Del Sesto et al v. Prospect CharterCARE, LLC et al
Plaintiff: Caroll Short, Gail J Major, Stephen Del Sesto, Dorothy Willner, Eugenia Levesque, Nancy Zompa, Ralph Bryden, Donna Boutelle and Gail J. Major
Defendant: The Angell Pension Group, Inc., CharterCARE Community Board, Roman Catholic Bishop of Providence, The Rhode Island Community Foundation, CharterCARE Foundation, Prospect CharterCARE, LLC, Prospect Medical Holdings, Inc., Prospect CharterCare SJHSRI, LLC, Prospect East Holdings, Inc., Diocesan Administration Corporation, St. Joseph Health Services of Rhode Island, Prospect Chartercare RWMC, LLC, Diocesan Service Corporation and Roger Williams Hospital
Interested Party: Michael W Field and Lydia Corvese
Receiver: THOMAS HEMMENDINGER
Special Master: Deming E. Sherman
Case Number: 1:2018cv00328
Filed: June 18, 2018
Court: US District Court for the District of Rhode Island
Office: Providence Office
County: Providence
Presiding Judge: William E Smith
Nature of Suit: Labor: E.R.I.S.A.
Cause of Action: 29:1132
Jury Demanded By: Both
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on April 9, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
April 9, 2021 Filing 211 DECLARATION re #210 MOTION for Attorney Fees in Connection with Settlement with the Prospect Entities, Related Individuals, and The Angell Pension Group, Inc. Supplemental Declaration of Stephen P. Sheehan by All Plaintiffs. (Ledsham, Benjamin)
April 9, 2021 Filing 210 MOTION for Attorney Fees in Connection with Settlement with the Prospect Entities, Related Individuals, and The Angell Pension Group, Inc. filed by All Plaintiffs. Responses due by 4/23/2021. (Ledsham, Benjamin)
April 9, 2021 Filing 211 DECLARATION re #210 MOTION for Attorney Fees in Connection with Settlement with the Prospect Entities, Related Individuals, and The Angell Pension Group, Inc. Supplemental Declaration of Stephen P. Sheehan by All Plaintiffs. (Ledsham, Benjamin)
April 9, 2021 Filing 210 MOTION for Attorney Fees in Connection with Settlement with the Prospect Entities, Related Individuals, and The Angell Pension Group, Inc. filed by All Plaintiffs. Responses due by 4/23/2021. (Ledsham, Benjamin)
March 26, 2021 NOTICE of Hearing: Fairness Hearing via Zoom scheduled for Tuesday 7/20/2021 at 2:00 PM as a Remote Hearing before District Judge William E. Smith; Zoom information below.(Zoom Meeting ID: 160 985 8874, Passcode: 647245) (Jackson, Ryan)
March 26, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 209 ORDER granting #206 Motion for Preliminary Settlement Approval, Settlement Class Certification, Appointment of Class Counsel, and a Finding of Good Faith Settlement. So Ordered by District Judge William E. Smith on 3/26/2021. (Jackson, Ryan)
March 26, 2021 NOTICE of Hearing: Fairness Hearing via Zoom scheduled for Tuesday 7/20/2021 at 2:00 PM as a Remote Hearing before District Judge William E. Smith; Zoom information below.(Zoom Meeting ID: 160 985 8874, Passcode: 647245) (Jackson, Ryan)
March 26, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 209 ORDER granting #206 Motion for Preliminary Settlement Approval, Settlement Class Certification, Appointment of Class Counsel, and a Finding of Good Faith Settlement. So Ordered by District Judge William E. Smith on 3/26/2021. (Jackson, Ryan)
March 25, 2021 Filing 208 RESPONSE In Opposition to #206 MOTION to Certify Class Plaintiffs' Motion for Preliminary Settlement Approval, Settlement Class Certification, Appointment of Class Counsel, and a Finding of Good Faith Settlement filed by Diocesan Administration Corporation, Diocesan Service Corporation, Roman Catholic Bishop of Providence. Replies due by 4/1/2021. (Merten, Howard)
March 11, 2021 Filing 207 DECLARATION re #206 MOTION to Certify Class Plaintiffs' Motion for Preliminary Settlement Approval, Settlement Class Certification, Appointment of Class Counsel, and a Finding of Good Faith Settlement Declaration of Stephen P. Sheehan by All Plaintiffs. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit 2, #3 Exhibit 3, #4 Exhibit 4, #5 Exhibit 5, #6 Exhibit 6, #7 Exhibit 7, #8 Exhibit 8, #9 Exhibit 9, #10 Exhibit 10, #11 Exhibit 11, #12 Exhibit 12, #13 Exhibit 13, #14 Exhibit 14, #15 Exhibit 15, #16 Exhibit 16, #17 Exhibit 17, #18 Exhibit 18, #19 Exhibit 19, #20 Exhibit 20, #21 Exhibit 21, #22 Exhibit 22, #23 Exhibit 23, #24 Exhibit 24, #25 Exhibit 25, #26 Exhibit 26, #27 Exhibit 27, #28 Exhibit 28, #29 Exhibit 29, #30 Exhibit 30, #31 Exhibit 31, #32 Exhibit 32, #33 Exhibit 33, #34 Exhibit 34)(Ledsham, Benjamin)
March 11, 2021 Filing 206 MOTION to Certify Class Plaintiffs' Motion for Preliminary Settlement Approval, Settlement Class Certification, Appointment of Class Counsel, and a Finding of Good Faith Settlement filed by All Plaintiffs. Responses due by 3/25/2021. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C, #4 Exhibit D)(Ledsham, Benjamin)
February 16, 2021 Opinion or Order TEXT ORDER granting #205 Motion to Stay. All proceedings and deadlines between the settling parties are stayed pending approval of the settlement agreement by both the Rhode Island Superior Court and this Court or disapproval by either court. The settling parties are instructed to submit a joint status report on March 15, 2021 and every 30 days thereafter, until a motion for preliminary settlement approval has been filed in this Court, or until the stay is lifted. The stay does not apply to Plaintiffs' claims against the Roman Catholic Bishop of Providence, the Diocesan Administration Corporation, or the Diocesan Service Corporation. So Ordered by District Judge William E. Smith on 2/16/2021. (Jackson, Ryan)
February 16, 2021 Opinion or Order TEXT ORDER granting #205 Motion to Stay. All proceedings and deadlines between the settling parties are stayed pending approval of the settlement agreement by both the Rhode Island Superior Court and this Court or disapproval by either court. The settling parties are instructed to submit a joint status report on March 15, 2021 and every 30 days thereafter, until a motion for preliminary settlement approval has been filed in this Court, or until the stay is lifted. The stay does not apply to Plaintiffs' claims against the Roman Catholic Bishop of Providence, the Diocesan Administration Corporation, or the Diocesan Service Corporation. So Ordered by District Judge William E. Smith on 2/16/2021. (Jackson, Ryan)
January 28, 2021 Filing 205 Joint MOTION to Stay Joint Motion by Settling Parties to Partially Stay Proceedings Pending Judicial Approvals of Settlement Agreement filed by All Plaintiffs. Responses due by 2/11/2021. (Ledsham, Benjamin)
January 28, 2021 Filing 205 Joint MOTION to Stay Joint Motion by Settling Parties to Partially Stay Proceedings Pending Judicial Approvals of Settlement Agreement filed by All Plaintiffs. Responses due by 2/11/2021. (Ledsham, Benjamin)
December 8, 2020 Filing 204 NOTICE by Diocesan Administration Corporation, Diocesan Service Corporation, Roman Catholic Bishop of Providence re #202 Response to Motion, #201 Statement of Disputed Facts,,, (Merten, Howard)
December 8, 2020 Filing 203 REPLY to Response re #202 Response to Motion, Reply to Plaintiffs' Memorandum of Law in Opposition to the Prospect Entities' Cross Motion for Summary Judgment on Count IV of the First Amended Complaint filed by Prospect CharterCARE, LLC, Prospect CharterCare SJHSRI, LLC, Prospect Chartercare RWMC, LLC, Prospect East Holdings, Inc., Prospect Medical Holdings, Inc.. (Wagner, Dean)
December 8, 2020 Filing 204 NOTICE by Diocesan Administration Corporation, Diocesan Service Corporation, Roman Catholic Bishop of Providence re #202 Response to Motion, #201 Statement of Disputed Facts,,, (Merten, Howard)
December 8, 2020 Filing 203 REPLY to Response re #202 Response to Motion, Reply to Plaintiffs' Memorandum of Law in Opposition to the Prospect Entities' Cross Motion for Summary Judgment on Count IV of the First Amended Complaint filed by Prospect CharterCARE, LLC, Prospect CharterCare SJHSRI, LLC, Prospect Chartercare RWMC, LLC, Prospect East Holdings, Inc., Prospect Medical Holdings, Inc.. (Wagner, Dean)
November 23, 2020 Filing 202 RESPONSE In Opposition to #193 MOTION for Summary Judgment Plaintiffs' Memorandum of Law in Opposition to the Prospect Entities' Cross Motion for Summary Judgment on Count IV of the First Amended Complaint filed by All Plaintiffs. Replies due by 11/30/2020. (Ledsham, Benjamin)
November 23, 2020 Filing 201 STATEMENT OF DISPUTED FACTS Plaintiffs' Supplemental Response to the Prospect Defendants' Statement of Undisputed Material Facts by All Plaintiffs re #191 Statement of Undisputed Facts,, #196 Statement of Disputed Facts,,. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 47, #2 Exhibit 48, #3 Exhibit 49, #4 Exhibit 50, #5 Exhibit 51, #6 Exhibit 52, #7 Exhibit 53, #8 Exhibit 54, #9 Exhibit 55, #10 Exhibit 56, #11 Exhibit 57, #12 Exhibit 58, #13 Exhibit 59, #14 Exhibit 60, #15 Exhibit 61, #16 Exhibit 62, #17 Exhibit 63, #18 Exhibit 64, #19 Exhibit 65, #20 Exhibit 66, #21 Exhibit 67, #22 Exhibit 68, #23 Exhibit 69, #24 Exhibit 70, #25 Exhibit 71, #26 Exhibit 72, #27 Exhibit 73, #28 Exhibit 74, #29 Exhibit 75, #30 Exhibit 76, #31 Exhibit 77, #32 Exhibit 78)(Ledsham, Benjamin)
November 23, 2020 Filing 202 RESPONSE In Opposition to #193 MOTION for Summary Judgment Plaintiffs' Memorandum of Law in Opposition to the Prospect Entities' Cross Motion for Summary Judgment on Count IV of the First Amended Complaint filed by All Plaintiffs. Replies due by 11/30/2020. (Ledsham, Benjamin)
November 23, 2020 Filing 201 STATEMENT OF DISPUTED FACTS Plaintiffs' Supplemental Response to the Prospect Defendants' Statement of Undisputed Material Facts by All Plaintiffs re #191 Statement of Undisputed Facts,, #196 Statement of Disputed Facts,,. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 47, #2 Exhibit 48, #3 Exhibit 49, #4 Exhibit 50, #5 Exhibit 51, #6 Exhibit 52, #7 Exhibit 53, #8 Exhibit 54, #9 Exhibit 55, #10 Exhibit 56, #11 Exhibit 57, #12 Exhibit 58, #13 Exhibit 59, #14 Exhibit 60, #15 Exhibit 61, #16 Exhibit 62, #17 Exhibit 63, #18 Exhibit 64, #19 Exhibit 65, #20 Exhibit 66, #21 Exhibit 67, #22 Exhibit 68, #23 Exhibit 69, #24 Exhibit 70, #25 Exhibit 71, #26 Exhibit 72, #27 Exhibit 73, #28 Exhibit 74, #29 Exhibit 75, #30 Exhibit 76, #31 Exhibit 77, #32 Exhibit 78)(Ledsham, Benjamin)
November 20, 2020 Filing 200 RESPONSE In Opposition to #193 MOTION for Summary Judgment [Prospect's Cross-Motion for Summary Judgment] filed by Diocesan Administration Corporation, Diocesan Service Corporation, Roman Catholic Bishop of Providence. Replies due by 11/27/2020. (Merten, Howard)
November 20, 2020 Filing 199 STATEMENT OF DISPUTED FACTS In Response to Prospect's Statement of Undisputed Facts by Diocesan Administration Corporation, Diocesan Service Corporation, Roman Catholic Bishop of Providence re #193 MOTION for Summary Judgment , #191 Statement of Undisputed Facts,,. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit 2, #3 Exhibit 3, #4 Exhibit 4, #5 Exhibit 5, #6 Exhibit 6, #7 Exhibit 7, #8 Exhibit 8, #9 Exhibit 9, #10 Exhibit 10, #11 Exhibit 11, #12 Exhibit 12, #13 Exhibit 13, #14 Exhibit 14, #15 Exhibit 15, #16 Exhibit 16, #17 Exhibit 17, #18 Exhibit 18, #19 Exhibit 19, #20 Exhibit 20, #21 Exhibit 21, #22 Exhibit 22, #23 Exhibit 23, #24 Exhibit 24)(Merten, Howard)
October 27, 2020 Opinion or Order TEXT ORDER Entering #198 Stipulation Concerning Briefing on Prospect's Cross Motion for Summary Judgment filed by Gail J. Major, Donna Boutelle, Ralph Bryden, Dorothy Willner, Nancy Zompa, Stephen Del Sesto, Caroll Short, Eugenia Levesque. So Ordered by District Judge William E. Smith on 10/27/2020. (Jackson, Ryan)
October 26, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 198 STIPULATION and Order Concerning Briefing on Prospect's Cross Motion for Summary Judgment filed by All Plaintiffs. (Sheehan, Stephen)
September 1, 2020 Filing 197 REPLY to Response re #190 Response to Motion,,, Plaintiffs' Reply to the Prospect Defendants' Memorandum of Law in Opposition to Plaintiffs' Motion for Summary Judgment on Count IV of the First Amended Complaint filed by All Plaintiffs. (Wistow, Max)
