Sales (US), LLC, Warner Chilcott U.S., LLC, Watson Laboratories, Inc., Watson Pharmaceuticals, Inc.. Responses due by 5/24/2019. (Benjamin, Nicole)
May 17, 2019 Filing 889 MOTION to Seal Memorandum of Law in Support of Defendants' Motion to Exclude Certain Opinions and Testimony of Michael Johnson and Exhibits Thereto Filed. Notice Sent To: Warner Chilcott Holdings Company III, Ltd., Warner Chilcott Corporation, Warner Chilcott Public Limited Company, Watson Laboratories, Inc., Warner Chilcott Company, LLC, Warner Chilcott Sales (US), LLC, Watson Pharmaceuticals, Inc., Warner Chilcott Laboratories Ireland Limited, Warner Chilcott U.S., LLC, Warner Chilcott Company, Inc., Actavis, Inc., Ahold USA, Inc., Albertson's, LLC, Mary Alexander, Allergan PLC, Allied Services Division Welfare Fund, American Sales Company, LLC, CVS Pharmacy, Inc., Melisa Chrestman, Melissa Chrestman, City of Providence, Direct Purchaser Class Plaintiffs, Electrical Workers 242 & 294 Health & Welfare Fund, End Payor Plaintiffs, Fraternal Order of Police Fort Lauderdale Lodge 31, HEB Grocery Company L.P., Laborers International Union of North America, Denise Loy, Lupin Ltd., Lupin Pharmaceuticals, Inc., New York Hotel Trades Council & Hotel Association of New York City, Inc. Health Benefits Fund, Painters District Council No. 30 Health & Welfare Fund, Plaintiffs, Rite-Aid Corporation, Rite-Aid Hdqtrs. Corp., Rochester Drug Co-Operative, Inc., Safeway, Inc., Teamsters Local 237 Welfare Benefits Fund, The Kroger Co., United Food and Commercial Workers Local 1776, Walgreen Co.. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Sealed Document Memorandum of Law in Support of Defendants' Motion to Exclude Certain Opinions and Testimony of Michael Johnson, #2 Proposed Sealed Document Exhibit 1, #3 Proposed Sealed Document Exhibit 2, #4 Proposed Sealed Document Exhibit 3, #5 Proposed Sealed Document Exhibit 4, #6 Proposed Sealed Document Exhibit 5, #7 Proposed Sealed Document Exhibit 6, #8 Proposed Sealed Document Exhibit 7, #9 Proposed Sealed Document Exhibit 8, #10 Proposed Sealed Document Exhibit 9, #11 Proposed Sealed Document Exhibit 10, #12 Proposed Sealed Document Exhibit 11, #13 Proposed Sealed Document Exhibit 12, #14 Proposed Sealed Document Exhibit 13, #15 Proposed Sealed Document Exhibit 14, #16 Proposed Sealed Document Exhibit 15, #17 Proposed Sealed Document Exhibit 16, #18 Proposed Sealed Document Exhibit 17)(Benjamin, Nicole) This entry/document has been filed under seal pursuant to statute, rule or court order and access is restricted. Please login to CM/ECF to view document(s).
May 17, 2019 Filing 888 MOTION to Exclude Certain Opinions and Testimony of Michael Johnson filed by Warner Chilcott Company, Inc., Warner Chilcott Company, LLC, Warner Chilcott Corporation, Warner Chilcott Holdings Company III, Ltd., Warner Chilcott Laboratories Ireland Limited, Warner Chilcott Public Limited Company, Warner Chilcott Sales (US), LLC, Warner Chilcott U.S., LLC, Watson Laboratories, Inc., Watson Pharmaceuticals, Inc.. Responses due by 5/31/2019. (Benjamin, Nicole)
May 17, 2019 Filing 887 MOTION to Seal Memorandum of Law in Support of Defendants' Motion to Exclude Certain Opinions and Testimony of Michael Thomas, M.D., on Chewability and Patent Issues and Exhibits Thereto Filed. Notice Sent To: Warner Chilcott Holdings Company III, Ltd., Warner Chilcott Corporation, Warner Chilcott Public Limited Company, Watson Laboratories, Inc., Warner Chilcott Company, LLC, Warner Chilcott Sales (US), LLC, Watson Pharmaceuticals, Inc., Warner Chilcott Laboratories Ireland Limited, Warner Chilcott U.S., LLC, Warner Chilcott Company, Inc., Actavis, Inc., Ahold USA, Inc., Albertson's, LLC, Mary Alexander, Allergan PLC, Allied Services Division Welfare Fund, American Sales Company, LLC, CVS Pharmacy, Inc., Melisa Chrestman, Melissa Chrestman, City of Providence, Direct Purchaser Class Plaintiffs, Electrical Workers 242 & 294 Health & Welfare Fund, End Payor Plaintiffs, Fraternal Order of Police Fort Lauderdale Lodge 31, HEB Grocery Company L.P., Laborers International Union of North America, Denise Loy, Lupin Ltd., Lupin Pharmaceuticals, Inc., New York Hotel Trades Council & Hotel Association of New York City, Inc. Health Benefits Fund, Painters District Council No. 30 Health & Welfare Fund, Plaintiffs, Rite-Aid Corporation, Rite-Aid Hdqtrs. Corp., Rochester Drug Co-Operative, Inc., Safeway, Inc., Teamsters Local 237 Welfare Benefits Fund, The Kroger Co., United Food and Commercial Workers Local 1776, Walgreen Co.. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Sealed Document Memorandum of Law in Support of Defendants' Motion to Exclude Certain Opinions and Testimony of Michael Thomas, M.D., on Chewability and Patent Issues, #2 Proposed Sealed Document Exhibit 1, #3 Proposed Sealed Document Exhibit 2, #4 Proposed Sealed Document Exhibit 3, #5 Proposed Sealed Document Exhibit 4)(Benjamin, Nicole) This entry/document has been filed under seal pursuant to statute, rule or court order and access is restricted. Please login to CM/ECF to view document(s).
May 17, 2019 Filing 886 MOTION to Exclude Certain Opinions and Testimony of Michael Thomas, M.D., on Chewability and Patent Issues filed by Warner Chilcott Company, Inc., Warner Chilcott Company, LLC, Warner Chilcott Corporation, Warner Chilcott Holdings Company III, Ltd., Warner Chilcott Laboratories Ireland Limited, Warner Chilcott Public Limited Company, Warner Chilcott Sales (US), LLC, Warner Chilcott U.S., LLC, Watson Laboratories, Inc., Watson Pharmaceuticals, Inc.. Responses due by 5/31/2019. (Benjamin, Nicole)
May 17, 2019 Filing 885 MOTION to Seal Memorandum of Law in Support of Defendants' Motion to Exclude the Opinions and Testimony of End-Payor Plaintiffs' Expert Dr. Gary L. French and Exhibits Thereto Filed. Notice Sent To: Warner Chilcott Holdings Company III, Ltd., Warner Chilcott Corporation, Warner Chilcott Public Limited Company, Watson Laboratories, Inc., Warner Chilcott Company, LLC, Warner Chilcott Sales (US), LLC, Watson Pharmaceuticals, Inc., Warner Chilcott Laboratories Ireland Limited, Warner Chilcott U.S., LLC, Warner Chilcott Company, Inc., Actavis, Inc., Ahold USA, Inc., Albertson's, LLC, Mary Alexander, Allergan PLC, Allied Services Division Welfare Fund, American Sales Company, LLC, CVS Pharmacy, Inc., Melisa Chrestman, Melissa Chrestman, City of Providence, Direct Purchaser Class Plaintiffs, Electrical Workers 242 & 294 Health & Welfare Fund, End Payor Plaintiffs, Fraternal Order of Police Fort Lauderdale Lodge 31, HEB Grocery Company L.P., Laborers International Union of North America, Denise Loy, Lupin Ltd., Lupin Pharmaceuticals, Inc., New York Hotel Trades Council & Hotel Association of New York City, Inc. Health Benefits Fund, Painters District Council No. 30 Health & Welfare Fund, Plaintiffs, Rite-Aid Corporation, Rite-Aid Hdqtrs. Corp., Rochester Drug Co-Operative, Inc., Safeway, Inc., Teamsters Local 237 Welfare Benefits Fund, The Kroger Co., United Food and Commercial Workers Local 1776, Walgreen Co.. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Sealed Document Memorandum of Law in Support of Motion to Exclude the Opinions and Testimony of End-Payor Plaintiffs' Expert Dr. Gary L. French, #2 Proposed Sealed Document Exhibit 1, #3 Proposed Sealed Document Exhibit 2, #4 Proposed Sealed Document Exhibit 3, #5 Proposed Sealed Document Exhibit 4, #6 Proposed Sealed Document Exhibit 5, #7 Proposed Sealed Document Exhibit 6, #8 Proposed Sealed Document Exhibit 7, #9 Proposed Sealed Document Exhibit 8, #10 Proposed Sealed Document Exhibit 9, #11 Proposed Sealed Document Exhibit 10)(Benjamin, Nicole) This entry/document has been filed under seal pursuant to statute, rule or court order and access is restricted. Please login to CM/ECF to view document(s).
May 17, 2019 Filing 884 MOTION to Exclude the Opinions and Testimony of End-Payor Plaintiffs' Expert Dr. Gary L. French filed by Warner Chilcott Company, Inc., Warner Chilcott Company, LLC, Warner Chilcott Corporation, Warner Chilcott Holdings Company III, Ltd., Warner Chilcott Laboratories Ireland Limited, Warner Chilcott Public Limited Company, Warner Chilcott Sales (US), LLC, Warner Chilcott U.S., LLC, Watson Laboratories, Inc., Watson Pharmaceuticals, Inc.. Responses due by 5/31/2019. (Benjamin, Nicole)
May 17, 2019 Filing 883 MOTION to Seal Memorandum of Law in Support of Motion to Exclude the Opinions and Testimony of Plaintiffs' Expert Dr. Thomas McGuire and Exhibits Thereto Filed. Notice Sent To: Warner Chilcott Holdings Company III, Ltd., Warner Chilcott Corporation, Warner Chilcott Public Limited Company, Watson Laboratories, Inc., Warner Chilcott Company, LLC, Warner Chilcott Sales (US), LLC, Watson Pharmaceuticals, Inc., Warner Chilcott Laboratories Ireland Limited, Warner Chilcott U.S., LLC, Warner Chilcott Company, Inc., Actavis, Inc., Ahold USA, Inc., Albertson's, LLC, Mary Alexander, Allergan PLC, Allied Services Division Welfare Fund, American Sales Company, LLC, CVS Pharmacy, Inc., Melisa Chrestman, Melissa Chrestman, City of Providence, Direct Purchaser Class Plaintiffs, Electrical Workers 242 & 294 Health & Welfare Fund, End Payor Plaintiffs, Fraternal Order of Police Fort Lauderdale Lodge 31, HEB Grocery Company L.P., Laborers International Union of North America, Denise Loy, Lupin Ltd., Lupin Pharmaceuticals, Inc., New York Hotel Trades Council & Hotel Association of New York City, Inc. Health Benefits Fund, Painters District Council No. 30 Health & Welfare Fund, Plaintiffs, Rite-Aid Corporation, Rite-Aid Hdqtrs. Corp., Rochester Drug Co-Operative, Inc., Safeway, Inc., Teamsters Local 237 Welfare Benefits Fund, The Kroger Co., United Food and Commercial Workers Local 1776, Walgreen Co.. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Sealed Document Memorandum of Law in Support of Defendants' Motion to Exclude the Opinions and Testimony of Plaintiffs' Expert Dr. Thomas McGuire, #2 Proposed Sealed Document Exhibit 1, #3 Proposed Sealed Document Exhibit 2)(Benjamin, Nicole) This entry/document has been filed under seal pursuant to statute, rule or court order and access is restricted. Please login to CM/ECF to view document(s).
May 17, 2019 Filing 882 MOTION to Exclude the Opinions and Testimony of Plaintiffs' Expert Dr. Thomas McGuire filed by Warner Chilcott Company, Inc., Warner Chilcott Company, LLC, Warner Chilcott Corporation, Warner Chilcott Holdings Company III, Ltd., Warner Chilcott Laboratories Ireland Limited, Warner Chilcott Public Limited Company, Warner Chilcott Sales (US), LLC, Warner Chilcott U.S., LLC, Watson Laboratories, Inc., Watson Pharmaceuticals, Inc.. Responses due by 5/31/2019. (Benjamin, Nicole)
May 17, 2019 Filing 881 MOTION to Partially Exclude the Opinions and Testimony of Robert A. Dormer filed by Plaintiffs. Responses due by 5/31/2019. (Johnson, Kristen)
May 17, 2019 Filing 880 MOTION to Seal Memorandum of Law in Support of Defendants' Motion to Exclude the Opinions and Testimony of Deborah Jaskot Concerning Lupin's Inability to Obtain FDA Approval for its Generic Until 2015 and Exhibits Thereto Filed. Notice Sent To: Warner Chilcott Holdings Company III, Ltd., Warner Chilcott Corporation, Warner Chilcott Public Limited Company, Watson Laboratories, Inc., Warner Chilcott Company, LLC, Warner Chilcott Sales (US), LLC, Watson Pharmaceuticals, Inc., Warner Chilcott Laboratories Ireland Limited, Warner Chilcott U.S., LLC, Warner Chilcott Company, Inc., Actavis, Inc., Ahold USA, Inc., Albertson's, LLC, Mary Alexander, Allergan PLC, Allied Services Division Welfare Fund, American Sales Company, LLC, CVS Pharmacy, Inc., Melisa Chrestman, Melissa Chrestman, City of Providence, Direct Purchaser Class Plaintiffs, Electrical Workers 242 & 294 Health & Welfare Fund, End Payor Plaintiffs, Fraternal Order of Police Fort Lauderdale Lodge 31, HEB Grocery Company L.P., Laborers International Union of North America, Denise Loy, Lupin Ltd., Lupin Pharmaceuticals, Inc., New York Hotel Trades Council & Hotel Association of New York City, Inc. Health Benefits Fund, Painters District Council No. 30 Health & Welfare Fund, Plaintiffs, Rite-Aid Corporation, Rite-Aid Hdqtrs. Corp., Rochester Drug Co-Operative, Inc., Safeway, Inc., Teamsters Local 237 Welfare Benefits Fund, The Kroger Co., United Food and Commercial Workers Local 1776, Walgreen Co.. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Sealed Document Memorandum of Law in Support of Defendants' Motion to Exclude the Opinions and Testimony of Deborah Jaskot Concerning Lupin's Inability to Obtain FDA Approval for its Generic Until 2015, #2 Proposed Sealed Document Exhibit 1, #3 Proposed Sealed Document Exhibit 2)(Benjamin, Nicole) This entry/document has been filed under seal pursuant to statute, rule or court order and access is restricted. Please login to CM/ECF to view document(s).
