State of Rhode Island v. Alon Refining Krotz Springs et al
Plaintiff: State of Rhode Island
Defendant: Alon Refining Krotz Springs, Valero Refining-Texas, L.P., CITGO Refining and Chemicals Company L.P., Ashland, Inc., Motiva Enterprises LLC, BP Products North America Inc, Shell Oil Products Company LLC, Highlands Fuel Delivery, LLC, The Premcor Refining Group Inc, Ultramar Energy, Inc., Marathon Oil Company, Exxon Mobile Corporation, Hess Corporation, Chevron U.S.A. Inc., Coastal Eagle Point Oil Company, Valero Energy Corporation, Marathon Petroleum Company LP, CITGO Petroleum Corporation, Irving Oil Limited, Atlantic Richfield Company, Shell Petroleum Inc, TRMI-H LLC, ExxonMobil Oil Corporation, TMR Company, Total Petrochemicals & Refining USA, Inc., Shell Trading (US) Company, Equilon Enterprises LLC, Shell Oil Company, PDV Midwest Refining, L.L.C., Paulsboro Refining Company, LLC, Valero Marketing and Supply Company, Sunoco, Inc. (R&M), Conoco Phillips Company, Mobil Corporation, Shell Trading (US) Company individually formerly known as Equiva Trading Company doing business as Stusco, Atlantic Richfield Company Individually, as successor-by-merger to Atlantic Richfield Company (a Pennsylvania corporation) and doing business as ARCO Products Company formerly known as Atlantic Richfield Delaware Corporation, Exxon Mobile Corporation formerly known as Exxon Corporation doing business as ExxonMobil Refining and Supply Company doing business as Exxon Chemical U.S.A doing business as ExxonMobil Chemical Corporation, Conoco Phillips Company individually, as successor-by-merger to Conoco, Inc. and Tosco Corporation formerly known as Phillips Petroleum Company doing business as Phillips 66 Company doing business as Phillips Chemical Company doing business as Philli, Chevron U.S.A. Inc. formerly known as Gulf Oil Corporation doing business as Chevron Products Company doing business as Chevron Chemical Company, Shell Oil Products Company LLC doing business as Shell Oil Products Company, Socony Vacuum Oil Company, Incorporated, Valero Refining Company-Texas, Amoco Oil Company and The American Oil Company, Marathon Petroleum Company LLC, Texaco Refining and Marketing (East), Inc., Mobil Oil Corporation,, Valero Refining Company, Atlantic Richfield Delaware Corporation, TOTAL Petrochemicals USA, Inc., Equilon Enterprises LLC individually, and as successor-by-merger to Equiva Services LLC doing business as Shell Oil Products US, American Petrofina Company of Texas, Amerada Hess Corporation, Exxon Corporation, Atofina Petrochemicals, Inc., Sun Refining and Marketing Company,, Gulf Oil Corporation, Cities Service RMT Corporation, Sun Oil Company of Pennsylvania, Getty Oil Company (Eastern Operations), Inc., Texaco Refining and Marketing Inc., USS Holdings Company, Texaco Refining and Marketing, Inc., Socony Mobil Oil Company,, Irving Oil Corporation, Fina Oil and Chemical Company, Star Enterprises LLC, Sun Company, Inc (R&M), Phillips Petroleum Company, TRMI Holdings Inc, Getty Refining and Marketing Inc. and Equiva Trading Company
Case Number: 1:2016cv00495
Filed: September 6, 2016
Court: US District Court for the District of Rhode Island
Office: Providence Office
County: Providence
Presiding Judge: John J McConnell
Referring Judge: William E Smith
2 Judge: Patricia A Sullivan
Nature of Suit: Environmental Matters
Cause of Action: 42:6901
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on March 27, 2017. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
March 27, 2017 Opinion or Order TEXT ORDER Entering #87 Stipulation of Dismissal without prejudice filed by State of Rhode Island. So Ordered by Chief Judge William E. Smith on 3/27/2017. (Jackson, Ryan)
March 13, 2017 Filing 87 STIPULATION of Dismissal filed by All Plaintiffs. (Kelly, Neil)
March 7, 2017 Minute Entry for proceedings held before Chief Judge William E. Smith: In Chambers Conference held on 3/7/2017; counsel present: N. Kelly, M. Rubin; G. Petros, R. Gainor, J. Tarantino. (Jackson, Ryan)
March 2, 2017 NOTICE of Hearing: In Chambers Conference scheduled for Tuesday 3/7/2017 at 2:00 PM in Chambers before Chief Judge William E. Smith. (Jackson, Ryan)
March 1, 2017 Opinion or Order TEXT ORDER granting #86 Motion for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply re #81 MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction , #61 MOTION to Dismiss , #77 MOTION to Dismiss , #80 MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction (and Joining Motion to Dismiss filed on December 15, 2016); Responses due by 3/7/2017. So Ordered by Chief Judge William E. Smith on 3/1/2017. (Jackson, Ryan)
February 21, 2017 Filing 86 MOTION for an Extension of Time to File Response/Reply filed by All Plaintiffs. Responses due by 3/7/2017. (Kelly, Neil)
February 13, 2017 Opinion or Order TEXT ORDER granting #84 Motion for Extension of Time to File Response as to: #81 MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction , #61 MOTION to Dismiss , #77 MOTION to Dismiss , #80 MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction (and Joining Motion to Dismiss filed on December 15, 2016); Responses due by 2/20/2017. So Ordered by Chief Judge William E. Smith on 2/13/2017. (Jackson, Ryan)
February 8, 2017 Filing 85 NOTICE by Exxon Mobile Corporation, ExxonMobil Oil Corporation, Mobil Corporation re #16 Stipulation,,, of Correction (Oliverio, Matthew)
February 7, 2017 Filing 84 MOTION for an Extension of Time to File Response/Reply filed by All Plaintiffs. Responses due by 2/21/2017. (Kelly, Neil)
January 25, 2017 Opinion or Order TEXT ORDER granting #76 Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice of Christopher L. Dodson - So Ordered by Chief Judge William E. Smith on 1/25/2017. (Barletta, Barbara)