September 1, 2020 Filing 196 STATEMENT OF DISPUTED FACTS Plaintiffs' Response to the Prospect Defendants' Statement of Undisputed Material Facts by All Plaintiffs re #191 Statement of Undisputed Facts,,. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 27, #2 Exhibit 28, #3 Exhibit 29, #4 Exhibit 30, #5 Exhibit 31, #6 Exhibit 32, #7 Exhibit 33, #8 Exhibit 34, #9 Exhibit 35, #10 Exhibit 36, #11 Exhibit 37, #12 Exhibit 38, #13 Exhibit 39, #14 Exhibit 40, #15 Exhibit 41, #16 Exhibit 42, #17 Exhibit 43, #18 Exhibit 44, #19 Exhibit 45, #20 Exhibit 46)(Wistow, Max)
July 14, 2020 Opinion or Order TEXT ORDER Entering #195 Fifth STIPULATION and Order Concerning Limited Discovery and Related Summary Judgment Motions. So Ordered by District Judge William E. Smith on 7/14/2020. (Jackson, Ryan)
July 14, 2020 Filing 195 Fifth STIPULATION and Order Concerning Limited Discovery and Related Summary Judgment Motions filed by Donna Boutelle, Ralph Bryden, Lydia Corvese, Stephen Del Sesto, Michael W Field, THOMAS HEMMENDINGER, Eugenia Levesque, Gail J. Major, Deming E. Sherman, Caroll Short, Dorothy Willner, Nancy Zompa. (Sheehan, Stephen)
July 2, 2020 Filing 194 STATEMENT OF DISPUTED FACTS as Amended by Prospect CharterCARE, LLC, Prospect CharterCare SJHSRI, LLC, Prospect Chartercare RWMC, LLC, Prospect East Holdings, Inc., Prospect Medical Holdings, Inc. re #174 Statement of Undisputed Facts,, #192 Statement of Disputed Facts,. (Pare, Edward)
June 26, 2020 Filing 193 MOTION for Summary Judgment filed by Prospect CharterCARE, LLC, Prospect CharterCare SJHSRI, LLC, Prospect Chartercare RWMC, LLC, Prospect East Holdings, Inc., Prospect Medical Holdings, Inc.. Responses due by 7/10/2020. (Attachments: #1 Supporting Memorandum, #2 Affidavit, #3 Affidavit, #4 Supplement, #5 Supplement)(Pare, Edward)
June 26, 2020 Filing 192 STATEMENT OF DISPUTED FACTS by Prospect CharterCARE, LLC, Prospect CharterCare SJHSRI, LLC, Prospect Chartercare RWMC, LLC, Prospect East Holdings, Inc., Prospect Medical Holdings, Inc. re #174 Statement of Undisputed Facts,,. (Pare, Edward)
June 26, 2020 Filing 191 STATEMENT OF UNDISPUTED FACTS by Prospect CharterCARE, LLC, Prospect CharterCare SJHSRI, LLC, Prospect Chartercare RWMC, LLC, Prospect East Holdings, Inc., Prospect Medical Holdings, Inc. re #190 Response to Motion,,,. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit, #2 Exhibit, #3 Exhibit, #4 Exhibit, #5 Exhibit, #6 Exhibit, #7 Exhibit, #8 Exhibit, #9 Exhibit, #10 Exhibit, #11 Exhibit, #12 Exhibit, #13 Exhibit, #14 Exhibit, #15 Exhibit, #16 Exhibit, #17 Exhibit, #18 Exhibit, #19 Exhibit, #20 Exhibit, #21 Exhibit)(Pare, Edward)
June 26, 2020 Filing 190 RESPONSE In Opposition to #173 MOTION for Summary Judgment on Count IV of the Complaint filed by Prospect CharterCARE, LLC, Prospect CharterCare SJHSRI, LLC, Prospect Chartercare RWMC, LLC, Prospect East Holdings, Inc., Prospect Medical Holdings, Inc.. Replies due by 7/6/2020. (Attachments: #1 Supporting Memorandum, #2 Affidavit, #3 Affidavit, #4 Supporting Memorandum, #5 Supporting Memorandum, #6 Exhibit, #7 Exhibit, #8 Exhibit, #9 Exhibit, #10 Exhibit, #11 Exhibit, #12 Exhibit, #13 Exhibit, #14 Exhibit, #15 Exhibit, #16 Exhibit, #17 Exhibit, #18 Exhibit, #19 Exhibit, #20 Exhibit, #21 Exhibit, #22 Exhibit, #23 Exhibit, #24 Exhibit, #25 Exhibit, #26 Exhibit)(Pare, Edward)
June 26, 2020 Filing 189 NOTICE by Diocesan Administration Corporation, Diocesan Service Corporation, Roman Catholic Bishop of Providence re #173 MOTION for Summary Judgment on Count IV of the Complaint of the Diocesan Defendants' Response and Reservation of Rights (Merten, Howard)
May 14, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 188 FOURTH ORDER CONCERNING LIMITED DISCOVERY AND RELATED SUMMARY JUDGMENT MOTIONS re: #184 Motion for Extension of Time. So Ordered by District Judge William E. Smith on 5/14/2020. (Jackson, Ryan)
May 13, 2020 Filing 187 NOTICE by Stephen Del Sesto re #170 Stipulation, #183 Stipulation, #184 MOTION for an Extension of Time Regarding Deadlines in Third Stipulation and Consent Order , #175 Stipulation , of Proposed Fourth Order Concerning Limited Discovery and Related Summary Judgment Motions (Wistow, Max)
May 6, 2020 Minute Entry for proceedings held before District Judge William E. Smith: 'In' Chambers Zoom Video-Conference held on 5/6/2020; counsel present: S. Del Sesto; S. Sheehan; D. Wagner; H. Merten; P. Halperin; S. Boyajian; T. Hemmendinger; C. Lee; P. Kessimian; M. Russo; D. Godofsky; B. Ledsham. (Jackson, Ryan)
May 2, 2020 Filing 186 REPLY to Response re #185 Response to Motion, filed by Prospect CharterCARE, LLC, Prospect CharterCare SJHSRI, LLC, Prospect Chartercare RWMC, LLC, Prospect East Holdings, Inc., Prospect Medical Holdings, Inc.. (Pare, Edward)
April 30, 2020 NOTICE of Hearing: 'In' Chambers Zoom Video-Conference scheduled for Wednesday 5/6/2020 at 2:00 PM via Zoom video conferencing before District Judge William E. Smith; Zoom invitation and instructions will be emailed to all counsel of record. (Jackson, Ryan)
April 27, 2020 Filing 185 RESPONSE In Opposition to #184 MOTION for an Extension of Time Regarding Deadlines in Third Stipulation and Consent Order filed by All Plaintiffs. Replies due by 5/4/2020. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit 2)(Wistow, Max)
April 11, 2020 Filing 184 MOTION for an Extension of Time Regarding Deadlines in Third Stipulation and Consent Order filed by Prospect CharterCARE, LLC, Prospect CharterCare SJHSRI, LLC, Prospect Chartercare RWMC, LLC, Prospect East Holdings, Inc., Prospect Medical Holdings, Inc.. Responses due by 4/27/2020. (Pare, Edward)
March 18, 2020 HEARING CANCELLED re: UPDATED NOTICE OF Telephone Conference previously scheduled for Wednesday 3/18/2020 at 3:00 PM before District Judge William E. Smith is hereby CANCELLED (Jackson, Ryan)
March 18, 2020 Opinion or Order TEXT ORDER entering #183 Third Stipulation and Consent Order Concerning Limited Discovery and Related Summary Judgment Motions filed by all parties. So Ordered by District Judge William E. Smith on 3/18/2020. (Jackson, Ryan)
March 18, 2020 Filing 183 Third STIPULATION re #170 Stipulation, #175 Stipulation Concerning Limited Discovery and Related Summary Judgment Motions filed by All Plaintiffs. (Wistow, Max)
March 16, 2020 UPDATED NOTICE OF Telephone Conference scheduled for Wednesday 3/18/2020 at 3:00 PM before District Judge William E. Smith; please note that the date and time of this conference have not changed, but it will now be conducted as a teleconference; dial-in instructions will be emailed to counsel shortly following this notice. (Jackson, Ryan)
March 16, 2020 Filing 182 NOTICE by Prospect CharterCARE, LLC Prospect CharterCare SJHSRI, LLC and Prospect CharterCare RWMC, LLC of the Withdrawal of Appearance of Joseph V. Cavanagh, Jr. and Joseph V. Cavanagh, III (Cavanagh, Joseph)
March 13, 2020 Filing 181 NOTICE of Appearance by Ronald F. Cascione on behalf of THOMAS HEMMENDINGER (Cascione, Ronald)
March 12, 2020 Filing 180 NOTICE of Appearance by Lisa M. Kresge on behalf of THOMAS HEMMENDINGER (Kresge, Lisa)
March 12, 2020 Filing 179 NOTICE of Appearance by Thomas S. Hemmendinger on behalf of THOMAS HEMMENDINGER (Hemmendinger, Thomas)
March 6, 2020 NOTICE of Hearing: Chambers Conference re: Discovery Dispute scheduled for Wednesday 3/18/2020 at 3:00 PM in Jury Assembly, 1st Floor, U.S. Courthouse (location subject to change) before District Judge William E. Smith. (Jackson, Ryan)
March 6, 2020 Filing 178 NOTICE of Appearance by Edward D. Pare, III on behalf of Prospect East Holdings, Inc., Prospect Medical Holdings, Inc. (Pare, Edward)
March 2, 2020 Filing 177 STIPULATION between Plaintiffs and The Angell Pension Group, Inc. filed by All Plaintiffs. (Wistow, Max)
March 2, 2020 Opinion or Order TEXT ORDER Entering #176 Plaintiffs' Notice of Dismissal with Prejudice of This Action as to Defendants CharterCARE Foundation and The Rhode Island Community Foundation Only filed by Stephen Del Sesto. So Ordered by District Judge William E. Smith on 3/2/2020. (Jackson, Ryan)
January 28, 2020 Filing 176 NOTICE by Stephen Del Sesto Plaintiffs' Notice of Dismissal with Prejudice of This Action as to Defendants CharterCARE Foundation and The Rhode Island Community Foundation Only (Wistow, Max)
January 13, 2020 HEARING CANCELLED re: Notice of Status Conference previously scheduled for Tuesday 1/28/2020 at 11:00 AM in the Judicial Conference Room, 2nd Floor, U.S. Courthouse before Judge William E. Smith is hereby CANCELLED in light of the entry of the Stipulation relating to the matters which were to have been the subject of the conference. (Jackson, Ryan)
January 13, 2020 Opinion or Order TEXT ORDER Entering #175 Stipulation and Schedule for Limited Discovery and Briefing Schedule on Related Summary Judgment Motions. So Ordered by District Judge William E. Smith on 1/13/2020. (Jackson, Ryan)
January 8, 2020 Filing 175 Consent STIPULATION re #170 Stipulation and Consent Order Concerning Limited Discovery and Related Summary Judgment Motions filed by All Plaintiffs. (Sheehan, Stephen)
January 8, 2020 NOTICE of Hearing: Status Conference scheduled for Tuesday 1/28/2020 at 11:00 AM in the Judicial Conference Room, 2nd Floor, U.S. Courthouse before District Judge William E. Smith. (Jackson, Ryan)
December 17, 2019 Filing 174 STATEMENT OF UNDISPUTED FACTS by All Plaintiffs re #173 MOTION for Summary Judgment on Count IV of the Complaint. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit 2, #3 Exhibit 3, #4 Exhibit 4, #5 Exhibit 5, #6 Exhibit 6, #7 Exhibit 7, #8 Exhibit 8, #9 Exhibit 9, #10 Exhibit 10, #11 Exhibit 11, #12 Exhibit 12, #13 Exhibit 13, #14 Exhibit 14, #15 Exhibit 15, #16 Exhibit 16, #17 Exhibit 17, #18 Exhibit 18, #19 Exhibit 19, #20 Exhibit 20, #21 Exhibit 21, #22 Exhibit 22, #23 Exhibit 23, #24 Exhibit 24, #25 Exhibit 25, #26 Exhibit 26)(Wistow, Max)
December 17, 2019 Filing 173 MOTION for Summary Judgment on Count IV of the Complaint filed by All Plaintiffs. Responses due by 12/31/2019. (Wistow, Max)
November 25, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 172 ORDER Entering #171 Stipulation filed by Prospect Medical Holdings, Inc., Prospect East Holdings, Inc. So Ordered by Chief Judge William E. Smith on 11/25/2019. (Jackson, Ryan)
November 7, 2019 Filing 171 STIPULATION and Proposed Order filed by Prospect East Holdings, Inc., Prospect Medical Holdings, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit Exhibit C)(Fragomeni, Christopher)
October 29, 2019 Opinion or Order TEXT ORDER entering #170 Stipulation and Proposed Order Concerning Limited Discovery and Related Summary Judgment Motion. Furthermore, based on the filing of the Stipulation, the Court hereby DENIES WITHOUT PREJUDICE #67 Motion to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim, #68 Motion to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim, and #70 Motion to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim. To the extent that any party wishes to raise an issue asserted in the motions to dismiss, it may do so at a later time in the proceedings, as contemplated by the Stipulation. Furthermore, in accordance with the schedule set forth by the parties, Plaintiffs' Motion for Summary Judgment as to Count IV shall be filed no earlier than November 29, 2019, and no later than December 29, 2019. The Defendants' responses and/or cross-motions for Summary Judgment will be due in accordance with the remainder of the schedule outlined in the Stipulation. So Ordered by Chief Judge William E. Smith on 10/29/2019. (Jackson, Ryan)
October 24, 2019 Opinion or Order TEXT ORDER adopting #165 Report and Recommendations, granting #64 Motion for Attorney Fees, and, granting #78 Motion for Attorney Fees: After considering the Report and Recommendations of the Special Master, and having heard no objections, the Court ACCEPTS and ADOPTS #165 Report and Recommendations in full. Accordingly, the Court GRANTS #64 Motion for Attorneys' Fees and #78 Second Motion for Attorneys' Fees. So Ordered by Chief Judge William E. Smith on 10/24/2019. (Jackson, Ryan)
October 22, 2019 Filing 170 STIPULATION AND PROPOSED ORDER CONCERNING LIMITED DISCOVERY AND RELATED SUMMARY JUDGMENT MOTIONS filed by All Plaintiffs. (Wistow, Max)
