Karmue v. Remington et al
Plaintiff: Kormahyah Karmue
Defendant: David Remington and Donald Wyatt Detention Center
Case Number: 1:2017cv00107
Filed: March 21, 2017
Court: US District Court for the District of Rhode Island
Office: Providence Office
County: Providence
Presiding Judge: Andrea K Johnstone
Presiding Judge: Landya B McCafferty
Nature of Suit: Federal Employers Liability
Cause of Action: 42:1983
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
March 18, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 141 ORDER: The court GRANTS IN PART and DENIES IN PART the federal defendants' motion for partial summary judgment and to dismiss (doc. no. 112 ), as follows: 1. The federal defendants' motion for partial summary judgment and dismissal (doc. n o. 112 ) is DENIED as to Claims 1-4 and 9, without prejudice to the defendants' ability to assert an appropriate claim in a summary judgment motion filed at a later stage in this case after the parties have had the opportunity to conduct discov ery; 2. The federal defendants' motion for partial summary judgment and to dismiss (doc. no. 112 ) is GRANTED as to Claims 10 and 11; 3. Dr. Al-Karim Dhanji and Physical Therapist Kerry Quinn are dismissed from this action - So Ordered by District Judge Landya B McCafferty on 3/18/2020. (Urizandi, Nisshy)
March 4, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 109 ORDER: denying 79 Motion for Leave to File Amended Complaint; adopting Report and Recommendations re 100 Report and Recommendations - So Ordered by District Judge Landya B McCafferty on 3/4/2019. (Urizandi, Nisshy)
February 4, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 99 REPORT AND RECOMMENDATIONS re 78 Objection to 67 REPORT AND RECOMMENDATIONS and Motion to Amend re 1 Complaint. For the reasons stated within, the district judge should grant in part and otherwise deny Karmue's motion to amend (Doc. No, 78) Objections to R&R due by 2/19/2019 - So Ordered by Magistrate Judge Andrea K Johnstone on 2/1/2019. (Urizandi, Nisshy)
January 30, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 97 REPORT AND RECOMMENDATIONS re 91 MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction. For the reasons stated within, the district judge should deny defendant Dr. Edward Blanchette's motion to dismiss (Doc. No. 91 ) without prejudice. Any objections to this Report and Recommendation must be filed within fourteen days of receipt of this notice. The fourteen-day period may be extended upon motion. Failure to file specific written objections to the Report and Recommendation within the specified tim e waives the right to appeal the district court's order See Santos-Santos v. Torres-Centeno, 842 F.3d 163, 168 (1st Cir. 2016). Objections to R&R due by 2/13/2019 - So Ordered by Magistrate Judge Andrea K Johnstone on 1/29/2019. (Urizandi, Nisshy)
January 29, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 59 ORDER adopting 41 Report and Recommendations; denying 17 Motion for TRO; denying 17 Motion for Order to Show Cause; denying 18 Motion for TRO; denying 18 Motion for Order to Show Cause; denying 19 Motion for TRO; denying 19 Motio n for Order to Show Cause; denying 20 Motion for TRO; denying 20 Motion for Order to Show Cause; denying 21 Motion for Preliminary Injunction; denying 22 Motion for Preliminary Injunction; denying 23 Motion for Preliminary Injunction; denying 24 Motion for Preliminary Injunction. So Ordered by District Judge Landya B. McCafferty, District of NH on 1/26/2018. (Jackson, Ryan)
July 25, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 45 ORDER directing clerk's office to issue summons to serve Amended Complaint on defendants John Does 1 through 4 along with documents #11,17,20,21-24,41 and 44; the United States Attorney within sixty days shall file a notice stating the names of the John Does or to file a notice why the John Does cannot be named and the efforts made to discover their identities; Plaintiff must amend his complaint within thirty days of the date of this Order as to Claims 4, 6 and 7 as set forth in 44 Report and Recommendation So Ordered by Magistrate Judge Andrea K Johnstone on 7/24/2017. (Barletta, Barbara)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Rhode Island District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Karmue v. Remington et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Kormahyah Karmue
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: David Remington
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Donald Wyatt Detention Center
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?