January 25, 2017 Opinion or Order TEXT ORDER granting #75 Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice of Amy E. Parker - So Ordered by Chief Judge William E. Smith on 1/25/2017. (Barletta, Barbara)
January 25, 2017 Opinion or Order TEXT ORDER granting #74 Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice of Carlton Wilde - So Ordered by Chief Judge William E. Smith on 1/25/2017. (Barletta, Barbara)
January 25, 2017 Opinion or Order TEXT ORDER granting #71 Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice of John S. Guttmann - So Ordered by Chief Judge William E. Smith on 1/25/2017. (Barletta, Barbara)
January 25, 2017 Opinion or Order TEXT ORDER granting #70 Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice of Nessa Horewitch Coppinger - So Ordered by Chief Judge William E. Smith on 1/25/2017. (Barletta, Barbara)
January 25, 2017 Opinion or Order TEXT ORDER granting #69 Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice of Daniel M. Krainin - So Ordered by Chief Judge William E. Smith on 1/25/2017. (Barletta, Barbara)
January 25, 2017 Opinion or Order TEXT ORDER granting #59 Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice of Frank A. Dante - So Ordered by Chief Judge William E. Smith on 1/25/2017. (Barletta, Barbara)
January 25, 2017 Opinion or Order TEXT ORDER granting #57 Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice of Christopher Danley - So Ordered by Chief Judge William E. Smith on 1/25/2017. (Barletta, Barbara)
January 25, 2017 Opinion or Order TEXT ORDER granting #56 Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice of Joshua B. Frank - So Ordered by Chief Judge William E. Smith on 1/25/2017. (Barletta, Barbara)
January 25, 2017 Opinion or Order TEXT ORDER granting #55 Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice of Steven L. Leifer - So Ordered by Chief Judge William E. Smith on 1/25/2017. (Barletta, Barbara)
January 24, 2017 Opinion or Order TEXT ORDER granting #83 Motion for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply re #81 MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction ; Responses due by 2/7/2017. So Ordered by Chief Judge William E. Smith on 1/24/2017. (Jackson, Ryan)
January 20, 2017 Opinion or Order TEXT ORDER granting #82 Motion for Extension of Time up to and including 2/7/17. So Ordered by Chief Judge William E. Smith on 1/20/2017. (Jackson, Ryan)
January 19, 2017 Filing 83 Assented MOTION for an Extension of Time to File Response/Reply filed by All Plaintiffs. Responses due by 2/2/2017. (Kelly, Neil)
January 17, 2017 Filing 82 Assented MOTION for an Extension of Time filed by All Plaintiffs. Responses due by 1/31/2017. (Kelly, Neil)
January 13, 2017 Opinion or Order TEXT ORDER granting #78 Motion for Extension of Time to File Response re: #61 MOTION to Dismiss, #77 MOTION to Dismiss; Responses due by 2/7/2017. So Ordered by Chief Judge William E. Smith on 1/13/2017. (Jackson, Ryan)
January 11, 2017 Filing 81 MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction WITH SUPPORTING MEMO filed by Total Petrochemicals & Refining USA, Inc.. Responses due by 1/25/2017. (Attachments: #1 Supporting Memorandum Memorandum in support of Motion to Dismiss, #2 Affidavit Affidavit in Support of Motion to Dismiss)(Padwa, Jeffrey)
January 5, 2017 Opinion or Order TEXT ORDER granting #42 Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice of James F. Bennett; granting #43 Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice of Erika M. Anderson; granting #44 Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice of Kelly J.H. Murrie. So Ordered by Chief Judge William E. Smith on 1/5/2017. (Jackson, Ryan)
January 5, 2017 Opinion or Order TEXT ORDER granting #47 Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice of James L. Messenger. So Ordered by Chief Judge William E. Smith on 1/5/2017. (Jackson, Ryan)
January 4, 2017 Filing 80 MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction (and Joining Motion to Dismiss filed on December 15, 2016) With Supporting Memo filed by Alon Refining Krotz Springs. Responses due by 1/18/2017. (Attachments: #1 Supporting Memorandum, #2 Affidavit of Gregg Byers)(Fine, Robert)
January 3, 2017 Filing 79 STIPULATION re #1 Complaint filed by Total Petrochemicals & Refining USA, Inc.. (Padwa, Jeffrey)
December 28, 2016 Filing 78 MOTION for an Extension of Time to File Response/Reply as to #61 MOTION to Dismiss filed by All Plaintiffs. Responses due by 1/11/2017. (Kelly, Neil)
December 28, 2016 Filing 77 MOTION to Dismiss filed by Total Petrochemicals & Refining USA, Inc.. Responses due by 1/11/2017. (Padwa, Jeffrey)
December 27, 2016 Filing 76 MOTION for Christopher L. Dodson to Appear Pro Hac Vice ( filing fee paid $ 50.00, receipt number 0103-1040595 ) filed by Total Petrochemicals & Refining USA, Inc.. (Padwa, Jeffrey)
December 27, 2016 Filing 75 MOTION for Amy Parker to Appear Pro Hac Vice ( filing fee paid $ 50.00, receipt number 0103-1040594 ) filed by Total Petrochemicals & Refining USA, Inc.. (Padwa, Jeffrey)
December 27, 2016 Filing 74 MOTION for Carlton Wilde to Appear Pro Hac Vice ( filing fee paid $ 50.00, receipt number 0103-1040593 ) filed by Total Petrochemicals & Refining USA, Inc.. (Padwa, Jeffrey)
December 26, 2016 Opinion or Order TEXT ORDER Entering #51 Notice of Dismissal of Ashland Inc. filed by State of Rhode Island. So Ordered by Chief Judge William E. Smith on 12/26/2016. (Jackson, Ryan)
December 26, 2016 Reset Deadlines: Alon Refining Krotz Springs answer due 1/4/2017; Total Petrochemicals & Refining USA, Inc. answer due 1/4/2017. (Jackson, Ryan)
