Hall v. Spencer
Plaintiff: Lori Hall
Defendant: Richard V. Spencer
Case Number: 1:2018cv00355
Filed: June 27, 2018
Court: US District Court for the District of Rhode Island
Office: Providence Office
County: Providence
Presiding Judge: William E. Smith
Presiding Judge: Patricia A. Sullivan
Nature of Suit: Employment
Cause of Action: 42 U.S.C. ยง 2000
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
August 1, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 94 ORDER REGARDING FILINGS IN DISTRICT COURTDURING PENDENCY OF APPEALS. So Ordered by Magistrate Judge Patricia A. Sullivan on 8/1/2022. (Saucier, Martha)
July 14, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 91 MEMORANDUM AND ORDER DENYING RENEWED MOTION FOR STAY AND RESETTING PRETRIAL ORDER DEADLINES Dispositive Motions due by 8/31/2022;, Pretrial Memorandum due by 9/15/2022 only if no dispositive motion is pending. Motions terminated: 68 MOTION to Stay filed by Lori Hall.. So Ordered by Magistrate Judge Patricia A. Sullivan on 7/14/2022. (Saucier, Martha)
July 12, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 83 REPORT AND RECOMMENDATIONS re 81 MOTION for Leave to Appeal in forma pauperis filed by Lori Hall Objections to R&R due by 7/26/2022.., I recommend that her IFP application be denied. So Ordered by Magistrate Judge Patricia A. Sullivan on 7/12/2022. (Saucier, Martha)
May 3, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 61 ORDER regarding 54 Motion to Stay. Considering all of the circumstances, the Court finds that it is appropriate to grant the limited relief (a thirty-day stay) that Plaintiff asked for on reply. This will afford Plaintiff time to submit documenta tion from medical providers verifying the impact of her mental health symptoms on her ability to litigate this civil case, including the timing of when any medically verified limitation may change. Accordingly, Plaintiffs motion to stay (ECF No. 54) is granted in part in that proceedings in this case in the District Court (not in the Court of Appeals) are hereby stayed for a period of thirty days. Otherwise, the motion to stay (including any request to reopen discovery) is denied without prejudice to Plaintiff seeking further relief at the end of the thirty-day period. So Ordered by Magistrate Judge Patricia A. Sullivan on 5/3/2022. (Potter, Carrie)
April 25, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 55 REPORT AND RECOMMENDATIONS re 53 MOTION for Leave to Appeal in forma pauperis filed by Lori Hall Objections to R&R due by 5/9/2022.. I recommend that the motion to proceed IFP on appeal be denied without prejudice. So Ordered by Magistrate Judge Patricia A. Sullivan on 4/25/2022. (Saucier, Martha)
February 22, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 48 ORDER REGARDING CONTACT WITH COURT STAFF. So Ordered by Magistrate Judge Patricia A. Sullivan on 2/22/2022. (Saucier, Martha)
January 28, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 38 ORDER denying 31 MOTION to Reset Deadlines to Deadlines Set in 8/18/21 Text Order, Second MOTION to Stay ; denying 33 Motion to Stay. Plaintiff's motions for stay (ECF Nos. 31, 33) are denied and the Navys show cau se response (ECF No. 32) is sustained. Because it remains conceivable that a more detailed statement of the applicable facts (for example, during briefing on a motion for summary judgment in this case) might reveal some prejudice to Plaintiff that the Court has not yet identified, the motions to stay are denied without prejudice. So Ordered by Magistrate Judge Patricia A. Sullivan on 1/28/2022. (Saucier, Martha)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Rhode Island District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Hall v. Spencer
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Lori Hall
Represented By: Richard J. Savage
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Richard V. Spencer
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?