Marquis v. Portfolio Recovery Associates, LLC

Plaintiff: Robert Marquis
Defendant: Portfolio Recovery Associates, LLC
Case Number: 1:2018cv00567
Filed: October 15, 2018
Court: US District Court for the District of Rhode Island
Presiding Judge: John J McConnell
Referring Judge: Patricia A Sullivan
Nature of Suit: Consumer Credit
Cause of Action: 28:3001
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on December 6, 2018. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
December 6, 2018 Opinion or Order TEXT ORDER: Pursuant to the #8 Notice of Settlement, all pending deadlines are vacated -- So Ordered by District Judge John J. McConnell, Jr. on 12/6/2018. (Barletta, Barbara)
December 5, 2018 Filing 8 NOTICE by Robert Marquis of Settlement (Munro-Delotto, Paige)
November 26, 2018 Opinion or Order TEXT ORDER entering #7 Stipulation to extend time to answer; Reset Deadlines: Portfolio Recovery Associates, LLC answer due 12/26/2018- So Ordered by District Judge John J. McConnell, Jr. on 11/26/2018. (Barletta, Barbara)
November 21, 2018 Filing 7 STIPULATION to Extend Time to Answer filed by Portfolio Recovery Associates, LLC. (Nash, Margaret)
November 21, 2018 Filing 6 NOTICE of Appearance by Margaret C. Nash on behalf of Portfolio Recovery Associates, LLC (Nash, Margaret)
November 12, 2018 Filing 5 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Robert Marquis. Portfolio Recovery Associates, LLC served on 11/2/2018, answer due 11/23/2018. (Munro-Delotto, Paige)
October 15, 2018 Filing 4 Summons Issued as to Portfolio Recovery Associates, LLC. (Potter, Carrie)
October 15, 2018 Filing 3 Summons Request filed by Robert Marquis. (Munro-Delotto, Paige)
October 15, 2018 Filing 2 CASE OPENING NOTICE ISSUED (Potter, Carrie)
October 15, 2018 Case assigned to District Judge John J. McConnell, Jr. and Magistrate Judge Patricia A. Sullivan. (Potter, Carrie)
October 15, 2018 Filing 1 COMPLAINT ( filing fee paid $ 400.00, receipt number 0103-1273168 ), filed by ROBERT MARQUIS. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)(Munro-Delotto, Paige)
October 15, 2018 Filing 4 Summons Issued as to Portfolio Recovery Associates, LLC. (Potter, Carrie)
October 15, 2018 Filing 3 Summons Request filed by Robert Marquis. (Munro-Delotto, Paige)
October 15, 2018 Filing 2 CASE OPENING NOTICE ISSUED (Potter, Carrie)
October 15, 2018 Case assigned to District Judge John J. McConnell, Jr. and Magistrate Judge Patricia A. Sullivan. (Potter, Carrie)
October 15, 2018 Filing 1 COMPLAINT ( filing fee paid $ 400.00, receipt number 0103-1273168 ), filed by ROBERT MARQUIS. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)(Munro-Delotto, Paige)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Rhode Island District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Marquis v. Portfolio Recovery Associates, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Portfolio Recovery Associates, LLC
Represented By: Margaret C. Nash
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Robert Marquis
Represented By: Paige Alexandra Munro-Delotto
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?