December 26, 2016 Opinion or Order TEXT ORDER Entering #45 Stipulation Extending Time to Answer filed by State of Rhode Island, Total Petrochemicals & Refining USA, Inc., and Alon Refining Krotz Springs. So Ordered by Chief Judge William E. Smith on 12/26/2016. (Jackson, Ryan)
December 23, 2016 Filing 73 NOTICE of Appearance by Jeffrey M. Padwa on behalf of Total Petrochemicals & Refining USA, Inc. (Padwa, Jeffrey)
December 22, 2016 Filing 72 Corporate Disclosure Statement by Sunoco, Inc. (R&M) identifying Corporate Parent Sunoco, Inc. for Sunoco, Inc. (R&M).. (Fine, Robert)
December 22, 2016 Filing 71 MOTION for John S. Guttmann to Appear Pro Hac Vice ( filing fee paid $ 50.00, receipt number 0103-1039699 ) filed by Sunoco, Inc. (R&M). (Fine, Robert)
December 22, 2016 Filing 70 MOTION for Nessa Horewitch Coppinger to Appear Pro Hac Vice ( filing fee paid $ 50.00, receipt number 0103-1039696 ) filed by Sunoco, Inc. (R&M). (Fine, Robert)
December 22, 2016 Filing 69 MOTION for Daniel M. Krainin to Appear Pro Hac Vice ( filing fee paid $ 50.00, receipt number 0103-1039683 ) filed by Sunoco, Inc. (R&M). (Fine, Robert)
December 19, 2016 Filing 68 Corporate Disclosure Statement by Highlands Fuel Delivery, LLC. (Gainor, Ryan)
December 19, 2016 Filing 67 Corporate Disclosure Statement by Irving Oil Limited. (Gainor, Ryan)
December 16, 2016 Filing 66 Corporate Disclosure Statement by Shell Oil Company, Shell Oil Products Company LLC, Shell Petroleum Inc, Shell Trading (US) Company, TMR Company identifying Corporate Parent Royal Dutch Shell plc. for Shell Oil Company, Shell Oil Products Company LLC, Shell Petroleum Inc, Shell Trading (US) Company, TMR Company.. (Whitmarsh, Bethany)
December 16, 2016 Filing 65 Corporate Disclosure Statement by Marathon Petroleum Company LP identifying Corporate Parent Marathon Petroleum Corporation, Corporate Parent MPC Investment LLC for Marathon Petroleum Company LP.. (Fine, Robert)
December 16, 2016 Filing 64 Corporate Disclosure Statement by Marathon Oil Company identifying Corporate Parent Marathon Oil Corporation for Marathon Oil Company.. (Fine, Robert)
December 16, 2016 Filing 63 Corporate Disclosure Statement by Hess Corporation. (Fine, Robert)
December 16, 2016 Opinion or Order TEXT ORDER granting #30 Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice of Lisa S. Meyer, ; granting #31 Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice of Nathan P. Eimer; granting #32 Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice of Pamela R. Hanebutt. So Ordered by Chief Judge William E. Smith on 12/16/2016. (Jackson, Ryan)
December 15, 2016 Filing 62 Corporate Disclosure Statement by Coastal Eagle Point Oil Company. (Dolan, Mark)
December 15, 2016 Filing 61 MOTION to Dismiss With Supporting Memo filed by Atlantic Richfield Company, BP Products North America Inc, CITGO Petroleum Corporation, CITGO Refining and Chemicals Company L.P., Coastal Eagle Point Oil Company, Conoco Phillips Company, Equilon Enterprises LLC, Exxon Mobile Corporation, ExxonMobil Oil Corporation, Hess Corporation, Highlands Fuel Delivery, LLC, Irving Oil Limited, Marathon Oil Company, Marathon Petroleum Company LP, Mobil Corporation, Motiva Enterprises LLC, PDV Midwest Refining, L.L.C., Paulsboro Refining Company, LLC, Shell Oil Company, Shell Oil Products Company LLC, Shell Petroleum Inc, Shell Trading (US) Company, Sunoco, Inc. (R&M), TMR Company, The Premcor Refining Group Inc, Ultramar Energy, Inc., Valero Energy Corporation, Valero Marketing and Supply Company, Valero Refining-Texas, L.P.. Responses due by 12/29/2016. (Attachments: #1 Supporting Memorandum, #2 Appendix A)(Oliverio, Matthew)
December 15, 2016 Filing 60 Corporate Disclosure Statement by Alon Refining Krotz Springs identifying Corporate Parent Delek US Holdings, Inc., Corporate Parent Alon USA Energy, Inc. for Alon Refining Krotz Springs.. (Fine, Robert)
December 15, 2016 Filing 59 MOTION for Frank A. Dante to Appear Pro Hac Vice for defendant Alon Refining Krotz Springs ( filing fee paid $ 50.00, receipt number 0103-1037858 ) filed by Alon Refining Krotz Springs. (Fine, Robert)
December 15, 2016 Filing 58 NOTICE of Appearance by Robert D. Fine on behalf of Sunoco, Inc. (R&M) (Fine, Robert)
December 15, 2016 Filing 57 MOTION for Christopher Danley to Appear Pro Hac Vice for Hess and Marathon defendantsts ( filing fee paid $ 50.00, receipt number 0103-1037641 ) filed by Hess Corporation. (Fine, Robert)
December 15, 2016 Filing 56 MOTION for Joshua B. Frank to Appear Pro Hac Vice for Hess and Marathon defendants ( filing fee paid $ 50.00, receipt number 0103-1037639 ) filed by Hess Corporation. (Fine, Robert)
December 15, 2016 Filing 55 MOTION for Steven l. Leifer to Appear Pro Hac Vice for Hess and Marathon defendants ( filing fee paid $ 50.00, receipt number 0103-1037634 ) filed by Hess Corporation. (Fine, Robert)
December 15, 2016 Filing 54 NOTICE of Appearance by Robert D. Fine on behalf of Sunoco, Inc. (R&M) (Fine, Robert)
December 15, 2016 Filing 53 NOTICE of Appearance by Robert D. Fine on behalf of Hess Corporation (Fine, Robert)
December 15, 2016 Filing 52 NOTICE of Appearance by Robert D. Fine on behalf of Alon Refining Krotz Springs (Fine, Robert)
December 15, 2016 Filing 51 NOTICE of Voluntary Dismissal by State of Rhode Island (Pickrel, Carla)
December 15, 2016 Filing 50 NOTICE of Appearance by Bethany M. Whitmarsh on behalf of Equilon Enterprises LLC, Motiva Enterprises LLC, Shell Oil Company, Shell Oil Products Company LLC, Shell Petroleum Inc, Shell Trading (US) Company, TMR Company (Whitmarsh, Bethany)
December 15, 2016 Filing 49 NOTICE of Appearance by Shanna M. Boughton on behalf of Equilon Enterprises LLC, Motiva Enterprises LLC, Shell Oil Company, Shell Oil Products Company LLC, Shell Petroleum Inc, Shell Trading (US) Company, TMR Company (Boughton, Shanna)
