McGraw v. Nationwide Mutual Insurance Company
Plaintiff: Joseph McGraw
Defendant: Nationwide Mutual Insurance Company
Case Number: 1:2018cv00553
Filed: October 4, 2018
Court: US District Court for the District of Rhode Island
Presiding Judge: John J McConnell
Referring Judge: Patricia A Sullivan
Nature of Suit: Insurance
Cause of Action: 28:1441
Jury Demanded By: Defendant
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on November 28, 2018. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
November 28, 2018 Filing 12 MOTION to Sever and Stay Discovery of Plaintiff filed by All Defendants. Responses due by 12/12/2018. (Attachments: #1 Supporting Memorandum, #2 Exhibit)(Whittle, Kristen)
November 15, 2018 Filing 11 AFFIDAVIT by All Plaintiffs. (Bianco, Jay)
November 15, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 10 PRETRIAL SCHEDULING ORDER: Factual Discovery to close by 5/15/2019 and Dispositive Motions shall be filed by 6/14/2019 - So Ordered by District Judge John J. McConnell, Jr. on 11/15/2018. (Barletta, Barbara)
November 15, 2018 Opinion or Order TEXT ORDER: Plaintiff shall provide whatever documentation it wishes to present regarding residency at the time of the accident within 30 days. Defendants will respond within 14 days - So Ordered by District Judge John J. McConnell, Jr. on 11/15/2018. (Barletta, Barbara)
November 15, 2018 Minute Entry for proceedings held before District Judge John J. McConnell, Jr.: Telephonic Rule 16 Conference held on 11/15/2018; Jay C. Bianco and Kristen M. Whittle participated (Barletta, Barbara)
November 12, 2018 Filing 9 NOTICE of Appearance by Edward D. Pare, III on behalf of Nationwide Mutual Insurance Company (Pare, Edward)
November 12, 2018 Filing 8 RULE 16 STATEMENT by Joseph McGraw. (Bianco, Jay)
November 8, 2018 Filing 7 RULE 16 STATEMENT by Nationwide Mutual Insurance Company. (Whittle, Kristen)
October 17, 2018 Filing 6 NOTICE of Hearing: Telephonic Rule 16 Conference set for Thursday, 11/15/2018 at 09:00 AM before District Judge John J. McConnell, Jr. The Court will initiate the call. Counsel shall provide the Clerk with contact information if it differs from the docket sheet. (Barletta, Barbara)
October 10, 2018 Filing 5 ANSWER to Complaint by Nationwide Mutual Insurance Company.(Barletta, Barbara)
October 9, 2018 Filing 4 STATE COURT RECORD received electronically from the State of Rhode Island. (Potter, Carrie)
October 4, 2018 Filing 3 Corporate Disclosure Statement by Nationwide Mutual Insurance Company identifying Corporate Parent Nationwide Mutual Insurance Company for Nationwide Mutual Insurance Company.. (Whittle, Kristen)
October 4, 2018 Filing 2 CASE OPENING NOTICE ISSUED (Potter, Carrie)
October 4, 2018 Case assigned to District Judge John J. McConnell, Jr. and Magistrate Judge Patricia A. Sullivan. (Potter, Carrie)
October 4, 2018 Filing 1 NEW CASE/NOTICE OF REMOVAL from Providence County Superior Court, Case Number PC2018-6265. Filing fee $ 400, receipt number 0103-1270280, filed by Nationwide Mutual Insurance Company. (Attachments: #1 State Court Complaint, #2 State Court Notice of Removal, #3 Civil Cover Sheet)(Whittle, Kristen)
October 4, 2018 Filing 3 Corporate Disclosure Statement by Nationwide Mutual Insurance Company identifying Corporate Parent Nationwide Mutual Insurance Company for Nationwide Mutual Insurance Company.. (Whittle, Kristen)
October 4, 2018 Filing 2 CASE OPENING NOTICE ISSUED (Potter, Carrie)
October 4, 2018 Case assigned to District Judge John J. McConnell, Jr. and Magistrate Judge Patricia A. Sullivan. (Potter, Carrie)
October 4, 2018 Filing 1 NEW CASE/NOTICE OF REMOVAL from Providence County Superior Court, Case Number PC2018-6265. Filing fee $ 400, receipt number 0103-1270280, filed by Nationwide Mutual Insurance Company. (Attachments: #1 State Court Complaint, #2 State Court Notice of Removal, #3 Civil Cover Sheet)(Whittle, Kristen)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Rhode Island District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: McGraw v. Nationwide Mutual Insurance Company
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Joseph McGraw
Represented By: Jay C. Bianco
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Nationwide Mutual Insurance Company
Represented By: Kristen M. Whittle
Represented By: Edward D. Pare, III
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?