Cooley, Incorporated v. Silvia
Plaintiff: Cooley, Incorporated
Defendant: Justin J. Silvia
Intervenor: Edmund Bard and Response Technologies, LLC
Interested Party: David Pettey
Case Number: 1:2018cv00557
Filed: October 9, 2018
Court: US District Court for the District of Rhode Island
Presiding Judge: John J McConnell
Referring Judge: Patricia A Sullivan
Nature of Suit: Contract: Other
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on December 7, 2018. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
December 7, 2018 Filing 24 RESPONSE In Opposition to #22 Joint MOTION to Approve Consent Judgment filed by Edmund Bard, David Pettey, Response Technologies, LLC. Replies due by 12/14/2018. (Silveira, Lori)
November 26, 2018 Opinion or Order TEXT ORDER granting #23 Motion to Intervene for purpose of objecting to #22 Motion for Entry of Consent Order. Intervenor shall file an objection to the Motion on or before 12/7/18 -- So Ordered by District Judge John J. McConnell, Jr. on 11/26/2018 (Barletta, Barbara)
November 21, 2018 Filing 23 MOTION to Intervene For Limited Purpose of Objecting to Joint Motion for Entry of Consent Judgment filed by David Pettey, Response Technologies, LLC, Justin J. Silvia. Responses due by 12/5/2018. (Silveira, Lori)
November 20, 2018 Filing 22 Joint MOTION to Approve Consent Judgment filed by Cooley, Incorporated. Responses due by 12/4/2018. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Proposed Consent Judgment)(Parker, Matthew)
November 15, 2018 HEARING CANCELLED: The Telephonic Rule 16 Conference scheduled for Monday, 11/26/18 at 9:30 a.m. before Judge John J. McConnell, Jr. is cancelled (Barletta, Barbara)
November 8, 2018 Opinion or Order TEXT ORDER denying #19 Motion to Quash; The Court has issued a Protective Order (ECF No. 21). So Ordered by District Judge John J. McConnell, Jr. on 11/8/2018. (Urizandi, Nisshy)
November 8, 2018 Opinion or Order TEXT ORDER VACATING Text Order on Motion for Protective Order - So Ordered by District Judge John J. McConnell, Jr. on 11/8/2018. (Urizandi, Nisshy)
November 8, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 21 PROTECTIVE ORDER - So Ordered by District Judge John J. McConnell, Jr. on 11/8/2018. (Urizandi, Nisshy)
November 8, 2018 Opinion or Order TEXT ORDER granting #19 Motion for Protective Order - So Ordered by District Judge John J. McConnell, Jr. on 11/8/2018. (Urizandi, Nisshy)
November 7, 2018 Filing 20 RESPONSE In Opposition to #19 MOTION for Protective Order filed by Cooley, Incorporated. Replies due by 11/14/2018. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit, #2 Exhibit)(Parker, Matthew)
November 7, 2018 NOTICE of Hearing on Motion #19 MOTION for Protective Order : Telephonic Hearing set for 11/7/2018 at 2:30 PM before District Judge John J. McConnell, Jr. Court to initiate the call. Parties to notify the case manger if contact information is different from that listed on the docket sheet. (Urizandi, Nisshy)
November 7, 2018 Filing 19 MOTION to Quash filed by Edmund Bard, David Pettey, Response Technologies, LLC. Responses due by 11/21/2018. (Silveira, Lori) Modified on 11/8/2018 to correct docket event (Urizandi, Nisshy).
November 7, 2018 Filing 18 NOTICE of Appearance by Lori Caron Silveira on behalf of Response Technologies, LLC, David Pettey, Edmund Bard (Silveira, Lori)
November 5, 2018 Filing 17 NOTICE of Hearing: Telephonic Rule 16 Conference set for Monday, 11/26/2018 at 09:30 AM before District Judge John J. McConnell, Jr. The Court will initiate the call. Counsel shall provide the Clerk with contact information if it differs from the docket sheet. (Barletta, Barbara)
October 31, 2018 Filing 16 ANSWER to Complaint by Justin J. Silvia.(Lepizzera, Michael)
October 30, 2018 Filing 15 ACKNOWLEDGEMENT OF SERVICE Executed for 6 Subpoenas Acknowledgement filed by Cooley, Incorporated. (Parker, Matthew)
October 24, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 14 CONSENT ORDER amending #6 Order on Motion for TRO - So Ordered by District Judge John J. McConnell, Jr. on 10/24/2018 (Barletta, Barbara)
October 22, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 13 PROTECTIVE ORDER - So Ordered by District Judge John J. McConnell, Jr. on 10/22/2018. (Urizandi, Nisshy)
October 22, 2018 Opinion or Order TEXT ORDER granting #12 Motion for Protective Order - So Ordered by District Judge John J. McConnell, Jr. on 10/22/2018. (Urizandi, Nisshy)
October 19, 2018 Filing 12 Joint MOTION for Protective Order filed by Cooley, Incorporated. Responses due by 11/2/2018. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1)(Parker, Matthew)
October 12, 2018 Filing 11 NOTICE of Appearance by Timothy K. Baldwin on behalf of Cooley, Incorporated (Baldwin, Timothy)
October 11, 2018 Minute Entry for proceedings held before District Judge John J. McConnell, Jr.: Telephone Conference held on 10/11/2018; Matthew H. Parker, Michael J. Lepizzera and Stephen Angell participated (Barletta, Barbara)
October 11, 2018 NOTICE of Hearing: Telephone Conference set for Thursday, 10/11/2018 at 02:00 PM before District Judge John J. McConnell, Jr.; Court to initiate call. (Barletta, Barbara)
October 10, 2018 Filing 10 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Cooley, Incorporated. Justin J. Silvia served on 10/9/2018, answer due 10/30/2018. (Parker, Matthew)
October 10, 2018 Filing 9 NOTICE of Appearance by Stephen J. Angell on behalf of Justin J. Silvia (Lepizzera, Michael) Modified on 11/27/2018 to add correct attorney (Barletta, Barbara).