December 14, 2016 Filing 48 Corporate Disclosure Statement by Exxon Mobile Corporation, ExxonMobil Oil Corporation, Mobil Corporation. (Oliverio, Matthew)
December 13, 2016 Filing 47 MOTION for James Messenger to Appear Pro Hac Vice ( filing fee paid $ 50.00, receipt number 0103-1036933 ) filed by Coastal Eagle Point Oil Company. (Dolan, Mark)
December 13, 2016 Filing 46 NOTICE of Appearance by Mark P. Dolan on behalf of Coastal Eagle Point Oil Company (Dolan, Mark)
December 9, 2016 Filing 45 STIPULATION Extending Time by All Plaintiffs. (Kelly, Neil)
December 8, 2016 Filing 44 MOTION for Kelly J. H. Murrie to Appear Pro Hac Vice ( filing fee paid $ 50.00, receipt number 0103-1035184 ) filed by Paulsboro Refining Company, LLC, The Premcor Refining Group Inc, Ultramar Energy, Inc., Valero Energy Corporation, Valero Marketing and Supply Company, Valero Refining-Texas, L.P.. (Sanford, Paul)
December 8, 2016 Filing 43 MOTION for Erika M. Anderson to Appear Pro Hac Vice ( filing fee paid $ 50.00, receipt number 0103-1035182 ) filed by Paulsboro Refining Company, LLC, The Premcor Refining Group Inc, Ultramar Energy, Inc., Valero Energy Corporation, Valero Marketing and Supply Company, Valero Refining-Texas, L.P.. (Sanford, Paul)
December 8, 2016 Filing 42 MOTION for James F. Bennett to Appear Pro Hac Vice ( filing fee paid $ 50.00, receipt number 0103-1035177 ) filed by Paulsboro Refining Company, LLC, The Premcor Refining Group Inc, Ultramar Energy, Inc., Valero Energy Corporation, Valero Marketing and Supply Company, Valero Refining-Texas, L.P.. (Sanford, Paul)
December 8, 2016 Filing 41 NOTICE of Appearance by Benjamin C. Caldwell on behalf of The Premcor Refining Group Inc (Caldwell, Benjamin)
December 8, 2016 Filing 40 NOTICE of Appearance by Paul M. Sanford on behalf of The Premcor Refining Group Inc (Sanford, Paul)
November 30, 2016 Filing 39 NOTICE of Appearance by John E. Bulman on behalf of PDV Midwest Refining, L.L.C. (Bulman, John)
November 30, 2016 Filing 38 NOTICE of Appearance by Stephen J. MacGillivray on behalf of PDV Midwest Refining, L.L.C. (MacGillivray, Stephen)
November 26, 2016 Opinion or Order TEXT ORDER granting #21 Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice of Andrew R. Running; granting #22 Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice of J. Andrew Langan; granting #23 Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice of Bradley H. Weidenhammer. So Ordered by Chief Judge William E. Smith on 11/26/2016. (Jackson, Ryan)
November 26, 2016 Opinion or Order TEXT ORDER granting #18 Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice of James Anthony Pardo; granting #19 Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice of Deborah E. Barnard; granting #20 Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice of Anthony A. Bongiorno. So Ordered by Chief Judge William E. Smith on 11/26/2016. (Jackson, Ryan)
November 26, 2016 Opinion or Order TEXT ORDER granting #27 Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice of Matthew D Thurlow; granting #28 Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice of Mary Rose Alexander. So Ordered by Chief Judge William E. Smith on 11/26/2016. (Jackson, Ryan)
November 18, 2016 Filing 37 Corporate Disclosure Statement by PDV Midwest Refining, L.L.C. identifying Corporate Parent VPHI Midwest, Inc. for PDV Midwest Refining, L.L.C... (MacGillivray, Stephen)
November 18, 2016 Filing 36 Corporate Disclosure Statement by CITGO Refining and Chemicals Company L.P. identifying Corporate Parent CITGO Investment Company, whose parent corporation is CITGO for CITGO Refining and Chemicals Company L.P... (MacGillivray, Stephen)
November 18, 2016 Filing 35 Corporate Disclosure Statement by CITGO Petroleum Corporation identifying Corporate Parent CITGO Holding, Inc. for CITGO Petroleum Corporation.. (MacGillivray, Stephen)
November 18, 2016 CORRECTIVE DOCKET ENTRY Regarding: #30 MOTION for Lisa S. Meyer to Appear Pro Hac Vice ( filing fee paid $ 50.00, receipt number 0103-1029416 ), #32 MOTION for Pamela R. Hanebutt to Appear Pro Hac Vice ( filing fee paid $ 50.00, receipt number 0103-1029436 ), #31 MOTION for to Appear Pro Hac Vice of Nathan P. Eimer ( filing fee paid $ 50.00, receipt number 0103-1029427 ). Filers added to original docket entry. Corrected NEF regenerated. (Farrell Pletcher, Paula)
November 18, 2016 Filing 34 NOTICE of Appearance by Benjamin C. Caldwell on behalf of Paulsboro Refining Company, LLC, Ultramar Energy, Inc., Valero Energy Corporation, Valero Marketing and Supply Company, Valero Refining-Texas, L.P. (Caldwell, Benjamin)
November 18, 2016 Filing 33 NOTICE of Appearance by Paul M. Sanford on behalf of Paulsboro Refining Company, LLC, Ultramar Energy, Inc., Valero Energy Corporation, Valero Marketing and Supply Company, Valero Refining-Texas, L.P. (Sanford, Paul)
November 18, 2016 Filing 32 MOTION for Pamela R. Hanebutt to Appear Pro Hac Vice ( filing fee paid $ 50.00, receipt number 0103-1029436 ) filed by CITGO Petroleum Corporation, CITGO Refining and Chemicals Company L.P. and PVD Midwest Refining, LLC. (MacGillivray, Stephen) Modified on 11/18/2016 (Farrell Pletcher, Paula).
November 18, 2016 Filing 31 MOTION for to Appear Pro Hac Vice of Nathan P. Eimer ( filing fee paid $ 50.00, receipt number 0103-1029427 ) filed by CITGO Petroleum Corporation CITGO Refining and Chemicals Company L.P. and PDV Midwest Refining, LLC. (MacGillivray, Stephen) Filers Modified on 11/18/2016 (Farrell Pletcher, Paula).
November 18, 2016 Filing 30 MOTION for Lisa S. Meyer to Appear Pro Hac Vice ( filing fee paid $ 50.00, receipt number 0103-1029416 ) filed by CITGO Petroleum Corporation, CITGO Refining and Chemicals Company L.P. (MacGillivray, Stephen) Filers Modified on 11/18/2016 (Farrell Pletcher, Paula).