May 17, 2019 Filing 879 MOTION to Exclude the Opinions and Testimony of Deborah Jaskot Concerning Lupin's Inability to Obtain FDA Approval for its Generic Until 2015 filed by Warner Chilcott Company, Inc., Warner Chilcott Company, LLC, Warner Chilcott Corporation, Warner Chilcott Holdings Company III, Ltd., Warner Chilcott Laboratories Ireland Limited, Warner Chilcott Public Limited Company, Warner Chilcott Sales (US), LLC, Warner Chilcott U.S., LLC, Watson Laboratories, Inc., Watson Pharmaceuticals, Inc.. Responses due by 5/31/2019. (Benjamin, Nicole)
May 17, 2019 Filing 878 MOTION to Seal Memorandum Of Law In Support Of Their Motion To Exclude The Merits Testimony And Opinions Of James W. Hughes, Ph.D. And The Declaration Of Marvin A. Miller Filed. Notice Sent To: End Payor Plaintiffs, Actavis, Inc., Ahold USA, Inc., Albertson's, LLC, Mary Alexander, Allergan PLC, Allied Services Division Welfare Fund, American Sales Company, LLC, CVS Pharmacy, Inc., Melissa Chrestman, City of Providence, Direct Purchaser Class Plaintiffs, Electrical Workers 242 & 294 Health & Welfare Fund, Fraternal Order of Police Fort Lauderdale Lodge 31, HEB Grocery Company L.P., Laborers International Union of North America, Denise Loy, Lupin Ltd., Lupin Pharmaceuticals, Inc., New York Hotel Trades Council & Hotel Association of New York City, Inc. Health Benefits Fund, Painters District Council No. 30 Health & Welfare Fund, Rite-Aid Corporation, Rite-Aid Hdqtrs. Corp., Rochester Drug Co-Operative, Inc., Safeway, Inc., Teamsters Local 237 Welfare Benefits Fund, The Kroger Co., United Food and Commercial Workers Local 1776, Walgreen Co., Warner Chilcott Company, Inc., Warner Chilcott Company, LLC, Warner Chilcott Corporation, Warner Chilcott Holdings Company III, Ltd., Warner Chilcott Laboratories Ireland Limited, Warner Chilcott Public Limited Company, Warner Chilcott Sales (US), LLC, Warner Chilcott U.S., LLC, Watson Laboratories, Inc., Watson Pharmaceuticals, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Sealed Document Memo in Support of Motion to Exclude Dr. Hughes' Merits Testimony and Opinions, #2 Proposed Sealed Document Declaration of Marvin Miller in Support of Motion to Exclude Dr. Hughes' Merits Testimony and Opinions, #3 Proposed Sealed Document Ex 1 - Hughes Merits Report, #4 Proposed Sealed Document Ex 2 - Hughes Dep. 11-27-18, #5 Exhibit Ex 3 - Class Cert Hrg Transcript 2-13-19, #6 Exhibit Ex 4 - Class Cert Hrg Transcript 2-14-19, #7 Proposed Sealed Document Ex 5 - French Merits Report, #8 Proposed Sealed Document Ex 6 - Addanki Dep., #9 Exhibit Ex 7 - JAMA article, #10 Exhibit Ex 8 - Morelli article, #11 Proposed Sealed Document Ex 9 - Hughes Dep. 1-25-19, #12 Proposed Sealed Document Ex 10 - WCL0081812, #13 Exhibit Ex 11 - GoodRx blog, #14 Proposed Sealed Document Ex 12 - French Class Cert Reply Report, #15 Proposed Sealed Document Ex 13 - French Merits Reply Report, #16 Proposed Sealed Document Ex 14 - Supplemental French Declaration)(Miller, Marvin) This entry/document has been filed under seal pursuant to statute, rule or court order and access is restricted. Please login to CM/ECF to view document(s).
May 17, 2019 Filing 877 MOTION to Seal Memoranda in Support of Motions to Exclude and Exhibits Filed. Notice Sent To: Painters District Council No. 30 Health & Welfare Fund, United Food and Commercial Workers Local 1776, The Kroger Co., Melissa Chrestman, American Sales Company, LLC, Laborers International Union of North America, New York Hotel Trades Council & Hotel Association of New York City, Inc. Health Benefits Fund, Fraternal Order of Police Fort Lauderdale Lodge 31, Walgreen Co., Rite-Aid Hdqtrs. Corp., Denise Loy, Rochester Drug Co-Operative, Inc., City of Providence, Ahold USA, Inc., Allied Services Division Welfare Fund, CVS Pharmacy, Inc., Safeway, Inc., Rite-Aid Corporation, Albertson's, LLC, HEB Grocery Company L.P., Mary Alexander, Electrical Workers 242 & 294 Health & Welfare Fund, Melisa Chrestman, Teamsters Local 237 Welfare Benefits Fund, Direct Purchaser Class Plaintiffs, End Payor Plaintiffs, Actavis, Inc., Allergan PLC, Lupin Ltd., Lupin Pharmaceuticals, Inc., Warner Chilcott Company, Inc., Warner Chilcott Company, LLC, Warner Chilcott Corporation, Warner Chilcott Holdings Company III, Ltd., Warner Chilcott Laboratories Ireland Limited, Warner Chilcott Public Limited Company, Warner Chilcott Sales (US), LLC, Warner Chilcott U.S., LLC, Watson Laboratories, Inc., Watson Pharmaceuticals, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Sealed Document Memo in Support of Motion to Exclude re: Procompetitive Justifications, #2 Proposed Sealed Document Memo in Support of Motion to Exclude re: Anticompetitive Effect From Product Hop, #3 Shadowen Declaration, #4 Exhibit A, #5 Exhibit B, #6 Exhibit C, #7 Exhibit D, #8 Exhibit E, #9 Exhibit F, #10 Exhibit G, #11 Exhibit H, #12 Exhibit I, #13 Exhibit J)(Simoncelli, Michael) This entry/document has been filed under seal pursuant to statute, rule or court order and access is restricted. Please login to CM/ECF to view document(s).
May 17, 2019 Filing 876 MOTION To Exclude The Merits Testimony And Opinions Of James W. Hughes, Ph.D. filed by End Payor Plaintiffs. Responses due by 5/31/2019. (Miller, Marvin)
May 17, 2019 Filing 875 MOTION to Exclude Opinions and Testimony of Drs. Christine S. Meyer, Mark S. Robbins, and Melissa A. Schilling Regarding Lack of Anticompetitive Effect from Product Hop filed by Ahold USA, Inc., Albertson's, LLC, Mary Alexander, Allied Services Division Welfare Fund, American Sales Company, LLC, CVS Pharmacy, Inc., Melisa Chrestman, Melissa Chrestman, City of Providence, Direct Purchaser Class Plaintiffs, Electrical Workers 242 & 294 Health & Welfare Fund, End Payor Plaintiffs, Fraternal Order of Police Fort Lauderdale Lodge 31, HEB Grocery Company L.P., Laborers International Union of North America, Denise Loy, New York Hotel Trades Council & Hotel Association of New York City, Inc. Health Benefits Fund, Painters District Council No. 30 Health & Welfare Fund, Rite-Aid Corporation, Rite-Aid Hdqtrs. Corp., Rochester Drug Co-Operative, Inc., Safeway, Inc., Teamsters Local 237 Welfare Benefits Fund, The Kroger Co., United Food and Commercial Workers Local 1776, Walgreen Co.. Responses due by 5/31/2019. (Simoncelli, Michael)
May 17, 2019 Filing 874 MOTION to Exclude Opinions and Testimony of Drs. Christine S. Meyer and Mark S. Robbins Regarding Procompetitive Justifications of Reverse Payments filed by Ahold USA, Inc., Albertson's, LLC, Mary Alexander, Allied Services Division Welfare Fund, American Sales Company, LLC, CVS Pharmacy, Inc., Melisa Chrestman, Melissa Chrestman, City of Providence, Direct Purchaser Class Plaintiffs, Electrical Workers 242 & 294 Health & Welfare Fund, End Payor Plaintiffs, Fraternal Order of Police Fort Lauderdale Lodge 31, HEB Grocery Company L.P., Laborers International Union of North America, Denise Loy, New York Hotel Trades Council & Hotel Association of New York City, Inc. Health Benefits Fund, Painters District Council No. 30 Health & Welfare Fund, Rite-Aid Corporation, Rite-Aid Hdqtrs. Corp., Rochester Drug Co-Operative, Inc., Safeway, Inc., Teamsters Local 237 Welfare Benefits Fund, The Kroger Co., United Food and Commercial Workers Local 1776, Walgreen Co.. Responses due by 5/31/2019. (Simoncelli, Michael)
May 17, 2019 Filing 873 MOTION to Seal Plaintiffs' Memorandum of Law In Support of Motion to Exclude Certain Purported Expert Opinions and Testimony of Christopher Smith, Robert Dormer, and Mark Robbins and Declaration of Terence S. Ziegler Filed. Notice Sent To: All Plaintiffs. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Sealed Document Memorandum, #2 Proposed Sealed Document Declaration of Terence S. Ziegler, #3 Proposed Sealed Document Exhibit A, #4 Proposed Sealed Document Exhibit B, #5 Proposed Sealed Document Exhibit C, #6 Proposed Sealed Document Exhibit D, #7 Proposed Sealed Document Exhibit E)(Meltzer, Joseph) This entry/document has been filed under seal pursuant to statute, rule or court order and access is restricted. Please login to CM/ECF to view document(s).
May 17, 2019 Filing 872 MOTION Exclude Certain Purported Expert Opinions and Testimony of Christopher Smith, Robert Dormer, and Mark Robbins filed by All Plaintiffs. Responses due by 5/31/2019. (Meltzer, Joseph)
May 17, 2019 Filing 871 MOTION to Strike Plaintiffs' Motion to Strike Defendants Exhibit 70 (Declaration of Pramod Dahibhate) and to Preclude Defendants from Relying Thereon in Support of Their Motion for Summary Judgment, Any Other Motion, at a Hearing, or at Trial filed by All Plaintiffs. Responses due by 5/31/2019. (Meltzer, Joseph)
May 17, 2019 Filing 870 MOTION to Seal Plaintiffs Memorandum of Law in Support of Plaintiffs Motion to Exclude In Part the Expert Opinions of Christine S. Meyer Filed. Notice Sent To: All Plaintiffs. (Attachments: #1 Supporting Memorandum with exhibits)(Ravkind, Lauren) This entry/document has been filed under seal pursuant to statute, rule or court order and access is restricted. Please login to CM/ECF to view document(s).
May 17, 2019 Filing 869 MOTION to Seal Plaintiffs Memorandum of Law in Support of Plaintiffs Motion to Exclude In Part the Expert Opinions of Dr. Philip D. Darney Filed. Notice Sent To: All Plaintiffs. (Attachments: #1 Supporting Memorandum with Exhibits)(Ravkind, Lauren) This entry/document has been filed under seal pursuant to statute, rule or court order and access is restricted. Please login to CM/ECF to view document(s).
May 17, 2019 Filing 868 MOTION to Seal Motion to Exclude Portions of Testimony of Dr. Pierre-Yves Cremieux Filed. Notice Sent To: Plaintiffs, Actavis, Inc., Ahold USA, Inc., Albertson's, LLC, Mary Alexander, Allergan PLC, Allied Services Division Welfare Fund, American Sales Company, LLC, CVS Pharmacy, Inc., Melisa Chrestman, Melissa Chrestman, City of Providence, Direct Purchaser Class Plaintiffs, Electrical Workers 242 & 294 Health & Welfare Fund, End Payor Plaintiffs, Fraternal Order of Police Fort Lauderdale Lodge 31, HEB Grocery Company L.P., Laborers International Union of North America, Denise Loy, Lupin Ltd., Lupin Pharmaceuticals, Inc., New York Hotel Trades Council & Hotel Association of New York City, Inc. Health Benefits Fund, Painters District Council No. 30 Health & Welfare Fund, Rite-Aid Corporation, Rite-Aid Hdqtrs. Corp., Rochester Drug Co-Operative, Inc., Safeway, Inc., Teamsters Local 237 Welfare Benefits Fund, The Kroger Co., United Food and Commercial Workers Local 1776, Walgreen Co., Warner Chilcott Company, Inc., Warner Chilcott Company, LLC, Warner Chilcott Corporation, Warner Chilcott Holdings Company III, Ltd., Warner Chilcott Laboratories Ireland Limited, Warner Chilcott Public Limited Company, Warner Chilcott Sales (US), LLC, Warner Chilcott U.S., LLC, Watson Laboratories, Inc., Watson Pharmaceuticals, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Sealed Document, #2 Proposed Sealed Document, #3 Proposed Sealed Document, #4 Exhibit, #5 Exhibit)(Walker, Daniel) This entry/document has been filed under seal pursuant to statute, rule or court order and access is restricted. Please login to CM/ECF to view document(s).
May 17, 2019 Filing 867 MOTION to Exclude In Part Expert Opinions of Christine S. Meyer filed by All Plaintiffs. Responses due by 5/31/2019. (Ravkind, Lauren)
May 17, 2019 Filing 866 MOTION to Seal Motion to Exclude Karen Ryle Filed. Notice Sent To: Plaintiffs, Actavis, Inc., Ahold USA, Inc., Albertson's, LLC, Mary Alexander, Allergan PLC, Allied Services Division Welfare Fund, American Sales Company, LLC, CVS Pharmacy, Inc., Melisa Chrestman, Melissa Chrestman, City of Providence, Direct Purchaser Class Plaintiffs, Electrical Workers 242 & 294 Health & Welfare Fund, End Payor Plaintiffs, Fraternal Order of Police Fort Lauderdale Lodge 31, HEB Grocery Company L.P., Laborers International Union of North America, Denise Loy, Lupin Ltd., Lupin Pharmaceuticals, Inc., New York Hotel Trades Council & Hotel Association of New York City, Inc. Health Benefits Fund, Painters District Council No. 30 Health & Welfare Fund, Rite-Aid Corporation, Rite-Aid Hdqtrs. Corp., Rochester Drug Co-Operative, Inc., Safeway, Inc., Teamsters Local 237 Welfare Benefits Fund, The Kroger Co., United Food and Commercial Workers Local 1776, Walgreen Co., Warner Chilcott Company, Inc., Warner Chilcott Company, LLC, Warner Chilcott Corporation, Warner Chilcott Holdings Company III, Ltd., Warner Chilcott Laboratories Ireland Limited, Warner Chilcott Public Limited Company, Warner Chilcott Sales (US), LLC, Warner Chilcott U.S., LLC, Watson Laboratories, Inc., Watson Pharmaceuticals, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Sealed Document, #2 Proposed Sealed Document, #3 Proposed Sealed Document, #4 Exhibit, #5 Exhibit, #6 Exhibit)(Walker, Daniel) This entry/document has been filed under seal pursuant to statute, rule or court order and access is restricted. Please login to CM/ECF to view document(s).
