Gateway Woodside, Inc. v. Northeast Restaurants, LLC et al
Plaintiff: Gateway Woodside, Inc.
Defendant: Top Line Restaurants, Inc. and Northeast Restaurants, LLC
Case Number: 1:2018cv00512
Filed: September 13, 2018
Court: US District Court for the District of Rhode Island
Presiding Judge: Lincoln D Almond
Referring Judge: William E Smith
Nature of Suit: Rent Lease & Ejectment
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on October 25, 2018. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
October 25, 2018 Filing 5 STIPULATION Stipulation of Dismissal filed by Gateway Woodside, Inc.. (Souza, Randall)
October 12, 2018 Reset Deadlines: Northeast Restaurants, LLC answer due 10/22/2018; Top Line Restaurants, Inc. answer due 10/22/2018. (Jackson, Ryan)
October 12, 2018 Opinion or Order TEXT ORDER Entering #4 Stipulation filed by Gateway Woodside, Inc.. So Ordered by Chief Judge William E. Smith on 10/12/2018. (Jackson, Ryan)
September 20, 2018 Filing 4 STIPULATION Stipulation for Extension of Time filed by Gateway Woodside, Inc.. (Souza, Randall)
September 14, 2018 Filing 3 STATE COURT RECORD received electronically from the State of Rhode Island. (Attachments: #1 2 of 3, #2 3 of 3)(Potter, Carrie)
September 13, 2018 Filing 2 CASE OPENING NOTICE ISSUED (Potter, Carrie)
September 13, 2018 Case assigned to Chief Judge William E. Smith and Magistrate Judge Lincoln D. Almond. (Potter, Carrie)
September 13, 2018 Filing 1 NEW CASE/NOTICE OF REMOVAL from Providence County Superior Court, Case Number PC-2018-5734. Filing fee $ 400, receipt number 0103-1262742, filed by Top Line Restaurants, Inc., Northeast Restaurants, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Complaint - Part 1 of 2, #2 Complaint - Part 2 of 2, #3 State Court Notice of Removal, #4 Civil Cover Sheet Civil Cover Sheet)(Lyons, Thomas)
September 13, 2018 Filing 2 CASE OPENING NOTICE ISSUED (Potter, Carrie)
September 13, 2018 Case assigned to Chief Judge William E. Smith and Magistrate Judge Lincoln D. Almond. (Potter, Carrie)
September 13, 2018 Filing 1 NEW CASE/NOTICE OF REMOVAL from Providence County Superior Court, Case Number PC-2018-5734. Filing fee $ 400, receipt number 0103-1262742, filed by Top Line Restaurants, Inc., Northeast Restaurants, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Complaint - Part 1 of 2, #2 Complaint - Part 2 of 2, #3 State Court Notice of Removal, #4 Civil Cover Sheet Civil Cover Sheet)(Lyons, Thomas)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Rhode Island District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Gateway Woodside, Inc. v. Northeast Restaurants, LLC et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Gateway Woodside, Inc.
Represented By: Randall L. Souza
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Top Line Restaurants, Inc.
Represented By: Thomas W. Lyons, III
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Northeast Restaurants, LLC
Represented By: Thomas W. Lyons, III
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?