October 17, 2019 Filing 169 TRANSCRIPT of Fairness hearing held on 09/10/2019 before Judge Smith. Court Reporter/Transcriber Lisa Schwam, Telephone number 401-752-7128. Transcript may be viewed at the court public terminal or purchased through the Court Reporter/Transcriber before the deadline for Release of Transcript Restriction. After that date it may be obtained through PACER. NOTICE TO COUNSEL: Redaction Requests must be filed for personal identifiers only. All other redactions must be requested by motion. For local policy and sample redaction request visit our website at www.rid.uscourts.gov and select Transcripts under the Case Information menu option. Redaction Request due 11/7/2019. Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 11/18/2019. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 1/15/2020. (Schwam, Lisa)
October 17, 2019 Filing 168 TRANSCRIPT of Motion to Dismiss held on 09/10/2019 before Judge Smith. Court Reporter/Transcriber Lisa Schwam, Telephone number 401-752-7128. Transcript may be viewed at the court public terminal or purchased through the Court Reporter/Transcriber before the deadline for Release of Transcript Restriction. After that date it may be obtained through PACER. NOTICE TO COUNSEL: Redaction Requests must be filed for personal identifiers only. All other redactions must be requested by motion. For local policy and sample redaction request visit our website at www.rid.uscourts.gov and select Transcripts under the Case Information menu option. Redaction Request due 11/7/2019. Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 11/18/2019. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 1/15/2020. (Schwam, Lisa) (Simoncelli, Michael).
October 17, 2019 Filing 167 TRANSCRIPT ORDER ACKNOWLEDGMENT Entered re: #166 Transcript Order. Court Reporter/Transcriber: Lisa Schwam. (Dias, Jennifer)
October 16, 2019 Filing 166 TRANSCRIPT ORDER for proceedings held on 9/10/19 before Judge Smtih. Expedited Transcript selected. Transcript to be delivered within 7 calendar days.. (Boyajian, Steven)
October 14, 2019 Filing 165 REPORT AND RECOMMENDATIONS of Special Master re: #78 Second MOTION for Attorney Fees and #64 MOTION for Attorney Fees; Any party wishing to respond to or object to any Special Master report, statement and/or recommendation must file such response or objection with the Court within seven (7) days from the day the Special Master files the report, statement and/or recommendation via ECF. Any opposition shall be filed within five (5) days after the objection is filed. So Ordered by Deming E. Sherman, Special Master on 10/14/2019. (Jackson, Ryan)
October 9, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 164 MEMORANDUM AND ORDER Entering Final Approval of the Settlement pursuant to #124 Memorandum and Order granting preliminary approval of the Joint Motion for Settlement Class Certification, Appointment of Class Counsel, and Preliminary Approval by Plaintiffs and Defendants SJHSRI, RWH, and CCCB. So Ordered by Chief Judge William E. Smith on 10/9/2019. (Jackson, Ryan)
October 8, 2019 Filing 163 NOTICE by Stephen Del Sesto re #70 Joint MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM , #67 MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM CONCERNING AMENDED COMPLAINT, #68 MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM as to First Amended Complaint (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Sheehan, Stephen)
September 30, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 162 MEMORANDUM OF DECISION Entering Final Approval of the Settlement pursuant to #123 Order on Motion for Preliminary Approval of the Settlement. So Ordered by Chief Judge William E. Smith on 9/30/2019. (Jackson, Ryan)
September 27, 2019 Filing 161 DECLARATION of Stephen P. Sheehan by All Plaintiffs. (Wistow, Max)
September 26, 2019 Opinion or Order TEXT ORDER: The Court has reviewed #156 the Proposed Compensation and Budget submitted by the Special Master in accordance with #152 the Order Appointing a Special Master. No objection has been filed. The Court finds the compensation to be reasonable and therefore APPROVES the proposal set forth in ECF No. 156. So Ordered by Chief Judge William E. Smith on 9/26/2019. (Jackson, Ryan)
September 18, 2019 Filing 160 TRANSCRIPT ORDER ACKNOWLEDGMENT Entered re: #159 Transcript Order. Court Reporter/Transcriber: Lisa Schwam. (Simoncelli, Michael)
September 17, 2019 Filing 159 TRANSCRIPT ORDER for proceedings held on 8/29/2019 before Judge Smith. Expedited Transcript selected. Transcript to be delivered within 7 calendar days.. (Boyajian, Steven)
September 17, 2019 Filing 158 TRANSCRIPT of Motions held on 8/29/2019 before Judge Smith. Court Reporter/Transcriber Lisa Schwam, Telephone number 401-752-7128. Transcript may be viewed at the court public terminal or purchased through the Court Reporter/Transcriber before the deadline for Release of Transcript Restriction. After that date it may be obtained through PACER. NOTICE TO COUNSEL: Redaction Requests must be filed for personal identifiers only. All other redactions must be requested by motion. For local policy and sample redaction request visit our website at www.rid.uscourts.gov and select Transcripts under the Case Information menu option. Redaction Request due 10/8/2019. Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 10/18/2019. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 12/16/2019. (Schwam, Lisa)
September 16, 2019 Filing 157 NOTICE OF MEETING WITH SPECIAL MASTER by Deming E. Sherman: Thursday 9/26/19 at 2 PM in the Judicial Conference Room, 2nd Floor, U.S. Courthouse (Jackson, Ryan)
September 16, 2019 Filing 156 PROPOSED COMPENSATION AND BUDGET OF THE SPECIAL MASTER by Deming E. Sherman (Jackson, Ryan)
September 10, 2019 Opinion or Order TEXT ORDER: For the reason stated in the 9/10/2019 hearing, the Court finds the following as moot #49 Motion to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim; #50 MOTION Request for Judicial Notice ; #51 Motion to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim; #52 Motion to Dismiss; #54 Motion to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim. So Ordered by Chief Judge William E. Smith on 9/10/2019. (Potter, Carrie)
September 10, 2019 Minute Entry for proceedings held before Chief Judge William E. Smith: Motion Hearing held on 9/10/2019 re #70 Joint MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM filed by Prospect Medical Holdings, Inc., Prospect Chartercare RWMC, LLC, Prospect East Holdings, Inc., Prospect CharterCARE, LLC, Prospect CharterCare SJHSRI, LLC, #49 MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM filed by The Angell Pension Group, Inc., #67 MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM CONCERNING AMENDED COMPLAINT filed by Diocesan Administration Corporation, Roman Catholic Bishop of Providence, Diocesan Service Corporation, #68 MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM as to First Amended Complaint filed by The Angell Pension Group, Inc., #54 MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM filed by Diocesan Administration Corporation, Roman Catholic Bishop of Providence, Diocesan Service Corporation, #52 MOTION to Dismiss filed by CharterCARE Foundation, #51 Joint MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM filed by Prospect Medical Holdings, Inc., Prospect Chartercare RWMC, LLC, Prospect East Holdings, Inc., Prospect CharterCARE, LLC, Prospect CharterCare SJHSRI, LLC, #50 MOTION Request for Judicial Notice filed by The Angell Pension Group, Inc..: S. Sheehan for the Plaintiffs, D. Godafsky for The Angell Pension Group, H. Merten and P. Lessimian, Diocesan Defendants, J. McGowan and D. Wagner for Prospect Defendants. Defendants and Plaintiffs argue Motions to Dismiss. Court finds ECF 49, 50, 51, 51 and 54 as moot. Court orders parties to file a Joint Proposed Discovery Schedule. If the parties cannot agree, they must file a Proposed Discovery Schedule separately. Recess. (Court Reporter Lisa Schwam in Courtroom 3 at 2:05 p.m..) (Potter, Carrie)
September 10, 2019 Filing 155 EXHIBIT IN SUPPORT by All Plaintiffs in support of Oral MOTION to Supplement the Record to add one page to the Operative Plan, Order on Motion for Miscellaneous Relief St. Joseph Health Services of Rhode Island Retirement Plan 8.1. (Wistow, Max)
September 10, 2019 Filing 154 Exhibit/Witness List. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit)(Potter, Carrie)
September 10, 2019 Opinion or Order TEXT ORDER granting Oral MOTION to Supplement the Record to add one page to the Operative Plan. So Ordered by Chief Judge William E. Smith on 9/10/2019. (Potter, Carrie)
September 10, 2019 Oral MOTION to Supplement the Record to add one page to the Operative Plan filed by All Plaintiffs. Responses due by 9/24/2019. (Potter, Carrie)
September 10, 2019 Minute Entry for proceedings held before Chief Judge William E. Smith: Fairness Hearing held on 9/10/2019. S. Sheehan for the Plaintiff, P. Halperin for the Prospect Defendants, P. Kessimian for the Diocesan Defendants. Arguments heard regarding Settlement A from Plaintiffs and non-settling Defendants. 1 Exhibit entered. Plaintiffs Oral Motion to Supplement one page of the Operative Plan. Motion granted. Court takes under advisement. Written decision to follow. (Court Reporter Lisa Schwam in Courtroom 3 at 10:04.) (Potter, Carrie)
September 10, 2019 Filing 153 AFFIDAVIT of Deming E. Sherman, Esq. (Potter, Carrie)
September 9, 2019 UPDATED NOTICE of Hearing: FINAL Hearing re: Settlement and Class Certification pursuant to #124 Memorandum and Order granting #63 Joint MOTION for Settlement and Settlement Class Certification is scheduled for TUESDAY 9/10/2019 at 10:00 AM in Courtroom 3 before Chief Judge William E. Smith; please note the change of location; the hearing on the various motions to dismiss will commence as previously scheduled and noticed (on 8/5/19), also in Courtroom 3. (Jackson, Ryan)
September 5, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 152 ORDER APPOINTING SPECIAL MASTER: The Court has selected Deming Sherman, Esq. to serve as Special Master in this matter. So Ordered by Chief Judge William E. Smith on 9/5/2019. (Jackson, Ryan)
September 3, 2019 Filing 151 DECLARATION re #144 Declaration, #150 Reply Memorandum, #149 Reply Memorandum Second Declaration of Stephen Del Sesto in Support of Settlement A by All Plaintiffs. (Wistow, Max)
September 3, 2019 Filing 150 REPLY MEMORANDUM re #64 MOTION for Attorney Fees , #147 Response to Motion,, #146 Response to Motion, . (Wistow, Max)
September 3, 2019 Filing 149 REPLY MEMORANDUM re #147 Response to Motion,, #63 Joint MOTION for Settlement and Settlement Class Certification, #146 Response to Motion, . (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit 2, #3 Exhibit 3)(Wistow, Max)
September 3, 2019 Filing 148 REPLY MEMORANDUM re #147 Response to Motion,, . (Attachments: #1 Exhibit, #2 Exhibit)(Fine, Robert)
August 29, 2019 Minute Entry for proceedings held before Chief Judge William E. Smith: Fairness Hearing held on 8/29/2019. S. Sheehan, Esq. and M. Wistow, Esq. for Mr. Del Sesto; R. Conn for CharterCare Foundation; P. Halperin, Esq. for the Prospect Defendants; H. Merten, Esq. for the Diocesan Defendants. Statements regarding Settlement heard from Plaintiffs, Defendants and Objectors. The Court intends to appoint D. Sherman as Special Master. Order to issue. Court approves Settlement Agreement. Order to issue. Recess. (Court Reporter Lisa Schwam in Courtroom 3 at 10:07.) (Potter, Carrie)
August 27, 2019 Filing 147 RESPONSE In Opposition to #63 Joint MOTION for Settlement and Settlement Class Certification filed by Prospect CharterCARE, LLC, Prospect CharterCare SJHSRI, LLC, Prospect Chartercare RWMC, LLC, Prospect East Holdings, Inc., Prospect Medical Holdings, Inc.. Replies due by 9/3/2019. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit 2, #3 Exhibit 3, #4 Exhibit 4, #5 Exhibit 5, #6 Exhibit 6, #7 Exhibit 7, #8 Exhibit 8)(Halperin, Preston)
August 27, 2019 Filing 146 RESPONSE In Opposition to #64 MOTION for Attorney Fees , #63 Joint MOTION for Settlement and Settlement Class Certification concerning Settlement A filed by Diocesan Administration Corporation, Diocesan Service Corporation, Roman Catholic Bishop of Providence. Replies due by 9/3/2019. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B)(Merten, Howard)
August 15, 2019 Filing 145 DECLARATION re #78 Second MOTION for Attorney Fees , #64 MOTION for Attorney Fees , and #63 Joint MOTION for Settlement and Settlement Class Certification: Second Supplemental Declaration of Max Wistow by All Plaintiffs. (Wistow, Max) Modified on 8/19/2019: added additional related document, ECF No. 63 (Jackson, Ryan).