November 10, 2016 Opinion or Order TEXT ORDER granting #14 Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice of James D Herschlein. So Ordered by Chief Judge William E. Smith on 11/10/2016. (Jackson, Ryan)
November 4, 2016 Filing 29 Corporate Disclosure Statement by Conoco Phillips Company. (Flanders, Robert)
November 4, 2016 Filing 28 MOTION for Mary Rose Alexander to Appear Pro Hac Vice ( filing fee paid $ 50.00, receipt number 0103-1024753 ) filed by Conoco Phillips Company. (Flanders, Robert)
November 4, 2016 Filing 27 MOTION for Matthew D. Thurlow to Appear Pro Hac Vice ( filing fee paid $ 50.00, receipt number 0103-1024744 ) filed by Conoco Phillips Company. (Flanders, Robert)
November 4, 2016 Filing 26 NOTICE of Appearance by Robert G. Flanders, Jr on behalf of Conoco Phillips Company (Flanders, Robert)
November 2, 2016 Filing 25 NOTICE of Appearance by John E. Bulman on behalf of CITGO Petroleum Corporation, CITGO Refining and Chemicals Company L.P. (Bulman, John)
November 2, 2016 Filing 24 NOTICE of Appearance by Stephen J. MacGillivray on behalf of CITGO Petroleum Corporation, CITGO Refining and Chemicals Company L.P. (MacGillivray, Stephen)
October 31, 2016 Reset Deadlines: Alon Refining Krotz Springs answer due 12/15/2016; Ashland, Inc. answer due 12/15/2016; CITGO Petroleum Corporation answer due 12/15/2016; CITGO Refining and Chemicals Company L.P. answer due 12/15/2016; Coastal Eagle Point Oil Company answer due 12/15/2016; Conoco Phillips Company answer due 12/15/2016; Equilon Enterprises LLC answer due 12/15/2016; Exxon Mobile Corporation answer due 12/15/2016; ExxonMobil Oil Corporation answer due 12/15/2016; Hess Corporation answer due 12/15/2016; Marathon Oil Company answer due 12/15/2016; Marathon Petroleum Company LP answer due 12/15/2016; Mobil Corporation answer due 12/15/2016; Motiva Enterprises LLC answer due 12/15/2016; PDV Midwest Refining, L.L.C. answer due 12/15/2016; Paulsboro Refining Company, LLC answer due 12/15/2016; Shell Oil Company answer due 12/15/2016; Shell Oil Products Company LLC answer due 12/15/2016; Shell Petroleum Inc answer due 12/15/2016; Sunoco, Inc. (R&M) answer due 12/15/2016; TMR Company answer due 12/15/2016; Total Petrochemicals & Refining USA, Inc. answer due 12/15/2016; Ultramar Energy, Inc. answer due 12/15/2016; Valero Energy Corporation answer due 12/15/2016; Valero Marketing and Supply Company answer due 12/15/2016; Valero Refining-Texas, L.P. answer due 12/15/2016. (Jackson, Ryan) Modified on 2/16/2017 (Jackson, Ryan): parties CHevron USA, Inc. and TRMI-H LLC removed purs. to #85 Notice of Correction.
October 31, 2016 Opinion or Order TEXT ORDER Entering #16 Stipulation re: #1 Complaint to Extend Time to Answer filed by Shell Oil Products Company LLC, Motiva Enterprises LLC, CITGO Petroleum Corporation, Conoco Phillips Company, Sunoco, Inc. (R&M), Shell Petroleum Inc, Exxon Mobile Corporation, Alon Refining Krotz Springs, CITGO Refining and Chemicals Company L.P., Marathon Oil Company, Marathon Petroleum Company LP, Mobil Corporation, Shell Oil Company, ExxonMobil Oil Corporation, TMR Company, PDV Midwest Refining, L.L.C., Paulsboro Refining Company, LLC, Valero Marketing and Supply Company, Ultramar Energy, Inc., Hess Corporation, Valero Refining-Texas, L.P., Equilon Enterprises LLC, Valero Energy Corporation, Total Petrochemicals & Refining USA, Inc., Coastal Eagle Point Oil Company, Ashland, Inc.. So Ordered by Chief Judge William E. Smith on 10/31/2016. (Jackson, Ryan) Modified on 2/16/2017 (Jackson, Ryan): parties removed purs. to #85 Notice of Correction.
October 28, 2016 Filing 23 MOTION for Bradley H. Weidenhammer to Appear Pro Hac Vice ( filing fee paid $ 50.00, receipt number 0103-1022160 ) filed by Atlantic Richfield Company, BP Products North America Inc. (Tarantino, John)
October 28, 2016 Filing 22 MOTION for J. Andrew Langan to Appear Pro Hac Vice ( filing fee paid $ 50.00, receipt number 0103-1022158 ) filed by Atlantic Richfield Company, BP Products North America Inc. (Tarantino, John)
October 28, 2016 Filing 21 MOTION for Andrew R. Running to Appear Pro Hac Vice ( filing fee paid $ 50.00, receipt number 0103-1022144 ) filed by Atlantic Richfield Company, BP Products North America Inc. (Tarantino, John)
October 27, 2016 Reset Deadlines: Atlantic Richfield Company answer due 12/15/2016; BP Products North America Inc answer due 12/15/2016. (Jackson, Ryan)
October 27, 2016 Opinion or Order TEXT ORDER Entering #13 Stipulation Extending Time to Answer or Otherwise Respond to #1 Complaint filed by BP Products North America Inc, Atlantic Richfield Company, State of RI. So Ordered by Chief Judge William E. Smith on 10/27/2016. (Jackson, Ryan)
October 25, 2016 Filing 20 MOTION for Anthony Bongiorno to Appear Pro Hac Vice ( filing fee paid $ 50.00, receipt number 0103-1021030 ) filed by Exxon Mobile Corporation, ExxonMobil Oil Corporation, Mobil Corporation. (Oliverio, Matthew)
October 21, 2016 Filing 19 MOTION for Deborah E. Barnard to Appear Pro Hac Vice ( filing fee paid $ 50.00, receipt number 0103-1019748 ) filed by Exxon Mobile Corporation, ExxonMobil Oil Corporation, Mobil Corporation. (Oliverio, Matthew)
October 21, 2016 Filing 18 MOTION for James Pardo to Appear Pro Hac Vice ( filing fee paid $ 50.00, receipt number 0103-1019741 ) filed by Exxon Mobile Corporation, ExxonMobil Oil Corporation, Mobil Corporation. (Oliverio, Matthew)
October 17, 2016 Filing 17 NOTICE of Appearance by William A. Walsh on behalf of All Plaintiffs (Walsh, William)
October 17, 2016 Filing 16 STIPULATION re #1 Complaint to Extend Time to Answer by Alon Refining Krotz Springs, Ashland, Inc., CITGO Petroleum Corporation, CITGO Refining and Chemicals Company L.P., Coastal Eagle Point Oil Company, Conoco Phillips Company, Equilon Enterprises LLC, Exxon Mobile Corporation, ExxonMobil Oil Corporation, Hess Corporation, Marathon Oil Company, Marathon Petroleum Company LP, Mobil Corporation, Motiva Enterprises LLC, PDV Midwest Refining, L.L.C., Paulsboro Refining Company, LLC, Shell Oil Company, Shell Oil Products Company LLC, Shell Petroleum Inc, Sunoco, Inc. (R&M), TMR Company, Total Petrochemicals & Refining USA, Inc., Ultramar Energy, Inc., Valero Energy Corporation, Valero Marketing and Supply Company, Valero Refining-Texas, L.P.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A)(Oliverio, Matthew) Modified on 2/16/2017: Defendants Chevron USA, Inc. and TRMI-H LLC removed from list of filers purs. ECF #85 Notice of Correction (Jackson, Ryan).
