Rego v. East Side Laboratories, Inc.
Plaintiff: Crystal Rego
Defendant: East Side Laboratories, Inc.
Case Number: 1:2018cv00546
Filed: October 1, 2018
Court: US District Court for the District of Rhode Island
Presiding Judge: Lincoln D Almond
Referring Judge: John J McConnell
Nature of Suit: Labor: Family and Medical Leave Act
Cause of Action: 28:1331
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on November 27, 2018. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
November 27, 2018 Filing 8 NOTICE of Hearing: Telephonic Rule 16 Conference set for Friday, 12/7/2018 at 09:45 AM before District Judge John J. McConnell, Jr. The Court will initiate the call. Counsel shall provide the Clerk with contact information if it differs from the docket sheet. (Barletta, Barbara)
October 19, 2018 Filing 7 ANSWER to Complaint by East Side Laboratories, Inc..(Folger-Hartwell, Jillian)
October 17, 2018 Opinion or Order TEXT ORDER entering #6 Stipulation to extend time to answer; Reset Deadlines: East Side Laboratories, Inc. answer due 10/19/2018- So Ordered by District Judge John J. McConnell, Jr. on 10/17/2018. (Barletta, Barbara)
October 16, 2018 Filing 6 STIPULATION FOR EXTENSION OF TIME filed by East Side Laboratories, Inc.. (Folger-Hartwell, Jillian)
October 11, 2018 Filing 5 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Crystal Rego. All Plaintiffs. (Bejma, Vicki)
October 10, 2018 Opinion or Order TEXT ORDER entering #4 Stipulation to extend time to answer; Reset Deadlines: East Side Laboratories, Inc. answer due 10/16/2018- So Ordered by District Judge John J. McConnell, Jr. on 10/10/2018 (Barletta, Barbara)
October 9, 2018 Filing 4 STIPULATION FOR EXTENSION OF TIME filed by East Side Laboratories, Inc.. (Folger-Hartwell, Jillian)
October 2, 2018 Filing 3 STATE COURT RECORD received electronically from the State of Rhode Island. (Potter, Carrie)
October 1, 2018 Filing 2 CASE OPENING NOTICE ISSUED (Potter, Carrie)
October 1, 2018 Case assigned to District Judge John J. McConnell, Jr. and Magistrate Judge Lincoln D. Almond. (Potter, Carrie)
October 1, 2018 Filing 1 NEW CASE/NOTICE OF REMOVAL from Providence County Superior Court, Case Number PC2018-6381. Filing fee $ 400, receipt number 0103-1268465, filed by East Side Laboratories, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Summons and Complaint, #2 Exhibit Notice of Filing of Notice of Removal, #3 Civil Cover Sheet)(Folger-Hartwell, Jillian)
October 1, 2018 Filing 2 CASE OPENING NOTICE ISSUED (Potter, Carrie)
October 1, 2018 Case assigned to District Judge John J. McConnell, Jr. and Magistrate Judge Lincoln D. Almond. (Potter, Carrie)
October 1, 2018 Filing 1 NEW CASE/NOTICE OF REMOVAL from Providence County Superior Court, Case Number PC2018-6381. Filing fee $ 400, receipt number 0103-1268465, filed by East Side Laboratories, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Summons and Complaint, #2 Exhibit Notice of Filing of Notice of Removal, #3 Civil Cover Sheet)(Folger-Hartwell, Jillian)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Rhode Island District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Rego v. East Side Laboratories, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: East Side Laboratories, Inc.
Represented By: Jillian S. Folger-Hartwell
Represented By: Alexsa Marino
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Crystal Rego
Represented By: Noelle K. Clapham
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?