August 15, 2019 Filing 144 DECLARATION re: #78 Second MOTION for Attorney Fees , #64 MOTION for Attorney Fees , and #63 Joint MOTION for Settlement and Settlement Class Certification: Declaration of Stephen Del Sesto by All Plaintiffs. (Wistow, Max) Modified on 8/19/2019: added additional related document, ECF No. 63 (Jackson, Ryan).
August 15, 2019 Filing 143 DECLARATION re: #78 Second MOTION for Attorney Fees , #64 MOTION for Attorney Fees , and #63 Joint MOTION for Settlement and Settlement Class Certification: Declaration of Jeffrey W. Kasle by All Plaintiffs. (Wistow, Max) Modified on 8/19/2019 (Jackson, Ryan).
August 15, 2019 Filing 142 AFFIDAVIT re: #78 Second MOTION for Attorney Fees , #64 MOTION for Attorney Fees , and #63 Joint MOTION for Settlement and Settlement Class Certification: Affidavit of Arlene Violet by All Plaintiffs. (Wistow, Max) Modified on 8/19/2019 (Jackson, Ryan).
August 15, 2019 Filing 141 DECLARATION re: #78 Second MOTION for Attorney Fees , #64 MOTION for Attorney Fees , and #63 Joint MOTION for Settlement and Settlement Class Certification: Declaration of Christopher Callaci by All Plaintiffs. (Wistow, Max) Modified on 8/19/2019 (Jackson, Ryan).
August 15, 2019 Filing 140 SUPPLEMENTAL MEMORANDUM by All Plaintiffs in support of #78 Second MOTION for Attorney Fees . (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1)(Wistow, Max)
August 15, 2019 Filing 139 SUPPLEMENTAL MEMORANDUM by All Plaintiffs in support of #77 Joint MOTION for Settlement and Settlement Class Certification . (Wistow, Max)
August 15, 2019 Filing 138 RESPONSE In Opposition to #77 Joint MOTION for Settlement and Settlement Class Certification in connection with 8-29-19 final approval hearing filed by Prospect CharterCARE, LLC, Prospect CharterCare SJHSRI, LLC, Prospect Chartercare RWMC, LLC, Prospect East Holdings, Inc., Prospect Medical Holdings, Inc.. Replies due by 8/22/2019. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit Exhibit B)(Halperin, Preston)
August 15, 2019 Filing 137 SUPPLEMENTAL MEMORANDUM by CharterCARE Foundation in support of #77 Joint MOTION for Settlement and Settlement Class Certification . (Dennington, Andrew)
August 15, 2019 Filing 136 RESPONSE In Opposition to #78 Second MOTION for Attorney Fees , #77 Joint MOTION for Settlement and Settlement Class Certification in connection with 8-29-19 final approval hearing filed by Diocesan Administration Corporation, Diocesan Service Corporation, Roman Catholic Bishop of Providence. Replies due by 8/22/2019. (Merten, Howard)
August 14, 2019 Filing 135 DECLARATION Regarding Compliance with CAFA Notice Requirements Concerning CCF Settlement by CharterCARE Foundation. (Dennington, Andrew)
August 5, 2019 NOTICE of Hearing on #54 MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM, #68 MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM as to First Amended Complaint, #50 MOTION Request for Judicial Notice, #51 Joint MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM, #49 MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM, #52 MOTION to Dismiss, #67 MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM CONCERNING AMENDED COMPLAINT, #70 Joint MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM: Motion Hearing scheduled for Tuesday 9/10/2019 at 2:00 PM in Courtroom 3 before Chief Judge William E. Smith; this hearing will follow the morning's Final Fairness Hearing. (Jackson, Ryan)
August 5, 2019 Minute Entry for proceedings held before Chief Judge William E. Smith: Telephonic Status Conference held on 8/5/2019; counsel on call: M. Wistow, S. Sheehan; P. Halperin; R. Conn; R. Fine; P. Kessimian. (Jackson, Ryan)
July 30, 2019 Filing 134 NOTICE of Appearance by Steven E. Snow on behalf of Diocesan Administration Corporation, Diocesan Service Corporation, Roman Catholic Bishop of Providence (Snow, Steven)
July 30, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 133 STIPULATION and Order Re Non-Waiver of Attorney Client Privilege filed by All Plaintiffs. (Sheehan, Stephen)
July 29, 2019 NOTICE of Hearing: Telephonic Status Conference set for Monday, 8/5/2019 at 2:00 PM before Chief Judge William E. Smith. The Court will send call-in instructions prior to the day of the conference to all listed counsel, via email. (Urizandi, Nisshy)
July 23, 2019 Filing 132 STIPULATION as to non-waiver of Attorney-Client privilege filed by CharterCARE Community Board. (Fine, Robert)
July 8, 2019 Filing 131 SUPPLEMENTAL MEMORANDUM by All Plaintiffs in opposition to #70 Joint MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM , #68 MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM as to First Amended Complaint, #127 Supplemental Memorandum in Support,, . (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1)(Wistow, Max)
July 8, 2019 Filing 130 SUPPLEMENTAL MEMORANDUM by All Plaintiffs in opposition to #67 MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM CONCERNING AMENDED COMPLAINT, #126 Supplemental Memorandum in Support, . (Wistow, Max)
July 2, 2019 Filing 129 DECLARATION re #124 Order on Motion for Settlement,,, Order on Motion for Discovery,, of Notice of Proposed Settlement by CharterCARE Community Board. (Attachments: #1 Second Declaration of Notice, #2 Third Declaration of Notice)(Fine, Robert)
June 14, 2019 Filing 128 RESPONSE IN OPPOSITION by Lydia Corvese re #123 Order on Motion for Settlement. (Attachments: #1 Envelope)(Jackson, Kerrie)
June 14, 2019 Filing 127 SUPPLEMENTAL MEMORANDUM by Prospect CharterCARE, LLC, Prospect CharterCare SJHSRI, LLC, Prospect Chartercare RWMC, LLC, Prospect East Holdings, Inc., Prospect Medical Holdings, Inc. in support of #70 Joint MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM , #68 MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM as to First Amended Complaint Joint Motion with Angel Pension Group. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit Exhibit 2, #3 Exhibit Exhibit 3, #4 Exhibit Exhibit 4, #5 Exhibit Exhibit 5)(Fragomeni, Christopher)
June 14, 2019 Filing 126 SUPPLEMENTAL MEMORANDUM by Diocesan Administration Corporation, Diocesan Service Corporation, Roman Catholic Bishop of Providence in support of #67 MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM CONCERNING AMENDED COMPLAINT . (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit 2)(Merten, Howard)
June 10, 2019 Opinion or Order TEXT ORDER entering #125 Stipulation. Defendants The Angell Pension Group, Inc., Roman Catholic Bishop of Providence, a corporation sole, Diocesan Administration Corporation, Diocesan Service Corporation, Prospect Medical Holdings, Inc., Prospect East Holdings, Inc., Prospect CharterCare, LLC, Prospect CharterCare SJHSRI, LLC, and Prospect CharterCare RWMC, LLC (collectively the "Non-Settling Defendants") shall have up to and including June 14, 2019 to file their supplemental memoranda. The Plaintiffs and Defendants St. Joseph Health Services of Rhode Island, Roger Williams Hospital, and CharterCare Community Board shall have up to and including July 8, 2019 to file their replies to the Non-Settling Defendants' supplemental memoranda - So Ordered by Chief Judge William E. Smith on 6/10/2019. (Urizandi, Nisshy)
June 7, 2019 Filing 125 STIPULATION filed by All Plaintiffs. (Wistow, Max)
June 6, 2019 NOTICE of Hearing: FINAL Hearing re: Settlement and Class Certification pursuant to #124 Memorandum and Order granting #63 Joint MOTION for Settlement and Settlement Class Certification is scheduled for Tuesday, 9/10/2019 at 10:00 AM in Courtroom 2 before Chief Judge William E. Smith. (Urizandi, Nisshy)
June 6, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 124 MEMORANDUM AND ORDER: The Joint Motion for Settlement Class Certification, Appointment of Class Counsel, and Preliminary Approval by Plaintiffs and Defendants SJHSRI, RWH, and CCCB (ECF No. #63 ) ("Joint Mot.") is GRANTED. The Joint Motion for Leave to Propound Limited Discovery Related to the Settlement Agreement Between Plaintiffs and CCCB (ECF No. #103 ) is also GRANTED. All parties shall have sixty days from the date of this Order to propound and complete any discovery in accordance with the terms set forth within - So Ordered by Chief Judge William E. Smith on 6/6/2019. (Urizandi, Nisshy)
May 20, 2019 NOTICE of Hearing: FINAL Hearing re: Settlement Approval and Class Certification pursuant to #123 Memorandum and Order granting #77 Joint MOTION for Settlement Class Certification, Appointment of Class Counsel, and Preliminary Settlement Approval: Scheduled for Thursday 8/29/2019 at 10:00 AM in Courtroom 3 before Chief Judge William E. Smith. (Jackson, Ryan)
May 17, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 123 MEMORANDUM AND ORDER granting #77 Joint MOTION for Settlement Class Certification, Appointment of Class Counsel, and Preliminary Settlement Approval. So Ordered by Chief Judge William E. Smith on 5/17/2019. (Simoncelli, Michael)
May 14, 2019 Minute Entry for proceedings held before Chief Judge William E. Smith: Telephone Conference held on 5/14/2019; counsel on call: S. Sheehan, M. Wistow; P. Halperin; D. Godofosky; A. Dennington; S. Del Sesto. (Jackson, Ryan)
May 13, 2019 NOTICE of Hearing: Telephone Conference re: Receiver's Ninth Interim Report scheduled for Tuesday 5/14/2019 at 10:00 AM before Chief Judge William E. Smith; dial-in instructions will be provided to counsel shortly. (Jackson, Ryan)
April 1, 2019 Minute Entry for proceedings held before Chief Judge William E. Smith and RI Superior Court Justice Brian P. Stern: In Chambers Conference held on 4/1/2019; counsel of record present for all parties as well as counsel from the Office of RI Attorney General. (Jackson, Ryan)
March 27, 2019 Filing 122 REPLY to Response re #73 Response to Motion, Join in with Plaintiff's opposition filed by St. Joseph Health Services of Rhode Island. (Fine, Robert)
March 26, 2019 Filing 121 REPLY MEMORANDUM re #116 Supplemental Memorandum in Opposition, #117 Notice (Other) . (Wistow, Max)
March 26, 2019 Filing 120 REPLY MEMORANDUM re #115 Supplemental Memorandum in Opposition, . (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1)(Wistow, Max)
March 26, 2019 Filing 119 REPLY MEMORANDUM re #115 Supplemental Memorandum in Opposition, . (Fine, Robert)
