W.R. Cobb Company v. VJ Designs et al
Plaintiff: W.R. Cobb Company
Defendant: VJ Designs and Benjamin Galili
Case Number: 1:2018cv00551
Filed: October 3, 2018
Court: US District Court for the District of Rhode Island
Presiding Judge: Lincoln D Almond
Referring Judge: John J McConnell
Nature of Suit: Contract: Other
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on November 30, 2018. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
November 30, 2018 Filing 12 MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction filed by All Defendants. Responses due by 12/14/2018. (Attachments: #1 Supporting Memorandum, #2 Affidavit, #3 Exhibit)(Boivin, Mark)
November 30, 2018 Filing 11 NOTICE of Appearance by Mark T. Boivin on behalf of All Defendants (Boivin, Mark)
October 23, 2018 Filing 10 AFFIDAVIT of Service, filed by W.R. Cobb Company for summons and complaint on VJ Designs served on 10/11/2018, answer due 10/31/2018. (Fine, Robert)
October 23, 2018 Filing 9 AFFIDAVIT of Service, filed by W.R. Cobb Company for Summons and Complaint on Benjamin Galili served on 10/20/2018, answer due 11/9/2018. (Fine, Robert)
October 4, 2018 Filing 8 Corporate Disclosure Statement by W.R. Cobb Company. (Fine, Robert)
October 4, 2018 Filing 7 Summons Issued as to Benjamin Galili. (Potter, Carrie)
October 3, 2018 Filing 6 Summons Request filed by W.R. Cobb Company. (Fine, Robert)
October 3, 2018 Filing 5 Summons Issued as to VJ Designs. (Potter, Carrie)
October 3, 2018 Filing 4 CASE OPENING NOTICE ISSUED (Potter, Carrie)
October 3, 2018 Case assigned to District Judge John J. McConnell, Jr. and Magistrate Judge Lincoln D. Almond. (Potter, Carrie)
October 3, 2018 Filing 3 Summons Request filed by W.R. Cobb Company. (Fine, Robert)
October 3, 2018 Filing 2 Civil Cover Sheet filed by All Plaintiffs. Regarding New Case: #1 Complaint . (Fine, Robert) (Main Document 2 replaced on 10/3/2018) (Potter, Carrie).
October 3, 2018 Filing 1 COMPLAINT ( filing fee paid $ 400.00, receipt number 0103-1269747 ), filed by W.R. Cobb Company. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Letter Agreement)(Fine, Robert)
October 3, 2018 Filing 6 Summons Request filed by W.R. Cobb Company. (Fine, Robert)
October 3, 2018 Filing 5 Summons Issued as to VJ Designs. (Potter, Carrie)
October 3, 2018 Filing 4 CASE OPENING NOTICE ISSUED (Potter, Carrie)
October 3, 2018 Case assigned to District Judge John J. McConnell, Jr. and Magistrate Judge Lincoln D. Almond. (Potter, Carrie)
October 3, 2018 Filing 3 Summons Request filed by W.R. Cobb Company. (Fine, Robert)
October 3, 2018 Filing 2 Civil Cover Sheet filed by All Plaintiffs. Regarding New Case: #1 Complaint . (Fine, Robert) (Main Document 2 replaced on 10/3/2018) (Potter, Carrie).
October 3, 2018 Filing 1 COMPLAINT ( filing fee paid $ 400.00, receipt number 0103-1269747 ), filed by W.R. Cobb Company. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Letter Agreement)(Fine, Robert)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Rhode Island District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: W.R. Cobb Company v. VJ Designs et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: VJ Designs
Represented By: Mark T. Boivin
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Benjamin Galili
Represented By: Mark T. Boivin
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: W.R. Cobb Company
Represented By: Robert D. Fine
Represented By: Andre S. Digou
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?