United States of America v. Real Property Located at 51 Highview Avenue, Hopkinton, RI
Defendant: United States of America and Real Property Located at 51 Highview Avenue, Hopkinton, RI
Counter Claimant: Chi Chiu Tow
Case Number: 1:2018cv00487
Filed: September 4, 2018
Court: US District Court for the District of Rhode Island
Presiding Judge: Lincoln D Almond
Referring Judge: John J McConnell
Nature of Suit: Drug Related Seizure of Property
Cause of Action: 21:881
Jury Demanded By: Defendant
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on October 25, 2018. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
October 25, 2018 CORRECTIVE DOCKET ENTRY Regarding: #9 Notice of Hearing, The telephonic rule 16 conference scheduled for 11/29/18 was docketed in the wrong case. The telephonic rule 16 conference for this case is Monday, 11/19/18 at 9:00 a.m. (Barletta, Barbara)
October 25, 2018 Filing 9 NOTICE of Hearing: Telephonic Rule 16 Conference set for Thursday, 11/29/2018 at 09:30 AM before District Judge John J. McConnell, Jr. The Court will initiate the call. Counsel shall provide the Clerk with contact information if it differs from the docket sheet. (Barletta, Barbara)
October 25, 2018 Filing 8 NOTICE of Hearing: Telephonic Rule 16 Conference set for Monday, 11/19/2018 at 09:00 AM before District Judge John J. McConnell, Jr. The Court will initiate the call. Counsel shall provide the Clerk with contact information if it differs from the docket sheet. (Barletta, Barbara)
October 22, 2018 Filing 7 Claimant's ANSWER to Complaint for Forfeiture, First COUNTERCLAIM for attorneys fees against United States of America by Chi Chiu Tow.(DiLibero, Steven)
October 18, 2018 Filing 6 CLAIM Verified Claim of Ownership by Chi Chiu Tow. (DiLibero, Steven)
October 9, 2018 Opinion or Order TEXT ORDER granting #5 Motion for Extension of Time ; Reset Deadlines: Chi Chiu Tow Claim due by 12/7/18 and answer due 12/18/2018 - So Ordered by District Judge John J. McConnell, Jr. on 10/9/2018. (Barletta, Barbara)
October 5, 2018 Filing 5 Assented MOTION for an Extension of Time to file claim and answer filed by Chi Chiu Tow. Responses due by 10/19/2018. (DiLibero, Steven)
October 5, 2018 Filing 4 NOTICE of Appearance by Steven D. DiLibero on behalf of Chi Chiu Tow (DiLibero, Steven)
September 6, 2018 Filing 3 WRIT of Entry issued (Barletta, Barbara)
September 6, 2018 Opinion or Order TEXT ORDER granting #2 Motion for Writ- So Ordered by District Judge John J. McConnell, Jr. on 9/6/2018. (Barletta, Barbara)
September 5, 2018 CASE PERMANENTLY ASSIGNED: Since District Judge John J. McConnell, Jr. has determined that this case is in fact related to CA 18-cv-485-JJM-LDA this case is permanently assigned to District Judge John J. McConnell, Jr. for all further proceedings. (Urizandi, Nisshy)
September 4, 2018 CASE CONDITIONALLY ASSIGNED to District Judge John J. McConnell, Jr. and Magistrate Judge Lincoln D. Almond. Related Case Number 18-cv-485 and 18-cv-486 based upon the indication on the cover sheet that a related case previously was assigned to the presiding judge. The assignment is subject to the presiding judge's determination that the cases, in fact, are related. (Potter, Carrie)
September 4, 2018 Filing 2 MOTION for Writ of Entry filed by United States of America. Responses due by 9/18/2018. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Rogers, Mary)
September 4, 2018 Filing 1 COMPLAINT (No fee paid, USA, Waived by Statute, or IFP.), filed by United States of America. (Attachments: #1 Sworn Declaration, #2 Civil Cover Sheet)(Rogers, Mary)
September 4, 2018 CASE CONDITIONALLY ASSIGNED to District Judge John J. McConnell, Jr. and Magistrate Judge Lincoln D. Almond. Related Case Number 18-cv-485 and 18-cv-486 based upon the indication on the cover sheet that a related case previously was assigned to the presiding judge. The assignment is subject to the presiding judge's determination that the cases, in fact, are related. (Potter, Carrie)
September 4, 2018 Filing 2 MOTION for Writ of Entry filed by United States of America. Responses due by 9/18/2018. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Rogers, Mary)
September 4, 2018 Filing 1 COMPLAINT (No fee paid, USA, Waived by Statute, or IFP.), filed by United States of America. (Attachments: #1 Sworn Declaration, #2 Civil Cover Sheet)(Rogers, Mary)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Rhode Island District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: United States of America v. Real Property Located at 51 Highview Avenue, Hopkinton, RI
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: United States of America
Represented By: Mary Rogers
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Real Property Located at 51 Highview Avenue, Hopkinton, RI
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Counter claimant: Chi Chiu Tow
Represented By: Steven D. DiLibero
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?