March 14, 2019 Filing 118 TRANSCRIPT of Motion hearing held on 2/12/2019 before Judge Smith. Court Reporter/Transcriber Lisa Schwam, Telephone number 401-752-7128. Transcript may be viewed at the court public terminal or purchased through the Court Reporter/Transcriber before the deadline for Release of Transcript Restriction. After that date it may be obtained through PACER. NOTICE TO COUNSEL: Redaction Requests must be filed for personal identifiers only. All other redactions must be requested by motion. For local policy and sample redaction request visit our website at www.rid.uscourts.gov and select Transcripts under the Case Information menu option. Redaction Request due 4/4/2019. Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 4/15/2019. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 6/12/2019. (Schwam, Lisa)
March 12, 2019 Filing 117 NOTICE by The Angell Pension Group, Inc. of position regarding the appointment of a receiver (Boyajian, Steven)
March 12, 2019 Filing 116 SUPPLEMENTAL MEMORANDUM by Prospect CharterCARE, LLC, Prospect CharterCare SJHSRI, LLC, Prospect Chartercare RWMC, LLC, Prospect East Holdings, Inc., Prospect Medical Holdings, Inc. in opposition to #63 Joint MOTION for Settlement and Settlement Class Certification . (Fragomeni, Christopher)
March 12, 2019 Filing 115 SUPPLEMENTAL MEMORANDUM by Diocesan Administration Corporation, Diocesan Service Corporation, Roman Catholic Bishop of Providence in opposition to #63 Joint MOTION for Settlement and Settlement Class Certification . (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A)(Merten, Howard)
March 12, 2019 NOTICE of Hearing: In Chambers Conference scheduled for Monday 4/1/2019 at 2:00 PM in Chambers (location within U.S. Courthouse subject to change) before Chief Judge William E. Smith. (Jackson, Ryan)
March 4, 2019 Filing 114 REPLY to Response re #96 Response to Motion, filed by Diocesan Administration Corporation, Diocesan Service Corporation, Roman Catholic Bishop of Providence. (Merten, Howard)
March 4, 2019 Filing 113 REPLY to Response re #99 Response to Motion, filed by Prospect CharterCARE, LLC, Prospect CharterCare SJHSRI, LLC, Prospect Chartercare RWMC, LLC, Prospect East Holdings, Inc., Prospect Medical Holdings, Inc.. (Fragomeni, Christopher)
March 4, 2019 Filing 112 REPLY MEMORANDUM re #98 Response in Opposition, to Request for Judicial Notice. (Attachments: #1 Appendix)(Boyajian, Steven)
March 4, 2019 Filing 111 REPLY to Response re #97 Response to Motion, filed by The Angell Pension Group, Inc.. (Boyajian, Steven)
March 4, 2019 Filing 110 RESPONSE In Opposition to #103 Joint MOTION for Discovery (Joint Motion to Propound Limited Discovery Relating to Settlement Between Plaintiffs and CharterCare Community Board) filed by All Plaintiffs. Replies due by 3/11/2019. (Attachments: #1 Supporting Memorandum)(Wistow, Max)
February 26, 2019 Filing 109 SUPPLEMENTAL MEMORANDUM by All Plaintiffs in support of #63 Joint MOTION for Settlement and Settlement Class Certification, Motion Hearing,, Post Hearing Memorandum. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Affidavit (Exhibit 2))(Wistow, Max)
February 26, 2019 Filing 108 NOTICE by Stephen Del Sesto re #63 Joint MOTION for Settlement and Settlement Class Certification, Motion Hearing,, Notice of Proposed Orders (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order (Tab 1 - Plaintiffs' and Settling Defendants' proposed order), #2 Proposed Order (Tab 2 - Prospect Defendants' and Diocesan Defendants' proposed order), #3 Exhibit (Tab 3 - redline of proposed orders))(Wistow, Max)
February 26, 2019 Opinion or Order TEXT ORDER granting #107 Joint MOTION to Set Briefing Schedule. So Ordered by Chief Judge William E. Smith on 2/26/2019. (Jackson, Ryan)
February 26, 2019 Filing 107 Joint MOTION to Set Briefing Schedule filed by All Plaintiffs. Responses due by 3/12/2019. (Wistow, Max) Docket Text Modified on 2/26/2019 (Farrell Pletcher, Paula).
February 21, 2019 Filing 106 NOTICE by the Attorney General to Not Intervene filed by Michael W Field (Field, Michael) Docket Text Modified on 2/26/2019 (Farrell Pletcher, Paula).
February 19, 2019 Filing 105 TRANSCRIPT ORDER ACKNOWLEDGMENT Entered re: #104 Transcript Order. Court Reporter/Transcriber: Lisa Schwam. (Dias, Jennifer)
February 19, 2019 Filing 104 TRANSCRIPT ORDER for proceedings held on 02/12/2019 before Judge William Smith. Ordinary Transcript delivery selected. Transcript to be delivered in 30 days.. (Del Sesto, Stephen)
February 18, 2019 Filing 103 Joint MOTION for Discovery (Joint Motion to Propound Limited Discovery Relating to Settlement Between Plaintiffs and CharterCare Community Board) filed by Prospect CharterCARE, LLC, Prospect CharterCare SJHSRI, LLC, Prospect Chartercare RWMC, LLC, Prospect East Holdings, Inc., Prospect Medical Holdings, Inc.. Responses due by 3/4/2019. (Halperin, Preston)
February 12, 2019 Minute Entry for proceedings held before Chief Judge William E. Smith: Motion Hearing held on 2/12/2019 re #63 Joint MOTION for Settlement and Settlement Class Certification. Ledsham, Sheehan and Del Sesto for the Plaintiffs. Kessimian, Halperin, McGowan, Jr., Merten, Boyajian, Sullivan, Fragomeni, Russo, Wollin and Land for the Defendants. Court addresses. Counsel argue motion. Court takes motion under advisement. (Court Reporter Lisa Schwam in Courtroom 3 at 10:10.) (Jackson, Kerrie)
February 6, 2019 Opinion or Order TEXT ORDER denying #102 Motion for Leave to File: Plaintiffs' Motion for Leave to File A Response to the Prospect Defendants' Sur-Reply (ECF No. 102) is DENIED. So Ordered by Chief Judge William E. Smith on 2/6/2019. (Jackson, Ryan)
February 6, 2019 Filing 102 MOTION for Leave to File Document response to Prospect Defendants' sur-reply filed by All Plaintiffs. Responses due by 2/20/2019. (Wistow, Max)
February 5, 2019 Filing 101 SUR-REPLY to Reply to Motion Response re #73 Response to Motion, filed by Prospect CharterCARE, LLC, Prospect CharterCare SJHSRI, LLC, Prospect Chartercare RWMC, LLC, Prospect East Holdings, Inc., Prospect Medical Holdings, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A complaint, #2 Exhibit B)(Halperin, Preston)
February 4, 2019 Filing 100 SUPPLEMENTAL MEMORANDUM by All Plaintiffs in opposition to #70 Joint MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM , #67 MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM CONCERNING AMENDED COMPLAINT, #68 MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM as to First Amended Complaint (Omnibus Memorandum). (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit 2)(Wistow, Max)
February 4, 2019 Filing 99 RESPONSE In Opposition to #70 Joint MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM filed by All Plaintiffs. Replies due by 2/11/2019. (Attachments: #1 Supporting Memorandum, #2 Exhibit 1)(Wistow, Max)
February 4, 2019 Filing 98 RESPONSE IN OPPOSITION by Donna Boutelle, Ralph Bryden, Stephen Del Sesto, Eugenia Levesque, Gail J. Major, Caroll Short, Dorothy Willner, Nancy Zompa re #69 Notice (Other) . (Attachments: #1 Supporting Memorandum, #2 Exhibit 1)(Wistow, Max)
February 4, 2019 Filing 97 RESPONSE In Opposition to #68 MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM as to First Amended Complaint filed by All Plaintiffs. Replies due by 2/11/2019. (Attachments: #1 Supporting Memorandum)(Wistow, Max)
February 4, 2019 Filing 96 RESPONSE In Opposition to #67 MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM CONCERNING AMENDED COMPLAINT filed by All Plaintiffs. Replies due by 2/11/2019. (Attachments: #1 Supporting Memorandum, #2 Exhibit 1)(Wistow, Max)
February 4, 2019 Reset Hearings re: Notice of Hearing on #63 Joint MOTION for Settlement and Settlement Class Certification : Motion Hearing RE-SCHEDULED to TUESDAY 2/12/2019 at 10:00 AM in Courtroom 3 before Chief Judge William E. Smith. ECF #64 Motion for Attorney Fees has been removed from the schedule for this hearing and will be heard at a date to be determined; the hearing previously scheduled for 2/7/19 is hereby CANCELLED. (Jackson, Ryan)
January 30, 2019 Opinion or Order AMENDED TEXT ORDER granting #87 Motion for Leave to File Sur-Reply; any sur-reply is to be filed on or before 2/5/19 at 5 PM. So Ordered by Chief Judge William E. Smith on 1/30/2019. (Jackson, Ryan) Modified on 1/30/2019 (Jackson, Ryan).
January 30, 2019 Opinion or Order TEXT ORDER granting #95 Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice of John McGowan, Jr.. So Ordered by Chief Judge William E. Smith on 1/30/2019. (Potter, Carrie)
January 29, 2019 Filing 95 MOTION for John McGowan, Jr. to Appear Pro Hac Vice ( filing fee paid $ 100.00, receipt number 0103-1317025 ) filed by Prospect East Holdings, Inc., Prospect Medical Holdings, Inc.. (Halperin, Preston)
January 29, 2019 Filing 94 RESPONSE In Opposition to #87 Joint MOTION for Leave to File Document sur-reply filed by CharterCARE Community Board, Roger Williams Hospital, St. Joseph Health Services of Rhode Island. Replies due by 2/5/2019. (Fine, Robert)
January 29, 2019 Filing 93 REPLY to Response re #89 Reply to Response, #80 Response to Motion, filed by CharterCARE Community Board, Roger Williams Hospital, St. Joseph Health Services of Rhode Island. (Fine, Robert)
January 29, 2019 Filing 92 REPLY to Response re #81 Response to Motion, #88 Reply to Response filed by CharterCARE Community Board, Roger Williams Hospital, St. Joseph Health Services of Rhode Island. (Fine, Robert)
January 28, 2019 Filing 91 RESPONSE In Opposition to #87 Joint MOTION for Leave to File Document sur-reply filed by All Plaintiffs. Replies due by 2/4/2019. (Wistow, Max)
January 28, 2019 Filing 90 NOTICE of Appearance by Christine E. Dieter on behalf of The Rhode Island Community Foundation (Dieter, Christine)
January 25, 2019 Filing 89 REPLY to Response re #80 Response to Motion, filed by All Plaintiffs. (Wistow, Max)
January 25, 2019 Filing 88 REPLY to Response re #81 Response to Motion, filed by Donna Boutelle, Ralph Bryden, Stephen Del Sesto, Eugenia Levesque, Gail J. Major, Caroll Short, Dorothy Willner, Nancy Zompa. (Wistow, Max)
January 25, 2019 Filing 87 Joint MOTION for Leave to File Document sur-reply filed by Prospect CharterCARE, LLC, Prospect CharterCare SJHSRI, LLC, Prospect Chartercare RWMC, LLC, Prospect East Holdings, Inc., Prospect Medical Holdings, Inc.. Responses due by 2/8/2019. (Fragomeni, Christopher)
January 25, 2019 Filing 86 REPLY to Response re #75 Response to Motion, filed by CharterCARE Foundation. (Dennington, Andrew)
January 23, 2019 AMENDED NOTICE of Hearing on #63 Joint MOTION for Settlement and Settlement Class Certification : Motion Hearing scheduled for Thursday 2/7/2019 at 2:00 PM in Courtroom 3 before Chief Judge William E. Smith. (Jackson, Ryan) Modified on 1/25/2019: #64 Motion for Attorney Fees has been removed from the schedule for this hearing and will be heard at a date to be determined (Jackson, Ryan).