May 17, 2019 Filing 865 MOTION to Exclude In Part Expert Opinions of Dr. Philip D. Darney filed by All Plaintiffs. Responses due by 5/31/2019. (Ravkind, Lauren)
May 17, 2019 Filing 864 STIPULATION OF DISMISSAL OF RETAILER PLAINTIFFS CLAIMS AGAINST THE LUPIN DEFENDANTS filed by Albertson's, LLC, CVS Pharmacy, Inc., HEB Grocery Company L.P., Rite-Aid Corporation, Rite-Aid Hdqtrs. Corp., Safeway, Inc., The Kroger Co., Walgreen Co.. (Perwin, Scott)
May 17, 2019 Opinion or Order TEXT ORDER: [End Payors]: Ex Parte Confidential Sealed Conference for End Payor Class Plaintiffs with Court to review time and expense reports for Quarter 1, ending March 31, 2019, set for 06/13/2019 at 4:00 pm in Magistrate Judge Sullivan Chambers - Room P-285 before Magistrate Judge Patricia A. Sullivan. At least one interim co-lead counsel and the CPA are ordered to participate, but may, at their option, do so either in-person or by telephone. Liaison counsel shall advise the Deputy Clerk on or before 5:00 pm on 06/11/2019, whether participants will be in-person or by telephone, and, if any participants will join by telephone, the Clerk will provide liaison counsel with the dial-in information. Liaison counsel are directed to supply the dial-in information to the CPA and any counsel wishing to participate telephonically. The Clerk will email to liaison counsel the dial-in instructions. So Ordered by Magistrate Judge Patricia A. Sullivan on 5/17/2019. (Saucier, Martha)
May 17, 2019 Opinion or Order TEXT ORDER: [Direct Payors]: Ex Parte Confidential Sealed Conference for Direct Payor Class Plaintiffs with Court to review time and expense reports for Quarter 1, ending March 31, 2019, set for 06/13/2019 at 3:00 pm in Magistrate Judge Sullivan Chambers - Room P-285 before Magistrate Judge Patricia A. Sullivan. At least one interim co-lead counsel and the CPA are ordered to participate, but may, at their option, do so either in-person or by telephone. Liaison counsel shall advise the Deputy Clerk on or before 5:00 pm on 06/11/2019 whether participants will be in-person or by telephone, and, if any participants will join by telephone, the Clerk will provide liaison counsel with the dial-in information. Liaison counsel are directed to supply the dial-in information to the CPA and any counsel wishing to participate telephonically. The Clerk will email to liaison counsel the dial-in instructions.. So Ordered by Magistrate Judge Patricia A. Sullivan on 5/17/2019. (Saucier, Martha)
May 13, 2019 Opinion or Order TEXT ORDER granting #844 Motion to Seal; granting #845 Motion to Seal; granting #846 Motion to Seal; granting #847 Motion to Seal; granting #848 Motion to Seal; granting #849 Motion to Seal; granting #850 Motion to Seal; granting #851 Motion to Seal; granting #852 Motion to Seal; granting #853 Motion to Seal; granting #854 Motion to Seal; granting #855 Motion to Seal; granting #856 Motion to Seal; granting #857 Motion to Seal; granting #858 Motion to Seal. So Ordered by Chief Judge William E. Smith on 5/13/2019. (Jackson, Ryan)
May 10, 2019 Filing 858 MOTION to Seal Memorandum of Law in Support of Defendants' Motion for Summary Judgment Filed. Notice Sent To: Warner Chilcott Holdings Company III, Ltd., Warner Chilcott Corporation, Warner Chilcott Public Limited Company, Watson Laboratories, Inc., Warner Chilcott Company, LLC, Warner Chilcott Sales (US), LLC, Watson Pharmaceuticals, Inc., Warner Chilcott Laboratories Ireland Limited, Warner Chilcott U.S., LLC, Warner Chilcott Company, Inc., Actavis, Inc., Ahold USA, Inc., Albertson's, LLC, Mary Alexander, Allergan PLC, Allied Services Division Welfare Fund, American Sales Company, LLC, CVS Pharmacy, Inc., Melisa Chrestman, Melissa Chrestman, City of Providence, Direct Purchaser Class Plaintiffs, Electrical Workers 242 & 294 Health & Welfare Fund, End Payor Plaintiffs, Fraternal Order of Police Fort Lauderdale Lodge 31, HEB Grocery Company L.P., Laborers International Union of North America, Denise Loy, Lupin Ltd., Lupin Pharmaceuticals, Inc., New York Hotel Trades Council & Hotel Association of New York City, Inc. Health Benefits Fund, Painters District Council No. 30 Health & Welfare Fund, Plaintiffs, Rite-Aid Corporation, Rite-Aid Hdqtrs. Corp., Rochester Drug Co-Operative, Inc., Safeway, Inc., Teamsters Local 237 Welfare Benefits Fund, The Kroger Co., United Food and Commercial Workers Local 1776, Walgreen Co.. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Sealed Document Defendants' Memorandum of Law in Support of Motion for Summary Judgment)(Benjamin, Nicole) This entry/document has been filed under seal pursuant to statute, rule or court order and access is restricted. Please login to CM/ECF to view document(s).
May 10, 2019 Filing 857 MOTION to Seal Defendants Statement of Undisputed Facts Filed. Notice Sent To: Warner Chilcott Holdings Company III, Ltd., Warner Chilcott Corporation, Warner Chilcott Public Limited Company, Watson Laboratories, Inc., Warner Chilcott Company, LLC, Warner Chilcott Sales (US), LLC, Watson Pharmaceuticals, Inc., Warner Chilcott Laboratories Ireland Limited, Warner Chilcott U.S., LLC, Warner Chilcott Company, Inc., Actavis, Inc., Ahold USA, Inc., Albertson's, LLC, Mary Alexander, Allergan PLC, Allied Services Division Welfare Fund, American Sales Company, LLC, CVS Pharmacy, Inc., Melisa Chrestman, Melissa Chrestman, City of Providence, Direct Purchaser Class Plaintiffs, Electrical Workers 242 & 294 Health & Welfare Fund, End Payor Plaintiffs, Fraternal Order of Police Fort Lauderdale Lodge 31, HEB Grocery Company L.P., Laborers International Union of North America, Denise Loy, Lupin Ltd., Lupin Pharmaceuticals, Inc., New York Hotel Trades Council & Hotel Association of New York City, Inc. Health Benefits Fund, Painters District Council No. 30 Health & Welfare Fund, Plaintiffs, Rite-Aid Corporation, Rite-Aid Hdqtrs. Corp., Rochester Drug Co-Operative, Inc., Safeway, Inc., Teamsters Local 237 Welfare Benefits Fund, The Kroger Co., United Food and Commercial Workers Local 1776, Walgreen Co.. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Sealed Document Defendants Statement of Undisputed Facts)(Benjamin, Nicole) This entry/document has been filed under seal pursuant to statute, rule or court order and access is restricted. Please login to CM/ECF to view document(s).
May 10, 2019 Filing 856 MOTION to Seal Exhibits 250-279 in Support of Defendants Statement of Undisputed Facts in Support of Defendants Motion for Summary Judgment Filed. Notice Sent To: Warner Chilcott Holdings Company III, Ltd., Warner Chilcott Corporation, Warner Chilcott Public Limited Company, Watson Laboratories, Inc., Warner Chilcott Company, LLC, Warner Chilcott Sales (US), LLC, Watson Pharmaceuticals, Inc., Warner Chilcott Laboratories Ireland Limited, Warner Chilcott U.S., LLC, Warner Chilcott Company, Inc., Actavis, Inc., Ahold USA, Inc., Albertson's, LLC, Mary Alexander, Allergan PLC, Allied Services Division Welfare Fund, American Sales Company, LLC, CVS Pharmacy, Inc., Melisa Chrestman, Melissa Chrestman, City of Providence, Direct Purchaser Class Plaintiffs, Electrical Workers 242 & 294 Health & Welfare Fund, End Payor Plaintiffs, Fraternal Order of Police Fort Lauderdale Lodge 31, HEB Grocery Company L.P., Laborers International Union of North America, Denise Loy, Lupin Ltd., Lupin Pharmaceuticals, Inc., New York Hotel Trades Council & Hotel Association of New York City, Inc. Health Benefits Fund, Painters District Council No. 30 Health & Welfare Fund, Plaintiffs, Rite-Aid Corporation, Rite-Aid Hdqtrs. Corp., Rochester Drug Co-Operative, Inc., Safeway, Inc., Teamsters Local 237 Welfare Benefits Fund, The Kroger Co., United Food and Commercial Workers Local 1776, Walgreen Co.. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Sealed Document Exhibit 250, #2 Proposed Sealed Document Exhibit 251, #3 Proposed Sealed Document Exhibit 252, #4 Proposed Sealed Document Exhibit 253, #5 Proposed Sealed Document Exhibit 254, #6 Proposed Sealed Document Exhibit 255, #7 Proposed Sealed Document Exhibit 256, #8 Proposed Sealed Document Exhibit 257, #9 Proposed Sealed Document Exhibit 258, #10 Proposed Sealed Document Exhibit 259, #11 Proposed Sealed Document Exhibit 260, #12 Proposed Sealed Document Exhibit 261, #13 Proposed Sealed Document Exhibit 262, #14 Proposed Sealed Document Exhibit 263, #15 Proposed Sealed Document Exhibit 264, #16 Proposed Sealed Document Exhibit 265, #17 Proposed Sealed Document Exhibit 266, #18 Proposed Sealed Document Exhibit 267, #19 Proposed Sealed Document Exhibit 268, #20 Proposed Sealed Document Exhibit 269, #21 Proposed Sealed Document Exhibit 270, #22 Proposed Sealed Document Exhibit 271, #23 Proposed Sealed Document Exhibit 272, #24 Proposed Sealed Document Exhibit 273, #25 Proposed Sealed Document Exhibit 274, #26 Proposed Sealed Document Exhibit 275, #27 Proposed Sealed Document Exhibit 276, #28 Proposed Sealed Document Exhibit 277, #29 Proposed Sealed Document Exhibit 278, #30 Proposed Sealed Document Exhibit 279)(Benjamin, Nicole) This entry/document has been filed under seal pursuant to statute, rule or court order and access is restricted. Please login to CM/ECF to view document(s).
May 10, 2019 Filing 855 MOTION to Seal Exhibits 152-169, 173-179, 184, 198, 217, 219, 221 and 227-249 in Support of Defendants Statement of Undisputed Facts in Support of Defendants Motion for Summary Judgment Filed. Notice Sent To: Warner Chilcott Holdings Company III, Ltd., Warner Chilcott Corporation, Warner Chilcott Public Limited Company, Watson Laboratories, Inc., Warner Chilcott Company, LLC, Warner Chilcott Sales (US), LLC, Watson Pharmaceuticals, Inc., Warner Chilcott Laboratories Ireland Limited, Warner Chilcott U.S., LLC, Warner Chilcott Company, Inc., Actavis, Inc., Ahold USA, Inc., Albertson's, LLC, Mary Alexander, Allergan PLC, Allied Services Division Welfare Fund, American Sales Company, LLC, CVS Pharmacy, Inc., Melisa Chrestman, Melissa Chrestman, City of Providence, Direct Purchaser Class Plaintiffs, Electrical Workers 242 & 294 Health & Welfare Fund, End Payor Plaintiffs, Fraternal Order of Police Fort Lauderdale Lodge 31, HEB Grocery Company L.P., Laborers International Union of North America, Denise Loy, Lupin Ltd., Lupin Pharmaceuticals, Inc., New York Hotel Trades Council & Hotel Association of New York City, Inc. Health Benefits Fund, Painters District Council No. 30 Health & Welfare Fund, Plaintiffs, Rite-Aid Corporation, Rite-Aid Hdqtrs. Corp., Rochester Drug Co-Operative, Inc., Safeway, Inc., Teamsters Local 237 Welfare Benefits Fund, The Kroger Co., United Food and Commercial Workers Local 1776, Walgreen Co.. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Sealed Document Exhibit 152, #2 Proposed Sealed Document Exhibit 153, #3 Proposed Sealed Document Exhibit 154, #4 Proposed Sealed Document Exhibit 155, #5 Proposed Sealed Document Exhibit 156, #6 Proposed Sealed Document Exhibit 157, #7 Proposed Sealed Document Exhibit 158, #8 Proposed Sealed Document Exhibit 159, #9 Proposed Sealed Document Exhibit 160, #10 Proposed Sealed Document Exhibit 161, #11 Proposed Sealed Document Exhibit 162, #12 Proposed Sealed Document Exhibit 163, #13 Proposed Sealed Document Exhibit 164, #14 Proposed Sealed Document Exhibit 165, #15 Proposed Sealed Document Exhibit 166, #16 Proposed Sealed Document Exhibit 167, #17 Proposed Sealed Document Exhibit 168, #18 Proposed Sealed Document Exhibit 169, #19 Proposed Sealed Document Exhibit 173, #20 Proposed Sealed Document Exhibit 174, #21 Proposed Sealed Document Exhibit 175, #22 Proposed Sealed Document Exhibit 176, #23 Proposed Sealed Document Exhibit 177, #24 Proposed Sealed Document Exhibit 178, #25 Proposed Sealed Document Exhibit 179, #26 Proposed Sealed Document Exhibit 184, #27 Proposed Sealed Document Exhibit 198, #28 Proposed Sealed Document Exhibit 217, #29 Proposed Sealed Document Exhibit 219, #30 Proposed Sealed Document Exhibit 221, #31 Proposed Sealed Document Exhibit 227, #32 Proposed Sealed Document Exhibit 228, #33 Proposed Sealed Document Exhibit 229, #34 Proposed Sealed Document Exhibit 230, #35 Proposed Sealed Document Exhibit 231, #36 Proposed Sealed Document Exhibit 232, #37 Proposed Sealed Document Exhibit 233, #38 Proposed Sealed Document Exhibit 234, #39 Proposed Sealed Document Exhibit 235, #40 Proposed Sealed Document Exhibit 236, #41 Proposed Sealed Document Exhibit 237, #42 Proposed Sealed Document Exhibit 238, #43 Proposed Sealed Document Exhibit 239, #44 Proposed Sealed Document Exhibit 240, #45 Proposed Sealed Document Exhibit 241, #46 Proposed Sealed Document Exhibit 242, #47 Proposed Sealed Document Exhibit 243, #48 Proposed Sealed Document Exhibit 244, #49 Proposed Sealed Document Exhibit 245, #50 Proposed Sealed Document Exhibit 246, #51 Proposed Sealed Document Exhibit 247, #52 Proposed Sealed Document Exhibit 248, #53 Proposed Sealed Document Exhibit 249)(Benjamin, Nicole) This entry/document has been filed under seal pursuant to statute, rule or court order and access is restricted. Please login to CM/ECF to view document(s).
