Airway Leasing, LLC v. MTGLQ Investors, L.P.
Plaintiff: AIRWAY LEASING LLC AIRWAY LEASING, LLC and Airway Leasing, LLC
3Rd Party Plaintiff: MTGLQ INVESTORS, L.P.
3Rd Party Defendant: Ann-Marie K. DeLuca, R.J.R. Realty Co. and Rocco A. Deluca
Case Number: 1:2018cv00516
Filed: September 14, 2018
Court: US District Court for the District of Rhode Island
Presiding Judge: John J McConnell
Referring Judge: Patricia A Sullivan
Nature of Suit: Real Property: Other
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on November 8, 2018. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
November 8, 2018 Opinion or Order TEXT ORDER entering #12 Stipulation to Extend Time to Answer; MTGLQ is granted an extension to file a responsive pleading until after receiving the Amended Complaint from Airway - So Ordered by District Judge John J. McConnell, Jr. on 11/8/2018. (Urizandi, Nisshy)
November 7, 2018 Filing 12 STIPULATION to Extend Time to Answer filed by MTGLQ Investors, L.P.. (Boughton, Shanna)
November 2, 2018 NOTICE of Hearing: Telephonic Rule 16 Conference set for Thursday, 1/10/2019 at 09:00 AM before District Judge John J. McConnell, Jr. The Court will initiate the call. Counsel shall provide the Clerk with contact information if it differs from the docket sheet. (Barletta, Barbara)
November 2, 2018 Opinion or Order TEXT ORDER: The Plaintiff is granted leave to file an Amended Complaint to add new Defendants - So Ordered by District Judge John J. McConnell, Jr. on 11/2/2018. (Barletta, Barbara)
November 2, 2018 Minute Entry for proceedings held before District Judge John J. McConnell, Jr.: Telephonic Rule 16 Conference held on 11/2/2018; Richard W. Nicholson, August Bigos and Shanna M. Boughton participated (Barletta, Barbara)
November 1, 2018 Filing 11 RULE 16 STATEMENT by MTGLQ Investors, L.P.. (Boughton, Shanna)
November 1, 2018 Filing 10 THIRD PARTY COMPLAINT against Rocco A. Deluca, Ann-Marie K. DeLuca, R.J.R. Realty Co., filed by MTGLQ Investors, L.P..(Boughton, Shanna)
October 30, 2018 Filing 9 RULE 16 STATEMENT by Airway Leasing, LLC. (Nicholson, Richard)
October 26, 2018 Filing 8 AMENDED COMPLAINT and Answer to Defendant's Counterclaim against All Defendants, filed by Airway Leasing, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Exhibits A-Q)(Nicholson, Richard)
October 11, 2018 Filing 7 NOTICE of Hearing: Telephonic Rule 16 Conference set for Friday, 11/2/2018 at 09:00 AM before District Judge John J. McConnell, Jr. The Court will initiate the call. Counsel shall provide the Clerk with contact information if it differs from the docket sheet. (Barletta, Barbara)
October 5, 2018 Filing 6 Defendant's ANSWER to Complaint Defendant's, COUNTERCLAIM against Airway Leasing, LLC by MTGLQ Investors, L.P.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A- 1961 Deed, #2 Exhibit B- RJR Deed, #3 Exhibit C- DeLucca Deed, #4 Exhibit D- Note, #5 Exhibit E- Mortgage, #6 Exhibit F- First Assignment, #7 Exhibit G- Second Assignment, #8 Exhibit H- Third Assignment, #9 Exhibit I- Quitclaim Deed, #10 Exhibit J- Corrective Deed, #11 Exhibit K- Airway Deed, #12 Exhibit L- Transfer & Assignment, #13 Exhibit M - Fourth Assignment, #14 Exhibit N- HUD 1 Settlement Statement)(Boughton, Shanna)
September 28, 2018 Filing 5 STATE COURT RECORD received electronically from the State of Rhode Island. (Attachments: #1 Part 2 of 2)(Potter, Carrie)
September 27, 2018 Opinion or Order TEXT ORDER granting #4 Motion for Extension of Time to File responsive pleading ; Reset Deadlines: MTGLQ Investors, L.P. answer due 10/5/2018 - So Ordered by District Judge John J. McConnell, Jr. on 9/27/2018 (Barletta, Barbara)
September 26, 2018 Filing 4 Amended MOTION for an Extension of Time to File Response/Reply filed by MTGLQ Investors, L.P.. Responses due by 10/10/2018. (Boughton, Shanna)
September 20, 2018 Opinion or Order TEXT ORDER granting #3 Motion for Extension of Time to file responsive pleading; Reset Deadlines: MTGLQ Investors, L.P. answer due 9/28/2018 - So Ordered by District Judge John J. McConnell, Jr. on 9/20/2018 (Barletta, Barbara)
September 19, 2018 Filing 3 MOTION for an Extension of Time Extend Time to File Responsive Pleading filed by MTGLQ Investors, L.P.. Responses due by 10/3/2018. (Boughton, Shanna)
September 17, 2018 Filing 2 CASE OPENING NOTICE ISSUED (Simoncelli, Michael)
September 17, 2018 Case assigned to District Judge John J. McConnell, Jr. and Magistrate Judge Patricia A. Sullivan. (Simoncelli, Michael)
September 14, 2018 Filing 1 NEW CASE/NOTICE OF REMOVAL Filing fee $ 400, receipt number 0103-1263261, filed by MTGLQ INVESTORS, L.P.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Verified Complaint, #2 Exhibit Entity Summary for Plaintiff, #3 Exhibit 2017 Annual Report, #4 Exhibit Articles of Organization, #5 Exhibit Verified Complaint filed by Gerard DiSanto II, #6 Exhibit Entity Summary, #7 Exhibit North Providence Tax Assesor)(Boughton, Shanna)
September 14, 2018 Filing 1 NEW CASE/NOTICE OF REMOVAL Filing fee $ 400, receipt number 0103-1263261, filed by MTGLQ INVESTORS, L.P.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Verified Complaint, #2 Exhibit Entity Summary for Plaintiff, #3 Exhibit 2017 Annual Report, #4 Exhibit Articles of Organization, #5 Exhibit Verified Complaint filed by Gerard DiSanto II, #6 Exhibit Entity Summary, #7 Exhibit North Providence Tax Assesor)(Boughton, Shanna)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Rhode Island District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Airway Leasing, LLC v. MTGLQ Investors, L.P.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
3rd party plaintiff: MTGLQ INVESTORS, L.P.
Represented By: Shanna M. Boughton
Represented By: Bethany M. Whitmarsh
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: AIRWAY LEASING LLC AIRWAY LEASING, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Airway Leasing, LLC
Represented By: Richard W. Nicholson
Represented By: August Bigos
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
3rd party defendant: Ann-Marie K. DeLuca
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
3rd party defendant: R.J.R. Realty Co.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
3rd party defendant: Rocco A. Deluca
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?