January 22, 2019 Filing 85 REPLY to Response re #83 Reply to Response filed by CharterCARE Community Board, Roger Williams Hospital, St. Joseph Health Services of Rhode Island. (Fine, Robert)
January 22, 2019 Filing 84 REPLY to Response re #82 Reply to Response filed by CharterCARE Community Board, Roger Williams Hospital, St. Joseph Health Services of Rhode Island. (Fine, Robert)
January 21, 2019 Filing 83 REPLY to Response re #75 Response to Motion, filed by All Plaintiffs. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Affidavit of Jeffrey B. Cohen)(Wistow, Max)
January 21, 2019 Filing 82 REPLY to Response re #73 Response to Motion, filed by All Plaintiffs. (Wistow, Max)
January 18, 2019 Filing 81 RESPONSE In Opposition to #77 Joint MOTION for Settlement and Settlement Class Certification filed by Prospect CharterCARE, LLC, Prospect CharterCare SJHSRI, LLC, Prospect Chartercare RWMC, LLC, Prospect East Holdings, Inc., Prospect Medical Holdings, Inc.. Replies due by 1/25/2019. (Fragomeni, Christopher)
January 18, 2019 Filing 80 RESPONSE In Opposition to #78 Second MOTION for Attorney Fees , #77 Joint MOTION for Settlement and Settlement Class Certification filed by Diocesan Administration Corporation, Diocesan Service Corporation, Roman Catholic Bishop of Providence. Replies due by 1/25/2019. (Merten, Howard)
January 17, 2019 Opinion or Order TEXT ORDER Entering #71 Stipulation, filed by Diocesan Administration Corporation, Roman Catholic Bishop of Providence, Diocesan Service Corporation. So Ordered by Chief Judge William E. Smith on 1/17/2019. (Jackson, Ryan)
January 17, 2019 Opinion or Order TEXT ORDER granting #66 Motion to Stay: The Court GRANTS the Joint Motion to Stay Response to Amended Complaint (ECF No. 66). Defendant CharterCARE Foundation's time to respond to the Complaint is enlarged until 30 days after the latest of the following events: (a) the Superior Court in the Receivership Proceeding refuses to approve the Proposed Settlement, (b) this Court refuses to approve the Proposed Settlement, or (c) the Superior Court in the 2015 Cy Pres Action (including after an appeal to the Rhode Island Supreme Court) refuses to enter the Cy Pres Final Judgment. This order shall apply nunc pro tunc to December 4, 2018. So Ordered by Chief Judge William E. Smith on 1/17/2019. (Jackson, Ryan)
January 4, 2019 Filing 79 DECLARATION re #78 Second MOTION for Attorney Fees , #77 Joint MOTION for Settlement and Settlement Class Certification (Supplemental Declaration) by All Plaintiffs. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit 2, #3 Exhibit 3, #4 Exhibit 4, #5 Exhibit 5, #6 Exhibit 6, #7 Exhibit 7, #8 Exhibit 8)(Wistow, Max)
January 4, 2019 Filing 78 Second MOTION for Attorney Fees filed by All Plaintiffs. Responses due by 1/18/2019. (Attachments: #1 Supporting Memorandum)(Wistow, Max)
January 4, 2019 Filing 77 Joint MOTION for Settlement and Settlement Class Certification filed by All Plaintiffs. Responses due by 1/18/2019. (Attachments: #1 Supporting Memorandum, #2 Exhibit 1)(Wistow, Max)
December 27, 2018 Filing 76 NOTICE by Prospect CharterCARE, LLC, Prospect CharterCare SJHSRI, LLC, Prospect Chartercare RWMC, LLC Notice of Withdrawal of Appearance of Lynne Barry Dolan (Dolan, Lynne)
December 27, 2018 Opinion or Order TEXT ORDER entering #71 Stipulation. Responses to #63 Joint Motion for Settlement and Settlement Class Certification and #64 Motion for Attorney Fees shall be filed by 12/24/2018; Replies shall be filed by 1/21/2019 - So Ordered by Chief Judge William E. Smith on 12/27/2018. (Urizandi, Nisshy)
December 24, 2018 Filing 75 RESPONSE In Opposition to #63 Joint MOTION for Settlement and Settlement Class Certification filed by Prospect CharterCARE, LLC, Prospect CharterCare SJHSRI, LLC, Prospect Chartercare RWMC, LLC, Prospect East Holdings, Inc., Prospect Medical Holdings, Inc.. Replies due by 12/31/2018. (Attachments: #1 Supporting Memorandum)(Fragomeni, Christopher)
December 21, 2018 Filing 74 NOTICE by Diocesan Administration Corporation, Diocesan Service Corporation, Roman Catholic Bishop of Providence re #73 Response to Motion, Constitutional Challenge (Merten, Howard)
December 21, 2018 Filing 73 RESPONSE In Opposition to #63 Joint MOTION for Settlement and Settlement Class Certification, #64 MOTION for Attorney Fees filed by Diocesan Administration Corporation, Diocesan Service Corporation, Roman Catholic Bishop of Providence. Replies due by 12/28/2018. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit 2, #3 Exhibit 3, #4 Exhibit 4, #5 Exhibit 5)(Merten, Howard)
December 20, 2018 Filing 72 NOTICE of Appearance by William Mark Russo on behalf of Prospect CharterCARE, LLC, Prospect CharterCare SJHSRI, LLC, Prospect Chartercare RWMC, LLC (Russo, William)
December 5, 2018 Filing 71 Joint STIPULATION re #64 MOTION for Attorney Fees , #63 Joint MOTION for Settlement and Settlement Class Certification by ALL PARTIES filed by Diocesan Administration Corporation, Diocesan Service Corporation, Roman Catholic Bishop of Providence. (Merten, Howard)
December 4, 2018 Filing 70 Joint MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM filed by Prospect CharterCARE, LLC, Prospect CharterCare SJHSRI, LLC, Prospect Chartercare RWMC, LLC, Prospect East Holdings, Inc., Prospect Medical Holdings, Inc.. Responses due by 12/18/2018. (Attachments: #1 Supporting Memorandum)(Wagner, Dean)
December 4, 2018 Filing 69 NOTICE by The Angell Pension Group, Inc. as to Request for Judicial Notice Pursuant ot Federal Rule of Evidence 201 (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1)(Boyajian, Steven)
December 4, 2018 Filing 68 MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM as to First Amended Complaint filed by The Angell Pension Group, Inc.. Responses due by 12/18/2018. (Attachments: #1 Supporting Memorandum, #2 Exhibit A, #3 Exhibit B, #4 Exhibit C, #5 Exhibit D, #6 Exhibit E)(Boyajian, Steven)
December 4, 2018 Filing 67 MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM CONCERNING AMENDED COMPLAINT filed by Diocesan Administration Corporation, Diocesan Service Corporation, Roman Catholic Bishop of Providence. Responses due by 12/18/2018. (Attachments: #1 Supporting Memorandum, #2 Exhibit 1, #3 Exhibit 2, #4 Exhibit 3, #5 Exhibit 4, #6 Exhibit 5, #7 Exhibit 6, #8 Exhibit 7, #9 Exhibit 8, #10 Exhibit 9, #11 Exhibit 10, #12 Exhibit 11, #13 Exhibit 12, #14 Exhibit 13, #15 Exhibit 14, #16 Exhibit 15, #17 Exhibit 16, #18 Exhibit 17, #19 Exhibit 18, #20 Exhibit 19, #21 Exhibit 20, #22 Exhibit 21, #23 Exhibit 22, #24 Exhibit 23, #25 Exhibit 24, #26 Exhibit 25)(Merten, Howard)
November 30, 2018 Filing 66 Joint MOTION to Stay re #60 Amended Complaint Pending Judicial Approval of Proposed Settlement filed by CharterCARE Foundation. Responses due by 12/14/2018. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Petition for Settlement Instructions)(Dennington, Andrew)
November 21, 2018 Filing 65 DECLARATION re #63 Joint MOTION for Settlement and Settlement Class Certification, #64 MOTION for Attorney Fees by All Plaintiffs. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit 2, #3 Exhibit 3, #4 Exhibit 4, #5 Exhibit 5, #6 Exhibit 6, #7 Exhibit 7, #8 Exhibit 8, #9 Exhibit 9, #10 Exhibit 10, #11 Exhibit 11, #12 Exhibit 12, #13 Exhibit 13, #14 Exhibit 14, #15 Exhibit 15, #16 Exhibit 16, #17 Exhibit 17, #18 Exhibit 18, #19 Exhibit 19, #20 Exhibit 20, #21 Exhibit 21, #22 Exhibit 22, #23 Exhibit 23, #24 Exhibit 24, #25 Exhibit 25)(Wistow, Max)
November 21, 2018 Filing 64 MOTION for Attorney Fees filed by All Plaintiffs. Responses due by 12/5/2018. (Attachments: #1 Supporting Memorandum)(Wistow, Max)
November 21, 2018 Filing 63 Joint MOTION for Settlement and Settlement Class Certification filed by All Plaintiffs. Responses due by 12/5/2018. (Attachments: #1 Supporting Memorandum, #2 Exhibit A, #3 Exhibit B, #4 Exhibit C, #5 Exhibit D, #6 Exhibit E, #7 Exhibit F)(Wistow, Max)
November 14, 2018 Opinion or Order TEXT ORDER granting #62 Motion for Extension of Time to Answer CharterCARE Foundation answer due 12/4/2018; Diocesan Administration Corporation answer due 12/4/2018; Diocesan Service Corporation answer due 12/4/2018; Prospect CharterCARE, LLC answer due 12/4/2018; Prospect CharterCare SJHSRI, LLC answer due 12/4/2018; Prospect Chartercare RWMC, LLC answer due 12/4/2018; Prospect East Holdings, Inc. answer due 12/4/2018; Prospect Medical Holdings, Inc. answer due 12/4/2018; Roman Catholic Bishop of Providence answer due 12/4/2018; The Angell Pension Group, Inc. answer due 12/4/2018; all additional deadlines as described in the Motion are also granted. So Ordered by Chief Judge William E. Smith on 11/13/2018. (Jackson, Ryan)
November 13, 2018 Minute Entry for proceedings held before Chief Judge William E. Smith: Telephone Conference held on 11/13/2018; counsel on call: M. Wistow; S. Sheehan; P. Halperin; H. Merten; R. Conn (Jackson, Ryan)
November 6, 2018 NOTICE of Hearing: Telephone Conference re: General Scheduling scheduled for Tuesday 11/13/2018 at 2:00 PM before Chief Judge William E. Smith; call-in instructions will be emailed to all counsel of record prior to the day of the scheduled conference. (Jackson, Ryan)
October 19, 2018 Filing 62 Joint MOTION for an Extension of Time to File Answer to Plaintiffs' First Amended Complaint filed by The Angell Pension Group, Inc.. Responses due by 11/2/2018. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Stipulation)(Boyajian, Steven)
October 11, 2018 Opinion or Order TEXT ORDER granting #61 Motion for Extension of Time to Answer; Rhode Island Community Foundation answer due 10 days after decision on the last of the pending dispositive motions. So Ordered by Chief Judge William E. Smith on 10/11/2018. (Jackson, Ryan)
October 9, 2018 Filing 61 Consent MOTION for an Extension of Time to File Answer re #60 Amended Complaint filed by The Rhode Island Community Foundation. Responses due by 10/23/2018. (Wollin, David)
October 5, 2018 Filing 60 AMENDED COMPLAINT against All Defendants, filed by Donna Boutelle, Gail J. Major, Stephen Del Sesto, Caroll Short, Eugenia Levesque, Ralph Bryden. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1)(Wistow, Max)
September 26, 2018 Minute Entry for proceedings held before Chief Judge William E. Smith: Telephone Conference held on 9/26/2018; counsel for all parties present on call (Jackson, Ryan)
September 20, 2018 Filing 59 Corporate Disclosure Statement by CharterCARE Foundation. (Dennington, Andrew)
September 19, 2018 Filing 58 Corporate Disclosure Statement by Prospect CharterCARE, LLC identifying Corporate Parent Prospect East Holdings, Inc. for Prospect CharterCARE, LLC.. (Cavanagh, Joseph)
September 19, 2018 Filing 57 Corporate Disclosure Statement by Prospect CharterCare SJHSRI, LLC identifying Corporate Parent Prospect CharterCARE, LLC for Prospect CharterCare SJHSRI, LLC.. (Cavanagh, Joseph)
