Robert R. v. Commissioner of Social Security
Plaintiff: Robert Anthony Ryan
Defendant: Commissioner of Social Security
Interested Party: Social Security Administration
Case Number: 1:2018cv00561
Filed: October 11, 2018
Court: US District Court for the District of Rhode Island
Presiding Judge: Lincoln D Almond
Referring Judge: John J McConnell
Nature of Suit: Social Security: DIWC/DIWW
Cause of Action: 42:405
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on April 19, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
December 7, 2018 Filing 7 ANSWER to Complaint by Commissioner of Social Security.(Nitze, Paul)
December 7, 2018 Filing 6 SOCIAL SECURITY ADMINISTRATIVE RECORD filed by Commissioner of Social Security. (Nitze, Paul)
November 14, 2018 Filing 5 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Robert Anthony Ryan. Commissioner of Social Security served on 10/15/2018, answer due 12/14/2018. (Osterhout, Karl)
October 11, 2018 Filing 4 Summons Issued as to Commissioner of Social Security, U.S. Attorney and U.S. Attorney General (Attachments: #1 Summons, #2 Summons)(Potter, Carrie)
October 11, 2018 Opinion or Order TEXT ORDER granting #2 Motion for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis - So Ordered by District Judge John J. McConnell, Jr. on 10/11/2018. (Urizandi, Nisshy)
October 11, 2018 Opinion or Order TEXT ORDER granting #3 Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice of Karl E. Osterhout. So Ordered by District Judge John J. McConnell, Jr. on 10/11/2018. (Potter, Carrie)
October 11, 2018 Case assigned to District Judge John J. McConnell, Jr. and Magistrate Judge Lincoln D. Almond. (Potter, Carrie)
October 11, 2018 Filing 3 MOTION for KARL E. OSTERHOUT to Appear Pro Hac Vice ( filing fee paid $ 100.00, receipt number 0103-1272194 ) filed by ROBERT ANTHONY RYAN. (Woods, Kerin)
October 11, 2018 Filing 2 MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis filed by ROBERT ANTHONY RYAN. (Woods, Kerin)
October 11, 2018 Filing 1 COMPLAINT (No fee paid, USA, Waived by Statute, or IFP.), filed by ROBERT ANTHONY RYAN. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 SUMMONS, #3 SUMMONS, #4 SUMMONS)(Woods, Kerin)
October 11, 2018 Filing 4 Summons Issued as to Commissioner of Social Security, U.S. Attorney and U.S. Attorney General (Attachments: #1 Summons, #2 Summons)(Potter, Carrie)
October 11, 2018 Opinion or Order TEXT ORDER granting #2 Motion for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis - So Ordered by District Judge John J. McConnell, Jr. on 10/11/2018. (Urizandi, Nisshy)
October 11, 2018 Opinion or Order TEXT ORDER granting #3 Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice of Karl E. Osterhout. So Ordered by District Judge John J. McConnell, Jr. on 10/11/2018. (Potter, Carrie)
October 11, 2018 Case assigned to District Judge John J. McConnell, Jr. and Magistrate Judge Lincoln D. Almond. (Potter, Carrie)
October 11, 2018 Filing 3 MOTION for KARL E. OSTERHOUT to Appear Pro Hac Vice ( filing fee paid $ 100.00, receipt number 0103-1272194 ) filed by ROBERT ANTHONY RYAN. (Woods, Kerin)
October 11, 2018 Filing 2 MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis filed by ROBERT ANTHONY RYAN. (Woods, Kerin)
October 11, 2018 Filing 1 COMPLAINT (No fee paid, USA, Waived by Statute, or IFP.), filed by ROBERT ANTHONY RYAN. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 SUMMONS, #3 SUMMONS, #4 SUMMONS)(Woods, Kerin)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Rhode Island District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Robert R. v. Commissioner of Social Security
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Commissioner of Social Security
Represented By: Paul K. Nitze
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Robert Anthony Ryan
Represented By: Kerin M. Woods
Represented By: Karl E. Osterhout
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Interested party: Social Security Administration
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?