Mannix v. CBS Corporation
Plaintiff: Patricia Mannix
Defendant: Rapid American Corporation, Ingersoll-Rand Company, Hobart Corp., Anchor Packing Company, Crane Co., Crwon, Cork & Seal Co., Inc., Foster Wheeler Corporation, Donlee Technologies, Inc., A.W. Chesterton Company, General Electric Company, Packing & Insulations Corporation, BOC Group, Inc., Warren Pumps, Lincoln Electric Corporation, Ericsson Radio Systems, Inc., John Crane, Inc., Metropolitan Life Insurance Company, Gould Pumps, Eastern Refractories Company, Inc., Carborundum Company, Inc., Okonite Company, Garlock, Inc., Minnesota Mining & Manufacturing Company, H.B. Smith Company, Inc., CBS Corporation, IMO Industries, P.I.C. Contractors, Inc., York Shipley Inc., Crown, Cork & Seal Co., Inc. and IMO Delaval
Case Number: 1:2018cv00558
Filed: October 9, 2018
Court: US District Court for the District of Rhode Island
Presiding Judge: William E Smith
Referring Judge: Patricia A Sullivan
Nature of Suit: P.I. : Asbestos
Cause of Action: 28:1331
Jury Demanded By: Both
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on January 9, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
November 21, 2018 Filing 16 RESPONSE In Opposition to #15 MOTION to Remand to State Court filed by CBS Corporation. Replies due by 11/28/2018. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit Exhibit 2, #3 Exhibit Exhibit 3, #4 Exhibit Exhibit 4, #5 Exhibit Exhibit 5, #6 Exhibit Exhibit 6 Part 1 of 2, #7 Exhibit Exhibit 6 Part 2 of 2, #8 Exhibit Exhibit 7, #9 Exhibit Exhibit 8, #10 Exhibit Exhibit 9)(Lyons, Thomas)
November 8, 2018 Filing 15 MOTION to Remand to State Court filed by Patricia Mannix. Responses due by 11/23/2018. (Attachments: #1 Supporting Memorandum, #2 Exhibit A, #3 Exhibit B, #4 Exhibit C, #5 Exhibit D)(Greene, Vincent)
November 1, 2018 Filing 14 ANSWER to Complaint (Notice of Removal), CROSSCLAIM against All Defendants by H.B. Smith Company, Inc.. (Potter, Carrie)
November 1, 2018 Filing 13 ANSWER to Complaint (Notice of Removal), CROSSCLAIM against All Defendants by General Electric Company. (Potter, Carrie)
November 1, 2018 Filing 12 ANSWER to Complaint (Notice of Removal), CROSSCLAIM against All Defendants by Garlock, Inc.. (Potter, Carrie)
November 1, 2018 Filing 11 ANSWER to Complaint (Notice of Removal) by Donlee Technologies, Inc.. (Potter, Carrie)
November 1, 2018 Filing 10 ANSWER to Complaint (Notice of Removal), CROSSCLAIM against All Defendants by CBS Corporation. (Potter, Carrie)
November 1, 2018 Filing 9 ANSWER to Complaint (Notice of Removal), CROSSCLAIM against Anchor Packing Company, CBS Corporation, Crane Co., Crown, Cork & Seal Co., Inc., Donlee Technologies, Inc., Eastern Refractories Company, Inc., Garlock, Inc., General Electric Company, Gould Pumps, H.B. Smith Company, Inc., IMO Delaval, John Crane, Inc., Metropolitan Life Insurance Company, Minnesota Mining & Manufacturing Company, Okonite Company, P.I.C. Contractors, Inc., Packing & Insulations Corporation, Rapid American Corporation, York Shipley Inc. by A.W. Chesterton Company. (Potter, Carrie)
November 1, 2018 Filing 8 ANSWER to Complaint (Notice of Removal), CROSSCLAIM against A.W. Chesterton Company, CBS Corporation, Crane Co., Crown, Cork & Seal Co., Inc., Donlee Technologies, Inc., Eastern Refractories Company, Inc., Garlock, Inc., General Electric Company, Gould Pumps, H.B. Smith Company, Inc., IMO Delaval, John Crane, Inc., Metropolitan Life Insurance Company, Minnesota Mining & Manufacturing Company, Okonite Company, P.I.C. Contractors, Inc., Packing & Insulations Corporation, Rapid American Corporation, York Shipley Inc. by Anchor Packing Company. (Potter, Carrie)
October 18, 2018 Filing 7 STATE COURT RECORD received electronically from the State of Rhode Island. (Potter, Carrie) (Additional attachment(s) added on 10/19/2018: #1 Clerk's Certificate, #2 State Docket Sheet) (Potter, Carrie).