May 10, 2019 Filing 854 MOTION to Seal Exhibits 151 in Support of Defendants Statement of Undisputed Facts in Support of Defendants Motion for Summary Judgment Filed. Notice Sent To: Warner Chilcott Holdings Company III, Ltd., Warner Chilcott Corporation, Warner Chilcott Public Limited Company, Watson Laboratories, Inc., Warner Chilcott Company, LLC, Warner Chilcott Sales (US), LLC, Watson Pharmaceuticals, Inc., Warner Chilcott Laboratories Ireland Limited, Warner Chilcott U.S., LLC, Warner Chilcott Company, Inc., Actavis, Inc., Ahold USA, Inc., Albertson's, LLC, Mary Alexander, Allergan PLC, Allied Services Division Welfare Fund, American Sales Company, LLC, CVS Pharmacy, Inc., Melisa Chrestman, Melissa Chrestman, City of Providence, Direct Purchaser Class Plaintiffs, Electrical Workers 242 & 294 Health & Welfare Fund, End Payor Plaintiffs, Fraternal Order of Police Fort Lauderdale Lodge 31, HEB Grocery Company L.P., Laborers International Union of North America, Denise Loy, Lupin Ltd., Lupin Pharmaceuticals, Inc., New York Hotel Trades Council & Hotel Association of New York City, Inc. Health Benefits Fund, Painters District Council No. 30 Health & Welfare Fund, Plaintiffs, Rite-Aid Corporation, Rite-Aid Hdqtrs. Corp., Rochester Drug Co-Operative, Inc., Safeway, Inc., Teamsters Local 237 Welfare Benefits Fund, The Kroger Co., United Food and Commercial Workers Local 1776, Walgreen Co.. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Sealed Document Exhibit 151)(Benjamin, Nicole) This entry/document has been filed under seal pursuant to statute, rule or court order and access is restricted. Please login to CM/ECF to view document(s).
May 10, 2019 Filing 853 MOTION to Seal Exhibit 150 in Support of Defendants Statement of Undisputed Facts in Support of Defendants Motion for Summary Judgment Filed. Notice Sent To: Warner Chilcott Holdings Company III, Ltd., Warner Chilcott Corporation, Warner Chilcott Public Limited Company, Watson Laboratories, Inc., Warner Chilcott Company, LLC, Warner Chilcott Sales (US), LLC, Watson Pharmaceuticals, Inc., Warner Chilcott Laboratories Ireland Limited, Warner Chilcott U.S., LLC, Warner Chilcott Company, Inc., Actavis, Inc., Ahold USA, Inc., Albertson's, LLC, Mary Alexander, Allergan PLC, Allied Services Division Welfare Fund, American Sales Company, LLC, CVS Pharmacy, Inc., Melisa Chrestman, Melissa Chrestman, City of Providence, Direct Purchaser Class Plaintiffs, Electrical Workers 242 & 294 Health & Welfare Fund, End Payor Plaintiffs, Fraternal Order of Police Fort Lauderdale Lodge 31, HEB Grocery Company L.P., Laborers International Union of North America, Denise Loy, Lupin Ltd., Lupin Pharmaceuticals, Inc., New York Hotel Trades Council & Hotel Association of New York City, Inc. Health Benefits Fund, Painters District Council No. 30 Health & Welfare Fund, Plaintiffs, Rite-Aid Corporation, Rite-Aid Hdqtrs. Corp., Rochester Drug Co-Operative, Inc., Safeway, Inc., Teamsters Local 237 Welfare Benefits Fund, The Kroger Co., United Food and Commercial Workers Local 1776, Walgreen Co.. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Sealed Document Exhibit 150)(Benjamin, Nicole) This entry/document has been filed under seal pursuant to statute, rule or court order and access is restricted. Please login to CM/ECF to view document(s).
May 10, 2019 Filing 852 MOTION to Seal Exhibits 135-141 and 143-149 in Support of Defendants Statement of Undisputed Facts in Support of Defendants Motion for Summary Judgment Filed. Notice Sent To: Warner Chilcott Holdings Company III, Ltd., Warner Chilcott Corporation, Warner Chilcott Public Limited Company, Watson Laboratories, Inc., Warner Chilcott Company, LLC, Warner Chilcott Sales (US), LLC, Watson Pharmaceuticals, Inc., Warner Chilcott Laboratories Ireland Limited, Warner Chilcott U.S., LLC, Warner Chilcott Company, Inc., Actavis, Inc., Ahold USA, Inc., Albertson's, LLC, Mary Alexander, Allergan PLC, Allied Services Division Welfare Fund, American Sales Company, LLC, CVS Pharmacy, Inc., Melisa Chrestman, Melissa Chrestman, City of Providence, Direct Purchaser Class Plaintiffs, Electrical Workers 242 & 294 Health & Welfare Fund, End Payor Plaintiffs, Fraternal Order of Police Fort Lauderdale Lodge 31, HEB Grocery Company L.P., Laborers International Union of North America, Denise Loy, Lupin Ltd., Lupin Pharmaceuticals, Inc., New York Hotel Trades Council & Hotel Association of New York City, Inc. Health Benefits Fund, Painters District Council No. 30 Health & Welfare Fund, Plaintiffs, Rite-Aid Corporation, Rite-Aid Hdqtrs. Corp., Rochester Drug Co-Operative, Inc., Safeway, Inc., Teamsters Local 237 Welfare Benefits Fund, The Kroger Co., United Food and Commercial Workers Local 1776, Walgreen Co.. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Sealed Document Exhibit 135, #2 Proposed Sealed Document Exhibit 136, #3 Proposed Sealed Document Exhibit 137, #4 Proposed Sealed Document Exhibit 138, #5 Proposed Sealed Document Exhibit 139, #6 Proposed Sealed Document Exhibit 140, #7 Proposed Sealed Document Exhibit 141, #8 Proposed Sealed Document Exhibit 143, #9 Proposed Sealed Document Exhibit 144, #10 Proposed Sealed Document Exhibit 145, #11 Proposed Sealed Document Exhibit 146, #12 Proposed Sealed Document Exhibit 147, #13 Proposed Sealed Document Exhibit 148, #14 Proposed Sealed Document Exhibit 149)(Benjamin, Nicole) This entry/document has been filed under seal pursuant to statute, rule or court order and access is restricted. Please login to CM/ECF to view document(s).
May 10, 2019 Filing 851 MOTION to Seal Exhibits 111-134 in Support of Defendants Statement of Undisputed Facts in Support of Defendants Motion for Summary Judgment Filed. Notice Sent To: Warner Chilcott Holdings Company III, Ltd., Warner Chilcott Corporation, Warner Chilcott Public Limited Company, Watson Laboratories, Inc., Warner Chilcott Company, LLC, Warner Chilcott Sales (US), LLC, Watson Pharmaceuticals, Inc., Warner Chilcott Laboratories Ireland Limited, Warner Chilcott U.S., LLC, Warner Chilcott Company, Inc., Actavis, Inc., Ahold USA, Inc., Albertson's, LLC, Mary Alexander, Allergan PLC, Allied Services Division Welfare Fund, American Sales Company, LLC, CVS Pharmacy, Inc., Melisa Chrestman, Melissa Chrestman, City of Providence, Direct Purchaser Class Plaintiffs, Electrical Workers 242 & 294 Health & Welfare Fund, End Payor Plaintiffs, Fraternal Order of Police Fort Lauderdale Lodge 31, HEB Grocery Company L.P., Laborers International Union of North America, Denise Loy, Lupin Ltd., Lupin Pharmaceuticals, Inc., New York Hotel Trades Council & Hotel Association of New York City, Inc. Health Benefits Fund, Painters District Council No. 30 Health & Welfare Fund, Plaintiffs, Rite-Aid Corporation, Rite-Aid Hdqtrs. Corp., Rochester Drug Co-Operative, Inc., Safeway, Inc., Teamsters Local 237 Welfare Benefits Fund, The Kroger Co., United Food and Commercial Workers Local 1776, Walgreen Co.. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Sealed Document Exhibit 111, #2 Proposed Sealed Document Exhibit 112, #3 Proposed Sealed Document Exhibit 113, #4 Proposed Sealed Document Exhibit 114, #5 Proposed Sealed Document Exhibit 115, #6 Proposed Sealed Document Exhibit 116, #7 Proposed Sealed Document Exhibit 117, #8 Proposed Sealed Document Exhibit 118, #9 Proposed Sealed Document Exhibit 119, #10 Proposed Sealed Document Exhibit 120, #11 Proposed Sealed Document Exhibit 121, #12 Proposed Sealed Document Exhibit 122, #13 Proposed Sealed Document Exhibit 123, #14 Proposed Sealed Document Exhibit 124, #15 Proposed Sealed Document Exhibit 125, #16 Proposed Sealed Document Exhibit 126, #17 Proposed Sealed Document Exhibit 127, #18 Proposed Sealed Document Exhibit 128, #19 Proposed Sealed Document Exhibit 129, #20 Proposed Sealed Document Exhibit 130, #21 Proposed Sealed Document Exhibit 131, #22 Proposed Sealed Document Exhibit 132, #23 Proposed Sealed Document Exhibit 133, #24 Proposed Sealed Document Exhibit 134)(Benjamin, Nicole) This entry/document has been filed under seal pursuant to statute, rule or court order and access is restricted. Please login to CM/ECF to view document(s).
May 10, 2019 Filing 850 MOTION to Seal Exhibits 86-110 in Support of Defendants Statement of Undisputed Facts in Support of Defendants Motion for Summary Judgment Filed. Notice Sent To: Warner Chilcott Holdings Company III, Ltd., Warner Chilcott Corporation, Warner Chilcott Public Limited Company, Watson Laboratories, Inc., Warner Chilcott Company, LLC, Warner Chilcott Sales (US), LLC, Watson Pharmaceuticals, Inc., Warner Chilcott Laboratories Ireland Limited, Warner Chilcott U.S., LLC, Warner Chilcott Company, Inc., Actavis, Inc., Ahold USA, Inc., Albertson's, LLC, Mary Alexander, Allergan PLC, Allied Services Division Welfare Fund, American Sales Company, LLC, CVS Pharmacy, Inc., Melisa Chrestman, Melissa Chrestman, City of Providence, Direct Purchaser Class Plaintiffs, Electrical Workers 242 & 294 Health & Welfare Fund, End Payor Plaintiffs, Fraternal Order of Police Fort Lauderdale Lodge 31, HEB Grocery Company L.P., Laborers International Union of North America, Denise Loy, Lupin Ltd., Lupin Pharmaceuticals, Inc., New York Hotel Trades Council & Hotel Association of New York City, Inc. Health Benefits Fund, Painters District Council No. 30 Health & Welfare Fund, Plaintiffs, Rite-Aid Corporation, Rite-Aid Hdqtrs. Corp., Rochester Drug Co-Operative, Inc., Safeway, Inc., Teamsters Local 237 Welfare Benefits Fund, The Kroger Co., United Food and Commercial Workers Local 1776, Walgreen Co.. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Sealed Document Exhibit 86, #2 Proposed Sealed Document Exhibit 87, #3 Proposed Sealed Document Exhibit 88, #4 Proposed Sealed Document Exhibit 89, #5 Proposed Sealed Document Exhibit 90, #6 Proposed Sealed Document Exhibit 91, #7 Proposed Sealed Document Exhibit 92, #8 Proposed Sealed Document Exhibit 93, #9 Proposed Sealed Document Exhibit 94, #10 Proposed Sealed Document Exhibit 95, #11 Proposed Sealed Document Exhibit 96, #12 Proposed Sealed Document Exhibit 97, #13 Proposed Sealed Document Exhibit 98, #14 Proposed Sealed Document Exhibit 99, #15 Proposed Sealed Document Exhibit 100, #16 Proposed Sealed Document Exhibit 101, #17 Proposed Sealed Document Exhibit 102, #18 Proposed Sealed Document Exhibit 103, #19 Proposed Sealed Document Exhibit 104, #20 Proposed Sealed Document Exhibit 105, #21 Proposed Sealed Document Exhibit 106, #22 Proposed Sealed Document Exhibit 107, #23 Proposed Sealed Document Exhibit 108, #24 Proposed Sealed Document Exhibit 109, #25 Proposed Sealed Document Exhibit 110)(Benjamin, Nicole) This entry/document has been filed under seal pursuant to statute, rule or court order and access is restricted. Please login to CM/ECF to view document(s).
