Alifax Holding Spa v. Alcor Scientific Inc. et al

Plaintiff: Alifax Holding Spa
Defendant: Alcor Scientific Inc. and Francesco A. Frappa
Case Number: 1:2014cv00440
Filed: October 7, 2014
Court: US District Court for the District of Rhode Island
Office: Providence Office
County: Providence
Presiding Judge: Lincoln D. Almond
Presiding Judge: William E. Smith
Nature of Suit: Patent
Cause of Action: 35:145
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
June 18, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 337 MEMORANDUM AND ORDER: Defendants' Motion to Strike the Declaration of Robert H. Stier, Jr. (Dkt No. 302-2) and Exhibit Thereto (Dkt. No. 302-3) (ECF No. 310 ) is GRANTED. The Declaration of Robert H. Stier, Jr. (ECF No. 302-2) is hereby deemed struck and will not be relied upon for any purpose by the Court in its post-trial rulings. The supplemental attachments to Alifax's opposition memorandum are similarly deemed struck - So Ordered by Chief Judge William E. Smith on 6/18/2019. (Urizandi, Nisshy)
April 30, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 288 MEMORANDUM AND ORDER granting in part 230 MOTION TO EXCLUDE THE OPINIONS OF EXPERT WITNESS CHRISTOPHER J. BOKHART. So Ordered by Chief Judge William E. Smith on 4/30/2019. (Jackson, Ryan)
April 12, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 277 ORDER: Defendants' Motion to Exclude the Opinions of Expert Witness Christopher J. Bokhart (ECF No. 230 ) is GRANTED IN PART. Mr. Bokhart's copyright damages opinion is hereby EXCLUDED. Defendants' request to exclude Mr. Bokhart' s trade secret damages opinion remains under advisement; the Court may issue a ruling before trial. Consistent with the Court's bench ruling on April 11, 2019, Mr. Bokhart may opine on patent-related damages should the jury find infringement - So Ordered by Chief Judge William E. Smith on 4/12/2019. (Urizandi, Nisshy)
January 11, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 212 MEMORANDUM AND ORDER terminating 200 Motion to Compel; granting in part 201 Motion to Compel; granting in part 202 Motion for Reconsideration. So Ordered by Chief Judge William E. Smith on 1/11/2019. (Jackson, Ryan)
April 27, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 73 MEMORANDUM AND ORDER Re: 49 Notice: Opening Claim Construction Brief filed by Francesco A. Frappa, Alcor Scientific, Inc., 48 Notice: Opening Claim Construction Brief filed by Sire Analytical Systems Srl, Alifax Holding Spa. So Ordered by Chief Judge William E. Smith on 4/27/2017. (Jackson, Ryan)
March 20, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 67 MEMORANDUM AND ORDER granting 55 Motion to File Amended Pleading. So Ordered by Chief Judge William E. Smith on 3/20/2017. (Jackson, Ryan)
September 29, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 25 MEMORANDUM AND ORDER denying without prejudice 10 Defendants' Motion to Dismiss. So Ordered by Chief Judge William E. Smith on 9/28/2015. (Jackson, Ryan)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Rhode Island District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Alifax Holding Spa v. Alcor Scientific Inc. et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Alifax Holding Spa
Represented By: Michael J. Daly
Represented By: Christopher H. Little
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Alcor Scientific Inc.
Represented By: Byron L. McMasters
Represented By: Craig M. Scott
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Francesco A. Frappa
Represented By: Byron L. McMasters
Represented By: Craig M. Scott
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?