October 17, 2016 Filing 15 NOTICE of Appearance by Matthew Thomas Oliverio on behalf of Exxon Mobile Corporation, ExxonMobil Oil Corporation, Mobil Corporation (Oliverio, Matthew)
October 4, 2016 Filing 14 MOTION for James D. Herschlein to Appear Pro Hac Vice ( filing fee paid $ 50.00, receipt number 0103-1014467 ) filed by Highlands Fuel Delivery, LLC, Irving Oil Limited. (Petros, Gerald)
October 3, 2016 Filing 13 STIPULATION re #1 Complaint Extending Time to Answer or Otherwise Respond by Atlantic Richfield Company, BP Products North America Inc. (Tarantino, John)
September 30, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 12 ORDER OF RECUSAL: Judge John J. McConnell, Jr. recused; Case reassigned to Chief Judge William E. Smith for all further proceedings- So Ordered by Judge John J. McConnell, Jr. on 9/30/2016. (Barletta, Barbara)
September 30, 2016 Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge John J. McConnell, Jr.: Telephone Conference held on 9/30/2016; Neil F.X. Kelly, Rebecca Tedford Partington, Carla Burke Pickrel, Gerald J. Petros and John Tarantino participated (Barletta, Barbara)
September 28, 2016 Opinion or Order TEXT ORDER entering #11 Stipulation to extend time; Reset Deadlines: answer due 12/15/2016; Irving Oil Limited answer due 12/15/2016.- So Ordered by Judge John J. McConnell, Jr. on 9/28/2016. (Barletta, Barbara)
September 28, 2016 HEARING CANCELLED: The in chambers conference scheduled for Friday, 9/30/16 at 9:30 a.m. before Judge John J. McConnell, Jr. is now a telephone conference (Barletta, Barbara)
September 28, 2016 REVISED NOTICE of Hearing: Telephone Conference set for Friday, 9/30/2016 at 09:30 AM; before Judge John J. McConnell, Jr.; Please note that the in chambers conference will now be a telephone conference. Call in instructions will be provided under separate cover(Barletta, Barbara)
September 27, 2016 Opinion or Order TEXT ORDER granting #10 Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice of Glenn J. Pogust - So Ordered by Judge John J. McConnell, Jr. on 9/27/2016. (Barletta, Barbara)
September 27, 2016 Filing 11 STIPULATION re #1 Complaint that the time for both Defendants to answer or otherwise respond to Plaintiffs Complaint is extended up to and including December 15, 2016 by Highlands Fuel Delivery, LLC, Irving Oil Limited. (Gainor, Ryan)
September 23, 2016 Filing 10 MOTION for Glenn J. Pogust to Appear Pro Hac Vice ( filing fee paid $ 50.00, receipt number 0103-1010840 ) filed by Highlands Fuel Delivery, LLC, Irving Oil Limited. (Petros, Gerald)
September 23, 2016 Filing 9 NOTICE of Appearance by Ryan M. Gainor on behalf of Irving Oil Limited (Gainor, Ryan)
September 23, 2016 Filing 8 NOTICE of Appearance by Gerald J. Petros on behalf of Irving Oil Limited (Petros, Gerald)
September 23, 2016 Filing 7 NOTICE of Appearance by Ryan M. Gainor on behalf of Highlands Fuel Delivery, LLC (Gainor, Ryan)
September 23, 2016 Filing 6 NOTICE of Appearance by Gerald J. Petros on behalf of Highlands Fuel Delivery, LLC (Petros, Gerald)
September 21, 2016 Filing 5 NOTICE of Appearance by John A. Tarantino on behalf of Atlantic Richfield Company, BP Products North America Inc (Tarantino, John)
September 20, 2016 NOTICE of Hearing: In Chambers Conference set for Friday, 9/30/2016 at 09:30 AM in Judge McConnell Chambers - Room 211 (Barletta, Barbara)
September 13, 2016 Opinion or Order TEXT ORDER granting #4 Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice of William A. Walsh - So Ordered by Judge John J. McConnell, Jr. on 9/13/2016. (Barletta, Barbara)
September 13, 2016 Opinion or Order TEXT ORDER granting #3 Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice of Carla Burke Pickrel - So Ordered by Judge John J. McConnell, Jr. on 9/13/2016. (Barletta, Barbara)
September 13, 2016 Opinion or Order TEXT ORDER granting #2 Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice of Celeste A. Evangelisti - So Ordered by Judge John J. McConnell, Jr. on 9/13/2016. (Barletta, Barbara)
September 9, 2016 Filing 4 MOTION for William A. Walsh to Appear Pro Hac Vice ( filing fee paid $ 50.00, receipt number 0103-1006034 ) filed by All Plaintiffs. (Rubin, Michael)
September 9, 2016 Filing 3 MOTION for Carla Burke Pickrel to Appear Pro Hac Vice ( filing fee paid $ 50.00, receipt number 0103-1006031 ) filed by All Plaintiffs. (Rubin, Michael)
September 9, 2016 Filing 2 MOTION for Celeste A. Evangelisti to Appear Pro Hac Vice ( filing fee paid $ 50.00, receipt number 0103-1006017 ) filed by All Plaintiffs. (Rubin, Michael)
September 6, 2016 Filing 1 COMPLAINT ( filing fee paid $ 400.00 receipt number 14670017911 ), filed by State of Rhode Island. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 receipt)(Capraro, Dona)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Rhode Island District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: State of Rhode Island v. Alon Refining Krotz Springs et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: State of Rhode Island
Represented By: Celeste A. Evangelisti
Represented By: Rebecca Tedford Partington
Represented By: Michael Rubin
Represented By: William A. Walsh
Represented By: Carla Burke Pickrel
Represented By: Neil F.X. Kelly
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Alon Refining Krotz Springs
Represented By: Robert D. Fine
Represented By: Frank A. Dante
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Valero Refining-Texas, L.P.