May 10, 2019 Filing 849 MOTION to Seal Exhibit 85 in Support of Defendants Statement of Undisputed Facts in Support of Defendants Motion for Summary Judgment Filed. Notice Sent To: Warner Chilcott Holdings Company III, Ltd., Warner Chilcott Corporation, Warner Chilcott Public Limited Company, Watson Laboratories, Inc., Warner Chilcott Company, LLC, Warner Chilcott Sales (US), LLC, Watson Pharmaceuticals, Inc., Warner Chilcott Laboratories Ireland Limited, Warner Chilcott U.S., LLC, Warner Chilcott Company, Inc., Actavis, Inc., Ahold USA, Inc., Albertson's, LLC, Mary Alexander, Allergan PLC, Allied Services Division Welfare Fund, American Sales Company, LLC, CVS Pharmacy, Inc., Melisa Chrestman, Melissa Chrestman, City of Providence, Direct Purchaser Class Plaintiffs, Electrical Workers 242 & 294 Health & Welfare Fund, End Payor Plaintiffs, Fraternal Order of Police Fort Lauderdale Lodge 31, HEB Grocery Company L.P., Laborers International Union of North America, Denise Loy, Lupin Ltd., Lupin Pharmaceuticals, Inc., New York Hotel Trades Council & Hotel Association of New York City, Inc. Health Benefits Fund, Painters District Council No. 30 Health & Welfare Fund, Plaintiffs, Rite-Aid Corporation, Rite-Aid Hdqtrs. Corp., Rochester Drug Co-Operative, Inc., Safeway, Inc., Teamsters Local 237 Welfare Benefits Fund, The Kroger Co., United Food and Commercial Workers Local 1776, Walgreen Co.. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Sealed Document Exhibit 85)(Benjamin, Nicole) This entry/document has been filed under seal pursuant to statute, rule or court order and access is restricted. Please login to CM/ECF to view document(s).
May 10, 2019 Filing 848 MOTION to Seal Exhibits 81-84 in Support of Defendants Statement of Undisputed Facts in Support of Defendants Motion for Summary Judgment Filed. Notice Sent To: Warner Chilcott Holdings Company III, Ltd., Warner Chilcott Corporation, Warner Chilcott Public Limited Company, Watson Laboratories, Inc., Warner Chilcott Company, LLC, Warner Chilcott Sales (US), LLC, Watson Pharmaceuticals, Inc., Warner Chilcott Laboratories Ireland Limited, Warner Chilcott U.S., LLC, Warner Chilcott Company, Inc., Actavis, Inc., Ahold USA, Inc., Albertson's, LLC, Mary Alexander, Allergan PLC, Allied Services Division Welfare Fund, American Sales Company, LLC, CVS Pharmacy, Inc., Melisa Chrestman, Melissa Chrestman, City of Providence, Direct Purchaser Class Plaintiffs, Electrical Workers 242 & 294 Health & Welfare Fund, End Payor Plaintiffs, Fraternal Order of Police Fort Lauderdale Lodge 31, HEB Grocery Company L.P., Laborers International Union of North America, Denise Loy, Lupin Ltd., Lupin Pharmaceuticals, Inc., New York Hotel Trades Council & Hotel Association of New York City, Inc. Health Benefits Fund, Painters District Council No. 30 Health & Welfare Fund, Plaintiffs, Rite-Aid Corporation, Rite-Aid Hdqtrs. Corp., Rochester Drug Co-Operative, Inc., Safeway, Inc., Teamsters Local 237 Welfare Benefits Fund, The Kroger Co., United Food and Commercial Workers Local 1776, Walgreen Co.. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Sealed Document Exhibit 81, #2 Proposed Sealed Document Exhibit 82, #3 Proposed Sealed Document Exhibit 83, #4 Proposed Sealed Document Exhibit 84)(Benjamin, Nicole) This entry/document has been filed under seal pursuant to statute, rule or court order and access is restricted. Please login to CM/ECF to view document(s).
May 10, 2019 Filing 847 MOTION to Seal Exhibits 77-80 in Support of Defendants Statement of Undisputed Facts in Support of Defendants Motion for Summary Judgment Filed. Notice Sent To: Warner Chilcott Holdings Company III, Ltd., Warner Chilcott Corporation, Warner Chilcott Public Limited Company, Watson Laboratories, Inc., Warner Chilcott Company, LLC, Warner Chilcott Sales (US), LLC, Watson Pharmaceuticals, Inc., Warner Chilcott Laboratories Ireland Limited, Warner Chilcott U.S., LLC, Warner Chilcott Company, Inc., Actavis, Inc., Ahold USA, Inc., Albertson's, LLC, Mary Alexander, Allergan PLC, Allied Services Division Welfare Fund, American Sales Company, LLC, CVS Pharmacy, Inc., Melisa Chrestman, Melissa Chrestman, City of Providence, Direct Purchaser Class Plaintiffs, Electrical Workers 242 & 294 Health & Welfare Fund, End Payor Plaintiffs, Fraternal Order of Police Fort Lauderdale Lodge 31, HEB Grocery Company L.P., Laborers International Union of North America, Denise Loy, Lupin Ltd., Lupin Pharmaceuticals, Inc., New York Hotel Trades Council & Hotel Association of New York City, Inc. Health Benefits Fund, Painters District Council No. 30 Health & Welfare Fund, Plaintiffs, Rite-Aid Corporation, Rite-Aid Hdqtrs. Corp., Rochester Drug Co-Operative, Inc., Safeway, Inc., Teamsters Local 237 Welfare Benefits Fund, The Kroger Co., United Food and Commercial Workers Local 1776, Walgreen Co.. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Sealed Document Exhibit 77, #2 Proposed Sealed Document Exhibit 78, #3 Proposed Sealed Document Exhibit 79, #4 Proposed Sealed Document Exhibit 80)(Benjamin, Nicole) This entry/document has been filed under seal pursuant to statute, rule or court order and access is restricted. Please login to CM/ECF to view document(s).
May 10, 2019 Filing 846 MOTION to Seal Exhibits 73-76 in Support of Defendants Statement of Undisputed Facts in Support of Defendants Motion for Summary Judgment Filed. Notice Sent To: Warner Chilcott Holdings Company III, Ltd., Warner Chilcott Corporation, Warner Chilcott Public Limited Company, Watson Laboratories, Inc., Warner Chilcott Company, LLC, Warner Chilcott Sales (US), LLC, Watson Pharmaceuticals, Inc., Warner Chilcott Laboratories Ireland Limited, Warner Chilcott U.S., LLC, Warner Chilcott Company, Inc., Actavis, Inc., Ahold USA, Inc., Albertson's, LLC, Mary Alexander, Allergan PLC, Allied Services Division Welfare Fund, American Sales Company, LLC, CVS Pharmacy, Inc., Melisa Chrestman, Melissa Chrestman, City of Providence, Direct Purchaser Class Plaintiffs, Electrical Workers 242 & 294 Health & Welfare Fund, End Payor Plaintiffs, Fraternal Order of Police Fort Lauderdale Lodge 31, HEB Grocery Company L.P., Laborers International Union of North America, Denise Loy, Lupin Ltd., Lupin Pharmaceuticals, Inc., New York Hotel Trades Council & Hotel Association of New York City, Inc. Health Benefits Fund, Painters District Council No. 30 Health & Welfare Fund, Plaintiffs, Rite-Aid Corporation, Rite-Aid Hdqtrs. Corp., Rochester Drug Co-Operative, Inc., Safeway, Inc., Teamsters Local 237 Welfare Benefits Fund, The Kroger Co., United Food and Commercial Workers Local 1776, Walgreen Co.. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Sealed Document Exhibit 73, #2 Proposed Sealed Document Exhibit 74, #3 Proposed Sealed Document Exhibit 75, #4 Proposed Sealed Document Exhibit 76)(Benjamin, Nicole) This entry/document has been filed under seal pursuant to statute, rule or court order and access is restricted. Please login to CM/ECF to view document(s).
May 10, 2019 Filing 845 MOTION to Seal Exhibits 33-72 in Support of Defendants Statement of Undisputed Facts in Support of Defendants Motion for Summary Judgment Filed. Notice Sent To: Warner Chilcott Holdings Company III, Ltd., Warner Chilcott Corporation, Warner Chilcott Public Limited Company, Watson Laboratories, Inc., Warner Chilcott Company, LLC, Warner Chilcott Sales (US), LLC, Watson Pharmaceuticals, Inc., Warner Chilcott Laboratories Ireland Limited, Warner Chilcott U.S., LLC, Warner Chilcott Company, Inc., Actavis, Inc., Ahold USA, Inc., Albertson's, LLC, Mary Alexander, Allergan PLC, Allied Services Division Welfare Fund, American Sales Company, LLC, CVS Pharmacy, Inc., Melisa Chrestman, Melissa Chrestman, City of Providence, Direct Purchaser Class Plaintiffs, Electrical Workers 242 & 294 Health & Welfare Fund, End Payor Plaintiffs, Fraternal Order of Police Fort Lauderdale Lodge 31, HEB Grocery Company L.P., Laborers International Union of North America, Denise Loy, Lupin Ltd., Lupin Pharmaceuticals, Inc., New York Hotel Trades Council & Hotel Association of New York City, Inc. Health Benefits Fund, Painters District Council No. 30 Health & Welfare Fund, Plaintiffs, Rite-Aid Corporation, Rite-Aid Hdqtrs. Corp., Rochester Drug Co-Operative, Inc., Safeway, Inc., Teamsters Local 237 Welfare Benefits Fund, The Kroger Co., United Food and Commercial Workers Local 1776, Walgreen Co.. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Sealed Document Exhibit 33, #2 Proposed Sealed Document Exhibit 34, #3 Proposed Sealed Document Exhibit 35, #4 Proposed Sealed Document Exhibit 36, #5 Proposed Sealed Document Exhibit 37, #6 Proposed Sealed Document Exhibit 38, #7 Proposed Sealed Document Exhibit 39, #8 Proposed Sealed Document Exhibit 40, #9 Proposed Sealed Document Exhibit 41, #10 Proposed Sealed Document Exhibit 42, #11 Proposed Sealed Document Exhibit 43, #12 Proposed Sealed Document Exhibit 44, #13 Proposed Sealed Document Exhibit 45, #14 Proposed Sealed Document Exhibit 46, #15 Proposed Sealed Document Exhibit 47, #16 Proposed Sealed Document Exhibit 48, #17 Proposed Sealed Document Exhibit 49, #18 Proposed Sealed Document Exhibit 50, #19 Proposed Sealed Document Exhibit 51, #20 Proposed Sealed Document Exhibit 52, #21 Proposed Sealed Document Exhibit 53, #22 Proposed Sealed Document Exhibit 54, #23 Proposed Sealed Document Exhibit 55, #24 Proposed Sealed Document Exhibit 56, #25 Proposed Sealed Document Exhibit 57, #26 Proposed Sealed Document Exhibit 58, #27 Proposed Sealed Document Exhibit 59, #28 Proposed Sealed Document Exhibit 60, #29 Proposed Sealed Document Exhibit 61, #30 Proposed Sealed Document Exhibit 62, #31 Proposed Sealed Document Exhibit 63, #32 Proposed Sealed Document Exhibit 64, #33 Proposed Sealed Document Exhibit 65, #34 Proposed Sealed Document Exhibit 66, #35 Proposed Sealed Document Exhibit 67, #36 Proposed Sealed Document Exhibit 68, #37 Proposed Sealed Document Exhibit 69, #38 Proposed Sealed Document Exhibit 70, #39 Proposed Sealed Document Exhibit 71, #40 Proposed Sealed Document Exhibit 72)(Benjamin, Nicole) This entry/document has been filed under seal pursuant to statute, rule or court order and access is restricted. Please login to CM/ECF to view document(s).
May 10, 2019 Filing 844 MOTION to Seal Exhibits 1-32 in Support of Defendants Statement of Undisputed Facts in Support of Defendants Motion for Summary Judgment Filed. Notice Sent To: Warner Chilcott Holdings Company III, Ltd., Warner Chilcott Corporation, Warner Chilcott Public Limited Company, Watson Laboratories, Inc., Warner Chilcott Company, LLC, Warner Chilcott Sales (US), LLC, Watson Pharmaceuticals, Inc., Warner Chilcott Laboratories Ireland Limited, Warner Chilcott U.S., LLC, Warner Chilcott Company, Inc., Actavis, Inc., Ahold USA, Inc., Albertson's, LLC, Mary Alexander, Allergan PLC, Allied Services Division Welfare Fund, American Sales Company, LLC, CVS Pharmacy, Inc., Melisa Chrestman, Melissa Chrestman, City of Providence, Direct Purchaser Class Plaintiffs, Electrical Workers 242 & 294 Health & Welfare Fund, End Payor Plaintiffs, Fraternal Order of Police Fort Lauderdale Lodge 31, HEB Grocery Company L.P., Laborers International Union of North America, Denise Loy, Lupin Ltd., Lupin Pharmaceuticals, Inc., New York Hotel Trades Council & Hotel Association of New York City, Inc. Health Benefits Fund, Painters District Council No. 30 Health & Welfare Fund, Plaintiffs, Rite-Aid Corporation, Rite-Aid Hdqtrs. Corp., Rochester Drug Co-Operative, Inc., Safeway, Inc., Teamsters Local 237 Welfare Benefits Fund, The Kroger Co., United Food and Commercial Workers Local 1776, Walgreen Co.. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Sealed Document Exhibit 1, #2 Proposed Sealed Document Exhibit 2, #3 Proposed Sealed Document Exhibit 3, #4 Proposed Sealed Document Exhibit 4, #5 Proposed Sealed Document Exhibit 5, #6 Proposed Sealed Document Exhibit 6, #7 Proposed Sealed Document Exhibit 7, #8 Proposed Sealed Document Exhibit 8, #9 Proposed Sealed Document Exhibit 9, #10 Proposed Sealed Document Exhibit 10, #11 Proposed Sealed Document Exhibit 11, #12 Proposed Sealed Document Exhibit 12, #13 Proposed Sealed Document Exhibit 13, #14 Proposed Sealed Document Exhibit 14, #15 Proposed Sealed Document Exhibit 15, #16 Proposed Sealed Document Exhibit 16, #17 Proposed Sealed Document Exhibit 17, #18 Proposed Sealed Document Exhibit 18, #19 Proposed Sealed Document Exhibit 19, #20 Proposed Sealed Document Exhibit 20, #21 Proposed Sealed Document Exhibit 21, #22 Proposed Sealed Document Exhibit 22, #23 Proposed Sealed Document Exhibit 23, #24 Proposed Sealed Document Exhibit 24, #25 Proposed Sealed Document Exhibit 25, #26 Proposed Sealed Document Exhibit 26, #27 Proposed Sealed Document Exhibit 27, #28 Proposed Sealed Document Exhibit 28, #29 Proposed Sealed Document Exhibit 29, #30 Proposed Sealed Document Exhibit 30, #31 Proposed Sealed Document Exhibit 31, #32 Proposed Sealed Document Exhibit 32)(Benjamin, Nicole) This entry/document has been filed under seal pursuant to statute, rule or court order and access is restricted. Please login to CM/ECF to view document(s).
