Wilmington Savings Fund Society, FSB v. Sherman et al
Plaintiff: Wilmington Savings Fund Society, FSB
Defendant: Debra A. Sherman, The Bank of New York Mellon and George F. Sherman, Jr.
Case Number: 1:2018cv00572
Filed: October 17, 2018
Court: US District Court for the District of Rhode Island
Presiding Judge: William E Smith
Referring Judge: Patricia A Sullivan
Nature of Suit: Real Property: Foreclosure
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on December 11, 2018. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
December 11, 2018 Filing 10 CLERK'S ENTRY OF DEFAULT as to Debra A. Sherman, George F. Sherman, Jr., The Bank of New York Mellon (Potter, Carrie)
December 11, 2018 Filing 9 AFFIDAVIT re #8 Application for Clerk's Entry of Default as to Military Service and Competency by Wilmington Savings Fund Society, FSB. (Eastwood, Catherine)
December 11, 2018 Filing 8 APPLICATION for Clerk's Entry of Default filed by Wilmington Savings Fund Society, FSB as to All Defendants. (Eastwood, Catherine)
November 19, 2018 Filing 7 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Wilmington Savings Fund Society, FSB. The Bank of New York Mellon served on 11/13/2018, answer due 12/4/2018. (Eastwood, Catherine)
October 31, 2018 Filing 6 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Wilmington Savings Fund Society, FSB. Debra A. Sherman served on 10/29/2018, answer due 11/19/2018; George F. Sherman, Jr. served on 10/29/2018, answer due 11/19/2018. (Attachments: #1 ROS_George)(Eastwood, Catherine)
October 22, 2018 Filing 5 Corporate Disclosure Statement by Wilmington Savings Fund Society, FSB identifying Corporate Parent WSFS Financial Corporation for Wilmington Savings Fund Society, FSB.. (McNicholas, John)
October 17, 2018 Filing 4 Summons Issued as to Debra A. Sherman, George F. Sherman, Jr., The Bank of New York Mellon. (Attachments: #1 Summons, #2 Summons)(Potter, Carrie)
October 17, 2018 Filing 3 CASE OPENING NOTICE ISSUED (Potter, Carrie)
October 17, 2018 Case assigned to Chief Judge William E. Smith and Magistrate Judge Patricia A. Sullivan. (Potter, Carrie)
October 17, 2018 Filing 2 NOTICE by Wilmington Savings Fund Society, FSB, d/b/a Christiana Trust, not individually but as trustee for Pretium Mortgage Acquisition Trust re #1 Complaint,, of Availability of Loss Mitigation and Mediation Programs (McNicholas, John)
October 17, 2018 Filing 1 COMPLAINT ( filing fee paid $ 400.00, receipt number 0103-1274421 ), filed by Wilmington Savings Fund Society, FSB, d/b/a Christiana Trust, not individually but as trustee for Pretium Mortgage Acquisition Trust. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1 - Assessor Card, #2 Exhibit 2 - Note, #3 Exhibit 3 - Mortgage, #4 Exhibit 4 - Assignment, #5 Exhibit 5 - Demands, #6 Exhibit 6 - Pay History, #7 Exhibit 7 - Accels, #8 Exhibit 8 - Assignment, #9 Civil Cover Sheet, #10 Summons - Debra, #11 Summons - George, #12 Summons - The Bank of New York Mellon)(McNicholas, John)
October 17, 2018 Filing 4 Summons Issued as to Debra A. Sherman, George F. Sherman, Jr., The Bank of New York Mellon. (Attachments: #1 Summons, #2 Summons)(Potter, Carrie)
October 17, 2018 Filing 3 CASE OPENING NOTICE ISSUED (Potter, Carrie)
October 17, 2018 Case assigned to Chief Judge William E. Smith and Magistrate Judge Patricia A. Sullivan. (Potter, Carrie)
October 17, 2018 Filing 2 NOTICE by Wilmington Savings Fund Society, FSB, d/b/a Christiana Trust, not individually but as trustee for Pretium Mortgage Acquisition Trust re #1 Complaint,, of Availability of Loss Mitigation and Mediation Programs (McNicholas, John)
October 17, 2018 Filing 1 COMPLAINT ( filing fee paid $ 400.00, receipt number 0103-1274421 ), filed by Wilmington Savings Fund Society, FSB, d/b/a Christiana Trust, not individually but as trustee for Pretium Mortgage Acquisition Trust. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1 - Assessor Card, #2 Exhibit 2 - Note, #3 Exhibit 3 - Mortgage, #4 Exhibit 4 - Assignment, #5 Exhibit 5 - Demands, #6 Exhibit 6 - Pay History, #7 Exhibit 7 - Accels, #8 Exhibit 8 - Assignment, #9 Civil Cover Sheet, #10 Summons - Debra, #11 Summons - George, #12 Summons - The Bank of New York Mellon)(McNicholas, John)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Rhode Island District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Wilmington Savings Fund Society, FSB v. Sherman et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Debra A. Sherman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: The Bank of New York Mellon
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: George F. Sherman, Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Wilmington Savings Fund Society, FSB
Represented By: John S. McNicholas
Represented By: Catherine V. Eastwood
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?