Represented By: Erika M. Anderson
Represented By: Kelly J.H. Murrie
Represented By: Benjamin C. Caldwell
Represented By: Paul M. Sanford
Represented By: James F. Bennett
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: CITGO Refining and Chemicals Company L.P.
Represented By: Pamela R. Hanebutt
Represented By: Nathan P. Eimer
Represented By: John E. Bulman
Represented By: Lisa S. Meyer
Represented By: Stephen J. MacGillivray
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Ashland, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Motiva Enterprises LLC
Represented By: Shanna M. Boughton
Represented By: Bethany M. Whitmarsh
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: BP Products North America Inc
Represented By: Andrew R. Running
Represented By: Bradley H. Weidenhammer
Represented By: J. Andrew Langan
Represented By: John A. Tarantino
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Shell Oil Products Company LLC
Represented By: Shanna M. Boughton
Represented By: Bethany M. Whitmarsh
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Highlands Fuel Delivery, LLC
Represented By: Ryan M. Gainor
Represented By: Glenn J. Pogust
Represented By: Gerald J. Petros
Represented By: James D. Herschlein
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: The Premcor Refining Group Inc
Represented By: Erika M. Anderson
Represented By: Kelly J.H. Murrie
Represented By: Benjamin C. Caldwell
Represented By: Paul M. Sanford
Represented By: James F. Bennett
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Ultramar Energy, Inc.
Represented By: Erika M. Anderson
Represented By: Kelly J.H. Murrie
Represented By: Benjamin C. Caldwell
Represented By: Paul M. Sanford
Represented By: James F. Bennett
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Marathon Oil Company
Represented By: Joshua B. Frank
Represented By: Steven L. Leifer
Represented By: Christopher Danley
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Exxon Mobile Corporation
Represented By: Matthew Thomas Oliverio
Represented By: James Anthony Pardo
Represented By: Anthony A Bongiorno
Represented By: Deborah E. Barnard
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Hess Corporation
Represented By: Joshua B. Frank
Represented By: Robert D. Fine
Represented By: Steven L. Leifer
Represented By: Christopher Danley
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Chevron U.S.A. Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Coastal Eagle Point Oil Company
Represented By: Mark P. Dolan
Represented By: James L. Messenger
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Valero Energy Corporation
Represented By: Erika M. Anderson
Represented By: Kelly J.H. Murrie
Represented By: Benjamin C. Caldwell
Represented By: Paul M. Sanford
Represented By: James F. Bennett
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Marathon Petroleum Company LP
Represented By: Joshua B. Frank
Represented By: Steven L. Leifer
Represented By: Christopher Danley
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: CITGO Petroleum Corporation
Represented By: Pamela R. Hanebutt
Represented By: Nathan P. Eimer
Represented By: John E. Bulman
Represented By: Lisa S. Meyer
Represented By: Stephen J. MacGillivray
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Irving Oil Limited
Represented By: Ryan M. Gainor
Represented By: Glenn J. Pogust
Represented By: Gerald J. Petros
Represented By: James D. Herschlein
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Atlantic Richfield Company
Represented By: Andrew R. Running
Represented By: Bradley H. Weidenhammer
Represented By: J. Andrew Langan
Represented By: John A. Tarantino
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Shell Petroleum Inc
Represented By: Shanna M. Boughton
Represented By: Bethany M. Whitmarsh
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: TRMI-H LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: ExxonMobil Oil Corporation
Represented By: Matthew Thomas Oliverio
Represented By: James Anthony Pardo
Represented By: Anthony A Bongiorno
Represented By: Deborah E. Barnard
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: TMR Company
Represented By: Shanna M. Boughton
Represented By: Bethany M. Whitmarsh
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Total Petrochemicals & Refining USA, Inc.
Represented By: Christopher L. Dodson
Represented By: Jeffrey M. Padwa
Represented By: Amy E. Parker
Represented By: Carlton D. Wilde, III
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Shell Trading (US) Company
Represented By: Shanna M. Boughton
Represented By: Bethany M. Whitmarsh
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Equilon Enterprises LLC
Represented By: Shanna M. Boughton
Represented By: Bethany M. Whitmarsh
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Shell Oil Company
Represented By: Shanna M. Boughton
Represented By: Bethany M. Whitmarsh
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: PDV Midwest Refining, L.L.C.
Represented By: Pamela R. Hanebutt
Represented By: Nathan P. Eimer
Represented By: John E. Bulman
Represented By: Lisa S. Meyer
Represented By: Stephen J. MacGillivray
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Paulsboro Refining Company, LLC
Represented By: Erika M. Anderson
Represented By: Kelly J.H. Murrie
Represented By: Benjamin C. Caldwell
Represented By: Paul M. Sanford
Represented By: James F. Bennett
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Valero Marketing and Supply Company
Represented By: Erika M. Anderson
Represented By: Kelly J.H. Murrie
Represented By: Benjamin C. Caldwell
Represented By: Paul M. Sanford
Represented By: James F. Bennett
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Sunoco, Inc. (R&M)
Represented By: John S. Guttmann
Represented By: Daniel M. Krainin
Represented By: Robert D. Fine
Represented By: Nessa Horewitch Coppinger
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Conoco Phillips Company
Represented By: Mary Rose Alexander
Represented By: Robert G. Flanders, Jr.
