Silvia v. State of Rhode Island, Dept. of Human Services et al
Plaintiff: David A. Silvia
Defendant: Courtney Hawkins and State of Rhode Island, Dept. of Human Services
Case Number: 1:2018cv00517
Filed: September 17, 2018
Court: US District Court for the District of Rhode Island
Presiding Judge: William E Smith
Referring Judge: Patricia A Sullivan
Nature of Suit: Other Statutes: Administrative Procedures Act/Review or Appeal of Agency Decision
Cause of Action: 05:551
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on January 8, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
October 31, 2018 Filing 11 NOTICE of Appearance by Katherine Connolly Sadeck on behalf of Courtney Hawkins, State of Rhode Island, Dept. of Human Services (Sadeck, Katherine)
October 26, 2018 Filing 10 MEMORANDUM IN SUPPORT by David A. Silvia in support of #1 Complaint. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit, #2 Envelope)(Potter, Carrie)
October 24, 2018 Filing 9 Process Return and Receipt Executed by United States Marshal. SUMMONS Returned Executed by State of Rhode Island, Dept. of Human Services. State of Rhode Island, Dept. of Human Services served on 10/11/2018, answer due 11/1/2018. (Potter, Carrie)
October 24, 2018 Filing 8 Process Return and Receipt Executed by United States Marshal. SUMMONS Returned Executed. Courtney Hawkins served on 10/11/2018, answer due 11/1/2018. (Potter, Carrie)
October 19, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 7 REPORT AND RECOMMENDATIONS recommending that Mr. Silvia's complaint be summarily dismissed without prejudice #1 Complaint filed by David A. Silvia. Objections to R&R due by 11/2/2018. So Ordered by Magistrate Judge Patricia A. Sullivan on 10/19/2018. (Noel, Jeannine)
October 16, 2018 Filing 6 MEMORANDUM IN SUPPORT by David A. Silvia in support of #1 Complaint. (Attachments: #1 Envelope)(Simoncelli, Michael)
October 4, 2018 Filing 5 Summons Issued as to Courtney Hawkins, State of Rhode Island, Dept. of Human Services. Summonses and USM-285 Forms forwarded to US Marshals Service for service. (Attachments: #1 USM-285 Form, #2 Summons, #3 USM-285 Form, #4 Envelope)(Potter, Carrie)
September 25, 2018 Filing 4 Letter sent to David Silvia requesting that the Process Receipt and Return form (USM-285) and summons be completed in order for the U.S. Marshals Service to effectuate service pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 4(c)(3). USM -285 form can be found by clicking # here. (Potter, Carrie)
September 24, 2018 Opinion or Order TEXT ORDER granting #2 Motion for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis. So Ordered by Magistrate Judge Patricia A. Sullivan on 9/24/2018. (Saucier, Martha)
September 18, 2018 MOTIONS REFERRED: #2 MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis , referred for determination to Magistrate Judge Patricia A. Sullivan. (Jackson, Ryan)
September 17, 2018 Filing 3 CASE OPENING NOTICE ISSUED (Jackson, Kerrie)
September 17, 2018 Filing 2 MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis , filed by David A. Silvia. (Jackson, Kerrie)
September 17, 2018 Filing 1 COMPLAINT, filed by David A. Silvia. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit, #2 Cover Sheet, #3 Envelope)(Jackson, Kerrie)
September 17, 2018 Filing 3 CASE OPENING NOTICE ISSUED (Jackson, Kerrie)
September 17, 2018 Filing 2 MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis , filed by David A. Silvia. (Jackson, Kerrie)
September 17, 2018 Filing 1 COMPLAINT, filed by David A. Silvia. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit, #2 Cover Sheet, #3 Envelope)(Jackson, Kerrie)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Rhode Island District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Silvia v. State of Rhode Island, Dept. of Human Services et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: David A. Silvia
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Courtney Hawkins
Represented By: Katherine Connolly Sadeck
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: State of Rhode Island, Dept. of Human Services
Represented By: Katherine Connolly Sadeck
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?