Ayinkamiye v. Rhode Island College et al
Plaintiff: Jeannette Ayinkamiye
Defendant: Rhode Island College, City of Providence and State of Rhode Island
Case Number: 1:2017cv00054
Filed: February 7, 2017
Court: US District Court for the District of Rhode Island
Office: Providence Office
County: Providence
Presiding Judge: William E. Smith
Presiding Judge: Patricia A. Sullivan
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Education
Cause of Action: 28:1331
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
October 11, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 36 ORDER denying as moot 33 Motion to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim; adopting 35 Report and Recommendations; and, Ordering Plaintiff to Show Cause in writing on or before 11/13/17. So Ordered by Chief Judge William E. Smith on 10/11/2017. (Jackson, Ryan)
May 9, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 31 ORDER adopting 25 Report and Recommendations and denying 16 Motion for emergency relief- So Ordered by Chief Judge William E. Smith on 5/9/2017. (Barletta, Barbara)
April 12, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 26 ORDER denying 3 Motion for Preliminary Injunction; adopting 9 Report and Recommendations. So Ordered by Chief Judge William E. Smith on 4/12/2017. (Jackson, Ryan)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Rhode Island District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Ayinkamiye v. Rhode Island College et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Jeannette Ayinkamiye
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Rhode Island College
Represented By: Jeffrey S. Michaelson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: City of Providence
Represented By: Kevin F. McHugh
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: State of Rhode Island
Represented By: Adam J. Sholes
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?