Markham Concepts, Inc. v. Hasbro, Inc.
Plaintiff: Markham Concepts, Inc.
Defendant: Hasbro, Inc.
Intervenor: Reuben Klamer
Case Number: 1:2015cv00419
Filed: October 2, 2015
Court: US District Court for the District of Rhode Island
Office: Providence Office
County: Providence
Presiding Judge: William E. Smith
Presiding Judge: Patricia A. Sullivan
Nature of Suit: Other Contract
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: Both

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
August 14, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 251 CLERK'S JUDGMENT in favor of Hasbro, Inc., Reuben Klamer, Dawn Linkletter Griffin, Sharon Linkletter, Michael Linkletter, Laura Linkletter Rich, Dennis Linkletter, Thomas Feiman (in his capacity as co-trustee of the Irvin S. and Ida Mae Atkins Family Trust), Robert Miller (in his capacity as co-trustee of the Irvin S. and Ida Mae Atkins Family Trust), and Max Candiotty (in his capacity as co-trustee of the Irvin S. and Ida Mae Atkins Family Trust) and against the Plaintiffs Markham Concept s, Inc., Lorraine Markham, and Susan Garretson as to Count III of the Third Amended Complaint (ECF No. 127 ). The remaining counts of the complaint were dismissed by this Court's July 25, 2019 Text Order entering the parties Stipulation of Partial Dismissal with Prejudice (ECF No. 249 ). (Urizandi, Nisshy)
January 25, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 240 FINDINGS OF FACT AND CONCLUSIONS OF LAW. So Ordered by Chief Judge William E. Smith on 1/25/2019. (Jackson, Ryan)
December 19, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 176 MEMORANDUM AND ORDER denying 130 Motion in Limine to Exclude Bill Markham's 1989 Deposition Testimony. So Ordered by Chief Judge William E. Smith on 12/19/2012. (Jackson, Ryan)
December 15, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 174 ORDER denying as moot 129 Motion to Compel; denying 144 Motion for Attorney Fees- So Ordered by Chief Judge William E. Smith on 12/15/2017. (Barletta, Barbara)
October 17, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 128 MEMORANDUM AND ORDER granting in part and denying in part 37 Motion for Judgment on the Pleadings; denying 49 Motion to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim. So Ordered by Chief Judge William E. Smith on 10/17/2017. (Jackson, Ryan)
July 22, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 97 MEMORANDUM AND ORDER granting 75 Motion to Disqualify Counsel. Attorney Michael S. Lazaroff and Louis M. Solomon terminated- So Ordered by Chief Judge William E. Smith on 7/22/2016. (Barletta, Barbara)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Rhode Island District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Markham Concepts, Inc. v. Hasbro, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Hasbro, Inc.
Represented By: Joseph Avanzato
Represented By: Patricia K. Rocha
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Markham Concepts, Inc.
Represented By: Joseph V. Cavanagh, Jr.
Represented By: Mary C. Dunn
Represented By: Kyle G Grimm
Represented By: Michael S. Lazaroff
Represented By: Louis M. Solomon
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Intervenor: Reuben Klamer
Represented By: Eric E. Renner
Represented By: Erica J. Van Loon
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?