September 19, 2018 Filing 56 Corporate Disclosure Statement by Prospect Chartercare RWMC, LLC identifying Corporate Parent Prospect CharterCARE, LLC for Prospect Chartercare RWMC, LLC.. (Cavanagh, Joseph)
September 19, 2018 Filing 55 NOTICE of Appearance by Lynne Barry Dolan on behalf of Prospect CharterCARE, LLC, Prospect CharterCare SJHSRI, LLC, Prospect Chartercare RWMC, LLC (Dolan, Lynne)
September 18, 2018 NOTICE of Hearing: Telephone Conference re: status and case management scheduled for Wednesday 9/26/2018 at 10:00 AM before Chief Judge William E. Smith (will be held jointly before Associate Justice Brian P. Stern of the RI Superior Court); this office will send call-in instructions prior to the day of the conference to all listed counsel, via email (Jackson, Ryan)
September 17, 2018 Filing 54 MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM filed by Diocesan Administration Corporation, Diocesan Service Corporation, Roman Catholic Bishop of Providence. Responses due by 10/1/2018. (Attachments: #1 Supporting Memorandum, #2 Exhibit 1, #3 Exhibit 2, #4 Exhibit 3, #5 Exhibit 4, #6 Exhibit 5, #7 Exhibit 6, #8 Exhibit 7, #9 Exhibit 8, #10 Exhibit 9, #11 Exhibit 10, #12 Exhibit 11, #13 Exhibit 12, #14 Exhibit 13, #15 Exhibit 14, #16 Exhibit 15, #17 Exhibit 16, #18 Exhibit 17, #19 Exhibit 18, #20 Exhibit 19, #21 Exhibit 20, #22 Exhibit 21, #23 Exhibit 22, #24 Exhibit 23, #25 Exhibit 24, #26 Exhibit 25)(Merten, Howard)
September 17, 2018 Filing 53 MEMORANDUM IN SUPPORT by CharterCARE Foundation in support of #52 MOTION to Dismiss . (Attachments: #1 Exhibit, #2 Exhibit)(Sweeney, Christopher)
September 17, 2018 Filing 52 MOTION to Dismiss filed by CharterCARE Foundation. Responses due by 10/1/2018. (Sweeney, Christopher)
September 17, 2018 Filing 51 Joint MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM filed by Prospect CharterCARE, LLC, Prospect CharterCare SJHSRI, LLC, Prospect Chartercare RWMC, LLC, Prospect East Holdings, Inc., Prospect Medical Holdings, Inc.. Responses due by 10/1/2018. (Attachments: #1 Supporting Memorandum)(Wagner, Dean)
September 14, 2018 Filing 50 MOTION Request for Judicial Notice filed by The Angell Pension Group, Inc.. Responses due by 9/28/2018. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit 2, #3 Exhibit 3)(Boyajian, Steven)
September 14, 2018 Filing 49 MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM filed by The Angell Pension Group, Inc.. Responses due by 9/28/2018. (Attachments: #1 Supporting Memorandum, #2 Exhibit A to Memorandum, #3 Exhibit B to Memorandum)(Boyajian, Steven)
September 7, 2018 Opinion or Order TEXT ORDER granting #48 Motion to Stay/Continue deadline for Repsonding to the Complaint. So Ordered by Chief Judge William E. Smith on 9/7/2018. (Jackson, Ryan)
September 5, 2018 Filing 48 Joint MOTION to Stay Deadline for Defendants St. Joseph Health Services of Rhode Island, Roger Williams Hospital and CharterCARE Community Board to Answer or Otherwise Respond to Complaint filed by Donna Boutelle, Ralph Bryden, Stephen Del Sesto, Eugenia Levesque, Gail J. Major, Caroll Short, Dorothy Willner, Nancy Zompa. Responses due by 9/19/2018. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1)(Wistow, Max)
September 5, 2018 Filing 47 Corporate Disclosure Statement by Diocesan Administration Corporation, Diocesan Service Corporation, Roman Catholic Bishop of Providence. (Merten, Howard)
August 27, 2018 Filing 46 NOTICE by Diocesan Administration Corporation, Diocesan Service Corporation, Roman Catholic Bishop of Providence of Withdrawal of Appearance of Steven E. Snow (Snow, Steven)
August 23, 2018 Opinion or Order TEXT ORDER granting #45 Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice of Emily S. Costin. So Ordered by Chief Judge William E. Smith on 8/23/2018. (Potter, Carrie) Modified on 8/24/2018 to edit docket text (Potter, Carrie).
August 23, 2018 Filing 45 MOTION for Emily S. Costin to Appear Pro Hac Vice ( filing fee paid $ 100.00, receipt number 0103-1255743 ) filed by The Angell Pension Group, Inc.. (Boyajian, Steven) (Main Document 45 replaced on 8/23/2018) (Potter, Carrie).
August 23, 2018 Filing 44 NOTICE by The Angell Pension Group, Inc. of Withdrawal of Appearance (Patrick C. DiCarlo) (Boyajian, Steven)
August 14, 2018 Filing 43 Corporate Disclosure Statement by Prospect East Holdings, Inc. identifying Corporate Parent Prospect Medical Holdings, Inc. for Prospect East Holdings, Inc... (Fragomeni, Christopher)
August 14, 2018 Filing 42 Corporate Disclosure Statement by Prospect Medical Holdings, Inc. identifying Corporate Parent Ivy Intermediate Holding Inc. for Prospect Medical Holdings, Inc... (Fragomeni, Christopher)
August 13, 2018 Opinion or Order TEXT ORDER granting #40 Motion for Extension of Time to Answer; The Rhode Island Community Foundation shall have up to 10 days after a decision has been made on the defendants' motions to dismiss to file their answer to the complaint - So Ordered by Chief Judge William E. Smith on 8/13/2018. (Urizandi, Nisshy)
August 10, 2018 Filing 41 Corporate Disclosure Statement by The Rhode Island Community Foundation. (Wollin, David)
August 10, 2018 Filing 40 Consent MOTION for an Extension of Time to File Answer to Complaint filed by The Rhode Island Community Foundation. Responses due by 8/24/2018. (Wollin, David)
August 3, 2018 Filing 39 Corporate Disclosure Statement by The Angell Pension Group, Inc.. (Boyajian, Steven)
July 30, 2018 Opinion or Order TEXT ORDER: Parties shall have until 9/15/2018 to file dispositive motions; Reponses are to be filed on or before 11/15/2018 and Replies are to be filed on or before 12/15/2018. Parties not filing dispositive motions shall file their answer to the complaint by 9/15/2018 - So Ordered by Chief Judge William E. Smith on 7/30/2018. (Urizandi, Nisshy)
July 30, 2018 Minute Entry for proceedings held before Chief Judge William E. Smith: Scheduling Conference held on 7/30/2018: Max Wistow, Stephen P. Sheehan, Stephen Del Sesto, Joseph V. Cavanagh, III, Joseph V. Cavanaugh, Jr., Robert Fine, Preston W. Halperin, Dean Wagner, Russell F. Conn, David Wollin, Steven E. Snow, Eugene G. Bernardo, II, David Sullivan, and Steven J. Boyajian present. (Urizandi, Nisshy)
July 27, 2018 Filing 38 NOTICE of Appearance by Steven E. Snow on behalf of Diocesan Administration Corporation, Diocesan Service Corporation, Roman Catholic Bishop of Providence (Snow, Steven)
July 23, 2018 Filing 37 STIPULATION filed by All Plaintiffs. (Sheehan, Stephen)
July 23, 2018 Opinion or Order TEXT ORDER granting #36 Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice of Russell F. Conn. So Ordered by Chief Judge William E. Smith on 7/23/2018. (Potter, Carrie)
July 20, 2018 Filing 36 MOTION for Russell F. Conn to Appear Pro Hac Vice ( filing fee paid $ 100.00, receipt number 0103-1238677 ) filed by CharterCARE Foundation. (Sweeney, Christopher)
July 20, 2018 CORRECTED NOTICE of Hearing: Scheduling Conference with regard to response to Complaint deadline is set for Monday, 7/30/2018 at 10:00 AM in Judge Smith Chambers. This notice is corrected to reflect that this is not a Rule 16 Conference(Barletta, Barbara)
July 20, 2018 Filing 35 NOTICE of Appearance by Christopher K. Sweeney on behalf of CharterCARE Foundation (Sweeney, Christopher)
July 20, 2018 Opinion or Order TEXT ORDER granting #34 Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice of Thomas V Reichert. So Ordered by Chief Judge William E. Smith on 7/20/2018. (Potter, Carrie)
July 20, 2018 Filing 34 MOTION for Thomas V. Reichert to Appear Pro Hac Vice ( filing fee paid $ 100.00, receipt number 0103-1238473 ) filed by Prospect East Holdings, Inc., Prospect Medical Holdings, Inc.. (Wagner, Dean)
July 20, 2018 Filing 33 NOTICE of Hearing: Scheduling Conference set for Monday, 7/30/2018 at 10:00 AM in Judge Smith Chambers (Barletta, Barbara)
July 19, 2018 Opinion or Order TEXT ORDER granting #32 Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice of Ekwan E. Rhow. So Ordered by Chief Judge William E. Smith on 7/19/2018. (Potter, Carrie)
July 19, 2018 Filing 32 MOTION for Ekwan E. Rhow to Appear Pro Hac Vice ( filing fee paid $ 100.00, receipt number 0103-1238108 ) filed by Prospect East Holdings, Inc., Prospect Medical Holdings, Inc.. (Wagner, Dean)
July 19, 2018 Filing 31 NOTICE of Appearance by Christopher Joseph Fragomeni on behalf of Prospect East Holdings, Inc., Prospect Medical Holdings, Inc. (Fragomeni, Christopher)
July 19, 2018 Filing 30 NOTICE of Appearance by Dean J. Wagner on behalf of Prospect East Holdings, Inc., Prospect Medical Holdings, Inc. (Wagner, Dean)
July 18, 2018 Reset Deadlines: All Defendants answer due 8/14/18. (Jackson, Ryan)
July 18, 2018 Opinion or Order TEXT ORDER Entering #29 Stipulation filed by Gail J. Major, Donna Boutelle, Ralph Bryden, Dorothy Willner, Nancy Zompa, Stephen Del Sesto, Caroll Short, Eugenia Levesque extending time to answer up to and including 8/14/18. So Ordered by Chief Judge William E. Smith on 7/18/2018. (Jackson, Ryan)
July 6, 2018 Filing 29 STIPULATION filed by All Plaintiffs. (Wistow, Max)
July 5, 2018 Filing 28 NOTICE of Appearance by Daniel F. Sullivan on behalf of The Angell Pension Group, Inc. (Sullivan, Daniel)
July 5, 2018 Filing 27 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Donna Boutelle, Gail J. Major, Stephen Del Sesto, Caroll Short, Nancy Zompa, Eugenia Levesque, Ralph Bryden, Dorothy Willner. (Wistow, Max)
July 5, 2018 Opinion or Order TEXT ORDER granting #26 Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice of Patrick C. DiCarlo. So Ordered by Chief Judge William E. Smith on 7/5/2018. (Potter, Carrie)
July 5, 2018 Opinion or Order TEXT ORDER granting #25 Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice of David R. Godofsky. So Ordered by Chief Judge William E. Smith on 7/5/2018. (Potter, Carrie)
July 5, 2018 Filing 26 MOTION for Patrick C. DiCarlo to Appear Pro Hac Vice ( filing fee paid $ 100.00, receipt number 0103-1233291 ) filed by The Angell Pension Group, Inc.. (Boyajian, Steven)
July 5, 2018 Filing 25 MOTION for David R. Godofsky to Appear Pro Hac Vice ( filing fee paid $ 100.00, receipt number 0103-1233285 ) filed by The Angell Pension Group, Inc.. (Boyajian, Steven)
July 3, 2018 Filing 24 NOTICE of Appearance by Eugene G. Bernardo, II on behalf of Diocesan Administration Corporation, Diocesan Service Corporation, Roman Catholic Bishop of Providence (Bernardo, Eugene)
July 3, 2018 Filing 23 NOTICE of Appearance by Joseph V. Cavanagh, III on behalf of Prospect CharterCARE, LLC, Prospect CharterCare SJHSRI, LLC, Prospect Chartercare RWMC, LLC (Cavanagh, Joseph)
July 3, 2018 Filing 22 NOTICE of Appearance by Joseph V. Cavanagh, Jr. on behalf of Prospect CharterCARE, LLC, Prospect CharterCare SJHSRI, LLC, Prospect Chartercare RWMC, LLC (Cavanagh, Joseph)
