July 11, 2022 |
Filing
203
ORDER denying 193 Motion to Alter Judgment; adopting 190 Report and Recommendations, denying 160 Motion for Summary Judgment, and granting 172 Motion for Summary Judgment. So Ordered by Chief Judge John J. McConnell, Jr. on 7/8/2022. (Jackson, Ryan)
|
April 14, 2022 |
Filing
190
REPORT AND RECOMMENDATIONS re 160 MOTION for Summary Judgment With Supporting Memorandum filed by Kenneth Fitch, Estate of Dianne L. Fitch, 172 Cross MOTION for Summary Judgment filed by Federal National Mortgage Associa tion Objections to R&R due by 4/28/2022.. I recommend that the motion for partial summary judgment (ECF No. 172) of Defendant Federal National Mortgage Association be GRANTED and that Plaintiff's motion for partial summa ry judgment (ECF No. 160) be DENIED. I further recommend that the Court enter final judgment against Plaintiff and in favor of all remaining Defendants (Federal National Mortgage Association, Federal Housing Finance Agency, Rushmore Loan Management Services, LLC, and U.S. Bank National Association as Trustee for RMAC Trust Series 2016-CTT) on all remaining Counts (II through VI) in the Amended Complaint, terminating this action. So Ordered by Magistrate Judge Patricia A. Sullivan on 4/14/2022. (Saucier, Martha)
|
March 31, 2022 |
Filing
189
ORDER granting 96 Motion for Partial Summary Judgment; granting 117 Motion for Partial Summary Judgment; adopting 184 Report and Recommendations. So Ordered by Chief Judge John J. McConnell, Jr. on 3/31/2022. (Jackson, Ryan)
|
March 8, 2022 |
Filing
184
REPORT AND RECOMMENDATIONS re 117 MOTION for Partial Summary Judgment Concerning Due Process Theory filed by 266 Putnam Avenue, LLC, 96 MOTION for Partial Summary Judgment filed by 266 Putnam Avenue, LLC Objections to R&R due by 3/22/2022.. I recommend that Putnam's motion for partial summary judgment (ECF No. 96) and motion for partial summary judgment based on due process (ECF No. 117) both be GRANTED and that the Court enter judgment in favor of Putnam terminating it as a party in this case, and against Plaintiff as to all his claims against Putnam. Because Montilla is dispositive of all issues pertinent to Count I, I further recommend that the Court enter judgment against Plaintiff and in favor of all Defendants with respect to Count I (due process) of the Amended Complaint. So Ordered by Magistrate Judge Patricia A. Sullivan on 3/8/2022. (Saucier, Martha)
|
January 18, 2022 |
Filing
183
ORDER adopting 157 Report and Recommendations and granting 102 Motion to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction filed by Wells Fargo Bank, N.A. So Ordered by Chief Judge John J. McConnell, Jr. on 1/18/2022. (Jackson, Ryan)
|
October 21, 2021 |
Filing
157
REPORT AND RECOMMENDATIONS re 102 MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction and/or for Failure to State a Claim filed by Wells Fargo Bank, N.A. Objections to R&R due by 11/4/2021.. I recommend that Wells Fargo& #039;s Motion (ECF No. 102) to Dismiss for Lack of Subject Matter Jurisdiction pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 12(b)(1) be GRANTED and that Counts VII through XIII (including both iterations of Count XII) be dismissed without prejudice. If the Court do es not adopt this recommendation, I alternatively recommend that Wells Fargo's Motion to Dismiss these Counts for Failing to State a Plausible Claim pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 12(b)(6) should be GRANTED and that these Counts should be dismissed with prejudice. So Ordered by Magistrate Judge Patricia A. Sullivan on 10/21/2021. (Saucier, Martha)
|
May 18, 2021 |
Filing
107
MEMORANDUM AND ORDER granting in part and denying in part 100 Motion for Protective Order. So Ordered by Magistrate Judge Patricia A. Sullivan on 5/18/2021. (Saucier, Martha)
|
December 16, 2019 |
Filing
59
MEMORANDUM AND ORDER granting 42 Motion to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim as to Harmon Law Offices, P.C.- So Ordered by Chief Judge John J. McConnell, Jr. on 12/16/2019. (Barletta, Barbara)
|