Iovinelli v. Matlet Group, LLC et al

Plaintiff: Joseph Iovinelli
Defendant: Packaging Concepts, LLC and Matlet Group, LLC
Intervenor Plaintiff: Maria Escobar, Nilda Beltre, Lissette Bonilla, Wendy Baez, Eliecer De La Rosa, Luis Rodas, Daniel Perez, Edgar Civino, Fluvia Lopez, Mireya Osoria, Yohanna Gomez, Mercedes Adames, Maritza Aponte, Joao Sebastiao, Brenda Cano, Felix Gonzalez, Myrna Martinez, Emilio Perez, July Polanco, Milagros Rodriguez, Rebecca Francia, Judith De La Ossa, Johanna Calle, Maria Borda, Francisca Fernandez, Ana Gomes, Blanca Chipillae, Yocasta Pichardo, Olga Cordoba and Miguel Robles
Case Number: 1:2018cv00573
Filed: October 17, 2018
Court: US District Court for the District of Rhode Island
0 Judge: Lincoln D Almond
1 Judge: William E Smith
Nature of Suit: Labor: Other
Cause of Action: 29:2101
Jury Demanded By: None

Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on November 19, 2018. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
November 19, 2018 Filing 8 RESPONSE In Opposition to #7 MOTION to Intervene As Plaintiffs filed by Joseph Iovinelli. Replies due by 11/26/2018. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A)(Roupinian, Rene)
November 5, 2018 Filing 7 MOTION to Intervene As Plaintiffs filed by Mercedes Adames, Maritza Aponte, Wendy Baez, Nilda Beltre, Lissette Bonilla, Maria Borda, Johanna Calle, Brenda Cano, Blanca Chipillae, Edgar Civino, Olga Cordoba, Judith De La Ossa, Eliecer De La Rosa, Maria Escobar, Francisca Fernandez, Rebecca Francia, Ana Gomes, Yohanna Gomez, Felix Gonzalez, Fluvia Lopez, Myrna Martinez, Mireya Osoria, Daniel Perez, Emilio Perez, Yocasta Pichardo, July Polanco, Miguel Robles, Luis Rodas, Milagros Rodriguez, Joao Sebastiao. Responses due by 11/19/2018. (Gursky, Marc)
November 5, 2018 Filing 6 NOTICE of Appearance by Marc B. Gursky on behalf of Mercedes Adames, Maritza Aponte, Wendy Baez, Nilda Beltre, Lissette Bonilla, Maria Borda, Johanna Calle, Brenda Cano, Blanca Chipillae, Olga Cordoba, Edgar Civino, Judith De La Ossa, Eliecer De La Rosa, Maria Escobar, Francisca Fernandez, Rebecca Francia, Ana Gomes, Yohanna Gomez, Felix Gonzalez, Fluvia Lopez, Myrna Martinez, Mireya Osoria, Daniel Perez, Emilio Perez, Yocasta Pichardo, July Polanco, Miguel Robles, Luis Rodas, Milagros Rodriguez, Joao Sebastiao (Gursky, Marc)
October 18, 2018 Filing 5 Summons Issued as to Matlet Group, LLC, Packaging Concepts, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Packaging Graphics Summons)(Farrell Pletcher, Paula)
October 18, 2018 Opinion or Order TEXT ORDER granting #3 Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice of Jack A. Raisner. So Ordered by Chief Judge William E. Smith on 10/18/2018. (Potter, Carrie)
October 18, 2018 Opinion or Order TEXT ORDER granting #2 Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice of Rene S. Roupinian. So Ordered by Chief Judge William E. Smith on 10/18/2018. (Potter, Carrie)
October 18, 2018 Filing 4 CASE OPENING NOTICE ISSUED (Potter, Carrie)
October 18, 2018 Case assigned to Chief Judge William E. Smith and Magistrate Judge Lincoln D. Almond. (Potter, Carrie)
October 17, 2018 Filing 3 MOTION for Jack A. Rasiner to Appear Pro Hac Vice ( filing fee paid $ 100.00, receipt number 0103-1274775 ) filed by All Plaintiffs. (Sinapi, Richard)
October 17, 2018 Filing 2 MOTION for Ren S. Roupinian to Appear Pro Hac Vice ( filing fee paid $ 100.00, receipt number 0103-1274774 ) filed by All Plaintiffs. (Sinapi, Richard)
October 17, 2018 Filing 1 COMPLAINT ( filing fee paid $ 400.00, receipt number 0103-1274759 ), filed by Joseph Iovinelli. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Summons-Matlet Group, LLC, #3 Summons-Packaging Graphics, LLC)(Sinapi, Richard)
October 17, 2018 Filing 3 MOTION for Jack A. Rasiner to Appear Pro Hac Vice ( filing fee paid $ 100.00, receipt number 0103-1274775 ) filed by All Plaintiffs. (Sinapi, Richard)
October 17, 2018 Filing 2 MOTION for Ren S. Roupinian to Appear Pro Hac Vice ( filing fee paid $ 100.00, receipt number 0103-1274774 ) filed by All Plaintiffs. (Sinapi, Richard)