May 10, 2019 Filing 843 DECLARATION re #842 MOTION for Summary Judgment (Declaration of Katherine Dyson) by Warner Chilcott Company, Inc., Warner Chilcott Company, LLC, Warner Chilcott Corporation, Warner Chilcott Holdings Company III, Ltd., Warner Chilcott Laboratories Ireland Limited, Warner Chilcott Public Limited Company, Warner Chilcott Sales (US), LLC, Warner Chilcott U.S., LLC, Watson Laboratories, Inc., Watson Pharmaceuticals, Inc.. (Benjamin, Nicole)
May 10, 2019 Filing 842 MOTION for Summary Judgment filed by Warner Chilcott Company, Inc., Warner Chilcott Company, LLC, Warner Chilcott Corporation, Warner Chilcott Holdings Company III, Ltd., Warner Chilcott Laboratories Ireland Limited, Warner Chilcott Public Limited Company, Warner Chilcott Sales (US), LLC, Warner Chilcott U.S., LLC, Watson Laboratories, Inc., Watson Pharmaceuticals, Inc.. Responses due by 5/24/2019. (Benjamin, Nicole)
May 10, 2019 Filing 841 NOTICE by Allergan PLC, Warner Chilcott Company, LLC, Warner Chilcott Corporation, Warner Chilcott Holdings Company III, Ltd., Warner Chilcott Laboratories Ireland Limited, Warner Chilcott Public Limited Company, Warner Chilcott Sales (US), LLC, Warner Chilcott U.S., LLC, Watson Laboratories, Inc., Watson Pharmaceuticals, Inc. / Notice of Withdrawal of Appearance of Caitlin Cipicchio (Cipicchio, Caitlin)
May 6, 2019 Opinion or Order TEXT ORDER granting in part #839 Motion for Leave to File Excess Pages: Defendants may file up to 125 pages, inclusive of their statement(s) of facts, for their opening memorandum in support of their motion for summary judgment. The Court is disinclined to take up this matter again and is confident that counsel of record is capable of zealously representing their clients within these parameters. So Ordered by Chief Judge William E. Smith on 5/6/2019. (Jackson, Ryan)
May 2, 2019 Filing 840 RESPONSE In Opposition to #839 MOTION for Leave to File Excess Pages (Motion to Enlarge Page Limit for Defendants' Rule 56 Motion and Accompanying Statement of Undisputed Facts) filed by Plaintiffs. Replies due by 5/9/2019. (Johnson, Kristen)
April 30, 2019 Filing 839 MOTION for Leave to File Excess Pages (Motion to Enlarge Page Limit for Defendants' Rule 56 Motion and Accompanying Statement of Undisputed Facts) filed by Warner Chilcott Company, Inc., Warner Chilcott Company, LLC, Warner Chilcott Corporation, Warner Chilcott Holdings Company III, Ltd., Warner Chilcott Laboratories Ireland Limited, Warner Chilcott Public Limited Company, Warner Chilcott Sales (US), LLC, Warner Chilcott U.S., LLC, Watson Laboratories, Inc., Watson Pharmaceuticals, Inc.. (Benjamin, Nicole)
April 29, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 838 ORDER Entering #831 Stipulation REGARDING USE OF IZUMI HARA AND PAUL HERENDEEN DEPOSITIONS AND OTHER LIVE OR WRITTEN TESTIMONY filed by Plaintiffs. So Ordered by Chief Judge William E. Smith on 4/29/2019. (Jackson, Ryan)
April 26, 2019 Filing 837 NOTICE by Warner Chilcott Company, Inc., Warner Chilcott Company, LLC, Warner Chilcott Corporation, Warner Chilcott Holdings Company III, Ltd., Warner Chilcott Laboratories Ireland Limited, Warner Chilcott Public Limited Company, Warner Chilcott Sales (US), LLC, Warner Chilcott U.S., LLC, Watson Laboratories, Inc., Watson Pharmaceuticals, Inc. re #836 Notice (Other) (Defendants' Response to Plaintiffs' Notice of Supplemental Authority Regarding Market Power: FTC Decision in In re Impax Laboratories, Inc.) (Benjamin, Nicole)
April 22, 2019 Filing 836 NOTICE by Plaintiffs re 599 Memorandum in Support, Notice of Supplemental Authority Regarding Market Power (Attachments: #1 Exhibit)(Shadowen, Steve)
April 19, 2019 Filing 835 RESPONSE IN OPPOSITION by End Payor Plaintiffs re #833 Notice (Other),, End-Payor Plaintiffs Response To Defendants Notice Of Supplemental Authority Regarding End-Payor Plaintiffs Motion For Class Certification. (Miller, Marvin)
April 16, 2019 Opinion or Order TEXT ORDER granting #832 Motion to Seal. So Ordered by Chief Judge William E. Smith on 4/16/2019. (Jackson, Ryan)
April 16, 2019 Opinion or Order TEXT ORDER denying #830 Motion for Leave to File: As stated in the text order dated 4/11/2019, the Court DENIES #830 Defendants' Motion for Leave to File a Sur-Rebuttal Expert Report of Dr. Thisted, with the understanding that, if the Court has questions or needs further argument with respect to the latter expert, it will notify the parties. So Ordered by Chief Judge William E. Smith on 4/16/2019. (Jackson, Ryan)
April 15, 2019 Filing 833 NOTICE by Warner Chilcott Company, Inc., Warner Chilcott Company, LLC, Warner Chilcott Corporation, Warner Chilcott Holdings Company III, Ltd., Warner Chilcott Laboratories Ireland Limited, Warner Chilcott Public Limited Company, Warner Chilcott Sales (US), LLC, Warner Chilcott U.S., LLC, Watson Laboratories, Inc., Watson Pharmaceuticals, Inc. re 589 Response to Motion,,,,,, Notice of Supplemental Authority Regarding End-Payor Plaintiffs' Motion for Class Certification (Benjamin, Nicole)
April 15, 2019 Filing 832 MOTION to Seal EXHIBITS TO STIPULATION REGARDING USE OF IZUMI HARA AND PAUL HERENDEEN DEPOSITIONS AND OTHER LIVE OR WRITTEN TESTIMONY AND [PROPOSED] ORDER Filed. Notice Sent To: Plaintiffs, Actavis, Inc., Ahold USA, Inc., Albertson's, LLC, Mary Alexander, Allergan PLC, Allied Services Division Welfare Fund, American Sales Company, LLC, CVS Pharmacy, Inc., Melisa Chrestman, Melissa Chrestman, City of Providence, Direct Purchaser Class Plaintiffs, Electrical Workers 242 & 294 Health & Welfare Fund, End Payor Plaintiffs, Fraternal Order of Police Fort Lauderdale Lodge 31, HEB Grocery Company L.P., Laborers International Union of North America, Denise Loy, Lupin Ltd., Lupin Pharmaceuticals, Inc., New York Hotel Trades Council & Hotel Association of New York City, Inc. Health Benefits Fund, Painters District Council No. 30 Health & Welfare Fund, Rite-Aid Corporation, Rite-Aid Hdqtrs. Corp., Rochester Drug Co-Operative, Inc., Safeway, Inc., Teamsters Local 237 Welfare Benefits Fund, The Kroger Co., United Food and Commercial Workers Local 1776, Walgreen Co., Warner Chilcott Company, Inc., Warner Chilcott Company, LLC, Warner Chilcott Corporation, Warner Chilcott Holdings Company III, Ltd., Warner Chilcott Laboratories Ireland Limited, Warner Chilcott Public Limited Company, Warner Chilcott Sales (US), LLC, Warner Chilcott U.S., LLC, Watson Laboratories, Inc., Watson Pharmaceuticals, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Sealed Document Exhibit A, #2 Proposed Sealed Document Exhibit B, #3 Proposed Sealed Document Exhibit C, #4 Proposed Sealed Document Exhibit D)(Robertson, Sharon) This entry/document has been filed under seal pursuant to statute, rule or court order and access is restricted. Please login to CM/ECF to view document(s).
April 15, 2019 Filing 831 STIPULATION REGARDING USE OF IZUMI HARA AND PAUL HERENDEEN DEPOSITIONS AND OTHER LIVE OR WRITTEN TESTIMONY AND [PROPOSED] ORDER filed by Plaintiffs. (Robertson, Sharon)
April 12, 2019 Filing 830 MOTION for Leave to File Document (Motion for Leave to Serve Sur-Reply Expert Report of Dr. Ronald Thisted and Request for Expedited Relief) (Public Version) filed by Warner Chilcott Company, Inc., Warner Chilcott Company, LLC, Warner Chilcott Corporation, Warner Chilcott Holdings Company III, Ltd., Warner Chilcott Laboratories Ireland Limited, Warner Chilcott Public Limited Company, Warner Chilcott Sales (US), LLC, Warner Chilcott U.S., LLC, Watson Laboratories, Inc., Watson Pharmaceuticals, Inc.. Responses due by 4/26/2019. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit 2, #3 Exhibit 3)(Benjamin, Nicole)
April 11, 2019 Opinion or Order TEXT ORDER denying #826 Motion for Leave to File a Supplemental Memo of Law in Further Support of the Dr. French Daubert Motion and DENYING 827 Defendants' Motion for Leave to File a Sur-Rebuttal Expert Report of Dr. Thisted, with the understanding that, if the Court has questions or needs further argument with respect to the latter expert, it will notify the parties. So Ordered by Chief Judge William E. Smith on 4/11/2019. (Jackson, Ryan)
April 10, 2019 Filing 829 RESPONSE In Opposition to #826 MOTION for Leave to File Document (Motion for Leave to File a Supplemental Memorandum of Law in Further Support of Defendants' Motion to Exclude the Opinions and Testimony of End-Payor Plaintiffs' Expert Gary L. French) filed by End Payor Plaintiffs. Replies due by 4/17/2019. (Miller, Marvin)
April 10, 2019 Filing 828 RESPONSE In Opposition to 827 MOTION for Leave to File Document Plaintiffs' Opposition to Defendants' Emergency Motion for Leave to Serve Sur-Reply Expert Report of Dr. Ronald Thisted (Served 4/9/2019) filed by Plaintiffs. Replies due by 4/17/2019. (Johnson, Kristen)
April 8, 2019 Opinion or Order TEXT ORDER granting in part 827 Motion for Leave to File: Text Order adopting the expedited briefing schedule set forth on page 4 of 827 Defendants' Motion for Leave to Serve Sur-Reply Expert Report of Thisted. Plaintiff has until April 9, 2019 to file a response to 827 Defendants' Motion. So Ordered by Chief Judge William E. Smith on 4/8/2019. (Jackson, Ryan) Modified ruling to "granting in part" 4/8/2019 (Jackson, Ryan).
April 5, 2019 Opinion or Order TEXT ORDER granting #825 Motion to Seal. So Ordered by Chief Judge William E. Smith on 4/5/2019. (Jackson, Ryan)
April 4, 2019 Filing 826 MOTION for Leave to File Document (Motion for Leave to File a Supplemental Memorandum of Law in Further Support of Defendants' Motion to Exclude the Opinions and Testimony of End-Payor Plaintiffs' Expert Gary L. French) filed by Warner Chilcott Company, Inc., Warner Chilcott Company, LLC, Warner Chilcott Corporation, Warner Chilcott Holdings Company III, Ltd., Warner Chilcott Laboratories Ireland Limited, Warner Chilcott Public Limited Company, Warner Chilcott Sales (US), LLC, Warner Chilcott U.S., LLC, Watson Laboratories, Inc., Watson Pharmaceuticals, Inc.. Responses due by 4/18/2019. (Benjamin, Nicole)
April 4, 2019 Filing 825 MOTION to Seal Motion for Leave to Serve Sur-Reply Expert Report of Dr. Ronald Thisted and Request for Expedited Relief Filed. Notice Sent To: Warner Chilcott Holdings Company III, Ltd., Warner Chilcott Corporation, Warner Chilcott Public Limited Company, Watson Laboratories, Inc., Warner Chilcott Company, LLC, Warner Chilcott Sales (US), LLC, Watson Pharmaceuticals, Inc., Warner Chilcott Laboratories Ireland Limited, Warner Chilcott U.S., LLC, Warner Chilcott Company, Inc., Actavis, Inc., Ahold USA, Inc., Albertson's, LLC, Mary Alexander, Allergan PLC, Allied Services Division Welfare Fund, American Sales Company, LLC, CVS Pharmacy, Inc., Melisa Chrestman, Melissa Chrestman, City of Providence, Direct Purchaser Class Plaintiffs, Electrical Workers 242 & 294 Health & Welfare Fund, End Payor Plaintiffs, Fraternal Order of Police Fort Lauderdale Lodge 31, HEB Grocery Company L.P., Laborers International Union of North America, Denise Loy, Lupin Ltd., Lupin Pharmaceuticals, Inc., New York Hotel Trades Council & Hotel Association of New York City, Inc. Health Benefits Fund, Painters District Council No. 30 Health & Welfare Fund, Plaintiffs, Rite-Aid Corporation, Rite-Aid Hdqtrs. Corp., Rochester Drug Co-Operative, Inc., Safeway, Inc., Teamsters Local 237 Welfare Benefits Fund, The Kroger Co., United Food and Commercial Workers Local 1776, Walgreen Co.. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Sealed Document Motion for Leave to Serve Sur-Reply Expert Report of Dr. Ronald Thisted and Request for Expedited Relief, #2 Proposed Sealed Document Exhibit 1, #3 Proposed Sealed Document Exhibit 2, #4 Proposed Sealed Document Exhibit 3)(Benjamin, Nicole) This entry/document has been filed under seal pursuant to statute, rule or court order and access is restricted. Please login to CM/ECF to view document(s).
