United States of America v. Real Property Located at 85 Church Avenue, Warwick,RI
Plaintiff: United States of America
Defendant: Real Property Located at 85 Church Avenue, Warwick,RI
Claimant: Bing Quan Deng
Case Number: 1:2018cv00488
Filed: September 4, 2018
Court: US District Court for the District of Rhode Island
Presiding Judge: William E Smith
Referring Judge: Patricia A Sullivan
Nature of Suit: Drug Related Seizure of Property
Cause of Action: 21:881
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on October 24, 2018. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
October 24, 2018 Filing 5 ANSWER to Complaint by Bing Quan Deng.(Potter, Carrie)
October 22, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 4 ORDER granting #2 Motion for Writ; Writ of Entry. So Ordered by Chief Judge William E. Smith on 10/22/2018. (Jackson, Ryan)
October 12, 2018 Filing 3 CLAIM by Bing Quan Deng. (Simoncelli, Michael)
September 4, 2018 Case assigned to Chief Judge William E. Smith and Magistrate Judge Patricia A. Sullivan. (Potter, Carrie)
September 4, 2018 Filing 2 MOTION for Writ of Entry filed by United States of America. Responses due by 9/18/2018. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Rogers, Mary)
September 4, 2018 Filing 1 COMPLAINT (No fee paid, USA, Waived by Statute, or IFP.), filed by United States of America. (Attachments: #1 Sworn Declaration, #2 Civil Cover Sheet)(Rogers, Mary)
September 4, 2018 Case assigned to Chief Judge William E. Smith and Magistrate Judge Patricia A. Sullivan. (Potter, Carrie)
September 4, 2018 Filing 2 MOTION for Writ of Entry filed by United States of America. Responses due by 9/18/2018. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Rogers, Mary)
September 4, 2018 Filing 1 COMPLAINT (No fee paid, USA, Waived by Statute, or IFP.), filed by United States of America. (Attachments: #1 Sworn Declaration, #2 Civil Cover Sheet)(Rogers, Mary)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Rhode Island District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: United States of America v. Real Property Located at 85 Church Avenue, Warwick,RI
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Real Property Located at 85 Church Avenue, Warwick,RI
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: United States of America
Represented By: Mary Rogers
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Claimant: Bing Quan Deng
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?