October 17, 2018 Filing 1 COMPLAINT ( filing fee paid $ 400.00, receipt number 0103-1274759 ), filed by Joseph Iovinelli. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Summons-Matlet Group, LLC, #3 Summons-Packaging Graphics, LLC)(Sinapi, Richard)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Rhode Island District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Iovinelli v. Matlet Group, LLC et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Joseph Iovinelli
Represented By: Richard A. Sinapi
Represented By: Jack A. Raisner
Represented By: Rene S. Roupinian
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Packaging Concepts, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Matlet Group, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Intervenor plaintiff: Maria Escobar
Represented By: Marc B. Gursky
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Intervenor plaintiff: Nilda Beltre
Represented By: Marc B. Gursky
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Intervenor plaintiff: Lissette Bonilla
Represented By: Marc B. Gursky
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Intervenor plaintiff: Wendy Baez
Represented By: Marc B. Gursky
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Intervenor plaintiff: Eliecer De La Rosa
Represented By: Marc B. Gursky
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Intervenor plaintiff: Luis Rodas
Represented By: Marc B. Gursky
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Intervenor plaintiff: Daniel Perez
Represented By: Marc B. Gursky
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Intervenor plaintiff: Edgar Civino
Represented By: Marc B. Gursky
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Intervenor plaintiff: Fluvia Lopez
Represented By: Marc B. Gursky
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Intervenor plaintiff: Mireya Osoria
Represented By: Marc B. Gursky
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Intervenor plaintiff: Yohanna Gomez
Represented By: Marc B. Gursky
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Intervenor plaintiff: Mercedes Adames
Represented By: Marc B. Gursky
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Intervenor plaintiff: Maritza Aponte
Represented By: Marc B. Gursky
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Intervenor plaintiff: Joao Sebastiao
Represented By: Marc B. Gursky
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Intervenor plaintiff: Brenda Cano
Represented By: Marc B. Gursky
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Intervenor plaintiff: Felix Gonzalez
Represented By: Marc B. Gursky
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Intervenor plaintiff: Myrna Martinez
Represented By: Marc B. Gursky
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Intervenor plaintiff: Emilio Perez
Represented By: Marc B. Gursky
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Intervenor plaintiff: July Polanco
Represented By: Marc B. Gursky
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Intervenor plaintiff: Milagros Rodriguez
Represented By: Marc B. Gursky
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Intervenor plaintiff: Rebecca Francia
Represented By: Marc B. Gursky
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Intervenor plaintiff: Judith De La Ossa
Represented By: Marc B. Gursky
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Intervenor plaintiff: Johanna Calle
Represented By: Marc B. Gursky
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Intervenor plaintiff: Maria Borda
Represented By: Marc B. Gursky
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Intervenor plaintiff: Francisca Fernandez
Represented By: Marc B. Gursky
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Intervenor plaintiff: Ana Gomes
Represented By: Marc B. Gursky
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Intervenor plaintiff: Blanca Chipillae
Represented By: Marc B. Gursky
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Intervenor plaintiff: Yocasta Pichardo
Represented By: Marc B. Gursky
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Intervenor plaintiff: Olga Cordoba
Represented By: Marc B. Gursky
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Intervenor plaintiff: Miguel Robles
Represented By: Marc B. Gursky
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?