April 2, 2019 Opinion or Order TEXT ORDER: The Court has considered the parties' #824 Joint Proposal Regarding Summary Judgment and Daubert Motions. The Court adopts the parties' new proposed filing deadlines as set forth on page 2 of the Joint Proposal, as well as the other agreed-upon aspects set forth therein. With respect to page limits for the briefing, the Court imposes the following limits: Summary judgment opening brief: 90 pages; opposition brief: 90 pages; and reply brief: 45 pages. Daubert opening briefs (per expert): 20 pages; oppositions: 20 pages; and reply: 10 pages. Additional statement(s) of facts in support of the briefs are included in these limits. The Court will not limit subsequent motions seeking exclusion of expert testimony at this time, but may at a future date. So Ordered by Chief Judge William E. Smith on 4/2/2019. (Jackson, Ryan)
March 29, 2019 Filing 824 STATUS REPORT Joint Proposal Regarding Summary Judgment and Daubert Motions by Plaintiffs. (Sobol, Thomas)
March 29, 2019 Filing 823 TRANSCRIPT of Motion for Summary Judgment (Market Power), held on March 14, 2019, before Chief Judge William E. Smith. Court Reporter Denise P. Veitch, Telephone number 401-752-7031. Transcript may be viewed at the court public terminal or purchased through the Court Reporter before the deadline for Release of Transcript Restriction. After that date it may be obtained through the Court Reporter or PACER. NOTICE TO COUNSEL: Redaction Requests must be filed for personal identifiers only. All other redactions must be requested by motion. For local policy and sample redaction request visit our website at www.rid.uscourts.gov and select Transcripts under the Case Information menu option. Redaction Request due 4/19/2019. Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 4/29/2019. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 6/27/2019. (Veitch, Denise)
March 25, 2019 Minute Entry for proceedings held before Magistrate Judge Patricia A. Sullivan: Telephone Conference held on 3/25/2019. Attorneys present: Direct Purchaser Plaintiffs Joseph Meltzer Daniel Walker; End Payor Plaintiffs Lori Fanning; Walgreen Plaintiffs Scott Perwin; CVS/Rite Aid Plaintiffs Eric Bloom; Warner Chilcott and Watson Defendants Nicole Benjamin Kate Dyson and David Courchaine; Lupin Defendants Katie Glynn. (Chambers at 9:30.) (Saucier, Martha)
March 20, 2019 Filing 822 TRANSCRIPT ORDER ACKNOWLEDGMENT Entered re: #821 Transcript Order. Court Reporter/Transcriber: Denise Veitch. (Dias, Jennifer)
March 19, 2019 Filing 821 TRANSCRIPT ORDER for proceedings held on March 14, 2019 before Judge Smith. Expedited Transcript selected. Transcript to be delivered within 7 calendar days.. (Johnson, Kristen)
March 19, 2019 NOTICE of Hearing: Telephone Conference set for 3/25/2019 at 09:30 AM in Magistrate Judge Sullivan Chambers before Magistrate Judge Patricia A. Sullivan regarding discovery dispute. (Saucier, Martha)
March 18, 2019 Filing 820 REPLY to Response re 803 Response to Motion, (Reply Memorandum of Law in Support of Defendants' Motion to Exclude Certain Opinions and Testimony of Dr. Richard J. Derman) (Public Version) filed by Warner Chilcott Company, Inc., Warner Chilcott Company, LLC, Warner Chilcott Corporation, Warner Chilcott Holdings Company III, Ltd., Warner Chilcott Laboratories Ireland Limited, Warner Chilcott Public Limited Company, Warner Chilcott Sales (US), LLC, Warner Chilcott U.S., LLC, Watson Laboratories, Inc., Watson Pharmaceuticals, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Exhibit 4)(Benjamin, Nicole)
March 18, 2019 Filing 819 TRANSCRIPT ORDER ACKNOWLEDGMENT Entered re: #817 Transcript Order. Court Reporter/Transcriber: Denise Veitch. (Dias, Jennifer)
March 15, 2019 Filing 818 REPLY MEMORANDUM re #646 MOTION Exclude the Opinions and Testimony of Plaintiffs' Expert Dr. Christopher F. Baum and Certain Opinions of Dr. Meredith Rosenthal (Public Version). (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 8, #2 Exhibit 9, #3 Exhibit 10, #4 Exhibit 11, #5 Exhibit 12, #6 Exhibit 13, #7 Exhibit 14, #8 Exhibit 15, #9 Exhibit 16, #10 Exhibit 17)(Benjamin, Nicole)
March 15, 2019 Filing 817 TRANSCRIPT ORDER for proceedings held on 3/14/19 before Judge William E. Smith. Ordinary Transcript delivery selected. Transcript to be delivered in 30 days.. (Benjamin, Nicole)
March 14, 2019 Minute Entry for proceedings held before Chief Judge William E. Smith: Evidentiary Hearing held on 3/15/2019. Steve Shadowen, Kristen Johnson, Edward Notargiacomo, Thomas Sobol and Scott Perwin for the Plaintiffs. Mark Gidley, Robert A. Milne, Nicole Benjamin, Jack Pace and Eugene Hutchinson for the Defendants. Court addresses. Counsel argue. Exhibits offered. Court takes under advisement. (Court Reporter Denise Veitch in Courtroom 3 at 10:04.) (Jackson, Kerrie)
March 13, 2019 Filing 814 REDACTION Plaintiffs' Reply in Support of Their Motion to Exclude the Expert Testimony of Dr. Addanki Filed (Public Version) by Plaintiffs. (Kohn, Peter)
March 12, 2019 Opinion or Order TEXT ORDER granting #809 Motion to Seal; granting #810 Motion to Seal. So Ordered by Chief Judge William E. Smith on 3/12/2019. (Jackson, Ryan)
March 12, 2019 Opinion or Order TEXT ORDER granting #811 Motion for Extension of Time for Service of Rebuttal Merits Expert Reports by and Depositions of Certain of Plaintiffs' Experts. So Ordered by Chief Judge William E. Smith on 3/12/2019. (Jackson, Ryan)
March 11, 2019 Filing 812 REDACTION Public Version of ECF 803 by Plaintiffs. (Attachments: #1 Affidavit, #2 Exhibit)(Walker, Daniel)
March 11, 2019 Filing 811 Assented MOTION for an Extension of Time for Service of Rebuttal Merits Expert Reports by and Depositions of Certain of Plaintiffs' Experts filed by Plaintiffs. Responses due by 3/25/2019. (Sobol, Thomas)
March 8, 2019 Filing 810 MOTION to Seal Reply Memorandum of Law in Support of Defendants Motion to Exclude Certain Opinions and Testimony of Dr. Richard J. Derman Filed. Notice Sent To: Warner Chilcott Holdings Company III, Ltd., Warner Chilcott Corporation, Warner Chilcott Public Limited Company, Watson Laboratories, Inc., Warner Chilcott Company, LLC, Warner Chilcott Sales (US), LLC, Watson Pharmaceuticals, Inc., Warner Chilcott Laboratories Ireland Limited, Warner Chilcott U.S., LLC, Warner Chilcott Company, Inc., Actavis, Inc., Ahold USA, Inc., Albertson's, LLC, Mary Alexander, Allergan PLC, Allied Services Division Welfare Fund, American Sales Company, LLC, CVS Pharmacy, Inc., Melisa Chrestman, Melissa Chrestman, City of Providence, Direct Purchaser Class Plaintiffs, Electrical Workers 242 & 294 Health & Welfare Fund, End Payor Plaintiffs, Fraternal Order of Police Fort Lauderdale Lodge 31, HEB Grocery Company L.P., Laborers International Union of North America, Denise Loy, Lupin Ltd., Lupin Pharmaceuticals, Inc., New York Hotel Trades Council & Hotel Association of New York City, Inc. Health Benefits Fund, Painters District Council No. 30 Health & Welfare Fund, Plaintiffs, Rite-Aid Corporation, Rite-Aid Hdqtrs. Corp., Rochester Drug Co-Operative, Inc., Safeway, Inc., Teamsters Local 237 Welfare Benefits Fund, The Kroger Co., United Food and Commercial Workers Local 1776, Walgreen Co.. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Sealed Document Defendants' Reply Memorandum of Law in Support of Defendants Motion to Exclude Certain Opinions and Testimony of Dr. Richard J. Derman, #2 Proposed Sealed Document Exhibit 4)(Benjamin, Nicole) This entry/document has been filed under seal pursuant to statute, rule or court order and access is restricted. Please login to CM/ECF to view document(s).
March 8, 2019 Filing 809 MOTION to Seal Plaintiffs' Reply in Support of Their Motion to Exclude the Expert Testimony of Dr. Addanki Filed. Notice Sent To: Plaintiffs, Actavis, Inc., Ahold USA, Inc., Albertson's, LLC, Mary Alexander, Allergan PLC, Allied Services Division Welfare Fund, City of Providence, Direct Purchaser Class Plaintiffs, Electrical Workers 242 & 294 Health & Welfare Fund, End Payor Plaintiffs, Fraternal Order of Police Fort Lauderdale Lodge 31, HEB Grocery Company L.P., Laborers International Union of North America, Denise Loy, Lupin Ltd., Lupin Pharmaceuticals, Inc., New York Hotel Trades Council & Hotel Association of New York City, Inc. Health Benefits Fund, Painters District Council No. 30 Health & Welfare Fund, Rite-Aid Corporation, Rite-Aid Hdqtrs. Corp., Rochester Drug Co-Operative, Inc., Safeway, Inc., Teamsters Local 237 Welfare Benefits Fund, The Kroger Co., United Food and Commercial Workers Local 1776, Walgreen Co., Warner Chilcott Company, Inc., Warner Chilcott Company, LLC, Warner Chilcott Corporation, Warner Chilcott Holdings Company III, Ltd., Warner Chilcott Laboratories Ireland Limited, Warner Chilcott Public Limited Company, Warner Chilcott Sales (US), LLC, Warner Chilcott U.S., LLC, Watson Laboratories, Inc., Watson Pharmaceuticals, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Sealed Document)(Potter, Carrie) This entry/document has been filed under seal pursuant to statute, rule or court order and access is restricted. Please login to CM/ECF to view document(s).
March 8, 2019 Minute Entry for proceedings held before Magistrate Judge Patricia A. Sullivan: Status Conference held on 3/8/2019 with Attorneys Marvin Miller and Robert McConnell. CPA Linda Opichka. (Court Reporter Lisa Schwam in Chambers at 4:08.) (Saucier, Martha)
March 8, 2019 Minute Entry for proceedings held before Magistrate Judge Patricia A. Sullivan: Status Conference held on 3/8/2019 with Attorneys Peter Kohn and David Calvello. CPA Robert Zagrodny and Chet Capodilupo. (Court Reporter Lisa Schwam in Chambers at 3:00.) (Saucier, Martha)
March 8, 2019 Filing 808 TRANSCRIPT of Evidentiary held on 02/14/2019 before Judge Smith. Court Reporter/Transcriber Lisa Schwam, Telephone number 401-752-7128. Transcript may be viewed at the court public terminal or purchased through the Court Reporter/Transcriber before the deadline for Release of Transcript Restriction. After that date it may be obtained through PACER. NOTICE TO COUNSEL: Redaction Requests must be filed for personal identifiers only. All other redactions must be requested by motion. For local policy and sample redaction request visit our website at www.rid.uscourts.gov and select Transcripts under the Case Information menu option. Redaction Request due 3/29/2019. Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 4/8/2019. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 6/6/2019. (Schwam, Lisa)
March 8, 2019 Filing 807 TRANSCRIPT of Evidentiary held on 02/13/2019 before Judge Smith. Court Reporter/Transcriber Lisa Schwam, Telephone number 401-752-7128. Transcript may be viewed at the court public terminal or purchased through the Court Reporter/Transcriber before the deadline for Release of Transcript Restriction. After that date it may be obtained through PACER. NOTICE TO COUNSEL: Redaction Requests must be filed for personal identifiers only. All other redactions must be requested by motion. For local policy and sample redaction request visit our website at www.rid.uscourts.gov and select Transcripts under the Case Information menu option. Redaction Request due 3/29/2019. Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 4/8/2019. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 6/6/2019. (Schwam, Lisa)
March 8, 2019 Filing 806 TRANSCRIPT of Evidentiary hearing held on 02/11/2019 before Judge Smith. Court Reporter/Transcriber Lisa Schwam, Telephone number 401-752-7128. Transcript may be viewed at the court public terminal or purchased through the Court Reporter/Transcriber before the deadline for Release of Transcript Restriction. After that date it may be obtained through PACER. NOTICE TO COUNSEL: Redaction Requests must be filed for personal identifiers only. All other redactions must be requested by motion. For local policy and sample redaction request visit our website at www.rid.uscourts.gov and select Transcripts under the Case Information menu option. Redaction Request due 3/29/2019. Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 4/8/2019. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 6/6/2019. (Schwam, Lisa)
March 8, 2019 Opinion or Order TEXT ORDER granting #804 Motion to Seal. So Ordered by Chief Judge William E. Smith on 3/8/2019. (Jackson, Ryan)
March 7, 2019 Filing 804 MOTION to Seal Defendants Reply Memorandum of Law in Support of Defendants Motion to Exclude the Opinions and Testimony of Plaintiffs Expert Dr. Christopher F. Baum and Certain Opinions of Dr. Meredith Rosenthal and Exhibits Thereto Filed. Notice Sent To: Warner Chilcott Holdings Company III, Ltd., Warner Chilcott Corporation, Warner Chilcott Public Limited Company, Watson Laboratories, Inc., Warner Chilcott Company, LLC, Warner Chilcott Sales (US), LLC, Watson Pharmaceuticals, Inc., Warner Chilcott Laboratories Ireland Limited, Warner Chilcott U.S., LLC, Warner Chilcott Company, Inc., Actavis, Inc., Ahold USA, Inc., Albertson's, LLC, Mary Alexander, Allergan PLC, Allied Services Division Welfare Fund, American Sales Company, LLC, CVS Pharmacy, Inc., Melisa Chrestman, Melissa Chrestman, City of Providence, Direct Purchaser Class Plaintiffs, Electrical Workers 242 & 294 Health & Welfare Fund, End Payor Plaintiffs, Fraternal Order of Police Fort Lauderdale Lodge 31, HEB Grocery Company L.P., Laborers International Union of North America, Denise Loy, Lupin Ltd., Lupin Pharmaceuticals, Inc., New York Hotel Trades Council & Hotel Association of New York City, Inc. Health Benefits Fund, Painters District Council No. 30 Health & Welfare Fund, Plaintiffs, Rite-Aid Corporation, Rite-Aid Hdqtrs. Corp., Rochester Drug Co-Operative, Inc., Safeway, Inc., Teamsters Local 237 Welfare Benefits Fund, The Kroger Co., United Food and Commercial Workers Local 1776, Walgreen Co.. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Sealed Document Defendants Reply Memorandum of Law in Support of Defendants Motion to Exclude the Opinions and Testimony of Plaintiffs Expert Dr. Christopher F. Baum and Certain Opinions of Dr. Meredith Rosenthal, #2 Proposed Sealed Document Exhibit 8, #3 Proposed Sealed Document Exhibit 9, #4 Proposed Sealed Document Exhibit 10, #5 Proposed Sealed Document Exhibit 11, #6 Proposed Sealed Document Exhibit 12, #7 Proposed Sealed Document Exhibit 13, #8 Proposed Sealed Document Exhibit 14, #9 Proposed Sealed Document Exhibit 15, #10 Proposed Sealed Document Exhibit 16, #11 Proposed Sealed Document Exhibit 17)(Benjamin, Nicole) This entry/document has been filed under seal pursuant to statute, rule or court order and access is restricted. Please login to CM/ECF to view document(s).