October 10, 2018 Filing 8 NOTICE of Appearance by Michael J. Lepizzera on behalf of Justin J. Silvia (Lepizzera, Michael)
October 9, 2018 Filing 7 Corporate Disclosure Statement by Cooley, Incorporated identifying Corporate Parent Cooley Group Holdings, Inc. for Cooley, Incorporated.. (Parker, Matthew)
October 9, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 6 TEMPORARY RESTRAINING ORDER - So Ordered by District Judge John J. McConnell, Jr. on 10/9/2018 (Barletta, Barbara)
October 9, 2018 Minute Entry for proceedings held before District Judge John J. McConnell, Jr.: Telephone Conference held on 10/9/2018; Matthew H. Parker participated. (Barletta, Barbara)
October 9, 2018 NOTICE of Hearing: Telephonic TRO Conference set for Tuesday, 10/9/2018 at 03:00 PM before District Judge John J. McConnell, Jr.; Court to initiate call. Kindly provide clerk at 401-752-7202 with telephone contact information if it differs from the docket sheet (Barletta, Barbara)
October 9, 2018 Filing 5 MOTION for Temporary Restraining Order filed by Cooley, Incorporated. (Parker, Matthew)
October 9, 2018 CORRECTIVE DOCKET ENTRY Regarding: 2 Case Opening Notice. Please disregard ECF entry 2. ECF document 3 is the correct document. (Potter, Carrie)
October 9, 2018 Filing 4 Summons Issued as to Justin J. Silvia. (Potter, Carrie)
October 9, 2018 Filing 3 CASE OPENING NOTICE ISSUED (Potter, Carrie)
October 9, 2018 Filing 2 CASE OPENING NOTICE ISSUED (Potter, Carrie)
October 9, 2018 Case assigned to District Judge John J. McConnell, Jr. and Magistrate Judge Patricia A. Sullivan. (Potter, Carrie)
October 9, 2018 Filing 1 COMPLAINT ( filing fee paid $ 400.00, receipt number 0103-1271015 ), filed by Cooley, Incorporated. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit 2, #3 Exhibit 3, #4 Exhibit 4, #5 Exhibit 5, #6 Civil Cover Sheet Civil Cover Sheet, #7 Summons)(Parker, Matthew)
October 9, 2018 Filing 7 Corporate Disclosure Statement by Cooley, Incorporated identifying Corporate Parent Cooley Group Holdings, Inc. for Cooley, Incorporated.. (Parker, Matthew)
October 9, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 6 TEMPORARY RESTRAINING ORDER - So Ordered by District Judge John J. McConnell, Jr. on 10/9/2018 (Barletta, Barbara)
October 9, 2018 Minute Entry for proceedings held before District Judge John J. McConnell, Jr.: Telephone Conference held on 10/9/2018; Matthew H. Parker participated. (Barletta, Barbara)
October 9, 2018 NOTICE of Hearing: Telephonic TRO Conference set for Tuesday, 10/9/2018 at 03:00 PM before District Judge John J. McConnell, Jr.; Court to initiate call. Kindly provide clerk at 401-752-7202 with telephone contact information if it differs from the docket sheet (Barletta, Barbara)
October 9, 2018 Filing 5 MOTION for Temporary Restraining Order filed by Cooley, Incorporated. (Parker, Matthew)
October 9, 2018 CORRECTIVE DOCKET ENTRY Regarding: 2 Case Opening Notice. Please disregard ECF entry 2. ECF document 3 is the correct document. (Potter, Carrie)
October 9, 2018 Filing 4 Summons Issued as to Justin J. Silvia. (Potter, Carrie)
October 9, 2018 Filing 3 CASE OPENING NOTICE ISSUED (Potter, Carrie)
October 9, 2018 Filing 2 CASE OPENING NOTICE ISSUED (Potter, Carrie)
October 9, 2018 Case assigned to District Judge John J. McConnell, Jr. and Magistrate Judge Patricia A. Sullivan. (Potter, Carrie)
October 9, 2018 Filing 1 COMPLAINT ( filing fee paid $ 400.00, receipt number 0103-1271015 ), filed by Cooley, Incorporated. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit 2, #3 Exhibit 3, #4 Exhibit 4, #5 Exhibit 5, #6 Civil Cover Sheet Civil Cover Sheet, #7 Summons)(Parker, Matthew)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Rhode Island District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Cooley, Incorporated v. Silvia
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Justin J. Silvia
Represented By: Michael J. Lepizzera
Represented By: Stephen J. Angell
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Cooley, Incorporated
Represented By: Matthew H. Parker
Represented By: Timothy K. Baldwin
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Intervenor: Edmund Bard
Represented By: Lori Caron Silveira
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Intervenor: Response Technologies, LLC
Represented By: Lori Caron Silveira
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Interested party: David Pettey
Represented By: Lori Caron Silveira
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?