Murphy et al v. Ford Motor Company et al
Plaintiff: Francis M. Murphy and Michele Murphy
Defendant: Ford Motor Company
Case Number: 1:2014cv00423
Filed: September 26, 2014
Court: US District Court for the District of Rhode Island
Office: Providence Office
County: Providence
Presiding Judge: Lincoln D Almond
Referring Judge: John J McConnell
Nature of Suit: Motor Vehicle Prod. Liability
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1332 Diversity-Notice of Removal
Jury Demanded By: Both
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on May 6, 2016. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
May 6, 2016 Opinion or Order TEXT ORDER entering #21 Stipulation of Dismissal - So Ordered by Judge John J. McConnell, Jr. on 5/6/2016. (Barletta, Barbara)
May 5, 2016 Filing 21 STIPULATION of Dismissal Without Prejudice by Ford Motor Company. (Larson, Adam)
February 11, 2016 Opinion or Order TEXT ORDER granting #20 Motion to Amend/Correct; Reset Scheduling Order Deadlines:( Factual Discovery to close on 5/23/2016; Plaintiffs' expert disclosures shall be made by 6/29/16; Defendants' expert disclosures shall be made by 7/29/16; Expert Discovery to close on 8/31/16; Dispositive Motions due by 9/30/2016 and Pretrial Memorandum due by 10/28/2016, if no dispositive motions are filed or 30 days after a decision on any dispositive motions.)- So Ordered by Judge John J. McConnell, Jr. on 2/11/2016. (Barletta, Barbara)
February 10, 2016 Filing 20 Joint MOTION to Amend/Correct the Pretrial Order filed by Ford Motor Company. Responses due by 2/29/2016 (Larson, Adam)
October 2, 2015 Opinion or Order TEXT ORDER granting #19 Motion to Amend/Correct; Reset Scheduling Order Deadlines:( Factual Discovery to close on 2/22/2016; Plaintiffs' expert disclosures due by 3/29/16; Defendants' expert disclosures due by 4/29/16; Expert Discovery to close on 5/31/16; Dispositive Motions due by 6/30/2016 and Pretrial Memorandum due by 7/29/2016.)- So Ordered by Judge John J. McConnell, Jr. on 10/2/2015. (Barletta, Barbara)
October 1, 2015 Filing 19 Joint MOTION to Amend/Correct The Pretrial Order filed by Ford Motor Company. Responses due by 10/19/2015 (Larson, Adam)
August 27, 2015 Opinion or Order TEXT ORDER entering #18 Stipulated Sharing and Non-Sharing Protective Order - So Ordered by Judge John J. McConnell, Jr. on 8/27/2015. (Barletta, Barbara)
August 26, 2015 Filing 18 Stipulated Sharing and Non-Sharing Protective Order filed by Ford Motor Company. Responses due by 9/14/2015 (Larson, Adam) Modified on 8/27/2015 to correct event (Barletta, Barbara).
July 24, 2015 Opinion or Order TEXT ORDER denying #17 Motion for Protective Order. The parties may enter an appropriate protective order between themselves, but the Court will not enter a blanket protective order as an Order of the Court- So Ordered by Judge John J. McConnell, Jr. on 7/24/2015. (Barletta, Barbara)
July 23, 2015 Filing 17 Assented MOTION for Protective Order filed by Ford Motor Company. Responses due by 8/10/2015 (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Stipulated Protective Order)(Larson, Adam)
June 22, 2015 Opinion or Order TEXT ORDER granting #11 Motion to Compel; granting #12 Motion to Compel; granting #13 Motion to Compel- So Ordered by Judge John J. McConnell, Jr. on 6/22/15. (Barletta, Barbara)
June 19, 2015 Filing 16 RESPONSE to Motion re #12 MOTION to Compel Requests for Production of Documents and Tangible Things to Plaintiffs filed by All Plaintiffs. (Ursillo, David)
June 19, 2015 Filing 15 RESPONSE to Motion re #10 MOTION to Compel Interrogatories Propounded to Francis Murphy filed by All Plaintiffs. (Ursillo, David)
June 19, 2015 Filing 14 RESPONSE to Motion re #11 MOTION to Compel Interrogatories to Michele Murphy filed by All Plaintiffs. (Ursillo, David)
June 9, 2015 Filing 13 MOTION to Compel Ford's Interrogatories to Francis Murphy filed by Ford Motor Company. Responses due by 6/26/2015 (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Ford's Interrogatories to Francis Murphy, #2 Exhibit Email to Plaintiff's Counsel regarding discovery)(Larson, Adam)
June 9, 2015 Filing 12 MOTION to Compel Requests for Production of Documents and Tangible Things to Plaintiffs filed by Ford Motor Company. Responses due by 6/26/2015 (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Ford's Request for Production of Documents, #2 Exhibit Email to Plaintiffs' Counsel Regarding Discovery)(Larson, Adam)
June 9, 2015 Filing 11 MOTION to Compel Interrogatories to Michele Murphy filed by Ford Motor Company. Responses due by 6/26/2015 (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Ford's Interrogatories to Plaintiff Michele Murphy, #2 Exhibit Email to Plaintiff's Counsel Regarding Discovery)(Larson, Adam)
June 9, 2015 Filing 10 MOTION to Compel Interrogatories Propounded to Francis Murphy filed by Ford Motor Company. Responses due by 6/26/2015 (Attachments: #1 Exhibit FedEx Interrogatories Served on Plaintiff Francis Murphy, #2 Exhibit Email to P's counsel regarding discovery)(Larson, Adam) Modified on 6/9/2015 to note that this document was terminated and re-filed as #13 Motion to Compel(Barletta, Barbara).