March 5, 2019 Opinion or Order TEXT ORDER granting #799 Motion for Extension of Time to File Response and Reply to #781 MOTION Exclude Certain Opinions and Testimony of Dr. Richard J. Derman; Responses due by 3/4/2019; Replies due by 3/8/2019. So Ordered by Chief Judge William E. Smith on 3/5/2019. (Jackson, Ryan)
March 5, 2019 Opinion or Order TEXT ORDER granting #801 Motion to Seal. So Ordered by Chief Judge William E. Smith on 3/5/2019. (Jackson, Ryan)
March 4, 2019 Filing 801 MOTION to Seal Plaintiffs' Opposition to ECF No. 741 Filed. Notice Sent To: Plaintiffs, Actavis, Inc., Ahold USA, Inc., Albertson's, LLC, Mary Alexander, Allergan PLC, Allied Services Division Welfare Fund, American Sales Company, LLC, CVS Pharmacy, Inc., Melisa Chrestman, Melissa Chrestman, City of Providence, Direct Purchaser Class Plaintiffs, Electrical Workers 242 & 294 Health & Welfare Fund, End Payor Plaintiffs, Fraternal Order of Police Fort Lauderdale Lodge 31, HEB Grocery Company L.P., Laborers International Union of North America, Denise Loy, Lupin Ltd., Lupin Pharmaceuticals, Inc., New York Hotel Trades Council & Hotel Association of New York City, Inc. Health Benefits Fund, Painters District Council No. 30 Health & Welfare Fund, Rite-Aid Corporation, Rite-Aid Hdqtrs. Corp., Rochester Drug Co-Operative, Inc., Safeway, Inc., Teamsters Local 237 Welfare Benefits Fund, The Kroger Co., United Food and Commercial Workers Local 1776, Walgreen Co., Warner Chilcott Company, Inc., Warner Chilcott Company, LLC, Warner Chilcott Corporation, Warner Chilcott Holdings Company III, Ltd., Warner Chilcott Laboratories Ireland Limited, Warner Chilcott Public Limited Company, Warner Chilcott Sales (US), LLC, Warner Chilcott U.S., LLC, Watson Laboratories, Inc., Watson Pharmaceuticals, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Sealed Document, #2 Proposed Sealed Document, #3 Proposed Sealed Document, #4 Proposed Sealed Document)(Noteware, Ellen) This entry/document has been filed under seal pursuant to statute, rule or court order and access is restricted. Please login to CM/ECF to view document(s).
March 4, 2019 Filing 800 REDACTION ECF No.787 by Plaintiffs. (Walker, Daniel)
March 4, 2019 Filing 799 MOTION for an Extension of Time to File Response/Reply to ECF No. 741 filed by Plaintiffs. Responses due by 3/18/2019. (Noteware, Ellen)
March 4, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 798 ORDER MODIFYING INTERIM CASE MANAGEMENT ORDER 14 and granting #796 Motion for Extension of Time. So Ordered by Chief Judge William E. Smith on 3/4/2019. (Jackson, Ryan)
March 1, 2019 Filing 797 STATUS REPORT (Joint Status Report Concerning Motion for Summary Judgment on Market Power) by Warner Chilcott Company, Inc., Warner Chilcott Company, LLC, Warner Chilcott Corporation, Warner Chilcott Holdings Company III, Ltd., Warner Chilcott Laboratories Ireland Limited, Warner Chilcott Public Limited Company, Warner Chilcott Sales (US), LLC, Warner Chilcott U.S., LLC, Watson Laboratories, Inc., Watson Pharmaceuticals, Inc.. (Benjamin, Nicole)
March 1, 2019 Filing 796 Joint MOTION for an Extension of Time To Extend Deadlines in Case Managment Order No. 14 . Responses due by 3/15/2019. (Farrell Pletcher, Paula)
March 1, 2019 Filing 795 REPLY to Response re 720 Response to Motion, (Reply Memorandum of Law in Support of Defendants' Motion to Exclude Certain Opinions and Testimony of Michael A. Thomas, M.D.) (public version) filed by Warner Chilcott Company, Inc., Warner Chilcott Company, LLC, Warner Chilcott Corporation, Warner Chilcott Holdings Company III, Ltd., Warner Chilcott Laboratories Ireland Limited, Warner Chilcott Public Limited Company, Warner Chilcott Sales (US), LLC, Warner Chilcott U.S., LLC, Watson Laboratories, Inc., Watson Pharmaceuticals, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 13)(Benjamin, Nicole)
March 1, 2019 Filing 794 MEMORANDUM IN SUPPORT by Warner Chilcott Company, Inc., Warner Chilcott Company, LLC, Warner Chilcott Corporation, Warner Chilcott Holdings Company III, Ltd., Warner Chilcott Laboratories Ireland Limited, Warner Chilcott Public Limited Company, Warner Chilcott Sales (US), LLC, Warner Chilcott U.S., LLC, Watson Laboratories, Inc., Watson Pharmaceuticals, Inc. in support of #781 MOTION Exclude Certain Opinions and Testimony of Dr. Richard J. Derman (Public Version). (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit 2, #3 Exhibit 3)(Benjamin, Nicole)
March 1, 2019 Filing 793 RESPONSE In Opposition to #711 MOTION to Exclude the Expert Testimony of Dr. Sumanth Addanki (Public Version) filed by Warner Chilcott Company, Inc., Warner Chilcott Company, LLC, Warner Chilcott Corporation, Warner Chilcott Holdings Company III, Ltd., Warner Chilcott Laboratories Ireland Limited, Warner Chilcott Public Limited Company, Warner Chilcott Sales (US), LLC, Warner Chilcott U.S., LLC, Watson Laboratories, Inc., Watson Pharmaceuticals, Inc.. Replies due by 3/8/2019. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit 2, #3 Exhibit 3, #4 Exhibit 4, #5 Exhibit 5, #6 Exhibit 6, #7 Exhibit 7)(Benjamin, Nicole)
February 28, 2019 Opinion or Order TEXT ORDER granting #787 Motion to Seal. So Ordered by Chief Judge William E. Smith on 2/28/2019. (Jackson, Ryan)
February 28, 2019 Opinion or Order TEXT ORDER granting #792 Motion for Extension of Time to File Reply to #711 MOTION to Exclude the Expert Testimony of Dr. Sumanth Addanki; Replies due by 3/7/2019. So Ordered by Chief Judge William E. Smith on 2/28/2019. (Jackson, Ryan)
February 25, 2019 Filing 792 MOTION for an Extension of Time to File Response/Reply as to 791 Response to Motion,,,,,, filed by All Plaintiffs. Responses due by 3/11/2019. (Simoncelli, Michael)
February 25, 2019 Filing 788 MOTION for Leave to File Document Full Deposition Transcripts filed by All Plaintiffs. Responses due by 3/11/2019. (Simoncelli, Michael)
February 25, 2019 Filing 787 MOTION to Seal Notice of Errata Filed. Notice Sent To: All Plaintiffs. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Sealed Document Notice of Errata)(Simoncelli, Michael) This entry/document has been filed under seal pursuant to statute, rule or court order and access is restricted. Please login to CM/ECF to view document(s).
February 25, 2019 Opinion or Order TEXT ORDER granting #782 Motion to Seal; granting #783 Motion to Seal; granting #784 Motion to Seal; granting #785 Motion to Seal; granting #786 Motion to Seal. So Ordered by Chief Judge William E. Smith on 2/25/2019. (Jackson, Ryan)
February 22, 2019 Filing 786 MOTION to Seal End-Payor Plaintiffs Motion For Leave To File Under Seal The Declaration Of Matthew E. Van Tine Submitting End-Payor Plaintiffs Expert Response To The New Exhibits Of The Defense Expert, Dr. James W. Hughes, Used At The Class Certification Hearing Filed. Notice Sent To: End Payor Plaintiffs, Actavis, Inc., Ahold USA, Inc., Albertson's, LLC, Mary Alexander, Allergan PLC, Allied Services Division Welfare Fund, American Sales Company, LLC, CVS Pharmacy, Inc., City of Providence, Direct Purchaser Class Plaintiffs, Electrical Workers 242 & 294 Health & Welfare Fund, Fraternal Order of Police Fort Lauderdale Lodge 31, HEB Grocery Company L.P., Laborers International Union of North America, Denise Loy, Lupin Ltd., Lupin Pharmaceuticals, Inc., New York Hotel Trades Council & Hotel Association of New York City, Inc. Health Benefits Fund, Painters District Council No. 30 Health & Welfare Fund, Plaintiffs, Rite-Aid Corporation, Rite-Aid Hdqtrs. Corp., Rochester Drug Co-Operative, Inc., Safeway, Inc., Teamsters Local 237 Welfare Benefits Fund, The Kroger Co., United Food and Commercial Workers Local 1776, Walgreen Co., Warner Chilcott Company, Inc., Warner Chilcott Company, LLC, Warner Chilcott Corporation, Warner Chilcott Holdings Company III, Ltd., Warner Chilcott Laboratories Ireland Limited, Warner Chilcott Public Limited Company, Warner Chilcott Sales (US), LLC, Warner Chilcott U.S., LLC, Watson Laboratories, Inc., Watson Pharmaceuticals, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Affidavit Declaration of Matthew E. Van Tine Submitting End-Payor Plaintiffs Expert Response To The New Exhibits Of The Defense Expert, Dr. James W. Hughes, Used At The Class Certification Hearing, #2 Exhibit 1 - Supplemental Declaration of Gary L. French, Ph.D.)(Van Tine, Matthew) This entry/document has been filed under seal pursuant to statute, rule or court order and access is restricted. Please login to CM/ECF to view document(s).
February 22, 2019 Filing 785 MOTION to Seal End-Payor Plaintiffs Motion For Leave To File Under Seal The Declaration Of Matthew E. Van Tine Submitting End-Payor Plaintiffs Expert Response To The New Exhibits Of The Defense Expert, Dr. James W. Hughes, Used At The Class Certification Hearing Filed. Notice Sent To: End Payor Plaintiffs, Actavis, Inc., Ahold USA, Inc., Albertson's, LLC, Mary Alexander, Allergan PLC, Allied Services Division Welfare Fund, American Sales Company, LLC, CVS Pharmacy, Inc., City of Providence, Direct Purchaser Class Plaintiffs, Electrical Workers 242 & 294 Health & Welfare Fund, Fraternal Order of Police Fort Lauderdale Lodge 31, HEB Grocery Company L.P., Laborers International Union of North America, Denise Loy, Lupin Ltd., Lupin Pharmaceuticals, Inc., New York Hotel Trades Council & Hotel Association of New York City, Inc. Health Benefits Fund, Painters District Council No. 30 Health & Welfare Fund, Plaintiffs, Rite-Aid Corporation, Rite-Aid Hdqtrs. Corp., Rochester Drug Co-Operative, Inc., Safeway, Inc., Teamsters Local 237 Welfare Benefits Fund, The Kroger Co., United Food and Commercial Workers Local 1776, Walgreen Co., Warner Chilcott Company, Inc., Warner Chilcott Company, LLC, Warner Chilcott Corporation, Warner Chilcott Holdings Company III, Ltd., Warner Chilcott Laboratories Ireland Limited, Warner Chilcott Public Limited Company, Warner Chilcott Sales (US), LLC, Warner Chilcott U.S., LLC, Watson Laboratories, Inc., Watson Pharmaceuticals, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Affidavit Declaration of Matthew E. Van Tine Submitting End-Payor Plaintiffs Expert Response To The New Exhibits Of The Defense Expert, Dr. James W. Hughes, Used At The Class Certification Hearing, #2 Exhibit 1 - Supplemental Declaration of Gary L. French, Ph.D.)(Van Tine, Matthew) This entry/document has been filed under seal pursuant to statute, rule or court order and access is restricted. Please login to CM/ECF to view document(s).
February 21, 2019 Filing 784 MOTION to Seal Defendants' Opposition to Plaintiffs' Motion to Exclude the Expert Testimony of Dr. Sumanth Addanki and Exhibits Thereto Filed. Notice Sent To: Warner Chilcott Holdings Company III, Ltd., Warner Chilcott Corporation, Warner Chilcott Public Limited Company, Watson Laboratories, Inc., Warner Chilcott Company, LLC, Warner Chilcott Sales (US), LLC, Watson Pharmaceuticals, Inc., Warner Chilcott Laboratories Ireland Limited, Warner Chilcott U.S., LLC, Warner Chilcott Company, Inc., Actavis, Inc., Ahold USA, Inc., Albertson's, LLC, Mary Alexander, Allergan PLC, Allied Services Division Welfare Fund, American Sales Company, LLC, CVS Pharmacy, Inc., Melisa Chrestman, Melissa Chrestman, City of Providence, Direct Purchaser Class Plaintiffs, Electrical Workers 242 & 294 Health & Welfare Fund, End Payor Plaintiffs, Fraternal Order of Police Fort Lauderdale Lodge 31, HEB Grocery Company L.P., Laborers International Union of North America, Denise Loy, Lupin Ltd., Lupin Pharmaceuticals, Inc., New York Hotel Trades Council & Hotel Association of New York City, Inc. Health Benefits Fund, Painters District Council No. 30 Health & Welfare Fund, Plaintiffs, Rite-Aid Corporation, Rite-Aid Hdqtrs. Corp., Rochester Drug Co-Operative, Inc., Safeway, Inc., Teamsters Local 237 Welfare Benefits Fund, The Kr