Lucas v. State of Rhode Island Department of Children, Youth and Families et al
Plaintiff: William A Lucas, Jr
Defendant: State of Rhode Island Providence County Courthouse and State of Rhode Island Department of Children, Youth and Families
Case Number: 1:2018cv00530
Filed: September 24, 2018
Court: US District Court for the District of Rhode Island
Presiding Judge: John J McConnell
Referring Judge: Patricia A Sullivan
Nature of Suit: Constitutional - State Statute
Cause of Action: 28:1331
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on November 19, 2018. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
November 19, 2018 Filing 8 Summons Issued as to State of Rhode Island Department of Children, Youth and Families. Summons and USM-285 form forwarded to the US Marshals Service for service. (Potter, Carrie)
November 19, 2018 Filing 7 Summons Request filed by William A Lucas, Jr. (Attachments: #1 Envelope)(Potter, Carrie)
November 5, 2018 Filing 6 Letter sent to William A. Lucas, Jr. requesting that the Process Receipt and Return form (USM-285) and summons be completed in order for the U.S. Marshals Service to effectuate service pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 4(c)(3). USM -285 form can be found by clicking # here. (Potter, Carrie)
November 5, 2018 Opinion or Order TEXT ORDER granting #3 Motion for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis - So Ordered by District Judge John J. McConnell, Jr. on 11/5/2018. (Urizandi, Nisshy)
November 5, 2018 Opinion or Order TEXT ORDER vacating #4 Order Dismissing Case - So Ordered by District Judge John J. McConnell, Jr. on 11/5/2018. (Urizandi, Nisshy)
November 2, 2018 Filing 5 Prisoner Trust Fund Account Statement by William A Lucas, Jr. (Attachments: #1 Letter & Envelope)(McGuire, Vickie)
November 1, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 4 ORDER DISMISSING THE CASE WITHOUT PREJUDICE - So Ordered by District Judge John J. McConnell, Jr. on 11/1/2018. (Urizandi, Nisshy)
September 27, 2018 Opinion or Order TEXT ORDER: Plaintiff William A. Lucas, Jr., has submitted the requisite Affidavit in support of his Application to Proceed without Prepayment of Fees, but he has not provided a certified copy of his inmate account statement, obtained from the appropriate official at the ACI, as directed by 1915(a)(2). Accordingly, the Court directs Plaintiff to file a certified copy of his inmate account statement, obtained from and certified by the appropriate official at the ACI, within 30 days of the date of this order. When the Court receives the certified copy, it will rule upon the Application - So Ordered by District Judge John J. McConnell, Jr. on 9/27/2018. (Barletta, Barbara)
September 24, 2018 Filing 3 MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis filed by William A Lucas, Jr. (Potter, Carrie)
September 24, 2018 CLERKS NOTE: Regarding: #2 Complaint. Remote electronic access to the document has been restricted by the Clerks Office as it contains one or more personal identifiers. (Potter, Carrie)
September 24, 2018 Filing 2 COMPLAINT (Unredacted), filed by William A Lucas, Jr.(Potter, Carrie)
September 24, 2018 Filing 1 COMPLAINT (Redacted), filed by William A Lucas, Jr. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Summons, #3 Envelope)(Potter, Carrie)
September 24, 2018 Filing 3 MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis filed by William A Lucas, Jr. (Potter, Carrie)
September 24, 2018 CLERKS NOTE: Regarding: #2 Complaint. Remote electronic access to the document has been restricted by the Clerks Office as it contains one or more personal identifiers. (Potter, Carrie)
September 24, 2018 Filing 2 COMPLAINT (Unredacted), filed by William A Lucas, Jr.(Potter, Carrie)
September 24, 2018 Filing 1 COMPLAINT (Redacted), filed by William A Lucas, Jr. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Summons, #3 Envelope)(Potter, Carrie)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Rhode Island District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Lucas v. State of Rhode Island Department of Children, Youth and Families et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: State of Rhode Island Providence County Courthouse
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: State of Rhode Island Department of Children, Youth and Families
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: William A Lucas, Jr
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?