January 21, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 9 PRETRIAL SCHEDULING ORDER: Factual Discovery to close on 10/21/2015; Plaintiffs' expert disclosures due by 11/20/15; Defendant's expert disclosures due by 12/21/15; Expert Discovery to close on 1/21/2016; Dispositive Motions due by 2/23/2016 and Pretrial Memorandum due by 3/23/2016- So Ordered by Judge John J. McConnell, Jr. on 1/21/15. (Barletta, Barbara)
January 21, 2015 Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge John J. McConnell, Jr.: Rule 16 Conference held on 1/21/2015; David Ursillo for plaintiff; Adam Larson for defendants (Barletta, Barbara)
December 1, 2014 HEARING CANCELLED: The rule 16 Conference scheduled for Tuesday, 12/2/14 at 9:30 a.m. in Judge McConnell Chambers 211 is cancelled and will be rescheduled (Barletta, Barbara)
December 1, 2014 REVISED NOTICE of Hearing: Telephonic Rule 16 Conference is RESET to Wednesday, 1/21/2015 at 09:00 AM in Judge McConnell Chambers - Room 211; Court to initiate call; please provide clerk with contact information if the number differs from the docket sheet (Barletta, Barbara)
November 25, 2014 Filing 8 RULE 16 STATEMENT Summary by All Plaintiffs. (Ursillo, David)
November 25, 2014 Filing 7 RULE 16 STATEMENT Ford Motor Company's Summary of the Facts of the Case and Legal Issues for Rule 16(b) Scheduling Conference by Ford Motor Company. (Larson, Adam)
October 3, 2014 Filing 6 NOTICE of Hearing: Rule 16 Conference set for Tuesday, 12/2/2014 at 09:30 AM in Judge McConnell Chambers - Room 211 (Barletta, Barbara)
October 2, 2014 Filing 5 STATE COURT RECORD filed by Ford Motor Company. (McGuire, Vickie) (Additional attachment(s) added on 9/1/2015: #1 Exhibit State Court Record) (McGuire, Vickie).
October 1, 2014 Filing 4 ANSWER to Complaint Plaintiffs' Amended Complaint by Ford Motor Company.(Larson, Adam)
September 26, 2014 Filing 3 Corporate Disclosure Statement by Ford Motor Company. (Larson, Adam)
September 26, 2014 Filing 2 NOTICE of Appearance by Adam A. Larson on behalf of Ford Motor Company (Larson, Adam)
September 26, 2014 Filing 1 NEW CASE/NOTICE OF REMOVAL from Providence Superior Court, case number 14-3299. Filing fee $ 400, receipt number 0103-784433, filed by Ford Motor Company. (Attachments: #1 Appendix Summons and Complaint, #2 Exhibit Notice of Removal State Court, #3 Exhibit Civil Cover Sheet)(Larson, Adam)
September 26, 2014 CORRECTIVE DOCKET ENTRY Regarding: #1 Notice of Removal - New Case. This case has been electronically filed and processed, however, after a quality control review the following deficiencies were found: Ca use of Action was incorrect and a John Doe party was incorrectly included. Correction made by Clerks Office. No further action is required. Please refer to the #Attorney Case Opening Instructions for guidance. (Melendez, Filipa)
September 26, 2014 Case assigned to Judge John J. McConnell, Jr and Magistrate Judge Lincoln D. Almond. (Melendez, Filipa)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Rhode Island District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Murphy et al v. Ford Motor Company et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Francis M. Murphy
Represented By: David A. Ursillo
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Michele Murphy
Represented By: David A. Ursillo
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Ford Motor Company
Represented By: Adam A. Larson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?