July 2, 2018 Filing 21 NOTICE of Appearance by Christopher M. Wildenhain on behalf of Diocesan Administration Corporation, Diocesan Service Corporation, Roman Catholic Bishop of Providence (Wildenhain, Christopher)
July 2, 2018 Filing 20 NOTICE of Appearance by Paul M. Kessimian on behalf of Diocesan Administration Corporation, Diocesan Service Corporation, Roman Catholic Bishop of Providence (Kessimian, Paul)
July 2, 2018 Filing 19 NOTICE of Appearance by Howard A. Merten on behalf of Diocesan Administration Corporation, Diocesan Service Corporation, Roman Catholic Bishop of Providence (Merten, Howard)
July 2, 2018 Filing 18 NOTICE of Appearance by Richard J. Land on behalf of CharterCARE Community Board, Roger Williams Hospital, St. Joseph Health Services of Rhode Island (Land, Richard)
July 2, 2018 Filing 17 NOTICE of Appearance by Robert D. Fine on behalf of CharterCARE Community Board, Roger Williams Hospital, St. Joseph Health Services of Rhode Island (Fine, Robert)
July 2, 2018 Filing 16 NOTICE of Appearance by Steven J. Boyajian on behalf of The Angell Pension Group, Inc. (Boyajian, Steven)
July 2, 2018 Filing 15 ACKNOWLEDGEMENT OF SERVICE Executed by Preston Halperin, Esq. for Prospect Medical Holdings, Inc. and Prospect East Holdings, Inc. Acknowledgement filed by Donna Boutelle, Ralph Bryden, Stephen Del Sesto, Eugenia Levesque, Gail J. Major, Caroll Short, Dorothy Willner, Nancy Zompa. (Wistow, Max)
July 2, 2018 Filing 14 ACKNOWLEDGEMENT OF SERVICE Executed by Joseph Cavanagh, III, Esq., for Prospect CharterCare. LLC, Propsect CharterCare SJHSRI, LLC and Prospect CharterCare RWMC, LLC Acknowledgement filed by Donna Boutelle, Ralph Bryden, Stephen Del Sesto, Eugenia Levesque, Gail J. Major, Caroll Short, Dorothy Willner, Nancy Zompa. (Wistow, Max)
July 2, 2018 Filing 13 ACKNOWLEDGEMENT OF SERVICE Executed by Howard Merten, Esq. for Roman Catholic Bishop of Providence, Diocesan Administration Corporation and Diocesan Services Corporation Acknowledgement filed by Donna Boutelle, Ralph Bryden, Stephen Del Sesto, Eugenia Levesque, Gail J. Major, Caroll Short, Dorothy Willner, Nancy Zompa. (Wistow, Max)
July 2, 2018 Filing 12 ACKNOWLEDGEMENT OF SERVICE Executed by Andrew Dennington, Esq. for Chartercare Foundation Acknowledgement filed by Donna Boutelle, Ralph Bryden, Stephen Del Sesto, Eugenia Levesque, Gail J. Major, Caroll Short, Dorothy Willner, Nancy Zompa. (Wistow, Max)
July 2, 2018 Filing 11 ACKNOWLEDGEMENT OF SERVICE Executed by Richard Land, Esq. for St. Joseph Health Services of Rhode Island, Roger Williams Hospital and Chartercare Community Board Acknowledgement filed by Donna Boutelle, Ralph Bryden, Stephen Del Sesto, Eugenia Levesque, Gail J. Major, Caroll Short, Dorothy Willner, Nancy Zompa. (Wistow, Max)
July 2, 2018 Filing 10 ACKNOWLEDGEMENT OF SERVICE Executed by Robert Fine, Esq. for St. Joseph Health Services of Rhode Island, Roger Williams Hospital and Chartercare Community Board Acknowledgement filed by Donna Boutelle, Ralph Bryden, Stephen Del Sesto, Eugenia Levesque, Gail J. Major, Caroll Short, Dorothy Willner, Nancy Zompa. (Wistow, Max)
July 2, 2018 Filing 9 ACKNOWLEDGEMENT OF SERVICE Executed Acknowledgement filed by Donna Boutelle, Ralph Bryden, Stephen Del Sesto, Eugenia Levesque, Gail J. Major, Caroll Short, Dorothy Willner, Nancy Zompa. (Wistow, Max)
July 2, 2018 Filing 8 NOTICE of Appearance by Preston W. Halperin on behalf of Prospect East Holdings, Inc., Prospect Medical Holdings, Inc. (Halperin, Preston)
June 29, 2018 Filing 7 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Prospect East Holdings, Inc., Prospect Medical Holdings, Inc.. Prospect East Holdings, Inc. served on 6/27/2018, answer due 7/18/2018; Prospect Medical Holdings, Inc. served on 6/27/2018, answer due 7/18/2018. (Halperin, Preston)
June 25, 2018 Filing 6 NOTICE of Appearance by David A. Wollin on behalf of The Rhode Island Community Foundation (Wollin, David)
June 21, 2018 Filing 5 NOTICE of Appearance by Andrew R. Dennington on behalf of CharterCARE Foundation (Dennington, Andrew)
June 19, 2018 Filing 4 Summons Issued as to CharterCARE Community Board, CharterCARE Foundation, Diocesan Administration Corporation, Diocesan Service Corporation, Prospect CharterCARE, LLC, Prospect CharterCare SJHSRI, LLC, Prospect Chartercare RWMC, LLC, Prospect East Holdings, Inc., Prospect Medical Holdings, Inc., Roger Williams Hospital, Roman Catholic Bishop of Providence, St. Joseph Health Services of Rhode Island, The Angell Pension Group, Inc., The Rhode Island Community Foundation. (Attachments: #1 Summons, #2 Summons, #3 Summons, #4 Summons, #5 Summons, #6 Summons, #7 Summons, #8 Summons, #9 Summons, #10 Summons, #11 Summons, #12 Summons, #13 Summons)(Potter, Carrie)
June 19, 2018 Filing 3 Summons Request filed by Donna Boutelle, Ralph Bryden, Stephen Del Sesto, Eugenia Levesque, Gail J. Major, Caroll Short, Dorothy Willner, Nancy Zompa. (Wistow, Max)
June 19, 2018 Filing 2 CASE OPENING NOTICE ISSUED (Farrell Pletcher, Paula)
June 19, 2018 Case assigned to Chief Judge William E. Smith and Magistrate Judge Lincoln D. Almond. (Farrell Pletcher, Paula)
June 18, 2018 Filing 1 COMPLAINT ( filing fee paid $ 400.00, receipt number 0103-1227278 ), filed by Donna Boutelle, Gail J Major, Stephen Del Sesto, Caroll Short, Nancy Zompa, Eugenia Levesque, Ralph Bryden, Dorothy Willner. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Civil Cover Sheet, #3 Summonses)(Wistow, Max)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Rhode Island District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Del Sesto et al v. Prospect CharterCARE, LLC et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: The Angell Pension Group, Inc.
Represented By: Daniel F. Sullivan
Represented By: Emily S. Costin
Represented By: Patrick C. DiCarlo
Represented By: David R. Godofsky
Represented By: Steven J. Boyajian
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: CharterCARE Community Board
Represented By: Richard J. Land
Represented By: Robert D. Fine
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Roman Catholic Bishop of Providence
Represented By: Paul M. Kessimian
Represented By: Christopher M. Wildenhain
Represented By: Howard A. Merten
Represented By: Eugene G. Bernardo, II
Represented By: Steven E. Snow
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: The Rhode Island Community Foundation
Represented By: David A. Wollin
Represented By: Christine E. Dieter
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: CharterCARE Foundation
Represented By: Christopher K. Sweeney
Represented By: Andrew R. Dennington
Represented By: Russell F. Conn
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Prospect CharterCARE, LLC
Represented By: Joseph V. Cavanagh, III
Represented By: Christopher Joseph Fragomeni
Represented By: William Mark Russo
Represented By: Lynne Barry Dolan
Represented By: Dean J. Wagner
Represented By: Joseph V. Cavanagh, Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Prospect Medical Holdings, Inc.
Represented By: Preston W. Halperin
Represented By: John McGowan, Jr.
Represented By: Christopher Joseph Fragomeni
Represented By: Thomas V Reichert
Represented By: Edward D. Pare, III
Represented By: Ekwan E. Rhow
Represented By: Dean J. Wagner
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Prospect CharterCare SJHSRI, LLC
Represented By: Joseph V. Cavanagh, III
Represented By: Christopher Joseph Fragomeni
Represented By: William Mark Russo
Represented By: Lynne Barry Dolan
Represented By: Dean J. Wagner
Represented By: Joseph V. Cavanagh, Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Prospect East Holdings, Inc.
Represented By: Preston W. Halperin
Represented By: John McGowan, Jr.
Represented By: Christopher Joseph Fragomeni
Represented By: Thomas V Reichert
Represented By: Edward D. Pare, III
Represented By: Ekwan E. Rhow
Represented By: Dean J. Wagner
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Diocesan Administration Corporation
Represented By: Paul M. Kessimian
Represented By: Christopher M. Wildenhain
Represented By: Howard A. Merten
Represented By: Eugene G. Bernardo, II
Represented By: Steven E. Snow
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: St. Joseph Health Services of Rhode Island
Represented By: Richard J. Land
Represented By: Robert D. Fine
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Prospect Chartercare RWMC, LLC
Represented By: Joseph V. Cavanagh, III
Represented By: Christopher Joseph Fragomeni
Represented By: William Mark Russo
Represented By: Lynne Barry Dolan
Represented By: Dean J. Wagner
Represented By: Joseph V. Cavanagh, Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Diocesan Service Corporation
Represented By: Paul M. Kessimian
Represented By: Christopher M. Wildenhain
Represented By: Howard A. Merten
Represented By: Eugene G. Bernardo, II
Represented By: Steven E. Snow
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Roger Williams Hospital
Represented By: Richard J. Land
Represented By: Robert D. Fine
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Caroll Short
Represented By: Max Wistow
Represented By: Benjamin G. Ledsham
Represented By: Stephen P. Sheehan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Gail J Major
Represented By: Max Wistow
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Stephen Del Sesto
Represented By: Max Wistow
Represented By: Benjamin G. Ledsham
Represented By: Stephen P. Sheehan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Dorothy Willner
Represented By: Max Wistow
Represented By: Benjamin G. Ledsham
Represented By: Stephen P. Sheehan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Eugenia Levesque
Represented By: Max Wistow
Represented By: Benjamin G. Ledsham
Represented By: Stephen P. Sheehan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Nancy Zompa
Represented By: Max Wistow
Represented By: Benjamin G. Ledsham
Represented By: Stephen P. Sheehan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Ralph Bryden
Represented By: Max Wistow
Represented By: Benjamin G. Ledsham
Represented By: Stephen P. Sheehan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Donna Boutelle
Represented By: Max Wistow
Represented By: Benjamin G. Ledsham
Represented By: Stephen P. Sheehan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Gail J. Major
Represented By: Max Wistow
Represented By: Benjamin G. Ledsham
Represented By: Stephen P. Sheehan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Interested party: Michael W Field
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Interested party: Lydia Corvese
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Receiver: THOMAS HEMMENDINGER
Represented By: Lisa M. Kresge
Represented By: Thomas S. Hemmendinger
Represented By: Ronald F. Cascione
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Special master: Deming E. Sherman
Represented By: Deming E. Sherman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?