October 16, 2018 Filing 6 Corporate Disclosure Statement by CBS Corporation identifying Corporate Parent NAI Entertainment Holdings LLC, Corporate Parent National Amusements, Inc. for CBS Corporation.. (Lyons, Thomas)
October 16, 2018 Filing 5 Corporate Disclosure Statement by General Electric Company. (Shannon, Anne)
October 16, 2018 Filing 4 NOTICE of Appearance by Anne E. Shannon on behalf of General Electric Company (Shannon, Anne)
October 9, 2018 Filing 3 CASE OPENING NOTICE ISSUED (Potter, Carrie)
October 9, 2018 Case assigned to Chief Judge William E. Smith and Magistrate Judge Patricia A. Sullivan. (Potter, Carrie)
October 9, 2018 Filing 2 Civil Cover Sheet filed by CBS Corporation. Regarding New Case: #1 Notice of Removal - New Case, . (Lyons, Thomas)
October 9, 2018 Filing 1 NEW CASE/NOTICE OF REMOVAL from Providence County Superior Court, Case Number C.A. No. PC 07-5269. Filing fee $ 400, receipt number 0103-1271183, filed by CBS Corporation. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit State Court Complaint)(Lyons, Thomas) (Additional attachment(s) added on 10/9/2018: #2 State Court Notice of Removal) (Potter, Carrie).
October 9, 2018 Filing 3 CASE OPENING NOTICE ISSUED (Potter, Carrie)
October 9, 2018 Case assigned to Chief Judge William E. Smith and Magistrate Judge Patricia A. Sullivan. (Potter, Carrie)
October 9, 2018 Filing 2 Civil Cover Sheet filed by CBS Corporation. Regarding New Case: #1 Notice of Removal - New Case, . (Lyons, Thomas)
October 9, 2018 Filing 1 NEW CASE/NOTICE OF REMOVAL from Providence County Superior Court, Case Number C.A. No. PC 07-5269. Filing fee $ 400, receipt number 0103-1271183, filed by CBS Corporation. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit State Court Complaint)(Lyons, Thomas) (Additional attachment(s) added on 10/9/2018: #2 State Court Notice of Removal) (Potter, Carrie).

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Rhode Island District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Mannix v. CBS Corporation
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Rapid American Corporation
Represented By: Mark P. Dolan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Ingersoll-Rand Company
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Hobart Corp.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Anchor Packing Company
Represented By: Andrew C. Coulam
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Crane Co.
Represented By: Timothy J. Dodd
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Crwon, Cork & Seal Co., Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Foster Wheeler Corporation
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Donlee Technologies, Inc.
Represented By: Alex A. Romano
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: A.W. Chesterton Company
Represented By: Brian D. Gross
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: General Electric Company
Represented By: Anne E. Shannon
Represented By: Jeffrey M. Thomen
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Packing & Insulations Corporation
Represented By: Paul V. Sullivan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: BOC Group, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Warren Pumps
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Lincoln Electric Corporation
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Ericsson Radio Systems, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: John Crane, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Metropolitan Life Insurance Company
Represented By: Staci L. Kolb
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Gould Pumps
Represented By: Kevin C. McCaffrey
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Eastern Refractories Company, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Carborundum Company, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Okonite Company
Represented By: Jonathan F. Tabasky
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Garlock, Inc.
Represented By: Craig R. Waksler
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Minnesota Mining & Manufacturing Company
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: H.B. Smith Company, Inc.
Represented By: Peter F. Mathieu
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: CBS Corporation
Represented By: Thomas W. Lyons, III
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: IMO Industries
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: P.I.C. Contractors, Inc.
Represented By: Paul V. Sullivan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: York Shipley Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Crown, Cork & Seal Co., Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: IMO Delaval
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Patricia Mannix
Represented By: Robert J. McConnell
Represented By: Donald A. Migliori
Represented By: Vincent L. Greene, IV
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?