L'Image, Inc. v. Stella & Dot LLC

Plaintiff: L'Image, Inc.
Defendant: Stella & Dot LLC
Case Number: 1:2018cv00473
Filed: August 27, 2018
Court: US District Court for the District of Rhode Island
0 Judge: Lincoln D Almond
1 Judge: John J McConnell
Nature of Suit: Trademark
Cause of Action: 28:2201
Jury Demanded By: Both

Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on October 17, 2018. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
October 17, 2018 CORRECTIVE DOCKET ENTRY Regarding: Notice of Hearing for 10/25/18 telephone conference. This entry was docketed in the wrong case and should be disregarded. (Barletta, Barbara)
October 17, 2018 NOTICE of Hearing: Telephone Conference set for Thursday, 10/25/2018 at 09:30 a.m. before District Judge John J. McConnell, Jr. (Barletta, Barbara)
October 17, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 16 PRETRIAL SCHEDULING ORDER: Factual Discovery to close by 4/17/2019; Plaintiff's Expert Disclosures shall be made by 5/17/2019; Defendant's Expert Disclosures shall be made by 6/17/2019; Expert Discovery to close by 7/17/2019 and Dispositive Motions shall be filed by 8/16/2019 - So Ordered by District Judge John J. McConnell, Jr. on 10/17/2018. (Barletta, Barbara)
October 17, 2018 Minute Entry for proceedings held before District Judge John J. McConnell, Jr.: Telephonic Rule 16 Conference held on 10/17/2018; Robert D. Fine, Jeffrey K. Techentin and Ian Boyd parcipated (Barletta, Barbara)
October 15, 2018 Opinion or Order TEXT ORDER granting #15 Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice of Anna P. Chang. So Ordered by District Judge John J. McConnell, Jr. on 10/15/2018. (Potter, Carrie)
October 15, 2018 Opinion or Order TEXT ORDER granting #14 Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice of Ian Boyd. So Ordered by District Judge John J. McConnell, Jr. on 10/15/2018. (Potter, Carrie)
October 15, 2018 Filing 15 MOTION for Anna P. Chang to Appear Pro Hac Vice ( filing fee paid $ 100.00, receipt number 0103-1273426 ) filed by Stella & Dot LLC. (Techentin, Jeffrey)
October 15, 2018 Filing 14 MOTION for Ian K. Boyd to Appear Pro Hac Vice ( filing fee paid $ 100.00, receipt number 0103-1273392 ) filed by Stella & Dot LLC. (Techentin, Jeffrey) (Additional attachment(s) added on 10/15/2018: #1 Affidavit) (Potter, Carrie).
October 15, 2018 Filing 13 RULE 16 STATEMENT by All Plaintiffs. (Fine, Robert)
October 12, 2018 Filing 12 RULE 16 STATEMENT /Defendant and Counterclaimant Stella & Dot LLC's Rule 16(b) Conference Statement by Stella & Dot LLC. (Techentin, Jeffrey)
October 9, 2018 Filing 11 Reply to Counterclaim by L'Image, Inc.. (Fine, Robert)
October 2, 2018 Filing 10 Corporate Disclosure Statement by L'Image, Inc.. (Fine, Robert)
September 25, 2018 Filing 9 NOTICE of Hearing: Telephonic Rule 16 Conference set for Wednesday, 10/17/2018 at 09:15 AM before District Judge John J. McConnell, Jr. The Court will initiate the call. Counsel shall provide the Clerk with contact information if it differs from the docket sheet. (Barletta, Barbara)
September 21, 2018 Filing 8 Corporate Disclosure Statement by Stella & Dot LLC. (Dolan, William)
September 21, 2018 Filing 7 NOTICE of Appearance by Jeffrey K. Techentin on behalf of Stella & Dot LLC (Techentin, Jeffrey)
September 21, 2018 Filing 6 NOTICE of Appearance by William M. Dolan, III on behalf of Stella & Dot LLC (Dolan, William)
September 21, 2018 Filing 5 ANSWER to Complaint , COUNTERCLAIM against L'Image, Inc. by Stella & Dot LLC.(Dolan, William)
August 29, 2018 Filing 4 AO FORM 120: REPORT on Filing or Determination of an Action Regarding a Patent or Trademark (Potter, Carrie)
August 27, 2018 Filing 3 Summons Issued as to Stella & Dot LLC. (Potter, Carrie)
August 27, 2018 Filing 2 CASE OPENING NOTICE ISSUED (Potter, Carrie)
August 27, 2018 Case assigned to District Judge John J. McConnell, Jr. and Magistrate Judge Lincoln D. Almond. (Potter, Carrie)
August 27, 2018 Filing 1 COMPLAINT ( filing fee paid $ 400.00, receipt number 0103-1256792 ), filed by L'Image, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A-G, #2 Civil Cover Sheet, #3 summons)(Fine, Robert)
August 27, 2018 Filing 3 Summons Issued as to Stella & Dot LLC. (Potter, Carrie)
August 27, 2018 Filing 2 CASE OPENING NOTICE ISSUED (Potter, Carrie)
August 27, 2018 Case assigned to District Judge John J. McConnell, Jr. and Magistrate Judge Lincoln D. Almond. (Potter, Carrie)
August 27, 2018 Filing 1 COMPLAINT ( filing fee paid $ 400.00, receipt number 0103-1256792 ), filed by L'Image, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A-G, #2 Civil Cover Sheet, #3 summons)(Fine, Robert)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Rhode Island District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: L'Image, Inc. v. Stella & Dot LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: L'Image, Inc.
Represented By: Robert D. Fine
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Stella & Dot LLC
Represented By: Ian Boyd
Represented By: Jeffrey K. Techentin
Represented By: William M. Dolan, III
Represented By: Anna P. Chang
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?