Represented By: Matthew D Thurlow
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Mobil Corporation
Represented By: Matthew Thomas Oliverio
Represented By: James Anthony Pardo
Represented By: Anthony A Bongiorno
Represented By: Deborah E. Barnard
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Shell Trading (US) Company individually formerly known as Equiva Trading Company doing business as Stusco
Represented By: Shanna M. Boughton
Represented By: Bethany M. Whitmarsh
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Atlantic Richfield Company Individually, as successor-by-merger to Atlantic Richfield Company (a Pennsylvania corporation) and doing business as ARCO Products Company formerly known as Atlantic Richfield Delaware Corporation
Represented By: Andrew R. Running
Represented By: Bradley H. Weidenhammer
Represented By: J. Andrew Langan
Represented By: John A. Tarantino
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Exxon Mobile Corporation formerly known as Exxon Corporation doing business as ExxonMobil Refining and Supply Company doing business as Exxon Chemical U.S.A doing business as ExxonMobil Chemical Corporation
Represented By: Matthew Thomas Oliverio
Represented By: James Anthony Pardo
Represented By: Anthony A Bongiorno
Represented By: Deborah E. Barnard
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Conoco Phillips Company individually, as successor-by-merger to Conoco, Inc. and Tosco Corporation formerly known as Phillips Petroleum Company doing business as Phillips 66 Company doing business as Phillips Chemical Company doing business as Philli
Represented By: Mary Rose Alexander
Represented By: Robert G. Flanders, Jr.
Represented By: Matthew D Thurlow
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Chevron U.S.A. Inc. formerly known as Gulf Oil Corporation doing business as Chevron Products Company doing business as Chevron Chemical Company
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Shell Oil Products Company LLC doing business as Shell Oil Products Company
Represented By: Shanna M. Boughton
Represented By: Bethany M. Whitmarsh
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Socony Vacuum Oil Company, Incorporated
Represented By: Matthew Thomas Oliverio
Represented By: James Anthony Pardo
Represented By: Anthony A Bongiorno
Represented By: Deborah E. Barnard
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Valero Refining Company-Texas
Represented By: Erika M. Anderson
Represented By: Kelly J.H. Murrie
Represented By: Benjamin C. Caldwell
Represented By: Paul M. Sanford
Represented By: James F. Bennett
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Amoco Oil Company and The American Oil Company
Represented By: Andrew R. Running
Represented By: Bradley H. Weidenhammer
Represented By: J. Andrew Langan
Represented By: John A. Tarantino
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Marathon Petroleum Company LLC
Represented By: Joshua B. Frank
Represented By: Steven L. Leifer
Represented By: Christopher Danley
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Texaco Refining and Marketing (East), Inc.
Represented By: Shanna M. Boughton
Represented By: Bethany M. Whitmarsh
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Mobil Oil Corporation,
Represented By: Matthew Thomas Oliverio
Represented By: James Anthony Pardo
Represented By: Anthony A Bongiorno
Represented By: Deborah E. Barnard
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Valero Refining Company
Represented By: Erika M. Anderson
Represented By: Kelly J.H. Murrie
Represented By: Benjamin C. Caldwell
Represented By: Paul M. Sanford
Represented By: James F. Bennett
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Atlantic Richfield Delaware Corporation
Represented By: Andrew R. Running
Represented By: Bradley H. Weidenhammer
Represented By: J. Andrew Langan
Represented By: John A. Tarantino
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: TOTAL Petrochemicals USA, Inc.
Represented By: Christopher L. Dodson
Represented By: Jeffrey M. Padwa
Represented By: Amy E. Parker
Represented By: Carlton D. Wilde, III
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Equilon Enterprises LLC individually, and as successor-by-merger to Equiva Services LLC doing business as Shell Oil Products US
Represented By: Shanna M. Boughton
Represented By: Bethany M. Whitmarsh
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: American Petrofina Company of Texas
Represented By: Christopher L. Dodson
Represented By: Jeffrey M. Padwa
Represented By: Amy E. Parker
Represented By: Carlton D. Wilde, III
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Amerada Hess Corporation
Represented By: Joshua B. Frank
Represented By: Robert D. Fine
Represented By: Steven L. Leifer
Represented By: Christopher Danley
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Exxon Corporation
Represented By: Matthew Thomas Oliverio
Represented By: James Anthony Pardo
Represented By: Anthony A Bongiorno
Represented By: Deborah E. Barnard
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Atofina Petrochemicals, Inc.
Represented By: Christopher L. Dodson
Represented By: Jeffrey M. Padwa
Represented By: Amy E. Parker
Represented By: Carlton D. Wilde, III
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Sun Refining and Marketing Company,
Represented By: John S. Guttmann
Represented By: Daniel M. Krainin
Represented By: Robert D. Fine
Represented By: Nessa Horewitch Coppinger
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Gulf Oil Corporation
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Cities Service RMT Corporation
Represented By: Pamela R. Hanebutt
Represented By: Nathan P. Eimer
Represented By: John E. Bulman
Represented By: Lisa S. Meyer
Represented By: Stephen J. MacGillivray
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Sun Oil Company of Pennsylvania
Represented By: John S. Guttmann
Represented By: Daniel M. Krainin
Represented By: Robert D. Fine
Represented By: Nessa Horewitch Coppinger
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Getty Oil Company (Eastern Operations), Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Texaco Refining and Marketing Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: USS Holdings Company
Represented By: Joshua B. Frank
Represented By: Steven L. Leifer
Represented By: Christopher Danley
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Texaco Refining and Marketing, Inc.
Represented By: Shanna M. Boughton
Represented By: Bethany M. Whitmarsh
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Socony Mobil Oil Company,
Represented By: Matthew Thomas Oliverio
Represented By: James Anthony Pardo
Represented By: Anthony A Bongiorno
Represented By: Deborah E. Barnard
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Irving Oil Corporation
Represented By: Ryan M. Gainor
Represented By: Glenn J. Pogust
Represented By: Gerald J. Petros
Represented By: James D. Herschlein
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Fina Oil and Chemical Company
Represented By: Christopher L. Dodson
Represented By: Jeffrey M. Padwa
Represented By: Amy E. Parker
Represented By: Carlton D. Wilde, III
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Star Enterprises LLC
Represented By: Shanna M. Boughton
Represented By: Bethany M. Whitmarsh
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Sun Company, Inc (R&M)
Represented By: John S. Guttmann
Represented By: Daniel M. Krainin
Represented By: Robert D. Fine
Represented By: Nessa Horewitch Coppinger
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Phillips Petroleum Company
Represented By: Mary Rose Alexander
Represented By: Robert G. Flanders, Jr.
Represented By: Matthew D Thurlow
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: TRMI Holdings Inc
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Getty Refining and Marketing Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Equiva Trading Company
Represented By: Shanna M. Boughton
Represented By: Bethany M. Whitmarsh
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?